USA v. Ivulans
Criminal Case Illinois Northern District Court, Case No. 1:08-cr-00132

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

United States of America United States of America, Plaintiff
Officially listed as "USA"

Represented by United States Department of Justice

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Entity DB

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Probation Department +4085 408 408 5197 Intake_Docket_ILNP@ilnp.uscourts.gov
Space Pretrial Services +4355 435 435 5545 ilnptdb_Court_Action_Notice@ilnpt.uscourts.gov

Note: Criminal cases with multiple defendants may have several records with the same case number: one record for the master file (all defendants), as well as one record per defendant. It can often be difficult to tell which record is which. Other likely matches for this case include:

Office Chicago
Filed 2/14/2008
County Cook
Terminated 6/18/2008
Reopened
Other Court Case None
Count 1
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1542.F
Offense Level 4
Def Custody Status
Flag NOLAN
  Entries (13) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank -- Filed: 6/24/2008, Entered: 6/24/2008 Judgment and Commitment Issued
JUDGMENT and Commitment as to Edgars Ivulans issued to U.S. Marshal (yap, )
    LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 6/18/2008, Entered: 6/24/2008 Sentencing
    JUDGMENT (Sentencing Order) as to Edgars Ivulans (1): The defendant pleaded guilty to count(s) one(1). The defendant is hereby committed to the custody of the United States Bureau of Prisons to be imprisoned for a total term of:fourteen (14) months. To run concurrent to the sentence imposed in 07 cr 364-11(USA vs. Starnes, et al). The defendant is remanded to the custody of the United States Marshal. Upon release from imprisonment, the defendant shall be on supervised release for a term of: three(3) years. Standard conditions of supervision. Additional supervised release terms. Criminal monetary penalties. Schedule of payments. Edgars Ivulans terminated. Signed by the Honorable Wayne R. Andersen on 6/23/08.Mailed copy to counsel of record (yap, )
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 6/12/2008, Entered: 6/12/2008 Description not available
      MINUTE entry before the Honorable Wayne R. Andersen:as to Edgars Ivulans, Sentencing hearing held on 6/12/2008. Sentencing reset for 6/18/2008 at 09:00 AM. Mailed notice (tsa, )
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 3/17/2008, Entered: 3/20/2008 Description not availableCourt Filing
        MINUTE entry before Judge Honorable Wayne R. Andersen as to Edgars Ivulans: Status hearing held. Defendant enters a plea of guilty as to count one (1). Court enters judgment on the plea.Order cause referred to the probation office for presentence investigation. Sentencing set for 6/12/2008 @10:30 a.m. Mailed notice (yap, )
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 2/29/2008, Entered: 3/4/2008 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
          EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE ORDER: Case as to Edgars Ivulans Reassigned to Judge Wayne R. Andersen pursuant to Local Rule 40.4. The case pending on the calendar of Judge Ruben Castillo to be related 07 cr 364-11 which is pending on the calendar of Judge Andersen. Accordingly, Honorable Judge Wayne R. Andersen request the Executive Committee order said case to be reassigned to my calendar as a related case. (For further details see order). (yap, ) .
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 2/28/2008, Entered: 2/28/2008 Description not availableCourt Filing
            MINUTE entry before Judge Ruben Castillo Edgar Ivulans : Arraignment hearing set for 3/5/2008 before Judge Castillo is vacated. Mailed notice (rao, )
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 2/28/2008, Entered: 2/28/2008 Description not availableCourt Filing
              MINUTE entry before Judge Wayne R. Andersen as to Edgars Ivulans (1): Arraignment held. Defendant is informed of his rights. Defendant waives formal reading of the indictment.Defendant enters a plea of not guilty as to count one (1). Status hearing set for 3/18/2008 at 1:00 p.m. Timeis hereby excluded to 3/18/2008 pursuant to 18:3161(h)(1)(F). Mailed notice (yap, )
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 2/20/2008, Entered: 2/20/2008 Terminate HearingsCourt Filing
                MINUTE entry before Judge Ruben Castillo : Arraignment reset to 3/5/2008 at 9:00 AM. Mailed notice (rao, )
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 2/15/2008, Entered: 2/15/2008 notice of arraignment
                  NOTICE of Arraignment as to Edgars Ivulans before Honorable Ruben Castillo on 2/20/2008 at 10:00 A.M. (las, )
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 2/14/2008, Entered: 2/19/2008 Declaration
                    DECLARATION by USA as to Edgars Ivulans regarding Grand Jury subpoenas pursuant to Local Criminal Rule 1.04(d) (yap, )
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 2/14/2008, Entered: 2/15/2008 Description not availableCourt Filing
                      MINUTE entry before Judge Maria Valdez as to Edgars Ivulans : No bond set; detained by magistrate in 07 cr 364. (las, )
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 2/14/2008, Entered: 2/15/2008 designation form
                        DESIGNATION Sheet: FELONY (Category 4). (las, )
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 2/14/2008, Entered: 2/15/2008 Indictment
                          INDICTMENT as to Edgars Ivulans (1) count(s) 1 (las, )
                            Request RequestSpace LREF

                            Statistics

                            This case has been viewed 404 times.

                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                            Space
                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                             
                            PlainSite
                            Sign Up
                            Need Password Help?