USA v. Koosed
Criminal Case California Central District Court, Case No. 2:97-cr-00104-JGD

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 15, 2017 at 4:55 AM EST (5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts
No Logo Koosed, Terry, Defendant
Officially listed as "Terry Koosed"

Represented by Irell & Manella, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 07/23/1997, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Designation: Retained S Thomas Pollack +1 310 277 1010 tpollack@irell.com

Note: Criminal cases with multiple defendants may have several records with the same case number: one record for the master file (all defendants), as well as one record per defendant. It can often be difficult to tell which record is which. Other likely matches for this case include:

  Entries (32) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 8/27/1999, Entered: 8/30/1999 Probation Form 35Court Filing
REPORT AND ORDER TERMINATING PROBATION/Supervised Release Prior to Original Expiration Date as to Terry Koosed Ordered by Judge Terry J. Hatter Jr. . (vc)
    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 2/22/1999, Entered: 2/22/1999 Satisfaction of Judgment
    SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT filed by USA , as to Terry Koosed (vc)
      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 8/14/1997, Entered: 8/15/1997 Transcript - CR
      TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings held on 07/23/97 as to Terry Koosed . (es)
        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 8/14/1997, Entered: 8/15/1997 Receipt of Reporters Transcript (G-80)
        RECEIPT for Transcripts of proceedings held on: 07/23/97 (es)
          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 7/25/1997, Entered: 7/31/1997 Judgment and CommitmentCourt Filing
          JUDGMENT AND COMMITMENT issued to U.S. Marshal for Terry Koosed Approved by Judge John G. Davies . Entered on: 07/31/97. (es)
            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 7/23/1997, Entered: 7/31/1997 SentencingCourt Filing
            MINUTES OF SENTENCING held before Judge John G. Davies as to Terry Koosed (1) count(s) 1-2. Dft is placed on Probation for Three (3) years under the following terms & conds: Cmply w/r&r of USPO & GO 318; perform 500 hrs of community srv; provide accurate financial stmt w/spprtng docs to Prbtn Offcr; Dft shll pay S/A of $100.00. The drug testing cond mandated by statute is suspended. Exonerated bond as to Terry Koosed [8-1] , Court advises Terry Koosed of right to appeal. C/R: Robert Tomassone (es)
              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 7/21/1997, Entered: 7/22/1997 Remark
              Governments second supplemental memoradum re sentencing filed by USA as to Terry Koosed (vc)
                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 7/17/1997, Entered: 7/18/1997 Declaration
                DECLARATION of S. Thomas Pollack in Support of Dft Terry Koosed's Second Supplemental Memorandum Re Sentncing FILED by Terry Koosed. (es)
                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 7/17/1997, Entered: 7/18/1997 Sentencing Memorandum
                  Dft Terry Koosed's Second Supplemental Memo Re SENTENCING filed by Terry Koosed (es)
                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 7/9/1997, Entered: 7/14/1997 Motion HearingCourt Filing
                    MINUTES OF CONTINUED SENTENCING HEARING held before Judge John G. Davies as to Terry Koosed : The w/in actn convened for sentencing hrg. Crt conferred w/cnsl on various sentencing factors under the Guidelines. Dft's cnsl indicated to Crt tht he felt that addtnl brfng involving input from experts on certain iss, and orally over for a brf cont of mttr. Govt cnsl did not oppose. Mtn to cont was granted. The act is contd to 4:45pm, 7/23/97 for further sentencing prcdngs. Dft may subm addtnl brfng on or before 7/16/97, Govt's cnsl may have til 7/21/97 to subm any addtnl brfng; and both sides are to provide a cc to said brfs delivered dir to Crt's chambers. Dft was dir to rtrn on the date of sentencing w/out fur order of crt. mttr recessed. C/R: R Lynne Smith (es)
                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 7/7/1997, Entered: 7/8/1997 Reply (Motion Related)(CR)
                      Dft Terry Koosed's Reply to Govt's Supplemental Memo Re Sentencing and Second Addendum To The Pre-Sentence Report filed by Terry Koosed to (es)
                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 7/2/1997, Entered: 7/2/1997 Remark
                        Subpoena in a Criminal Case and original Proof of Service filed by Terry Koosed (es)
                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 6/20/1997, Entered: 6/23/1997 Declaration
                          DECLARATION of S. Thomas Pollack in Supprt of Dft Terry Koosed's Supplemental Memo of Position Re Sentencing FILED by Terry Koosed . (es)
                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 6/20/1997, Entered: 6/23/1997 Sentencing Memorandum
                            Supplemental MEMORANDUM In Support of Dft Terry Koosed's Positin Re Sentencing filed by Terry Koosed (es)
                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 6/12/1997, Entered: 6/16/1997 Motion HearingCourt Filing
                              MINUTES OF CONTD SENTENCING HEARING held before Judge John G. Davies as to Terry Koosed : The w/in actn convened for sentencing. Dft has subm its sentencing brf, and supplmntl decl. Crt cld benefit frm Govt's sentencing pos brf. Sentencing cannot go frwrd w/out it. Dft may file any supplmntl brf or or before 9/9/97, Govt's resp is to be fld by 6/27/97. Accordingly, the act was contd to Wed, 4:30pm, 7/9/97 for sentencing. Dft was dir to appear n that date at that time. C/R: Robert Tomassone (es)
                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 6/10/1997, Entered: 6/11/1997 Declaration
                                DECLARATION of Richard L Wynne in Supprt of Dft's Position Re Sentencing FILED as to Terry Koosed . (es)
                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 6/9/1997, Entered: 6/9/1997 Letter Filed
                                  LETTERS submitted in Supprt of Dft's Position Regarding Sentencing filed as to Terry Koosed by (es)
                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 6/5/1997, Entered: 6/6/1997 Position with Respect to Presentence Report/Sentencing Factors
                                    Dft Terry Koosed's Position Re Sentencing And Objections to Presentence Report filed by Terry Koosed (es)
                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 6/5/1997, Entered: 6/6/1997 Declaration
                                      DECLARATION of S Thomas Pollack in Supprt of Dft's Position Re Sentencing FILED as to Terry Koosed . (es)
                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 6/5/1997, Entered: 6/6/1997 Declaration
                                        DECLARATION of Lewis Cohen In Supprt of Dft's Posititon Re Sentencing FILED as to Terry Koosed . (es)
                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 5/14/1997, Entered: 5/19/1997 Order to Continue - Excludable DelayCourt Filing
                                          STIPULATION AND ORDER filed by Judge John G. Davies as to Terry Koosed : to continue sentencing hearing sentencing hearing contd to 4:30pm, 6/12/97 for Terry Koosed (es)
                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 4/16/1997, Entered: 4/30/1997 Motion HearingCourt Filing
                                            MINUTES OF CONTINUED SENTENCING HEARING held before Judge John G. Davies as to Terry Koosed: The w/in actn convened for sentencing. Cnsl orally and jntly reqstd the instant mttr contd. Mtn was granted. Sentence is cont to 8:30am, 5/19/97 for Terry Koosed C/R: Robert Tomassone (es)
                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 2/10/1997, Entered: 2/25/1997 Change of Plea Hearing (plea accepted)Court Filing
                                              MINUTES OF PLEA AND TRIAL SETTIGN HEARING held before Judge John G. Davies as to Terry Koosed: The w/in actn convened for plea and trial setting. Dft was qstnd by Crt. Dft entered a plea of guilty to ea Cnt 1 & 2 of the Info. Dft was sworn. Upon exam of dft, crt found plea to be knowingly and vol made, and accepted the plea. The Court refers Terry Koosed to the Probation Office for investigation and report. The actn was set down for Wed, 8:30am on 4/16/97 for sentencing. Dft dir to appear on tht date and time, w/out fur ord of crt. C/R: Robert Tomassone (es)
                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 2/10/1997, Entered: 2/25/1997 Bond and Conditions (CR-1)Court Filing
                                                BOND AND CONDITIONS OF RELEASE filed by Terry Koosed , in the amount of: $75,000 Unsec AB. Approved by Magistrate Judge Virginia A. Phillips . (es)
                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 2/10/1997, Entered: 2/25/1997 Notice of Attorney Appearance for a Defendant
                                                  DESIGNATION AND APPEARANCE of Attorney for Terry Koosed by Thomas Pollack (es)
                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 2/10/1997, Entered: 2/25/1997 Statement of Constitutional Rights
                                                    STATEMENT OF DEFENDANT'S CONSTITUTIONAL RIGHTS filed as to Terry Koosed . (es)
                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 2/10/1997, Entered: 2/25/1997 In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding heldCourt Filing
                                                      MINUTES OF PIA HEARING held before Magistrate Judge Virginia A. Phillips as to Terry Koosed: Dft arr and st/s t/n as chrgd. Dft is gvn cpy of Info and waives reading. Case reassigned to Judge John G. Davies for plea, trial setting and all fur prcdngs this date at 3:30pm. Tape 1015 (es)
                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 2/10/1997, Entered: 2/14/1997 (TERMED) WAIVER - event converted from ICMS
                                                        WAIVER of Indictment by Terry Koosed (es)
                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 2/10/1997, Entered: 2/12/1997 Plea Agreement
                                                          Notice of Filing Original PLEA Agreement as to Terry Koosed (es)
                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 2/3/1997, Entered: 2/6/1997 Case Summary (CR-72)
                                                            CASE SUMMARY filed by AUSA Jon Cederberg, attorney for USA, as to Terry Koosed . Offense occurred in LA. (dm)
                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 2/3/1997, Entered: 2/6/1997 Information - Felony
                                                              INFORMATION Terry Koosed (1) count(s) 1-2 (dm)
                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                Blank  Summons Issued - NFPV
                                                                SUMMONS issued as to Terry Koosed (dm)
                                                                  LREF

                                                                  Statistics

                                                                  This case has been viewed 134,837 times.

                                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                  Space
                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                   
                                                                  PlainSite
                                                                  Sign Up
                                                                  Need Password Help?