Gale et al v. Proskauer Rose LLP et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Texas Northern District Court, Case No. 3:12-cv-01803
District Judge David C Godbey, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated December 26, 2016 at 11:29 AM EST (5.1 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts
No Logo Alba Giraldo, Plaintiff
No Logo Alberto Leon, Plaintiff
No Logo Alfredo Ruiz Trust, Plaintiff
No Logo Amanda Ballesteros, Plaintiff
No Logo Andres Banuelos, Plaintiff
No Logo Asociacion Latino Americana de Supermercados, A.C., Plaintiff
No Logo Aurora Kawas, Plaintiff
No Logo Blancia Aida Neyda Ruiz de Villaseno R. Trust, Plaintiff
No Logo Carmen Mata, Plaintiff
No Logo Daniel Toiber, Plaintiff
No Logo Deportista Trust, Plaintiff
No Logo Felipe Benavides, Plaintiff
No Logo Fernando Perez, Plaintiff
No Logo Francisco Casas, Plaintiff
No Logo Guadalupe Acosta, Plaintiff
No Logo Gustavo Gomez, Plaintiff
No Logo Homero Karras, Plaintiff
No Logo Ivonne Avila, Plaintiff
No Logo Jacobo Lichi, Plaintiff
No Logo Jardines del Santo Cristo de Saltillo Trust, Plaintiff
No Logo Jesus Mauricio Cagigas Adalid Trust, Plaintiff
No Logo Jesus Nieto Trust, Plaintiff
No Logo Jorge Karras, Plaintiff
No Logo Julian A. Garcia, Plaintiff
No Logo Leonard Rapoport, Plaintiff
No Logo Leticia Mendoza, Plaintiff
No Logo Luis Martinez, Plaintiff
No Logo Luis Santana, Plaintiff
No Logo Luz Sobrino, Plaintiff
No Logo M Y M Generaciones Trust, Plaintiff
No Logo Manual Figueroa, Plaintiff
No Logo Margarito Lozano, Plaintiff
No Logo Maria de la Luz Majul Ballesteros Trust, Plaintiff
No Logo Maria Rivera, Plaintiff
No Logo Maria Santana, Plaintiff
No Logo Mary Green, Plaintiff
No Logo Michael Gale, Plaintiff

Represented by Castillo Snyder PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Bar Status: Admitted/In Good Standing Jesse R Castillo +1 210 630 4200 +1 210 630 4210 jcastillo@casnlaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Bar Status: Admitted/In Good Standing Edward C Snyder +1 210 630 4200 +1 210 630 4210 esnyder@casnlaw.com

Represented by NELIGAN FOLEY, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Bar Status: Admitted/In Good Standing Douglas James Buncher +1 214 840 5300 +1 214 840 5301 dbuncher@neliganlaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Bar Status: Admitted/In Good Standing Nicholas Andrew Foley +1 214 840 5330 +1 214 840 5301 nfoley@neliganlaw.com
No Logo Michoacan Trust, Plaintiff
No Logo Monica Sansores, Plaintiff
No Logo Morumbi Trust, Plaintiff
No Logo Negib Nieto, Plaintiff
No Logo Neyda Alexandra Villasenor Ruiz Trust, Plaintiff
No Logo Nicolas Ferrer, Plaintiff
No Logo Pedro Ramirez, Plaintiff
No Logo Rafael Lemus, Plaintiff
No Logo Raul Lopez, Plaintiff
No Logo Said Enrique Majul Madrid Trust, Plaintiff
No Logo Samuel Oldak, Plaintiff
No Logo Yolanda Rocha, Plaintiff
v.
No Logo Chadbourne & Parke, LLP, Defendant

Represented by Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Garrison, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Bar Status: Not Admitted Daniel J. Beller +1 212 373 3312 +1 212 373 2315 dbeller@paulweiss.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Bar Status: Not Admitted DANIEL J. LEFFELL +1 212 373 3218 dleffell@paulweiss.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Bar Status: Not Admitted William B Michael +1 212 373 3000 wmichael@paulweiss.com

Represented by Vinson & Elkins LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Bar Status: Admitted/In Good Standing Harry M Reasoner +1 713 758 2358 + 713 615 5173 hreasoner@velaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Bar Status: Admitted/In Good Standing William D. Sims, Jr. +1 214 220 7700 bsims@velaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Bar Status: Not Admitted William D. Sims, Jr. +1 214 220 7700 bsims@velaw.com
Proskauer Rose LLP Proskauer Rose LLP, Defendant

Represented by Carrington, Coleman, Sloman & Blumenthal, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Bar Status: Admitted/In Good Standing Neil Ross Burger +1 214 855 3076 +1 214 840 0120 nburger@ccsb.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Bar Status: Admitted/In Good Standing Bruce Collins +1 214 855 3000 +1 214 855 1333 bcollins@ccsb.com

Represented by Davis Polk & Wardwell, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 05/07/2013, PRO HAC VICE, Bar Status: Not Admitted Richard Cooper +1 212 450 4000 +1 212 701 5800 richard.cooper@davispolk.com
TERMINATED: 05/22/2012, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Bar Status: Not Admitted Rajesh S. James , +1 212 450 4000 +1 212 450 3384 rajesh.james@davispolk.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Bar Status: Not Admitted James P. Rouhandeh +1 212 450 4000 +1 212 450 3835 james.rouhandeh@dpw.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Bar Status: Not Admitted Daniel Jacob Schwartz +1 212 450 4581 +1 212 450 3581 daniel.schwartz@dpw.com
No Logo Spencer C. Barasch, Defendant

Represented by Weitzman Law Offices, LLC (NJ)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Bar Status: Admitted/In Good Standing Paul Edward Coggins +1 214 740 8000 +1 214 740 8800 pcoggins@lockelord.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Bar Status: Admitted/In Good Standing Kiprian E Mendrygal +1 214 740 8400 +1 214 740 8800 kmendrygal@lockelord.com
No Logo THOMAS V. SJOBLOM, Defendant

Represented by Fish & Richardson, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Bar Status: Admitted/In Good Standing Martha Deacon Jones +1 214 747 5070 +1 214 747 2091 jones@fr.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Bar Status: Admitted/In Good Standing William B Mateja +1 214 747 5070 + 214 747 2091 mateja@fr.com

Represented by McKenna Long & Aldridge LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Bar Status: Not Admitted Joshua R. Hochberg +1 202 496 7691 +1 202 496 7756 jhochberg@mckennalong.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Bar Status: Not Admitted Mindy L Rattan +1 202 496 7691 mrattan@mckennalong.com
Citation Section 15 U.S.C. § 77
Nature of Suit 850 - Other Statutes: Securities/Commodities/Exchange
  Entries (69) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 9/9/2015, Entered: None
NOTICE of Compliance with Rule 1.11(c) filed by Spencer C. Barasch (Coggins, Paul) (Entered: 09/09/2015)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 10/3/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
    ORDER: The cases referenced in this order are stayed until the sooner of thirty (30) days after issuance of a decision by this Court on plaintiffs' forthcoming motion for class certification in Troice, et al. v. Proskauer Rose, LLP, et al., Civil Action No. 3:09-cv-1600-N, or the issuance of a final order dismissing the complaint in that action. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 10/3/2014) (gmg) (Entered: 10/03/2014)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 10/2/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
      ELECTRONIC ORDER granting 65 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Nicholas A. Foley is withdrawn as counsel for plaintiffs Guadalupe Acosta, Alfredo Ruiz Trust, Asociacion Latino Americana de Supermercados, A.C., Ivonne Avila, Amanda Ballesteros, Andres Banuelos, Felipe Benavides, Blancia Aida Neyda Ruiz de Villaseno R. Trust, Francisco Casas, Deportista Trust, Nicolas Ferrer, Manual Figueroa, Michael Gale, Julian A. Garcia, Alba Giraldo, Gustavo Gomez, Mary Green, Jardines del Santo Cristo de Saltillo Trust, Jesus Mauricio Cagigas Adalid Trust, Jesus Nieto Trust, Homero Karras, Jorge Karras, Aurora Kawas, Rafael Lemus, Alberto Leon, Jacobo Lichi, Raul Lopez, Margarito Lozano, M Y M Generaciones Trust, Maria de la Luz Majul Ballesteros Trust, Luis Martinez, Carmen Mata, Leticia Mendoza, Michoacan Trust, Morumbi Trust, Neyda Alexandra Villasenor Ruiz Trust, Negib Nieto, Samuel Oldak, Fernando Perez, Pedro Ramirez, Leonard Rapoport, Maria Rivera, Yolanda Rocha, Said Enrique Majul Madrid Trust, Monica Sansores, Luis Santana, Maria Santana, Luz Sobrino and Daniel Toiber. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 10/2/2014) (chmb) (Entered: 10/02/2014)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 10/2/2014, Entered: None
        Joint MOTION to Stay filed by Spencer C. Barasch, Chadbourne & Parke LLP, Proskauer Rose LLP (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Rouhandeh, James) (Entered: 10/02/2014)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 8/21/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
          ELECTRONIC Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge David C Godbey: Status Conference held on 8/21/2014. Attorney Appearances: SEC - David Reece; Receiver- Kevin Sadler, Michael Kuckelman, Douglas Buncher; Examiner- John Little; Defense - Jonathan Polkes, Ashley Kleber, Brian Tagtmeier, Robert Plotkin, Phil Preis, Jesse Castillo, Edward Valdepino, and Randy Pulman. (Court Reporter: Linda Langford) (No exhibits) Time in Court - 01:11. (chmb) (Entered: 08/21/2014) (jkm) (Entered: 08/21/2014)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 10/1/2014, Entered: None
            MOTION to Withdraw filed by Guadalupe Acosta, Alfredo Ruiz Trust, Asociacion Latino Americana de Supermercados, A.C., Ivonne Avila, Amanda Ballesteros, Andres Banuelos, Felipe Benavides, Blancia Aida Neyda Ruiz de Villaseno R. Trust, Francisco Casas, Deportista Trust, Nicolas Ferrer, Manual Figueroa, Michael Gale, Julian A. Garcia, Alba Giraldo, Gustavo Gomez, Mary Green, Jardines del Santo Cristo de Saltillo Trust, Jesus Mauricio Cagigas Adalid Trust, Jesus Nieto Trust, Homero Karras, Jorge Karras, Aurora Kawas, Rafael Lemus, Alberto Leon, Jacobo Lichi, Raul Lopez, Margarito Lozano, M Y M Generaciones Trust, Maria de la Luz Majul Ballesteros Trust, Luis Martinez, Carmen Mata, Leticia Mendoza, Michoacan Trust, Morumbi Trust, Neyda Alexandra Villasenor Ruiz Trust, Negib Nieto, Samuel Oldak, Fernando Perez, Pedro Ramirez, Leonard Rapoport, Maria Rivera, Yolanda Rocha, Said Enrique Majul Madrid Trust, Monica Sansores, Luis Santana, Maria Santana, Luz Sobrino, Daniel Toiber (Buncher, Douglas) (Entered: 10/01/2014)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 7/22/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
              The Court will hold a status hearing for all parties to the Stanford MDL proceeding on 8/21/2014 10:00 AM in US Courthouse, Courtroom 1505, 1100 Commerce St., Dallas, TX 75242-1310 before Judge David C Godbey. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 7/22/2014) (jkm) (Entered: 07/22/2014)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 9/29/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                ELECTRONIC ORDER granting 63 Motion to Extend Time. Responses due by 10/6/2014. Replies due by 10/20/2014. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 9/29/2014) (chmb) (Entered: 09/29/2014)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 2/13/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                  It is ordered that all matters and motions previously referred to the Honorable E. Scott Frost, United States Magistrate Judge, in the In re Stanford Entities Securities Litigation multidistrict litigation, are now hereby referred to the Honorable Nancy M. Koenig, United States Magistrate Judge, except for two matters outlined in the order. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 2/13/2014) (gmg) (Entered: 02/14/2014)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 9/22/2014, Entered: None
                    STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER by Spencer C. Barasch, Chadbourne & Parke LLP, Proskauer Rose LLP. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Rouhandeh, James) Modified to add motion part on 9/29/2014 (gmg). (Entered: 09/22/2014)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 1/17/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                      ELECTRONIC Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge David C Godbey: Status Conference held on 1/16/2014. Attorney Appearances: Receiver - Kevin Sadler; SEC - David Reece; Examiner - John Little; Defendants - Daniel Schwartz, Michael Kuckelman, Jim E. Cowles, Sim Israeloff, Chuck Green, Bill Mateja, Ed Snyder, Emil Lippe, Jr. (Court Reporter: Linda Langford) (No exhibits) Time in Court - :48. (chmb) (jkm) (Entered: 01/17/2014)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Blank 62 Filed: 9/8/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                        ORDER: Given the Supreme Court's decision, this Court orders that Defendants must respond to the pending motions to remand within twenty-one days from the date of this Order. The Plaintiffs may reply fourteen days after the date of Defendants' response. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 9/8/2014) (skt) (Entered: 09/08/2014)
                          LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 12/3/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                          ORDER requesting input regarding the priority of decision in various matters pending in all cases within the In re Stanford Entities Securities Litigation. Input must be filed with the Court within twenty-one (21) days of the date of this Order. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 12/3/2013) (gmg) (Entered: 12/03/2013)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 12/2/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                            ORDER: Status Hearing for all parties to the Stanford MDL proceeding set for 1/16/2014 10:00 AM in US Courthouse, Courtroom 1505, 1100 Commerce St., Dallas, TX 75242-1310 before Judge David C Godbey. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 12/2/2013) (gmg) (Entered: 12/03/2013)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 5/7/2013, Entered: None
                              NOTICE of Withdrawal of Counsel of Record filed by Proskauer Rose LLP (Burger, Neil) (Entered: 05/07/2013)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 10/4/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                ORDER: Status Conference set for 10/19/2012 02:00 PM in US Courthouse, Courtroom 1505, 1100 Commerce St., Dallas, TX 75242-1310 before Magistrate Judge E. Scott Frost. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge E. Scott Frost on 10/4/2012)(gmg) (Entered: 10/05/2012)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 9/24/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                  ORDER: Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 636, it is ordered that all cases within the In re Stanford Entities Securities Litigation multidistrict litigation, other than Securities Exchange Commission v. Stanford, et al., Civil Action No. 3:09-0298-N, are hereby referred to the Hon. E. Scott Frost, United States Magistrate Judge, for hearing and determination. See Order for specifics. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 9/24/2012) (gmg) (Entered: 09/26/2012)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 7/30/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                    ELECTRONIC ORDER granting 42 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Daniel J. Beller. If not already done, Applicant must register as an ECF User within 14 days (LR 5.1(f)). (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 7/30/2012) (chmb) (Entered: 07/30/2012)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 7/30/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                      ELECTRONIC ORDER granting 41 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Daniel J. Leffell. If not already done, Applicant must register as an ECF User within 14 days (LR 5.1(f)). (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 7/30/2012) (chmb) (Entered: 07/30/2012)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 7/30/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                        ELECTRONIC ORDER granting 40 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of William B. Michael. If not already done, Applicant must register as an ECF User within 14 days (LR 5.1(f)). (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 7/30/2012) (chmb) (Entered: 07/30/2012)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 7/30/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                          ELECTRONIC ORDER granting 48 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Richard A. Cooper. If not already done, Applicant must register as an ECF User within 14 days (LR 5.1(f)). (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 7/30/2012) (chmb) (Entered: 07/30/2012)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 7/26/2012, Entered: None
                                            Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Cert. of Good Standing for Attorney Richard A. Cooper (Filing fee $25; Receipt number 0539-4718571) filed by Proskauer Rose LLP (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Good Standing) (Cooper, Richard) (Entered: 07/26/2012)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 7/24/2012, Entered: None
                                              Appendix in Support filed by Chadbourne & Parke LLP, Proskauer Rose LLP re 46 Response/Objection to Motion to Remand (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) A, # 2 Exhibit(s) B, # 3 Exhibit(s) C, # 4 Exhibit(s) D) (Burger, Neil) (Entered: 07/24/2012)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Blank 46 Filed: 7/24/2012, Entered: None
                                              RESPONSE filed by Chadbourne & Parke LLP, Proskauer Rose LLP re: 10 Opposed MOTION to Remand to State Court (Plaintiffs Opposed Motion to Remand and Brief In Support Thereof) (Burger, Neil) (Entered: 07/24/2012)
                                                LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 7/16/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                ORDER: granting Examiner's request for status conference. Status Conference set for 7/26/2012 10:00 AM in US Courthouse, Courtroom 1505, 1100 Commerce St., Dallas, TX 75242-1310 before Judge David C Godbey. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 7/16/2012) (gr) (Entered: 07/24/2012)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 7/24/2012, Entered: None
                                                  NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Harry M Reasoner on behalf of Chadbourne & Parke LLP. (Reasoner, Harry) (Entered: 07/24/2012)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 7/24/2012, Entered: None
                                                    NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by William D Sims, Jr on behalf of Chadbourne & Parke LLP. (Sims, William) (Entered: 07/24/2012)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 7/23/2012, Entered: None
                                                      Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Cert. of Good Standing for Attorney Daniel J. Beller (Filing fee $25; Receipt number 0539-4712140) filed by Chadbourne & Parke LLP (Beller, Daniel) (Entered: 07/23/2012)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 7/23/2012, Entered: None
                                                        Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Cert. of Good Standing for Attorney Daniel J. Leffell (Filing fee $25; Receipt number 0539-4711903) filed by Chadbourne & Parke LLP (Leffell, Daniel) (Entered: 07/23/2012)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 7/23/2012, Entered: None
                                                          Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Cert. of Good Standing for Attorney William B. Michael (Filing fee $25; Receipt number 0539-4711372) filed by Chadbourne & Parke LLP (Michael, William) (Entered: 07/23/2012)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 7/3/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                            ORDER: This Order addresses pending motions to remand: 10 in 3:12-CV-1803-N; 6 in 3:12-CV-1805-N; 9 in 3:12-CV-1806-N; 11 in 3:12-CV-1808-N; 7 in 3:12-CV- 1809-N. The Court orders that Defendants must respond to the pending motions to remand within twenty-one (21) days from the date of this Order. The Plaintiffs may reply fourteen (14) days after the date of Defendants' response. To the extent that any case is stayed, the Court lifts the stay, and to the extent that there are pending motions to stay in any case, the Court denies those motions as moot. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 7/3/2012) (jrb) (Entered: 07/03/2012)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 7/3/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                              ELECTRONIC ORDER granting 36 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Daniel J. Schwartz. If not already done, Applicant must register as an ECF User within 14 days (LR 5.1(f)). (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 7/3/2012) (chmb) (Entered: 07/03/2012)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 7/3/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                ELECTRONIC ORDER granting 35 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of James P. Rouhandeh. If not already done, Applicant must register as an ECF User within 14 days (LR 5.1(f)). (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 7/3/2012) (chmb) (Entered: 07/03/2012)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 6/27/2012, Entered: None
                                                                  Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Cert. of Good Standing for Attorney Daniel J. Schwartz (Filing fee $25; Receipt number 0539-4664060) filed by Proskauer Rose LLP (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) Certificate of Good Standing, # 2 Proposed Order) (Schwartz, Daniel) (Entered: 06/27/2012)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 6/27/2012, Entered: None
                                                                    Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Cert. of Good Standing for Attorney James P. Rouhandeh (Filing fee $25; Receipt number 0539-4663870) filed by Proskauer Rose LLP (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) Certificate of Good Standing, # 2 Proposed Order) (Rouhandeh, James) (Entered: 06/27/2012)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 6/12/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                      New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. File to Judge Godbey. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Kaplan). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (jrb) (Entered: 06/12/2012)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 6/12/2012, Entered: None
                                                                        Case electronically transferred in from District of Texas Western; Case Number 5:12-cv-00079. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas should seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: Attorney Information - Bar Membership. Copy of NEF to be sent US Mail to parties not electronically noticed. (Entered: 06/12/2012)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 6/8/2012, Entered: None
                                                                          Certified copy of TRANSFER ORDER issued by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation TRANSFERRING this cause to the Northern District of Texas to proceed under MDL No. 2099. (kh, ) [Transferred from Texas Western on 6/12/2012.] (Entered: 06/08/2012)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 5/22/2012, Entered: None
                                                                            NOTICE of Withdrawal of Counsel of Record by Proskauer Rose LLP (Burger, Neil) [Transferred from Texas Western on 6/12/2012.] (Entered: 05/22/2012)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 5/2/2012, Entered: None
                                                                              ADVISORY TO THE COURT by Chadbourne & Parke LLP, Proskauer Rose LLP in Further Support of their Motion for Stay. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Burger, Neil) [Transferred from Texas Western on 6/12/2012.] (Entered: 05/02/2012)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 4/30/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                ADVISORY TO THE COURT by Guadalupe Acosta, Alfredo Ruiz Trust, Asociacion Latino Americana de Supermercados, A.C., Ivonne Avila, Amanda Ballesteros, Andres Banuelos, Felipe Benavides, Blancia Aida Neyda Ruiz de Villaseno R. Trust, Francisco Casas, Deportista Trust, Nicolas Ferrer, Manual Figueroa, Michael Gale, Julian A. Garcia, Alba Giraldo, Gustavo Gomez, Mary Green, Jardines del Santo Cristo de Saltillo Trust, Jesus Mauricio Cagigas Adalid Trust, Jesus Nieto Trust, Homero Karras, Jorge Karras, Aurora Kawas, Rafael Lemus, Alberto Leon, Jacobo Lichi, Raul Lopez, Margarito Lozano, M Y M Generaciones Trust, Maria de la Luz Majul Ballesteros Trust, Luis Martinez, Carmen Mata, Leticia Mendoza, Michoacan Trust, Morumbi Trust, Neyda Alexandra Villasenor Ruiz Trust, Negib Nieto, Samuel Oldak, Fernando Perez, Pedro Ramirez, Leonard Rapoport, Maria Rivera, Yolanda Rocha, Said Enrique Majul Madrid Trust, Monica Sansores, Luis Santana, Maria Santana, Luz Sobrino, Daniel Toiber. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit "A")(Snyder, Edward) [Transferred from Texas Western on 6/12/2012.] (Entered: 04/30/2012)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 4/19/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                  ADVISORY TO THE COURT by Guadalupe Acosta, Alfredo Ruiz Trust, Asociacion Latino Americana de Supermercados, A.C., Ivonne Avila, Amanda Ballesteros, Andres Banuelos, Felipe Benavides, Blancia Aida Neyda Ruiz de Villaseno R. Trust, Francisco Casas, Deportista Trust, Nicolas Ferrer, Manual Figueroa, Michael Gale, Julian A. Garcia, Alba Giraldo, Gustavo Gomez, Mary Green, Jardines del Santo Cristo de Saltillo Trust, Jesus Mauricio Cagigas Adalid Trust, Jesus Nieto Trust, Homero Karras, Jorge Karras, Aurora Kawas, Rafael Lemus, Alberto Leon, Jacobo Lichi, Raul Lopez, Margarito Lozano, M Y M Generaciones Trust, Maria de la Luz Majul Ballesteros Trust, Luis Martinez, Carmen Mata, Leticia Mendoza, Michoacan Trust, Morumbi Trust, Neyda Alexandra Villasenor Ruiz Trust, Negib Nieto, Samuel Oldak, Fernando Perez, Pedro Ramirez, Leonard Rapoport, Maria Rivera, Yolanda Rocha, Said Enrique Majul Madrid Trust, Monica Sansores, Luis Santana, Maria Santana, Luz Sobrino, Daniel Toiber. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit "A")(Snyder, Edward) [Transferred from Texas Western on 6/12/2012.] (Entered: 04/19/2012)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 4/13/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                    ORDER Staying Case pending a ruling from the Fifth Circuit Court of Appeals in the TROICE matter. Signed by Judge Orlando L. Garcia. (tr1) Modified on 4/16/2012,to edit text (rf). [Transferred from Texas Western on 6/12/2012.] (Entered: 04/13/2012)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 4/6/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                      ADVISORY TO THE COURT by Chadbourne & Parke LLP, Proskauer Rose LLP in Further Support of Their 16 Motion for Stay. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Burger, Neil) Modified on 4/6/2012, to link to doc #16 (rf). [Transferred from Texas Western on 6/12/2012.] (Entered: 04/06/2012)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 3/27/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                        RESPONSE to 24 Advisory to the Court, 16 MOTION to Stay Case by Proskauer Rose LLP. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Burger, Neil) Modified on 3/28/2012, to remove filer (rf). [Transferred from Texas Western on 6/12/2012.] (Entered: 03/27/2012)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 3/22/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                          ADVISORY TO THE COURT by Guadalupe Acosta, Alfredo Ruiz Trust, Asociacion Latino Americana de Supermercados, A.C., Ivonne Avila, Amanda Ballesteros, Andres Banuelos, Felipe Benavides, Blancia Aida Neyda Ruiz de Villaseno R. Trust, Francisco Casas, Deportista Trust, Nicolas Ferrer, Manual Figueroa, Michael Gale, Julian A. Garcia, Alba Giraldo, Gustavo Gomez, Mary Green, Jardines del Santo Cristo de Saltillo Trust, Jesus Mauricio Cagigas Adalid Trust, Jesus Nieto Trust, Homero Karras, Jorge Karras, Aurora Kawas, Rafael Lemus, Alberto Leon, Jacobo Lichi, Raul Lopez, Margarito Lozano, M Y M Generaciones Trust, Maria de la Luz Majul Ballesteros Trust, Luis Martinez, Carmen Mata, Leticia Mendoza, Michoacan Trust, Morumbi Trust, Neyda Alexandra Villasenor Ruiz Trust, Negib Nieto, Samuel Oldak, Fernando Perez, Pedro Ramirez, Leonard Rapoport, Maria Rivera, Yolanda Rocha, Said Enrique Majul Madrid Trust, Monica Sansores, Luis Santana, Maria Santana, Luz Sobrino, Daniel Toiber. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit "A")(Snyder, Edward) [Transferred from Texas Western on 6/12/2012.] (Entered: 03/22/2012)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 3/13/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                            ADVISORY TO THE COURT by Guadalupe Acosta, Alfredo Ruiz Trust, Asociacion Latino Americana de Supermercados, A.C., Ivonne Avila, Amanda Ballesteros, Andres Banuelos, Felipe Benavides, Blancia Aida Neyda Ruiz de Villaseno R. Trust, Francisco Casas, Deportista Trust, Nicolas Ferrer, Manual Figueroa, Michael Gale, Julian A. Garcia, Alba Giraldo, Gustavo Gomez, Mary Green, Jardines del Santo Cristo de Saltillo Trust, Jesus Mauricio Cagigas Adalid Trust, Jesus Nieto Trust, Homero Karras, Jorge Karras, Aurora Kawas, Rafael Lemus, Alberto Leon, Jacobo Lichi, Raul Lopez, Margarito Lozano, M Y M Generaciones Trust, Maria de la Luz Majul Ballesteros Trust, Luis Martinez, Carmen Mata, Leticia Mendoza, Michoacan Trust, Morumbi Trust, Neyda Alexandra Villasenor Ruiz Trust, Negib Nieto, Samuel Oldak, Fernando Perez, Pedro Ramirez, Leonard Rapoport, Maria Rivera, Yolanda Rocha, Said Enrique Majul Madrid Trust, Monica Sansores, Luis Santana, Maria Santana, Luz Sobrino, Daniel Toiber. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit "A")(Snyder, Edward) [Transferred from Texas Western on 6/12/2012.] (Entered: 03/13/2012)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 3/5/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                              REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by Proskauer Rose LLP, re 16 MOTION to Stay Case filed by Defendant Proskauer Rose LLP (Burger, Neil) [Transferred from Texas Western on 6/12/2012.] (Entered: 03/05/2012)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 2/21/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                ORDER GRANTING 14 Motion of Rajesh James to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Orlando L. Garcia. (rf) [Transferred from Texas Western on 6/12/2012.] (Entered: 02/21/2012)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 2/21/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                  ORDER GRANTING 13 Motion of Daniel J. Schwartz to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Orlando L. Garcia. (rf ) [Transferred from Texas Western on 6/12/2012.] (Entered: 02/21/2012)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 2/21/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                    ORDER GRANTING 12 Motion of James Rouhandeh to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Orlando L. Garcia. (rf) [Transferred from Texas Western on 6/12/2012.] (Entered: 02/21/2012)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 2/20/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                      APPENDIX to 17 Response to Motion,,,, by Guadalupe Acosta, Alfredo Ruiz Trust, Asociacion Latino Americana de Supermercados, A.C., Ivonne Avila, Amanda Ballesteros, Andres Banuelos, Felipe Benavides, Blancia Aida Neyda Ruiz de Villaseno R. Trust, Francisco Casas, Deportista Trust, Nicolas Ferrer, Manual Figueroa, Michael Gale, Julian A. Garcia, Alba Giraldo, Gustavo Gomez, Mary Green, Jardines del Santo Cristo de Saltillo Trust, Jesus Mauricio Cagigas Adalid Trust, Jesus Nieto Trust, Homero Karras, Jorge Karras, Aurora Kawas, Rafael Lemus, Alberto Leon, Jacobo Lichi, Raul Lopez, Margarito Lozano, M Y M Generaciones Trust, Maria de la Luz Majul Ballesteros Trust, Luis Martinez, Carmen Mata, Leticia Mendoza, Michoacan Trust, Morumbi Trust, Neyda Alexandra Villasenor Ruiz Trust, Negib Nieto, Samuel Oldak, Fernando Perez, Pedro Ramirez, Leonard Rapoport, Maria Rivera, Yolanda Rocha, Said Enrique Majul Madrid Trust, Monica Sansores, Luis Santana, Maria Santana, Luz Sobrino, Daniel Toiber. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix 1-50)(Snyder, Edward) [Transferred from Texas Western on 6/12/2012.] (Entered: 02/20/2012)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 2/20/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                        RESPONSE to Motion, filed by Guadalupe Acosta, Alfredo Ruiz Trust, Asociacion Latino Americana de Supermercados, A.C., Ivonne Avila, Amanda Ballesteros, Andres Banuelos, Felipe Benavides, Blancia Aida Neyda Ruiz de Villaseno R. Trust, Francisco Casas, Deportista Trust, Nicolas Ferrer, Manual Figueroa, Michael Gale, Julian A. Garcia, Alba Giraldo, Gustavo Gomez, Mary Green, Jardines del Santo Cristo de Saltillo Trust, Jesus Mauricio Cagigas Adalid Trust, Jesus Nieto Trust, Homero Karras, Jorge Karras, Aurora Kawas, Rafael Lemus, Alberto Leon, Jacobo Lichi, Raul Lopez, Margarito Lozano, M Y M Generaciones Trust, Maria de la Luz Majul Ballesteros Trust, Luis Martinez, Carmen Mata, Leticia Mendoza, Michoacan Trust, Morumbi Trust, Neyda Alexandra Villasenor Ruiz Trust, Negib Nieto, Samuel Oldak, Fernando Perez, Pedro Ramirez, Leonard Rapoport, Maria Rivera, Yolanda Rocha, Said Enrique Majul Madrid Trust, Monica Sansores, Luis Santana, Maria Santana, Luz Sobrino, Daniel Toiber, re 16 MOTION to Stay Case filed by Defendant Proskauer Rose LLP (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Snyder, Edward) [Transferred from Texas Western on 6/12/2012.] (Entered: 02/20/2012)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 2/14/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                          MOTION to Stay Case by Proskauer Rose LLP. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Burger, Neil) [Transferred from Texas Western on 6/12/2012.] (Entered: 02/14/2012)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 2/14/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                            Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 10 Opposed MOTION to Remand to State Court (Plaintiffs Opposed Motion to Remand and Brief In Support Thereof)Opposed MOTION to Remand to State Court (Plaintiffs Opposed Motion to Remand and Brief In Support Thereof)Opposed MOTION to Remand to State Court (Plaintiffs Opposed Motion to Remand and Brief In Support Thereof)Opposed MOTION to Remand to State Court (Plaintiffs Opposed Motion to Remand and Brief In Support Thereof)Opposed MOTION to Remand to State Court (Plaintiffs Opposed Motion to Remand and Brief In Support Thereof) by Proskauer Rose LLP. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Proposed Order)(Burger, Neil) [Transferred from Texas Western on 6/12/2012.] (Entered: 02/14/2012)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 2/14/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                              MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Neil R. Burger for Rajesh James ( Filing fee $ 25 receipt number 0542-4326759) by on behalf of Proskauer Rose LLP. (Burger, Neil) [Transferred from Texas Western on 6/12/2012.] (Entered: 02/14/2012)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 2/14/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Neil R. Burger for Daniel J. Schwartz ( Filing fee $ 25 receipt number 0542-4326745) by on behalf of Proskauer Rose LLP. (Burger, Neil) [Transferred from Texas Western on 6/12/2012.] (Entered: 02/14/2012)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 2/14/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                  MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Neil R. Burger for James Rouhandeh ( Filing fee $ 25 receipt number 0542-4326723) by on behalf of Proskauer Rose LLP. (Burger, Neil) [Transferred from Texas Western on 6/12/2012.] (Entered: 02/14/2012)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 2/13/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Filing (PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF FILING OF OPPOSITION TO CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER WITH JUDICIAL PANEL ON MULTIDISTRICT LITIGATION) by Guadalupe Acosta, Alfredo Ruiz Trust, Asociacion Latino Americana de Supermercados, A.C., Ivonne Avila, Amanda Ballesteros, Andres Banuelos, Felipe Benavides, Blancia Aida Neyda Ruiz de Villaseno R. Trust, Francisco Casas, Deportista Trust, Nicolas Ferrer, Manual Figueroa, Michael Gale, Julian A. Garcia, Alba Giraldo, Gustavo Gomez, Mary Green, Jardines del Santo Cristo de Saltillo Trust, Jesus Mauricio Cagigas Adalid Trust, Jesus Nieto Trust, Homero Karras, Jorge Karras, Aurora Kawas, Rafael Lemus, Alberto Leon, Jacobo Lichi, Raul Lopez, Margarito Lozano, M Y M Generaciones Trust, Maria de la Luz Majul Ballesteros Trust, Luis Martinez, Carmen Mata, Leticia Mendoza, Michoacan Trust, Morumbi Trust, Neyda Alexandra Villasenor Ruiz Trust, Negib Nieto, Samuel Oldak, Fernando Perez, Pedro Ramirez, Leonard Rapoport, Maria Rivera, Yolanda Rocha, Said Enrique Majul Madrid Trust, Monica Sansores, Luis Santana, Maria Santana, Luz Sobrino, Daniel Toiber (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit "1")(Snyder, Edward) [Transferred from Texas Western on 6/12/2012.] (Entered: 02/13/2012)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 2/3/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                      Opposed MOTION to Remand to State Court (Plaintiffs Opposed Motion to Remand and Brief In Support Thereof) by Guadalupe Acosta, Alfredo Ruiz Trust, Asociacion Latino Americana de Supermercados, A.C., Ivonne Avila, Amanda Ballesteros, Andres Banuelos, Felipe Benavides, Blancia Aida Neyda Ruiz de Villaseno R. Trust, Francisco Casas, Deportista Trust, Nicolas Ferrer, Manual Figueroa, Michael Gale, Julian A. Garcia, Alba Giraldo, Gustavo Gomez, Mary Green, Jardines del Santo Cristo de Saltillo Trust, Jesus Mauricio Cagigas Adalid Trust, Jesus Nieto Trust, Homero Karras, Jorge Karras, Aurora Kawas, Rafael Lemus, Alberto Leon, Jacobo Lichi, Raul Lopez, Margarito Lozano, M Y M Generaciones Trust, Maria de la Luz Majul Ballesteros Trust, Luis Martinez, Carmen Mata, Leticia Mendoza, Michoacan Trust, Morumbi Trust, Neyda Alexandra Villasenor Ruiz Trust, Negib Nieto, Samuel Oldak, Fernando Perez, Pedro Ramirez, Leonard Rapoport, Maria Rivera, Yolanda Rocha, Said Enrique Majul Madrid Trust, Monica Sansores, Luis Santana, Maria Santana, Luz Sobrino, Daniel Toiber. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Snyder, Edward) [Transferred from Texas Western on 6/12/2012.] (Entered: 02/03/2012)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 2/2/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                      Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Move, or Otherwise Respond by Proskauer Rose LLP. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Burger, Neil) [Transferred from Texas Western on 6/12/2012.] (Entered: 02/02/2012)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 1/30/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                        CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Chadbourne & Parke LLP of Corporate Disclosure Statement 3 Notice (Other) (Sims, Bill) [Transferred from Texas Western on 6/12/2012.] (Entered: 01/30/2012)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 1/30/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                          DEFICIENCY NOTICE: ***NOTIFIED COUNSEL THAT DOCUMENT IS DEFICIENT - MISSING CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE**** re 4 Disclosure Statement (Rule 7) (rf) [Transferred from Texas Western on 6/12/2012.] (Entered: 01/30/2012)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 1/30/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                            DEFICIENCY NOTICE: ***NOTIFIED COUNSEL THAT DOCUMENT IS DEFICIENT - MISSING CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE**** re 3 Notice (rf) [Transferred from Texas Western on 6/12/2012.] (Entered: 01/30/2012)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 1/27/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                              CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Spencer C. Barasch, Chadbourne & Parke LLP, Proskauer Rose LLP, Thomas V. Sjoblom 1 Notice of Removal,,, (Burger, Neil) [Transferred from Texas Western on 6/12/2012.] (Entered: 01/27/2012)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 1/27/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                ****DOCUMENT IS SUFFICIENT ****RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Proskauer Rose LLP. (Burger, Neil) Modified on 1/30/2012, to designate deficiency (rf). Modified on 1/30/2012, to reflect document is sufficient (rf). [Transferred from Texas Western on 6/12/2012.] (Entered: 01/27/2012)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 1/27/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                  ***DOCUMENT IS DEFICIENT - MISSING CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE***NOTICE Defendant Chadbourne & Parke LLP's Corporate Disclosure Statement by Chadbourne & Parke LLP (Sims, Bill) Modified on 1/30/2012, to designate deficiency (rf). [Transferred from Texas Western on 6/12/2012.] (Entered: 01/27/2012)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 1/27/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                    Letter directed to Kip Mendrygal regarding admittance to the bar. (rf) [Transferred from Texas Western on 6/12/2012.] (Entered: 01/27/2012)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 1/27/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Chadbourne & Parke LLP, Proskauer Rose LLP, Spencer C. Barasch, Thomas V. Sjoblom (Filing fee $350 receipt number 0542-4280964), filed by Chadbourne & Parke LLP, Proskauer Rose LLP, Spencer C. Barasch, Thomas V. Sjoblom. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Supplement, # 3 Exhibit 1-Index of Attachments, # 4 Exhibit 2, # 5 Exhibit 3, # 6 Exhibit 4, # 7 Exhibit 5, # 8 Exhibit 6, # 9 Exhibit 7, # 10 Exhibit 8, # 11 Exhibit 9, # 12 Exhibit 10, # 13 Exhibit 11, # 14 Exhibit 12, # 15 Exhibit 13, # 16 Exhibit 14, # 17 Exhibit 15, # 18 Exhibit 16, # 19 Exhibit 17, # 20 Exhibit 18, # 21 Exhibit 19, # 22 Exhibit 20, # 23 Exhibit 21, # 24 Exhibit 22, # 25 Exhibit 23)(Burger, Neil) [Transferred from Texas Western on 6/12/2012.] (Entered: 01/27/2012)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                        Statistics

                                                                                                                                        This case has been viewed 246 times.

                                                                                                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                        Space
                                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                         
                                                                                                                                        PlainSite
                                                                                                                                        Sign Up
                                                                                                                                        Need Password Help?