Giaraputo v. Xerox Corporation
Appeal Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit, Case No. 13-1658

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 25, 2017 at 3:41 AM ST (4.3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Nature of Suit 3450 - Interstate Commerce
  Entries (8) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 9/29/2014, Entered: None
JUDGMENT MANDATE, ISSUED.[1330860] [13-1658] [Entered: 09/29/2014 10:36 AM]
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 9/8/2014, Entered: None
    JUDGMENT, FILED.[1314337] [13-1658]
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 9/8/2014, Entered: None
      NEW CASE MANAGER, Ralph Obas, ASSIGNED.[1313641] [13-1658]
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Blank 126 Filed: 9/8/2014, Entered: None
        OPINION, affirming the district court's grant of summary judgment in favor of Defendants, by DJ, RSP, C. Reiss, FILED. [1313636] [13-1658]
        LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 2/25/2014, Entered: None
        NOTICE OF HEARING DATE ACKNOWLEDGMENT, on behalf of Appellant IBEW Local 164 Welfare Fund, FILED. Service date 02/25/2014 by CM/ECF. [1164561] [13-1658]
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 2/19/2014, Entered: None
          NOTICE OF HEARING DATE ACKNOWLEDGMENT, on behalf of Appellee Xerox Corporation, FILED. Service date 02/19/2014 by CM/ECF. [1160229] [13-1658]
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 2/14/2014, Entered: None
            ARGUMENT NOTICE, to attorneys/parties, TRANSMITTED.[1157515] [13-1658]
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 1/14/2014, Entered: None
              ORAL ARGUMENT STATEMENT LR 34.1 (a), on behalf of filer Attorney Mr. Brad N. Friedman, Esq. for Appellant IBEW Local 164 Welfare Fund, FILED. Service date 01/14/2014 by CM/ECF. [1133396] [13-1658]
                Request RequestSpace LREF

                Statistics

                This case has been viewed 41 times.

                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                Space
                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                 
                PlainSite
                Sign Up
                Need Password Help?