J & J Sports Productions, Inc. v. Montes
Federal Civil Lawsuit Arkansas Western District Court, Case No. 4:14-cv-04115

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 13, 2019 at 5:55 PM ST (2.4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Citation Section 47 U.S.C. § 0553
Nature of Suit Cable/Satellite TV
  Entries (40) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 4/12/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
JUDGMENT in favor of J & J Sports Productions, Inc. against La Fogata of Haynesville, LLC, Jesus Montes in the amount of $12,332.44 (Default judgment - $8,000.00; attorney's fees and costs - $4,332.44.) Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on April 12, 2016. (mll)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 4/12/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    ORDER granting in part and denying in part 38 Motion for Attorney Fees and Costs in the amount of $4,332.44. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on April 12, 2016. (mll)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 3/2/2016, Entered: None Attorney Fees
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 2/17/2016, Entered: None Judgment - Default
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 2/17/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          ORDER granting 29 MOTION to Strike 28 Answer to Amended Complaint. Defendant Jesus Montes' Answer is hereby struck from the record. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on February 17, 2016. (mll)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 1/20/2016, Entered: None Reply
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 1/20/2016, Entered: None Memorandum Brief in Support
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 1/20/2016, Entered: None Leave to File Document
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 1/13/2016, Entered: None Memorandum Brief in Support
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 1/13/2016, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 11/9/2015, Entered: None Memorandum Brief in Support
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 11/9/2015, Entered: None Strike
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 10/19/2015, Entered: None Answer to Amended Complaint
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 9/21/2015, Entered: None Memorandum Brief in Support
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 9/18/2015, Entered: None Default Judgment
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 8/20/2015, Entered: None Clerk's Entry of Default
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 8/18/2015, Entered: None Affidavit in Support of Default
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 8/12/2015, Entered: None Notice of Default
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 8/5/2015, Entered: None Clerk to Enter Default
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 7/13/2015, Entered: None Summons Returned Executed
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 7/13/2015, Entered: None Summons Returned Executed
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 6/19/2015, Entered: None Final Scheduling Order
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 5/22/2015, Entered: None Summons Issued
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 5/22/2015, Entered: None Amended Complaint
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 5/15/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion for Leave to File
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 4/30/2015, Entered: None Memorandum Brief in Support
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 4/29/2015, Entered: None Leave to File Document
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 4/13/2015, Entered: None Stipulation
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 3/31/2015, Entered: None Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 1/22/2015, Entered: None Initial Scheduling Order
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 12/22/2014, Entered: None Jury Demand
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 12/22/2014, Entered: None Answer
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 12/5/2014, Entered: None Summons Returned Executed
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 12/5/2014, Entered: None Waiver of Service Executed
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 9/29/2014, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 9/10/2014, Entered: None Magistrate Notice/Consent Furnished
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 9/10/2014, Entered: None Summons Issued
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 9/10/2014, Entered: None Certificate
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 9/10/2014, Entered: None civil cover sheet
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 9/10/2014, Entered: None Complaint
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                  Statistics

                                                                                  This case has been viewed 6 times.

                                                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                  Space
                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                   
                                                                                  PlainSite
                                                                                  Sign Up
                                                                                  Need Password Help?