Jose G. Martinez v. Allstar Financial Services, Inc.
Federal Civil Lawsuit California Central District Court, Case No. 2:14-cv-04661

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated November 10, 2018 at 11:18 PM ST (2.6 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1442
Nature of Suit Truth in Lending
  Entries (8) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 6/5/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
JUDGMENT by Judge Margaret M. Morrow (MD JS-6, Case Terminated). The action is hereby dismissed. (ah)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 6/5/2015, Entered: None Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 5/12/2015, Entered: None Order
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 5/8/2015, Entered: None Dismiss Case
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 5/8/2015, Entered: None Order
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 10/9/2014, Entered: None Dismiss Case
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 9/26/2014, Entered: None Joint Report Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 9/10/2014, Entered: None Non-Opposition to Motion
                  Request RequestSpace LREF

                  Statistics

                  This case has been viewed 0 times.

                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                  Space
                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                   
                  PlainSite
                  Sign Up
                  Need Password Help?