Trump Entertainment Resorts, Inc.
Bankruptcy Case Delaware Bankruptcy Court, Case No. 14-12103
District Judge Kevin Gross, presiding

Tags
Last Updated October 30, 2020 at 11:04 AM DT (10.9 months ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors, Creditor Committee

Toggle Switch Represented by Gibbons PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Mark B Conlan +1 973 596 4545 +1 973 639 6356
Space David N Crapo +1 973 596 4500 +1 973 596 0545
Space Karen A. Giannelli +1 973 596 4505 +1 973 596 0545 kgiannelli@gibbonslaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of NATHAN A. SCHULTZ

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space NATHAN A. SCHULTZ +1 310 429 7128 +1 702 597 5503
No Logo Prime Clerk LLC, Notice and Claims Agent, Claims Agent
No Logo Prime Clerk, Notice and Claims Agent, Claims Agent
Trump Entertainment Resorts, Inc. Trump Entertainment Resorts, Inc., Debtor

Toggle Switch Represented by Stroock & Stroock & Lavan LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jennifer Arbuse +1 212 806 5400
Space Erez E. Gilad +1 212 806 5400 +1 212 806 6006 egilad@stroock.com
Space Kristopher Martin Hansen +1 212 806 6056 +1 212 806 6006 khansen@stroock.com
Space Curtis Campbell Mechling +1 212 806 5400 +2123 212 212 3006 cmechling@stroock.com
Space Kenneth Pasquale +1 212 806 5400 +1 212 806 6006 kpasquale@stroock.com
Space Gabriel Sasson +1 212 806 5400

Toggle Switch Represented by Young Conaway Stargatt & Taylor, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Ian J Bambrick +1 302 571 6600 ibambrick@ycst.com
Space Matthew Barry Lunn +1 302 571 6600 mlunn@ycst.com
Space Ashley E. Markow +1 302 571 6600 +1 302 571 1253
Space Robert F. Poppiti, Jr. +1 302 571 6600
Office of the United States Trustee Office of the United States Trustee, U.S. Trustee
Officially listed as "United States Trustee"

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of the United States Trustee

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jane M. Leamy +1 302 573 6491 +1 302 573 6497
  Entries (1219) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End

Since this appears to be a very large docket, we will only show 500 entries at at time.

Latest 500DividerNext 500DividerPrevious 500DividerEarliest 500

Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 2422 Filed: 10/30/2020, Entered: None ?
    LREF
    Blank 2407 Filed: 4/17/2020, Entered: None ?
      LREF
      Blank 2406 Filed: 4/15/2020, Entered: None ?
        LREF
        Blank 2396 Filed: 2/20/2020, Entered: None ?
          LREF
          Blank 2389 Filed: 1/26/2020, Entered: None ?
            LREF
            Blank 2388 Filed: 1/24/2020, Entered: None ?
              LREF
              Blank 2385 Filed: 1/15/2020, Entered: None ?
                LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1793 Filed: 12/18/2015, Entered: None
                Order Further Extending the Time Within Which the Debtors Must Assume or Reject a Certain Unexpired Lease of Nonresidential Real Property with the Prior Written Consent of the Lessor (R&R Associates) Under Such Lease (related document(s)668, 1115, 1386, 1601, 1791). Signed on 12/18/2015. (SJS) (Entered: 12/18/2015)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1792 Filed: 12/18/2015, Entered: None
                  Affidavit of Service of Steven Gordon Regarding Order Further Extending the Time Within Which the Debtors Must Assume or Reject a Certain Unexpired Lease of Nonresidential Real Property with the Prior Written Consent of the Lessor (Plaza Hotel Management Company) Under Such Lease. Filed by Prime Clerk. (related document(s)1789) (Smith, David) Modified docket text on 12/18/2015 (LMD). (Entered: 12/18/2015)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1791 Filed: 12/18/2015, Entered: None
                    Certification of Counsel Regarding Proposed Order Further Extending the Time Within Which the Debtors Must Assume or Reject a Certain Unexpired Lease of Nonresidential Real Property With the Prior Written Consent of the Lessor (R&R Associates) Under Such Lease (related document(s)668, 1115, 1386, 1601) Filed by Trump Entertainment Resorts, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 # 2 Exhibit 2) (Poppiti, Jr., Robert) (Entered: 12/18/2015)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1790 Filed: 12/17/2015, Entered: None
                      Certificate of No Objection regarding Fourteenth Monthly Application of Gibbons P.C. as Co-Counsel for the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors for Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses for the period October 1, 2015 to October 31, 2015 (related document(s)1752) Filed by OFFICIAL COMMITTEE OF UNSECURED CREDITORS. (Songonuga, Natasha) (Entered: 12/17/2015)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1789 Filed: 12/16/2015, Entered: None
                        Order Further Extending the Time Within Which the Debtors Must Assume or Reject a Certain Unexpired Lease of Nonresidential Real Property With the Prior Written Consent of the Lessor (Plaza Hotel Management Company) Under Such Lease (related document(s)1788) Order Signed on 12/16/2015. (LMD) (Entered: 12/16/2015)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1788 Filed: 12/16/2015, Entered: None
                          Certification of Counsel Regarding Proposed Order Further Extending the Time Within Which the Debtors Must Assume or Reject a Certain Unexpired Lease of Nonresidential Real Property With the Prior Written Consent of the Lessor (Plaza Hotel Management Company) Under Such Lease (related document(s)668, 967, 1344, 1596) Filed by Trump Entertainment Resorts, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1) (Poppiti, Jr., Robert) (Entered: 12/16/2015)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1787 Filed: 12/15/2015, Entered: None
                            Affidavit of Service of Jordan D. Searles Regarding Fourth Order Extending the Period Within Which the Debtors May Remove Actions. Filed by Prime Clerk. (related document(s)1777) (Smith, David) Modified docket text on 12/16/2015 (LMD). (Entered: 12/15/2015)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1786 Filed: 12/15/2015, Entered: None
                              Certificate of Service regarding Fifteenth Monthly Application of The Law Office of Nathan A. Schultz, P.C. as Co-Counsel for the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors for Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses for the Period from November 1, 2015 through November 30, 2015 (related document(s)1783) Filed by OFFICIAL COMMITTEE OF UNSECURED CREDITORS. (Songonuga, Natasha) (Entered: 12/15/2015)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1785 Filed: 12/15/2015, Entered: None
                                Monthly Application for Compensation (Fifteenth) for the period November 1, 2015 to November 30, 2015 Filed by Young Conaway Stargatt & Taylor, LLP. Objections due by 1/4/2016. (Attachments: # 1 Notice # 2 Exhibit A # 3 Exhibit B # 4 Exhibit C # 5 Affidavit of Service) (Lunn, Matthew) (Entered: 12/15/2015)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1784 Filed: 12/15/2015, Entered: None
                                  Monthly Application for Compensation (Seventh) for the period September 1, 2015 to November 30, 2015 Filed by Robbins, Russell, Englert, Orseck, Untereiner & Sauber LLP. Objections due by 1/4/2016. (Attachments: # 1 Notice # 2 Exhibit A # 3 Exhibit B # 4 Exhibit C # 5 Affidavit of Service) (Bambrick, Ian) (Entered: 12/15/2015)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1783 Filed: 12/15/2015, Entered: None
                                    Monthly Application for Compensation (Fifteenth) of The Law Office of Nathan A. Schultz, P.C. as Co-Counsel to the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors for Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses for the period November 1, 2015 to November 30, 2015 Filed by OFFICIAL COMMITTEE OF UNSECURED CREDITORS. Objections due by 1/4/2016. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A # 2 Exhibit B # 3 Notice) (Songonuga, Natasha) (Entered: 12/15/2015)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1782 Filed: 12/15/2015, Entered: None
                                      The transcriber has requested a standing order for all hearings in this case for the period 12/15/2015 to 12/29/2015. To obtain a copy of a transcript contact the transcriber Veritext . Telephone number 516-608-2400 . (AJL) (Entered: 12/15/2015)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1781 Filed: 12/14/2015, Entered: None
                                        Affidavit of Service of Steven Gordon Regarding Notice of Third Supplement to List of Ordinary Course Professionals, and Notice of Filing of Declaration of Disinterestedness of Ordinary Course Professional F.E. DiBacco, Inc.. Filed by Prime Clerk. (related document(s)1774, 1775) (Smith, David) Modified docket text on 12/14/2015 (LMD). (Entered: 12/14/2015)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1780 Filed: 12/11/2015, Entered: None
                                          Affidavit of Service of Steven Gordon Regarding Order Further Extending the Debtors Exclusive Periods to File a Chapter 11 Plan and Solicit Acceptances Thereto. Filed by Prime Clerk. (related document(s)1770) (Smith, David) Modified docket text on 12/11/2015 (LMD). (Entered: 12/11/2015)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1779 Filed: 12/10/2015, Entered: None
                                            Affidavit of Service of Steven Gordon Regarding Notice of Monthly Fee Application for the Thirteenth Monthly Application of Ernst & Young LLP for Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses as Auditors and Tax Advisors to the Debtors for the Period from October 1, 2015 through October 31, 2015. Filed by Prime Clerk. (related document(s)1768) (Steele, Benjamin) Modified docket text on 12/11/2015 (LMD). (Entered: 12/10/2015)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1778 Filed: 12/10/2015, Entered: None
                                              Certificate of No Objection Regarding Fourteenth Monthly Fee Application for the Period From October 1, 2015 Through October 31, 2015 (related document(s)1737) Filed by Stroock & Stroock & Lavan LLP. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Service) (Jacobs, Ashley) Modified docket text on 12/11/2015 (LMD). (Entered: 12/10/2015)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1777 Filed: 12/10/2015, Entered: None
                                                Order (Fourth) Pursuant to Bankruptcy Rules 9006 and 9027, Extending the Period Within Which the Debtors May Remove Actions Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1452 (related document(s)1748, 1771) Order Signed on 12/10/2015. (LMD) (Entered: 12/10/2015)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1776 Filed: 12/9/2015, Entered: None
                                                  Affidavit of Service of Jordan D. Searles Regarding Debtors' Application for an Order Authorizing the Retention and Employment of Merlin Law Group P.A. as Special Insurance Litigation Counsel, Nunc Pro Tune to October 29, 2015. Filed by Prime Clerk. (related document(s)1765) (Adler, Adam) Modified docket text on 12/10/2015 (LMD). (Entered: 12/09/2015)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1775 Filed: 12/9/2015, Entered: None
                                                    Notice of Filing of Declaration of Disinterestedness of Ordinary Course Professional F.E. DiBacco, Inc. (Objections Due By 12/23/15) (related document(s)76, 221) Filed by Trump Entertainment Resorts, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A) (Jacobs, Ashley) Modified docket text on 12/10/2015 (LMD). (Entered: 12/09/2015)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1774 Filed: 12/9/2015, Entered: None
                                                      Supplemental List of Ordinary Course Professionals (Objections Due By 12/23/15) (related document(s)221) Filed by Trump Entertainment Resorts, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1) (Jacobs, Ashley) (Entered: 12/09/2015)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1773 Filed: 12/9/2015, Entered: None
                                                        Affidavit of Service of Jordan D. Searles Regarding Order (I) Approving Further Amendment to the DIP Credit Agreement and (II) Further Amending the Final DIP Order on Account of Such Amendment. Filed by Prime Clerk. (related document(s)1762) (Adler, Adam) Modified docket text on 12/10/2015 (LMD). (Entered: 12/09/2015)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1772 Filed: 12/9/2015, Entered: None
                                                          Certificate of No Objection regarding Fourteenth Monthly Application of The Law Office of Nathan A. Schultz, P.C. as Co-Counsel to the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors for Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses for the period October 1, 2015 to October 31, 2015 (related document(s)1733) Filed by OFFICIAL COMMITTEE OF UNSECURED CREDITORS. (Songonuga, Natasha) (Entered: 12/09/2015)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1771 Filed: 12/9/2015, Entered: None
                                                            Certificate of No Objection Regarding Debtors' Fourth Motion for an Order, Pursuant to Bankruptcy Rules 9006 and 9027, Extending the Period Within Which the Debtors May Remove Actions Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1452 (related document(s)1748) Filed by Trump Entertainment Resorts, Inc.. (Poppiti, Jr., Robert) (Entered: 12/09/2015)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1770 Filed: 12/8/2015, Entered: None
                                                              Order Further Extending The Debtors' Exclusive Periods To File A Chapter 11 Plan And Solicit Acceptances Thereto. (related document(s)1743) Signed on 12/8/2015. (JAF) (Entered: 12/08/2015)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1769 Filed: 12/7/2015, Entered: None
                                                                Certificate of No Objection Regarding Debtors' Motion for Order Pursuant to Section 1121(d) of the Bankruptcy Code Further Extending the Exclusive Periods Within Which the Debtors May File a Chapter 11 Plan and Solicit Acceptances Thereof (related document(s)1743) Filed by Trump Entertainment Resorts, Inc.. (Poppiti, Jr., Robert) (Entered: 12/07/2015)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1768 Filed: 12/7/2015, Entered: None
                                                                  Monthly Application for Compensation (Thirteenth) for the period October 1, 2015 to October 31, 2015 Filed by Ernst & Young LLP. Objections due by 12/28/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Notice # 2 Exhibit A # 3 Exhibit B # 4 Affidavit of Service) (Bambrick, Ian) (Entered: 12/07/2015)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1767 Filed: 12/7/2015, Entered: None
                                                                    Motion to Compel Discovery of Electronic E-Discovery Pursuant to Rule 7026-3 Filed by Marilyn Mazzella. Hearing scheduled for 1/12/2016 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #3, Wilmington, Delaware. The case judge is Kevin Gross. Objections due by 1/5/2016. (NAL) (Entered: 12/07/2015)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1766 Filed: 12/4/2015, Entered: None
                                                                      Affidavit of Service of Steven Gordon Regarding Notice of the Fourteenth Monthly Fee Application of Young Conaway Stargatt & Taylor, LLP for Allowance of Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses as Co-Counsel to the Debtors and Debtors-in-Possession for the Period from October 1, 2015 through October 31, 2015. Filed by Prime Clerk. (related document(s)1759) (Smith, David) Modified docket text on 12/9/2015 (LMD). (Entered: 12/04/2015)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1765 Filed: 12/4/2015, Entered: None
                                                                        Application/Motion to Employ/Retain Merlin Law Group P.A. as Special Insurance Litigation Counsel Filed by Trump Entertainment Resorts, Inc.. Hearing scheduled for 1/12/2016 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #3, Wilmington, Delaware. Objections due by 12/18/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Notice # 2 Exhibit A # 3 Exhibit B # 4 Exhibit C # 5 Exhibit D) (Jacobs, Ashley) (Entered: 12/04/2015)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1764 Filed: 12/3/2015, Entered: None
                                                                          Affidavit of Service of Rafael Stitt Regarding Order Scheduling Omnibus Hearing Dates. Filed by Prime Clerk. (related document(s)1750) (Adler, Adam) Modified docket text on 12/9/2015 (LMD). (Entered: 12/03/2015)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1763 Filed: 12/3/2015, Entered: None
                                                                            HEARING CANCELLED/RESCHEDULED. Amended Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing. Filed by Trump Entertainment Resorts, Inc.. Hearing scheduled for 12/7/2015 at 02:00 PM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #3, Wilmington, Delaware. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Service) (Poppiti, Jr., Robert) Modified docket text on 12/3/2015 (LMD). (Entered: 12/03/2015)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1762 Filed: 12/3/2015, Entered: None
                                                                              Order (I) Approving Further Amendment to the DIP Credit Agreement and (II) Further Amending the Final DIP Order on Account of Such Amendment (Related Doc 565, 846, 1047, 1144, 1740). Order Signed on 12/3/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1) (NAL) Modified on 12/3/2015 to Add Related Docket Numbers (LB). (Entered: 12/03/2015)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1761 Filed: 12/3/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing Filed by Trump Entertainment Resorts, Inc.. Hearing scheduled for 12/7/2015 at 02:00 PM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #3, Wilmington, Delaware. (Poppiti, Jr., Robert) (Entered: 12/03/2015)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1760 Filed: 12/2/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                  Certificate of No Objection Regarding Debtors' Motion for an Order (I) Approving Further Amendment to the DIP Credit Agreement and (II) Further Amending the Final DIP Order on Account of Such Amendment (related document(s)1740) Filed by Trump Entertainment Resorts, Inc.. (Poppiti, Jr., Robert) (Entered: 12/02/2015)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1759 Filed: 12/2/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                    Monthly Application for Compensation (Fourteenth) for the period October 1, 2015 to October 31, 2015 Filed by Young Conaway Stargatt & Taylor, LLP. Objections due by 12/22/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Notice # 2 Exhibit A # 3 Exhibit B # 4 Exhibit C # 5 Affidavit of Service) (Lunn, Matthew) (Entered: 12/02/2015)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1758 Filed: 12/1/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                      The transcriber has requested a standing order for all hearings in this case for the period 12/1/2015 to 12/15/2015. To obtain a copy of a transcript contact the transcriber, Veritext, Telephone number (888)706-4576. (BJM) (Entered: 12/01/2015)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1757 Filed: 11/30/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                        Certificate of No Objection Regarding Twelfth Monthly Fee Application for the Period From September 1, 2015 Through September 30, 2015 (related document(s)1686) Filed by Ernst & Young LLP. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Service) (Lunn, Matthew) (Entered: 11/30/2015)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1756 Filed: 11/30/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                          Certificate of Service regarding Fourteenth Monthly Application of Gibbons P.C. as Co-Counsel for the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors for Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses for the Period from October 1, 2015 through October 31, 2015 (related document(s)1752) Filed by OFFICIAL COMMITTEE OF UNSECURED CREDITORS. (Songonuga, Natasha) (Entered: 11/30/2015)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1755 Filed: 11/27/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                            Affidavit of Service of Richard M. Allen Regarding Debtors' Fourth Motion for an Order Extending the Period Within Which the Debtors May Remove Actions. Filed by Prime Clerk. (related document(s)1748) (Steele, Benjamin) Modified docket text on 11/30/2015 (LMD). (Entered: 11/27/2015)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1754 Filed: 11/25/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                              Certificate of No Objection Regarding Thirteenth Monthly Fee Application for the Period From September 1, 2015 Through September 30, 2015 (related document(s)1683) Filed by Stroock & Stroock & Lavan LLP. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Service) (Jacobs, Ashley) (Entered: 11/25/2015)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1753 Filed: 11/25/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                Affidavit of Service of Richard M. Allen Regarding Notice of Debtors' Motion for an Order (I) Approving Further Amendment to the DIP Credit Agreement and (II) Further Amending the Final DIP Order on Account of Such Amendment, Order Granting the City of Atlantic City's Motion for Relief from the Automatic Stay, and Debtors' Motion for Order Further Extending the Exclusive Periods Within Which the Debtors May File a Chapter 11 Plan and Solicit Acceptances Thereof. Filed by Prime Clerk. (related document(s)1740, 1741) (Smith, David) Modified docket text on 11/25/2015 (LMD). (Entered: 11/25/2015)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1752 Filed: 11/25/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                  Monthly Application for Compensation (Fourteenth) of Gibbons P.C. as Co-Counsel for the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors for Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses for the period October 1, 2015 to October 31, 2015 Filed by OFFICIAL COMMITTEE OF UNSECURED CREDITORS. Objections due by 12/15/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A # 2 Exhibit B # 3 Notice) (Songonuga, Natasha) (Entered: 11/25/2015)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1751 Filed: 11/25/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                    Debtor-In-Possession Monthly Operating Report for Filing Period October 1, 2015 to October 31, 2015 Filed by Trump Entertainment Resorts, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Service) (Poppiti, Jr., Robert) (Entered: 11/25/2015)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1750 Filed: 11/24/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                      Order Scheduling Omnibus Hearings. All hearings will be held at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #3, Wilmington, Delaware . Omnibus Hearings scheduled for 1/12/2016 at 10:00 AM., 2/16/2016 at 10:00 AM. Signed on 11/24/2015. (SS) (Entered: 11/24/2015)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1749 Filed: 11/23/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                        Affidavit of Service of Jordan D. Searles Regarding Order (I) Approving Further Amendment to the DIP Credit Agreement and (II) Further Amending the Final DIP Order on Account of Such Amendment, and Fourteenth Monthly Application of Stroock & Stroock & Lavan LLP as Counsel for the Debtors and Debtors-in-Possession for Allowance of Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses Incurred for the Interim Period from October 1, 2015 Through and Including October 31, 2015. Filed by Prime Clerk. (related document(s)1735, 1737) (Smith, David) Modified docket text on 11/23/2015 (LMD). (Entered: 11/23/2015)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1748 Filed: 11/23/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                          Motion to Extend the Period Within Which the Debtors May Remove Actions Filed by Trump Entertainment Resorts, Inc.. Hearing scheduled for 1/12/2016 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #3, Wilmington, Delaware. Objections due by 12/7/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Notice # 2 Exhibit A) (Poppiti, Jr., Robert) (Entered: 11/23/2015)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1747 Filed: 11/20/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                            Affidavit of Service of Steven Gordon Regarding Notice of Rescheduled Omnibus Hearing. Filed by Prime Clerk. (related document(s)1732) (Adler, Adam) Modified docket text on 11/23/2015 (LMD). (Entered: 11/20/2015)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1746 Filed: 11/20/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                              Receipt of filing fee for Motion for Relief From Stay (B)(14-12103-KG) [motion,mrlfsty] ( 176.00). Receipt Number 7805152, amount $ 176.00. (U.S. Treasury) (Entered: 11/20/2015)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1745 Filed: 11/20/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                Motion for Relief from Stay (FEE) and/or for Relief from Discharge and Plan Injunction and/or for Abstention to Liquidate Claim and for Related Relief. Fee Amount $176. Filed by Robert Torres. Hearing scheduled for 12/10/2015 at 03:00 PM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #3, Wilmington, Delaware. Objections due by 12/3/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 # 2 Notice # 3 Proposed Form of Order # 4 Certificate of Service) (Loizides, Christopher) (Entered: 11/20/2015)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1744 Filed: 11/19/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                  Certificate of No Objection regarding 12th Monthly Application of PricewaterhouseCoopers LLP for Compensation of Services Rendered and Reimbursement of Expenses as Financial Advisor for the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors for the period September 1, 2015 to September 30, 2015 (related document(s)1667) Filed by OFFICIAL COMMITTEE OF UNSECURED CREDITORS. (Songonuga, Natasha) (Entered: 11/19/2015)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1743 Filed: 11/19/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                    Motion to Extend Exclusivity Period for Filing a Chapter 11 Plan and Disclosure Statement Filed by Trump Entertainment Resorts, Inc.. Hearing scheduled for 1/12/2016 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #3, Wilmington, Delaware. Objections due by 12/3/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Notice # 2 Exhibit A) (Poppiti, Jr., Robert) (Entered: 11/19/2015)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1742 Filed: 11/19/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                      Certification of Counsel Regarding Order Scheduling Omnibus Hearing Dates Filed by Trump Entertainment Resorts, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A) (Poppiti, Jr., Robert) (Entered: 11/19/2015)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1741 Filed: 11/19/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                        Order Granting the City of Atlantic City's Motion for Relief From the Automatic Stay Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Section 362(d) (related document(s)1716, 1738) Order Signed on 11/19/2015. (LMD) (Entered: 11/19/2015)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1740 Filed: 11/19/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                          Debtors' Motion for an Order (I) Approving Further Amendment to the DIP Credit Agreement and (II) Further Amending the Final DIP Order on Account of Such Amendment (related document(s)565, 846, 1054, 1144) Filed by Trump Entertainment Resorts, Inc.. Hearing scheduled for 12/7/2015 at 02:00 PM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #3, Wilmington, Delaware. Objections due by 11/30/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Notice # 2 Exhibit A) (Poppiti, Jr., Robert) Modified docket text on 11/19/2015 (LMD). (Entered: 11/19/2015)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1739 Filed: 11/19/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                            HEARING CANCELLED/RESCHEDULED. Amended Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing. Filed by Trump Entertainment Resorts, Inc.. Hearing scheduled for 11/20/2015 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #3, Wilmington, Delaware. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Service) (Poppiti, Jr., Robert) Modified docket text on 11/19/2015 (LMD). (Entered: 11/19/2015)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1738 Filed: 11/19/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                              Certification of Counsel Regarding Atlantic City's Motion for Relief From the Automatic Stay Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Section 362(d) (related document(s)1716) Filed by Trump Entertainment Resorts, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 # 2 Exhibit 2) (Poppiti, Jr., Robert) (Entered: 11/19/2015)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1737 Filed: 11/18/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                Monthly Application for Compensation (Fourteenth) for the period October 1, 2015 to October 31, 2015 Filed by Stroock & Stroock & Lavan LLP. Objections due by 12/8/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Notice # 2 Exhibit A # 3 Exhibit B # 4 Exhibit C # 5 Affidavit of Service) (Jacobs, Ashley) (Entered: 11/18/2015)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1736 Filed: 11/18/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                  Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing Filed by Trump Entertainment Resorts, Inc.. Hearing scheduled for 11/20/2015 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #3, Wilmington, Delaware. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Service) (Poppiti, Jr., Robert) (Entered: 11/18/2015)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1735 Filed: 11/18/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                    Order (I) Approving Further Amendment to the DIP Credit Agreement and (II) Further Amending the Final DIP Order on Account of Such Amendment (related document(s)565, 846, 1047, 1144, 1693, 1731) Order Signed on 11/18/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit "1&2") (LMD) (Entered: 11/18/2015)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1734 Filed: 11/17/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                      Certificate of Service regarding Fourteenth Monthly Application of The Law Office of Nathan A. Schultz, P.C. as Co-Counsel to the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors for Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses for the period October 1, 2015 to October 31, 2015 (related document(s)1733) Filed by OFFICIAL COMMITTEE OF UNSECURED CREDITORS. (Songonuga, Natasha) (Entered: 11/17/2015)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1733 Filed: 11/17/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                        Monthly Application for Compensation (Fourteenth) of The Law Office of Nathan A. Schultz, P.C. as Co-Counsel to the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors for Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses for the period October 1, 2015 to October 31, 2015 Filed by OFFICIAL COMMITTEE OF UNSECURED CREDITORS. Objections due by 12/7/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A # 2 Notice) (Songonuga, Natasha) (Entered: 11/17/2015)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1732 Filed: 11/17/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                          Notice of Rescheduled Omnibus Hearing on December 10, 2015 at 3:00 p.m. (ET) Rescheduled to December 7, 2015 at 2:00 p.m. (ET) Filed by Trump Entertainment Resorts, Inc.. (Poppiti, Jr., Robert) Modified docket text on 11/17/2015 (LMD). (Entered: 11/17/2015)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1731 Filed: 11/17/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                            Certificate of No Objection Regarding Debtors' Motion for an Order (I) Approving Further Amendment to the DIP Credit Agreement and (II) Further Amending the Final DIP Order on Account of Such Amendment (related document(s)1693) Filed by Trump Entertainment Resorts, Inc.. (Poppiti, Jr., Robert) (Entered: 11/17/2015)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1730 Filed: 11/17/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                              The transcriber has requested a standing order for all hearings in this case for the period 11/17/2015 to 12/1/2015. To obtain a copy of a transcript contact the transcriber, Veritext, Telephone number (888)706-4576. (BJM) (Entered: 11/17/2015)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1729 Filed: 11/16/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                Affidavit of Service (related document(s)1716, 1718, 1719, 1721, 1722) Filed by City of Atlantic City. (Chipman, William) Modified docket text on 11/17/2015 (LMD). (Entered: 11/16/2015)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1728 Filed: 11/16/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                  Affidavit of Service of Jordan D. Searles Regarding Order Approving Interim Fee Requests of the Debtors' Professionals for the Period from June 1, 2015 through August 31, 2015. Filed by Prime Clerk. (related document(s)1713) (Smith, David) Modified docket text on 11/16/2015 (LMD). (Entered: 11/16/2015)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1727 Filed: 11/14/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                    BNC Certificate of Mailing. (related document(s)1715) Notice Date 11/14/2015. (Admin.) (Entered: 11/15/2015)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1726 Filed: 11/13/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                      Notice of Withdrawal of Certification of No Objection Regarding Twelfth Monthly Application of Pricewaterhouse Coopers LLP for Compensation for Services Rendered and Reimbursement of Expenses as Financial Advisor to the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors for the Period from September 1, 2015 through September 30, 2015 (related document(s)1725) Filed by OFFICIAL COMMITTEE OF UNSECURED CREDITORS. (Songonuga, Natasha) (Entered: 11/13/2015)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1725 Filed: 11/13/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                        WITHDRAWN 11/16/2015 (related docket 1726) Certificate of No Objection regarding PricewaterhouseCoopers LLP Twelfth Monthly Application for Compensation of Services Rendered and Reimbursement of Expenses as Financial Advisor for the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors for the period September 1, 2015 to September 30, 2015 (related document(s)1667) Filed by OFFICIAL COMMITTEE OF UNSECURED CREDITORS. (Songonuga, Natasha) Modified docket text on 11/16/2015 (LMD). Modified docket text on 11/19/2015 (LMD). (Entered: 11/13/2015)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1724 Filed: 11/13/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                          Certificate of No Objection regarding Gibbons P.C. Thirteenth Monthly Fee Application as Co-Counsel for the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors for the period September 1, 2015 to September 30, 2015 (related document(s)1659) Filed by OFFICIAL COMMITTEE OF UNSECURED CREDITORS. (Songonuga, Natasha) (Entered: 11/13/2015)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1723 Filed: 11/12/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                            Affidavit of Service of Jordan D. Searles Regarding Order Further Extending the Time Within Which the Debtors Must Assume or Reject a Certain Unexpired Lease of Nonresidential Real Property with the Prior Written Consent of the Lessor Under Such Lease. Filed by Prime Clerk. (related document(s)1706) (Adler, Adam) Modified docket text on 11/16/2015 (LMD). (Entered: 11/12/2015)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1722 Filed: 11/12/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                              Notice of Hearing Regarding Application in Support of Motion for Relief from the Automatic Stay (related document(s)1716, 1718, 1719, 1721) Filed by City of Atlantic City. Hearing scheduled for 11/20/2015 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #3, Wilmington, Delaware. Objections due by 11/19/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Motion for Relief # 2 Exhibit B - Stinson Declaration # 3 Exhibit C - Motion to Shorten # 4 Exhibit D - Order to Shorten) (Chipman, William) (Entered: 11/12/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1721 Filed: 11/12/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                Order Granting the Motion for an Order Shortening Time for Notice of the Hearing to Consider the Motion of the City of Atlantic City for Relief from the Automatic Stay. (Related Doc 1719)(related document(s)1716, 1719) Order Signed on 11/12/2015. (GM) Modified docket text on 11/16/2015 (LMD). (Entered: 11/12/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1720 Filed: 11/12/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                  Order Granting Motion of First Lien Parties for Leave to File a Supplemental Objection to Motion of Unite Here Health for Allowance of Administrative Claim (related document(s)1689). Signed on 11/10/2015. (SJS) (Modified Date Order Signed on 11/13/2015 (JohnstonJ, Julie). (Entered: 11/12/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1719 Filed: 11/12/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                    Motion to Shorten Time for Notice of the Hearing to Consider Motion for Relief from the Automatic Stay (related document(s)1716) Filed by City of Atlantic City. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Form of Order) (Chipman, William) (Entered: 11/12/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1718 Filed: 11/12/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                      Declaration of Michael P. Stinson in Support of Motion for Relief from the Automatic Stay (related document(s)1716) Filed by City of Atlantic City. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A # 2 Exhibit B) (Chipman, William) Modified Text on 11/13/2015 (LB). (Entered: 11/12/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1717 Filed: 11/12/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                        Receipt of filing fee for Motion for Relief From Stay (B)(14-12103-KG) [motion,mrlfsty] ( 176.00). Receipt Number 7794291, amount $ 176.00. (U.S. Treasury) (Entered: 11/12/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1716 Filed: 11/12/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                          Motion for Relief from Stay (FEE) . Fee Amount $176. Filed by City of Atlantic City. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Form of Order) (Chipman, William) (Entered: 11/12/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1715 Filed: 11/12/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                            Transcript regarding Hearing Held 11/10/2015 RE: Omnibus/Fees/Claims Objections. Remote electronic access to the transcript is restricted until 2/10/2016. The transcript may be viewed at the Bankruptcy Court Clerk's Office. [For information about how to contact the transcriber, call the Clerk's Office] or [Contact the Court Reporter/Transcriber Veritext, Telephone number (888)706-4576.] (RE: related document(s) 1705). Notice of Intent to Request Redaction Deadline Due By 11/19/2015. Redaction Request Due By 12/3/2015. Redacted Transcript Submission Due By 12/14/2015. Transcript access will be restricted through 2/10/2016. (BJM) (Entered: 11/12/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1714 Filed: 11/10/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                              Order Granting the Fourth Interim Quarterly Applications of all Professionals for the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Trump Entertainment Resorts, Inc., et al for Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses for the Period from June 2015 through August 2015 (related document(s)1641, 1642, 1643, 1704) Order Signed on 11/10/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit "A") (LMD) (Entered: 11/10/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1713 Filed: 11/10/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                Order Approving Interim Fee Requests of the Debtors' Professionals for the period from June 1, 2015 to August 31, 2015 (related document(s)1640) Order Signed on 11/10/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit "A") (LMD) (Entered: 11/10/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1712 Filed: 11/10/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                  Minutes of Hearing held on: 11/10/2015 Subject: Claim Objections;OMNIBUS HEARING; INTERIM FEE APPLICATIONS ;. (vCal Hearing ID (204410)). (related document(s) 1705) (SS) Additional attachment(s) added on 11/10/2015 (SS). (Entered: 11/10/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1711 Filed: 11/10/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                    Affidavit of Service of Steven Gordon Regarding Notice of Filing of Amendment to Exit Facility Commitment Letter, and Notice of Debtors' Motion for an Order (I) Approving Further Amendment to the DIP Credit Agreement and (II) Further Amending the Final DIP Order on Account of Such Amendment. Filed by Prime Clerk. (related document(s)1692, 1693) (Adler, Adam) Modified docket text on 11/10/2015 (LMD). (Entered: 11/10/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1710 Filed: 11/10/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                      Affidavit of Service of Jordan D. Searles Regarding Witness and Exhibit Lists and Deposition Designations Concerning the Hearing on the Motion of United Here Health for Allowance of Administrative Claim. Filed by Prime Clerk. (related document(s)1696) (Adler, Adam) Modified docket text on 11/10/2015 (LMD). (Entered: 11/10/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1709 Filed: 11/10/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                        Certificate of No Objection Regarding Thirteenth Monthly Fee Application for the Period From September 1, 2015 Through September 30, 2015 (related document(s)1649) Filed by Young Conaway Stargatt & Taylor, LLP. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Service) (Jacobs, Ashley) (Entered: 11/10/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1708 Filed: 11/9/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                          Affidavit of Service of Steven Gordon Regarding Notice of Twelfth Monthly Fee Application of Ernst & Young LLP for Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses as Auditors and Tax Advisors to the Debtors for the Period from September 1, 2015 through September 30, 2015. Filed by Prime Clerk. (related document(s)1686) (Steele, Benjamin) Modified docket text on 11/10/2015 (LMD). (Entered: 11/09/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1707 Filed: 11/9/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                            Order Granting and Sustaining the Thirteenth Omnibus (Non-Substantive) Objection to Certain (A) Duplicate Claims, (B) No Documentation Claims, and (C) Late Filed Claims(related document(s)1586, 1691) Signed on 11/9/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit "1-3") (LMD) (Entered: 11/09/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1706 Filed: 11/9/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                              Order Further Extending the Time Within Which the Debtors Must Assume or Reject a Certain Unexpired Lease of Nonresidential Real Property With the Prior Written Consent of the Lessor Under Such Lease (related document(s)668, 1116, 1495, 1694) Order Signed on 11/9/2015. (LMD) (Entered: 11/09/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1705 Filed: 11/9/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                Amended Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing Filed by Trump Entertainment Resorts, Inc.. Hearing scheduled for 11/10/2015 at 11:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #3, Wilmington, Delaware. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A # 2 Affidavit of Service) (Poppiti, Jr., Robert) (Entered: 11/09/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1704 Filed: 11/9/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Certification of Counsel regarding Fourth Interim Fee Applications Filed by Professionals to the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors (related document(s)1641, 1642, 1643) Filed by OFFICIAL COMMITTEE OF UNSECURED CREDITORS. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Proposed Order) (Songonuga, Natasha) (Entered: 11/09/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1703 Filed: 11/6/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Certificate of No Objection regarding Thirteenth Monthly Application of The Law Office of Nathan A. Schultz, P.C. as Co-Counsel to the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors for Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses for the Period from to September 1, 2015 through September 30, 2015 (related document(s)1646) Filed by OFFICIAL COMMITTEE OF UNSECURED CREDITORS. (Songonuga, Natasha) (Entered: 11/06/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1702 Filed: 11/6/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Affidavit of Service (related document(s)1697) Filed by Trump Entertainment Resorts, Inc.. (Poppiti, Jr., Robert) Modified docket text on 11/6/2015 (LMD). (Entered: 11/06/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1701 Filed: 11/6/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Affidavit of Service of Joshua L. Karotkin Regarding Findings of Fact, Conclusions of Law, and Order Confirming Debtors' Third Amended Joint Plan of Reorganization. Filed by Prime Clerk. (related document(s)1123) (Steele, Benjamin) Modified docket text on 11/6/2015 (LMD). (Entered: 11/06/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1700 Filed: 11/6/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Order Granting First Lien Parties' Motion to Shorten Notice of the Motion Of First Lien Parties For Leave To File A Supplemental Objection To Motion Of Unite Here Health For Allowance Of Administrative Claim (related document(s)1689, 1690) Order Signed on 11/6/2015. (LMD) (Entered: 11/06/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1699 Filed: 11/6/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Affidavit of Service of Jordan D. Searles Regarding Order Authorizing the Sale of a Certain Miscellaneous Asset Outside the Ordinary Course of Business Free and Clear of all Liens, Claims, Interests and Encumbrances; Order Scheduling Omnibus Hearing Date; and Notice of Thirteenth Monthly Application of Stroock & Stroock & Lavan LLP as Counsel for the Debtors and Debtors-in-Possession for Allowance of Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses Incurred for the Interim Period from September 1, 2015 Through and Including September 30, 2015. Filed by Prime Clerk. (related document(s)1678, 1680, 1683) (Steele, Benjamin) Modified docket text on 11/6/2015 (LMD). (Entered: 11/06/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1698 Filed: 11/6/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Affidavit of Service (related document(s)1695) Filed by Trump Entertainment Resorts, Inc.. (Poppiti, Jr., Robert) Modified docket text on 11/6/2015 (LMD). (Entered: 11/06/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1697 Filed: 11/6/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing Filed by Trump Entertainment Resorts, Inc.. Hearing scheduled for 11/10/2015 at 11:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #3, Wilmington, Delaware. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A) (Poppiti, Jr., Robert) (Entered: 11/06/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1696 Filed: 11/6/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Witness and Exhibit Lists and Deposition Designations Concerning the Hearing on the Motion of Unite Here Health for Allowance of Administrative Claim Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Section 503(b)(1)(A) (related document(s)759, 1302, 1305, 1624, 1672) Filed by Trump Entertainment Resorts, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits D-1 Through D-8 # 2 Exhibits U-1 Through U-7 # 3 Exhibit D/U-1) (Poppiti, Jr., Robert) Modified docket text on 11/6/2015 (LMD). (Entered: 11/06/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1695 Filed: 11/6/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Supplement to Fourth Interim Fee Request (related document(s)1640) Filed by Stroock & Stroock & Lavan LLP. (Poppiti, Jr., Robert) Modified docket text on 11/6/2015 (LMD). (Entered: 11/06/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1694 Filed: 11/6/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Certification of Counsel Regarding Proposed Order Further Extending the Time Within Which the Debtors Must Assume or Reject a Certain Unexpired Lease of Nonresidential Real Property With the Prior Written Consent of the Lessor Under Such Lease (related document(s)668, 1116, 1495) Filed by Trump Entertainment Resorts, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1) (Poppiti, Jr., Robert) (Entered: 11/06/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1693 Filed: 11/5/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Debtors' Motion for an Order (I) Approving Further Amendment to the DIP Credit Agreement and (II) Further Amending the Final DIP Order on Account of Such Amendment (related document(s)565, 846, 1054, 1144) Filed by Trump Entertainment Resorts, Inc.. Hearing scheduled for 12/10/2015 at 03:00 PM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #3, Wilmington, Delaware. Objections due by 11/12/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Notice # 2 Exhibit A) (Poppiti, Jr., Robert) Modified docket text on 11/6/2015 (LMD). (Entered: 11/05/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1692 Filed: 11/5/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Notice of Filing of Amendment to Exit Facility Commitment Letter Filed by Trump Entertainment Resorts, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A) (Poppiti, Jr., Robert) Modified docket text on 11/6/2015 (LMD). (Entered: 11/05/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1691 Filed: 11/5/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Certification of Counsel regarding Thirteenth Omnibus (Non-Substantive) Objection to Certain (A) Duplicate Claims, (B) No Documentation Claims, and (C) Late Filed Claims (related document(s)1586) Filed by OFFICIAL COMMITTEE OF UNSECURED CREDITORS. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Proposed Order # 2 Exhibit B - Redlined Proposed Order) (Songonuga, Natasha) (Entered: 11/05/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1690 Filed: 11/5/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              First Lien Parties' Motion to Shorten Notice of the Motion Of First Lien Parties For Leave To File A Supplemental Objection To Motion Of Unite Here Health For Allowance Of Administrative Claim [Requested Hearing] (related document(s)1689) Filed by First Lien Parties. Hearing scheduled for 11/10/2015 at 11:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #3, Wilmington, Delaware. Objections due by 11/10/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A) (Remming, Andrew) Modified docket text on 11/6/2015 (LMD). (Entered: 11/05/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1689 Filed: 11/5/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Motion for Leave Motion Of First Lien Parties For Leave To File A Supplemental Objection To Motion Of Unite Here Health For Allowance Of Administrative Claim (related document(s)759, 1302, 1305, 1624, 1672) Filed by First Lien Parties. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A # 2 Exhibit B) (Remming, Andrew) (Entered: 11/05/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1688 Filed: 11/5/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Notice of Service of the Debtors' First Request for Production of Documents to AmeriHealth Casualty Insurance Company and the Debtors' Notice of Deposition of AmeriHealth Casualty Insurance Company Filed by Trump Entertainment Resorts, Inc.. (Poppiti, Jr., Robert) (Entered: 11/05/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1687 Filed: 11/4/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Certificate of No Objection Regarding Eleventh Monthly Fee Application for the Period From August 1, 2015 Through August 31, 2015 (related document(s)1636) Filed by Ernst & Young LLP. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Service) (Jacobs, Ashley) (Entered: 11/04/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1686 Filed: 11/4/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Monthly Application for Compensation (Twelfth) for the period September 1, 2015 to September 30, 2015 Filed by Ernst & Young LLP. Objections due by 11/24/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Notice # 2 Exhibit A # 3 Exhibit B # 4 Affidavit of Service) (Bambrick, Ian) (Entered: 11/04/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1685 Filed: 11/4/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Notice of Service of First Lien Parties' (I) Reply And Joinder In Debtors' Motion To Reject The Amerihealth Agreements And (II) Opposition To Amerihealth's Request For Payment Of Debtors' Reimbursement Obligations (related document(s)1682) Filed by First Lien Parties. (Attachments: # 1 Service List) (Remming, Andrew) (Entered: 11/04/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1684 Filed: 11/4/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Supplement to Fourth Interim Fee Request (related document(s)1640) Filed by Young Conaway Stargatt & Taylor, LLP. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Service) (Lunn, Matthew) Modified docket text on 11/5/2015 (LMD). (Entered: 11/04/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1683 Filed: 11/3/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Monthly Application for Compensation (Thirteenth) for the period September 1, 2015 to September 30, 2015 Filed by Stroock & Stroock & Lavan LLP. Objections due by 11/23/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Notice # 2 Exhibit A # 3 Exhibit B # 4 Exhibit C # 5 Affidavit of Service) (Jacobs, Ashley) (Entered: 11/03/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1682 Filed: 11/3/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              First Lien Parties' (I) Reply And Joinder In Debtors' Motion To Reject The Amerihealth Agreements And (II) Opposition To Amerihealth's Request For Payment Of Debtors' Reimbursement Obligations (related document(s)1492, 1602, 1616, 1661, 1681) Filed by First Lien Parties (Remming, Andrew) Modified docket text on 11/5/2015 (LMD). (Entered: 11/03/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1681 Filed: 11/3/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Objection (Preliminary) to AmeriHealth Casualty Insurance Company's Request for Payment of the Debtors' Reimbursement Obligations and Reservation of Rights for Future Obligations Under the Self Insurance Program (related document(s)1661) Filed by Trump Entertainment Resorts, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Service) (Poppiti, Jr., Robert) (Entered: 11/03/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1680 Filed: 11/3/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Order Scheduling Omnibus Hearings. All hearings will be held at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #3, Wilmington, Delaware. Omnibus Hearing scheduled for 12/10/2015 at 03:00 PM. Signed on 11/3/2015. (SS) Modified docket text on 11/3/2015 (LMD). (Entered: 11/03/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1679 Filed: 11/3/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Notice of Service of Reservation Of Rights Of First Lien Parties With Respect To Fourth Interim Applications For Compensation By Estate Professionals (related document(s)1676) Filed by First Lien Parties. (Attachments: # 1 Service List) (Remming, Andrew) (Entered: 11/03/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1678 Filed: 11/2/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Order Authorizing the Sale of a Certain Miscellaneous Asset Outside the Ordinary Course of Business Free and Clear of All Liens, Claims, Interests and Encumbrances Pursuant to Section 363 of the Bankruptcy Code (related document(s)224, 1673) Order Signed on 11/2/2015. (LMD) (Entered: 11/03/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1677 Filed: 11/3/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        The transcriber has requested a standing order for all hearings in this case for the period 11/3/2015 to 11/17/2015. To obtain a copy of a transcript contact the transcriber, Veritext, Telephone number (888)706-4576. (BJM) (Entered: 11/03/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1676 Filed: 11/2/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Reservation of Rights Of First Lien Parties With Respect To Fourth Interim Applications For Compensation By Estate Professionals (related document(s)1640, 1641, 1642, 1643) Filed by First Lien Agent, First Lien Lenders. (Remming, Andrew) (Entered: 11/02/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1675 Filed: 11/2/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Certification of Counsel Regarding Order Scheduling Omnibus Hearing Date Filed by Trump Entertainment Resorts, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A) (Poppiti, Jr., Robert) (Entered: 11/02/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1674 Filed: 11/2/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Affidavit of Service of Jordan D. Searles Regarding Notice of Fourth Quarterly Statement of Payments Made to Ordinary Course Professionals During the Period from July 1, 2015 through September 30, 2015. Filed by Prime Clerk. (related document(s)1671) (Smith, David) Modified docket text on 11/2/2015 (LMD). (Entered: 11/02/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1673 Filed: 11/2/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Certification of Counsel With Respect to the Proposed Order Authorizing the Sale of a Certain Miscellaneous Asset Outside the Ordinary Course of Business Free and Clear of All Liens, Claims, Interests and Encumbrances Pursuant to Section 363 of the Bankruptcy Code (related document(s)224) Filed by Trump Entertainment Resorts, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1) (Poppiti, Jr., Robert) (Entered: 11/02/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1672 Filed: 10/30/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Response to Objection to Claim . Filed by Unite Here Health. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A) (related document(s)1624) (Burkley, Kirk) (Entered: 10/30/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1671 Filed: 10/30/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Notice of Fourth Quarterly Statement of Payments Made to Ordinary Course Professionals During the Period From July 1, 2015 Through September 30, 2015 Filed by Trump Entertainment Resorts, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A) (Jacobs, Ashley) Modified docket text on 11/2/2015 (LMD). (Entered: 10/30/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1670 Filed: 10/30/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Certificate of No Objection regarding Eleventh Monthly Fee Application of PricewaterhouseCoopers as Financial Advisor to the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors for the period August 1, 2015 to August 31, 2015 (related document(s)1620) Filed by OFFICIAL COMMITTEE OF UNSECURED CREDITORS. (Songonuga, Natasha) (Entered: 10/30/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1669 Filed: 10/30/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Debtor-In-Possession Monthly Operating Report for Filing Period September 1, 2015 to September 30, 2015 Filed by Trump Entertainment Resorts, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Service) (Poppiti, Jr., Robert) (Entered: 10/30/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1668 Filed: 10/28/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Certificate of Service regarding Twelfth Monthly Application for Compensation of PricewaterhouseCoopers LLP for Compensation of Services Rendered and Reimbursement of Expenses as Financial Advisor for the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors for the period September 1, 2015 to September 30, 2015 (related document(s)1667) Filed by OFFICIAL COMMITTEE OF UNSECURED CREDITORS. (Songonuga, Natasha) (Entered: 10/28/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1667 Filed: 10/28/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Monthly Application for Compensation of PricewaterhouseCoopers LLP for Compensation of Services Rendered and Reimbursement of Expenses as Financial Advisor for the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors for the period September 1, 2015 to September 30, 2015 Filed by OFFICIAL COMMITTEE OF UNSECURED CREDITORS. Objections due by 11/17/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A # 2 Exhibit B # 3 Exhibit C # 4 Notice) (Songonuga, Natasha) (Entered: 10/28/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1666 Filed: 10/26/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Certificate of Service (related document(s)1661, 1662) Filed by AmeriHealth Casualty Insurance Company. (Leonhardt, Scott) (Entered: 10/26/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1665 Filed: 10/23/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance as Counsel and Request for Removal from Electronic and Paper Noticing Matrix Filed by First Lien Parties. (Remming, Andrew) (Entered: 10/23/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1664 Filed: 10/22/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Order Limiting Notice With Respect To AmeriHealth Casualty Insurance Company's Request For Payment Of The Debtors' Reimbursement Obligations And Reservation Of Rights For Future Obligations Under The Self Insurance Program. (Related Doc # 1662)(related document(s)1661) Order Signed on 10/22/2015. (BJM) (Entered: 10/22/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1663 Filed: 10/22/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Affidavit of Service of Jordan D. Searles Regarding Notice of Thirteenth Monthly Application of Young Conaway Stargatt & Taylor, LLP for Allowance of Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses as Co-Counsel to the Debtors and Debtors-in-Possession for the Period from September 1, 2015 through September 30, 2015. Filed by Prime Clerk. (related document(s)1649) (Adler, Adam) Modified docket text on 10/22/2015 (LMD). (Entered: 10/22/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1662 Filed: 10/21/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Motion to Limit Notice with Respect to the Request for Payment of the Debtors' Reimbursement Obligations and Reservation of Rights for Future Obligations Under the Self Insurance Program (related document(s)1661) Filed by AmeriHealth Casualty Insurance Company. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Form of Order) (Leonhardt, Scott) (Entered: 10/21/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1661 Filed: 10/21/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request for Payment of the Debtors' Reimbursement Obligations and Reservation of Rights for Future Obligations Under the Self Insurance Program Filed by AmeriHealth Casualty Insurance Company. Hearing scheduled for 11/10/2015 at 11:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #3, Wilmington, Delaware. Objections due by 11/3/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Proposed Form of Order # 2 Exhibit B - Unpaid Invoices # 3 Notice) (Leonhardt, Scott) Modified docket text on 10/22/2015 (LMD). (Entered: 10/21/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1660 Filed: 10/21/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Certificate of Service regarding Thirteenth Monthly Application of Gibbons P.C. as Co-Counsel for the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors for Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses for the Period from September 1, 2015 through September 30, 2015 (related document(s)1659) Filed by OFFICIAL COMMITTEE OF UNSECURED CREDITORS. (Songonuga, Natasha) (Entered: 10/21/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1659 Filed: 10/21/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Monthly Application for Compensation (Thirteenth) of Gibbons P.C. as Co-Counsel for the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors for Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses for the period September 1, 2015 to September 30, 2015 Filed by OFFICIAL COMMITTEE OF UNSECURED CREDITORS. Objections due by 11/10/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A # 2 Exhibit B # 3 Notice) (Songonuga, Natasha) (Entered: 10/21/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1658 Filed: 10/20/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              The transcriber has requested a standing order for all hearings in this case for the period 10/20/2015 to 11/3/2015. To obtain a copy of a transcript contact the transcriber, Veritext, Telephone number (888)706-4576. (BJM) (Entered: 10/20/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1657 Filed: 10/19/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Affidavit/Declaration of Mailing of Jordan D. Searles Regarding Fourth Interim Quarterly Fee Requests of Debtors' Professionals. Filed by Prime Clerk. (related document(s)1640) (Steele, Benjamin) (Entered: 10/19/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1656 Filed: 10/19/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Response to Notice of Thirteenth Omnibus Objection to Certain Claims. (related document(s)1586) Filed by Thomas and Vanessa Dunn (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit "A" # 2 Exhibit "B" # 3 Exhibit "C" # 4 Exhibit "D" # 5 Exhibit "E" # 6 Exhibit "F" # 7 Exhibit "G" # 8 Exhibit "H") (LMD) (Entered: 10/19/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1655 Filed: 10/19/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Notice of Hearing regarding Thirteenth Monthly Fee Application of The Law Office of Nathan A. Schultz, P.C. as Co-Counsel to the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors for Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses for the period September 1, 2015 to September 30, 2015 (related document(s)1646) Filed by OFFICIAL COMMITTEE OF UNSECURED CREDITORS. Objections due by 11/4/2015. (Songonuga, Natasha) (Entered: 10/19/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1654 Filed: 10/19/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Response to Notice of Thirteenth Omnibus Objection to Certain Claims. (related document(s)1586) Filed by Frank Vanness (LMD) (Entered: 10/19/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1653 Filed: 10/16/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Affidavit/Declaration of Mailing of Jordan D. Searles Regarding Second Amended Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing on October 13, 2015 at 2:00 P.M. and Eleventh Monthly Application of Ernst & Young LLP for Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses as Auditors and Tax Advisors to the Debtors for the Period from August 1, 2015 Through August 31, 2015. Filed by Prime Clerk. (related document(s)1632, 1636) (Adler, Adam) (Entered: 10/16/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1652 Filed: 10/16/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Response to Notice of Thirteenth Omnibus Objection Filed by Luigi Noverati and Julia Noverati (SH) (Entered: 10/16/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1651 Filed: 10/16/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Response of Thomas and Vanessa Dunn/Bruno, Gerbino & Soriano LLP to Debtors Thirteenth Omnibus Objection to Claims Filed by Thomas and Vanessa Dunn (Attachments: # 1 Attachments) (SH) (Entered: 10/16/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1650 Filed: 10/16/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Quarterly Claims Register (Alphabetical and Numerical). Filed by Prime Clerk. (Attachments: # 1 Quarterly Claims Register (Numerical)) (Steele, Benjamin) Modified on 10/19/2015 (SH). (Entered: 10/16/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1649 Filed: 10/16/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Monthly Application for Compensation (Thirteenth) for the period September 1, 2015 to September 30, 2015 Filed by Young Conaway Stargatt & Taylor, LLP. Objections due by 11/5/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Notice # 2 Exhibit A # 3 Exhibit B # 4 Exhibit C # 5 Affidavit of Service) (Lunn, Matthew) (Entered: 10/16/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1648 Filed: 10/15/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Certificate of Service regarding Thirteenth Monthly Application of The Law Office of Nathan A. Schultz, P.C. as Co-Counsel for the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors for Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses for the Period from September 1, 2015 through September 30, 2015 (related document(s)1646) Filed by OFFICIAL COMMITTEE OF UNSECURED CREDITORS. (Songonuga, Natasha) (Entered: 10/15/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1647 Filed: 10/15/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Certificate of Service regarding Fourth Interim Quarterly Fee Applications of the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors Professionals (related document(s)1641, 1642, 1643, 1644) Filed by OFFICIAL COMMITTEE OF UNSECURED CREDITORS. (Songonuga, Natasha) (Entered: 10/15/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1646 Filed: 10/15/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Monthly Application for Compensation (Thirteenth) of The Law Office of Nathan A. Schultz, P.C. as Co-Counsel to the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors for Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses for the period September 1, 2015 to September 30, 2015 Filed by OFFICIAL COMMITTEE OF UNSECURED CREDITORS. Objections due by 11/4/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A # 2 Exhibit B) (Songonuga, Natasha) (Entered: 10/15/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1645 Filed: 10/15/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Certificate of No Objection regarding Twelfth Monthly Application of Gibbons, P.C. as Co-Counsel for the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors for Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses for the Period from August 1, 2015 through August 31, 2015 (related document(s)1593) Filed by OFFICIAL COMMITTEE OF UNSECURED CREDITORS. (Songonuga, Natasha) (Entered: 10/15/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1644 Filed: 10/15/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Notice of Hearing - Fourth Interim Quarterly Fee Applications of the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors' Professionals (related document(s)1628, 1641, 1642, 1643) Filed by OFFICIAL COMMITTEE OF UNSECURED CREDITORS. Hearing scheduled for 11/10/2015 at 11:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #3, Wilmington, Delaware. Objections due by 11/5/2015. (Songonuga, Natasha) (Entered: 10/15/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1643 Filed: 10/15/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Interim Application for Compensation (Fourth) of Law Office of Nathan A. Schultz, P.C. as Co-Counsel for the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors for Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses for the period June 1, 2015 to August 31, 2015 Filed by OFFICIAL COMMITTEE OF UNSECURED CREDITORS. Hearing scheduled for 11/10/2015 at 11:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #3, Wilmington, Delaware. Objections due by 11/5/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A # 2 Exhibit B # 3 Exhibit C # 4 Exhibit D) (Songonuga, Natasha) Modified text on 10/15/2015 (LCN). (Entered: 10/15/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1642 Filed: 10/15/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Interim Application for Compensation (Fourth) of Gibbons P.C. as Co-Counsel for the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors for Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses for the period June 1, 2015 to August 31, 2015 Filed by OFFICIAL COMMITTEE OF UNSECURED CREDITORS. Hearing scheduled for 11/10/2015 at 11:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #3, Wilmington, Delaware. Objections due by 11/5/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A # 2 Exhibit B # 3 Exhibit C) (Songonuga, Natasha) (Entered: 10/15/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1641 Filed: 10/15/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Amended Application for Compensation (Fourth Interim) of Pricewaterhouse Coopers as Financial Advisor for the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors for Compensation for Services Rendered and Reimbursement of Expenses for the period June 1, 2015 to August 31, 2015 - AMENDED Solely to Correct Objection and Hearing Dates (related document(s)1628) Filed by OFFICIAL COMMITTEE OF UNSECURED CREDITORS. Hearing scheduled for 11/10/2015 at 11:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #3, Wilmington, Delaware. Objections due by 11/5/2015. (Songonuga, Natasha) (Entered: 10/15/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1640 Filed: 10/14/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Quarterly Application for Compensation for the period June 1, 2015 to August 31, 2015 Filed by Ernst & Young LLP, Robbins, Russell, Englert, Orseck, Untereiner & Sauber LLP, Stroock & Stroock & Lavan LLP, Young Conaway Stargatt & Taylor, LLP. Hearing scheduled for 11/10/2015 at 11:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #3, Wilmington, Delaware. Objections due by 11/3/2015. (Poppiti, Jr., Robert) (Entered: 10/14/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1639 Filed: 10/14/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Affidavit/Declaration of Service (related document(s)1637, 1638) Filed by Trump Entertainment Resorts, Inc.. (Jacobs, Ashley) (Entered: 10/14/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1638 Filed: 10/14/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Certificate of No Objection Regarding Sixth Monthly Fee Application for the Period From July 1, 2015 Through August 31, 2015 (related document(s)1595) Filed by Robbins, Russell, Englert, Orseck, Untereiner & Sauber LLP. (Jacobs, Ashley) (Entered: 10/14/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1637 Filed: 10/14/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Certificate of No Objection Regarding Twelfth Monthly Fee Application for the Period From August 1, 2015 Through August 31, 2015 (related document(s)1589) Filed by Stroock & Stroock & Lavan LLP. (Jacobs, Ashley) (Entered: 10/14/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1636 Filed: 10/13/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Monthly Application for Compensation (Eleventh) for the period August 1, 2015 to August 31, 2015 Filed by Ernst & Young LLP. Objections due by 11/2/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Notice # 2 Exhibit A # 3 Exhibit B # 4 Affidavit of Service) (Bambrick, Ian) (Entered: 10/13/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1635 Filed: 10/13/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Receipt of filing fee for Motion for Relief From Stay (B)(14-12103-KG) [motion,mrlfsty] ( 176.00). Receipt Number 7755015, amount $ 176.00. (U.S. Treasury) (Entered: 10/13/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1634 Filed: 10/13/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Motion of Nicklaus Genuardi for Relief from the Automatic Stay --. Fee Amount $176. Filed by Nicklaus Genuardi. Hearing scheduled for 11/10/2015 at 11:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #3, Wilmington, Delaware. Objections due by 10/28/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Form of Order # 2 Notice # 3 Certificate of Service # 4 Service List) (Klauder, David) Modified on 10/14/2015 (SH). (Entered: 10/13/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1633 Filed: 10/13/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Affidavit/Declaration of Mailing of Jordan D. Searles Regarding Order Scheduling Omnibus Hearing Date. Filed by Prime Clerk. (related document(s)1623) (Steele, Benjamin) (Entered: 10/13/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1632 Filed: 10/13/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  HEARING CANCELLED/RESCHEDULED. Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing. Filed by Trump Entertainment Resorts, Inc.. Hearing scheduled for 10/13/2015 at 02:00 PM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #3, Wilmington, Delaware. (Poppiti, Jr., Robert) (Entered: 10/13/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1631 Filed: 10/12/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Affidavit/Declaration of Mailing of Jordan D. Searles Regarding Debtors' Supplemental Objection to Motion of Unite Here Health for Allowance of Administrative Claim. Filed by Prime Clerk. (related document(s)1624) (Adler, Adam) (Entered: 10/12/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1630 Filed: 10/12/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Response to Objection to Claim . Filed by Dimple Khullar. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate # 2 Exhibit A # 3 Exhibit B # 4 Exhibit C # 5 Exhibit D # 6 Certificate of Service # 7 Proposed Form of Order) (related document(s)1586) (Campbell, Robert) (Entered: 10/12/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1629 Filed: 10/9/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Certificate of Service regarding Fourth Interim Application of PricewaterhouseCoopers LLP as Financial Advisor to the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors for Compensation for Services Rendered and Reimbursement of Expenses for the Period of June 1, 2015 through August 31, 2015 (related document(s)1628) Filed by OFFICIAL COMMITTEE OF UNSECURED CREDITORS. (Songonuga, Natasha) (Entered: 10/09/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1628 Filed: 10/9/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Interim Application for Compensation (Fourth) of PricewaterhouseCoopers LLP as Financial Advisor for the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors for Compensation for Services Rendered and Reimbursement of Expenses for the period June 1, 2015 to August 31, 2015 Filed by OFFICIAL COMMITTEE OF UNSECURED CREDITORS. Hearing scheduled for 11/10/2015 at 11:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #3, Wilmington, Delaware. Objections due by 10/29/2015. (Songonuga, Natasha) (Entered: 10/09/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1627 Filed: 10/8/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Certificate of No Objection Regarding Twelfth Monthly Fee Application for the Period From August 1, 2015 Through August 31, 2015 (related document(s)1584) Filed by Young Conaway Stargatt & Taylor, LLP. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Service) (Jacobs, Ashley) (Entered: 10/08/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1626 Filed: 10/8/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Amended Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing Filed by Trump Entertainment Resorts, Inc.. Hearing scheduled for 10/13/2015 at 02:00 PM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #3, Wilmington, Delaware. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Service) (Poppiti, Jr., Robert) (Entered: 10/08/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1625 Filed: 10/8/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing Filed by Trump Entertainment Resorts, Inc.. Hearing scheduled for 10/13/2015 at 02:00 PM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #3, Wilmington, Delaware. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Service) (Poppiti, Jr., Robert) (Entered: 10/08/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1624 Filed: 10/8/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Supplemental Objection to Motion of Unite Here Health for Allowance of Administrative Claim Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. § 503(b)(1)(A) (related document(s)759, 1302) Filed by Trump Entertainment Resorts, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A # 2 Exhibit B # 3 Exhibit C # 4 Exhibit D # 5 Exhibit E # 6 Exhibit F) (Poppiti, Jr., Robert) (Entered: 10/08/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1623 Filed: 10/8/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Order Scheduling Omnibus Hearing. All hearings will be held at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #3, Wilmington, Delaware. Omnibus Hearing scheduled for 11/10/2015 at 11:00 AM. Signed on 10/8/2015. (SS) (Entered: 10/08/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1622 Filed: 10/7/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Certificate of Mailing of Jordan D. Searles Regarding Order Authorizing the Debtors to Expand the Scope of their Retention of Ernst & Young LLP as Auditors and Tax Advisors. Filed by Prime Clerk. (related document(s)1610) (Steele, Benjamin) (Entered: 10/07/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1621 Filed: 10/7/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Certificate of Service regarding Eleventh Monthly Application of PricewaterhouseCoopers LLC as Financial Advisor for the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors for Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses for the Period from August 1, 2015 through August 31, 2015 (related document(s)1620) Filed by OFFICIAL COMMITTEE OF UNSECURED CREDITORS. (Songonuga, Natasha) (Entered: 10/07/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1620 Filed: 10/7/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Application for Compensation (Eleventh) of PricewaterhouseCoopers as Financial Advisor to the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors for the period August 1, 2015 to August 31, 2015 Filed by OFFICIAL COMMITTEE OF UNSECURED CREDITORS. Objections due by 10/27/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A # 2 Exhibit B # 3 Exhibit C) (Songonuga, Natasha) (Entered: 10/07/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1619 Filed: 10/7/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Certificate of No Objection regarding Twelfth Monthly Application of The Law Office of Nathan A. Schultz, P.C. as Co-Counsel to the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors for Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses for the Period from to August 1, 2015 through August 31, 2015 (related document(s)1575) Filed by OFFICIAL COMMITTEE OF UNSECURED CREDITORS. (Songonuga, Natasha) (Entered: 10/07/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1618 Filed: 10/7/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Certificate of Service re: Limited Objection and Reservation of Rights of the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors with Respect to Debtors' Motion for Entry of an Order, Pursuant to Sections 105(a) and 365(a) of the Bankruptcy Code, (A) Authorizing the Debtors to Reject the AmeriHealth Agreements, Nunc Pro Tunc to the Rejection Effective Date and (B) Granting Related Relief (related document(s)1616) Filed by OFFICIAL COMMITTEE OF UNSECURED CREDITORS. (Songonuga, Natasha) (Entered: 10/07/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1617 Filed: 10/7/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Certification of Counsel Regarding Order Scheduling Omnibus Hearing Date Filed by Trump Entertainment Resorts, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A) (Poppiti, Jr., Robert) (Entered: 10/07/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1616 Filed: 10/7/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Limited Objection and Reservation of Rights of the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors with Respect to Debtors' Motion for Entry of an Order, Pursuant to Sections 105(a) and 365(a) of the Bankruptcy Code, (A) Authorizing the Debtors to Reject the AmeriHealth Agreements, Nunc Pro Tunc to the Rejection Effective Date and (B) Granting Related Relief Filed by OFFICIAL COMMITTEE OF UNSECURED CREDITORS (related document(s)1602, 1492). (Songonuga, Natasha) Modified on 10/9/2015 (SH). (Entered: 10/07/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1615 Filed: 10/6/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Letter Regarding Claim of Ms. Brown-Elam. Filed by Taniel Brown-Elam . (SH) (Entered: 10/07/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1614 Filed: 10/7/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Order Authorizing Sinay Lim Ou and Sovath Ou to File Late Proof of Claim (RE: Related Doc # 995)(related document(s)1613) Order Signed on 10/7/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1) (SH) (Entered: 10/07/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1613 Filed: 10/6/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Certification of Counsel regarding Motion by Sinay Lim Ou and Sovath Ou for Authority to File Late Proof of Claim (related document(s)995) Filed by OFFICIAL COMMITTEE OF UNSECURED CREDITORS. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Proposed Order) (Songonuga, Natasha) (Entered: 10/06/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1612 Filed: 10/6/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          The transcriber has requested a standing order for all hearings in this case for the period 10/6/2015 to 10/20/2015. To obtain a copy of a transcript contact the transcriber Veritext. Telephone number (516)608-2400. (GM) (Entered: 10/06/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1611 Filed: 10/5/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Response to Objection to Claim (Thirteenth Omnibus Objection). Filed by Kathleen Murphy. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A) (related document(s)1586) (SH) (Entered: 10/05/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1610 Filed: 10/5/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Order Authorizing the Debtors to Expand the Scope of Their Retention of Ernst & Young LLP as Auditors and Tax Advisors (related document(s)425, 1180, 1583, 1608) Order Signed on 10/5/2015. (SH) (Entered: 10/05/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1609 Filed: 10/5/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Certificate of No Objection regarding Tenth Monthly Application of PricewaterhouseCoopers LLP for Services Rendered and Reimbursement of Expenses as Financial Advisor to the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors for Compensation for the Period from to July 1, 2015 through July 31, 2015 (related document(s)1568) Filed by OFFICIAL COMMITTEE OF UNSECURED CREDITORS. (Songonuga, Natasha) (Entered: 10/05/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1608 Filed: 10/2/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Certification of Counsel Regarding Order Authorizing the Debtors to Expand the Scope of Their Retention of Ernst & Young LLP as Auditors and Tax Advisors (related document(s)425, 1180, 1583) Filed by Trump Entertainment Resorts, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A) (Bambrick, Ian) (Entered: 10/02/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1607 Filed: 10/2/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Affidavit/Declaration of Mailing of Timothy R. Quinn Regarding ORder Furhter Extending the Time Within Which the Debtors Must Assume or Reject a Certain Unexpired Lease of Nonresidential Real Property with the Prior Written Consent of the Lessor (R&R Associates) under such Lease. Filed by Prime Clerk. (related document(s)1601) (Adler, Adam) (Entered: 10/02/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1606 Filed: 10/1/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Notice of Service (Requests for Document Production) Filed by AmeriHealth Casualty Insurance Company. (Leonhardt, Scott) (Entered: 10/01/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1605 Filed: 10/1/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Certificate of No Objection Regarding Tenth Monthly Fee Application for the Period From July 1, 2015 Through July 31, 2015 (related document(s)1565) Filed by Ernst & Young LLP. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Service) (Jacobs, Ashley) (Entered: 10/01/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1604 Filed: 9/30/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Debtor-In-Possession Monthly Operating Report for Filing Period August 1, 2015 to August 31, 2015 Filed by Trump Entertainment Resorts, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Service) (Poppiti, Jr., Robert) (Entered: 09/30/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1603 Filed: 9/30/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Certificate of Service (related document(s)1602) Filed by AmeriHealth Casualty Insurance Company. (Leonhardt, Scott) (Entered: 09/30/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1602 Filed: 9/29/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Objection to Debtors' Motion for Entry of an Order, Pursuant to Sections 105(a) and 365(a) of the Bankruptcy Code, (A) Authorizing the Debtors to Reject the AmeriHealth Agreements, Nunc Pro Tunc to the Rejection Effective Date and (B) Granting Related Relief (related document(s)1492) Filed by AmeriHealth Casualty Insurance Company (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Escrow Agreement # 2 Exhibit B - Letter from Stroock & Stroock & Lavan LLP # 3 Exhibit C - Unpaid July Invoices) (Leonhardt, Scott) (Entered: 09/29/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1601 Filed: 9/29/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Order Further Extending the Time Within Which the Debtors Must Assume or Reject a Certain Unexpired Lease of Nonresidential Real Property With the Prior Written Consent of the Lessor (R&R Associates) Under Such Lease. (related document(s)668, 1115, 1386, 1599) Order Signed on 9/28/2015. (LCN) (Entered: 09/29/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1600 Filed: 9/29/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Affidavit/Declaration of Mailing of Jordan D. Searles Regarding Order Further Extending the Time Within Which the Debtors Must Assume or Reject a Certain Unexpired Lease of Nonresidential Real Property with the Prior Written Consent of the Lessor (Plaza Hotel Management Company) Under Such Lease. Filed by Prime Clerk. (related document(s)1596) (Steele, Benjamin) (Entered: 09/29/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1599 Filed: 9/28/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Certification of Counsel Regarding Proposed Order Further Extending the Time Within Which the Debtors Must Assume or Reject a Certain Unexpired Lease of Nonresidential Real Property With the Prior Written Consent of the Lessor (R&R Associates) Under Such Lease (related document(s)668, 1115, 1386) Filed by Trump Entertainment Resorts, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 # 2 Exhibit 2) (Poppiti, Jr., Robert) (Entered: 09/28/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1598 Filed: 9/25/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Affidavit/Declaration of Mailing of Jordan D. Searles Regarding Notice of Twelfth Monthly Application of Stroock & Stroock & Lavan LLP as Counsel for the Debtors and Debtors-in-Possession for Allowance of Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses Incurred for the Interim Period from August 1, 2015 through and including August 31, 2015 and Notice of Sixth Monthly Application of Robbins, Russell, Englert, Orseck, Untereiner & Sauber LLP for Allowance of Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses as Special Appellate Counsel to the Debtors and Debtors-in-Possession for the Period from July 1, 2015 through August 31, 2015. Filed by Prime Clerk. (related document(s)1589, 1595) (Adler, Adam) (Entered: 09/25/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1597 Filed: 9/24/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Certificate of No Objection Regarding Eleventh Monthly Fee Application for the Period From July 1, 2015 Through July 31, 2015 (related document(s)1549) Filed by Stroock & Stroock & Lavan LLP. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Service) (Jacobs, Ashley) (Entered: 09/24/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1596 Filed: 9/24/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Order Further Extending the Time Within Which the Debtors Must Assume or Reject a Certain Unexpired Lease of Nonresidential Real Property With the Prior Written Consent of the Lessor (Plaza Hotel Management Company) Under Such Lease. (related document(s)668, 967, 1344, 1592) Order Signed on 9/24/2015. (LCN) Modified a Related Docket Number on 9/25/2015 (LB). (Entered: 09/24/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1595 Filed: 9/22/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Monthly Application for Compensation (Sixth) for the period July 1, 2015 to August 31, 2015 Filed by Robbins, Russell, Englert, Orseck, Untereiner & Sauber LLP. Objections due by 10/12/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Notice # 2 Exhibit A # 3 Exhibit B # 4 Exhibit C # 5 Affidavit of Service) (Bambrick, Ian) (Entered: 09/22/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1594 Filed: 9/22/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Certificate of Service regarding Twelfth Monthly Application of Gibbons, P.C. as Co-Counsel for the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors for Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses for the Period from August 1, 2015 through August 31, 2015 (related document(s)1593) Filed by OFFICIAL COMMITTEE OF UNSECURED CREDITORS. (Songonuga, Natasha) (Entered: 09/22/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1593 Filed: 9/22/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Monthly Application for Compensation (Twelfth) of Gibbons P.C. as Co-Counsel to the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors for Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses for the period August 1, 2015 to August 31, 2015 Filed by OFFICIAL COMMITTEE OF UNSECURED CREDITORS. Objections due by 10/13/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A # 2 Exhibit B) (Songonuga, Natasha) (Entered: 09/22/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1592 Filed: 9/22/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Certification of Counsel Regarding Proposed Order Further Extending the Time Within Which the Debtors Must Assume or Reject a Certain Unexpired Lease of Nonresidential Real Property With the Prior Written Consent of the Lessor (Plaza Hotel Management Company) Under Such Lease (related document(s)668, 967, 1344) Filed by Trump Entertainment Resorts, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1) (Poppiti, Jr., Robert) (Entered: 09/22/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1591 Filed: 9/22/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Affidavit/Declaration of Service (related document(s)1589) Filed by Trump Entertainment Resorts, Inc.. (Jacobs, Ashley) (Entered: 09/22/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1590 Filed: 9/22/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      The transcriber has requested a standing order for all hearings in this case for the period 9/22/2015 to 10/6/2015. To obtain a copy of a transcript contact the transcriber Veritext. Telephone number (516)608-2400. (GM) (Entered: 09/22/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1589 Filed: 9/21/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Monthly Application for Compensation (Twelfth) for the period August 1, 2015 to August 31, 2015 Filed by Stroock & Stroock & Lavan LLP. Objections due by 10/12/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Notice # 2 Exhibit A # 3 Exhibit B # 4 Exhibit C) (Jacobs, Ashley) (Entered: 09/21/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1588 Filed: 9/18/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Affidavit/Declaration of Mailing of Jordan D. Searles Regarding Second Notice of the Proposed Expansion of the Services to be Provided by Ernst & Young LLP to the Debtors, and Notice of Twelfth Monthly Application of Young Conaway Stargatt & Taylor, LLP for Allowance of Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses as Co-Counsel to the Debtors and Debtors-in-Possession for the Period from August 1, 2015 through August 31, 2015. Filed by Prime Clerk. (related document(s)1583, 1584) (Adler, Adam) (Entered: 09/18/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1587 Filed: 9/18/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Certificate of Service regarding Thirteenth (Non-Substantive) to Certain (A) Duplicate Claims, (B) No Documentation Claims, and (C) Late Claims Pursuant to Section 502 of the Bankruptcy Code, Bankruptcy Rule 3007 and Local Rule 3007-1 (related document(s)1586) Filed by OFFICIAL COMMITTEE OF UNSECURED CREDITORS. (Songonuga, Natasha) (Entered: 09/18/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1586 Filed: 9/18/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Omnibus Objection to Claims - Thirteenth (Non-Substantive) to Certain (A) Duplicate Claims, (B) No Documentation Claims, and (C) Late Claims Pursuant to Section 502 of the Bankruptcy Code, Bankruptcy Rule 3007 and Local Rule 3007-1. Filed by OFFICIAL COMMITTEE OF UNSECURED CREDITORS. Hearing scheduled for 11/10/2015 at 11:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #3, Wilmington, Delaware. Objections due by 10/16/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Adam Rosen # 2 Exhibit B - Proposed Order # 3 Notice) (Songonuga, Natasha) (Entered: 09/18/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1585 Filed: 9/17/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Supplemental Affidavit/Declaration of Service of Sebastian V. Higgins Regarding Third Order Extending the Period within which the Debtors May Remove Actions (related document(s)1526) Filed by Prime Clerk. (Steele, Benjamin) (Entered: 09/17/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1584 Filed: 9/16/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Monthly Application for Compensation (Twelfth) for the period August 1, 2015 to August 31, 2015 Filed by Young Conaway Stargatt & Taylor, LLP. Objections due by 10/6/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Notice # 2 Exhibit A # 3 Exhibit B # 4 Exhibit C # 5 Affidavit of Service) (Lunn, Matthew) (Entered: 09/16/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1583 Filed: 9/16/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Second Notice of the Proposed Expansion of the Services to be Provided by Ernst & Young LLP to the Debtors [Objections due by 9/30/2015] Filed by Trump Entertainment Resorts, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A # 2 Exhibit B) (Bambrick, Ian) Modified text on 9/17/2015 (MDW). (Entered: 09/16/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1582 Filed: 9/16/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Supplemental Affidavit/Declaration of Mailing of Sebastian V. Higgins Regarding Debtors' Third Motion for an Order Extending the Period Within Which the Debtors May Remove Actions. Filed by Prime Clerk. (related document(s)1500) (Adler, Adam) Modified text on 9/17/2015 (MDW). (Entered: 09/16/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1581 Filed: 9/15/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Affidavit/Declaration of Service (related document(s)1579, 1580) Filed by Trump Entertainment Resorts, Inc.. (Poppiti, Jr., Robert) (Entered: 09/15/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1580 Filed: 9/15/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          HEARING CANCELLED/RESCHEDULED. Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing. Filed by Trump Entertainment Resorts, Inc.. Hearing scheduled for 9/18/2015 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #3, Wilmington, Delaware. (Poppiti, Jr., Robert) (Entered: 09/15/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1579 Filed: 9/15/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            HEARING CANCELLED/RESCHEDULED. Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing. Filed by Trump Entertainment Resorts, Inc.. Hearing scheduled for 9/17/2015 at 01:30 PM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #3, Wilmington, Delaware. (Poppiti, Jr., Robert) (Entered: 09/15/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1578 Filed: 9/15/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Certificate of Service regarding Twelfth Monthly Application of The Law Office of Nathan A. Schultz, P.C. as Co-Counsel for the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors for Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses for the Period from August 1, 2015 through August 31, 2015 (related document(s)1575) Filed by OFFICIAL COMMITTEE OF UNSECURED CREDITORS. (Songonuga, Natasha) (Entered: 09/15/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1577 Filed: 9/15/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing Filed by Trump Entertainment Resorts, Inc.. Hearing scheduled for 9/18/2015 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #3, Wilmington, Delaware. (Poppiti, Jr., Robert) (Entered: 09/15/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1576 Filed: 9/15/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing Filed by Trump Entertainment Resorts, Inc.. Hearing scheduled for 9/17/2015 at 01:30 PM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #3, Wilmington, Delaware. (Poppiti, Jr., Robert) (Entered: 09/15/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1575 Filed: 9/15/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Application for Compensation (Twelfth) of The Law Office of Nathan A. Schultz, P.C. as Co-Counsel to the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors for Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses for the period August 1, 2015 to August 31, 2015 Filed by OFFICIAL COMMITTEE OF UNSECURED CREDITORS. Objections due by 10/5/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A # 2 Exhibit B) (Songonuga, Natasha) (Entered: 09/15/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1574 Filed: 9/14/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Affidavit/Declaration of Mailing of Jordan D. Searles Regarding Order Scheduling Omnibus Hearing Date. Filed by Prime Clerk. (related document(s)1566) (Adler, Adam) (Entered: 09/14/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1573 Filed: 9/14/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Affidavit/Declaration of Service of Jordan D. Searles Regarding Order Scheduling Omnibus Hearing (related document(s)1566) Filed by Prime Clerk. (Steele, Benjamin) (Entered: 09/14/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1572 Filed: 9/14/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Affidavit/Declaration of Service of Jordan D. Searles Regarding Notice of Tenth Monthly Application of Ernst & Young LLP for Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses as Auditors and Tax Advisors to the Debtors for the Period from July 1, 2015 through July 31, 2015 (related document(s)1565) Filed by Prime Clerk. (Steele, Benjamin) (Entered: 09/14/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1571 Filed: 9/14/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Certificate of No Objection regarding Eleventh Monthly Application of Gibbons P.C. as Co-Counsel to the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors for Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses for the period July 1, 2015 to July 31, 2015 (related document(s)1525) Filed by OFFICIAL COMMITTEE OF UNSECURED CREDITORS. (Songonuga, Natasha) (Entered: 09/14/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1570 Filed: 9/11/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Certificate of No Objection Regarding Eleventh Monthly Fee Application for the Period From July 1, 2015 Through July 31, 2015 (related document(s)1523) Filed by Young Conaway Stargatt & Taylor, LLP. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Service) (Jacobs, Ashley) (Entered: 09/11/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1569 Filed: 9/11/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Certificate of Service re Tenth Monthly Fee Application of PricewaterhouseCoopers LLP (related document(s)1568) Filed by OFFICIAL COMMITTEE OF UNSECURED CREDITORS. (Songonuga, Natasha) (Entered: 09/11/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1568 Filed: 9/11/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Monthly Application for Compensation (Tenth) of PricewaterhouseCoopers LLP for the period July 1, 2015 to July 31, 2015 Filed by OFFICIAL COMMITTEE OF UNSECURED CREDITORS. Objections due by 10/1/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A # 2 Exhibit B # 3 Exhibit C) (Songonuga, Natasha) (Entered: 09/11/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1567 Filed: 9/11/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Certificate of No Objection Regarding the Eleventh Monthly Application of the Law Office of Nathan A. Schultz, P.C. (related document(s)1517) Filed by OFFICIAL COMMITTEE OF UNSECURED CREDITORS. (Songonuga, Natasha) (Entered: 09/11/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1566 Filed: 9/10/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Order Scheduling Omnibus Hearing. All hearings will be held at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #3, Wilmington, Delaware. Omnibus Hearing scheduled for 10/13/2015 at 02:00 PM. Signed on 9/10/2015. (SS) (Entered: 09/10/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1565 Filed: 9/9/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Monthly Application for Compensation (Tenth) for the period July 1, 2015 to July 31, 2015 Filed by Ernst & Young LLP. Objections due by 9/29/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Notice # 2 Exhibit A # 3 Exhibit B # 4 Affidavit of Service) (Bambrick, Ian) (Entered: 09/09/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1564 Filed: 9/8/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Certification of Counsel Regarding Order Scheduling Omnibus Hearing Date Filed by Trump Entertainment Resorts, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A) (Lunn, Matthew) (Entered: 09/08/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1563 Filed: 9/8/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Affidavit/Declaration of Mailing of Jordan D. Searles Regarding Notice of Eleventh Monthly Application of Stroock & Stroock & Lavan LLP as Counsel for the Debtors and Debtors-in-Posession for Allowance of Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses Incurred for the Interim Period from July 1, 2015 through and including July 31, 2015. Filed by Prime Clerk. (related document(s)1549) (Adler, Adam) (Entered: 09/08/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1562 Filed: 9/8/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Order Approving Motion for Admission pro hac vice of Melissa Y. Boey, Esquire of Morgan, Lewis & Bockius LLP (Related Doc # 1557) (related document(s)1557) Order Signed on 9/8/2015. (LJH) (Entered: 09/08/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1561 Filed: 9/8/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Order Approving Motion for Admission pro hac vice of James O. Moore, Esquire of Morgan, Lewis & Bockius LLP(Related Doc # 1556) (related document(s)1556) Order Signed on 9/8/2015. (LJH) (Entered: 09/08/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1560 Filed: 9/8/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Order Approving Motion for Admission pro hac vice of Andrew J. Gallo, Esquire of Morgan, Lewis & Bockius LLP (Related Doc # 1555) (related document(s)1555) Order Signed on 9/8/2015. (LJH) (Entered: 09/08/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1559 Filed: 9/8/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Order Approving Motion for Admission pro hac vice of John C. Goodchild, III, Esquire of Morgan, Lewis & Bockius LLP (Related Doc # 1554) (related document(s)1554) Order Signed on 9/8/2015. (LJH) (Entered: 09/08/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1558 Filed: 9/8/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      The transcriber has requested a standing order for all hearings in this case for the period 9/8/2015 to 9/22/2015. To obtain a copy of a transcript contact the transcriber, Veritext, Telephone number (888)706-4576. (BJM) (Entered: 09/08/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1557 Filed: 9/6/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Motion to Appear pro hac vice of Melissa Y. Boey, Esquire of Morgan, Lewis & Bockius LLP. Receipt Number 1782227, Filed by AmeriHealth Casualty Insurance Company. (Klein, Julia) (Entered: 09/06/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1556 Filed: 9/6/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Motion to Appear pro hac vice of James O. Moore, Esquire of Morgan, Lewis & Bockius LLP. Receipt Number 1782227, Filed by AmeriHealth Casualty Insurance Company. (Klein, Julia) (Entered: 09/06/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1555 Filed: 9/6/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Motion to Appear pro hac vice of Andrew J. Gallo, Esquire of Morgan, Lewis & Bockius LLP. Receipt Number 1782227, Filed by AmeriHealth Casualty Insurance Company. (Klein, Julia) (Entered: 09/06/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1554 Filed: 9/6/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Motion to Appear pro hac vice of John C. Goodchild, III, Esquire of Morgan, Lewis & Bockius LLP. Receipt Number 1782227, Filed by AmeriHealth Casualty Insurance Company. (Klein, Julia) (Entered: 09/06/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1553 Filed: 9/6/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Notice of Appearance Filed by AmeriHealth Casualty Insurance Company. (Klein, Julia) (Entered: 09/06/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1552 Filed: 9/4/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Affidavit/Declaration of Mailing (Supplemental) of Ingamar D. Ramirez Regarding Third Order Extending the Period Within Which the Debtors May Remove Actions. Filed by Prime Clerk. (related document(s)1526) (Adler, Adam) (Entered: 09/04/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1551 Filed: 9/4/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Affidavit/Declaration of Mailing of Timothy R. Quinn Regarding Debtors' Seventh (7th) Notice of Satisfaction of Claims. Filed by Prime Clerk. (related document(s)1550) (Adler, Adam) (Entered: 09/04/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1550 Filed: 9/3/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Notice of Satisfaction of Claim. Filed by Trump Entertainment Resorts, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A) (Poppiti, Jr., Robert) (Entered: 09/03/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1549 Filed: 9/2/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Application for Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses of Stroock & Stroock & Lavan LLP for the period July 1, 2015 to July 31, 2015 Filed by Trump Entertainment Resorts, Inc.. Objections due by 9/14/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Notice # 2 Exhibit) (Jacobs, Ashley) Modified on 9/3/2015 (SH). (Entered: 09/02/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1548 Filed: 9/2/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Certificate of No Objection regarding Ninth Monthly Application of PricewaterhouseCoopers LLP as Financial Advisor for the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors for Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses for the period June 1, 2015 to June 30, 2015 (related document(s)1498) Filed by OFFICIAL COMMITTEE OF UNSECURED CREDITORS. (Songonuga, Natasha) (Entered: 09/02/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1547 Filed: 9/2/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Order [AMENDED] Granting and Sustaining Twelfth Omnibus (Non-Substantive) Objection to certain (A) Duplicate Claims and (B) No Documentation Claims (related document(s)1456, 1531, 1546). Signed on 9/1/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 # 2 Exhibit 2) (SJS) (Entered: 09/02/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1546 Filed: 9/1/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Certification of Counsel regarding Amended Order Granting Twelfth Omnibus (Non-Substantive) Objection to Certain (A) Duplicate Claims and (B) No Documentation Claims (related document(s)1456, 1531) Filed by OFFICIAL COMMITTEE OF UNSECURED CREDITORS. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Amended Proposed Order # 2 Exhibit B - Amended Proposed Order - Redline) (Songonuga, Natasha) (Entered: 09/01/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1545 Filed: 8/31/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Debtor-In-Possession Monthly Operating Report for Filing Period July 2015 Filed by Trump Entertainment Resorts, Inc.. (Poppiti, Jr., Robert) (Entered: 08/31/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1544 Filed: 8/30/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  BNC Certificate of Mailing. (related document(s)1542) Notice Date 08/30/2015. (Admin.) (Entered: 08/31/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1543 Filed: 8/28/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Affidavit/Declaration of Mailing of Timothy R. Quinn Regarding Order Approving Interim Fee Requess of the Debtors' Professionals for the Period from March 1, 2015 through May 31, 2015. Filed by Prime Clerk. (related document(s)1538) (Adler, Adam) (Entered: 08/28/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1542 Filed: 8/28/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Transcript regarding Hearing Held 08/27/2015 RE: 08/28/2015. Remote electronic access to the transcript is restricted until 11/27/2015. The transcript may be viewed at the Bankruptcy Court Clerk's Office. [For information about how to contact the transcriber, call the Clerk's Office] or [Contact the Court Reporter/Transcriber Veritext, Telephone number (212)267-6868.] Notice of Intent to Request Redaction Deadline Due By 9/4/2015. Redaction Request Due By 9/18/2015. Redacted Transcript Submission Due By 9/28/2015. Transcript access will be restricted through 11/27/2015. (related document(s)1535) (GM) (Entered: 08/28/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1541 Filed: 8/28/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Affidavit/Declaration of Service of Timothy R. Quinn Regarding Eleventh Monthly Application of Young Conaway Stargatt & Taylor, LLP for Allowance of Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses, as Co-Counsel to the Debtors and Debtors-in-Possession for the Period From July 1, 2015 Through July 31, 2015 (related document(s)1523) Filed by Prime Clerk. (Steele, Benjamin) (Entered: 08/28/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1540 Filed: 8/27/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Certificate of No Objection Regarding Ninth Monthly Fee Application for the Period From June 1, 2015 Through June 30, 2015 (related document(s)1504) Filed by Ernst & Young LLP. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Service) (Jacobs, Ashley) (Entered: 08/27/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1539 Filed: 8/27/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Minutes of Hearing held on: 08/27/2015 Subject: INTERIM FEE APPLICATIONS. (vCal Hearing ID (200955)). (related document(s) 1535) (SS) Additional attachment(s) added on 8/27/2015 (SS). (Entered: 08/27/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1538 Filed: 8/27/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Order Approving Interim Fee Requests of the Debtors' Professionals for the Period from March 1, 2015 Through May 31, 2015. (Related Doc # 1449) Order Signed on 8/27/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A) (SH) (Entered: 08/27/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1537 Filed: 8/26/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Certificate of No Objection Regarding Tenth Monthly Fee Application for the Period From June 1, 2015 Through June 30, 2015 (related document(s)1501) Filed by Stroock & Stroock & Lavan LLP. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Service) (Jacobs, Ashley) (Entered: 08/26/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1536 Filed: 8/26/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Affidavit/Declaration of Mailing of Timothy R. Quinn Regarding Third Order Extending the Period Within Which the Debtors May Remove Actions. Filed by Prime Clerk. (related document(s)1526) (Adler, Adam) (Entered: 08/26/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1535 Filed: 8/25/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing Filed by Trump Entertainment Resorts, Inc.. Hearing scheduled for 8/27/2015 at 02:00 PM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #3, Wilmington, Delaware. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A # 2 Affidavit of Service) (Lunn, Matthew) (Entered: 08/25/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1534 Filed: 8/25/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      The transcriber has requested a standing order for all hearings in this case for the period 8/25/2015 to 9/8/2015. To obtain a copy of a transcript contact the transcriber, Veritext, Telephone number (888)706-4576. (BJM) (Entered: 08/25/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1533 Filed: 8/24/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Supplement to Third Interim Fee Request (related document(s)1449) Filed by Stroock & Stroock & Lavan LLP. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Service) (Lunn, Matthew) Modified on 8/25/2015 (SH). (Entered: 08/24/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1532 Filed: 8/24/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Order Granting The Third Interim Quarterly Applications of All Professionals for the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Trump Entertainment Resorts Inc et al for Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses for the Period from March 2015 Through May 2015. (Related Doc # 1420)(related document(s)1516), (Related Doc # 1447)(related document(s)1516), . (Related Doc # 1450)(related document(s)1516) Order Signed on 8/24/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A) (SH) (Entered: 08/24/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1531 Filed: 8/24/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Order Granting and Sustaining Twelfth Omnibus (Non Substantive) Objection to Certain (A)Duplicate Claims and (B)No Documentation Claims (related document(s)1456, 1530) Signed on 8/24/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 # 2 Exhibit 2) (SH) (Entered: 08/24/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1530 Filed: 8/24/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Certification of Counsel regarding Twelfth Omnibus (Non-Substantive) Objection to Certain (A) Duplicate Claims and (B) No Documentation Claims Pursuant to Section 502 of the Bankruptcy Code, Bankruptcy Rule 3007 and Local Rule 3007-1 (related document(s)1456) Filed by OFFICIAL COMMITTEE OF UNSECURED CREDITORS. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Revised Proposed Order # 2 Exhibit B - Revised Proposed Order - Redline) (Songonuga, Natasha) (Entered: 08/24/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1529 Filed: 8/24/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Affidavit/Declaration of Mailing of Calvin C. Liu Regarding (Supplemental) Debtors Third Motion for an Order Extending the Period within which the Debtors' may Remove Actions. Filed by Prime Clerk. (related document(s)1500) (Steele, Benjamin) (Entered: 08/24/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1528 Filed: 8/21/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Affidavit/Declaration of Mailing Of Timothy R. Quinn Regarding Order Sustaining, in Part, Debtors' Fifth (5th) Omnibus (Substantive) Objection to Claims Pursuant to Section 502 of the Bankruptcy Code, Bankruptcy Rule 3007 and Local Rule 3007-1. Filed by Prime Clerk. (related document(s)1522) (Adler, Adam) (Entered: 08/21/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1527 Filed: 8/21/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Certificate of Service regarding Eleventh Monthly Application of Gibbons P.C. as Co-Counsel for the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors for Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses for the Period from July 1, 2015 through July 31, 2015 (related document(s)1525) Filed by OFFICIAL COMMITTEE OF UNSECURED CREDITORS. (Songonuga, Natasha) (Entered: 08/21/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1526 Filed: 8/21/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Order (Third) Extending the Period Within Which the Debtors May Remove Actions(Related Doc # 1500) Order Signed on 8/21/2015. (SH) (Entered: 08/21/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1525 Filed: 8/21/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Monthly Application for Compensation (Eleventh) of Gibbons P.C. as Co-Counsel to the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors for Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses for the period July 1, 2015 to July 31, 2015 Filed by OFFICIAL COMMITTEE OF UNSECURED CREDITORS. Objections due by 9/10/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A # 2 Exhibit B) (Songonuga, Natasha) (Entered: 08/21/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1524 Filed: 8/20/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Certificate of No Objection Regarding Third Motion to Extend the Period Within Which the Debtors May Remove Actions (related document(s)1500) Filed by Trump Entertainment Resorts, Inc.. (Poppiti, Jr., Robert) (Entered: 08/20/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1523 Filed: 8/20/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Monthly Application for Compensation (Eleventh) for the period July 1, 2015 to July 31, 2015 Filed by Young Conaway Stargatt & Taylor, LLP. Objections due by 9/9/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Notice # 2 Exhibit A # 3 Exhibit B # 4 Exhibit C # 5 Affidavit of Service) (Lunn, Matthew) (Entered: 08/20/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1522 Filed: 8/19/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Order Sustaining In Part Debtors' Fifth (5th) Omnibus (Substantive) Objection to Claims(related document(s)1161, 1244, 1521) Signed on 8/19/2015. (SH) (Entered: 08/19/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1521 Filed: 8/19/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Certification of Counsel Regarding Debtors' Fifth Omnibus (Substantive) Objection to Claims Pursuant to Section 502 of the Bankruptcy Code, Bankruptcy Rule 3007 and Local Rule 3007-1 (related document(s)1161, 1244) Filed by Trump Entertainment Resorts, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 # 2 Exhibit 2) (Poppiti, Jr., Robert) (Entered: 08/19/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1520 Filed: 8/17/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Certificate of No Objection regarding Tenth Monthly Application of Gibbons P.C. as Co-Counsel for the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors for Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses for the Period from June 1, 2015 through June 30, 2015 (related document(s)1468) Filed by OFFICIAL COMMITTEE OF UNSECURED CREDITORS. (Songonuga, Natasha) (Entered: 08/17/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1519 Filed: 8/17/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Certificate of No Objection regarding Tenth Monthly Application of The Law Office of Nathan A. Schultz, P.C. as Co-Counsel for the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors for Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses for the Period from June 1, 2015 through June 30, 2015 (related document(s)1443) Filed by OFFICIAL COMMITTEE OF UNSECURED CREDITORS. (Songonuga, Natasha) (Entered: 08/17/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1518 Filed: 8/17/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Certificate of Service regarding Eleventh Monthly Application of The Law Office of Nathan A. Schultz, P.C. as Co-Counsel for the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors for Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses for the Period from July 1, 2015 through July 31, 2015 (related document(s)1517) Filed by OFFICIAL COMMITTEE OF UNSECURED CREDITORS. (Songonuga, Natasha) (Entered: 08/17/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1517 Filed: 8/17/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Monthly Application for Compensation (Eleventh) of the Law Office of Nathan A. Schultz, P.C. as Co-Counsel to the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors for Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses for the period July 1, 2015 to July 31, 2015 Filed by OFFICIAL COMMITTEE OF UNSECURED CREDITORS. Objections due by 9/8/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A) (Songonuga, Natasha) (Entered: 08/17/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1516 Filed: 8/12/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Certification of Counsel regarding Third Interim Fee Applications Filed by Professionals to the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors (related document(s)1420, 1447, 1450) Filed by OFFICIAL COMMITTEE OF UNSECURED CREDITORS. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Proposed Order) (Songonuga, Natasha) (Entered: 08/12/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1515 Filed: 8/11/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Notice of Service of (i) Notice of Depositions of Unite Here Health Concerning the Motion of Unite Here Health for Allowance of Administrative Claim Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. § 503(b)(1)(A), (ii) First Set of Interrogatories to Unite Here Health Concerning the Motion of Unite Here Health for Allowance of Administrative Claim Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. § 503(b)(1)(A), and (iii) First Request for Production of Documents to Unite Here Health Concerning the Motion of Unite Here Health for Allowance of Administrative Claim Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. § 503(b)(1)(A) (related document(s)759) Filed by Trump Entertainment Resorts, Inc.. (Poppiti, Jr., Robert) (Entered: 08/11/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1514 Filed: 8/11/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              The transcriber has requested a standing order for all hearings in this case for the period 8/11/2015 to 8/25/2015. To obtain a copy of a transcript contact the transcriber, Veritext, Telephone number (888)706-4576. (BJM) (Entered: 08/11/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1513 Filed: 8/10/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Affidavit/Declaration of Mailing of Jordan D. Searles Regarding Notice of Ninth Monthly Application of Ernst & Young LLP for Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses as Auditors and Tax Advisors to the Debtors for the Period from June 1, 2015 through June 30, 2015. Filed by Prime Clerk. (related document(s)1504) (Steele, Benjamin) (Entered: 08/10/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1512 Filed: 8/7/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Affidavit/Declaration of Mailing of Jordan D. Searles Regarding Monthly Application for Compensation (Tenth) for the period June 1, 2015 to June 30, 2015 Filed by Stroock & Stroock & Lavan LLP. Filed by Prime Clerk. (related document(s)1501) (Steele, Benjamin) (Entered: 08/07/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1511 Filed: 8/7/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Affidavit/Declaration of Mailing of Jordan D. Searles Regarding Debtors' Third Motion for an Order Extending the Period within which the Debtors may Remove Actions. Filed by Prime Clerk. (related document(s)1500) (Steele, Benjamin) (Entered: 08/07/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1510 Filed: 8/6/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Affidavit/Declaration of Service (related document(s)1505, 1508, 1509) Filed by Trump Entertainment Resorts, Inc.. (Jacobs, Ashley) (Entered: 08/06/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1509 Filed: 8/6/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Certificate of No Objection Regarding Tenth Monthly Fee Application for the Period From June 1, 2015 Through June 30, 2015 (related document(s)1446) Filed by Young Conaway Stargatt & Taylor, LLP. (Jacobs, Ashley) (Entered: 08/06/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1508 Filed: 8/6/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Certificate of No Objection Regarding Fifth Monthly Fee Application for the Period From June 1, 2015 Through June 30, 2015 (related document(s)1445) Filed by Robbins, Russell, Englert, Orseck, Untereiner & Sauber LLP. (Jacobs, Ashley) (Entered: 08/06/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1507 Filed: 8/6/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Supplement to Third Interim Fee Request (related document(s)1449) Filed by Young Conaway Stargatt & Taylor, LLP. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Service) (Lunn, Matthew) Modified on 8/7/2015 (SH). (Entered: 08/06/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1506 Filed: 8/6/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Affidavit/Declaration of Service (related document(s)1504) Filed by Trump Entertainment Resorts, Inc.. (Bambrick, Ian) (Entered: 08/06/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1505 Filed: 8/6/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Supplement to Second Interim Fee Request (related document(s)1449) Filed by Robbins, Russell, Englert, Orseck, Untereiner & Sauber LLP. (Bambrick, Ian) Modified on 8/6/2015 (SH). (Entered: 08/06/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1504 Filed: 8/5/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Monthly Application for Compensation (Ninth) for the period June 1, 2015 to June 30, 2015 Filed by Ernst & Young LLP. Objections due by 8/25/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Notice # 2 Exhibit A # 3 Exhibit B) (Bambrick, Ian) (Entered: 08/05/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1503 Filed: 8/5/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Affidavit/Declaration of Service of Jordan D. Searles Regarding Order Further Extending the Time Within Which the Debtors Must Assume or Reject a Certain Unexpired Lease of Nonresidential Real Property with the Prior Written Consent of the Lessor Under Such Lease (related document(s)1495) Filed by Prime Clerk. (Steele, Benjamin) (Entered: 08/05/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1502 Filed: 8/5/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Affidavit/Declaration of Service (related document(s)1501) Filed by Trump Entertainment Resorts, Inc.. (Jacobs, Ashley) (Entered: 08/05/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1501 Filed: 8/4/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Monthly Application for Compensation (Tenth) for the period June 1, 2015 to June 30, 2015 Filed by Stroock & Stroock & Lavan LLP. Objections due by 8/24/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Notice # 2 Exhibit A # 3 Exhibit B # 4 Exhibit C) (Jacobs, Ashley) (Entered: 08/04/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1500 Filed: 8/4/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Third Motion to Extend the Period Within Which the Debtors May Remove Actions Filed by Trump Entertainment Resorts, Inc.. Hearing scheduled for 8/27/2015 at 02:00 PM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #3, Wilmington, Delaware. Objections due by 8/18/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Notice # 2 Exhibit A) (Poppiti, Jr., Robert) (Entered: 08/04/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1499 Filed: 8/3/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Certificate of Service regarding Ninth Monthly Application of PricewaterhouseCoopers LLP for Compensation for Services Rendered and Reimbursement of Expenses as Financial Advisor to the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors for the Period from June 1, 2015 to June 30, 2015 (related document(s)1498) Filed by OFFICIAL COMMITTEE OF UNSECURED CREDITORS. (Songonuga, Natasha) (Entered: 08/03/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1498 Filed: 8/3/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Monthly Application for Compensation (Ninth) of PricewaterhouseCoopers LLP as Financial Advisor for the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors for Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses for the period June 1, 2015 to June 30, 2015 Filed by OFFICIAL COMMITTEE OF UNSECURED CREDITORS. Objections due by 8/24/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A # 2 Exhibit B # 3 Exhibit C) (Songonuga, Natasha) (Entered: 08/03/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1497 Filed: 8/3/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Affidavit/Declaration of Service of Jordan D. Searles Regarding Order Scheduling Omnibus Hearing Date, Notice of Hearing Regarding Motion of Marilyn Mazzella for Relief from Stay, and Debtors Motion for Entry of an Order (A) Authorizing the Debtors to Reject the AmeriHealth Agreements, Nunc Pro Tunc to the Rejection Effective Date and (B) Granting Related Relief (related document(s)1488, 1491, 1492) Filed by Prime Clerk. (Steele, Benjamin) (Entered: 08/03/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1496 Filed: 8/2/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  BNC Certificate of Mailing. (related document(s)1494) Notice Date 08/02/2015. (Admin.) (Entered: 08/03/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1495 Filed: 7/31/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Order Further Extending the Time Within Which the Debtors Must Assume or Reject a Certain Unexpired Lease of Nonresidential Real Property With the Prior Written Consent of the Lessor Under Such Lease. (related document(s)668, 1116, 1493) Order Signed on 7/31/2015. (LMD) (Entered: 07/31/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1494 Filed: 7/31/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Transcript regarding Hearing Held 7/30/2015 RE: Omnibus. Remote electronic access to the transcript is restricted until 10/29/2015. The transcript may be viewed at the Bankruptcy Court Clerk's Office. [For information about how to contact the transcriber, call the Clerk's Office] or [Contact the Court Reporter/Transcriber Veritext, Telephone number (888)706-4576.] (RE: related document(s) 1482). Notice of Intent to Request Redaction Deadline Due By 8/7/2015. Redaction Request Due By 8/21/2015. Redacted Transcript Submission Due By 8/31/2015. Transcript access will be restricted through 10/29/2015. (BJM) (Entered: 07/31/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1493 Filed: 7/31/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Certification of Counsel Regarding Proposed Order Further Extending the Time Within Which the Debtors Must Assume or Reject a Certain Unexpired Lease of Nonresidential Real Property With the Prior Written Consent of the Lessor Under Such Lease (related document(s)668, 1116) Filed by Trump Entertainment Resorts, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1) (Poppiti, Jr., Robert) (Entered: 07/31/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1492 Filed: 7/30/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Debtors' Motion for Entry of an Order, Pursuant to Sections 105(a) and 365(a) of the Bankruptcy Code, (A) Authorizing the Debtors to Reject the AmeriHealth Agreements, Nunc Pro Tunc to the Rejection Effective Date and (B) Granting Related Relief Filed by Trump Entertainment Resorts, Inc.. Hearing scheduled for 8/27/2015 at 02:00 PM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #3, Wilmington, Delaware. Objections due by 8/13/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Notice # 2 Exhibit A # 3 Exhibit B # 4 Exhibit C) (Poppiti, Jr., Robert) Modified on 7/31/2015 (SH). (Entered: 07/30/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1491 Filed: 7/30/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Notice of Hearing Regarding Motion of Marilyn Mazzella for Relief From Stay (related document(s)910) Filed by Trump Entertainment Resorts, Inc.. Hearing scheduled for 8/27/2015 at 02:00 PM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #3, Wilmington, Delaware. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Service) (Lunn, Matthew) (Entered: 07/30/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1490 Filed: 7/30/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Affidavit/Declaration of Mailing of Jordan D. Searles Regarding Notice of Satisfaction of Claim(s), Order Approving the Release and Settlement Agreement by and among the Debtors and Luz Sota, Order Further Extending the Debtors' Exclusive Periods to File a Chapter 11 Plan and Solicit Acceptances Thereto, Order (I) Authorizing Plaza Associates to Transfer Certain Slot Machines and Licenses to Taj Mahal Associates, (II) Approving the Related Assignment Agreement, (III) Approving the Cure Schedule and Claim Amount Stipulation, and (IV) Granting Related Relief, and Order Approving the Release and Settlement Agreement by and among the Debtors and Luz Sota. Filed by Prime Clerk. (related document(s)1479, 1483, 1484, 1485) (Adler, Adam) (Entered: 07/30/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1489 Filed: 7/30/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Minutes of Hearing held on: 07/30/2015 Subject: OMNIBUS HEARING. (vCal Hearing ID (199971)). (related document(s) 1482) (SS) Additional attachment(s) added on 7/30/2015 (SS). (Entered: 07/30/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1488 Filed: 7/30/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Order Scheduling Omnibus Hearing. All hearings will be held at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #3, Wilmington, Delaware . Omnibus Hearing scheduled for 9/17/2015 at 01:30 PM. Signed on 7/30/2015. (SS) (Entered: 07/30/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1487 Filed: 7/29/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Certification of Counsel Regarding Order Scheduling Omnibus Hearing Date Filed by Trump Entertainment Resorts, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A) (Poppiti, Jr., Robert) (Entered: 07/29/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1486 Filed: 7/29/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Debtor-In-Possession Monthly Operating Report for Filing Period June 1, 2015 to June 30, 2015 Filed by Trump Entertainment Resorts, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Service) (Poppiti, Jr., Robert) (Entered: 07/29/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1485 Filed: 7/28/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Order (I) Authorizing Plaza Associates to Transfer Certain Slot Machines and Licenses to Taj Mahal Associates, (II) Approving the Related Assignment Agreement, (III) Approving the Cure Schedule and Claim Amount Stipulation, and (IV) Granting Related Relief (Related Doc 1435) Order Signed on 7/28/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 # 2 Exhibit 2) (LAM) Modified on 7/29/2015 (SH). (Entered: 07/28/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1484 Filed: 7/28/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Order Further Extending the Debtors' Exclusive Periods to File a Chapter 11 Plan and Solicit Acceptances Thereto. (Related Doc # 1429)(related document(s)1429) Order Signed on 7/28/2015. (LAM) (Entered: 07/28/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1483 Filed: 7/28/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Order Approving the Release and Settlement Agreement By and Among the Debtors and Luz Sota. (Related Doc # 1428)(related document(s)1428) Order Signed on 7/28/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1) (LAM) (Entered: 07/28/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1482 Filed: 7/28/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Amended Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing Filed by Trump Entertainment Resorts, Inc.. Hearing scheduled for 7/30/2015 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #3, Wilmington, Delaware. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Service) (Poppiti, Jr., Robert) (Entered: 07/28/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1481 Filed: 7/28/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Affidavit/Declaration of Mailing of Steven Gordon Debtors' Notice of Third Quarterly Statement of Payments Made to Ordinary Course Professionals During the Period From April 1, 2015 Through June 30, 2015. Filed by Prime Clerk. (related document(s)1466) (Adler, Adam) (Entered: 07/28/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1480 Filed: 7/28/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing Filed by Trump Entertainment Resorts, Inc.. Hearing scheduled for 7/30/2015 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #3, Wilmington, Delaware. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Service) (Poppiti, Jr., Robert) (Entered: 07/28/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1479 Filed: 7/28/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Notice of Satisfaction of Claim(s) Filed by Trump Entertainment Resorts, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A) (Poppiti, Jr., Robert) (Entered: 07/28/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1478 Filed: 7/28/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      The transcriber has requested a standing order for all hearings in this case for the period 7/28/2015 to 8/11/2015. To obtain a copy of a transcript contact the transcriber Veritext. Telephone number (516)608-2400. (GM) (Entered: 07/28/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1477 Filed: 7/27/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Notice of Service of Reservation Of Rights Of First Lien Parties With Respect To Third Interim Applications For Compensation By Estate Professionals (related document(s)1473) Filed by First Lien Parties. (Attachments: # 1 Service List) (Remming, Andrew) (Entered: 07/27/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1476 Filed: 7/27/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Certificate of No Objection Regarding Debtors' Motion for Entry of an Order, Pursuant to Sections 105(a), 363(b), 364(c), and 365 of the Bankruptcy Code and Bankruptcy Rule 6004, (I) Authorizing Plaza Associates to Transfer Certain Slot Machines and Licenses to Taj Mahal Associates, (II) Approving the Related Assignment Agreement, (III) Approving the Cure Schedule and Claim Amount Stipulation, and (IV) Granting Related Relief (related document(s)1435) Filed by Trump Entertainment Resorts, Inc.. (Poppiti, Jr., Robert) (Entered: 07/27/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1475 Filed: 7/27/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Certificate of No Objection Regarding Debtors' Motion for Order Pursuant to Section 1121(d) of the Bankruptcy Code Further Extending the Exclusive Periods Within Which the Debtors May File a Chapter 11 Plan and Solicit Acceptances Thereof (related document(s)1429) Filed by Trump Entertainment Resorts, Inc.. (Poppiti, Jr., Robert) (Entered: 07/27/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1474 Filed: 7/27/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Certificate of No Objection Regarding Debtors' Motion for Entry of an Order, Pursuant to Section 105(a) of the Bankruptcy Code and Bankruptcy Rule 9019, Approving the Release and Settlement Agreement By and Among the Debtors and Luz Sota (related document(s)1428) Filed by Trump Entertainment Resorts, Inc.. (Poppiti, Jr., Robert) (Entered: 07/27/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1473 Filed: 7/27/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Reservation of Rights of First Lien Parties with respect to Third Interim Applications for Compensation by Estate Professionals (related document(s)1420, 1449, 1450) Filed by First Lien Agent, First Lien Lenders. (Remming, Andrew) (Entered: 07/27/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1472 Filed: 7/24/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Order Granting and Sustaining Ninth Omnibus (Non Substantive) Objection to Certain (A)Duplicate Claims and (B)No Documentation Claims (related document(s)1352, 1470) Signed on 7/24/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 # 2 Exhibit 2 # 3 Exhibit 3) (SH) (Entered: 07/24/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1471 Filed: 7/24/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Affidavit/Declaration of Mailing of Jordan D. Searles Regarding 1) Opinion Regarding the Motion of Trump Enterprises, Inc. and Certain Entities Seeking Entry of an Order Against UNITE HERE Local 54 Enforcing the Automatic Stay; and 2) Order Relating to Opinion Regarding the Motion of Trump Enterprises, Inc. and Certain Entities Seeking Entry of an Order Against UNITE HERE Local 54 Enforcing the Automatic Stay. Filed by Prime Clerk. (related document(s)1463, 1464) (Adler, Adam) (Entered: 07/24/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1470 Filed: 7/24/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Certification of Counsel regarding Ninth Omnibus (Non-Substantive Objection) to Certain (A) Duplicate Claims and (B) No Documentation Claims Pursuant to Section 502 of the Bankruptcy Code, Bankruptcy Rule 3007 and Local Rule 3007-1 (related document(s)1352) Filed by OFFICIAL COMMITTEE OF UNSECURED CREDITORS. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Proposed Order # 2 Exhibit B - Redlined Proposed Order) (Songonuga, Natasha) (Entered: 07/24/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1469 Filed: 7/23/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Certificate of Service regarding Tenth Monthly Application of Gibbons P.C. as Co-Counsel for the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors for Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses for the period June 1, 2015 to June 30, 2015 (related document(s)1468) Filed by OFFICIAL COMMITTEE OF UNSECURED CREDITORS. (Songonuga, Natasha) (Entered: 07/23/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1468 Filed: 7/23/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Monthly Application for Compensation (Tenth) of Gibbons P.C. as Co-Counsel for the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors for the period June 1, 2015 to June 30, 2015 Filed by OFFICIAL COMMITTEE OF UNSECURED CREDITORS. Objections due by 8/12/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A) (Songonuga, Natasha) (Entered: 07/23/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1467 Filed: 7/22/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Certificate of No Objection Regarding Eighth Monthly Fee Application for the Period From May 1, 2015 Through May 31, 2015 (related document(s)1410) Filed by Ernst & Young LLP. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Service) (Jacobs, Ashley) (Entered: 07/22/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1466 Filed: 7/22/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Notice of Third Quarterly Statement of Payments Made to Ordinary Course Professionals During the Period From April 1, 2015 Through June 30, 2015 Filed by Trump Entertainment Resorts, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A) (Poppiti, Jr., Robert) Modified on 7/22/2015 (SH). (Entered: 07/22/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1465 Filed: 7/21/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Notice of Substitution of Counsel Filed by Sysco Philadelphia, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Service List) (Miller, Kathleen) (Entered: 07/21/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1464 Filed: 7/21/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Order Relating to Opinion Regarding the Motion of Trump Enterprises, Inc. and Certain Entities Seeking Entry of an Order Against UNITE HERE Local 54 Enforcing the Automatic Stay (related document(s)251, 1463) Order Signed on 7/21/2015. (LJH) (Entered: 07/21/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1463 Filed: 7/21/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Opinion Regarding the Motion of Trump Enterprises, Inc. and Certain Entities Seeking Entry of an Order Against UNITE HERE Local 54 Enforcing the Automatic Stay. (related document(s)251) (LJH) (Entered: 07/21/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1462 Filed: 7/21/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Certificate of No Objection regarding Eighth Monthly Application of PricewaterhouseCoopers LLP for Compensation for Services Rendered and Reimbursement of Expenses as Financial Advisor to the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors for the Period from May 1, 2015 to May 31, 2015 (related document(s)1400) Filed by OFFICIAL COMMITTEE OF UNSECURED CREDITORS. (Songonuga, Natasha) (Entered: 07/21/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1461 Filed: 7/20/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Affidavit/Declaration of Mailing of Jordan D. Searles Regarding Order Sustaining Debtors' Eleventh (11th) Omnibus (Non-Substantive) Objection to Claims and Order Sustaining, in Part, Debtors' Tenth (10th) Omnibus (Substantive) Objection to Claims. Filed by Prime Clerk. (related document(s)1458, 1459) (Adler, Adam) (Entered: 07/20/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1460 Filed: 7/17/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Affidavit/Declaration of Mailing of Timothy R. Quinn Regarding of Timothy R. Quinn Regarding 1) Monthly Application for Compensation (Fifth) for the period June 1, 2015 to June 30, 2015 Filed by Robbins, Russell, Englert, Orseck, Untereiner & Sauber LLP; 2) Monthly Application for Compensation (Tenth) for the period June 1, 2015 to June 30, 2015 Filed by Young Conaway Stargatt & Taylor, LLP; and 3) Quarterly Application for Compensation for the period March 1, 2015 to May 31, 2015. Filed by Prime Clerk. (related document(s)1445, 1446, 1449) (Adler, Adam) (Entered: 07/17/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1459 Filed: 7/17/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Order Sustaining, in Part, Debtors' Tenth (10th) Omnibus (Substantive) Objection to Claims (related document(s)1412, 1454). Signed on 7/17/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Reclassified Claims) (SJS) (Entered: 07/17/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1458 Filed: 7/17/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Order Sustaining Debtors' Eleventh (11th) Omnibus (Non-Substantive) Objection to Claims (related document(s)1413). Signed on 7/17/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Late Filed Claims) (SJS) (Entered: 07/17/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1457 Filed: 7/17/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Certificate of Service regarding Twelfth Omnibus (Non-Substantive) Objection to Certain (A) Duplicate Claims and (B) No Documentation Claims Pursuant to Section 502 of the Bankruptcy Code, Bankruptcy Rule 3007 and Local Rule 3007-1. (related document(s)1456) Filed by OFFICIAL COMMITTEE OF UNSECURED CREDITORS. (Songonuga, Natasha) (Entered: 07/17/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1456 Filed: 7/17/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Omnibus Objection to Claims - Twelfth (Non-Substantive) to Certain (A) Duplicate Claims and (B) No Documentation Claims Pursuant to Section 502 of the Bankruptcy Code, Bankruptcy Rule 3007 and Local Rule 3007-1. Filed by OFFICIAL COMMITTEE OF UNSECURED CREDITORS. Hearing scheduled for 8/27/2015 at 02:00 PM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #3, Wilmington, Delaware. Objections due by 8/7/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Adam Rosen # 2 Exhibit B - Proposed Order # 3 Notice) (Songonuga, Natasha) (Entered: 07/17/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1455 Filed: 7/16/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Certificate of No Objection Regarding Debtors' Eleventh Omnibus (Non-Substantive) Objection to Claims Pursuant to Section 502 of the Bankruptcy Code, Bankruptcy Rule 3007 and Local Rule 3007-1 (related document(s)1413) Filed by Trump Entertainment Resorts, Inc.. (Poppiti, Jr., Robert) (Entered: 07/16/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1454 Filed: 7/16/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Certification of Counsel Regarding Debtors' Tenth Omnibus (Substantive) Objection to Claims Pursuant to Section 502 of the Bankruptcy Code, Bankruptcy Rule 3007 and Local Rule 3007-1 (related document(s)1412) Filed by Trump Entertainment Resorts, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 # 2 Exhibit 2) (Poppiti, Jr., Robert) (Entered: 07/16/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1453 Filed: 7/16/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Certificate of Service Third Interim Applications of Gibbons P.C. and The Law Office of Nathan A. Schultz, P.C. as Co-Counsel to the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors for Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses for the Period from March 1, 2015 through May 31, 2015 (related document(s)1447, 1450) Filed by OFFICIAL COMMITTEE OF UNSECURED CREDITORS. (Songonuga, Natasha) (Entered: 07/16/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1452 Filed: 7/16/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Certificate of Service regarding Tenth Monthly Application of The Law Office of Nathan A. Schultz, P.C. as Co- Counsel for the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors for Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses for the Period from June 1, 2015 through June 30, 2015. (related document(s)1443) Filed by OFFICIAL COMMITTEE OF UNSECURED CREDITORS. (Songonuga, Natasha) (Entered: 07/16/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1451 Filed: 7/16/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Notice of Submission of Proof of Claim With Respect to Debtors' Tenth Omnibus (Substantive) Objection to Claims (related document(s)1412) Filed by Trump Entertainment Resorts, Inc.. (Poppiti, Jr., Robert) (Entered: 07/16/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1450 Filed: 7/15/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Interim Application for Compensation (Third) of Gibbons P.C. as Co-Counsel for the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors for Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses for the period March 1, 2015 to May 31, 2015 Filed by OFFICIAL COMMITTEE OF UNSECURED CREDITORS. Hearing scheduled for 8/27/2015 at 02:00 PM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #3, Wilmington, Delaware. Objections due by 8/5/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A # 2 Exhibit B # 3 Exhibit C) (Songonuga, Natasha) (Entered: 07/15/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1449 Filed: 7/15/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Quarterly Application for Compensation for the period March 1, 2015 to May 31, 2015 Filed by Ernst & Young LLP, Houlihan Lokey Capital, Inc., Prime Clerk, Robbins, Russell, Englert, Orseck, Untereiner & Sauber LLP, Stroock & Stroock & Lavan LLP, Young Conaway Stargatt & Taylor, LLP. Hearing scheduled for 8/27/2015 at 02:00 PM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #3, Wilmington, Delaware. Objections due by 8/4/2015. (Poppiti, Jr., Robert) (Entered: 07/15/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1448 Filed: 7/15/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Certificate of No Objection Regarding Ninth Monthly Fee Application for the Period From May 1, 2015 Through May 31, 2015 (related document(s)1394) Filed by Stroock & Stroock & Lavan LLP. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Service) (Jacobs, Ashley) (Entered: 07/15/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1447 Filed: 7/15/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Interim Application for Compensation (Third) of the Law Office of Nathan A. Schultz, P.C. as Co-Counsel for the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors for Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses for the period March 1, 2015 to May 31, 2015 Filed by OFFICIAL COMMITTEE OF UNSECURED CREDITORS. Hearing scheduled for 8/27/2015 at 02:00 PM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #3, Wilmington, Delaware. Objections due by 8/5/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A # 2 Exhibit B # 3 Exhibit C # 4 Exhibit D) (Songonuga, Natasha) (Entered: 07/15/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1446 Filed: 7/15/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Monthly Application for Compensation (Tenth) for the period June 1, 2015 to June 30, 2015 Filed by Young Conaway Stargatt & Taylor, LLP. Objections due by 8/4/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Notice # 2 Exhibit A # 3 Exhibit B # 4 Exhibit C # 5 Affidavit of Service) (Lunn, Matthew) (Entered: 07/15/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1445 Filed: 7/15/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Monthly Application for Compensation (Fifth) for the period June 1, 2015 to June 30, 2015 Filed by Robbins, Russell, Englert, Orseck, Untereiner & Sauber LLP. Objections due by 8/4/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Notice # 2 Exhibit A # 3 Exhibit B # 4 Exhibit C # 5 Affidavit of Service) (Poppiti, Jr., Robert) (Entered: 07/15/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1444 Filed: 7/15/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Quarterly Claims Register Alphabetical. Filed by Prime Clerk. (Attachments: # 1 Quarterly Claims Register - Numerical) (Steele, Benjamin) (Entered: 07/15/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1443 Filed: 7/15/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Monthly Application for Compensation (Tenth) of The Law Office of Nathan A. Schultz P.C. as Co-Counsel for the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors for the period June 1, 2015 to June 30, 2015 Filed by OFFICIAL COMMITTEE OF UNSECURED CREDITORS. Objections due by 8/4/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A # 2 Exhibit B) (Songonuga, Natasha) (Entered: 07/15/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1442 Filed: 7/14/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              The transcriber has requested a standing order for all hearings in this case for the period 7/14/2015 to 7/28/2015 To obtain a copy of a transcript contact the transcriber, Veritext, Telephone number (888)706-4576. (BJM) (Entered: 07/14/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1441 Filed: 7/13/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Affidavit/Declaration of Mailing of Sebastian V. Higgins Regarding Order (SECOND) Extending the Period Within Which the Debtors May Remove Actions. Filed by Prime Clerk. (related document(s)1250) (Steele, Benjamin) (Entered: 07/13/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1440 Filed: 7/13/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Affidavit/Declaration of Mailing of Jordan D. Searles Regarding 1) Debtors' Motion for Entry of an Order, Pursuant to Section 105(a) of the Bankruptcy Code and Bankruptcy Rule 9019, Approving the Release and Settlement Agreement By and Among the Debtors and Luz Sota; 2) Motion to Extend Exclusivity Period for Filing a Chapter 11 Plan and Disclosure Statement; 3) Order Granting Debtors' Motion For Entry Of An Order (I) Approving The Debtors' Entry Into Restrictive Covenants Regarding The Plaza; (II) Approving The Execution And Recordation Of The Related Declaration Of Restrictive Covenants, Nunc Pro Tunc To June 26, 2015; And (III) Granting Related Relief; and 4) Debtors' Motion for Entry of an Order, Pursuant to Sections 105(a), 363(b), 364(c), and 365 of the Bankruptcy Code and Bankruptcy Rule 6004, (I) Authorizing Plaza Associates to Transfer Certain Slot Machines and Licenses to Taj Mahal Associates, (II) Approving the Related Assignment Agreement, (III) Approving the Cure Schedule and Claim Amount Stipulation, and (IV) Granting Related Relief. Filed by Prime Clerk. (related document(s)1428, 1429, 1431, 1435) (Adler, Adam) (Entered: 07/13/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1439 Filed: 7/12/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    BNC Certificate of Mailing. (related document(s)1436) Notice Date 07/12/2015. (Admin.) (Entered: 07/13/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1438 Filed: 7/11/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Affidavit/Declaration of Mailing of Jordan D. Searles Regarding Order Scheduling Omnibus Hearing. Filed by Prime Clerk. (related document(s)1424) (Adler, Adam) (Entered: 07/11/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1437 Filed: 7/10/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Response of Eleanor Stokes to Ninth Omnibus Objection to Claims (related document(s)1352) Filed by Eleanor Stokes (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A # 2 Exhibit Exhibit B) (Weaver, John) (Entered: 07/10/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1436 Filed: 7/10/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Transcript regarding Hearing Held 7/9/2015 RE: Motion Regarding Taxing Provisions/Motion to Shorten. Remote electronic access to the transcript is restricted until 10/8/2015. The transcript may be viewed at the Bankruptcy Court Clerk's Office. [For information about how to contact the transcriber, call the Clerk's Office] or [Contact the Court Reporter/Transcriber Veritext, Telephone number (888)706-4576.] (RE: related document(s) 1421). Notice of Intent to Request Redaction Deadline Due By 7/17/2015. Redaction Request Due By 7/31/2015. Redacted Transcript Submission Due By 8/10/2015. Transcript access will be restricted through 10/8/2015. (BJM) (Entered: 07/10/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1435 Filed: 7/9/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Debtors' Motion for Entry of an Order, Pursuant to Sections 105(a), 363(b), 364(c), and 365 of the Bankruptcy Code and Bankruptcy Rule 6004, (I) Authorizing Plaza Associates to Transfer Certain Slot Machines and Licenses to Taj Mahal Associates, (II) Approving the Related Assignment Agreement, (III) Approving the Cure Schedule and Claim Amount Stipulation, and (IV) Granting Related Relief Filed by Trump Entertainment Resorts, Inc.. Hearing scheduled for 7/30/2015 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #3, Wilmington, Delaware. Objections due by 7/23/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Notice # 2 Exhibit A # 3 Exhibit B # 4 Exhibit C) (Poppiti, Jr., Robert) Modified on 7/10/2015 (SH). (Entered: 07/09/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1434 Filed: 7/9/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Affidavit/Declaration of Service (related document(s)1432, 1433) Filed by Trump Entertainment Resorts, Inc.. (Jacobs, Ashley) (Entered: 07/09/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1433 Filed: 7/9/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Certificate of No Objection Regarding Ninth Monthly Fee Application for the Period From May 1, 2015 Through May 31, 2015 (related document(s)1381) Filed by Young Conaway Stargatt & Taylor, LLP. (Jacobs, Ashley) (Entered: 07/09/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1432 Filed: 7/9/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Certificate of No Objection Regarding Fourth Monthly Fee Application for the Period From April 1, 2015 Through May 31, 2015 (related document(s)1380) Filed by Robbins, Russell, Englert, Orseck, Untereiner & Sauber LLP. (Jacobs, Ashley) (Entered: 07/09/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1431 Filed: 7/9/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Order Granting Debtors' Motion For Entry Of An Order (I) Approving The Debtors' Entry Into Restrictive Covenants Regarding The Plaza; (II) Approving The Execution And Recordation Of The Related Declaration Of Restrictive Covenants, Nunc Pro Tunc To June 26, 2015; And (III) Granting Related Relief. (Related Doc # 1404)(related document(s)1407) Order Signed on 7/9/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1) (BJM) (Entered: 07/09/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1430 Filed: 7/9/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Minutes of Hearing held on: 07/09/2015 Subject: MOTION REGARDING TAXING PROVISIONS; MOTION TO SHORTEN;. (vCal Hearing ID (200771)). (related document(s) 1421) (SS) Additional attachment(s) added on 7/9/2015 (SS). (Entered: 07/09/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1429 Filed: 7/9/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Motion to Extend Exclusivity Period for Filing a Chapter 11 Plan and Disclosure Statement Filed by Trump Entertainment Resorts, Inc.. Hearing scheduled for 7/30/2015 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #3, Wilmington, Delaware. Objections due by 7/23/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Notice # 2 Exhibit A) (Poppiti, Jr., Robert) (Entered: 07/09/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1428 Filed: 7/9/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Debtors' Motion for Entry of an Order, Pursuant to Section 105(a) of the Bankruptcy Code and Bankruptcy Rule 9019, Approving the Release and Settlement Agreement By and Among the Debtors and Luz Sota Filed by Trump Entertainment Resorts, Inc.. Hearing scheduled for 7/30/2015 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #3, Wilmington, Delaware. Objections due by 7/23/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Notice # 2 Exhibit A) (Poppiti, Jr., Robert) Modified on 7/9/2015 (SH). (Entered: 07/09/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1427 Filed: 7/8/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Certificate of No Objection regarding Ninth Monthly Application of Gibbons P.C. as Co-Counsel to the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors for Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses for the Period from to May 1, 2015 through May 31, 2015 (related document(s)1373) Filed by OFFICIAL COMMITTEE OF UNSECURED CREDITORS. (Songonuga, Natasha) (Entered: 07/08/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1426 Filed: 7/8/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Certificate of No Objection regarding Ninth Monthly Application of The Law Office of Nathan A. Schultz, P.C. as Co-Counsel for the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors for Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses for the Period from May 1, 2015 through May 31, 2015 (related document(s)1370) Filed by OFFICIAL COMMITTEE OF UNSECURED CREDITORS. (Songonuga, Natasha) (Entered: 07/08/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1425 Filed: 7/8/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Certificate of No Objection Regarding Eighth Monthly Fee Application for the Period From May 1, 2015 Through May 31, 2015 (related document(s)1378) Filed by Houlihan Lokey Capital, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Service) (Jacobs, Ashley) (Entered: 07/08/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1424 Filed: 7/8/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Order Scheduling Omnibus Hearing. All hearings will be held at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #3, Wilmington, Delaware. Omnibus Hearing scheduled for 8/27/2015 at 02:00 PM. Signed on 7/8/2015. (SS) (Entered: 07/08/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1423 Filed: 6/26/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Response to the Ninth Omnibus (Non Substantive) Objection to Certain (A)Duplicate Claim and (B)No Documentation Claims (related document(s)1352) Filed by Richard Payne (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit # 2 Proposed Form of Order) (SH) (Entered: 07/08/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1422 Filed: 7/7/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Certificate of Service regarding Third Interim Application of PricewaterhouseCoopers LLP for Compensation for Services Rendered and Reimbursement of Expenses as Financial Advisor to the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors for the Period from March 1, 2015 to May 31, 2015 (related document(s)1420) Filed by OFFICIAL COMMITTEE OF UNSECURED CREDITORS. (Songonuga, Natasha) (Entered: 07/07/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1421 Filed: 7/7/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing Filed by Trump Entertainment Resorts, Inc.. Hearing scheduled for 7/9/2015 at 11:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #3, Wilmington, Delaware. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Service) (Poppiti, Jr., Robert) (Entered: 07/07/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1420 Filed: 7/7/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Interim Application for Compensation (Third) of PricewaterhouseCoopers LLP as Financial Advisor for the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors for Compensation for Services Rendered and Reimbursement of Expenses for the period March 1, 2015 to May 31, 2015 Filed by OFFICIAL COMMITTEE OF UNSECURED CREDITORS. Hearing scheduled for 8/27/2015 at 02:00 PM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #3, Wilmington, Delaware. Objections due by 7/27/2015. (Songonuga, Natasha) (Entered: 07/07/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1419 Filed: 7/6/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Certificate of No Objection regarding Seventh Monthly Application of PricewaterhouseCoopers LLP as Financial Advisor for the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors for Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses for the period April 1, 2015 to April 30, 2015 (related document(s)1365) Filed by OFFICIAL COMMITTEE OF UNSECURED CREDITORS. (Songonuga, Natasha) (Entered: 07/06/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1418 Filed: 7/2/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Affidavit/Declaration of Service of Jordan D. Searles Regarding Notice of Eighth Monthly Application of Ernst & Young LLP for Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses as Auditors and Tax Advisors to the Debtors for the Period from May 1, 2015 through May 31, 2015, Debtors' Tenth (10th) Omnibus (Substantive) Objection to Claims, Debtors' Eleventh (11th) Omnibus (Non-Substantive) Objection to Claims, and Debtors' Fifth (5th) Notice of Satisfaction of Claims (related document(s)1410, 1412, 1413, 1414) Filed by Prime Clerk. (Steele, Benjamin) (Entered: 07/02/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1417 Filed: 7/2/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Certification of Counsel Regarding Order Scheduling Omnibus Hearing Date Filed by Trump Entertainment Resorts, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A) (Poppiti, Jr., Robert) (Entered: 07/02/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1416 Filed: 7/1/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Affidavit of Service of Jordan D. Searles Regarding 1) Order Authorizing the Debtors to Reject an Unexpired Lease with Preferred Coffee LLC D/B/A Starbucks Nunc Pro Tunc to the Rejection Effective Date; and 2) Order Shortening the Time for Notice of Debtors' Motion for Entry of an Order (I)Approving the Debtors' Entry Into Restrictive Covenants Regarding the Plaza (II)Approving the Execution and Recordation of the Related Declaration of Restrictive Covenants Nunc Pro Tunc to June 26, 2015 and (III)Granting Related Relief. Filed by Prime Clerk. (related document(s)1406, 1407) (Adler, Adam) Modified docket text on 7/2/2015 (LMD). (Entered: 07/01/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1415 Filed: 6/30/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Affidavit/Declaration of Service of Jordan D. Searles Regarding Debtors' Motion for Entry of an Order (I) Approving the Debtors' Entry into Restrictive Covenants Regarding the Plaza; (II) Approving the Execution and Recordation of the Related Declaration of Restrictive Covenants, Nunc Pro Tunc to June 26, 2015; and (III) Granting Related Relief, and Debtors' Motion for Entry of Order Shortening the Time for Notice of Debtors' Motion for Entry of an Order (I) Approving the Debtors' Entry into Restrictive Covenants Regarding the Plaza; (II) Approving the Execution and Recordation of the Related Declaration of Restrictive Covenants, Nunc Pro Tunc to June 26, 2015; and (III) Granting Related Relief (related document(s)1404, 1405) Filed by Prime Clerk. (Steele, Benjamin) (Entered: 06/30/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1414 Filed: 6/30/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Notice of Satisfaction of Claim(s) Filed by Trump Entertainment Resorts, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A) (Poppiti, Jr., Robert) (Entered: 06/30/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1413 Filed: 6/30/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Omnibus Objection to Claims (Eleventh) (Non-Substantive). Filed by Trump Entertainment Resorts, Inc.. Hearing scheduled for 7/30/2015 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #3, Wilmington, Delaware. Objections due by 7/14/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Notice # 2 Exhibit 1 # 3 Exhibit 2) (Poppiti, Jr., Robert) (Entered: 06/30/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1412 Filed: 6/30/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Omnibus Objection to Claims (Tenth) (Substantive). Filed by Trump Entertainment Resorts, Inc.. Hearing scheduled for 7/30/2015 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #3, Wilmington, Delaware. Objections due by 7/14/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Notice # 2 Exhibit 1 # 3 Exhibit 2) (Poppiti, Jr., Robert) (Entered: 06/30/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1411 Filed: 6/30/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Debtor-In-Possession Monthly Operating Report for Filing Period May 1, 2015 to May 31, 2015 Filed by Trump Entertainment Resorts, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Service) (Poppiti, Jr., Robert) (Entered: 06/30/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1410 Filed: 6/30/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Monthly Application for Compensation (Eighth) for the period May 1, 2015 to May 31, 2015 Filed by Ernst & Young LLP. Objections due by 7/20/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Notice # 2 Exhibit A # 3 Exhibit B # 4 Affidavit of Service) (Bambrick, Ian) (Entered: 06/30/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1409 Filed: 6/30/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                The transcriber has requested a standing order for all hearings in this case for the period 6/30/2015 to 7/14/2015. To obtain a copy of a transcript contact the transcriber Veritext. Telephone number (516)608-2400. (GM) (Entered: 06/30/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1408 Filed: 6/29/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Certificate of No Objection Regarding Eighth Monthly Fee Application for the Period From April 1, 2015 Through April 30, 2015 (related document(s)1353) Filed by Stroock & Stroock & Lavan LLP. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Service) (Jacobs, Ashley) (Entered: 06/29/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1407 Filed: 6/29/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Order Shortening the Time for Notice of Debtors' Motion for Entry of an Order (I)Approving the Debtors' Entry Into Restrictive Covenants Regarding the Plaza (II)Approving the Execution and Recordation of the Related Declaration of Restrictive Covenants Nunc Pro Tunc to June 26, 2015 and (III)Granting Related Relief (Related Doc # 1405)(related document(s)1404) Order Signed on 6/29/2015. (SH) (Entered: 06/29/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1406 Filed: 6/29/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Order Authorizing the Debtors to Reject an Unexpired Lease with Preferred Coffee LLC D/B/A Starbucks Nunc Pro Tunc to the Rejection Effective Date (related document(s)387, 473, 1399) Order Signed on 6/29/2015. (SH) (Entered: 06/29/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1405 Filed: 6/26/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Motion to Shorten the Time for Notice of the Debtors' Motion for Entry of an Order, Pursuant to Sections 105(a) and 363(b) of the Bankruptcy Code and Bankruptcy Rule 6004, (I) Approving the Debtors' Entry Into Restrictive Covenants Regarding the Plaza; (II) Approving the Execution and Recordation of the Related Declaration of Restrictive Covenants, Nunc Pro Tunc to June 26, 2015; and (III) Granting Related Relief (related document(s)1404) Filed by Trump Entertainment Resorts, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A) (Poppiti, Jr., Robert) (Entered: 06/26/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1404 Filed: 6/26/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Debtors' Motion for Entry of an Order, Pursuant to Sections 105(a) and 363(b) of the Bankruptcy Code and Bankruptcy Rule 6004, (I) Approving the Debtors' Entry Into Restrictive Covenants Regarding the Plaza; (II) Approving the Execution and Recordation of the Related Declaration of Restrictive Covenants, Nunc Pro Tunc to June 26, 2015; and (III) Granting Related Relief Filed by Trump Entertainment Resorts, Inc.. Hearing scheduled for 7/9/2015 at 11:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #3, Wilmington, Delaware. Objections due by 7/7/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Notice # 2 Exhibit A # 3 Exhibit B # 4 Exhibit C) (Poppiti, Jr., Robert) Modified on 6/29/2015 (SH). (Entered: 06/26/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1403 Filed: 6/26/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Certificate of No Objection Regarding Seventh Monthly Fee Application for the Period From April 1, 2015 Through April 30, 2015 (related document(s)1349) Filed by Ernst & Young LLP. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Service) (Bambrick, Ian) (Entered: 06/26/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1402 Filed: 6/26/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Response to Debtors' Ninth Omnibus Objection Filed by Angela Johnson (Cipparone, Rocco) (Entered: 06/26/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1401 Filed: 6/26/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Certificate of Service regarding Eighth Monthly Application of PricewaterhouseCoopers LLP for Compensation for Services Rendered and Reimbursement of Expenses as Financial Advisor to the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors for the Period from May 1, 2015 to May 31, 2015 (related document(s)1400) Filed by OFFICIAL COMMITTEE OF UNSECURED CREDITORS. (Songonuga, Natasha) (Entered: 06/26/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1400 Filed: 6/26/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Monthly Application for Compensation (Eighth) of PricewaterhouseCoopers LLP for Compensation for Services Rendered and Reimbursement of Expenses as Financial Advisor for the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors for the period May 1, 2015 to May 31, 2015 Filed by OFFICIAL COMMITTEE OF UNSECURED CREDITORS. Objections due by 7/16/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A # 2 Exhibit B # 3 Exhibit C) (Songonuga, Natasha) (Entered: 06/26/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1399 Filed: 6/26/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Certification of Counsel Regarding Debtors' First Motion for Entry of an Order, Pursuant to Sections 105(a) and 365(a) of the Bankruptcy Code, Authorizing the Debtors to Reject Certain Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases, Nunc Pro Tunc to the Rejection Effective Date (related document(s)387, 473) Filed by Trump Entertainment Resorts, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1) (Poppiti, Jr., Robert) (Entered: 06/26/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1398 Filed: 6/24/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Response to Ninth Omnibus Objection to Claims (related document(s)1352) Filed by Alesia Lester (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A # 2 Exhibit B # 3 Exhibit C # 4 Exhibit D # 5 Exhibit E # 6 Exhibit F # 7 Exhibit G # 8 Exhibit H) (SH) (Entered: 06/24/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1397 Filed: 6/16/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Response to Notice of Ninth Omnibus (Non Substantive) Objection to Certain (A)Duplicate Claims and (B)No Documentation Claims (related document(s)1352) Filed by Stephanie Fashauer (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A # 2 Exhibit B Part 1 # 3 Exhibit B Part 2 # 4 Exhibit B Part 3) (SH) (Entered: 06/24/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1396 Filed: 6/16/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Response to Motion to Expunge the Unsecured Claim of Fatima Ahmed (related document(s)1352) Filed by Fatima Ahmed (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A # 2 Exhibit B # 3 Exhibit C) (SH) Additional attachment(s) added on 6/24/2015 (SH). (Entered: 06/24/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1395 Filed: 6/23/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Affidavit/Declaration of Mailing of Timothy R. Quinn regarding Monthly Application for Compensation (Ninth) for the period May 1, 2015 to May 31, 2015 Filed by Stroock & Stroock & Lavan LLP. Filed by Prime Clerk. (related document(s)1394) (Steele, Benjamin) (Entered: 06/23/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1394 Filed: 6/22/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Monthly Application for Compensation (Ninth) for the period May 1, 2015 to May 31, 2015 Filed by Stroock & Stroock & Lavan LLP. Objections due by 7/13/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Notice # 2 Exhibit A # 3 Exhibit B # 4 Exhibit C # 5 Affidavit of Service) (Jacobs, Ashley) (Entered: 06/22/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1393 Filed: 6/22/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Certificate of No Objection Regarding Seventh Monthly Fee Application for the Period From April 1, 2015 Through April 30, 2015 (related document(s)1342) Filed by Prime Clerk. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Service) (Jacobs, Ashley) (Entered: 06/22/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1392 Filed: 6/22/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Affidavit/Declaration of Mailing of Steven Gordon Regarding Order Further Extending the Time Within Which the Debtors Must Assume or Reject a Certain Unexpired Lease of Nonresidential Real Property with the Prior Written Consent of the Lessor (R&R Associates) Under Such Lease. Filed by Prime Clerk. (related document(s)1386) (Adler, Adam) (Entered: 06/22/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1391 Filed: 6/22/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Affidavit/Declaration of Service of Steven Gordon Regarding Notice of Amendment to Statements of Financial Affairs of Trump Plaza Associates, LLC, Notice of Amendment to Statements of Financial Affairs of Trump Marina Associates, LLC, and Notice of Amendment to Statements of Financial Affairs of Trump Taj Mahal Associates, LLC (related document(s)1382, 1383, 1384) Filed by Prime Clerk. (Steele, Benjamin) (Entered: 06/22/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1390 Filed: 6/22/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Response to Ninth Omnibus Objection to Claims (related document(s)1352) Filed by Phyllis Ehret (SH) (Entered: 06/22/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1389 Filed: 6/22/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Response to Ninth Omnibus Objection to Claims (related document(s)1352) Filed by Phyllis Longo (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 # 2 Exhibit 2 # 3 Exhibit 3 # 4 Exhibit 4 # 5 Exhibit 5) (SH) (Entered: 06/22/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1388 Filed: 6/19/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Affidavit/Declaration of Mailing of Timothy R. Quinn Regarding 1) Notice of Monthly Application for Compensation (Fourth) for the period April 1, 2015 to May 31, 2015 Filed by Robbins, Russell, Englert, Orseck, Untereiner & Sauber LLP; and 2) NOtice of Monthly Application for Compensation (Ninth) for the period May 1, 2015 to May 31, 2015 Filed by Young Conaway Stargatt & Taylor, LLP. Filed by Prime Clerk. (related document(s)1380, 1381) (Adler, Adam) (Entered: 06/19/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1387 Filed: 6/19/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Affidavit/Declaration of Mailing of Timothy R. Quinn Regarding Monthly Application for Compensation (Eighth) for the period May 1, 2015 to May 31, 2015 Filed by Houlihan Lokey Capital, Inc... Filed by Prime Clerk. (related document(s)1378) (Adler, Adam) (Entered: 06/19/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1386 Filed: 6/19/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Order Further Extending the Time Within Which the Debtors Must Assume or Reject a Certain Unexpired Lease of Nonresidential Real Property with the Prior Written Consent of the Lessor (R&R Associates) Under Such Lease (related document(s)668, 1115, 1385) Order Signed on 6/19/2015. (SH) (Entered: 06/19/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1385 Filed: 6/19/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Certification of Counsel Regarding Proposed Order Further Extending the Time Within Which the Debtors Must Assume or Reject a Certain Unexpired Lease of Nonresidential Real Property With the Prior Written Consent of the Lessor (R&R Associates) Under Such Lease (related document(s)668, 1115) Filed by Trump Entertainment Resorts, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 # 2 Exhibit 2) (Poppiti, Jr., Robert) (Entered: 06/19/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1384 Filed: 6/18/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Amended Schedules/Statements filed: , , Stmt of Financial Affairs,. (Trump Taj Mahal Associates, LLC) Filed by Trump Entertainment Resorts, Inc.. (Poppiti, Jr., Robert) (Entered: 06/18/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1383 Filed: 6/18/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Amended Schedules/Statements filed: , , Stmt of Financial Affairs,. (Trump Marina Associates, LLC) Filed by Trump Entertainment Resorts, Inc.. (Poppiti, Jr., Robert) (Entered: 06/18/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1382 Filed: 6/18/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Amended Schedules/Statements filed: , , Stmt of Financial Affairs,. (Trump Plaza Associates, LLC) Filed by Trump Entertainment Resorts, Inc.. (Poppiti, Jr., Robert) (Entered: 06/18/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1381 Filed: 6/17/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Monthly Application for Compensation (Ninth) for the period May 1, 2015 to May 31, 2015 Filed by Young Conaway Stargatt & Taylor, LLP. Objections due by 7/7/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Notice # 2 Exhibit A # 3 Exhibit B # 4 Exhibit C # 5 Affidavit of Service) (Lunn, Matthew) (Entered: 06/17/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1380 Filed: 6/17/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Monthly Application for Compensation (Fourth) for the period April 1, 2015 to May 31, 2015 Filed by Robbins, Russell, Englert, Orseck, Untereiner & Sauber LLP. Objections due by 7/7/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Notice # 2 Exhibit A # 3 Exhibit B # 4 Exhibit C # 5 Affidavit of Service) (Bambrick, Ian) (Entered: 06/17/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1379 Filed: 6/17/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            HEARING CANCELLED/RESCHEDULED. Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing. Filed by Trump Entertainment Resorts, Inc.. Hearing scheduled for 6/17/2015 at 02:00 PM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #3, Wilmington, Delaware. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Service) (Poppiti, Jr., Robert) (Entered: 06/17/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1378 Filed: 6/16/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Monthly Application for Compensation (Eighth) for the period May 1, 2015 to May 31, 2015 Filed by Houlihan Lokey Capital, Inc.. Objections due by 7/6/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Notice # 2 Exhibit A # 3 Exhibit B # 4 Exhibit C # 5 Affidavit of Service) (Jacobs, Ashley) (Entered: 06/16/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1377 Filed: 6/16/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                The transcriber has requested a standing order for all hearings in this case for the period 6/16/2015 to 6/30/2015. To obtain a copy of a transcript contact the transcriber, Veritext, Telephone number (888)706-4576. (BJM) (Entered: 06/16/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1376 Filed: 6/15/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Certificate of Service regarding Ninth Monthly Application of Gibbons P.C. as Co-Counsel to the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors for Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses for the Period from to May 1, 2015 through May 31, 2015 (related document(s)1373) Filed by OFFICIAL COMMITTEE OF UNSECURED CREDITORS. (Songonuga, Natasha) (Entered: 06/15/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1375 Filed: 6/15/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Certificate of Service regarding Ninth Monthly Application of The Law Office of Nathan A. Schultz, P.C. as Co-Counsel for the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors for Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses for the Period from May 1, 2015 through May 31, 2015 (related document(s)1370) Filed by OFFICIAL COMMITTEE OF UNSECURED CREDITORS. (Songonuga, Natasha) (Entered: 06/15/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1374 Filed: 6/15/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Certificate of No Objection Regarding Seventh Monthly Fee Application for the Period From April 1, 2015 Through April 30, 2015 (related document(s)1331) Filed by Houlihan Lokey Capital, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Service) (Jacobs, Ashley) (Entered: 06/15/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1373 Filed: 6/15/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Monthly Application for Compensation (Ninth) of Gibbons P.C. as Co-Counsel for the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors for the period May 1, 2015 to May 31, 2015 Filed by OFFICIAL COMMITTEE OF UNSECURED CREDITORS. Objections due by 7/6/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A) (Songonuga, Natasha) (Entered: 06/15/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1372 Filed: 6/15/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Order Granting Motion for Relief from the Automatic Stay of Maryanne Klemmer, Bruce Pearlman and Gerald Florio (Related Doc # 1136)(related document(s)1368) Order Signed on 6/15/2015. (SH) (Entered: 06/15/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1371 Filed: 6/15/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Order Regarding Motion For Relief From Stay (Related Doc # 1175)(related document(s)1359) Order Signed on 6/15/2015. (SH) (Entered: 06/15/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1370 Filed: 6/15/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Monthly Application for Compensation (Ninth) of The Law Office of Nathan A. Schultz P.C. as Co-Counsel for the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors for the period May 1, 2015 to May 31, 2015 Filed by OFFICIAL COMMITTEE OF UNSECURED CREDITORS. Objections due by 7/6/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A # 2 Exhibit B) (Songonuga, Natasha) (Entered: 06/15/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1369 Filed: 6/15/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing Filed by Trump Entertainment Resorts, Inc.. Hearing scheduled for 6/17/2015 at 02:00 PM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #3, Wilmington, Delaware. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Service) (Poppiti, Jr., Robert) (Entered: 06/15/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1368 Filed: 6/15/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Certification of Counsel Regarding Motion of Maryanne Klemmer, Bruce Pearlman, and Gerald Florio Seeking an Order Removing From Bankruptcy Court Movants' Complaint as Against Co-Defendant John M. Donnelly, Esquire Only (related document(s)1136) Filed by Trump Entertainment Resorts, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1) (Poppiti, Jr., Robert) (Entered: 06/15/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1367 Filed: 6/12/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Affidavit/Declaration of Mailing of Jordan D. Searles Regarding Order Scheduling Omnibus Hearing on for 7/30/2015 at 10:00 AM. Filed by Prime Clerk. (related document(s)1351) (Adler, Adam) (Entered: 06/12/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1366 Filed: 6/12/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Certificate of Service regarding Seventh Monthly Application of PricewaterhouseCoopers LLP for Services Rendered and Reimbursement of Expenses as Financial Advisor to the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors for Compensation for the Period from to April 1, 2015 through April 30, 2015 (related document(s)1365) Filed by OFFICIAL COMMITTEE OF UNSECURED CREDITORS. (Songonuga, Natasha) (Entered: 06/12/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1365 Filed: 6/12/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Monthly Application for Compensation (Seventh) of PricewaterhouseCoopers LLC as Financial Advisor for the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors for Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses for the period April 1, 2015 to April 30, 2015 Filed by OFFICIAL COMMITTEE OF UNSECURED CREDITORS. Objections due by 7/2/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A # 2 Exhibit B # 3 Exhibit C) (Songonuga, Natasha) (Entered: 06/12/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1364 Filed: 6/11/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Certificate of No Objection regarding Eighth Monthly Application of Gibbons P.C. as Co-Counsel to the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors for Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses for the Period from to April 1, 2015 through April 30, 2015 (related document(s)1321) Filed by OFFICIAL COMMITTEE OF UNSECURED CREDITORS. (Songonuga, Natasha) (Entered: 06/11/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1363 Filed: 6/10/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Affidavit/Declaration of Service of Jordan D. Searles Regarding Order Further Extending the Time Within Which the Debtors Must Assume or Reject a Certain Unexpired Lease of Nonresidential Real Property with the Prior Written Consent of the Lessor (Plaza Hotel Management Company) and Notice of Filing of Declaration of Disinterestedness of Ordinary Course Professional Towers Watson Delaware Inc. (related document(s)1344, 1345) Filed by Prime Clerk. (Steele, Benjamin) (Entered: 06/10/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1362 Filed: 6/10/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Certificate of No Objection regarding Sixth Monthly Application of PricewaterhouseCoopers LLP for Services Rendered and Reimbursement of Expenses as Financial Advisor to the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors for Compensation for the Period from to March 1, 2015 through March 31, 2015 (related document(s)1309) Filed by OFFICIAL COMMITTEE OF UNSECURED CREDITORS. (Songonuga, Natasha) (Entered: 06/10/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1361 Filed: 6/9/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Order on Motion of Claimant Bar AC, LLC for Reconsideration of Order, or in the Alternative Motion for Relief from Order (Related Doc # 1253, 1290, 1330, 1360). Signed on 6/9/2015. (SJS) (Entered: 06/09/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1360 Filed: 6/9/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Certification of Counsel Regarding Motion of Claimant Bar AC for Reconsideration of Order Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. § 502(j) and Federal Rule of Bankruptcy Procedure 3008, or in the Alternative Motion for Relief From Order Pursuant to Federal Rule of Bankruptcy Procedure 9024 (related document(s)1253, 1290, 1330) Filed by Bar AC, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Proposed Order # 2 Exhibit B) (Gellert, Ronald) (Entered: 06/09/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1359 Filed: 6/9/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Certification of Counsel RE: Motion Filed by Juan Ruiz and Theresa Ruiz for Relief from the Automatic Stay (related document(s)1175) Filed by Juan Ruiz, Theresa Ruiz. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Form of Order) (Weiler, Timothy) (Entered: 06/09/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1358 Filed: 6/8/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Affidavit/Declaration of Mailing of Jordan D. Searles Regarding Monthly Application for Compensation (Eighth) and Reimbursement of Expenses of Stroock & Stroock & Lavan LLP as Counsel for the Debtors for the period April 1, 2015 to April 30, 2015. Filed by Prime Clerk. (related document(s)1353) (Adler, Adam) (Entered: 06/08/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1357 Filed: 6/8/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Affidavit/Declaration of Mailing of Jordan D. Searles Regarding Monthly Application for Compensation (Seventh) for the period April 1, 2015 to April 30, 2015. Filed by Prime Clerk. (related document(s)1349) (Adler, Adam) (Entered: 06/08/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1356 Filed: 6/8/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Certificate of No Objection Regarding Eighth Monthly Fee Application for the Period From April 1, 2015 Through April 30, 2015 (related document(s)1306) Filed by Young Conaway Stargatt & Taylor, LLP. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Service) (Jacobs, Ashley) (Entered: 06/08/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1355 Filed: 6/8/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Certificate of No Objection regarding Eighth Monthly Application of The Law Office of Nathan A. Schultz, P.C. as Co-Counsel for the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors for Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses for the Period from April 1, 2015 through April 30, 2015 (related document(s)1307) Filed by OFFICIAL COMMITTEE OF UNSECURED CREDITORS. (Songonuga, Natasha) (Entered: 06/08/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1354 Filed: 6/5/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Certificate of Service regarding Ninth Omnibus (Non-Substantive Objection) to Certain (A) Duplicate Claims and (B) No Documentation Claims Pursuant to Section 502 of the Bankruptcy Code, Bankruptcy Rule 3007 and Local Rule 3007-1 with Exhibits A (Declaration) and B (Proposed Order) (related document(s)1352) Filed by OFFICIAL COMMITTEE OF UNSECURED CREDITORS. (Songonuga, Natasha) (Entered: 06/05/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1353 Filed: 6/5/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Monthly Application for Compensation (Eighth) and Reimbursement of Expenses of Stroock & Stroock & Lavan LLP as Counsel for the Debtors for the period April 1, 2015 to April 30, 2015 Filed by Trump Entertainment Resorts, Inc.. Objections due by 6/25/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Notice # 2 Exhibit A # 3 Exhibit B # 4 Exhibit C) (Jacobs, Ashley) (Entered: 06/05/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1352 Filed: 6/5/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Omnibus Objection to Claims - Ninth (Non-Substantive) to Certain (A) Duplicate Claims and (B) No Documentation Claims Pursuant to Section 502 of the Bankruptcy Code, Bankruptcy Rule 3007 and Local Rule 3007-1. Filed by OFFICIAL COMMITTEE OF UNSECURED CREDITORS. Hearing scheduled for 7/30/2015 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #3, Wilmington, Delaware. Objections due by 6/26/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Declaration # 2 Exhibit B - Proposed Order # 3 Notice) (Songonuga, Natasha) (Entered: 06/05/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1351 Filed: 6/5/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Order Scheduling Omnibus Hearing. All hearings will be held at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #3, Wilmington, Delaware . Omnibus Hearing scheduled for 7/30/2015 at 10:00 AM. Signed on 6/5/2015. (SS) (Entered: 06/05/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1350 Filed: 6/4/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Affidavit/Declaration of Service of Jordan D. Searles Regarding Monthly Fee Application of Prime Clerk LLC, Administrative Advisor to the Debtors, for Compensation for Services Rendered and Reimbursement of Expenses for the Period from April 1, 2015 to April 30, 2015 (related document(s)1342) Filed by Prime Clerk. (Steele, Benjamin) (Entered: 06/04/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1349 Filed: 6/4/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Monthly Application for Compensation (Seventh) for the period April 1, 2015 to April 30, 2015 Filed by Ernst & Young LLP. Objections due by 6/24/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Notice # 2 Exhibit A # 3 Exhibit B # 4 Affidavit of Service) (Bambrick, Ian) (Entered: 06/04/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1348 Filed: 6/3/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Affidavit/Declaration of Mailing of Jordan D. Searles Regarding Notice of Filing of Declaration of Disinterestedness of Ordinary Course Professional Slater Tenaglia Fritz & Hunt, P.A.. Filed by Prime Clerk. (related document(s)1340) (Adler, Adam) (Entered: 06/03/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1347 Filed: 6/3/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Certification of Counsel Regarding Order Scheduling Omnibus Hearing Date Filed by Trump Entertainment Resorts, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A) (Poppiti, Jr., Robert) (Entered: 06/03/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1346 Filed: 6/2/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              The transcriber has requested a standing order for all hearings in this case for the period 6/2/2015 to 6/16/2015. To obtain a copy of a transcript contact the transcriber Veritext. Telephone number (516)608-2400. (GM) (Entered: 06/02/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1345 Filed: 6/1/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Notice of Filing of Declaration of Disinterestedness of Ordinary Course Professional Towers Watson Delaware Inc. [Objections due by 6/15/2015] (related document(s)76, 221) Filed by Trump Entertainment Resorts, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A) (Jacobs, Ashley) Modified on 6/2/2015 (SH). (Entered: 06/01/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1344 Filed: 6/1/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Order Further Extending the Time Within Which the Debtors Must Assume or Reject a Certain Unexpired Lease of Nonresidential Real Property with the Prior Written Consent of the Lessor (Plaza Hotel Management Company) Under Such Lease (related document(s)668, 967, 1341) Order Signed on 6/1/2015. (SH) (Entered: 06/01/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1343 Filed: 5/29/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Debtor-In-Possession Monthly Operating Report for Filing Period April 1, 2015 to April 30, 2015 Filed by Trump Entertainment Resorts, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Service) (Poppiti, Jr., Robert) (Entered: 05/29/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1342 Filed: 5/29/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Monthly Application for Compensation of Prime Clerk LLC, Administrative Advisor to the Debtors, for the period from April 1, 2015 to April 30, 2015. Filed by Prime Clerk. Objections due by 6/18/2015. (Adler, Adam) (Entered: 05/29/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1341 Filed: 5/29/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Certification of Counsel Regarding Proposed Order Further Extending the Time Within Which the Debtors Must Assume or Reject a Certain Unexpired Lease of Nonresidential Real Property With the Prior Written Consent of the Lessor (Plaza Hotel Management Company) Under Such Lease (related document(s)668, 967) Filed by Trump Entertainment Resorts, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1) (Poppiti, Jr., Robert) (Entered: 05/29/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1340 Filed: 5/28/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Notice of Filing of Declaration of Disinterestedness of Ordinary Course Professional Slater Tenaglia Fritz & Hunt, P.A. [Objections due by 6/11/2015] (related document(s)76, 221). Filed by Trump Entertainment Resorts, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A) (Jacobs, Ashley) Modified on 5/29/2015 (SJS). (Entered: 05/28/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1339 Filed: 5/27/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Affidavit of Service of Jordan D. Searles Regarding 1) Order Approving Interim Fee Requests of the Debtors' Professionals for the Period from December 1, 2014 Through February 28, 2015; and 2) Monthly Application for Compensation (Seventh) for the period April 1, 2015 to April 30, 2015. Filed by Prime Clerk. (related document(s)1327, 1331) (Adler, Adam) Modified docket text on 5/29/2015 (LMD). (Entered: 05/27/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1338 Filed: 5/27/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Affidavit of Service Regarding Objection to Motion of Unite Here Health for Allowance of Administrative Claim Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. § 503(b)(1)(A). (related document(s)1302) Filed by Trump Entertainment Resorts, Inc.. (Poppiti, Jr., Robert) Modified docket text on 5/29/2015 (LMD). (Entered: 05/27/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1337 Filed: 5/27/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Affidavit of Service Regarding Preliminary Response to Motion of Marilyn Mazzella for Relief from the Automatic Stay. (related document(s)1301) Filed by Trump Entertainment Resorts, Inc.. (Poppiti, Jr., Robert) Modified docket text on 5/29/2015 (LMD). (Entered: 05/27/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1336 Filed: 5/24/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  BNC Certificate of Mailing. (related document(s)1332) Notice Date 05/24/2015. (Admin.) (Entered: 05/25/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1335 Filed: 5/22/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Certificate of No Objection Regarding Sixth Monthly Fee Application for the Period From March 1, 2015 Through March 31, 2015 (related document(s)1275) Filed by Prime Clerk. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Service) (Jacobs, Ashley) (Entered: 05/22/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1334 Filed: 5/22/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Affidavit/Declaration of Mailing . Filed by Bar AC, LLC. (related document(s)1330) (Matthews, Gene) (Entered: 05/22/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1333 Filed: 5/22/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Affidavit/Declaration of Service of Timothy R. Quinn Regarding Order Scheduling Omnibus Hearings and Eighth Monthly Application of Young Conaway Stargatt & Taylor, LLP for Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses as Co-Counsel to the Debtors and Debtors-In-Possession for the Period April 1, 2015 through April 30, 2015 (related document(s)1297, 1306) Filed by Prime Clerk. (Steele, Benjamin) (Entered: 05/22/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1332 Filed: 5/22/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Transcript regarding Hearing Held 05/21/2015 RE: Fee Application. Remote electronic access to the transcript is restricted until 8/20/2015. The transcript may be viewed at the Bankruptcy Court Clerk's Office. [For information about how to contact the transcriber, call the Clerk's Office] or [Contact the Court Reporter/Transcriber Veritext, Telephone number (212)267-6868.] Notice of Intent to Request Redaction Deadline Due By 5/29/2015. Redaction Request Due By 6/12/2015. Redacted Transcript Submission Due By 6/22/2015. Transcript access will be restricted through 8/20/2015. (related document(s)1320) (GM) (Entered: 05/22/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1331 Filed: 5/22/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Monthly Application for Compensation (Seventh) for the period April 1, 2015 to April 30, 2015 Filed by Houlihan Lokey Capital, Inc.. Objections due by 6/11/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Notice # 2 Exhibit A # 3 Exhibit B # 4 Exhibit C # 5 Affidavit of Service) (Jacobs, Ashley) (Entered: 05/22/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 1330 Filed: 5/21/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Motion to Reconsider Order Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. § 502(J) and Federal Rule of Bankruptcy Procedure 3008, or in the Alternative Motion For Relief From Order Pursuant to Federal Rule of Bankruptcy Procedure 9024 (related document(s)1253, 1290) Filed by Bar AC, LLC (related document(s)1253, 1290). Hearing scheduled for 6/17/2015 at 02:00 PM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #3, Wilmington, Delaware. Objections due by 6/4/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Notice # 2 Exhibit A # 3 Proposed Form of Order # 4 Certificate of Service) (Gellert, Ronald) (Entered: 05/21/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1329 Filed: 5/21/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Certificate of No Objection Regarding Sixth Monthly Fee Application for the Period From March 1, 2015 Through March 31, 2015 (related document(s)1271) Filed by Houlihan Lokey Capital, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Service) (Jacobs, Ashley) (Entered: 05/21/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1328 Filed: 5/21/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Affidavit/Declaration of Service of Timothy R. Quinn Regarding Debtors' Preliminary Response to Motion of Marilyn Mazzella for Relief from the Automatic Stay, Debtors' Objection to Motion of Unite Here Health for Allowance of Administrative Claim (related document(s)1301, 1302) Filed by Prime Clerk. (Steele, Benjamin) (Entered: 05/21/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1327 Filed: 5/21/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Order Approving Interim Fee Requests of the Debtors' Professionals for the Period from December 1, 2014 Through February 28, 2015 (Related Doc # 1226) Order Signed on 5/21/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A) (SH) (Entered: 05/21/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1326 Filed: 5/21/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Order Granting the Second Interim Quarterly Applications of All Professionals for the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Trump Entertainment Resorts Inc. et al for Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses for the Period from December 2014 Through February 2015 (Related Doc # 1222), (Related Doc # 1223), (Related Doc # 1224) Order Signed on 5/21/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A) (SH) (Entered: 05/21/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1325 Filed: 5/21/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Minutes of Hearing held on: 05/21/2015 Subject: INTERIM FEE APPLICATIONS & OMNIBUS HEARING. (vCal Hearing ID (196931)). (related document(s) 1320) (SS) Additional attachment(s) added on 5/21/2015 (SS). (Entered: 05/21/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1324 Filed: 5/20/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Certificate of No Objection Regarding Sixth Monthly Fee Application for the Period From March 1, 2015 Through March 31, 2015 (related document(s)1268) Filed by Ernst & Young LLP. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Service) (Jacobs, Ashley) (Entered: 05/20/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1323 Filed: 5/20/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Order Regarding Motion For Relief From Stay (Related Doc # 935) Order Signed on 5/20/2015. (SH) (Entered: 05/20/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1322 Filed: 5/20/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Certificate of Service regarding Eighth Monthly Application of Gibbons P.C. as Co-Counsel for the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors for Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses for the Period from April 1, 2015 through April 30, 2015 (related document(s)1321) Filed by OFFICIAL COMMITTEE OF UNSECURED CREDITORS. (Songonuga, Natasha) (Entered: 05/20/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1321 Filed: 5/20/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Monthly Application for Compensation (Eighth) of Gibbons P.C. as Co-Counsel for the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors for the period April 1, 2015 to April 30, 2015 Filed by OFFICIAL COMMITTEE OF UNSECURED CREDITORS. Objections due by 6/9/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A # 2 Exhibit B) (Songonuga, Natasha) (Entered: 05/20/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 1320 Filed: 5/20/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Amended Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing Filed by Trump Entertainment Resorts, Inc.. Hearing scheduled for 5/21/2015 at 10:30 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #3, Wilmington, Delaware. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A # 2 Affidavit of Service) (Poppiti, Jr., Robert) (Entered: 05/20/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1319 Filed: 5/20/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Exhibit(s) // Supplement to Second Interim Fee Request (related document(s)1226) Filed by Stroock & Stroock & Lavan LLP. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Service) (Lunn, Matthew) (Entered: 05/20/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1318 Filed: 5/19/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Certification of Counsel Regarding Motion of John Bryant for Relief from Stay (related document(s)935) Filed by John Bryant. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A) (Miller, Evan) (Entered: 05/19/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1317 Filed: 5/19/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing Filed by Trump Entertainment Resorts, Inc.. Hearing scheduled for 5/21/2015 at 10:30 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #3, Wilmington, Delaware. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A # 2 Affidavit of Service) (Poppiti, Jr., Robert) (Entered: 05/19/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1316 Filed: 5/19/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          The transcriber has requested a standing order for all hearings in this case for the period 5/19/2015 to 6/2/2015. To obtain a copy of a transcript contact the transcriber Veritext. Telephone number (516)608-2400. (GM) (Entered: 05/19/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1315 Filed: 5/18/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Certificate of No Objection Regarding Seventh Monthly Fee Application for the Period From March 1, 2015 Through March 31, 2015 (related document(s)1265) Filed by Young Conaway Stargatt & Taylor, LLP. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Service) (Poppiti, Jr., Robert) (Entered: 05/18/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1314 Filed: 5/18/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Notice of Filing of Expense Detail to Third Monthly Fee Application (related document(s)786) Filed by Houlihan Lokey Capital, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A # 2 Affidavit of Service) (Poppiti, Jr., Robert) Modified on 5/19/2015 (SH). (Entered: 05/18/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1313 Filed: 5/18/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Supplement to Second Interim Fee Request (related document(s)1226) Filed by Young Conaway Stargatt & Taylor, LLP. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Service) (Lunn, Matthew) Modified on 5/19/2015 (SH). (Entered: 05/18/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1312 Filed: 5/15/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Notice of Service Re: Objection and Joinder of First Lien Parties in Debtors Objection to Motion of Unite Here Health for Allowance of Administrative Claim (related document(s)1305) Filed by First Lien Agent, First Lien Lenders. (Attachments: # 1 Service List) (Remming, Andrew) (Entered: 05/15/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1311 Filed: 5/15/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Certificate of No Objection Regarding Seventh Monthly Fee Application for the Period From March 1, 2015 Through March 31, 2015 (related document(s)1262) Filed by Stroock & Stroock & Lavan LLP. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Service) (Bambrick, Ian) (Entered: 05/15/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1310 Filed: 5/15/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Notice of Service of Reservation Of Rights Of First Lien Parties With Respect To Second Interim Applications For Compensation By Estate Professionals (related document(s)1299) Filed by First Lien Parties. (Attachments: # 1 Service List) (Remming, Andrew) (Entered: 05/15/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1309 Filed: 5/15/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Monthly Application for Compensation (Sixth) of PricewaterhouseCoopers LLP for Compensation for Services Rendered and Reimbursement of Expenses as Financial Advisor for the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors for the period March 1, 2015 to March 31, 2015 Filed by OFFICIAL COMMITTEE OF UNSECURED CREDITORS. Objections due by 6/4/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A # 2 Exhibit B # 3 Exhibit C) (Songonuga, Natasha) Modified (by request) on 5/15/2015 (LAM). (Entered: 05/15/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1308 Filed: 5/15/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Certificate of Service regarding Eighth Monthly Application of The Law Office of Nathan A. Schultz, P.C. as Co-Counsel for the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors for Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses for the Period from April 1, 2015 through April 30, 2015 (related document(s)1307) Filed by OFFICIAL COMMITTEE OF UNSECURED CREDITORS. (Songonuga, Natasha) (Entered: 05/15/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1307 Filed: 5/15/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Monthly Application for Compensation (Eighth) of The Law Office of Nathan A. Schultz P.C. as Co-Counsel for the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors for the period April 1, 2015 to April 30, 2015 Filed by OFFICIAL COMMITTEE OF UNSECURED CREDITORS. Objections due by 6/4/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A # 2 Exhibit B) (Songonuga, Natasha) (Entered: 05/15/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1306 Filed: 5/15/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Monthly Application for Compensation (Eighth) for the period April 1, 2015 to April 30, 2015 Filed by Young Conaway Stargatt & Taylor, LLP. Objections due by 6/4/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Notice # 2 Exhibit A # 3 Exhibit B # 4 Exhibit C # 5 Affidavit of Service) (Lunn, Matthew) (Entered: 05/15/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1305 Filed: 5/14/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Objection and Joinder of First Lien Parties in Debtors Objection to Motion of Unite Here Health for Allowance of Administrative Claim Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. § 503(b)(1)(A) (related document(s)759, 1302) Filed by First Lien Agent, First Lien Lenders (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A) (Remming, Andrew) (Entered: 05/14/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1304 Filed: 5/14/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Certificate of No Objection regarding Seventh Monthly Application of Gibbons P.C. as Co-Counsel to the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors for Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses for the Period from to March 1, 2015 through March 31, 2015 (related document(s)1257) Filed by OFFICIAL COMMITTEE OF UNSECURED CREDITORS. (Songonuga, Natasha) (Entered: 05/14/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1303 Filed: 5/14/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Certificate of Service regarding Supplement to Second Interim Application of Gibbons P.C. as Co-Counsel to the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors for Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses for the Period of December 1, 2014 through February 28, 2015 (related document(s)1300) Filed by OFFICIAL COMMITTEE OF UNSECURED CREDITORS. (Songonuga, Natasha) (Entered: 05/14/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1302 Filed: 5/14/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Objection to Motion of Unite Here Health for Allowance of Administrative Claim Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. § 503(b)(1)(A) (related document(s)759) Filed by Trump Entertainment Resorts, Inc. (Poppiti, Jr., Robert) (Entered: 05/14/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1301 Filed: 5/14/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Response (Preliminary) to Motion of Marilyn Mazzella for Relief from the Automatic Stay (related document(s)910) Filed by Trump Entertainment Resorts, Inc. (Poppiti, Jr., Robert) (Entered: 05/14/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          This case has been viewed 1,573 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                           
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Need Password Help?