J & J Sports Productions Inc v. Conteras
Federal Civil Lawsuit Arkansas Eastern District Court, Case No. 4:14-cv-00544

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 15, 2019 at 4:57 AM ST (2.4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Citation Section 47 U.S.C. § 521
Nature of Suit Cable/Satellite TV
  Entries (6) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 7/13/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
JUDGMENT: J&J Sports Productions, Inc.'s, claims against Jose's Night Club Aces, Inc., are dismissed without prejudice for lack of timely service; J&J Sports Productions, Inc., shall have judgment against Jose Conteras for $13,740.00. Post-judgment interest will accrue at 0.27% per annum from today until this Judgment is paid in full. 28 U.S.C. ยง 1961(a)-(b). Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 7/13/2015. (ljb)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 7/13/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion for Attorney Fees
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 6/23/2015, Entered: None Order
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 2/18/2015, Entered: None Clerks Entry of Default
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 1/9/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion to Extend Time
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 9/11/2014, Entered: None Complaint
              Request RequestSpace LREF

              Statistics

              This case has been viewed 2 times.

              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
              Space
              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
               
              PlainSite
              Sign Up
              Need Password Help?