NETWORLD COMMUNICATIONS, CORP. v. CROATIA AIRLINES, D.D.
Federal Civil Lawsuit New Jersey District Court, Case No. 2:13-cv-04770

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated September 30, 2016 at 2:40 PM DT (5.1 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo NETWORLD COMMUNICATIONS, CORP., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Lowenstein Sandler, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space MICHAEL B. HIMMEL +1 973 597 6172 +1 973 597 6173 mhimmel@lowenstein.com
Space Michael Andrew Kaplan +1 973 597 2302 mkaplan@lowenstein.com
Space MATTHEW M. OLIVER +1 973 597 6172 moliver@lowenstein.com

Toggle Switch Represented by McCarter & English LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space WILLIAM D. WALLACH +1 973 622 4444 wwallach@mccarter.com
v.
No Logo ABC Corporations 1-10, Defendant
No Logo CROATIA AIRLINES, D.D., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Condon and Forsyth LLP(7 Times Sq.)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Marissa N. Lefland +1 212 490 9100 +1 212 370 4453 mlefland@condonlaw.com
No Logo Lidija Saban, Defendant
  Entries (90) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 6/15/2015, Entered: None Order on Oral Motion
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 6/1/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion for Partial Summary Judgment
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 6/1/2015, Entered: None Opinion
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 5/19/2015, Entered: None Letter
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 5/19/2015, Entered: None Discovery Confidentiality Order
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 5/15/2015, Entered: None Letter
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 5/12/2015, Entered: None Letter
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 4/15/2015, Entered: None Letter
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 3/25/2015, Entered: None Notice to Withdraw from NEF as to Case
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 3/4/2015, Entered: None Scheduling Order
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 3/2/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 2/18/2015, Entered: None Letter
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 2/13/2015, Entered: None Letter
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 2/12/2015, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 2/12/2015, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 2/4/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion for Leave to File
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 2/2/2015, Entered: None Letter
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 1/30/2015, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 1/27/2015, Entered: None Leave to File Document
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 1/9/2015, Entered: None Order Set/Reset Hearing on Motion
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 1/8/2015, Entered: None Letter
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 12/23/2014, Entered: None Reply Brief to Opposition to Motion
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 12/22/2014, Entered: None Letter
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 12/8/2014, Entered: None Order
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 12/5/2014, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 12/2/2014, Entered: None Letter
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 11/26/2014, Entered: None Order
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 11/24/2014, Entered: None Letter
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 11/21/2014, Entered: None Letter Rule 7.1
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 11/18/2014, Entered: None Partial Summary Judgment
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 11/14/2014, Entered: None Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 11/3/2014, Entered: None Order
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 10/30/2014, Entered: None Letter
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 10/30/2014, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 10/20/2014, Entered: None Answer to Counterclaim
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 10/17/2014, Entered: None Letter Rule 7.1
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 10/10/2014, Entered: None Partial Summary Judgment
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 10/3/2014, Entered: None Counterclaim
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 10/3/2014, Entered: None Answer to Amended Complaint
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 9/26/2014, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 9/25/2014, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 9/24/2014, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 9/23/2014, Entered: None Order on Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 9/23/2014, Entered: None Opinion
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 9/19/2014, Entered: None Amended Complaint
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 9/18/2014, Entered: None Order on Motion to Amend/Correct
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 9/18/2014, Entered: None Opinion
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 9/12/2014, Entered: None Order on Motion for Partial Summary Judgment
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 4/15/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                  ORDER that the 39 Motion to Strike is DENIED, but Pltf's request to file a sur-reply is GRANTED. Pltf's subm. in support of its Motion to Strike shall be deemed its sur-reply. Signed by Magistrate Judge Madeline C. Arleo on 4/15/14. (DD, ) (Entered: 04/15/2014)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 4/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                    REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by NETWORLD COMMUNICATIONS, CORP. re 27 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(HIMMEL, MICHAEL) (Entered: 04/14/2014)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 4/7/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                      RESPONSE in Opposition filed by CROATIA AIRLINES, D.D., Lidija Saban re 27 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment (Attachments: # 1 Statement Pursuant to L.R. 56.1, # 2 Affidavit of Marissa N. Lefland)(LEFLAND, MARISSA) (Entered: 04/07/2014)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 4/4/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                        MOTION to Strike the Statement of Tonko Rilovi and the Declaration of Ana-Marija Jurkovi, or, in the Alternative, Request for Permission to File a Sur-Reply by NETWORLD COMMUNICATIONS, CORP.. Responses due by 4/21/2014 (Attachments: # 1 Brief in support of Plaintiff's motion, # 2 Declaration of Davor Gjivoje, Jr., in support of Plaintiff's motion, # 3 Text of Proposed Order, # 4 Certificate of Service)(HIMMEL, MICHAEL) (Entered: 04/04/2014)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 3/31/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                          REPLY to Response to Motion filed by CROATIA AIRLINES, D.D., Lidija Saban re 26 MOTION to Dismiss on forum non conveniens grounds (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Marko Baretic, # 2 Declaration of Danijela Simeunovic and Ratko Zuric, # 3 Declaration of Ana-Marija Jurkovic)(LEFLAND, MARISSA) (Entered: 03/31/2014)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 3/24/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                            MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by NETWORLD COMMUNICATIONS, CORP. re 26 MOTION to Dismiss on forum non conveniens grounds (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Davor Gjivoje, Jr. in Support of Opposition, # 2 Declaration of Professor Alan Uzelac in Support of Opposition, # 3 Declaration of Zoran Markovic in Support of Opposition)(HIMMEL, MICHAEL) (Entered: 03/24/2014)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 3/24/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                              MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by NETWORLD COMMUNICATIONS, CORP. re 26 MOTION to Dismiss on forum non conveniens grounds (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Davor Gjivoje, Jr. in Support of Plaintiffs Opposition, # 2 Declaration of Professor Alan Uzelac in Support of Plaintiffs Opposition, # 3 Declaration of Zoran Markovic in Support of Plaintiffs Opposition)(KAPLAN, MICHAEL) (Entered: 03/24/2014)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 3/19/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                LETTER ORDER adjourning the motion for partial summary judgment to 4/21/2014. Signed by Judge Susan D. Wigenton on 3/19/2014. (nr, ) (Entered: 03/19/2014)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 3/18/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                  Rule 7.1(d)(5) Letter for an automatic extension of the return date of a dispositive motion re 27 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment . (LEFLAND, MARISSA) (Entered: 03/18/2014)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 3/18/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                    TEXT ORDER re 32 MOTION for relief pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 56(d); The court is in receipt of Defendant's Notice of Motion for Relief Pursuant to FRCP 56(d) (Dkt entry # 32). The motion should be withdrawn and re-filed as "opposition" to Plaintiff's Notice of Motion for Partial Summary Judgment (Dkt. Entry # 27). SO ORDERED by Judge Susan D. Wigenton on 3/18/14. (cds, ) (Entered: 03/18/2014)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 3/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                      MOTION for relief pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 56(d) for an Order Denying or Deferring Consideration of Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment by CROATIA AIRLINES, D.D., Lidija Saban. (Attachments: # 1 Brief, # 2 Affidavit, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(LEFLAND, MARISSA) (Entered: 03/14/2014)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 3/10/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                        REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by NETWORLD COMMUNICATIONS, CORP. re 25 MOTION to Amend/Correct the First Amended Complaint (KAPLAN, MICHAEL) (Entered: 03/10/2014)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 3/3/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                          MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by CROATIA AIRLINES, D.D., Lidija Saban re 25 MOTION to Amend/Correct the First Amended Complaint (LEFLAND, MARISSA) (Entered: 03/03/2014)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 3/2/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                            NOTICE by NETWORLD COMMUNICATIONS, CORP. re 27 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment to Amend the Motion Return Date to April 7, 2014 (KAPLAN, MICHAEL) (Entered: 03/02/2014)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 3/2/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                              Rule 7.1(d)(5) Letter for an automatic extension of the return date of a dispositive motion re 26 MOTION to Dismiss on forum non conveniens grounds by Michael B. Himmel on behalf of Plaintiff Networld Communications, Corp.. (KAPLAN, MICHAEL) (Entered: 03/02/2014)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 2/28/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment by NETWORLD COMMUNICATIONS, CORP.. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum of Law in Support of Plaintiffs Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, # 2 Plaintiffs Local Rule 56.1 Statement of Undisputed Material Facts, # 3 Declaration of Michael B. Himmel in Support of Plaintiffs Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, # 4 Exhibit A to the Declaration of Michael B. Himmel, # 5 Exhibits B-D to the Declaration of Michael B. Himmel, # 6 Declaration of Davor Gjivoje, Jr. in Support of Plaintiffs Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, # 7 Declaration of Srecko Simunovic, # 8 Declaration of Zoran Markovi in Support of Plaintiffs Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, # 9 Text of Proposed Order)(KAPLAN, MICHAEL) (Entered: 02/28/2014)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 2/21/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Dismiss on forum non conveniens grounds by CROATIA AIRLINES, D.D., Lidija Saban. Responses due by 3/3/2014 (Attachments: # 1 Brief, # 2 Affidavit of Marissa N. Lefland, with Exhibits A and B, # 3 Declaration of Danijela Simeunovic, # 4 Text of Proposed Order)(LEFLAND, MARISSA) (Entered: 02/21/2014)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 2/21/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Amend/Correct the First Amended Complaint by NETWORLD COMMUNICATIONS, CORP.. (Attachments: # 1 Certification of Michael B. Himmel in Support of Motion for Leave to Amend, # 2 Exhibit A to the Certification of Michael B. Himmel, # 3 Exhibit B to the Certification of Michael B. Himmel, # 4 Exhibit C to the Certification of Michael B. Himmel, # 5 Brief in Support of Motion for Leave to Amend, # 6 Text of Proposed Order)(KAPLAN, MICHAEL) (Entered: 02/21/2014)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 2/20/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting Pltf's request for an extension to 2/28/14 in which to move for partial summary judgment. Signed by Judge Susan D. Wigenton on 2/20/14. (jd, ) (Entered: 02/20/2014)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 2/19/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                        Letter from Matthew M. Oliver Requesting Extension of Time to File Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. (OLIVER, MATTHEW) (Entered: 02/19/2014)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 2/18/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                          TEXT ORDER re 19 Letter; Plaintiff's request to file a motion for partial summary judgment on February 21, 2014 is hereby granted. SO ORDERED by Judge Susan D. Wigenton on 2/18/14. (cds, ) (Entered: 02/18/2014)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 2/17/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                            Letter from Michael B. Himmel, Esq.. (OLIVER, MATTHEW) (Entered: 02/17/2014)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 2/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                              Letter from Marissa N. Lefland re 19 Letter. (LEFLAND, MARISSA) (Entered: 02/14/2014)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 2/13/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                Letter from Michael B. Himmel Seeking Leave to File Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. (OLIVER, MATTHEW) (Entered: 02/13/2014)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 1/17/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                  LETTER ORDER, setting a Scheduling Conference for 2/10/2014 at 02:00 PM in Newark - Courtroom 2A before Magistrate Judge Madeline C. Arleo. Signed by Magistrate Judge Madeline C. Arleo on 1/17/14. (aa, ) (Entered: 01/17/2014)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 1/16/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                    ORDER dismissing as moot 6 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Susan D. Wigenton on 1/16/14. (sr, ) (Entered: 01/16/2014)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 12/23/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                      ANSWER to Amended Complaint by Lidija Saban.(LEFLAND, MARISSA) (Entered: 12/23/2013)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 12/23/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                        ANSWER to Amended Complaint by CROATIA AIRLINES, D.D..(LEFLAND, MARISSA) (Entered: 12/23/2013)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 12/23/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Appearance by MARISSA NICOLE LEFLAND on behalf of CROATIA AIRLINES, D.D., Lidija Saban (LEFLAND, MARISSA) (Entered: 12/23/2013)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 12/18/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Appearance by MICHAEL ANDREW KAPLAN on behalf of NETWORLD COMMUNICATIONS, CORP. (KAPLAN, MICHAEL) (Entered: 12/18/2013)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 12/12/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                              Request for Summons to be Issued by NETWORLD COMMUNICATIONS, CORP. as to Lidija Saban. (OLIVER, MATTHEW) (Entered: 12/12/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 12/9/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                AMENDED COMPLAINT against CROATIA AIRLINES, D.D., Lidija Saban, ABC Corporations 1-10, filed by NETWORLD COMMUNICATIONS, CORP..(OLIVER, MATTHEW) (Entered: 12/09/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 11/27/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE to Motion filed by NETWORLD COMMUNICATIONS, CORP. re 6 MOTION to Dismiss (OLIVER, MATTHEW) (Entered: 11/27/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 11/26/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting 8 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice RE: Michael J. Holland. Signed by Magistrate Judge Madeline C. Arleo on 11/20/13. (sr, ) (Entered: 11/26/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 11/18/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by CROATIA AIRLINES, D.D.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(LEFLAND, MARISSA) (Entered: 11/18/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 11/18/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                        Corporate Disclosure Statement by CROATIA AIRLINES, D.D. identifying Government of the Republic of Croatia as Corporate Parent.. (LEFLAND, MARISSA) (Entered: 11/18/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 11/18/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION to Dismiss by CROATIA AIRLINES, D.D.. Responses due by 12/2/2013 (Attachments: # 1 Brief, # 2 Declaration, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(LEFLAND, MARISSA) (Entered: 11/18/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 10/17/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                            Substitution of Attorney - Attorney WILLIAM D. WALLACH terminated. Attorney MICHAEL B. HIMMEL,MATTHEW M. OLIVER for NETWORLD COMMUNICATIONS, CORP. added.. (OLIVER, MATTHEW) (Entered: 10/17/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 8/13/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                              STATEMENT OF DISCLOSURE by NETWORLD COMMUNICATIONS, CORP.. (WALLACH, WILLIAM) (Entered: 08/13/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 8/13/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                COMPLAINT against CROATIA AIRLINES, D.D. with JURY DEMAND, filed by NETWORLD COMMUNICATIONS, CORP. (with corrected signature page)(jr) Modified on 8/13/2013 (jr). (Entered: 08/13/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 8/8/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                  SUMMONS ISSUED as to CROATIA AIRLINES, D.D. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. Issued By *Ellen McMurray* (emc) (Entered: 08/12/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 1 Filed: 8/8/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                    COMPLAINT against CROATIA AIRLINES, D.D. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-5162986) with JURY DEMAND, filed by NETWORLD COMMUNICATIONS, CORP. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(emc) (Entered: 08/12/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                      Space Space

                                                                                                                                                                                      Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                      This case has been viewed 243 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                      Space
                                                                                                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                       
                                                                                                                                                                                      PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                      Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                      Need Password Help?