Joseph Lai v. USB-Implementers Forum Inc et al

Federal Civil Lawsuit California Central District Court, Case No. 2:14-cv-05301
Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated July 28, 2017 at 7:20 PM EDT (7.7 years ago) Update UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert AlertsSpaceJump Jump
Summary

No one has written a summary of this case yet. Sign up or sign in to contribute one.

Parties
No Logo JOSEPH LAI, Plaintiff

Represented by Blecher and Collins PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Theo Giovanni Arbucci , +1 213 622 4222 +1 213 622 1656 jarbucci@blechercollins.com
Space Maxwell M Blecher +1 213 622 4222 +1 213 622 1656 mblecher@blechercollins.com
Space Donald R Pepperman +1 213 622 4222 +1 213 622 1656 dpepperman@blechercollins.com
v.
No Logo Does, Defendant
No Logo Foxconn (Kunshan) Computer Connector Co Ltd, Defendant
No Logo Foxconn Electronics Inc, Defendant
No Logo Foxconn International Holdings Ltd, Defendant
No Logo Foxconn International, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Hon Hai Precision Industry Company, Ltd., Defendant
Officially listed as "Hon Hai Precision Industry Co Ltd"
No Logo Usb-implementers Forum, Inc., Defendant
Attributes
Timeline
  Entries (51) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 3/11/2015, Entered: None Dismiss
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 2/11/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
NOTICE TO ALL PARTIES AND ORDER by Judge R. Gary Klausner. Defendant USB-Implementers Forum Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint 40 and Defendants Foxconn Electronics Inc. and Foxconn International Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint 41 , noticed for hearing on February 17, 2015, have been taken under submission and off the motion calendar. No appearances by counsel are necessary. The Court will issue a ruling after full consideration of properly submitted pleadings. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (sw) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 02/11/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 2/6/2015, Entered: None Protective Order
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 2/6/2015, Entered: None
STIPULATION for Protective Order filed by Plaintiff Joseph Lai.(Blecher, Maxwell) (Entered: 02/06/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 2/2/2015, Entered: None Reply (Motion related)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 2/2/2015, Entered: None Response
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 2/2/2015, Entered: None Reply (Motion related)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 1/29/2015, Entered: None
NOTICE of Decision: Case Potentially Instructive on Motion to Dismiss filed by Plaintiff Joseph Lai. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Blecher, Maxwell) (Entered: 01/29/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 1/26/2015, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 1/26/2015, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 1/5/2015, Entered: None Dismiss (cause or other)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 1/5/2015, Entered: None Dismiss (cause or other)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 12/23/2014, Entered: None Extending Answer Due Deadline
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 12/19/2014, Entered: None
STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Response as to Amended Complaint/Petition, 34 filed by Defendants Foxconn Electronics Inc, Foxconn International Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Brumfield, Noah) (Entered: 12/19/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 12/16/2014, Entered: None Pretrial-Trial Scheduling Order - form only
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 12/16/2014, Entered: None Scheduling Conference
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 12/15/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
MINUTES OF Scheduling Conference held before Judge R. Gary Klausner. Amended Pleadings due by 2/1/2015. Discovery cut-off 5/28/2015. Motion cut-off 6/10/2015. Pretrial Conference set for 8/10/2015 at 9:00 am. Jury Trial set for 8/25/2015 at 9:00 am. Court Reporter: Sandra MacNeil. (sw) (Entered: 12/16/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 12/11/2014, Entered: None
FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants Does, Foxconn (Kunshan) Computer Connector Co Ltd, Foxconn Electronics Inc, Foxconn International Holdings Ltd, Foxconn International Inc, Hon Hai Precision Industry Co Ltd, USB-Implementers Forum Inc amending Complaint - (Discovery), 1 , filed by Plaintiff Joseph Lai (Blecher, Maxwell) (Entered: 12/11/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 12/9/2014, Entered: None Order/Referral to ADR (No 3) (Private Mediator) (ADR-12)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 12/8/2014, Entered: None Request for ADR Procedure No. 3 - (ADR-1)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 12/8/2014, Entered: None Joint Report Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 11/21/2014, Entered: None Dismiss Case
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 10/21/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
SCHEDULING NOTICE TO ALL PARTIES AND ORDER by Judge R. Gary Klausner. Defendant USB-Implementers Forum, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss Case and to Strike USB-Implementers Forum Inc. 11 ; and Defendants Foxconn Electronics Inc, Foxconn International Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss Case or, in the Alternative, Motion to Strike 14 , noticed for hearing on October 27, 2014, have been taken under submission and off the motion calendar. No appearances by counsel are necessary. The Court will issue a ruling after full consideration of properly submitted pleadings. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (sw) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 10/21/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 10/10/2014, Entered: None Reply (Motion related)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 10/10/2014, Entered: None Reply (Motion related)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 10/3/2014, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 10/3/2014, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 10/3/2014, Entered: None
NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Taylor Chase-Wagniere on behalf of Plaintiff Joseph Lai (Attorney Taylor Chase-Wagniere added to party Joseph Lai(pty:pla))(Chase-Wagniere, Taylor) (Entered: 10/03/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 10/3/2014, Entered: None Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 9/17/2014, Entered: None Extension of Time to File a Document
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 9/16/2014, Entered: None
Foxconn International, Inc.'s NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants Foxconn Electronics Inc, Foxconn International Inc, identifying Hon Hai Precision Industry Co., Ltd. (Parent). (Ostrander, Jeremy) (Entered: 09/16/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 9/16/2014, Entered: None
Foxconn Electronics, Inc.'s NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants Foxconn Electronics Inc, Foxconn International Inc, identifying Hon Hai Precision Industry Co., Ltd. (Parent) and Actuone Holding Corp. (affiliate). (Ostrander, Jeremy) (Entered: 09/16/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 9/15/2014, Entered: None
NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Amara Rose Levy-Moore on behalf of Defendants Foxconn Electronics Inc, Foxconn International Inc (Attorney Amara Rose Levy-Moore added to party Foxconn Electronics Inc(pty:dft), Attorney Amara Rose Levy-Moore added to party Foxconn International Inc(pty:dft))(Levy-Moore, Amara) (Entered: 09/15/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 9/15/2014, Entered: None
NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Noah A Brumfield on behalf of Defendants Foxconn Electronics Inc, Foxconn International Inc (Attorney Noah A Brumfield added to party Foxconn Electronics Inc(pty:dft), Attorney Noah A Brumfield added to party Foxconn International Inc(pty:dft))(Brumfield, Noah) (Entered: 09/15/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 9/15/2014, Entered: None Objection/Opposition (Motion related)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 9/15/2014, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 9/15/2014, Entered: None
NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Bryan A Merryman on behalf of Defendants Foxconn Electronics Inc, Foxconn International Inc (Attorney Bryan A Merryman added to party Foxconn Electronics Inc(pty:dft), Attorney Bryan A Merryman added to party Foxconn International Inc(pty:dft))(Merryman, Bryan) (Entered: 09/15/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 9/12/2014, Entered: None Dismiss Case
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 9/12/2014, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Document
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 9/12/2014, Entered: None
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant USB-Implementers Forum Inc, identifying USB-Implementers Forum, Inc. and Federal Insurance Company. (McNaughton, Michael) (Entered: 09/12/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 9/12/2014, Entered: None Dismiss Case
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 8/6/2014, Entered: None
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Joseph Lai, upon Defendant Foxconn International Inc served on 7/21/2014, answer due 9/12/2014. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Joseph Cheng, Authorized Agent for Foxconn International, Inc. in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity. Original Summons NOT returned. (Blecher, Maxwell) (Entered: 08/06/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 8/5/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER GRANTING Stipulation to Extend Time to Respond to Initial Complaint By No More Than 30 Days for Defendants USB Implementers Forum and By More Than 30 Days for Certain Foxconn Defendants 8 by Judge R. Gary Klausner that Defendants Foxconn Electronics, Inc., Foxconn International, Inc., and USB Implementers Forum, Inc. shall have up to and including 9/12/2014 to respond to the Complaint. (jp) (Entered: 08/05/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 8/1/2014, Entered: None
STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to 09/12/14 re Complaint - (Discovery), 1 USB-Implementers Forum Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Attorney Garner K Weng added to party USB-Implementers Forum Inc(pty:dft))(Weng, Garner) (Entered: 08/01/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 7/31/2014, Entered: None
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Joseph Lai, upon Defendant USB-Implementers Forum Inc served on 7/23/2014, answer due 8/13/2014. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon USB-Implementers Forum, Inc., Traci Donnell, Executive Director in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service. Original Summons NOT returned. (Blecher, Maxwell) (Entered: 07/31/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 7/18/2014, Entered: None
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Joseph Lai, upon Defendant Foxconn Electronics Inc served on 7/17/2014, answer due 8/7/2014. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Jeff Tsai, Agent for Service of Process in compliance with statute not specified by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity. Original Summons returned. (Blecher, Maxwell) (Entered: 07/18/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 7/16/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
STANDING ORDER REGARDING NEWLY ASSIGNED CASES by Judge R. Gary Klausner. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT CONTROLS THIS CASE. (lom) (Entered: 07/17/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 7/9/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge R. Gary Klausner and Magistrate Judge Patrick J. Walsh. (et) (Entered: 07/16/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 7/9/2014, Entered: None
CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Joseph Lai. (et) (mg). (Entered: 07/16/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 7/9/2014, Entered: None
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint - (Discovery) 1 as to Defendants Foxconn (Kunshan) Computer Connector Co Ltd, Foxconn Electronics Inc, Foxconn International Holdings Ltd, Foxconn International Inc, Hon Hai Precision Industry Co Ltd, USB-Implementers Forum Inc. (et) (Entered: 07/16/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 1 Filed: 7/9/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
COMPLAINT against Defendants Foxconn (Kunshan) Computer Connector Co Ltd, Foxconn Electronics Inc, Foxconn International Holdings Ltd, Foxconn International Inc, Hon Hai Precision Industry Co Ltd, USB-Implementers Forum Inc, Does 1 through 20. Case assigned to Judge R. Gary Klausner for all further proceedings. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Patrick J Walsh. (Filing fee $ 400 PAID.) Jury Demanded., filed by Plaintiff Joseph Lai. (et) (mg). (Entered: 07/16/2014)
LREF

Statistics

This case has been viewed 75 times.

Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Sign Up
Need Password Help?