Cellular Communications Equipment LLC v. ZTE Corporation et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Texas Eastern District Court, Case No. 6:13-cv-00511

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 19, 2017 at 2:20 AM ST (4.8 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Cellular Communications Equipment LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Bragalone Conroy PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeffrey Ray Bragalone +1 214 785 6671 +1 214 785 6680 jbragalone@bcpc-law.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jonathan H. Rastegar +1 214 785 6670 +1 214 785 6680 jrastegar@bcpc-law.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Terry Afif Saad +1 214 785 6670 +1 214 785 6680 tsaad@bcpc-law.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Nelson Bumgardner Casto PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 02/19/2015 Barry J Bumgardner +1 817 377 9111 +1 817 377 3485 barry@nbclaw.net
TERMINATED: 02/19/2015 Brent Nelson Bumgardner +1 817 377 3490 +1 817 377 3485 brent@nelbum.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas Christopher Cecil +1 817 806 3812 +1 817 377 3485 tcecil@nbclaw.net
TERMINATED: 02/10/2016 Steven Brannon Latimer +1 817 377 9111 +1 817 377 3485 blatimer@nbclaw.net
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Edward R. Nelson, III +1 817 377 9111 ed@nelbum.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 2400

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 02/20/2014 Michael J. Fagan, Jr. +1 214 627 9975 mfagan@chenmalin.com

Toggle Switch Represented by WARD SMITH & HILL PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Claire Abernathy Henry +1 903 757 6400 +1 903 757 2323 claire@wsfirm.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jack Wesley Hill +1 903 757 6400 +1 903 757 2323 wh@wsfirm.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas John Ward, Jr. +1 903 757 6400 +1 903 758 7397 jw@jwfirm.com
ZTE USA, Inc. ZTE USA, Inc., Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Pillsbury Winthrop Shaw Pittman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED william.atkins@pillsburylaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Callie McCarthy Bjurstrom +1 619 544 3107 +1 619 819 4363 callie.bjurstrom@pillsburylaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Nicole S Cunningham +1 619 544 3112 +1 858 236 1995 nicole.cunningham@pillsburylaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Inge Larish +1 619 234 5000 +1 619 236 1995 inge.larish@pillsburylaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Steven A Moore +1 619 544 3112 +1 858 346 9392 steve.moore@pillsburylaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Upshaw PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 09/29/2015 David A Bailey +1 972 372 4235 +1 214 865 6086 davidbailey@everettupshaw.com
TERMINATED: 09/29/2015, LEAD ATTORNEY Everett McClyde Upshaw +1 214 680 6005 +1 214 865 6086 everettupshaw@everettupshaw.com
ZTE Corporation ZTE Corporation, Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Pillsbury Winthrop Shaw Pittman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED william.atkins@pillsburylaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Nicole S Cunningham +1 619 544 3112 +1 858 236 1995 nicole.cunningham@pillsburylaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Inge Larish +1 619 234 5000 +1 619 236 1995 inge.larish@pillsburylaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Steven A Moore +1 619 544 3112 +1 858 346 9392 steve.moore@pillsburylaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Upshaw PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 09/29/2015 David A Bailey +1 972 372 4235 +1 214 865 6086 davidbailey@everettupshaw.com
TERMINATED: 09/29/2015, LEAD ATTORNEY Everett McClyde Upshaw +1 214 680 6005 +1 214 865 6086 everettupshaw@everettupshaw.com
ZTE Solutions, Inc. ZTE Solutions, Inc., Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Pillsbury Winthrop Shaw Pittman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Nicole S Cunningham +1 619 544 3112 +1 858 236 1995 nicole.cunningham@pillsburylaw.com
v.
AT&T Mobility LLC AT&T Mobility LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Almasri & Marzwanian Law Firm PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/13/2014, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Debra Elaine Gunter +1 903 534 1100 +1 903 534 1137 dgunter@findlaycraft.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Paul Hastings LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christopher Wood Kennerly +1 650 320 1800 +1 650 320 1900 chriskennerly@paulhastings.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Ste. 200

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/09/2014, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sean Christian Platt +1 858 314 1156 +1 858 314 1500 cplatt@jonesday.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Yarbrough - Wilcox, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Herbert A Yarbrough, III +1 903 595 3111 +1 903 595 0191 trey@yw-lawfirm.com
AT&T, Inc. AT&T, Inc., Defendant
Officer/Director, Time Warner Telecom Inc.
Officer/Director, Ncr Corp
Officer/Director, At Home Corp
Officer/Director, Interactive Network Inc /ca
Officer/Director, Net2phone, Inc.
Officer/Director, Mail.com, Inc.

Toggle Switch Represented by Paul Hastings LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christopher Wood Kennerly +1 650 320 1800 +1 650 320 1900 chriskennerly@paulhastings.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Ste. 200

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/09/2014, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sean Christian Platt +1 858 314 1156 +1 858 314 1500 cplatt@jonesday.com
No Logo Boost Mobile, LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Rouse Hendricks German May PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mark W McGrory +1 913 777 5600 +1 913 777 5601 mark.mcgrory@eriseip.com
TERMINATED: 07/09/2015 Lawrence A Rouse +1 816 471 7711 +1 816 471 2221 larryr@rhgm.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Smith Weber LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert William Weber +1 903 223 5656 +1 903 223 5652 bweber@smithweber.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 300

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Megan J Redmond +1 913 777 5613 +1 913 777 5601 megan.redmond@eriseip.com
No Logo Cellco Partnership, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Potter Minton

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Patrick Colbert Clutter, IV +1 903 597 8311 patrickclutter@potterminton.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael Edwin Jones +1 903 597 8311 +1 903 593 0846 mikejones@potterminton.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Winston & Strawn, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas M Dunham +1 202 282 5852 +1 202 282 5100 tdunham@winston.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sarah J. Kalemeris skalemeris@winston.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Charles B. Molster +1 202 282 5988 +1 202 282 5100 cmolster@winston.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Corrine M Saylor +1 202 282 5000 +1 202 282 5100 csaylor@winston.com
Sprint Nextel Corporation Sprint Nextel Corporation, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Rouse Hendricks German May PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mark W McGrory +1 913 777 5600 +1 913 777 5601 mark.mcgrory@eriseip.com
TERMINATED: 07/09/2015 Lawrence A Rouse +1 816 471 7711 +1 816 471 2221 larryr@rhgm.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Smith Weber LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert William Weber +1 903 223 5656 +1 903 223 5652 bweber@smithweber.com
No Logo Sprint Solutions, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Rouse Hendricks German May PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mark W McGrory +1 913 777 5600 +1 913 777 5601 mark.mcgrory@eriseip.com
TERMINATED: 07/09/2015 Lawrence A Rouse +1 816 471 7711 +1 816 471 2221 larryr@rhgm.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Smith Weber LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert William Weber +1 903 223 5656 +1 903 223 5652 bweber@smithweber.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 300

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Megan J Redmond +1 913 777 5613 +1 913 777 5601 megan.redmond@eriseip.com
No Logo Sprint Spectrum, LP, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Rouse Hendricks German May PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mark W McGrory +1 913 777 5600 +1 913 777 5601 mark.mcgrory@eriseip.com
TERMINATED: 07/09/2015 Lawrence A Rouse +1 816 471 7711 +1 816 471 2221 larryr@rhgm.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Smith Weber LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert William Weber +1 903 223 5656 +1 903 223 5652 bweber@smithweber.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 300

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Megan J Redmond +1 913 777 5613 +1 913 777 5601 megan.redmond@eriseip.com
T-Mobile USA, Inc. T-Mobile USA, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by GILLAM AND SMITH, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Melissa Richards Smith +1 903 934 8450 +1 903 934 9257 melissa@gillamsmithlaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Melissa Richards Smith +1 903 934 8450 +1 903 934 9257 melissa@gillamsmithlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 1300

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Douglas James Dixon +1 949 226 6741 +1 888 775 0898 DDixon@hueston.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Douglas James Dixon +1 949 226 6741 +1 888 775 0898 DDixon@hueston.com
Verizon Communications, Inc. Verizon Communications, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Potter Minton

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Patrick Colbert Clutter, IV +1 903 597 8311 patrickclutter@potterminton.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael Edwin Jones +1 903 597 8311 +1 903 593 0846 mikejones@potterminton.com
ZTE USA, Inc. ZTE USA, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Pillsbury Winthrop Shaw Pittman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED william.atkins@pillsburylaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Callie McCarthy Bjurstrom +1 619 544 3107 +1 619 819 4363 callie.bjurstrom@pillsburylaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Nicole S Cunningham +1 619 544 3112 +1 858 236 1995 nicole.cunningham@pillsburylaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Inge Larish +1 619 234 5000 +1 619 236 1995 inge.larish@pillsburylaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Steven A Moore +1 619 544 3112 +1 858 346 9392 steve.moore@pillsburylaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Upshaw PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 09/29/2015 David A Bailey +1 972 372 4235 +1 214 865 6086 davidbailey@everettupshaw.com
TERMINATED: 09/29/2015, LEAD ATTORNEY Everett McClyde Upshaw +1 214 680 6005 +1 214 865 6086 everettupshaw@everettupshaw.com
ZTE Corporation ZTE Corporation, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Pillsbury Winthrop Shaw Pittman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED william.atkins@pillsburylaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Nicole S Cunningham +1 619 544 3112 +1 858 236 1995 nicole.cunningham@pillsburylaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Inge Larish +1 619 234 5000 +1 619 236 1995 inge.larish@pillsburylaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Steven A Moore +1 619 544 3112 +1 858 346 9392 steve.moore@pillsburylaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Upshaw PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 09/29/2015 David A Bailey +1 972 372 4235 +1 214 865 6086 davidbailey@everettupshaw.com
TERMINATED: 09/29/2015, LEAD ATTORNEY Everett McClyde Upshaw +1 214 680 6005 +1 214 865 6086 everettupshaw@everettupshaw.com
ZTE Solutions, Inc. ZTE Solutions, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Pillsbury Winthrop Shaw Pittman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Nicole S Cunningham +1 619 544 3112 +1 858 236 1995 nicole.cunningham@pillsburylaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Upshaw PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 09/29/2015 David A Bailey +1 972 372 4235 +1 214 865 6086 davidbailey@everettupshaw.com
No Logo Cellular Communications Equipment LLC, Counter-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Nelson Bumgardner Casto PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 02/19/2015 Barry J Bumgardner +1 817 377 9111 +1 817 377 3485 barry@nbclaw.net
TERMINATED: 02/19/2015 Brent Nelson Bumgardner +1 817 377 3490 +1 817 377 3485 brent@nelbum.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas Christopher Cecil +1 817 806 3812 +1 817 377 3485 tcecil@nbclaw.net
TERMINATED: 02/10/2016 Steven Brannon Latimer +1 817 377 9111 +1 817 377 3485 blatimer@nbclaw.net
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Edward R. Nelson, III +1 817 377 9111 ed@nelbum.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 2400

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 02/20/2014 Michael J. Fagan, Jr. +1 214 627 9975 mfagan@chenmalin.com

Toggle Switch Represented by WARD SMITH & HILL PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Claire Abernathy Henry +1 903 757 6400 +1 903 757 2323 claire@wsfirm.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jack Wesley Hill +1 903 757 6400 +1 903 757 2323 wh@wsfirm.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas John Ward, Jr. +1 903 757 6400 +1 903 758 7397 jw@jwfirm.com
  Entries (106) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 3/31/2016, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 3/31/2016, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 3/31/2016, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 3/31/2016, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 3/26/2016, Entered: None Amended Answer to Complaint
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 3/25/2016, Entered: None Amended Answer to Complaint
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 2/8/2016, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 2/8/2016, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 2/8/2016, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 12/7/2015, Entered: None Answer to Counterclaim
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 11/14/2015, Entered: None Answer to Amended Complaint
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 11/13/2015, Entered: None
                        ANSWER to 82 Amended Complaint, by T-Mobile US, Inc., T-Mobile USA, Inc..(Dixon, Douglas) (Entered: 11/13/2015)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 11/13/2015, Entered: None Counterclaim
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 11/13/2015, Entered: None Answer to Amended Complaint
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 11/13/2015, Entered: None Answer to Amended Complaint
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 11/13/2015, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 11/13/2015, Entered: None Answer to Amended Complaint
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 10/15/2015, Entered: None Order of Reference (Title 28 U.S.C. 636(c))
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 10/15/2015, Entered: None Consent to Proceed Before US Magistrate Judge
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 9/25/2015, Entered: None Withdraw as Attorney
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 7/1/2015, Entered: None Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 6/30/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                            ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 06/30/15. (mll, ) (Entered: 07/01/2015)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 4/29/2015, Entered: None Order Reassigning Case
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 4/28/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Rodney Gilstrap for all further proceedings. Judge Leonard Davis no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 04/28/15. (mll, ) (Entered: 04/29/2015)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 4/10/2015, Entered: None Amended Complaint
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 9/12/2014, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 6/13/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                      ORDER granting 79 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Debra Elaine Gunter terminated. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 06/13/14. (mll, ) (Entered: 06/13/2014)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 6/12/2014, Entered: None
                                                        Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Debby E. Gunter by AT&T Mobility LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Yarbrough, Herbert) (Entered: 06/12/2014)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 6/9/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                          ORDER withdrawing counsel. Attorney S Christian Platt terminated. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 6/9/2014. (gsg) (Entered: 06/09/2014)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 5/30/2014, Entered: None
                                                            NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by William P Atkins on behalf of ZTE (USA) Inc., ZTE Corporation (Atkins, William) (Entered: 05/30/2014)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 4/25/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                              ORDER denying as moot 48 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 04/25/14. (mll, ) (Entered: 04/25/2014)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 4/7/2014, Entered: None
                                                                NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Corrine M Saylor on behalf of Cellco Partnership Inc. (Saylor, Corrine) (Entered: 04/07/2014)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 3/21/2014, Entered: None
                                                                  AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Cellular Communications Equipment LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G)(Nelson, Edward) (Entered: 03/21/2014)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 2/27/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                    ORDER OF CONSOLIDATION consolidating cases 6:13cv507, 6:13cv508, 6:13cv509, 6:13cv510, 6:13cv511, 6:13cv568, 6:13cv569, 6:13cv584 and 6:13cv738 for pretrial issues only, with the exception of venue. Lead case is 6:13cv507. The Clerk of the Court shall add the consolidated defendants to the lead case, as well as Lead and Local Counsel only. Any other counsel who wishes to appear in the lead case shall file a notice of appearance in that case. Individual cases remain active for venue motions and trial, and all pending motions will be considered as filed. All future motions, other than venue motions, shall be filed in the consolidated case. Parties shall submit a single Docket Control Order by 3/15/2014, and a single Discovery, ESI, and Protective Order by 3/21/2014. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 2/27/14. (mjc, ) (Entered: 02/28/2014)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 2/20/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                      ORDER granting 70 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Michael James Fagan, Jr terminated. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 02/20/14. (mll, ) (Entered: 02/20/2014)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 2/19/2014, Entered: None
                                                                        NOTICE by Cellular Communications Equipment LLC REGARDING SPECIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE (Nelson, Edward) (Entered: 02/19/2014)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 2/19/2014, Entered: None
                                                                          Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Cellular Communications Equipment LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Nelson, Edward) (Entered: 02/19/2014)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 2/7/2014, Entered: None
                                                                            NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Everett McClyde Upshaw on behalf of ZTE Corporation (Upshaw, Everett) (Entered: 02/07/2014)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 2/3/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                              ORDER setting Initial Case Management Conference for 2/26/2014 02:30 PM before Judge Leonard Davis. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 02/03/14. (mll, ) (Entered: 02/03/2014)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 1/30/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                DEMAND for Trial by Jury by ZTE (USA) Inc., ZTE Corporation. (Bailey, David) (Entered: 01/30/2014)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 1/30/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                  NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by David A Bailey on behalf of ZTE (USA) Inc., ZTE Corporation (Bailey, David) (Entered: 01/30/2014)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 1/30/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                    CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by T-Mobile USA, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Deutsche Telekom AG, Corporate Parent T-Mobile Global Holding GmbH, Corporate Parent T-Mobile Global Zwischenholding GmbH, Corporate Parent T-Mobile US, Inc., Corporate Parent Deutsche Telekom Holding B.V. for T-Mobile USA, Inc.. (Dixon, Douglas) (Entered: 01/30/2014)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 1/30/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                      CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by T-Mobile US, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Deutsche Telekom AG, Corporate Parent T-Mobile Global Holding GmbH, Corporate Parent T-Mobile Global Zwischenholding GmbH, Corporate Parent Deutsche Telekom Holding B.V. for T-Mobile US, Inc.. (Dixon, Douglas) (Entered: 01/30/2014)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 12/26/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                        STIPULATED ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF DEFENDANT SPRINT NEXTEL CORPORATION granting 62 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Cellular Communications Equipment LLC. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 12/26/13. (mjc, ) (Entered: 12/26/2013)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 12/19/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                          STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice As To Defendant Sprint Nextel Corporation (N/K/A Sprint Communications, Inc.) by Cellular Communications Equipment LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Nelson, Edward) (Entered: 12/19/2013)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 11/25/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                            NOTICE by Cellular Communications Equipment LLC Of Readiness For Scheduling Conference (Nelson, Edward) (Entered: 11/25/2013)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 11/22/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                              SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 48 Joint MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Cellular Communications Equipment LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Nelson, Edward) (Entered: 11/22/2013)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 11/14/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Lawrence A Rouse on behalf of Boost Mobile, LLC, Sprint Nextel Corporation, Sprint Solutions, Inc., Sprint Spectrum L.P.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-4402854. (Rouse, Lawrence) (Entered: 11/14/2013)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 11/14/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                  NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Mark W McGrory on behalf of Boost Mobile, LLC (McGrory, Mark) (Entered: 11/14/2013)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 11/12/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                    REPLY to Response to Motion re 48 Joint MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by AT&T Mobility LLC, Boost Mobile, LLC, Cellco Partnership Inc., Sprint Nextel Corporation, Sprint Solutions, Inc., Sprint Spectrum L.P., T-Mobile US, Inc., T-Mobile USA, Inc., Verizon Communications, Inc., ZTE (USA) Inc., ZTE Corporation, ZTE Solutions, Inc. . (Kennerly, Christopher) (Entered: 11/12/2013)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 11/5/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                      NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Charles Bennett Molster, III on behalf of Cellco Partnership Inc. (Molster, Charles) (Entered: 11/05/2013)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 10/31/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                        RESPONSE in Opposition re 48 Joint MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Cellular Communications Equipment LLC. (Nelson, Edward) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/4/2013: # 1 Text of Proposed Order) (gsg, ). (Entered: 10/31/2013)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 10/30/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                          NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Thomas M Dunham on behalf of Cellco Partnership Inc. (Dunham, Thomas) (Entered: 10/30/2013)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 10/22/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                            NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Nicole S Cunningham on behalf of ZTE (USA) Inc., ZTE Corporation. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-4371081. (Cunningham, Nicole) (Entered: 10/22/2013)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 10/18/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                              CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by ZTE (USA) Inc. (Bailey, David) (Entered: 10/18/2013)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 10/16/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Everett McClyde Upshaw on behalf of ZTE (USA) Inc. (Upshaw, Everett) (Entered: 10/16/2013)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 10/15/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                  ORDER granting 42 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Cellular Communications Equipment LLC. Pursuant to stipulation of the parties, it is hereby ordered that Defendant Verizon Communications Inc. is dismissed from this action without prejudice. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 10/15/13. (mll, ) (Entered: 10/15/2013)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 10/15/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Douglas James Dixon on behalf of T-Mobile US, Inc., T-Mobile USA, Inc.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-4360019. (Dixon, Douglas) (Entered: 10/15/2013)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 10/14/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                      Joint MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by AT&T Mobility LLC, Boost Mobile, LLC, Cellco Partnership Inc., Sprint Nextel Corporation, Sprint Solutions, Inc., Sprint Spectrum L.P., T-Mobile US, Inc., T-Mobile USA, Inc., Verizon Communications, Inc., ZTE (USA) Inc., ZTE Corporation. (Kennerly, Christopher) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/17/2013: # 1 Text of Proposed Order) (sm, ). (Entered: 10/14/2013)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 10/14/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                        CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by AT&T Mobility LLC (Kennerly, Christopher) (Entered: 10/14/2013)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 10/14/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                          CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Cellco Partnership Inc., Verizon Communications, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Verizon Communications Inc., Corporate Parent Vodafone Group PLC for Cellco Partnership Inc.; Corporate Parent None for Verizon Communications, Inc.. (Jones, Michael) (Entered: 10/14/2013)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 10/14/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                            CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Boost Mobile, LLC, Sprint Nextel Corporation, Sprint Solutions, Inc., Sprint Spectrum L.P. identifying Corporate Parent Sprint Corporation for Boost Mobile, LLC, Sprint Nextel Corporation, Sprint Solutions, Inc., Sprint Spectrum L.P.. (Weber, Robert) (Entered: 10/14/2013)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 10/14/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                              CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by T-Mobile USA, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent T-Mobile US, Inc. for T-Mobile USA, Inc.. (Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 10/14/2013)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 10/14/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by T-Mobile US, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent T-Mobile Global Holding GmbH for T-Mobile US, Inc.. (Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 10/14/2013)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 10/14/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                  STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice as to Defendant Verizon Communications Inc. by Cellular Communications Equipment LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Nelson, Edward) (Entered: 10/14/2013)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 10/14/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Melissa Richards Smith on behalf of T-Mobile US, Inc., T-Mobile USA, Inc. (Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 10/14/2013)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 10/11/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Steven A Moore on behalf of ZTE (USA) Inc., ZTE Corporation. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-4357582. (Moore, Steven) (Entered: 10/11/2013)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 10/11/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Robert William Weber on behalf of Boost Mobile, LLC, Sprint Nextel Corporation, Sprint Solutions, Inc., Sprint Spectrum L.P. (Weber, Robert) (Entered: 10/11/2013)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 10/10/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Inge Larish on behalf of ZTE (USA) Inc., ZTE Corporation (Larish, Inge) (Entered: 10/10/2013)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 10/10/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Debra Elaine Gunter on behalf of AT&T Mobility LLC (Gunter, Debra) (Entered: 10/10/2013)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 10/10/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Herbert A Yarbrough, III on behalf of AT&T Mobility LLC (Yarbrough, Herbert) (Entered: 10/10/2013)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 10/8/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Mark W McGrory on behalf of Sprint Nextel Corporation, Sprint Solutions, Inc., Sprint Spectrum L.P.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-4351770. (McGrory, Mark) (Entered: 10/08/2013)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 9/18/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting 33 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by AT&T, Inc., Cellular Communications Equipment LLC. Defendant AT&T Inc is hereby DISMISSED from this action without prejudice. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 09/18/13. (mll, ) (Entered: 09/18/2013)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 9/17/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                    STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice as to Defendant AT&T Inc. by AT&T, Inc., Cellular Communications Equipment LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Nelson, Edward) (Entered: 09/17/2013)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 9/12/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by S Christian Platt on behalf of AT&T Mobility LLC, AT&T, Inc. (Platt, S) (Entered: 09/12/2013)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 9/12/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Christopher Wood Kennerly on behalf of AT&T Mobility LLC, AT&T, Inc. (Kennerly, Christopher) (Entered: 09/12/2013)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 8/5/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting 16 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. No more extensions will be granted absent a showing of good cause. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 08/05/13. (mll, ) (Entered: 08/05/2013)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 8/2/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Patrick Colbert Clutter, IV on behalf of Cellco Partnership Inc., Verizon Communications, Inc. (Clutter, Patrick) (Entered: 08/02/2013)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 7/31/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                              Return of Service Executed as to Sprint Solutions, Inc. on 7/10/2013, by personal service; answer due: 7/31/2013. (mll, ) (Entered: 08/01/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 7/31/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                Return of Service Executed as to Sprint Spectrum L.P. on 7/10/2013, by personal service; answer due: 7/31/2013. (mll, ) (Entered: 08/01/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 7/31/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                  Return of Service Executed as to Sprint Nextel Corporation on 7/9/2013, by personal service; answer due: 7/30/2013. (mll, ) (Entered: 08/01/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 7/31/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                    Return of Service Executed as to T-Mobile US, Inc. on 7/10/2013, by personal service; answer due: 7/31/2013. (mll, ) (Entered: 08/01/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 7/31/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                      Return of Service Executed as to T-Mobile USA, Inc. on 7/10/2013, by personal service; answer due: 7/31/2013. (mll, ) (Entered: 08/01/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 7/31/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                        Return of Service Executed as to AT&T, Inc. on 7/10/2013, by personal service; answer due: 7/31/2013. (mll, ) (Entered: 08/01/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 7/31/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                          Return of Service Executed as to AT&T Mobility LLC on 7/10/2013, by personal service; answer due: 7/31/2013. (mll, ) (Entered: 08/01/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 7/31/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                            Return of Service Executed as to Cellco Partnership Inc. on 7/10/2013, by personal service; answer due: 7/31/2013. (mll, ) (Entered: 08/01/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 7/31/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                              Return of Service Executed as to Verizon Communications, Inc. on 7/10/2013, by personal service; answer due: 7/31/2013. (mll, ) (Entered: 08/01/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 7/31/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                Return of Service Executed as to Boost Mobile, LLC on 7/10/2013, by personal service; answer due: 7/31/2013. (mll, ) (Entered: 08/01/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 7/31/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                  Return of Service Executed as to ZTE Solutions, Inc. on 7/10/2013, by personal service; answer due: 7/31/2013. (mll, ) (Entered: 08/01/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 7/31/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                    Return of Service Executed as to ZTE (USA) Inc. on 7/18/2013, by personal service; answer due: 8/8/2013. (mll, ) (Entered: 08/01/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 7/29/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                      Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer on Behalf of All Defendants by Cellular Communications Equipment LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Nelson, Edward) (Entered: 07/29/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 7/29/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael E Jones on behalf of Cellco Partnership Inc., Verizon Communications, Inc. (Jones, Michael) (Entered: 07/29/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 7/3/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                          SUMMONS Issued as to AT&T Mobility LLC, AT&T, Inc., Boost Mobile, LLC, Cellco Partnership Inc., Sprint Nextel Corporation, Sprint Solutions, Inc., Sprint Spectrum L.P., T-Mobile US, Inc., T-Mobile USA, Inc., Verizon Communications, Inc., ZTE (USA) Inc., ZTE Corporation, ZTE Solutions, Inc. and emailed to pltf for service. (Attachments: # 1 Summons(es), # 2 Summons(es), # 3 Summons(es), # 4 Summons(es), # 5 Summons(es), # 6 Summons(es), # 7 Summons(es), # 8 Summons(es), # 9 Summons(es), # 10 Summons(es), # 11 Summons(es), # 12 Summons(es))(klb, ) (Entered: 07/03/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 7/2/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael James Fagan on behalf of Cellular Communications Equipment LLC (Fagan, Michael) (Entered: 07/02/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 7/1/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Thomas Christopher Cecil on behalf of Cellular Communications Equipment LLC (Cecil, Thomas) (Entered: 07/01/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 7/1/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Edward R Nelson, III on behalf of Cellular Communications Equipment LLC (Nelson, Edward) (Entered: 07/01/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 7/1/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Brent Nelson Bumgardner on behalf of Cellular Communications Equipment LLC (Bumgardner, Brent) (Entered: 07/01/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 7/1/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Steven Brannon Latimer on behalf of Cellular Communications Equipment LLC (Latimer, Steven) (Entered: 07/01/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 7/1/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Barry Bumgardner on behalf of Cellular Communications Equipment LLC (Bumgardner, Barry) (Entered: 07/01/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 6/28/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Edward R Nelson, III on behalf of Cellular Communications Equipment LLC (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Appearance- Barry J. Bumgardner, # 2 Notice of Appearance- Brannon Latimer, # 3 Notice of Appearance- Brent N. Bumgardner, # 4 Notice of Appearance- Michael J. Fagan, Jr., # 5 Notice of Appearance- Thomas C. Cecil)(Nelson, Edward) (Entered: 06/28/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 6/26/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                          CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Cellular Communications Equipment LLC identifying Corporate Parent Acacia Research Corporation, Corporate Parent Acacia Research Group LLC for Cellular Communications Equipment LLC. (Ward, Thomas) (Entered: 06/26/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 6/26/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Claire Abernathy Henry on behalf of Cellular Communications Equipment LLC (Henry, Claire) (Entered: 06/26/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 6/26/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jack Wesley Hill on behalf of Cellular Communications Equipment LLC (Hill, Jack) (Entered: 06/26/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 6/26/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Cellular Communications Equipment LLC. (Ward, Thomas) (Entered: 06/26/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 6/26/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Ward, Thomas) (Entered: 06/26/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 6/25/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-4197674.), filed by Cellular Communications Equipment LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit A - '923 Patnet, # 3 Exhibit B - '962 Patent, # 4 Exhibit C - '174 Patent, # 5 Exhibit D - '820 Patent, # 6 Exhibit E - '923 Patent)(Ward, Thomas) (Entered: 06/25/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Space Space

                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                      This case has been viewed 39 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                       
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Need Password Help?