Cleveland Acceptance Corp v. Seese
Federal Civil Lawsuit Ohio Northern District Court, Case No. 1:14-cv-02033

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 14, 2019 at 8:46 PM ST (2.3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Citation Section 15 U.S.C. § 1640
Nature of Suit Truth in Lending
  Entries (9) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 12/1/2014, Entered: None Judgment
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 12/1/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
    Opinion and Order signed by Judge James S. Gwin on 12/1/14 granting the motion to remand this case to the Cleveland Municipal Court. (Related Doc. 9 ) (M,G)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 11/24/2014, Entered: None Withdraw as Attorney
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 11/13/2014, Entered: None Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 10/24/2014, Entered: None Case Management Conference Scheduling Order
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 10/24/2014, Entered: None Order
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 10/10/2014, Entered: None Remand Case (other)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 9/17/2014, Entered: None Extension (answer complaint)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 9/14/2014, Entered: None Notice of Removal
                    Request RequestSpace LREF

                    Statistics

                    This case has been viewed 21 times.

                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                    Space
                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                     
                    PlainSite
                    Sign Up
                    Need Password Help?