TLI Communications LLC v. AV Automotive, L.L.C. et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, Case No. 1:14-cv-00138
District Judge Thomas Selby Ellis, III, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated September 8, 2016 at 12:46 AM DT (4.9 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Tli Communications LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Fiske & Harvey PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Philip John Harvey +1 703 518 9910 +1 703 518 9931 PHarvey@FiskeHarvey.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Mishcon de Reya New York LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert Whitman +1 212 257 4455 +1 212 612 3297 robert.whitman@mishcon.com
v.
No Logo AV Automotive, L.L.C., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of AV Automotive, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/13/2014 AV Automotive, LLC

Toggle Switch Represented by Williams Mullen, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joshua Bryson Brady +1 703 760 5200 +1 703 748 0244 jbrady@williamsmullen.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Martin William Hayes +1 703 760 5245 mhayes@williamsmullen.com
No Logo For a Song, Inc. , Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Office of Craig C. Reilly

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Craig Crandall Reilly +1 703 549 5353 +1 703 549 2604 craig.reilly@ccreillylaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of For a Song, Inc.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/13/2014 For a Song, Inc.
No Logo Max Media LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Max Media LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/13/2014 Max Media LLC
Twitter, Inc. Twitter, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Durie Tangri LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ryan M Kent +1 415 362 6666 +1 415 236 6300 rkent@durietangri.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Troutman Sanders, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert Armistead Angle +1 804 697 1246 robert.angle@troutmansanders.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mary Catherine Zinsner +1 703 734 4363 +1 703 734 4340 mary.zinsner@troutmansanders.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Twitter, Inc.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/13/2014 Twitter, Inc.
No Logo Vine Labs, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Vine Labs, Inc.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/13/2014 Vine Labs, Inc.
  Entries (24) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 6/19/2014, Entered: None
OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Hearing held on 5/29/2014 before the Panel at Chicago, IL. Court Reporter/Transcriber Pamela S. Warren, 219 South Dearborn Street, Room 1928, Chicago, IL 60604, (312) 294-8907. Transcript may be viewed at the Panel's office or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Redaction due 6/26/2014. Redaction Request due 7/10/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/21/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/17/2014.Signed by Clerk of the Panel Jeffery N. Luthi, on 6/19/2014. Associated Cases: MDL No. 2534, DE/1:13-cv-01922, DE/1:13-cv-01925, DE/1:13-cv-01926, DE/1:13-cv-01927, DE/1:13-cv-01929, DE/1:13-cv-01930, DE/1:13-cv-01931, DE/1:13-cv-01932, DE/1:13-cv-01934, DE/1:13-cv-01936, VAE/1:14-cv-00136, VAE/1:14-cv-00137, VAE/1:14-cv-00138, VAE/1:14-cv-00139, VAE/1:14-cv-00140, VAE/1:14-cv-00141, VAE/1:14-cv-00142 (RH) (Entered: 06/19/2014)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 6/12/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
    TRANSFER ORDER re: pldg. ( 1 in MDL No. 2534) Transferring 10 action(s) to Judge Thomas S. Ellis III in the Eastern District of Virginia.Signed by Judge John G. Heyburn II, Chairman, PANEL ON MULTIDISTRICT LITIGATION, on 6/12/2014. Associated Cases: MDL No. 2534, DE/1:13-cv-01922, DE/1:13-cv-01925, DE/1:13-cv-01926, DE/1:13-cv-01927, DE/1:13-cv-01929, DE/1:13-cv-01930, DE/1:13-cv-01931, DE/1:13-cv-01932, DE/1:13-cv-01934, DE/1:13-cv-01936, VAE/1:14-cv-00136, VAE/1:14-cv-00137, VAE/1:14-cv-00138, VAE/1:14-cv-00139, VAE/1:14-cv-00140, VAE/1:14-cv-00141, VAE/1:14-cv-00142 (dn) (Entered: 06/12/2014)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 5/16/2014, Entered: None
      NOTICE OF ORAL ARGUMENT SCHEDULE re: pldg. (10 in DE/1:13-cv-01922, 10 in DE/1:13-cv-01925, 10 in DE/1:13-cv-01926, 10 in DE/1:13-cv-01927, 10 in DE/1:13-cv-01929, 11 in DE/1:13-cv-01930, 10 in DE/1:13-cv-01931, 10 in DE/1:13-cv-01932, 10 in DE/1:13-cv-01934, 10 in DE/1:13-cv-01936, 32 in MDL No. 2534, 13 in VAE/1:14-cv-00136, 12 in VAE/1:14-cv-00137, 16 in VAE/1:14-cv-00138, 11 in VAE/1:14-cv-00139, 13 in VAE/1:14-cv-00140, 11 in VAE/1:14-cv-00141, 19 in VAE/1:14-cv-00142) Setting oral argument schedule for the 5/29/2014 hearing session in Chicago, IL.Signed by Clerk of the Panel Jeffery N. Luthi on 5/16/2014. Associated Cases: MDL No. 2534, DE/1:13-cv-01922, DE/1:13-cv-01925, DE/1:13-cv-01926, DE/1:13-cv-01927, DE/1:13-cv-01929, DE/1:13-cv-01930, DE/1:13-cv-01931, DE/1:13-cv-01932, DE/1:13-cv-01934, DE/1:13-cv-01936, VAE/1:14-cv-00136, VAE/1:14-cv-00137, VAE/1:14-cv-00138, VAE/1:14-cv-00139, VAE/1:14-cv-00140, VAE/1:14-cv-00141, VAE/1:14-cv-00142 (RH) (Entered: 05/16/2014)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 5/12/2014, Entered: None
        NOTICE OF WAIVER OF ORAL ARGUMENT re: pldg. (10 in DE/1:13-cv-01922, 10 in DE/1:13-cv-01925, 10 in DE/1:13-cv-01926, 10 in DE/1:13-cv-01929, 10 in DE/1:13-cv-01932, 10 in DE/1:13-cv-01934, 32 in MDL No. 2534, 12 in VAE/1:14-cv-00137, 16 in VAE/1:14-cv-00138, 13 in VAE/1:14-cv-00140) Filed by Ryan Marshall Kent on behalf of Defendants Shutterfly Inc., et al.Pinterest, Inc., Imgur LLC, Tripadvisor Inc., Tripadvisor LLC, CityGrid Media LLC, IAC/InterActiveCorp, Vimeo LLC, Tumblr, Inc., Yahoo! Inc., WHI Inc., Dropbox Inc., Twitter, Inc., Vine Labs, Inc., Interested Party Twitter, Inc. [Suppress List] (Attachments: # 1 Other Attachment A, # 2 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 2534, DE/1:13-cv-01922, DE/1:13-cv-01925, DE/1:13-cv-01926, DE/1:13-cv-01929, DE/1:13-cv-01932, DE/1:13-cv-01934, VAE/1:14-cv-00137, VAE/1:14-cv-00138, VAE/1:14-cv-00140 (Kent, Ryan) (Entered: 05/12/2014)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 5/12/2014, Entered: None
          NOTICE OF WAIVER OF ORAL ARGUMENT re: pldg. ( 32 in MDL No. 2534, 16 in VAE/1:14-cv-00138, 19 in VAE/1:14-cv-00142) Filed by Craig Crandall Reilly on behalf of Defendant For a Song, Inc. Associated Cases: MDL No. 2534, VAE/1:14-cv-00138, VAE/1:14-cv-00142 (Reilly, Craig) (Entered: 05/12/2014)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 5/12/2014, Entered: None
            NOTICE OF PRESENTATION OF ORAL ARGUMENT re: pldg. (10 in DE/1:13-cv-01922, 10 in DE/1:13-cv-01925, 10 in DE/1:13-cv-01926, 10 in DE/1:13-cv-01927, 10 in DE/1:13-cv-01929, 11 in DE/1:13-cv-01930, 10 in DE/1:13-cv-01931, 10 in DE/1:13-cv-01932, 10 in DE/1:13-cv-01934, 10 in DE/1:13-cv-01936, 32 in MDL No. 2534, 13 in VAE/1:14-cv-00136, 12 in VAE/1:14-cv-00137, 16 in VAE/1:14-cv-00138, 11 in VAE/1:14-cv-00139, 13 in VAE/1:14-cv-00140, 11 in VAE/1:14-cv-00141, 19 in VAE/1:14-cv-00142) Filed by Heidi Lyn Keefe on behalf of Defendants Facebook, Inc., Instagram, LLC Associated Cases: MDL No. 2534, DE/1:13-cv-01922, DE/1:13-cv-01925, DE/1:13-cv-01926, DE/1:13-cv-01927, DE/1:13-cv-01929, DE/1:13-cv-01930, DE/1:13-cv-01931, DE/1:13-cv-01932, DE/1:13-cv-01934, DE/1:13-cv-01936, VAE/1:14-cv-00136, VAE/1:14-cv-00137, VAE/1:14-cv-00138, VAE/1:14-cv-00139, VAE/1:14-cv-00140, VAE/1:14-cv-00141, VAE/1:14-cv-00142 (Keefe, Heidi) (Entered: 05/12/2014)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 5/12/2014, Entered: None
              NOTICE OF WAIVER OF ORAL ARGUMENT re: pldg. ( 32 in MDL No. 2534, 13 in VAE/1:14-cv-00136, 12 in VAE/1:14-cv-00137, 16 in VAE/1:14-cv-00138, 11 in VAE/1:14-cv-00139, 13 in VAE/1:14-cv-00140, 11 in VAE/1:14-cv-00141, 19 in VAE/1:14-cv-00142) Filed by Joshua Bryson Brady on behalf of Defendants AV Automotive, L.L.C., Max Media LLC, Hall Automotive, LLC, Lucidiom, Inc., Richmond Camera Shop, Incorporated Associated Cases: MDL No. 2534, VAE/1:14-cv-00136, VAE/1:14-cv-00137, VAE/1:14-cv-00138, VAE/1:14-cv-00139, VAE/1:14-cv-00140, VAE/1:14-cv-00141, VAE/1:14-cv-00142 (Brady, Joshua) Modified on 5/13/2014 (RH). REMOVED DUPLICATE PARTIES NAMES (Entered: 05/12/2014)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 5/9/2014, Entered: None
                NOTICE OF PRESENTATION OF ORAL ARGUMENT re: pldg. (10 in DE/1:13-cv-01922, 10 in DE/1:13-cv-01925, 10 in DE/1:13-cv-01926, 10 in DE/1:13-cv-01927, 10 in DE/1:13-cv-01929, 11 in DE/1:13-cv-01930, 10 in DE/1:13-cv-01931, 10 in DE/1:13-cv-01932, 10 in DE/1:13-cv-01934, 10 in DE/1:13-cv-01936, 32 in MDL No. 2534, 13 in VAE/1:14-cv-00136, 12 in VAE/1:14-cv-00137, 16 in VAE/1:14-cv-00138, 11 in VAE/1:14-cv-00139, 13 in VAE/1:14-cv-00140, 11 in VAE/1:14-cv-00141, 19 in VAE/1:14-cv-00142) Filed by Robert Whitman on behalf of Plaintiff TLI Communications LLC (Attachments: # 1 Schedule of Actions, # 2 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 2534, DE/1:13-cv-01922, DE/1:13-cv-01925, DE/1:13-cv-01926, DE/1:13-cv-01927, DE/1:13-cv-01929, DE/1:13-cv-01930, DE/1:13-cv-01931, DE/1:13-cv-01932, DE/1:13-cv-01934, DE/1:13-cv-01936, VAE/1:14-cv-00136, VAE/1:14-cv-00137, VAE/1:14-cv-00138, VAE/1:14-cv-00139, VAE/1:14-cv-00140, VAE/1:14-cv-00141, VAE/1:14-cv-00142 (Whitman, Robert) Modified on 5/9/2014 (RH). REMOVED DUPLICATE PARTY NAMES (Entered: 05/09/2014)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 4/14/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                  HEARING ORDER re: pldg. ( 1 in MDL No. 2534) - SECTION A (DESIGNATED FOR ORAL ARGUMENT) PANEL HEARING set for 5/29/2014 in Chicago, Illinois. Notices of Presentation or Waiver of Oral Argument due on or before 5/12/2014.Notice of Presentation or Waiver of Oral Argument form (JPML form 9) can be downloaded from our website.Signed by Judge John G. Heyburn II, Chairman, PANEL ON MULTIDISTRICT LITIGATION, on 4/14/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Courthouse Advisory) Associated Cases: MDL No. 2534, DE/1:13-cv-01922, DE/1:13-cv-01925, DE/1:13-cv-01926, DE/1:13-cv-01927, DE/1:13-cv-01929, DE/1:13-cv-01930, DE/1:13-cv-01931, DE/1:13-cv-01932, DE/1:13-cv-01934, DE/1:13-cv-01936, VAE/1:14-cv-00136, VAE/1:14-cv-00137, VAE/1:14-cv-00138, VAE/1:14-cv-00139, VAE/1:14-cv-00140, VAE/1:14-cv-00141, VAE/1:14-cv-00142 (RH) (Entered: 04/14/2014)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 3/27/2014, Entered: None
                    SUPPLEMENTAL INFORMATION re: pldg. (7 in DE/1:13-cv-01922, 7 in DE/1:13-cv-01925, 7 in DE/1:13-cv-01926, 7 in DE/1:13-cv-01927, 7 in DE/1:13-cv-01929, 8 in DE/1:13-cv-01930, 7 in DE/1:13-cv-01931, 7 in DE/1:13-cv-01932, 7 in DE/1:13-cv-01934, 7 in DE/1:13-cv-01936, 27 in MDL No. 2534, 10 in VAE/1:14-cv-00136, 9 in VAE/1:14-cv-00137, 12 in VAE/1:14-cv-00138, 8 in VAE/1:14-cv-00139, 10 in VAE/1:14-cv-00140, 8 in VAE/1:14-cv-00141, 14 in VAE/1:14-cv-00142) Filed by Plaintiff TLI Communications LLC, (Attachments: # 1 Schedule of Actions, # 2 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 2534, DE/1:13-cv-01922, DE/1:13-cv-01925, DE/1:13-cv-01926, DE/1:13-cv-01927, DE/1:13-cv-01929, DE/1:13-cv-01930, DE/1:13-cv-01931, DE/1:13-cv-01932, DE/1:13-cv-01934, DE/1:13-cv-01936, VAE/1:14-cv-00136, VAE/1:14-cv-00137, VAE/1:14-cv-00138, VAE/1:14-cv-00139, VAE/1:14-cv-00140, VAE/1:14-cv-00141, VAE/1:14-cv-00142 (Whitman, Robert) Modified on 3/28/2014 (TB). DELETED DUPLICATE PARTIES. Modified on 3/31/2014 (TB). CHANGED EVENT TITLE FROM "REPLY TO RESPONSE TO MOTION TO TRANSFER" TO "SUPPLEMENTAL INFORMATION". (Entered: 03/27/2014)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 3/20/2014, Entered: None
                      RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION -- (re: pldg. ( 1 in MDL No. 2534) ) Filed by Plaintiffs TLI Communications LLC. - (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service, # 2 Schedule of Actions, # 3 Exhibit 1 - Description of pending Virginia actions, # 4 Exhibit 2 - E.D. VA. Judicial Caseload Profile, # 5 Exhibit 3 - Dist. Del. Judicial Caseload Profile, # 6 Exhibit 4 - Civil Case Processing in the Federal District Courts, # 7 Exhibit 5 - Litigation Cost Survey of Major Companies, # 8 Exhibit 6 - N.D. Cal. Judicial Caseload Profile) Associated Cases: MDL No. 2534, DE/1:13-cv-01922, DE/1:13-cv-01925, DE/1:13-cv-01926, DE/1:13-cv-01927, DE/1:13-cv-01929, DE/1:13-cv-01930, DE/1:13-cv-01931, DE/1:13-cv-01932, DE/1:13-cv-01934, DE/1:13-cv-01936, VAE/1:14-cv-00136, VAE/1:14-cv-00137, VAE/1:14-cv-00138, VAE/1:14-cv-00139, VAE/1:14-cv-00140, VAE/1:14-cv-00141, VAE/1:14-cv-00142 (Whitman, Robert) Modified on 3/21/2014 (TB). DELETED DUPLICATE PARTIES. Modified on 3/24/2014 (TB). DELETED "WITH MEMORANDUM". (Entered: 03/20/2014)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 3/20/2014, Entered: None
                        RESPONSE IN SUPPORT -- (re: pldg. ( 1 in MDL No. 2534) ) Filed by Defendant For a Song, Inc. - (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 2534, VAE/1:14-cv-00138, VAE/1:14-cv-00142 (Reilly, Craig) (Entered: 03/20/2014)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 3/20/2014, Entered: None
                          RESPONSE IN SUPPORT -- (re: pldg. ( 1 in MDL No. 2534) ) Filed by Defendant Apple Inc. - (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 2534, DE/1:13-cv-01922, DE/1:13-cv-01925, DE/1:13-cv-01926, DE/1:13-cv-01927, DE/1:13-cv-01929, DE/1:13-cv-01930, DE/1:13-cv-01931, DE/1:13-cv-01932, DE/1:13-cv-01934, DE/1:13-cv-01936, VAE/1:14-cv-00136, VAE/1:14-cv-00137, VAE/1:14-cv-00138, VAE/1:14-cv-00139, VAE/1:14-cv-00140, VAE/1:14-cv-00141, VAE/1:14-cv-00142 (Bowers, Steven) Modified on 3/24/2014 (TB). DELETED "WITH MEMORANDUM". (Entered: 03/20/2014)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 3/13/2014, Entered: None
                            CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT re: pldg. ( 1 in MDL No. 2534) -- Identifying Corporate Parent No Parent Corp. for For a Song, Inc., For a Song, Inc.. Associated Cases: MDL No. 2534, VAE/1:14-cv-00138, VAE/1:14-cv-00142 (Reilly, Craig) (Entered: 03/13/2014)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 3/13/2014, Entered: None
                              NOTICE OF APPEARANCE re: pldg.( 1 in MDL No. 2534) Filed by Craig Crandall Reilly on behalf of Defendants For a Song, Inc., For a Song, Inc. Associated Cases: MDL No. 2534, VAE/1:14-cv-00138, VAE/1:14-cv-00142 (Reilly, Craig) (Entered: 03/13/2014)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 3/13/2014, Entered: None
                                CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT re: pldg. ( 1 in MDL No. 2534) -- Identifying Corporate Parent No Parent Corp. for Dropbox Inc., IAC/InterActive Corp, Imgur LLC, Pinterest, Inc., Snapchat Inc., Tripadvisor Inc., Twitter, Inc., WHI Inc., Yahoo! Inc., Yelp Inc.; Corporate Parent IAC/InterActive Corp for CityGrid Media LLC, Vimeo LLC; Corporate Parent TripAdvisor, Inc. for Tripadvisor LLC; Corporate Parent Yahoo! Inc for Tumblr, Inc.; Corporate Parent Twitter, Inc. for Vine Labs, Inc.; Corporate Parent Wells Fargo & Co. for Shutterfly Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 2534, DE/1:13-cv-01922, DE/1:13-cv-01925, DE/1:13-cv-01926, DE/1:13-cv-01929, DE/1:13-cv-01931, DE/1:13-cv-01932, DE/1:13-cv-01934, DE/1:13-cv-01936, VAE/1:14-cv-00137, VAE/1:14-cv-00138, VAE/1:14-cv-00140 (Kent, Ryan) (Entered: 03/13/2014)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 3/13/2014, Entered: None
                                  NOTICE OF APPEARANCE re: pldg.( 1 in MDL No. 2534) Filed by Ryan Marshall Kent on behalf of Defendants Snapchat Inc., et al.Shutterfly Inc., Pinterest, Inc., Imgur LLC, Yelp Inc., Tripadvisor Inc., Tripadvisor LLC, CityGrid Media LLC, IAC/InterActive Corp, Vimeo LLC, Tumblr, Inc., Yahoo! Inc., WHI Inc., Dropbox Inc., Twitter, Inc., Vine Labs, Inc. [Suppress List] (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 2534, DE/1:13-cv-01922, DE/1:13-cv-01925, DE/1:13-cv-01926, DE/1:13-cv-01929, DE/1:13-cv-01931, DE/1:13-cv-01932, DE/1:13-cv-01934, DE/1:13-cv-01936, VAE/1:14-cv-00137, VAE/1:14-cv-00138, VAE/1:14-cv-00140 (Kent, Ryan) (Entered: 03/13/2014)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 3/13/2014, Entered: None
                                    CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT re: pldg. ( 1 in MDL No. 2534) -- Identifying Corporate Parent No Parent Corp. for Max Media LLC. Associated Cases: MDL No. 2534, VAE/1:14-cv-00138, VAE/1:14-cv-00139, VAE/1:14-cv-00140, VAE/1:14-cv-00142 (Brady, Joshua) (Entered: 03/13/2014)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 3/13/2014, Entered: None
                                      CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT re: pldg. ( 1 in MDL No. 2534) -- Identifying Corporate Parent No Parent Corp. for AV Automotive, L.L.C. Associated Cases: MDL No. 2534, VAE/1:14-cv-00136, VAE/1:14-cv-00138, VAE/1:14-cv-00139, VAE/1:14-cv-00140, VAE/1:14-cv-00142 (Brady, Joshua) Modified on 3/17/2014 (TB). DELETED DUPLICATE PARTIES. (Entered: 03/13/2014)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 3/13/2014, Entered: None
                                        NOTICE OF APPEARANCE re: pldg.( 1 in MDL No. 2534) Filed by Joshua Bryson Brady on behalf of Defendants AV Automotive, L.L.C., Max Media LLC, Hall Automotive, LLC, Lucidiom, Inc., Richmond Camera Shop, Incorporated U> Associated Cases: MDL No. 2534, VAE/1:14-cv-00136, VAE/1:14-cv-00137, VAE/1:14-cv-00138, VAE/1:14-cv-00139, VAE/1:14-cv-00140, VAE/1:14-cv-00141, VAE/1:14-cv-00142 (Brady, Joshua) Modified on 3/17/2014 (TB). DELETED DUPLICATE PARTIES. (Entered: 03/13/2014)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 3/13/2014, Entered: None
                                          CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT re: pldg. ( 1 in MDL No. 2534) -- Identifying Corporate Parent No Parent Corp. for TLI Communications LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Schedule of Actions, # 2 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 2534, DE/1:13-cv-01922, DE/1:13-cv-01925, DE/1:13-cv-01926, DE/1:13-cv-01927, DE/1:13-cv-01929, DE/1:13-cv-01930, DE/1:13-cv-01931, DE/1:13-cv-01932, DE/1:13-cv-01934, DE/1:13-cv-01936, VAE/1:14-cv-00136, VAE/1:14-cv-00137, VAE/1:14-cv-00138, VAE/1:14-cv-00139, VAE/1:14-cv-00140, VAE/1:14-cv-00141, VAE/1:14-cv-00142 (Whitman, Robert) Modified on 3/17/2014 (TB). DELETED DUPLICATE PARTIES. (Entered: 03/13/2014)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 3/13/2014, Entered: None
                                            NOTICE OF APPEARANCE re: pldg.( 1 in MDL No. 2534) Filed by Robert Whitman on behalf of Plaintiffs TLI Communications LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Schedule of Actions, # 2 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 2534, DE/1:13-cv-01922, DE/1:13-cv-01925, DE/1:13-cv-01926, DE/1:13-cv-01927, DE/1:13-cv-01929, DE/1:13-cv-01930, DE/1:13-cv-01931, DE/1:13-cv-01932, DE/1:13-cv-01934, DE/1:13-cv-01936, VAE/1:14-cv-00136, VAE/1:14-cv-00137, VAE/1:14-cv-00138, VAE/1:14-cv-00139, VAE/1:14-cv-00140, VAE/1:14-cv-00141, VAE/1:14-cv-00142 (Whitman, Robert) Modified on 3/17/2014 (TB). DELETED DUPLICATE PARTIES. (Entered: 03/13/2014)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 2/27/2014, Entered: None
                                              ***TEXT ONLY NOTICE***NOTICE OF FILING AND PUBLICATION OF BRIEFING SCHEDULE re: pldg. ( 1 in MDL No. 2534) BRIEFING SCHEDULE IS SET AS FOLLOWS: Notices of Appearance due on or before 3/13/2014. Corporate Disclosure Statements due on or before 3/13/2014. Responses due on or before 3/20/2014. Appearance forms (JPML form 18) and Corporate Disclosure forms can be downloaded from our website. Important: A Corporate Disclosure Form, if required, must be filed, even if one has previously been filed in this MDL.Please visit the CM/ECF Filing Guidelines & Forms page of our website for additional information.Signed by Clerk of the Panel Jeffery N. Luthi, on 2/27/2014. Associated Cases: MDL No. 2534, DE/1:13-cv-01922, DE/1:13-cv-01925, DE/1:13-cv-01926, DE/1:13-cv-01927, DE/1:13-cv-01929, DE/1:13-cv-01930, DE/1:13-cv-01931, DE/1:13-cv-01932, DE/1:13-cv-01934, DE/1:13-cv-01936, VAE/1:14-cv-00136, VAE/1:14-cv-00137, VAE/1:14-cv-00138, VAE/1:14-cv-00139, VAE/1:14-cv-00140, VAE/1:14-cv-00141, VAE/1:14-cv-00142 (TB) (Entered: 02/27/2014)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 2/27/2014, Entered: None
                                                MDL Number 2534 Assigned -- MOTION FOR TRANSFER ACCEPTED FOR FILING re: pldg. ( 1 in Pending No. 22) Associated Cases: Pending No. 22, DE/1:13-cv-01922, DE/1:13-cv-01925, DE/1:13-cv-01926, DE/1:13-cv-01927, DE/1:13-cv-01929, DE/1:13-cv-01930, DE/1:13-cv-01931, DE/1:13-cv-01932, DE/1:13-cv-01934, DE/1:13-cv-01936, VAE/1:14-cv-00136, VAE/1:14-cv-00137, VAE/1:14-cv-00138, VAE/1:14-cv-00139, VAE/1:14-cv-00140, VAE/1:14-cv-00141, VAE/1:14-cv-00142 (TB) (Entered: 02/27/2014)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                  Statistics

                                                  This case has been viewed 82 times.

                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                  Space
                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                   
                                                  PlainSite
                                                  Sign Up
                                                  Need Password Help?