TLI Communications LLC v. AV Automotive, L.L.C. et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, Case No. 1:14-cv-00139
District Judge Thomas Selby Ellis, III, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated September 20, 2016 at 5:40 PM DT (4.8 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Tli Communications LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Fiske & Harvey PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Philip John Harvey +1 703 518 9910 +1 703 518 9931 PHarvey@FiskeHarvey.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Mishcon de Reya New York LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert Whitman +1 212 257 4455 +1 212 612 3297 robert.whitman@mishcon.com
v.
No Logo AV Automotive, L.L.C., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of AV Automotive, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/13/2014 AV Automotive, LLC

Toggle Switch Represented by Williams Mullen, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joshua Bryson Brady +1 703 760 5200 +1 703 748 0244 jbrady@williamsmullen.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Martin William Hayes +1 703 760 5245 mhayes@williamsmullen.com
Google, Inc. Google, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Google, Inc.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/18/2014 Google, Inc.

Toggle Switch Represented by Williams & Connolly, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Raymond Kennon Poteat +1 202 434 5699 +1 202 434 5029 kpoteat@wc.com
No Logo Max Media LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Max Media LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/13/2014 Max Media LLC
  Entries (17) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 6/19/2014, Entered: None
OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Hearing held on 5/29/2014 before the Panel at Chicago, IL. Court Reporter/Transcriber Pamela S. Warren, 219 South Dearborn Street, Room 1928, Chicago, IL 60604, (312) 294-8907. Transcript may be viewed at the Panel's office or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Redaction due 6/26/2014. Redaction Request due 7/10/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/21/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/17/2014.Signed by Clerk of the Panel Jeffery N. Luthi, on 6/19/2014. Associated Cases: MDL No. 2534, DE/1:13-cv-01922, DE/1:13-cv-01925, DE/1:13-cv-01926, DE/1:13-cv-01927, DE/1:13-cv-01929, DE/1:13-cv-01930, DE/1:13-cv-01931, DE/1:13-cv-01932, DE/1:13-cv-01934, DE/1:13-cv-01936, VAE/1:14-cv-00136, VAE/1:14-cv-00137, VAE/1:14-cv-00138, VAE/1:14-cv-00139, VAE/1:14-cv-00140, VAE/1:14-cv-00141, VAE/1:14-cv-00142 (RH) (Entered: 06/19/2014)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 6/12/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
    TRANSFER ORDER re: pldg. ( 1 in MDL No. 2534) Transferring 10 action(s) to Judge Thomas S. Ellis III in the Eastern District of Virginia.Signed by Judge John G. Heyburn II, Chairman, PANEL ON MULTIDISTRICT LITIGATION, on 6/12/2014. Associated Cases: MDL No. 2534, DE/1:13-cv-01922, DE/1:13-cv-01925, DE/1:13-cv-01926, DE/1:13-cv-01927, DE/1:13-cv-01929, DE/1:13-cv-01930, DE/1:13-cv-01931, DE/1:13-cv-01932, DE/1:13-cv-01934, DE/1:13-cv-01936, VAE/1:14-cv-00136, VAE/1:14-cv-00137, VAE/1:14-cv-00138, VAE/1:14-cv-00139, VAE/1:14-cv-00140, VAE/1:14-cv-00141, VAE/1:14-cv-00142 (dn) (Entered: 06/12/2014)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 5/16/2014, Entered: None
      NOTICE OF ORAL ARGUMENT SCHEDULE re: pldg. (10 in DE/1:13-cv-01922, 10 in DE/1:13-cv-01925, 10 in DE/1:13-cv-01926, 10 in DE/1:13-cv-01927, 10 in DE/1:13-cv-01929, 11 in DE/1:13-cv-01930, 10 in DE/1:13-cv-01931, 10 in DE/1:13-cv-01932, 10 in DE/1:13-cv-01934, 10 in DE/1:13-cv-01936, 32 in MDL No. 2534, 13 in VAE/1:14-cv-00136, 12 in VAE/1:14-cv-00137, 16 in VAE/1:14-cv-00138, 11 in VAE/1:14-cv-00139, 13 in VAE/1:14-cv-00140, 11 in VAE/1:14-cv-00141, 19 in VAE/1:14-cv-00142) Setting oral argument schedule for the 5/29/2014 hearing session in Chicago, IL.Signed by Clerk of the Panel Jeffery N. Luthi on 5/16/2014. Associated Cases: MDL No. 2534, DE/1:13-cv-01922, DE/1:13-cv-01925, DE/1:13-cv-01926, DE/1:13-cv-01927, DE/1:13-cv-01929, DE/1:13-cv-01930, DE/1:13-cv-01931, DE/1:13-cv-01932, DE/1:13-cv-01934, DE/1:13-cv-01936, VAE/1:14-cv-00136, VAE/1:14-cv-00137, VAE/1:14-cv-00138, VAE/1:14-cv-00139, VAE/1:14-cv-00140, VAE/1:14-cv-00141, VAE/1:14-cv-00142 (RH) (Entered: 05/16/2014)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 5/12/2014, Entered: None
        NOTICE OF PRESENTATION OF ORAL ARGUMENT re: pldg. (10 in DE/1:13-cv-01922, 10 in DE/1:13-cv-01925, 10 in DE/1:13-cv-01926, 10 in DE/1:13-cv-01927, 10 in DE/1:13-cv-01929, 11 in DE/1:13-cv-01930, 10 in DE/1:13-cv-01931, 10 in DE/1:13-cv-01932, 10 in DE/1:13-cv-01934, 10 in DE/1:13-cv-01936, 32 in MDL No. 2534, 13 in VAE/1:14-cv-00136, 12 in VAE/1:14-cv-00137, 16 in VAE/1:14-cv-00138, 11 in VAE/1:14-cv-00139, 13 in VAE/1:14-cv-00140, 11 in VAE/1:14-cv-00141, 19 in VAE/1:14-cv-00142) Filed by Heidi Lyn Keefe on behalf of Defendants Facebook, Inc., Instagram, LLC Associated Cases: MDL No. 2534, DE/1:13-cv-01922, DE/1:13-cv-01925, DE/1:13-cv-01926, DE/1:13-cv-01927, DE/1:13-cv-01929, DE/1:13-cv-01930, DE/1:13-cv-01931, DE/1:13-cv-01932, DE/1:13-cv-01934, DE/1:13-cv-01936, VAE/1:14-cv-00136, VAE/1:14-cv-00137, VAE/1:14-cv-00138, VAE/1:14-cv-00139, VAE/1:14-cv-00140, VAE/1:14-cv-00141, VAE/1:14-cv-00142 (Keefe, Heidi) (Entered: 05/12/2014)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 5/12/2014, Entered: None
          NOTICE OF WAIVER OF ORAL ARGUMENT re: pldg. ( 32 in MDL No. 2534, 13 in VAE/1:14-cv-00136, 12 in VAE/1:14-cv-00137, 16 in VAE/1:14-cv-00138, 11 in VAE/1:14-cv-00139, 13 in VAE/1:14-cv-00140, 11 in VAE/1:14-cv-00141, 19 in VAE/1:14-cv-00142) Filed by Joshua Bryson Brady on behalf of Defendants AV Automotive, L.L.C., Max Media LLC, Hall Automotive, LLC, Lucidiom, Inc., Richmond Camera Shop, Incorporated Associated Cases: MDL No. 2534, VAE/1:14-cv-00136, VAE/1:14-cv-00137, VAE/1:14-cv-00138, VAE/1:14-cv-00139, VAE/1:14-cv-00140, VAE/1:14-cv-00141, VAE/1:14-cv-00142 (Brady, Joshua) Modified on 5/13/2014 (RH). REMOVED DUPLICATE PARTIES NAMES (Entered: 05/12/2014)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 5/9/2014, Entered: None
            NOTICE OF PRESENTATION OF ORAL ARGUMENT re: pldg. (10 in DE/1:13-cv-01922, 10 in DE/1:13-cv-01925, 10 in DE/1:13-cv-01926, 10 in DE/1:13-cv-01927, 10 in DE/1:13-cv-01929, 11 in DE/1:13-cv-01930, 10 in DE/1:13-cv-01931, 10 in DE/1:13-cv-01932, 10 in DE/1:13-cv-01934, 10 in DE/1:13-cv-01936, 32 in MDL No. 2534, 13 in VAE/1:14-cv-00136, 12 in VAE/1:14-cv-00137, 16 in VAE/1:14-cv-00138, 11 in VAE/1:14-cv-00139, 13 in VAE/1:14-cv-00140, 11 in VAE/1:14-cv-00141, 19 in VAE/1:14-cv-00142) Filed by Robert Whitman on behalf of Plaintiff TLI Communications LLC (Attachments: # 1 Schedule of Actions, # 2 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 2534, DE/1:13-cv-01922, DE/1:13-cv-01925, DE/1:13-cv-01926, DE/1:13-cv-01927, DE/1:13-cv-01929, DE/1:13-cv-01930, DE/1:13-cv-01931, DE/1:13-cv-01932, DE/1:13-cv-01934, DE/1:13-cv-01936, VAE/1:14-cv-00136, VAE/1:14-cv-00137, VAE/1:14-cv-00138, VAE/1:14-cv-00139, VAE/1:14-cv-00140, VAE/1:14-cv-00141, VAE/1:14-cv-00142 (Whitman, Robert) Modified on 5/9/2014 (RH). REMOVED DUPLICATE PARTY NAMES (Entered: 05/09/2014)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 4/14/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
              HEARING ORDER re: pldg. ( 1 in MDL No. 2534) - SECTION A (DESIGNATED FOR ORAL ARGUMENT) PANEL HEARING set for 5/29/2014 in Chicago, Illinois. Notices of Presentation or Waiver of Oral Argument due on or before 5/12/2014.Notice of Presentation or Waiver of Oral Argument form (JPML form 9) can be downloaded from our website.Signed by Judge John G. Heyburn II, Chairman, PANEL ON MULTIDISTRICT LITIGATION, on 4/14/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Courthouse Advisory) Associated Cases: MDL No. 2534, DE/1:13-cv-01922, DE/1:13-cv-01925, DE/1:13-cv-01926, DE/1:13-cv-01927, DE/1:13-cv-01929, DE/1:13-cv-01930, DE/1:13-cv-01931, DE/1:13-cv-01932, DE/1:13-cv-01934, DE/1:13-cv-01936, VAE/1:14-cv-00136, VAE/1:14-cv-00137, VAE/1:14-cv-00138, VAE/1:14-cv-00139, VAE/1:14-cv-00140, VAE/1:14-cv-00141, VAE/1:14-cv-00142 (RH) (Entered: 04/14/2014)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 3/27/2014, Entered: None
                SUPPLEMENTAL INFORMATION re: pldg. (7 in DE/1:13-cv-01922, 7 in DE/1:13-cv-01925, 7 in DE/1:13-cv-01926, 7 in DE/1:13-cv-01927, 7 in DE/1:13-cv-01929, 8 in DE/1:13-cv-01930, 7 in DE/1:13-cv-01931, 7 in DE/1:13-cv-01932, 7 in DE/1:13-cv-01934, 7 in DE/1:13-cv-01936, 27 in MDL No. 2534, 10 in VAE/1:14-cv-00136, 9 in VAE/1:14-cv-00137, 12 in VAE/1:14-cv-00138, 8 in VAE/1:14-cv-00139, 10 in VAE/1:14-cv-00140, 8 in VAE/1:14-cv-00141, 14 in VAE/1:14-cv-00142) Filed by Plaintiff TLI Communications LLC, (Attachments: # 1 Schedule of Actions, # 2 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 2534, DE/1:13-cv-01922, DE/1:13-cv-01925, DE/1:13-cv-01926, DE/1:13-cv-01927, DE/1:13-cv-01929, DE/1:13-cv-01930, DE/1:13-cv-01931, DE/1:13-cv-01932, DE/1:13-cv-01934, DE/1:13-cv-01936, VAE/1:14-cv-00136, VAE/1:14-cv-00137, VAE/1:14-cv-00138, VAE/1:14-cv-00139, VAE/1:14-cv-00140, VAE/1:14-cv-00141, VAE/1:14-cv-00142 (Whitman, Robert) Modified on 3/28/2014 (TB). DELETED DUPLICATE PARTIES. Modified on 3/31/2014 (TB). CHANGED EVENT TITLE FROM "REPLY TO RESPONSE TO MOTION TO TRANSFER" TO "SUPPLEMENTAL INFORMATION". (Entered: 03/27/2014)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 3/20/2014, Entered: None
                  RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION -- (re: pldg. ( 1 in MDL No. 2534) ) Filed by Plaintiffs TLI Communications LLC. - (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service, # 2 Schedule of Actions, # 3 Exhibit 1 - Description of pending Virginia actions, # 4 Exhibit 2 - E.D. VA. Judicial Caseload Profile, # 5 Exhibit 3 - Dist. Del. Judicial Caseload Profile, # 6 Exhibit 4 - Civil Case Processing in the Federal District Courts, # 7 Exhibit 5 - Litigation Cost Survey of Major Companies, # 8 Exhibit 6 - N.D. Cal. Judicial Caseload Profile) Associated Cases: MDL No. 2534, DE/1:13-cv-01922, DE/1:13-cv-01925, DE/1:13-cv-01926, DE/1:13-cv-01927, DE/1:13-cv-01929, DE/1:13-cv-01930, DE/1:13-cv-01931, DE/1:13-cv-01932, DE/1:13-cv-01934, DE/1:13-cv-01936, VAE/1:14-cv-00136, VAE/1:14-cv-00137, VAE/1:14-cv-00138, VAE/1:14-cv-00139, VAE/1:14-cv-00140, VAE/1:14-cv-00141, VAE/1:14-cv-00142 (Whitman, Robert) Modified on 3/21/2014 (TB). DELETED DUPLICATE PARTIES. Modified on 3/24/2014 (TB). DELETED "WITH MEMORANDUM". (Entered: 03/20/2014)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 3/20/2014, Entered: None
                    RESPONSE IN SUPPORT -- (re: pldg. ( 1 in MDL No. 2534) ) Filed by Defendant Apple Inc. - (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 2534, DE/1:13-cv-01922, DE/1:13-cv-01925, DE/1:13-cv-01926, DE/1:13-cv-01927, DE/1:13-cv-01929, DE/1:13-cv-01930, DE/1:13-cv-01931, DE/1:13-cv-01932, DE/1:13-cv-01934, DE/1:13-cv-01936, VAE/1:14-cv-00136, VAE/1:14-cv-00137, VAE/1:14-cv-00138, VAE/1:14-cv-00139, VAE/1:14-cv-00140, VAE/1:14-cv-00141, VAE/1:14-cv-00142 (Bowers, Steven) Modified on 3/24/2014 (TB). DELETED "WITH MEMORANDUM". (Entered: 03/20/2014)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 3/13/2014, Entered: None
                      CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT re: pldg. ( 1 in MDL No. 2534) -- Identifying Corporate Parent No Parent Corp. for Max Media LLC. Associated Cases: MDL No. 2534, VAE/1:14-cv-00138, VAE/1:14-cv-00139, VAE/1:14-cv-00140, VAE/1:14-cv-00142 (Brady, Joshua) (Entered: 03/13/2014)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 3/13/2014, Entered: None
                        CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT re: pldg. ( 1 in MDL No. 2534) -- Identifying Corporate Parent No Parent Corp. for AV Automotive, L.L.C. Associated Cases: MDL No. 2534, VAE/1:14-cv-00136, VAE/1:14-cv-00138, VAE/1:14-cv-00139, VAE/1:14-cv-00140, VAE/1:14-cv-00142 (Brady, Joshua) Modified on 3/17/2014 (TB). DELETED DUPLICATE PARTIES. (Entered: 03/13/2014)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 3/13/2014, Entered: None
                          NOTICE OF APPEARANCE re: pldg.( 1 in MDL No. 2534) Filed by Joshua Bryson Brady on behalf of Defendants AV Automotive, L.L.C., Max Media LLC, Hall Automotive, LLC, Lucidiom, Inc., Richmond Camera Shop, Incorporated U> Associated Cases: MDL No. 2534, VAE/1:14-cv-00136, VAE/1:14-cv-00137, VAE/1:14-cv-00138, VAE/1:14-cv-00139, VAE/1:14-cv-00140, VAE/1:14-cv-00141, VAE/1:14-cv-00142 (Brady, Joshua) Modified on 3/17/2014 (TB). DELETED DUPLICATE PARTIES. (Entered: 03/13/2014)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 3/13/2014, Entered: None
                            CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT re: pldg. ( 1 in MDL No. 2534) -- Identifying Corporate Parent No Parent Corp. for TLI Communications LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Schedule of Actions, # 2 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 2534, DE/1:13-cv-01922, DE/1:13-cv-01925, DE/1:13-cv-01926, DE/1:13-cv-01927, DE/1:13-cv-01929, DE/1:13-cv-01930, DE/1:13-cv-01931, DE/1:13-cv-01932, DE/1:13-cv-01934, DE/1:13-cv-01936, VAE/1:14-cv-00136, VAE/1:14-cv-00137, VAE/1:14-cv-00138, VAE/1:14-cv-00139, VAE/1:14-cv-00140, VAE/1:14-cv-00141, VAE/1:14-cv-00142 (Whitman, Robert) Modified on 3/17/2014 (TB). DELETED DUPLICATE PARTIES. (Entered: 03/13/2014)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 3/13/2014, Entered: None
                              NOTICE OF APPEARANCE re: pldg.( 1 in MDL No. 2534) Filed by Robert Whitman on behalf of Plaintiffs TLI Communications LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Schedule of Actions, # 2 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 2534, DE/1:13-cv-01922, DE/1:13-cv-01925, DE/1:13-cv-01926, DE/1:13-cv-01927, DE/1:13-cv-01929, DE/1:13-cv-01930, DE/1:13-cv-01931, DE/1:13-cv-01932, DE/1:13-cv-01934, DE/1:13-cv-01936, VAE/1:14-cv-00136, VAE/1:14-cv-00137, VAE/1:14-cv-00138, VAE/1:14-cv-00139, VAE/1:14-cv-00140, VAE/1:14-cv-00141, VAE/1:14-cv-00142 (Whitman, Robert) Modified on 3/17/2014 (TB). DELETED DUPLICATE PARTIES. (Entered: 03/13/2014)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 2/27/2014, Entered: None
                                ***TEXT ONLY NOTICE***NOTICE OF FILING AND PUBLICATION OF BRIEFING SCHEDULE re: pldg. ( 1 in MDL No. 2534) BRIEFING SCHEDULE IS SET AS FOLLOWS: Notices of Appearance due on or before 3/13/2014. Corporate Disclosure Statements due on or before 3/13/2014. Responses due on or before 3/20/2014. Appearance forms (JPML form 18) and Corporate Disclosure forms can be downloaded from our website. Important: A Corporate Disclosure Form, if required, must be filed, even if one has previously been filed in this MDL.Please visit the CM/ECF Filing Guidelines & Forms page of our website for additional information.Signed by Clerk of the Panel Jeffery N. Luthi, on 2/27/2014. Associated Cases: MDL No. 2534, DE/1:13-cv-01922, DE/1:13-cv-01925, DE/1:13-cv-01926, DE/1:13-cv-01927, DE/1:13-cv-01929, DE/1:13-cv-01930, DE/1:13-cv-01931, DE/1:13-cv-01932, DE/1:13-cv-01934, DE/1:13-cv-01936, VAE/1:14-cv-00136, VAE/1:14-cv-00137, VAE/1:14-cv-00138, VAE/1:14-cv-00139, VAE/1:14-cv-00140, VAE/1:14-cv-00141, VAE/1:14-cv-00142 (TB) (Entered: 02/27/2014)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 2/27/2014, Entered: None
                                  MDL Number 2534 Assigned -- MOTION FOR TRANSFER ACCEPTED FOR FILING re: pldg. ( 1 in Pending No. 22) Associated Cases: Pending No. 22, DE/1:13-cv-01922, DE/1:13-cv-01925, DE/1:13-cv-01926, DE/1:13-cv-01927, DE/1:13-cv-01929, DE/1:13-cv-01930, DE/1:13-cv-01931, DE/1:13-cv-01932, DE/1:13-cv-01934, DE/1:13-cv-01936, VAE/1:14-cv-00136, VAE/1:14-cv-00137, VAE/1:14-cv-00138, VAE/1:14-cv-00139, VAE/1:14-cv-00140, VAE/1:14-cv-00141, VAE/1:14-cv-00142 (TB) (Entered: 02/27/2014)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF

                                    Statistics

                                    This case has been viewed 81 times.

                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                    Space
                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                     
                                    PlainSite
                                    Sign Up
                                    Need Password Help?