City of Oceanside v. AELD, LLC et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit California Southern District Court, Case No. 3:08-cv-02180
District Judge John A. Houston, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated September 29, 2016 at 11:10 AM DT (5.1 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo City of Oceanside, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Gatzke Dillon & Ballance LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mark J Dillon +1 760 431 9501 +1 760 431 9512 mdillon@gdandb.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Danielle K Morone +1 760 431 9501 dmorone@gdandb.com
No Logo AELD, LLC, Counter-Claimant
v.
No Logo AELD, LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by 1430 Wynkoop St.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 12/10/2010, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Marsha Amin +1 619 238 1900 +1 619 235 0398 ma@procopio.com
TERMINATED: 12/10/2010, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Evelyn F. Heidelberg +1 619 238 1900 +1 619 235 0398 evelyn.heidelberg@procopio.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Sidley Austin LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Bradley H. Ellis +1 213 896 6000 +1 213 896 6600 bellis@sidley.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mark Edmonde Haddad +1 213 896 6604 +1 213 896 6600 mhaddad@sidley.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Carly Alison Steinbaum +1 213 896 6137 +1 213 896 6600 csteinbaum@sidley.com
Federal Aviation Administration Federal Aviation Administration, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED U. S. Attorney - Criminal +1 314 539 2200 +1 314 539 7695 usamoe.crimdock@usdoj.gov
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ernest Cordero, JR +1 619 557 5662 +1 619 557 7122 Ernest.Cordero@usdoj.gov
No Logo Robert A. Sturgell, Defendant
United States Department of Transportation United States Department of Transportation, Defendant
Officially listed as "U.S. Department of Transportation"
No Logo City of Oceanside, Counter-Defendant
Citation Section 49 U.S.C. § 1471
Nature of Suit 890 - Other Statutes: Other Statutory Actions
  Entries (65) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 7/22/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 64 Joint Motion to Dismiss With Prejudice. The parties shall bear their own attorneys' fees and costs. The Court shall and hereby does retain jurisdiction to enforce the settlement and mutual release agreement entered between the parties. Signed by Judge John A. Houston on 7/22/2011. (leh) (av1). (Entered: 07/22/2011)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Blank 64 Filed: 7/19/2011, Entered: None
    Joint MOTION to Dismiss Case With Prejudice by City of Oceanside(a general law city and municipal corporation). (Dillon, Mark) (jpp). (Entered: 07/19/2011)
      LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 7/18/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
      ORDER withdrawing Motions 54 , 55 , and 57 . The three pending motions are withdrawn and the related hearing, currently scheduled for 08/01/11 is taken off calendar. Signed by Judge John A. Houston on 07/18/11. (jpp) (jcj). (Entered: 07/18/2011)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 7/14/2011, Entered: None
        Joint MOTION to Withdraw 55 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment, 57 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment, 54 MOTION for Reconsideration re 45 Order MOTION for Reconsideration re 45 Order by City of Oceanside(a general law city and municipal corporation). (Dillon, Mark) (jpp). (Entered: 07/14/2011)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 5/26/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
          ORDER granting 60 Joint Motion to Continue motion hearing. Hearing on Motion for reconsideration and Cross-Motions for Partial Summary Judgment are continued to 8/1/2011 02:30 PM in Courtroom 11 before Judge John A. Houston. Signed by Judge John A. Houston on 05/25/11. (jpp) (jcj). (Entered: 05/26/2011)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 5/23/2011, Entered: None
            Joint MOTION to Continue June 6, 2011 Motion Hearing by City of Oceanside(a general law city and municipal corporation). (Dillon, Mark) (jpp). (Entered: 05/23/2011)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 3/29/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
              ORDER granting 58 Joint Motion to modify the order regulating pretrial proceedings. The Court vacates all remaining pretrial dates and the mandatory settlement conference set in the Court's 10/18/10 Scheduling Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal on 03/29/11. (jpp) Modified on 3/29/2011 to edit Judge info, nef resent to all ptys. (jpp). Modified on 3/30/2011 to correct judge association (jcj). (Entered: 03/29/2011)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 3/23/2011, Entered: None
                Joint MOTION to Stay re 47 Scheduling Order, by City of Oceanside(a general law city and municipal corporation). (Dillon, Mark) (jpp). (Entered: 03/23/2011)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 3/7/2011, Entered: None
                  MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment by City of Oceanside(a general law city and municipal corporation). (Attachments: # 1 Memo of Points and Authorities, # 2 Declaration, # 3 Proof of Service)(Dillon, Mark) (jpp). (Entered: 03/07/2011)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 3/7/2011, Entered: None
                    CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by AELD, LLC(a California limited liability company and successor to the Deutsch Company, a California corporation) re 55 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment, 54 MOTION for Reconsideration re 45 Order MOTION for Reconsideration re 45 Order (Haddad, Mark) (jpp). (Entered: 03/07/2011)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 3/7/2011, Entered: None
                      MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment by AELD, LLC(a California limited liability company and successor to the Deutsch Company, a California corporation). (Attachments: # 1 Memo of Points and Authorities, # 2 Declaration, # 3 Exhibit A-D, # 4 Exhibit E-O, # 5 Exhibit P-T, # 6 Exhibit U-AA)(Haddad, Mark) (jpp). (Entered: 03/07/2011)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 3/7/2011, Entered: None
                        MOTION for Reconsideration re 45 Order by AELD, LLC(a California limited liability company and successor to the Deutsch Company, a California corporation). (Attachments: # 1 Memo of Points and Authorities, # 2 Declaration, # 3 Exhibit)(Haddad, Mark) (jpp). (Entered: 03/07/2011)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 2/11/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                          ORDER granting 52 Joint to modify the 10/18/10 Scheduling Order. All motions, other than motion to amend or join parties, or motions in limine, shall be filed on or before 03/07/11. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal on 02/11/11. (jpp) (jrl). (Entered: 02/11/2011)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 2/9/2011, Entered: None
                            Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File all Motions by City of Oceanside(a general law city and municipal corporation). (Dillon, Mark) (jpp). (Entered: 02/09/2011)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 12/29/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                              ORDER granting 50 Joint Motion to modify the 10/18/10 Scheduling Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal on 12/29/10. (jpp) (jrl). (Entered: 12/29/2010)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 12/17/2010, Entered: None
                                Joint MOTION To Modify The October 18, 2010 Scheduling Order by AELD, LLC. (Haddad, Mark) (jpp). (Entered: 12/17/2010)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 12/10/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                  ORDER granting 48 Notice of Motion to Substitute Attorney. Attorney Mark E Haddad, Bradley Howard Ellis, and Carly Steinbaum are hereby added for AELD, LLC. Signed by Judge John A. Houston on 12/10/2010. (leh) (jrl). (Entered: 12/10/2010)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 12/8/2010, Entered: None
                                    NOTICE by AELD, LLC And Request of Substitution of Counsel (Haddad, Mark) (jpp). Modified on 12/8/2010 to change to motion. (jpp). (Entered: 12/08/2010)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 10/18/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                      SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Conference held 10/18/10. Mandatory Settlement Conference set for 5/4/2011 02:00 PM in Courtroom 12 before Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 5/16/2011. Final Pretrial Conference set for 5/23/2011 02:30 PM in Courtroom 11 before Judge John A. Houston. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal on 10/18/10.(jpp) (jrl). (Entered: 10/18/2010)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 10/18/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                        Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal: Case Management Conference held on 10/18/2010. Scheduling order to follow. (Plaintiff Attorney Mark Dillon). (Defendant Attorney Evelyn Heidelberg, Ernest Cordero). (alg) (Entered: 10/18/2010)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 10/14/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                          AMENDED ORDER re Motions for Summary Judgment 26 , 27 , 28 . Signed by Judge John A. Houston on 10/12/10.(jpp) (jrl). (Entered: 10/14/2010)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 10/1/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                            ORDER setting Telephonic Case Management Conference for 10/18/2010 01:30 PM in Courtroom 12 before Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal on 10/01/10.(jpp) (jrl). (Entered: 10/01/2010)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 9/28/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                              ORDER denying 26 AELD's Motion for Summary Judgment; granting 27 The Federal Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment; and granting in part and denying in part 28 Plaintiff's partial Motion for Summary Judgment. Judgment is entered in favor of Plaintiff as to Plaintiff's first, second, third and fourth claims and as to AELD's first and second counterclaims. Signed by Judge John A. Houston on 09/28/10. (jpp) (jrl). Modified on 10/8/2010 to replace image, nef resent to all ptys. (jpp). (Entered: 09/28/2010)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 6/21/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                TRANSFER ORDER. This case has been transferred from the calendar of Magistrate Judge William McCurine, Jr to the calendar of Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal for all further proceedings. The new case number is 08cv2180 JAH (BGS). Signed by Magistrate Judge William McCurine, Jr on 06/21/10.(jcj) (Entered: 06/21/2010)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 5/10/2010, Entered: None
                                                  NOTICE of Change of Address by Evelyn F. Heidelberg (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(Heidelberg, Evelyn) (jpp). (Entered: 05/10/2010)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 3/9/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                    ORDER granting 39 Motion to modify the Order Regulating Pretrial Proceedings. All pending dates in the Amended Scheduling Order of 10/09/09, are stayed until further order of the Court. Within 3 days of receiving a ruling from Judge Houston on the pending motions for summary judgment, Plaintiff shall telephone the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge William McCurine, Jr on 03/09/10. (jpp) (jrl). (Entered: 03/09/2010)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 2/16/2010, Entered: None
                                                      Joint MOTION Modify Orders Regulating Pretrial Proceedings by City of Oceanside(a general law city and municipal corporation). (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(Dillon, Mark) (jpp). (Entered: 02/16/2010)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 11/23/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                        Minute Order. for proceedings held before Judge John A. Houston:Motion Hearing held on 11/23/2009 submitting 26 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; submitting 27 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; submitting 28 Motion for Summary Judgment. Court to issue order. (Court Reporter Cameron Kircher.)(Plaintiff Attorney Mark J. Dillon, Danielle K. Morone).(Defendant Attorney Evelyn F. Heidelberg, Marsha Amin, Ernest Cordero, Jr.). (lwm) (Entered: 11/24/2009)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 11/16/2009, Entered: None
                                                          REPLY to Response to Motion re 28 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by City of Oceanside(a general law city and municipal corporation). (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(Dillon, Mark) (jpp). (Entered: 11/16/2009)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 11/16/2009, Entered: None
                                                            REPLY to Response to Motion re 26 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by AELD, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Declaration, # 3 Declaration, # 4 Objections to Declarations, # 5 Notice of Lodgment, # 6 Exhibit Part 1, # 7 Exhibit Part 2, # 8 Proof of Service)(Heidelberg, Evelyn) (jpp). (Entered: 11/16/2009)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 11/16/2009, Entered: None
                                                              REPLY to Response to Motion re 28 MOTION for Summary Judgment, 27 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Federal Aviation Administration, Robert A. Sturgell, U.S. Department of Transportation. (Cordero, Ernest) (jpp). (Entered: 11/16/2009)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 11/10/2009, Entered: None
                                                                CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by City of Oceanside(a general law city and municipal corporation) re 31 Response in Support of Motion by Federal Defendants (Dillon, Mark) (jpp). (Entered: 11/10/2009)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 11/9/2009, Entered: None
                                                                  RESPONSE in Opposition re 28 MOTION for Summary Judgment, 27 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment by City of Oceanside and Federal Defendants filed by AELD, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Declaration, # 3 Declaration, # 4 Notice, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Proof of Service)(Heidelberg, Evelyn) Atty contacted re s/ (pdc). (Entered: 11/09/2009)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 11/9/2009, Entered: None
                                                                    RESPONSE in Opposition re 26 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment by AELD, LLC filed by City of Oceanside(a general law city and municipal corporation). (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Declaration, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Proof of Service)(Dillon, Mark)(leh). (Entered: 11/09/2009)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 11/9/2009, Entered: None
                                                                      RESPONSE in Support re 27 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment by Federal Defendants filed by City of Oceanside(a general law city and municipal corporation). (Dillon, Mark) Modified on 11/10/2009 - sent email instructing to file proof (mjj) (Entered: 11/09/2009)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 10/9/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                        AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER. Mandatory Settlement Conference set for 3/29/2010 09:30 AM in Courtroom C before Magistrate Judge William McCurine Jr.. Signed by Magistrate Judge William McCurine, Jr on 10/09/09. (jpp) (jrl). (Entered: 10/09/2009)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 9/18/2009, Entered: None
                                                                          Joint MOTION to Modify Amended Scheduling Order and Case Management Conference by AELD, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(Heidelberg, Evelyn) Modified on 9/21/2009 - removed all caps (asw). (Entered: 09/18/2009)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 9/11/2009, Entered: None
                                                                            MOTION for Summary Judgment by City of Oceanside. (Attachments: # 1 Memo of Points and Authorities, # 2 Declaration, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit, # 7 Notice of Lodgment, # 8 Exhibit, # 9 Exhibit, # 10 Exhibit, # 11 Exhibit, # 12 Exhibit, # 13 Exhibit, # 14 Exhibit, # 15 Stipulation, # 16 Proof of Service)(Dillon, Mark) (jpp). (Entered: 09/11/2009)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 9/11/2009, Entered: None
                                                                              MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment by Federal Aviation Administration, U.S. Department of Transportation, Robert A. Sturgell. (Attachments: # 1 Memo of Points and Authorities, # 2 Notice of Lodgment and Table of Exhibits in Support of Partial SJ)(Cordero, Ernest) (jpp). (Entered: 09/11/2009)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 9/11/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment by AELD, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Notice, # 2 Memo of Points and Authorities, # 3 Notice Lodgment, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Proof of Service, # 7 Declaration Heidelberg, # 8 Declaration Holler, # 9 Declaration Dart)(Heidelberg, Evelyn) (jpp). (Entered: 09/11/2009)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 8/21/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                  Second Amended SCHEDULING ORDER re 23 . All other pretrial motions must be filed on or before December 21, 2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge William McCurine, Jr on 8/21/09. (lao) (jrl). (Entered: 08/24/2009)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 8/6/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                    CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by City of Oceanside re 23 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery (Dillon, Mark). (jah). (Entered: 08/06/2009)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 8/6/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                      Joint MOTION to Modify the Case Management Conference Order Regulating Discovery and Other Pretrial Proceedings by City of Oceanside, AELD, LLC(a California limited liability company and successor to the Deutsch Company, a California corporation), Federal Aviation Administration, U.S. Department of Transportation, Robert A. Sturgell. (Dillon, Mark) Modified on 8/7/09 - Edited text (vet). (Entered: 08/06/2009)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 6/5/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                        SCHEDULING ORDER: Telephonic Case Management Conference. Mandatory Settlement Conference set for 11/4/2009 09:15 AM in Courtroom C before Magistrate Judge William McCurine Jr. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 4/26/2010. Final Pretrial Conference set for 5/3/2010 10:30 AM in Courtroom 11 before Judge John A. Houston. Signed by Magistrate Judge William McCurine, Jr on 06/05/09. (jpp) (jrl). (Entered: 06/08/2009)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 5/21/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                          Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge William McCurine, Jr: Telephonic Discovery Hearing held on 5/21/2009(Tape #n/a). (Plaintiff Attorney Bernard R. Lafer). (Defendant Attorney Brian S. Inamine, Carolyn Taylor). (rab) (Entered: 05/22/2009)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 5/15/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                            Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge William McCurine, Jr: Case Management Conference held on 5/15/2009, Mandatory Settlement Conference held on 5/15/2009(Tape #n/a). (Plaintiff Attorney Mark J. Dillon, Danielle Morone, John Mullen, Doug Eddon). (Defendant Attorney Ernest Cordero, Jr., Evelyn F. Heidelberg, Mark McClary, Lorraine Hanson-Jones, Dan Darr). (rab) (Entered: 05/22/2009)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 4/29/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                              ANSWER to 18 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim of AELD, LLC by City of Oceanside.(Dillon, Mark) (jpp). (Entered: 04/29/2009)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 4/14/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                Amended ANSWER to 1 Complaint with Jury Demand, Amended COUNTERCLAIM against City of Oceanside by AELD, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(Amin, Marsha) (jpp). (Entered: 04/14/2009)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 4/14/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                  ORDER granting 15 Joint Motion for filing of First Amended Answer and Counterclaims. Defendant and Counter-Claimant AELD LLC shall electronically file the First Amended Answer and Counterclaims, filed on 04/09/09, as Exhibit A to the parties' Joint Motion. The answer is deemed filed as of the date of this Order. Signed by Judge John A. Houston on 04/14/09. (jpp) (jrl). (Entered: 04/14/2009)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 4/13/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                    NOTICE of Appearance by Danielle K Morone on behalf of City of Oceanside (Morone, Danielle) (jpp). (Entered: 04/13/2009)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 4/9/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                      Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct Answer and Counterclaims by AELD, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Proof of Service)(Amin, Marsha) (jpp). (Entered: 04/09/2009)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 3/17/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                        NOTICE of Appearance by Marsha Amin on behalf of AELD, LLC (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(Amin, Marsha) (jpp). (Entered: 03/17/2009)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 3/11/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                          Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge William McCurine, Jr:Telephonic Early Neutral Evaluation Conference held on 3/11/2009(Tape #n/a).(Plaintiff Attorney Mark J. Dillon, Danielle Morone, Peter Weiss).(Defendant Attorney Ernest Cordero, Marsha Amin).(rab) (Entered: 03/16/2009)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 3/12/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                            ORDER following Early Neutral Evaluation Conference held 05/11/09. Full day Case Management Conference set for 5/15/2009 09:30 AM in Courtroom C before Magistrate Judge William McCurine Jr,. Signed by Magistrate Judge William McCurine, Jr on 03/12/09. (jpp) (jrl). (Entered: 03/13/2009)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 2/23/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                              MOTION to Dismiss AELD's Third Counterclaim by City of Oceanside. (Attachments: # 1 Memo of Points and Authorities)(Dillon, Mark) (jpp). (Entered: 02/23/2009)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 2/9/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                NOTICE and ORDER setting Early Neutral Evaluation for 3/11/2009 09:30 AM in Courtroom C before Magistrate Judge William McCurine Jr. Signed by Magistrate Judge William McCurine, Jr on 02/09/09. (jpp) (Entered: 02/09/2009)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 2/3/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                  ANSWER to 1 Complaint by Federal Defendants to Complaint for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief by U.S. Department of Transportation. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(Cordero, Ernest) (jpp). (Entered: 02/03/2009)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 2/2/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                    Minute Entry:Magistrate Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo hereby recuses from this matter. Magistrate Judge William McCurine, Jr is added to the case. Magistrate Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo is no longer assigned to case. The new case number is 08cv2180 JAH(WMC).(pdc) (Entered: 02/03/2009)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 2/2/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                      ANSWER to 1 Complaint with Jury Demand and, COUNTERCLAIM against City of Oceanside by AELD, LLC.(Heidelberg, Evelyn) (jpp). (Entered: 02/02/2009)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 12/29/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                        SUMMONS Returned Executed by City of Oceanside. (Dillon, Mark) (jpp). (Entered: 12/29/2008)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 12/29/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                          SUMMONS Returned Executed by City of Oceanside. Federal Aviation Administration served on 12/5/2008, answer due 2/3/2009; U.S. Department of Transportation served on 12/5/2008, answer due 2/3/2009; Robert A. Sturgell served on 12/5/2008, answer due 2/3/2009. (Dillon, Mark) (jpp). (Entered: 12/29/2008)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 12/29/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                            WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by City of Oceanside. AELD, LLC waiver sent on 12/3/2008, answer due 2/2/2009. (Dillon, Mark) (jpp). (Entered: 12/29/2008)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 12/2/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                              Summons (Alias) Reissued as to AELD, LLC, Federal Aviation Administration, U.S. Department of Transportation, Robert A. Sturgell. (jpp) (Entered: 12/03/2008)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 11/25/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                Summons Issued as to AELD, LLC, Federal Aviation Administration, U.S. Department of Transportation, Robert A. Sturgell. (jer) (Entered: 11/25/2008)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 11/25/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                  COMPLAINT against AELD, LLC, Federal Aviation Administration, U.S. Department of Transportation, Robert A. Sturgell ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 157390.), filed by City of Oceanside.(jer)(kaj). (Entered: 11/25/2008)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                    Space Space

                                                                                                                                    Statistics

                                                                                                                                    This case has been viewed 240 times.

                                                                                                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                    Space
                                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                     
                                                                                                                                    PlainSite
                                                                                                                                    Sign Up
                                                                                                                                    Need Password Help?