REMY, INC. v. TECNOMATIC S.P.A.

Federal Civil Lawsuit Indiana Southern District Court, Case No. 1:08-cv-01227
District Judge Sarah Evans Barker, presiding
Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
District Judge Sarah Evans Barker
Last Updated October 5, 2016 at 8:57 AM EDT (8.5 years ago) Update UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert AlertsSpaceJump Jump
Summary

No one has written a summary of this case yet. Sign up or sign in to contribute one.

Parties
No Logo Remy Inc., Plaintiff

Represented by Baker & Daniels LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David P Irmscher +1 260 424 8000 +1 260 460 1700 david.irmscher@bakerd.com

Represented by Bryan Cave, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrew C. Warnecke +1 312 602 5066 andrew.warnecke@bryancave.com

Represented by Faegre Baker Daniels LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED RYAN M. HURLEY +1 317 237 1144 +1 317 237 1000 ryan.hurley@faegreBD.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph H. Yeager, Jr. +1 317 237 1278 jay.yeager@FaegreBD.com
No Logo Tecnomatic, S.p.a., Counter-Claimant
v.
No Logo Tecnomatic, S.p.a., Defendant

Represented by Bryan Cave, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Donald Alexander Cole +1 312 602 5028 donald.cole@bryancave.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kara E F Cenar +1 312 602 5019 kara.cenar@bryancave.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Patrick McKey +1 312 602 5000 +1 312 602 5050 patrick.mckey@bryancave.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mariangela M. Seale +1 312 602 5117 merili.seale@bryancave.com
Space Allyson Leigh Wilcox +1 312 602 5102 +1 312 698 7513 allyson.wilcox@bryancave.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paula Lynn Zecchini +1 949 223 7207 +1 949 223 7100 paula.zecchini@bryancave.com

Represented by THE WEATHERS LAW OFFICE

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Scott A. Weathers +1 317 822 8010 +1 317 822 8088 scott@sawlaw.net
No Logo Remy Inc., Counter-Defendant
Attributes
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332
Nature of Suit 190 - Contract: Other Contract Actions
Timeline
  Entries (203) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 205 Filed: 9/15/2011, Entered: None
Redacted Exhibit B - Part 2 to 192 Brief/Memorandum in Support of Motion by TECNOMATIC S.P.A. (SWM) (Entered: 09/16/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 204 Filed: 9/15/2011, Entered: None
Redacted Exhibit B (Deposition Transcript of William S. Howard) to 192 Brief/Memorandum in Support of Motion by TECNOMATIC S.P.A. (SWM) (Entered: 09/16/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 203 Filed: 9/15/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting Deft's 199 MOTION for Leave to File Redacted Versions of Exhibits A and B to Defendant's Memorandum in Support of Defendant's Motion to Exclude the Expert Report of William S. Howard. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 9/15/2011.(SWM) (Entered: 09/16/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 202 Filed: 9/15/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
CLOSED DISMISSED - Order GRANTING 188 MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by REMY, INC. The Clerk shall consolidate Cause No. 1:08-cv-1227 into Cause No. 1:11-cv-0991 and close Cause No. 1:08-cv-1227. All future filings shall bear the new consolidated caption and cause number. The Clerk shall transfer the motions pending in Cause No. 1:08-cv-1227 at Docket Nos. 179 and 191 to Cause No. 1:11-cv-991. The transfer of these motions shall not alter the deadlines for any response or reply briefs. The final pretrial conference previously scheduled for September 20, 2011, and the trial previously scheduled for October 3, 2011, in Cause No. 1:08-cv-1227 are VACATED. Signed by Judge Sarah Evans Barker on 9/15/2011.(CKM) (Entered: 09/15/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 201 Filed: 9/14/2011, Entered: None
EXHIBIT re 199 MOTION for Leave to File Redacted Versions of Exhibits A and B to Defendant's Memorandum in Support of Defendant's Motion to Exclude the Expert Report of William S. Howard by TECNOMATIC S.P.A.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit B_Part 1, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit B_Part 2)(Warnecke, Andrew) (Entered: 09/14/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 200 Filed: 9/14/2011, Entered: None
Submission of Proposed Order, re 199 MOTION for Leave to File Redacted Versions of Exhibits A and B to Defendant's Memorandum in Support of Defendant's Motion to Exclude the Expert Report of William S. Howard, filed by Defendant TECNOMATIC S.P.A.. (Warnecke, Andrew) (Entered: 09/14/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 199 Filed: 9/14/2011, Entered: None
MOTION for Leave to File Redacted Versions of Exhibits A and B to Defendant's Memorandum in Support of Defendant's Motion to Exclude the Expert Report of William S. Howard, filed by Defendant TECNOMATIC S.P.A.. (Warnecke, Andrew) (Entered: 09/14/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 198 Filed: 9/9/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore: Settlement Conference held on 9/1/2011. The parties appeared in person and by counsel. Settlement was not achieved. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore.(SWM) (Entered: 09/09/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 197 Filed: 9/9/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting Pltf's 196 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to 9/30/2011 re 191 MOTION to Exclude the Expert Report of William S. Howard. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 9/9/2011. (SWM) (Entered: 09/09/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 196 Filed: 9/6/2011, Entered: None
MOTION for Extension of Time to September 30, 2011 to file response to 191 MOTION to Exclude the Expert Report of William S. Howard, filed by Plaintiff REMY, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Motion to Exclude Expert Report)(Hurley, Ryan) (Entered: 09/06/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 195 Filed: 8/31/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting Deft's 194 Motion to Seal Dkt. Number 193. Within 10 days from date of entry of this Order, Deft is to file redacted copies of Exhibits A and B. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 8/31/2011. (SWM) (Entered: 09/01/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 194 Filed: 8/29/2011, Entered: None
MOTION to Seal Document 193 SEALED Document in Support of Defendants Motion to Exclude Expert Report of William Howard, filed by Plaintiff REMY, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Warnecke, Andrew) (Entered: 08/29/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 193 Filed: 8/29/2011, Entered: None
*** SEALED PER ORDER DATED 8/31/2011 *** SEALED Exhibits in Support of Motion to Exclude Expert Report of William Howard, re 192 Brief/Memorandum in Support of Motion, filed by Plaintiff REMY, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-Expert Report of William Howard, # 2 Exhibit B-Deposition Transcript of William Howard)(Warnecke, Andrew) Modified on 9/1/2011 (SWM). (Entered: 08/29/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 192 Filed: 8/29/2011, Entered: None
BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support re 191 MOTION to Exclude the Expert Report of William S. Howard, filed by Plaintiff REMY, INC.. (Warnecke, Andrew) (Entered: 08/29/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 191 Filed: 8/29/2011, Entered: None
MOTION to Exclude the Expert Report of William S. Howard, filed by Plaintiff REMY, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion to Exclude the Expert Report of William S. Howard)(Warnecke, Andrew) (Entered: 08/29/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 190 Filed: 8/29/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting Parties' 187 Joint Motion to extend time to complete discovery and discovery relating to damages (see Order). Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 8/29/2011. (SWM) (Entered: 08/29/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 189 Filed: 8/25/2011, Entered: None
BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support re 188 MOTION to Consolidate Cases, filed by Plaintiff REMY, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, part 1, Complaint & Ex. A in 11-cv-991, # 2 Exhibit 1, part 2, Ex. B-G to Complaint in 11-991, # 3 Exhibit 2, Subpoena to Odawara, # 4 Exhibit 3, Subpoena to Eagle)(Yeager, Joseph) (Entered: 08/25/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 188 Filed: 8/25/2011, Entered: None
MOTION to Consolidate Cases, filed by Plaintiff REMY, INC.. (Yeager, Joseph) (Entered: 08/25/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 187 Filed: 8/25/2011, Entered: None
MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (Stipulated) to Complete Discovery and Discovery Relating to Damages, filed by Defendant TECNOMATIC S.P.A.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order on Stipulation and Joint Motion to Extend Time to Complete Discovery and Discovery Relating to Damages)(Zecchini, Paula) Modified on 8/26/2011 (PGS). (Entered: 08/25/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 186 Filed: 8/5/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
Minute Entry for 8/3/2011, for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore: This matter came before the Court for a hearing on Defendant Tecnomatic S.P.A.'s Motion to Compel Access to Equipment by Tecnomatic S.P.A.'s Expert (Dkt. 179). The Court, having reviewed the parties briefs and submissions and having heard the arguments of counsel, takes this matter under advisement. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore.(SWM) (Entered: 08/05/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 185 Filed: 8/2/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER GRANTING 183 Motion to Appear pro hac vice. Attorney Andrew C. Warnecke for TECNOMATIC S.P.A. added. Signed by Judge Sarah Evans Barker on 8/2/2011. (CKM) (Entered: 08/03/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 184 Filed: 8/1/2011, Entered: None
REPLY in Support of Motion re 179 MOTION to Compel Access to Equipment by All Tecnomatic S.p.A. Experts, filed by Defendant TECNOMATIC S.P.A.. (Zecchini, Paula) (Entered: 08/01/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 183 Filed: 8/1/2011, Entered: None
MOTION for Attorney(s) Andrew C. Warnecke to Appear pro hac vice. Filing fee $ 30, receipt number 0756-2053959., filed by Counter Claimant TECNOMATIC S.P.A., Defendant TECNOMATIC S.P.A.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Order)(Cole, Donald) (Entered: 08/01/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 182 Filed: 7/28/2011, Entered: None
RESPONSE in Opposition re 179 MOTION to Compel Access to Equipment by All Tecnomatic S.p.A. Experts, filed by Plaintiff REMY, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Excerpts from Deposition of Maurilio Micucci, # 2 Exhibit B - Declaration of Mark Stephenson, # 3 Exhibit C - Article, # 4 Exhibit D - World news article, # 5 Exhibit E - Defendant Tecnomatic's Expert Disclosures, # 6 Exhibit F - Declaration of William Stamps Howard)(Hurley, Ryan) (Entered: 07/28/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 181 Filed: 7/21/2011, Entered: None
NOTICE of Errata, filed by Counter Claimant TECNOMATIC S.P.A., Defendant TECNOMATIC S.P.A., re 180 Brief/Memorandum in Support of Motion, 179 MOTION to Compel Access to Equipment by All Tecnomatic S.p.A. Experts. (Zecchini, Paula) (Entered: 07/21/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 180 Filed: 7/18/2011, Entered: None
BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support re 179 MOTION to Compel Access to Equipment by All Tecnomatic S.p.A. Experts, filed by Defendant TECNOMATIC S.P.A.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit B - Howard Expert Report, # 2 Exhibit Group Ex. C - Email exchange between parties' counsel, # 3 Exhibit Group Ex.D - Email exchange between parties' counsel)(Zecchini, Paula) (Entered: 07/18/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 179 Filed: 7/18/2011, Entered: None
MOTION to Compel Access to Equipment by All Tecnomatic S.p.A. Experts, filed by Defendant TECNOMATIC S.P.A.. (Zecchini, Paula) (Entered: 07/18/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 178 Filed: 7/12/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore: Telephonic Status Conference held on 7/11/2011. The parties discussed a dispute over the conduct of an inspection of equipment at issue in this matter and Plaintiff's designation of the equipment as "Highly Confidential" under the Protective Order. This matter is set for a hearing on Plaintiff's designation of "Highly Confidential" under the Protective Order on Wednesday, August 3, 2011 at 1:45 p.m. in Room 246, United States Courthouse, 46 East Ohio Street, Indianapolis, Indiana, before Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore. In addition, the Court hereby modifies the expert discoveryschedule (see Entry for established deadlines and other information). Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore.(SWM) (Entered: 07/13/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 176 Filed: 7/8/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
SCHEDULING ORDER - This matter is set for a telephone status conference on Monday, July 11, 2011 at 1:00 p.m. The purpose of this conference is to discuss an issue with the inspection of the Mexico facility. Counsel shall attend the conference by calling the phone number to be provided by the court in an email. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 7/8/2011.(JD) (Entered: 07/08/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 175 Filed: 6/7/2011, Entered: None
Witness List, filed by Counter Claimant TECNOMATIC S.P.A., Defendant TECNOMATIC S.P.A.. (Zecchini, Paula) (Entered: 06/07/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 174 Filed: 6/7/2011, Entered: None
Exhibit List, filed by Counter Claimant TECNOMATIC S.P.A., Defendant TECNOMATIC S.P.A.. (Zecchini, Paula) (Entered: 06/07/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 173 Filed: 6/6/2011, Entered: None
Exhibit List, filed by Plaintiff REMY, INC., Counter Defendant REMY, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A -- List of documents produced by Tecnomatic, # 2 Exhibit B -- List of documents produced by Remy)(Hurley, Ryan) (Entered: 06/06/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 172 Filed: 6/6/2011, Entered: None
Witness List, filed by Plaintiff REMY, INC., Counter Defendant REMY, INC.. (Hurley, Ryan) (Entered: 06/06/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 171 Filed: 5/25/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore: Telephonic Status Conference held on 5/25/2011. This matter came before the Court for a telephonic conference regarding a dispute as to whether Defendant Tecnomatic S.P.A. should be allowed to conduct an additional inspection of the equipment at issue in this case, and the replacement equipment claimed by Plaintiff as damages in this case (see Entry for details). Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore.(SWM) (Entered: 05/25/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 170 Filed: 5/25/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
MARGINAL ENTRY denying as moot Defendant's 166 Motion for Leave to File motion for partial S/J. DENIED AS MOOT in light of the Court's Order Denying Defendant's Motion for Partial Summary Judgement [Dkt. 167]. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 5/25/2011. (SWM) (Entered: 05/25/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 169 Filed: 5/25/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore: Telephonic Status Conference held on 5/18/2011. The parties report that final case preparations are underway and they anticipate no issues with the schedule. The parties further discussed a site inspection in Mexico. The parties report they are ready to proceed with the settlement conference currently scheduled for September 1, 2011. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore.(SWM) (Entered: 05/25/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 168 Filed: 5/25/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
SCHEDULING ENTRY: Status Conference set for 5/25/2011 10:30 AM in Telephonic before Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore. The purpose of this conference is to discuss an issue with the site inspection. Counsel shall attend the conference by calling the phone number to be provided by the court in an email. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 5/25/2011.(SWM) (Entered: 05/25/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 167 Filed: 5/20/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER denying Defendant's 98 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment (S.O.). Signed by Judge Sarah Evans Barker on 5/20/2011. (MAC) (Entered: 05/23/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 166 Filed: 5/18/2011, Entered: None
MOTION for Leave to File Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, filed by Defendant TECNOMATIC S.P.A.. (Zecchini, Paula) (Entered: 05/18/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 165 Filed: 5/18/2011, Entered: None
MOTION for Summary Judgment Partial, filed by Defendant TECNOMATIC S.P.A.. (Zecchini, Paula) (Entered: 05/18/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 164 Filed: 5/16/2011, Entered: None
Surreply re 98 MOTION for Summary Judgment, filed by Plaintiff REMY, INC.. (Hurley, Ryan) (Entered: 05/16/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 162 Filed: 5/9/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
SCHEDULING ENTRY: Settlement Conference set for 9/1/2011 09:00 AM in room #257, United States Courthouse, 46 E. Ohio Street, Indianapolis, Indiana before Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore. On or before five (5) business days before the settlement conference, the parties shall submit (not file) a confidential settlement statement (see Entry for additional information). Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 5/9/2011.(SWM) (Entered: 05/09/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 161 Filed: 5/7/2011, Entered: None
Appendix of Exhibits in Support of Reply in Support of Motion re 98 MOTION for Summary Judgment Partial, filed by Counter Claimant TECNOMATIC S.P.A., Defendant TECNOMATIC S.P.A.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit CC (Deposition Exhibit - Pt. 4))(Zecchini, Paula) (Entered: 05/07/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 160 Filed: 5/7/2011, Entered: None
Appendix of Exhibits in Support of Reply in Support of Motion re 98 MOTION for Summary Judgment Partial, filed by Counter Claimant TECNOMATIC S.P.A., Defendant TECNOMATIC S.P.A.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit CC (Deposition Exhibit Pt. 3))(Zecchini, Paula) (Entered: 05/07/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 159 Filed: 5/7/2011, Entered: None
Appendix of Exhibits in Support of Reply in Support of Motion re 98 MOTION for Summary Judgment Partial, filed by Counter Claimant TECNOMATIC S.P.A., Defendant TECNOMATIC S.P.A.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit CC (Deposition Exhibit - Pt. 2))(Zecchini, Paula) (Entered: 05/07/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 158 Filed: 5/7/2011, Entered: None
Appendix of Exhibits in Support of Reply in Support of Motion re 98 MOTION for Summary Judgment Partial, filed by Counter Claimant TECNOMATIC S.P.A., Defendant TECNOMATIC S.P.A.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit CC (Deposition Exhibit Pt. 1))(Zecchini, Paula) (Entered: 05/07/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 157 Filed: 5/7/2011, Entered: None
Appendix of Exhibits in Support of Reply in Support of Motion re 98 MOTION for Summary Judgment Partial, filed by Counter Claimant TECNOMATIC S.P.A., Defendant TECNOMATIC S.P.A.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit BB (Deposition Exhibit - 63))(Zecchini, Paula) (Entered: 05/07/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 156 Filed: 5/7/2011, Entered: None
Appendix of Exhibits in Support of Reply in Support of Motion re 98 MOTION for Summary Judgment Partial, filed by Counter Claimant TECNOMATIC S.P.A., Defendant TECNOMATIC S.P.A.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit BB (Deposition Exhibit - 3M))(Zecchini, Paula) (Entered: 05/07/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 155 Filed: 5/6/2011, Entered: None
Tecnomatic's ANSWER to 120 Amended Complaint, COUNTERCLAIM against REMY, INC., filed by TECNOMATIC S.P.A..(Zecchini, Paula) (Entered: 05/07/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 154 Filed: 5/6/2011, Entered: None
Appendix of Exhibits in Support of Reply in Support of Motion re 98 MOTION for Summary Judgment Partial, filed by Counter Claimant TECNOMATIC S.P.A., Defendant TECNOMATIC S.P.A.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit BB (Deposition Exhibit - 3L))(Zecchini, Paula) (Entered: 05/06/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 153 Filed: 5/6/2011, Entered: None
Appendix of Exhibits in Support of Reply in Support of Motion re 98 MOTION for Summary Judgment Partial, filed by Counter Claimant TECNOMATIC S.P.A., Defendant TECNOMATIC S.P.A.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit BB (Deposition Exhibit - 3K))(Zecchini, Paula) (Entered: 05/06/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 152 Filed: 5/6/2011, Entered: None
Appendix of Exhibits in Support of Reply in Support of Motion re 98 MOTION for Summary Judgment Partial, filed by Counter Claimant TECNOMATIC S.P.A., Defendant TECNOMATIC S.P.A.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit BB (Deposition Exhibit - 3J))(Zecchini, Paula) (Entered: 05/06/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 151 Filed: 5/6/2011, Entered: None
Appendix of Exhibits in Support of Reply in Support of Motion re 98 MOTION for Summary Judgment Partial, filed by Counter Claimant TECNOMATIC S.P.A., Defendant TECNOMATIC S.P.A.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit BB (Deposition Exhibit - 3I))(Zecchini, Paula) (Entered: 05/06/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 150 Filed: 5/6/2011, Entered: None
Appendix of Exhibits in Support of Reply in Support of Motion re 98 MOTION for Summary Judgment Partial, filed by Counter Claimant TECNOMATIC S.P.A., Defendant TECNOMATIC S.P.A.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit BB (Deposition Exhibit - 3H))(Zecchini, Paula) (Entered: 05/06/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 5/6/2011, Entered: None
Appendix of Exhibits in Support of Reply in Support of Motion re 98 MOTION for Summary Judgment Partial, filed by Counter Claimant TECNOMATIC S.P.A., Defendant TECNOMATIC S.P.A.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit BB (Deposition Exhibit - 3G))(Zecchini, Paula) (Entered: 05/06/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 148 Filed: 5/6/2011, Entered: None
Appendix of Exhibits in Support of Reply in Support of Motion re 98 MOTION for Summary Judgment Partial, filed by Counter Claimant TECNOMATIC S.P.A., Defendant TECNOMATIC S.P.A.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit BB (Deposition Exhibit - 3F))(Zecchini, Paula) (Entered: 05/06/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 147 Filed: 5/6/2011, Entered: None
Appendix of Exhibits in Support of Reply in Support of Motion re 98 MOTION for Summary Judgment Partial, filed by Counter Claimant TECNOMATIC S.P.A., Defendant TECNOMATIC S.P.A.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit BB (Deposition Exhibit - 3E))(Zecchini, Paula) (Entered: 05/06/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 146 Filed: 5/6/2011, Entered: None
Appendix of Exhibits in Support of Reply in Support of Motion re 98 MOTION for Summary Judgment Partial, filed by Counter Claimant TECNOMATIC S.P.A., Defendant TECNOMATIC S.P.A.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit BB (Deposition Exhibit 3D))(Zecchini, Paula) (Entered: 05/06/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 5/6/2011, Entered: None
Appendix of Exhibits in Support of Reply in Support of Motion re 98 MOTION for Summary Judgment Partial, filed by Counter Claimant TECNOMATIC S.P.A., Defendant TECNOMATIC S.P.A.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit BB (Deposition Exhibit 3C))(Zecchini, Paula) (Entered: 05/06/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 144 Filed: 5/6/2011, Entered: None
Appendix of Exhibits in Support of Reply in Support of Motion re 98 MOTION for Summary Judgment Partial, filed by Counter Claimant TECNOMATIC S.P.A., Defendant TECNOMATIC S.P.A.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit AA (Deposition Transcript Pt. 4))(Zecchini, Paula) (Entered: 05/06/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 5/6/2011, Entered: None
Appendix of Exhibits in Support of Reply in Support of Motion re 98 MOTION for Summary Judgment Partial, filed by Counter Claimant TECNOMATIC S.P.A., Defendant TECNOMATIC S.P.A.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit AA (Deposition Transcript Pt. 3))(Zecchini, Paula) (Entered: 05/06/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 5/6/2011, Entered: None
Appendix of Exhibits in Support of Reply in Support of Motion re 98 MOTION for Summary Judgment Partial, filed by Counter Claimant TECNOMATIC S.P.A., Defendant TECNOMATIC S.P.A.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit AA (Deposition Transcript-Pt 2))(Zecchini, Paula) (Entered: 05/06/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 5/6/2011, Entered: None
Appendix of Exhibits in Support of Reply in Support of Motion re 98 MOTION for Summary Judgment Partial, filed by Counter Claimant TECNOMATIC S.P.A., Defendant TECNOMATIC S.P.A.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit AA (Deposition Transcript Pt 1))(Zecchini, Paula) (Entered: 05/06/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 5/6/2011, Entered: None
REPLY in Support of Motion re 98 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Partial), filed by Counter Claimant TECNOMATIC S.P.A., Defendant TECNOMATIC S.P.A.. (Zecchini, Paula) (Entered: 05/06/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 5/4/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
MARGINAL ENTRY denying as moot parties' 133 Stipulation and Joint Motion to Extend Time to File and Serve Final Witness and Exhibit List. See Dkt. Number 135. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 5/4/2011. (SWM) (Entered: 05/04/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 5/4/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER ON 134 Stipulation and Joint Motion Regarding Application of Revised Rule 26(b)(4) of the Fed.R.Civ.P. Good cause appearing for the requested relief, the Court orders that the 12/1/10 amendments to Rule 26(b)(4) of the Fed.R.Civ.P. set forth above will apply to this case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 5/4/2011. (SWM) (Entered: 05/04/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 5/2/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
SCHEDULING ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 9/20/2011 02:00 PM in room #210, United States Courthouse, 46 E. Ohio Street, Indianapolis, Indiana before Judge Sarah Evans Barker. Jury Trial set for 10/3/2011 09:30 AM in room #216, United States Courthouse, 46 E. Ohio Street, Indianapolis, Indiana before Judge Sarah Evans Barker. Signed by Judge Sarah Evans Barker on 5/2/2011.(CKM) (Entered: 05/03/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 5/3/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER GRANTING 132 Motion to Appear pro hac vice. Attorney Donald Cole for TECNOMATIC S.P.A. added.(marginal notation) Signed by Judge Sarah Evans Barker on 5/3/2011. (CKM) Modified on 5/3/2011 (CKM). (Entered: 05/03/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 5/2/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
SCHEDULING ORDER: The Final Pretrial Conference scheduled for June 28, 2011 and the Trial scheduled for July 11, 2011 are hereby VACATED. The Court further amends the parties' Third Amended Case Management Plan, as amended (Dkt. 91, 95, 105 & 113) as follows (see Order established deadlines). Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 5/2/2011.(SWM) (Entered: 05/02/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 4/29/2011, Entered: None
STIPULATION and Joint Motion Regarding Application of Revised Rule 26(b)(4) of the Fed'l Rules of Civil Procedure, filed by Defendant TECNOMATIC S.P.A.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Order on Stipulation and Joint Motion Regarding Application of Revised Rule 26(b)(4) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure)(Zecchini, Paula) Modified on 5/2/2011 (PGS). (Entered: 04/29/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 4/28/2011, Entered: None
STIPULATION and Joint Motion to Extend Time to File and Serve Final Witness and Exhibit Lists, filed by Defendant TECNOMATIC S.P.A.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Order on Stipulation and Joint Motion to Extend Time to File and Serve Final Witness and Exhibit Lists)(Zecchini, Paula) Modified on 5/2/2011 (PGS). (Entered: 04/28/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 4/25/2011, Entered: None
MOTION for Attorney(s) Donald A. Cole to Appear pro hac vice., filed by Defendant TECNOMATIC S.P.A. (CKM) (Entered: 04/26/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 4/25/2011, Entered: None
RECEIPT #IP023728 in the amount of $ 30.00 For Pro Hac Fees by Bryan Cave LLP. (CKM) (Entered: 04/26/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 4/25/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 129 Motion to extend time to File Reply in Support of Motion for Partial Summary Judgment and Amended Answer and Counterclaim. Tecnomatic's current April 21, 2011 deadlines to file (1) a reply in support of its currently pending motion for partial summary judgment and (2) an answer to Remy's Amended Complaint, is hereby extended by fifteen (15) days to May 6, 2011. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 4/25/2011. (TMA) (Entered: 04/25/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 4/20/2011, Entered: None
Unopposed MOTION and Stipulation to Extend Time to File Reply in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment and Answer to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint, filed by Counter Claimant TECNOMATIC S.P.A., Defendant TECNOMATIC S.P.A.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Zecchini, Paula) (Entered: 04/20/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 4/20/2011, Entered: None
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by TECNOMATIC S.P.A. re 126 Reply in Support of Motion to Continue Trial and Related Deadlines (Zecchini, Paula) (Entered: 04/20/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 4/19/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting pltf's 119 Motion for Extension of Time to submit the name, address, and vita for all expert witnesses, along with the report required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a) (2) (B) to 4/1/2011. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 4/19/2011. (SWM) (Entered: 04/19/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 4/18/2011, Entered: None
REPLY in Support of Motion re 124 Unopposed MOTION for Continuance of Trial Date and all Pretrial and Trial Deadlines, filed by Defendant TECNOMATIC S.P.A.. (Zecchini, Paula) (Entered: 04/18/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 4/15/2011, Entered: None
RESPONSE in Opposition re 124 Unopposed MOTION for Continuance of Trial Date and all Pretrial and Trial Deadlines, filed by Plaintiff REMY, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Letter to Joseph Yeager dated July 22, 2009, # 2 Exhibit B - Email from Allyson Wilcox dated April 8, 2009 attaching draft request for inspection)(Hurley, Ryan) (Entered: 04/15/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 4/12/2011, Entered: None
Unopposed MOTION for Continuance of Trial Date and all Pretrial and Trial Deadlines, filed by Counter Claimant TECNOMATIC S.P.A., Defendant TECNOMATIC S.P.A.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Affidavit in Support of Motion to Continue, # 2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order on Motion to Continue)(Zecchini, Paula) (Entered: 04/12/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 4/11/2011, Entered: None
ANSWER to the Amended Counterclaims of Tecnomatic, S.P.A., filed by Plaintiff REMY, INC., Counter Defendant REMY, INC.. (Hurley, Ryan) (Entered: 04/11/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 4/8/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore: Settlement Conference held on 4/4/2011. Settlement was not achieved. Status Conference set for 5/18/2011 02:30 PM in Telephonic before Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore. The purpose of this conference is to discuss case status. Counsel shall attend the status conference by calling the designated phone number, to be provided by the court via email. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore.(SWM) (Entered: 04/11/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 4/7/2011, Entered: None
RESPONSE in Opposition re 98 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Partial), filed by Plaintiff REMY, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Letter to Ryan Hurley dated February 12, 2009)(Hurley, Ryan) (Entered: 04/07/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 4/4/2011, Entered: None
AMENDED COMPLAINT (FIRST) against TECNOMATIC S.P.A., filed by REMY, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Tecnomatic Quote dated May 25, 2005, # 2 Exhibit B - Tecnomatic Quote dated September 25, 2005, # 3 Exhibit C - Purchase Order 1283903, # 4 Exhibit D - Purchase Order 1283910, # 5 Exhibit Purchase Order 1283911, # 6 Exhibit F - Purchase Order 1283912, # 7 Exhibit G - Purchase Order 1283913, # 8 Exhibit H - Purchase Order 1283954, # 9 Exhibit I - Purchase Order 1283907, # 10 Exhibit J - Purchase Order 1292471, # 11 Exhibit K - Purchase Order 1292855, # 12 Exhibit L - Purchase Order 1292856, # 13 Exhibit M - Purchase Order 1292460, # 14 Exhibit N - Purchase Order 1301411)(Hurley, Ryan) (Entered: 04/04/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 3/30/2011, Entered: None
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to April 1, 2011 to Submit Expert Reports, filed by Plaintiff REMY, INC., Counter Defendant REMY, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion for Extension of Time to Submit Expert Reports)(Hurley, Ryan) (Entered: 03/30/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 3/24/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore: Telephone Status Conference held on 3/23/2011. Pending motions were addressed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore.(SWM) (Entered: 03/25/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 3/23/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting Pltf's 108 Motion for Leave to File a First Amended Complaint. Pltf is granted ten days from the date of this order to file its First Amended Complaint consistent with Local Rule 5.6 and 5.10 and Section 13 of CM/ECF Policies and Procedures. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 3/23/2011. (SWM) (Entered: 03/25/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 3/23/2011, Entered: None
AMENDED ANSWER, AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES AND COUNTERCLAIMS to Complaint, filed by Defendant TECNOMATIC S.P.A.. (SWM) (Entered: 03/24/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 3/23/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting deft's 102 Motion for Leave to File amended answer and counterclaims. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 3/23/2011. (SWM) (Entered: 03/24/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 3/23/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting pltf's 110 Motion for Extension of Time to respond to deft's first set of damages interrogatories to 4/1/2011. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 3/23/2011. (SWM) (Entered: 03/24/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 3/23/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER entered re 111 Motion (Further sipulation to extend fact discovery completion: The deadline to complete fact discovery relating to liability shall be extended to 4/11/2011. The above-ordered extension is w/o prejudice to either party's ability to seek a further extension of time to complete such discovery, as may be warranted by circumstances beyond control of either party, or their respective counsel of record. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 3/23/2011. (SWM) (Entered: 03/24/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 3/23/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting Pltf's 109 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to 4/7/2011 re 98 MOTION for Summary Judgment. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 3/23/2011. (SWM) (Entered: 03/24/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 3/21/2011, Entered: None
STIPULATION to Extend Time to Complete Fact Discovery, filed by Defendant TECNOMATIC S.P.A.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Re; Further Stipulation to Extend Fact Discovery Completion)(Zecchini, Paula) Modified on 3/22/2011 (PGS). (Entered: 03/21/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 3/21/2011, Entered: None
First MOTION for Extension of Time to April 4, 2011 to Respond to Tecnomatic's Damages Interrogatories, filed by Plaintiff REMY, INC., Counter Defendant REMY, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A -- Damages Interrogatories, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Hurley, Ryan) (Entered: 03/21/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 3/17/2011, Entered: None
MOTION for Extension of Time to April 7, 2011 to file response to 98 MOTION for Summary Judgment, filed by Plaintiff REMY, INC., Counter Defendant REMY, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Plaintiff Remy Inc.'s Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Tecnomatic's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment)(Hurley, Ryan) (Entered: 03/17/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 3/8/2011, Entered: None
MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint, filed by Plaintiff REMY, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Proposed Amended Complaint, # 2 Exhibit A - Exhibit A to Proposed Amended Complaint, # 3 Exhibit B - Exhibit B to Proposed Amended Complaint, # 4 Exhibit C - Exhibit C to Proposed Amended Complaint, # 5 Exhibit D - Exhibit D to Proposed Amended Complaint, # 6 Exhibit E - Exhibit E to Proposed Amended Complaint, # 7 Exhibit F - Exhibit F to Proposed Amended Complaint, # 8 Exhibit G - Exhibit G to Proposed Amended Complaint, # 9 Exhibit H - Exhibit H to Proposed Amended Complaint, # 10 Exhibit I - Exhibit I to Proposed Amended Complaint, # 11 Exhibit J - Exhibit J to Proposed Amended Complaint, # 12 Exhibit K - Exhibit K to Proposed Amended Complaint, # 13 Exhibit L - Exhibit L to Proposed Amended Complaint, # 14 Exhibit M - Exhibit M to Proposed Amended Complaint, # 15 Exhibit N - Exhibit N to Proposed Amended Complaint, # 16 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Hurley, Ryan) (Entered: 03/08/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 3/8/2011, Entered: None
RESPONSE to Motion re 102 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Answer and Counterclaims, 98 MOTION for Summary Judgment, filed by Plaintiff REMY, INC.. (Hurley, Ryan) (Entered: 03/08/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 3/4/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore: Telephonic Status Conference held on 3/3/2011. Settlement Conference set for 4/4/2011 08:30 AM in room #257, United States Courthouse, 46 E. Ohio Street, Indianapolis, Indiana before Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore. On or before three (3) business days before the settlement conference, the parties shall submit (not file) a confidential settlement statement (see Entry for additional details). Status Conference set for 3/23/2011 04:00 PM in Telephonic before Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore to address the replevin claims. Counsel shall attend the status conference by calling the designated phone number, to be provided by the court via emai. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore.(SWM) (Entered: 03/07/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 3/1/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 104 STIPULATION to Extend Time to Complete Fact Discovery - The deadline to complete fact discovery relating to liability shall be extended to March 21, 2011. All other aspects of the parties' approved Case Management Plan remain in full force and effect. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 3/1/2011. (JD) (Entered: 03/01/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 2/25/2011, Entered: None
STIPULATION to Extend Time to Complete Fact Discovery, filed by Defendant TECNOMATIC S.P.A.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Re: Stipulation to Extend Fact Discovery Completion)(Zecchini, Paula) Modified on 2/28/2011 (PGS). (Entered: 02/25/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 2/14/2011, Entered: None
BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support re 102 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Answer and Counterclaims, filed by Counter Claimant TECNOMATIC S.P.A., Defendant TECNOMATIC S.P.A.. (McKey, S.) (Entered: 02/14/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 2/14/2011, Entered: None
MOTION for Leave to File Amended Answer and Counterclaims, filed by Counter Claimant TECNOMATIC S.P.A., Defendant TECNOMATIC S.P.A.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Proposed First Amended Counterclaims)(McKey, S.) (Entered: 02/14/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 2/14/2011, Entered: None
Statement of Material Facts re 98 MOTION for Summary Judgment, filed by Counter Claimant TECNOMATIC S.P.A., Defendant TECNOMATIC S.P.A.. (McKey, S.) (Entered: 02/14/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 2/14/2011, Entered: None
EXHIBIT in Support of Motion re 98 MOTION for Summary Judgment, filed by Counter Claimant TECNOMATIC S.P.A., Defendant TECNOMATIC S.P.A.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit L - Capital Lease Agreement, # 2 Exhibit M - Invoices, # 3 Exhibit N (part 1) - Wire transfer receipts, # 4 Exhibit N (part 2) - Wire transfer receipts, # 5 Exhibit O - Correspondence)(McKey, S.) (Entered: 02/14/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 2/14/2011, Entered: None
BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support re 98 MOTION for Summary Judgment, filed by Counter Claimant TECNOMATIC S.P.A., Defendant TECNOMATIC S.P.A.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Purchase Order, # 2 Exhibit B - Purchase Order, # 3 Exhibit C - Purchase Order, # 4 Exhibit D - Purchase Order, # 5 Exhibit E - Purchase Order, # 6 Exhibit F - Purchase Order, # 7 Exhibit G - Purchase Order, # 8 Exhibit H - Purchase Order, # 9 Exhibit I - Purchase Order, # 10 Exhibit J - Purchase Order, # 11 Exhibit K - Purchase Order)(McKey, S.) (Entered: 02/14/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 2/14/2011, Entered: None
MOTION for Summary Judgment, filed by Counter Claimant TECNOMATIC S.P.A., Defendant TECNOMATIC S.P.A.. (McKey, S.) (Entered: 02/14/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 12/29/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
SCHEDULING ENTRY - The telephone status conference currently scheduled in this matter on Monday, March 7, 2011 is VACATED. Due to the reassignment of this case to Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore, the date, time, and call-in number for the conference must be changed. The telephone status conference in this matter is RESET for Thursday, March 3, 2011, at 9:30 a.m. Counsel shall participate in the conference by calling the designated phone number, to be provided by the court via email. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 12/29/2010.(JD) (Entered: 12/29/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 12/18/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
Reassignment of Case to Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore. Magistrate Judge William G. Hussmann, Jr no longer assigned to the case. Please include the new case number (1:08-cv-1227-SEB-MJD), which includes the initials of the newly assigned judge, on all future filings in this matter. (JD) (Entered: 12/18/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 11/18/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER: CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN APPROVED AS SUBMITTED. Dispositive Motions due by 2/1/2011. Jury Trial (5 days) set for 7/11/2011 09:30 AM in room #216, United States Courthouse, 46 E. Ohio Street, Indianapolis, Indiana before Judge Sarah Evans Barker. Status Conference set for 3/7/2011 12:00 PM Telephonic (PLEASE NOTE BRIDGE LINE) before Magistrate Judge William G. Hussmann, Jr. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Hussmann, Jr., on 11/18/2010.(NRN) (Entered: 11/18/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 11/16/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 92 Motion to Appear pro hac vice. Attorney Kara E. F. Cenar for TECNOMATIC S.P.A. added. Signed by Judge Sarah Evans Barker on 11/16/2010. (CKM) (Entered: 11/16/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 11/9/2010, Entered: None
RECEIPT #IP021090 in the amount of $ 30.00. For Pro Hace Fees by Kara E. F. Cenar. (CKM) (Entered: 11/16/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 11/8/2010, Entered: None
MOTION for Attorney(s) Kara E. F. Cenar to Appear pro hac vice., filed by Defendant TECNOMATIC S.P.A.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-Verified Petition of Kara E. F. Cenar to Appear Pro Hac Vice, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Weathers, Scott) (Entered: 11/08/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 10/29/2010, Entered: None
CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN TENDERED, filed by Plaintiff REMY, INC., Counter Defendant REMY, INC., Counter Claimant TECNOMATIC S.P.A., Defendant TECNOMATIC S.P.A. (Third Amended). (Hurley, Ryan) (Entered: 10/29/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 10/22/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge William G. Hussmann, Jr: Scheduling Conference held on 10/14/2010. The parties are directed to file a proposed amended case management plan by not later than October 29, 2010. See entry for other orders entered. (NRN) (Entered: 10/22/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 10/18/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER denying 74 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings. For the reasons stated herein, Defendants Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings [Docket No. 74] DENIED. (S.O.). Signed by Judge Sarah Evans Barker on 10/18/2010. (CKM) (Entered: 10/19/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 10/14/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
SCHEDULING ORDER: the parties advise the Magistrate Judge that this case is not yet ready for Trial. The 10/19/2010 Final Pretrial Conference and the 11/1/2010 Trial Dates are Vacated. Final Pretrial Conference reset for 6/28/2011 02:00 PM in room #210, United States Courthouse, 46 E. Ohio Street, Indianapolis, Indiana before Judge Sarah Evans Barker. Jury Trial reset for 7/11/2011 09:30 AM in room #216, United States Courthouse, 46 E. Ohio Street, Indianapolis, Indiana before Judge Sarah Evans Barker. Signed by Judge Sarah Evans Barker on 10/14/2010.(MAC) (Entered: 10/18/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 9/24/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge William G. Hussmann, Jr.: Status Conference held on 9/23/2010. Scheduling Conference set for 10/14/2010 03:00 PM Telephonic before Magistrate Judge William G. Hussmann, Jr. (NRN) (Entered: 09/24/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 9/2/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 85 Motion to suspend Case Managment Deadlines pending status conference set for 9/23/2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Hussmann, Jr., on 9/2/2010. (NRN) (Entered: 09/02/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 8/31/2010, Entered: None
Unopposed MOTION to Suspend Case Management Deadlines, filed by Plaintiff REMY, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Order Granting Unopposed Motion to Suspend Case Management Deadlines)(Hurley, Ryan) (Entered: 08/31/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 8/24/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 83 Motion to Modify Case Management Plan Deadlines. See order for specifics. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Hussmann, Jr., on 8/24/2010. (NRN) (Entered: 08/24/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 8/3/2010, Entered: None
MOTION to Modify Case Management Deadlines, filed by Plaintiff REMY, INC., Counter Defendant REMY, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hurley, Ryan) (Entered: 08/03/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 6/22/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER: CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN APPROVED AS SUBMITTED. Status Conference set for 9/23/2010 01:00 PM Telephonic before Magistrate Judge William G. Hussmann, Jr. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Hussmann, Jr., on 6/22/2010.(NRN) (Entered: 06/22/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 6/16/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
Reassignment of Case to Magistrate Judge William G. Hussmann, Jr. Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson no longer assigned to the case. Please include the new case number (1:08-cv-1227-SEB-WGH), which includes the initials of the newly assigned judge, on all future filings in this matter. (DH) (Entered: 06/16/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 6/14/2010, Entered: None
CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN TENDERED, filed by Plaintiff REMY, INC., Counter Defendant REMY, INC., Counter Claimant TECNOMATIC S.P.A., Defendant TECNOMATIC S.P.A.. (Hurley, Ryan) (Entered: 06/14/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 6/9/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson: Settlement Conference held on 6/9/2010. Parties appear in person and by counsel. Conference held and adjourned for further negotiations. Parties to submit revised case management plan by June 14, 2010. (SWM) (Entered: 06/10/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 6/7/2010, Entered: None
RESPONSE in Opposition re 74 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings, filed by Plaintiff REMY, INC.. (Hurley, Ryan) (Entered: 06/07/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 5/25/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 66 Motion to Modify Case Management Plan. See Order regarding the new case management deadlines. Signed by Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson on 5/25/2010. (LBK) (Entered: 05/25/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 5/24/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 73 Motion to Withdraw 69 Brief/Memorandum in Support of Motion. Signed by Judge Sarah Evans Barker on 5/24/2010. (MAC) (Entered: 05/24/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 5/21/2010, Entered: None
BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support re 74 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings, filed by Defendant TECNOMATIC S.P.A.. (Seale, Mariangela) (Entered: 05/21/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 5/21/2010, Entered: None
MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings, filed by Defendant TECNOMATIC S.P.A.. (Seale, Mariangela) (Entered: 05/21/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 5/21/2010, Entered: None
MOTION to Withdraw Document Number 69, filed by Defendant TECNOMATIC S.P.A.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Seale, Mariangela) (Entered: 05/21/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 5/20/2010, Entered: None
REPLY in Support of Motion re 66 MOTION to Modify Case Management Plan, filed by Plaintiff REMY, INC., Counter Defendant REMY, INC.. (Hurley, Ryan) (Entered: 05/20/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 5/17/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER regarding electronic filing errors re 68 Brief/Memorandum in Support of Motion filed by TECNOMATIC S.P.A., 67 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by TECNOMATIC S.P.A. Both filings are stricken pursuant to Local Rule 1.3. However, Defendant is granted leave through and including May 21, 2010, to re-file its documents correctly (S.O.). Signed by Judge Sarah Evans Barker on 5/17/2010.(MAC) (Entered: 05/18/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 5/18/2010, Entered: None
RESPONSE in Opposition re 66 MOTION to Modify Case Management Plan, filed by Defendant TECNOMATIC S.P.A.. (Seale, Mariangela) (Entered: 05/18/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 5/13/2010, Entered: None
**WITHDRAWN PER 76 **BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support re 67 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings Corrected, filed by Defendant TECNOMATIC S.P.A.. (Seale, Mariangela) Modified on 5/24/2010 (MAC). (Entered: 05/13/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 5/12/2010, Entered: None
**ORDERED STRICKEN PER 71 **BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support re 67 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings, filed by Defendant TECNOMATIC S.P.A.. (Seale, Mariangela) Modified on 5/18/2010 (MAC). (Entered: 05/12/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 5/12/2010, Entered: None
**ORDERED STRICKEN PER 71 ** MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings, filed by Defendant TECNOMATIC S.P.A.. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix of Foreign Authorities)(Seale, Mariangela) Modified on 5/18/2010 (MAC). (Entered: 05/12/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 5/11/2010, Entered: None
MOTION to Modify Case Management Plan, filed by Plaintiff REMY, INC., Counter Defendant REMY, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A -- Letter from Ryan M. Hurley to S. Patrick McKey dated January 26, 2010, # 2 Exhibit B -- Email from Ryan M. Hurley to S. Patrick McKey dated March 9, 2010, # 3 Exhibit C -- Letter from Ryan M. Hurley to S. Patrick McKey dated April 30, 2010, # 4 Exhibit D -- Email from Ryan M. Hurley to S. Patrick McKey dated March 9, 2010, # 5 Exhibit E -- Letter from Ryan M. Hurley to S. Patrick McKey dated March 22, 2010, # 6 Exhibit F -- Letter from S. Patrick McKey to Ryan M. Hurley dated March 22, 2010, # 7 Text of Proposed Order)(Hurley, Ryan) (Entered: 05/11/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 4/19/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
ENTRY REGARDING POSTPONED AND RESCHEDULED SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE: On Monday, April 19, 2010, the Magistrate Judge convened a settlement conference. Plaintiff appeared in person and by counsel, and Defendant appeared by counsel. Because of an unexpected and unavoidable flight cancellation, Tecnomatic's representative could not appear. By agreement of the parties, the settlement conference is RESET for a full day conference June 9, 2010, at 9:00 A.M. in Room 361, United States Courthouse, 46 E. Ohio Street, Indianapolis, Indiana.The parties shall provide updated confidential settlement statements, substantively compliant with the Court's Order of October 8, 2009 [dkt. 52], by June 4, 2010. Signed by Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson on 4/19/2010.(SWM) (Entered: 04/19/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 4/12/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 60 Motion to Appear pro hac vice. Attorney Paula L Zecchini for TECNOMATIC S.P.A.,Paula L Zecchini for TECNOMATIC S.P.A. added cm. Signed by Judge Sarah Evans Barker on 4/12/2010. (MAC) (Entered: 04/13/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 4/12/2010, Entered: None
RECEIPT #IP017592 in the amount of $ 30.00 for Pro Hac Fee - Zecchini (MAC) (Entered: 04/12/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 4/9/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 59 Motion to Appear pro hac vice. Attorney Mariangela M. Seale for TECNOMATIC S.P.A.,Mariangela M. Seale for TECNOMATIC S.P.A. added cm. Signed by Judge Sarah Evans Barker on 4/9/2010. (MAC) (Entered: 04/09/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 4/8/2010, Entered: None
RECEIPT #IP017571 in the amount of $ 30.00 for Pro Hac Fee - Seale (MAC) (Entered: 04/09/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 4/8/2010, Entered: None
MOTION for Attorney(s) Paula L. Zecchini to Appear pro hac vice., filed by Defendant TECNOMATIC S.P.A.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-Verified Petition of Paula L. Zecchini to Appear Pro Hac Vice, # 2 Text of Proposed Order Granting Paula L. Zecchini leave to appear pro hac vice)(Weathers, Scott) (Entered: 04/08/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 4/7/2010, Entered: None
MOTION for Attorney(s) Mariangela M. Seale to Appear pro hac vice., filed by Defendant TECNOMATIC S.P.A.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-Verified Petition of Mariangela M. Seale to Appear Pro Hac Vice, # 2 Text of Proposed Order Granting Mariangela M. Seal leave to appear pro hac vice)(Weathers, Scott) (Entered: 04/07/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 1/25/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
SCHEDULING ENTRY: The settlement conference set for January 25, 2010 is VACATED AND RESET for April 19, 2010, at 9:00 A.M. in Room 361, United States Courthouse, 46 E. Ohio Street, Indianapolis, Indiana. Deadlines established in the Order Setting Settlement Conference and Related Deadlines [dkt.52] remain in effect. Issued by Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson on 1/25/2010.(SWM) (Entered: 01/25/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 12/8/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
SCHEDULING ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference reset for 10/19/2010 02:00 PM in room #210 before Judge Sarah Evans Barker., Jury Trial reset for 11/1/2010 09:30 AM in room #216 before Judge Sarah Evans Barker. Signed by Judge Sarah Evans Barker on 12/8/2009.(MAC) (Entered: 12/08/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 12/4/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER: CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN APPROVED AS AMENDED (Amended CMP). Dispositive Motions due by 5/12/2010. Counsel and the parties are reminded that they are required to conduct a conference under LR 37.1 in the event of a discovery dispute. If the conference is unsuccessful, and the dispute does not involve a claim of privilege, the parties are advised to request a phone status conference prior to filing any motion to compel or for protective order. Additionally, the parties are advised to not only number but to add a descriptive identifier for any exhibits which are electronically filed (see Order for example and other details). Signed by Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson on 12/4/2009.(SWM) (Entered: 12/04/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 12/2/2009, Entered: None
MOTION for Continuance of Trial Setting and to Modify the Case Management Plan, filed by Plaintiff REMY, INC., Counter Defendant REMY, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hurley, Ryan) (Entered: 12/02/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 11/20/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting deft's 53 Motion for Continuance of Settlement Conference currently set for 11/24/2009. Settlement Conference RESET for 1/25/2010 09:00 AM in room #361 before Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson. Signed by Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson on 11/20/2009. (SWM) (Entered: 11/20/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 11/19/2009, Entered: None
MOTION for Continuance of Settlement Conference, filed by Defendant TECNOMATIC S.P.A.. (Weathers, Scott) (Entered: 11/19/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 10/8/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER Setting Settlement Conference and Related Deadlines. SCHEDULING ORDER: Settlement Conference set for 11/24/2009 09:00 AM in room #361 before Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson. Confidential settlement statements due three business days prior to the conference (see Order for other details). Signed by Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson on 10/8/09.(SWM) (Entered: 10/09/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 9/17/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
MARGINAL ENTRY re 50 Joint Status Report: Reviewed by magistrate judge. The parties are to jointly call the CRD, Michelle Imel, at 317-229-3672 at their mutual convenience to schedule a settlement conference. Signed by Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson on 9/17/2009.(SWM) (Entered: 09/17/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 9/16/2009, Entered: None
NOTICE of Parties Joint Status Report, filed by Plaintiff REMY, INC., Defendant TECNOMATIC S.P.A., Counter Claimant TECNOMATIC S.P.A., Counter Defendant REMY, INC., re 46 EntryScheduling Order. (Hurley, Ryan) (Entered: 09/16/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 9/9/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 48 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Allyson Leigh Wilcox withdrawn (Marginal Notation). Signed by Judge Sarah Evans Barker on 9/9/2009. (MAC) (Entered: 09/09/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 9/8/2009, Entered: None
MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Allyson Wilcox, filed by Defendant TECNOMATIC S.P.A., Counter Claimant TECNOMATIC S.P.A.. (Wilcox, Allyson) (Entered: 09/08/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 9/3/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson: Telephone Status Conference held on 9/3/2009 and parties ordered to confer with clients about preferred settlement procedure and report to the court by September 17, 2009 whether or not they wish to schedule a court-assisted settlement conference. (SWM) (Entered: 09/04/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 9/2/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
ENTRY FOR SEPTEMBER 2, 2009. The telephonic status conference, TIME ONLY, set for September 3, 2009 is RESET for 2:30 P.M. Counsel shall call the Court at 317-229-3670. Signed by Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson on 9/2/2009.(MRI) (Entered: 09/02/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 8/27/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
REVISED STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER 44 APPROVED. Signed by Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson on 8/27/2009.(SWM) (Entered: 08/27/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 8/25/2009, Entered: None
Joint MOTION for Protective Order, filed by Plaintiff REMY, INC., Defendant TECNOMATIC S.P.A., Counter Claimant TECNOMATIC S.P.A., Counter Defendant REMY, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hurley, Ryan) (Entered: 08/25/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 7/14/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER re 42 Joint Status Report Regarding Site Inspection and Protective Order. Report reviewed by magistrate judge. Case set for telephonic status conference on September 3, 2009 at 2:00 p.m. Counsel to call the court at the number provided. Signed by Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson on 7/14/2009.(SWM) (Entered: 07/14/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 7/10/2009, Entered: None
NOTICE of Joint Status Report Regarding Site Inspection and Protective Order, filed by Plaintiff REMY, INC., Defendant TECNOMATIC S.P.A., Counter Claimant TECNOMATIC S.P.A., Counter Defendant REMY, INC., re 39 Telephone Conference. (Hurley, Ryan) (Entered: 07/10/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 7/8/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER denying w/o prejudice parties' 40 Joint Motion for Protective Order (see Order for details). Signed by Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson on 7/8/2009. (SWM) (Entered: 07/08/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 6/19/2009, Entered: None
Joint MOTION for Protective Order, filed by Plaintiff REMY, INC., Counter Defendant REMY, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hurley, Ryan) (Entered: 06/19/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 6/10/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson: Telephone Status Conference held on 6/10/2009 and parties to prepare a joint status report regarding the site inspection, inspection protocol, and joint protective order by July 11, 2009. Court advises parties of requirements for proper protective order. (SWM) (Entered: 06/11/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 4/27/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson: Telephone Status Conference held on 4/27/2009 and parties working on protocol for site inspection, has yet to happen. Telephone status conference set for June 10, 2009 at 1:00 p.m. to discuss site visit scheduling and impact on settlement. Counsel to call the Court at the number provided. (SWM) (Entered: 04/27/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 4/13/2009, Entered: None
Witness List (preliminary), filed by Defendant TECNOMATIC S.P.A., Counter Claimant TECNOMATIC S.P.A., Exhibit List (preliminary), filed by Defendant TECNOMATIC S.P.A., Counter Claimant TECNOMATIC S.P.A.. (Weathers, Scott) (Entered: 04/13/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 3/12/2009, Entered: None
Witness List /Preliminary Witness and Exhibit Lists, filed by Plaintiff REMY, INC., Counter Defendant REMY, INC.. (Irmscher, David) (Entered: 03/12/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 2/18/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
SCHEDULING ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 7/6/2010 02:00 PM in room #210 before Judge Sarah Evans Barker. Jury Trial set for 7/19/2010 09:30 AM in room #216 before Judge Sarah Evans Barker. Signed by Judge Sarah Evans Barker on 2/18/2009.(MAC) (Entered: 02/18/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 2/13/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 31 Motion to Appear pro hac vice. Attorney Allyson L. Wilcox for TECNOMATIC S.P.A. added cm. Signed by Judge Sarah Evans Barker on 2/13/2009. (MAC) (Entered: 02/13/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 2/12/2009, Entered: None
NOTICE of Service of Initial Disclosures, filed by Plaintiff REMY, INC., Counter Defendant REMY, INC.. (Hurley, Ryan) (Entered: 02/12/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 2/12/2009, Entered: None
NOTICE of Service of Initial Disclosures, filed by Defendant TECNOMATIC S.P.A., Counter Claimant TECNOMATIC S.P.A.. (Weathers, Scott) (Entered: 02/12/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 2/12/2009, Entered: None
MOTION for Attorney(s) Allyson L. Wilcox to Appear pro hac vice. Filing fee $ 30, receipt number 07560000000001355263., filed by Defendant TECNOMATIC S.P.A., Counter Claimant TECNOMATIC S.P.A.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Verified Petition of Allyson L. Wilcox to Appear Pro Hac Vice, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Weathers, Scott) (Entered: 02/12/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 1/28/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 1/28/2009 and CMP approved as amended. SCHEDULING ORDER: Status Conference set for 4/27/2009 10:00 AM in Telephonic before Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson to discuss case status, site visit, and potential scheduling of settlement conference. Counsel to call the court at the number provided. (SWM) (Entered: 01/29/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 1/28/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER: CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN APPROVED AS AMENDED. Dispositive Motions due by 2/12/2010. If the required conference under LR 37.1 does not resolve discovery issues that may arise, the parties are advised to request a phone status conference prior to filing any motion to compel or for protective order. Additionally, the parties are advised to not only number but to add a descriptive identifier for any exhibits which are electronically filed (see Order for example and other instructions). Signed by Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson on 1/28/09.(SWM) (Entered: 01/29/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 1/27/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
ENTRY for 1/27/2009 - Magistrate Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson: The Initial Pretrial Conference set for 1/28/2009 10:30 AM will be converted to a telephonic conference. Counsel to call the Court at the number provided.(SWM) (Entered: 01/27/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 1/14/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN TENDERED, filed by Plaintiff REMY, INC., Defendant TECNOMATIC S.P.A., Counter Claimant TECNOMATIC S.P.A., Counter Defendant REMY, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Magistrate Judge's Summary of Proposed Case Management Plan)(Hurley, Ryan) (Entered: 01/14/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 1/1/2009, Entered: None
ANSWER to Tecnomatic's Counterclaim, filed by Plaintiff REMY, INC., Counter Defendant REMY, INC.. (Hurley, Ryan) (Entered: 01/01/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 12/24/2008, Entered: None
Corporate Disclosure Statement by TECNOMATIC S.P.A.. (Weathers, Scott) (Entered: 12/24/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 12/12/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Pretrial Conference RESET for 1/28/2009 10:30 AM in room #256 before Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson. The initial pretrial conference set for 1/29/2009 is VACATED. Signed by Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson on 12/12/08.(SWM) (Entered: 12/12/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 12/10/2008, Entered: None
NOTICE to File Corporate Disclosure Statement to TECNOMATIC S.P.A. (LAB) (MAC) (Entered: 12/10/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 12/9/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
ENTRY regarding CMP and Initial Pretrial Conference. SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Pretrial Conference set for 1/29/2009 03:00 PM in room #256 before Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson. The CMP is due no later than 14 days prior to the iptc (See Entry). Signed by Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson on 12/9/08.(SWM) (Entered: 12/09/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 12/9/2008, Entered: None
ANSWER to Complaint, COUNTERCLAIM against REMY, INC., filed by TECNOMATIC S.P.A..(Weathers, Scott) (Entered: 12/09/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 12/1/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting deft's 19 Motion for Extension of Time to File response to complaint to 12/15/08. Signed by Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson on 12/1/08. (SWM) (Entered: 12/01/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 11/26/2008, Entered: None
MOTION for Extension of Time to 12/15/2008 to respond to complaint, filed by Defendant TECNOMATIC S.P.A.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Weathers, Scott) (Entered: 11/26/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 11/13/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 17 Motion to Appear pro hac vice. Attorney S. Patrick McKey for TECNOMATIC S.P.A. added cm. Signed by Judge Sarah Evans Barker on 11/13/08. (MAC) (Entered: 11/13/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 11/12/2008, Entered: None
MOTION for Attorney(s) S. Patrick McKey to Appear pro hac vice. Filing fee $ 30, receipt number 07560000000001291523., filed by Defendant TECNOMATIC S.P.A.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Verified Petition of s. Patrick McKey to Appear Pro Hac Vice, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Weathers, Scott) (Entered: 11/12/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 10/20/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 15 Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time to 11/28/08 to respond to complaint. Signed by Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson on 10/20/08. (TMA) (Entered: 10/21/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 10/17/2008, Entered: None
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to 11/28/2008, filed by Defendant TECNOMATIC S.P.A.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Weathers, Scott) (Entered: 10/17/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 10/16/2008, Entered: None
NOTICE of Appearance by Scott A. Weathers on behalf of Defendant TECNOMATIC S.P.A.. (Weathers, Scott) (Entered: 10/16/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 10/2/2008, Entered: None
AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint and Summons (Amended) served on Tecnomatic, S.P.A. on September 29, 2008, filed by REMY, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Hurley, Ryan) (Entered: 10/02/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 10/2/2008, Entered: None
**PLEASE DISREGARD REFER 13 **AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint and Summons served on Tecnomatic on September 29, 2008, filed by REMY, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Hurley, Ryan) Modified on 10/3/2008 (MAC). (Entered: 10/02/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 9/24/2008, Entered: None
Summons Issued as to TECNOMATIC S.P.A.. (TMA) (Entered: 09/24/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 9/23/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 9 Motion for service of complaint and summons by Clerk. Signed by Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson on 9/23/08. c/m (TMA) (Entered: 09/24/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 9/12/2008, Entered: None
MOTION for Service of Complaint and Summons by Clerk, filed by Plaintiff REMY, INC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Summons Supplied)(JD) (Entered: 09/12/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 9/12/2008, Entered: None
Corporate Disclosure Statement by REMY, INC. identifying Corporate Parent REMY INTERNATIONAL, INC., Other Affiliate FIDELITY SPECIAL ASSETS for REMY, INC. (JD) (Entered: 09/12/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 9/12/2008, Entered: None
MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (JD) (Entered: 09/12/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 9/12/2008, Entered: None
NOTICE of Appearance by Ryan Michael Hurley on behalf of Plaintiff REMY, INC. (JD) (Entered: 09/12/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 9/12/2008, Entered: None
NOTICE of Appearance by David P. Irmscher on behalf of Plaintiff REMY, INC. (JD) (Entered: 09/12/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 9/12/2008, Entered: None
NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph H. Yeager, Jr on behalf of Plaintiff REMY, INC. (JD) (Entered: 09/12/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 9/12/2008, Entered: None
RECEIPT #IP008833 in the amount of $ 350.00 (JD) (Entered: 09/12/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 9/12/2008, Entered: None
CIVIL COVER SHEET, filed by Plaintiff REMY, INC. (JD) (Entered: 09/12/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 9/12/2008, Entered: None
COMPLAINT against TECNOMATIC S.P.A. with Jury Demand, filed by REMY, INC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M)(JD) (Entered: 09/12/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF

Statistics

This case has been viewed 123 times.

Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Sign Up
Need Password Help?