Williamson v. Bush et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit California Northern District Court, Case No. 3:07-cv-00992
District Judge William H Alsup, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated September 22, 2016 at 12:48 AM DT (4.6 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Jeff H. Williamson, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Pro Se

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jeff H. Williamson
v.
No Logo Alberto Gonzales, Defendant
No Logo Arthur Balizan, Defendant
No Logo Attacks Upon The United States, Defendant
No Logo Bob Wright, Defendant
No Logo Brian Smitt, Defendant
No Logo Charlene Thorton, Defendant
No Logo Chung Hwan Kwak, Defendant
No Logo Cndice M. Will, Defendant
No Logo David Price, Defendant
No Logo Debra Yang, Defendant
No Logo Donald Rumsfeld, Defendant
No Logo George H.W. Bush, Defendant
Bush, George Walker Bush, George Walker, Defendant
Officially listed as "George W. Bush"
No Logo Glenn Fine, Defendant
No Logo H. Marshall Jarret, Defendant
No Logo Jeb Bush, Defendant
No Logo Jim Walton, Defendant
No Logo John Doe Green, Defendant
No Logo Jonathan Bush, Defendant
No Logo Jonathon Klein, Defendant
No Logo Kelli Lewis, Defendant
No Logo Kevin Ryan, Defendant
No Logo Leslie Mooves, Defendant
No Logo Marvin P. Bush, Defendant
Hayden, Michael V. Hayden, Michael V., Defendant
Officially listed as "Michael Hayden"
Motorola, Inc. Unknown Role, Motorola, Inc.
No Logo Mike Francis, Defendant
No Logo Mike Galonos, Defendant
No Logo National Commission on Terrorist, Defendant
No Logo Neil Nush, Defendant
No Logo Peter Pace, Defendant
No Logo Porter Goss, Defendant
No Logo Richard C. Powers, Defendant
Cheney, Richard B. Cheney, Richard B., Defendant
Officially listed as "Richard Cheney"
No Logo Robert Iger, Defendant
No Logo Robert Swan Mueller, III, Defendant
No Logo Rudi Bakhtair, Defendant
Murdoch, A.C., K. Rupert Murdoch, A.C., K. Rupert, Defendant
Officially listed as "Rupert Murdoch"
No Logo Steve Olson, Defendant
No Logo Tom Curley, Defendant
No Logo d, Defendant
Officially listed as "Wan J. Kim"
No Logo William H.T. Bush, Defendant
No Logo William Leone, Defendant
Citation Section 42 U.S.C. § 1983
Nature of Suit 440 - Civil Rights: Other
  Entries (15) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 11/29/2007, Entered: None
CLERK'S NOTICE Fee Past Due Notice. Third Notice. (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/29/2007) (Entered: 01/22/2008)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 11/1/2007, Entered: None
    CLERK'S NOTICE re: filing fee (Second Notice) (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/1/2007) (Entered: 11/01/2007)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 5/24/2007, Entered: None
      ORDER of USCA - Ninth Circuit declines to entertain this duplicative petition. (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/24/2007) (Entered: 05/25/2007)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 4/23/2007, Entered: None
        Mail Returned as Unclaimed. Mail sent to Jeff H. Williamson. (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/23/2007) (Entered: 04/24/2007)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 4/17/2007, Entered: None
          Mail Returned as Unclaimed. Mail sent to Jeff H. Williamson. (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/17/2007) (Entered: 04/18/2007)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 4/17/2007, Entered: None
            Mail Returned as Unclaimed. Mail sent to Jeff H. Williamson. (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/17/2007) (Entered: 04/17/2007)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 3/30/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
              JUDGMENT in favor of Defendant against Plaintiff. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 3/30/07. (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/30/2007) (Entered: 04/02/2007)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 3/30/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                ORDER by Judge William Alsup denying 3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis and Dismissing Case (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/30/2007) (Entered: 04/02/2007)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 3/27/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                  ORDER by The Executive Committee REASSIGNING CASE to Judge William H. Alsup. (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/27/2007) (Entered: 03/28/2007)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 3/27/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                    CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/27/2007) (Entered: 03/28/2007)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 3/23/2007, Entered: None
                      Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Jeff H. Williamson. (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/23/2007) (Entered: 03/28/2007)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 2/22/2007, Entered: None
                        FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT; No Process against Richard Cheney, Donald Rumsfeld, Peter Pace, Michael Hayden, Porter Goss, Robert Swan Mueller, III, Charlene Thorton, Cndice M. Will, Alberto Gonzales, Wan J. Kim, H. Marshall Jarret, Glenn Fine, William Leone, Debra Yang, Kevin Ryan, Mike Francis, John Doe Green, Arthur Balizan, Brian Smitt, Steve Olson, Richard C. Powers, David Price, Kelli Lewis, National Commission on Terrorist, Attacks Upon The United States, Chung Hwan Kwak, Tom Curley, Bob Wright, Robert Iger, Leslie Mooves, George W. Bush, Rupert Murdoch, Jim Walton, Jonathon Klein, Rudi Bakhtair, Mike Galonos, George H.W. Bush, Jeb Bush, Neil Nush, Jonathan Bush, Marvin P. Bush, William H.T. Bush. Filed byJeff H. Williamson. (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/22/2007) (Entered: 02/22/2007)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 2/16/2007, Entered: None
                          MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Jeff H. Williamson. (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/16/2007) (Entered: 02/20/2007)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 2/16/2007, Entered: None
                            ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 5/25/2007. Case Management Conference set for 6/1/2007 01:30 PM. (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/16/2007) (Entered: 02/20/2007)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 2/16/2007, Entered: None
                              COMPLAINT; No Process against Richard Cheney, Donald Rumsfeld, Peter Pace, Michael Hayden, Porter Goss, Robert Swan Mueller, III, Charlene Thorton, Cndice M. Will, Alberto Gonzales, Wan J. Kim, H. Marshall Jarret, Glenn Fine, William Leone, Debra Yang, Kevin Ryan, Mike Francis, John Doe Green, Arthur Balizan, Brian Smitt, Steve Olson, Richard C. Powers, David Price, Kelli Lewis, National Commission on Terrorist, Attacks Upon The United States, Chung Hwan Kwak, Tom Curley, Bob Wright, Robert Iger, Leslie Mooves, George W. Bush, Rupert Murdoch, Jim Walton, Jonathon Klein, Rudi Bakhtair, Mike Galonos, George H.W. Bush, Jeb Bush, Neil Nush, Jonathan Bush, Marvin P. Bush, William H.T. Bush (Filing fee IFPP). Filed byJeff H. Williamson. (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/16/2007) (Entered: 02/20/2007)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF

                                Statistics

                                This case has been viewed 93 times.

                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                Space
                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                 
                                PlainSite
                                Sign Up
                                Need Password Help?