Tecnomatic, S.p.A. v. Remy, Inc. et al

Federal Civil Lawsuit Illinois Northern District Court, Case No. 1:11-cv-01652
District Judge Edmond E. Chang, presiding
Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
District Judge Edmond E. Chang
Last Updated September 26, 2016 at 4:15 AM EDT (8.6 years ago) Update UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert AlertsSpaceJump Jump
Summary

No one has written a summary of this case yet. Sign up or sign in to contribute one.

Parties
No Logo Tecnomatic, S.p.a., Plaintiff

Represented by Bryan Cave, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Donald Alexander Cole +1 312 602 5028 donald.cole@bryancave.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kara E F Cenar +1 312 602 5019 kara.cenar@bryancave.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Patrick McKey +1 312 602 5000 +1 312 602 5050 patrick.mckey@bryancave.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mariangela M. Seale +1 312 602 5117 merili.seale@bryancave.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paula Lynn Zecchini +1 949 223 7207 +1 949 223 7100 paula.zecchini@bryancave.com
v.
No Logo Delco Remy Mexico, S.R.L. de C.V., Defendant
No Logo Hanson Systems, LLC d/b/a Eagle Technologies Group, Defendant

Represented by Boveri Murphy Rice LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Charles Peter Rice +1 574 232 0300 +1 574 232 0400 crice@bmrllp.com
No Logo Odawara Automation, Inc., Defendant

Represented by Barnes & Thornburg, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
(Inactive), ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James E Michel +1 312 357 1313 jmichel@btlaw.com

Represented by INVALID ADDRESS - Barnes & Thornburg - Fort Wayne

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
(Inactive), ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James E Michel +1 312 357 1313 jmichel@btlaw.com

Represented by Thompson Hine, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John Keeler & Co., Inc., +1 937 443 6808 +1 937 443 6830 Victoria.Nilles@ThompsonHine.com
No Logo Remy Componentes S. de R.L. de C.V., Defendant
No Logo Remy International, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Remy Inc., Defendant

Represented by Faegre Baker Daniels LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David M. Allen +1 312 212 6500 david.allen@FaegreBD.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Colby Anne Kingsbury +1 312 212 6573 +1 312 212 6501 Colby.Kingsbury@FaegreBD.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Trina K Taylor +1 312 212 6516 +1 303 607 3600 trina.taylor@FaegreBD.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph H. Yeager, Jr. +1 317 237 1278 jay.yeager@FaegreBD.com
Attributes
Citation Section 15 U.S.C. § 1125
Nature of Suit 890 - Other Statutes: Other Statutory Actions
Timeline
  Entries (71) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 7/25/2011, Entered: None
TRANSFERRED to the Southern District of Indiana the electronic record.(gcy, ) (Main Document 71 replaced on 7/25/2011) (gcy, ). (Entered: 07/25/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 6/27/2011, Entered: None
ENTERED JUDGMENT: This case is transferred to the Southern District of Indiana. (gcy, ) (Entered: 06/27/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 6/27/2011, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before Honorable Edmond E. Chang: Remy's motion to transfer, R. 43. is granted. This case is transferred to the Southern District of Indiana. Odawara's. Eagle's, and Remy's respective motions to dismiss, R. 36, R. 32, and R. 40, are terminated as moot. [For further details see text below].] Mailed notices (gcy, ) (Entered: 06/27/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 6/27/2011, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before Honorable Edmond E. Chang: MOTION by Plaintiff Tecnomatic, S.p.A. for leave to file instanter inadvertently omitted attachments is granted. Mailed notice (slb, ) (Entered: 06/27/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 6/25/2011, Entered: None
NOTICE of Motion by Donald Alexander Cole for presentment of motion for leave to file, 66 before Honorable Edmond E. Chang on 6/30/2011 at 08:30 AM. (Cole, Donald) (Entered: 06/25/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 6/25/2011, Entered: None
MOTION by Plaintiff Tecnomatic, S.p.A. for leave to file instanter inadvertently omitted attachments (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A Mendoza Deposition Transcript, # 2 Exhibit B Oaf Deposition Transcript, # 3 Exhibit C Perry Deposition Transcript, # 4 Exhibit D Ponsler Deposition Transcript, # 5 Exhibit E Spellman Deposition Transcript, # 6 Exhibit F Stephenson Deposition Transcript, # 7 Exhibit G Young Deposition Transcript)(Cole, Donald) (Entered: 06/25/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 6/24/2011, Entered: None
REPLY by Delco Remy Mexico, S.R.L. de C.V., Remy Componentes S. de R.L. de C.V., Remy International, Inc., Remy, Inc. to MOTION by Defendants Delco Remy Mexico, S.R.L. de C.V., Remy Componentes S. de R.L. de C.V., Remy International, Inc., Remy, Inc. to transfer case 43 (Allen, David) (Entered: 06/24/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 6/23/2011, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before Honorable Edmond E. Chang:Application by Paula Zecchini to appear pro hac vice 63 on behalf of the plaintiff is granted. Mailed notice (slb, ) (Entered: 06/23/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 6/23/2011, Entered: None
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-6124153. (Zecchini, Paula) (Entered: 06/23/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 6/22/2011, Entered: None
NOTICE by Tecnomatic, S.p.A. re response in opposition to motion, 61 (McKey, Steven) (Entered: 06/22/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 6/22/2011, Entered: None
RESPONSE by Tecnomatic, S.p.A.in Opposition to MOTION by Defendants Delco Remy Mexico, S.R.L. de C.V., Remy Componentes S. de R.L. de C.V., Remy International, Inc., Remy, Inc. to transfer case 43 (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Guiseppe Ranalli)(McKey, Steven) (Entered: 06/22/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 6/17/2011, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before Honorable Edmond E. Chang: Plaintiff's motion for extension 49 is denied in part and granted in part. On or before 06/22/11, Plaintiff shall file a response to the Remy Defendants' motion to transfer 43 -- but without taking discovery. Plaintiff may, if it chooses, to stand on its reply 59 with regard to the exclusive jurisdiction provision, but should address the other factors relevant to deciding the forum nonconviens issue. The Remy Defendants may file a reply on or before 06/24/11. Motion hearing for the transfer motion 43 is reset from 08/09/11 to 06/28/11 at 8:30 a.m. Briefing on the motions to dismiss [32, 36 40] is suspended. Mailed notice (slb, ) (Entered: 06/17/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 6/16/2011, Entered: None
REPLY by Plaintiff Tecnomatic, S.p.A. (Cenar, Kara) (Entered: 06/16/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 6/13/2011, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before Honorable Edmond E. Chang: On or before 06/16/11, Plaintiff may, if it chooses, to file a reply of no more than 3 pages to Defendants' responses to Plaintiff's motion to take jurisdictional discovery 49 . Motion hearing reset from 06/14/11 to 06/20/11 at 8:30 a.m. Mailed notice (slb, ) (Entered: 06/13/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 6/8/2011, Entered: None
RESPONSE by Odawara Automation, Inc. to MOTION by Plaintiff Tecnomatic, S.p.A. for extension of time to file response/reply as to motion to dismiss 40 , motion to transfer case 43 and for Leave to Conduct Jurisdictional Discovery 49 (Michel, James) (Entered: 06/08/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 6/8/2011, Entered: None
RESPONSE by Hanson Systems, LLC d/b/a Eagle Technologies Groupin Opposition to MOTION by Plaintiff Tecnomatic, S.p.A. for extension of time to file response/reply as to motion to dismiss 40 , motion to transfer case 43 and for Leave to Conduct Jurisdictional Discovery 49 (Rice, Charles) (Entered: 06/08/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 6/7/2011, Entered: None
STATUS Report Joint Initial Status Report by Tecnomatic, S.p.A. (Cenar, Kara) (Entered: 06/07/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 6/1/2011, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before Honorable Edmond E. Chang: Any response to Plaintiff's motion for discovery 49 shall be filed by 06/08/2011. Motion hearing of 06/02/2011 is entered and continued to 06/14/2011. Mailed notice (slb, ) (Entered: 06/01/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 6/1/2011, Entered: None
NOTICE by Delco Remy Mexico, S.R.L. de C.V., Remy Componentes S. de R.L. de C.V., Remy International, Inc., Remy, Inc. re response in opposition to motion, 52 (Allen, David) (Entered: 06/01/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 6/1/2011, Entered: None
RESPONSE by Delco Remy Mexico, S.R.L. de C.V., Remy Componentes S. de R.L. de C.V., Remy International, Inc., Remy, Inc. in Opposition to MOTION by Plaintiff Tecnomatic, S.p.A. for extension of time to file response/reply as to motion to dismiss 40 , motion to transfer case 43 and for Leave to Conduct Jurisdictional Discovery 49 (Allen, David) (Entered: 06/01/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 5/27/2011, Entered: None
NOTICE of Motion by Kara Eve Foster Cenar for presentment of motion for extension of time to file response/reply, motion for relief, 49 before Honorable Edmond E. Chang on 6/2/2011 at 08:30 AM. (Cenar, Kara) (Entered: 05/27/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 5/27/2011, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM by Tecnomatic, S.p.A. in support of motion for extension of time to file response/reply, motion for relief, 49 and for Leave to Conduct Jurisdictional Discovery (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Cenar, Kara) (Entered: 05/27/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 5/27/2011, Entered: None
MOTION by Plaintiff Tecnomatic, S.p.A. for extension of time to file response/reply as to motion to dismiss 40 , motion to transfer case 43 and for Leave to Conduct Jurisdictional Discovery (Cenar, Kara) (Entered: 05/27/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 5/25/2011, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before Honorable Edmond E. Chang: Plaintiff shall respond on or before 06/27/11 to (a) the motion to dismiss 32 by Defendant Hanson Systems, LLC d/b/a Eagle Technologies Group; (b) motion to dismiss for lack of personal jurisdiction, improper venue, or failure to state a claim 36 by Defendant Odawara Automation, Inc.; (c) motion by Remy Defendants to dismiss 40 ; and (d) motion by Remy Defendants to transfer case 43 . Defendants shall reply on or before 07/5/11. Status hearing of 06/07/11 is reset to 08/09/11 at 8:30a.m. The joint initial written status report shall be filed on or before 06/07/11.Mailed notice (slb, ) (Entered: 05/25/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 5/25/2011, Entered: None
Corporate Disclosure STATEMENT by Delco Remy Mexico, S.R.L. de C.V., Remy Componentes S. de R.L. de C.V., Remy International, Inc., Remy, Inc. (Taylor, Trina) (Entered: 05/25/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 5/23/2011, Entered: None
NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Hanson Systems, LLC d/b/a Eagle Technologies Group (Rice, Charles) (Entered: 05/23/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 5/20/2011, Entered: None
NOTICE of Motion by David M. Allen for presentment of motion to transfer case 43 before Honorable Edmond E. Chang on 5/26/2011 at 08:30 AM. (Allen, David) (Entered: 05/20/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 5/20/2011, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM by Delco Remy Mexico, S.R.L. de C.V., Remy Componentes S. de R.L. de C.V., Remy International, Inc., Remy, Inc. in support of motion to transfer case 43 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Allen, David) (Entered: 05/20/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 5/20/2011, Entered: None
MOTION by Defendants Delco Remy Mexico, S.R.L. de C.V., Remy Componentes S. de R.L. de C.V., Remy International, Inc., Remy, Inc. to transfer case (Allen, David) (Entered: 05/20/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 5/20/2011, Entered: None
NOTICE of Motion by David M. Allen for presentment of motion to dismiss 40 before Honorable Edmond E. Chang on 5/26/2011 at 08:30 AM. (Allen, David) (Entered: 05/20/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 5/20/2011, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM by Delco Remy Mexico, S.R.L. de C.V., Remy Componentes S. de R.L. de C.V., Remy International, Inc., Remy, Inc. in support of motion to dismiss 40 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Allen, David) (Entered: 05/20/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 5/20/2011, Entered: None
MOTION by Defendants Delco Remy Mexico, S.R.L. de C.V., Remy Componentes S. de R.L. de C.V., Remy, Inc., Remy International, Inc. to dismiss (Allen, David) (Entered: 05/20/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 5/20/2011, Entered: None
NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Odawara Automation, Inc. (Michel, James) (Entered: 05/20/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 5/20/2011, Entered: None
NOTICE of Motion by James E Michel for presentment of motion to dismiss 36 before Honorable Edmond E. Chang on 5/26/2011 at 08:30 AM. (Michel, James) (Entered: 05/20/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 5/20/2011, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM by Odawara Automation, Inc. in support of motion to dismiss 36 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Declaration of Chris R. Spejna)(Michel, James) (Entered: 05/20/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 5/20/2011, Entered: None
MOTION by Defendant Odawara Automation, Inc. to dismiss for lack of personal jurisdiction, improper venue, and failure to state a claim upon which relief can be granted (Michel, James) (Entered: 05/20/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 5/20/2011, Entered: None
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Hanson Systems, LLC d/b/a Eagle Technologies Group (Rice, Charles) (Entered: 05/20/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 5/20/2011, Entered: None
NOTICE of Motion by Charles P Rice for presentment of motion to dismiss 32 before Honorable Edmond E. Chang on 5/26/2011 at 08:30 AM. (Rice, Charles) (Entered: 05/20/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 5/20/2011, Entered: None
Brief Supporting Motion to Dismiss by Hanson Systems, LLC d/b/a Eagle Technologies Group (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A (Hanson Affidavit))(Rice, Charles) (Entered: 05/20/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 5/20/2011, Entered: None
MOTION by Defendant Hanson Systems, LLC d/b/a Eagle Technologies Group to dismiss (Rice, Charles) (Entered: 05/20/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 5/17/2011, Entered: None
ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Remy Componentes S. de R.L. de C.V., Remy International, Inc., Remy, Inc. by Joseph H. Yeager, Jr (Yeager, Joseph) (Entered: 05/17/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 5/11/2011, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before Honorable Edmond E. Chang: Remy Defendants' motion to file oversized brief 25 is granted in part and denied in part. The Remy Defendants may file a brief of no more than 30 pages. Mailed notice (slb, ) (Entered: 05/11/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 5/11/2011, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before Honorable Edmond E. Chang: Remy Defendants' motion to delay the filing 23 of the initial status report until a ruling on the anticipated motions is denied. The relatively modest burden of preparing the status report does not outweigh the benefits of having a pre-initial-status written report, which aids the Court in managing the case and prioritizing the anticipated motions amongst the rest of its docket. In other cases, defendants who anticipate filing dispositive motions rather than answers, and indeed even defendants who already have filed dispositive motions, routinely participate in preparing the initial status report without finding it to be an undue burden. In order to help alleviate the overlapping duties of defense counsel, however, the Court will reset the initial status hearing to 06/07/2011 at 9:00a.m., which will push back the due date of the report. Mailed notice (slb, ) (Entered: 05/11/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 5/10/2011, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before Honorable Edmond E. Chang: Motion by Victoria L. Nilles to appear pro hac vice on behalf of defendant Odawara Automation, Inc. is granted. Mailed notice (slb, ) (Entered: 05/10/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 5/10/2011, Entered: None
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-5984450. (Nilles, Victoria) (Entered: 05/10/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 5/9/2011, Entered: None
NOTICE of Motion by David M. Allen for presentment of motion for leave to file excess pages 25 before Honorable Edmond E. Chang on 5/12/2011 at 08:30 AM. (Allen, David) (Entered: 05/09/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 5/9/2011, Entered: None
MOTION by Defendants Delco Remy Mexico, S.R.L. de C.V., Remy Componentes S. de R.L. de C.V., Remy International, Inc., Remy, Inc. for leave to file excess pages (Allen, David) (Entered: 05/09/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 5/9/2011, Entered: None
NOTICE of Motion by David M. Allen for presentment of extension of time 23 before Honorable Edmond E. Chang on 5/12/2011 at 08:30 AM. (Allen, David) (Entered: 05/09/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 5/9/2011, Entered: None
MOTION by Defendants Delco Remy Mexico, S.R.L. de C.V., Remy Componentes S. de R.L. de C.V., Remy International, Inc., Remy, Inc. for extension of time for filing the Joint Initial Status Report (Allen, David) (Entered: 05/09/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 4/29/2011, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before Honorable Edmond E. Chang:Application by Joseph H. Yeager, Jr. to appear pro hac vice 21 on behalf of the defendants is granted. Mailed notice (slb, ) (Entered: 04/29/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 4/29/2011, Entered: None
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-5953040. (Yeager, Joseph) (Entered: 04/29/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 4/19/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
MINUTE entry before Honorable Edmond E. Chang: Defendants' unopposed motion for extension of time until 5/20/2011 in which to answer or otherwise plead is granted. Status hearing set for 5/26/2011 at 8:30a.m. At least 4 business days before the initial status in this case, please file a joint initial status report (with a courtesy copy to the Courtroom Deputy), containing the following information: 1) The nature of the case, including the legal and factual issues; 2) Pending Motions and Case Plan; 3) Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge; and 4) Status of Settlement Discussions. (See Attachment #1)Mailed notice (Attachments: # 1 Initial Status Report Requirements) (slb, ) (Entered: 04/19/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 4/15/2011, Entered: None
NOTICE of Motion by David M. Allen for presentment of motion for extension of time to file answer 18 before Honorable Edmond E. Chang on 4/20/2011 at 08:30 AM. (Allen, David) (Entered: 04/15/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 4/15/2011, Entered: None
MOTION by Defendants Hanson Systems, LLC d/b/a Eagle Technologies Group, Odawara Automation, Inc., Remy International, Inc., Remy, Inc. for extension of time to file answer or otherwise plead [unopposed] (Allen, David) (Entered: 04/15/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 4/15/2011, Entered: None
ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Odawara Automation, Inc. by James E Michel (Michel, James) (Entered: 04/15/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 4/14/2011, Entered: None
ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Hanson Systems, LLC d/b/a Eagle Technologies Group by Charles P Rice (Rice, Charles) (Entered: 04/14/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 4/8/2011, Entered: None
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Tecnomatic, S.p.A. as to Hanson Systems, LLC d/b/a Eagle Technologies Group on 3/30/2011, answer due 4/20/2011. (Seale, Mariangela) (Entered: 04/08/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 4/8/2011, Entered: None
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Tecnomatic, S.p.A. as to Remy, Inc. on 3/30/2011, answer due 4/20/2011. (Seale, Mariangela) (Entered: 04/08/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 4/8/2011, Entered: None
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Tecnomatic, S.p.A. as to Remy International, Inc. on 3/30/2011, answer due 4/20/2011. (Seale, Mariangela) (Entered: 04/08/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 4/8/2011, Entered: None
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Tecnomatic, S.p.A. as to Odawara Automation, Inc. on 3/30/2011, answer due 4/20/2011. (Seale, Mariangela) (Entered: 04/08/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 4/8/2011, Entered: None
ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Tecnomatic, S.p.A. by Donald Alexander Cole (Cole, Donald) (Entered: 04/08/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 4/8/2011, Entered: None
ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Tecnomatic, S.p.A. by Mariangela M. Seale (Seale, Mariangela) (Entered: 04/08/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 4/6/2011, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before Honorable Edmond E. Chang:The Court has placed this case into the Seventh Circuit Electronic Discovery Pilot Program. The Court therefore will apply the standing order relating to the discovery of electronically stored information ("ESI") (See Attachment #1). The parties shall familiarize themselves with the standing order and with the principles relating to the discovery of electronically stored information that underlies the standing order, and shall use the standing order and those principles in addressing any discovery disputes that may arise in this case concerning ESI. Mailed notice (Attachments: # 1 Standing Order Relating to the Discovery of Electronically Stored Information) (slb, ) (Entered: 04/06/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 4/6/2011, Entered: None
ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Delco Remy Mexico, S.R.L. de C.V., Remy Componentes S. de R.L. de C.V., Remy International, Inc., Remy, Inc. by Colby Anne Kingsbury (Kingsbury, Colby) (Entered: 04/06/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 4/5/2011, Entered: None
ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Delco Remy Mexico, S.R.L. de C.V., Remy Componentes S. de R.L. de C.V., Remy International, Inc., Remy, Inc. by Trina K Taylor (Taylor, Trina) (Entered: 04/05/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 4/5/2011, Entered: None
ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Delco Remy Mexico, S.R.L. de C.V., Remy Componentes S. de R.L. de C.V., Remy International, Inc., Remy, Inc. by David M. Allen (Allen, David) (Entered: 04/05/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 3/29/2011, Entered: None
SUMMONS Issued 6 Original as to Defendants Delco Remy Mexico, S.R.L. de C.V., Hanson Systems, LLC d/b/a Eagle Technologies Group, Odawara Automation, Inc., Remy Componentes S. de R.L. de C.V., Remy International, Inc., Remy, Inc. (gcy, ) (Entered: 03/30/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 3/9/2011, Entered: None
ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Tecnomatic, S.p.A. by Kara Eve Foster Cenar (Cenar, Kara) (Entered: 03/09/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 3/9/2011, Entered: None
ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Tecnomatic, S.p.A. by Steven Patrick McKey (McKey, Steven) (Entered: 03/09/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 3/9/2011, Entered: None
CIVIL Cover Sheet (McKey, Steven) (Entered: 03/09/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 3/9/2011, Entered: None
COMPLAINT filed by Tecnomatic, S.p.A.; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 0752-5780020. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G)(McKey, Steven) (Entered: 03/09/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF

Statistics

This case has been viewed 153 times.

Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Sign Up
Need Password Help?