EMS Technologies, LLC v. Micron Technology, Inc. et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Texas Eastern District Court, Case No. 2:14-cv-00900

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 4, 2017 at 7:22 AM ST (4.5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo EMS Technologies, LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Evan Spencer Attorney At Law

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Aarika Katherine McCloskey +1 903 753 9300 +1 903 553 0403 aarika.kate@gmail.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Mishcon de Reya New York LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mark S Raskin +1 212 612 3270 +1 212 612 3297 Mark.Raskin@mishcon.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert Whitman +1 212 257 4455 +1 212 612 3297 robert.whitman@mishcon.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Ste. 300

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrew Wesley Spangler +1 903 935 3443 +1 903 553 0403 spangler@spanglerlawpc.com
No Logo Micron Technology, Inc., Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Fish & Richardson, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ruffin B. Cordell +1 262 626 6449 +1 202 783 2331 cordell@fr.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ruffin B. Cordell +1 262 626 6449 +1 202 783 2331 cordell@fr.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Timothy Wayne Riffe +1 202 626 6429 +1 202 783 2331 Riffe@fr.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert Andrew Schwentker +1 202 626 6357 schwentker@fr.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Adam R Shartzer +1 202 783 5070 +1 202 783 2331 shartzer@fr.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Adam R Shartzer +1 202 783 5070 +1 202 783 2331 shartzer@fr.com

Toggle Switch Represented by GILLAM AND SMITH, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Melissa Richards Smith +1 903 934 8450 +1 903 934 9257 melissa@gillamsmithlaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Melissa Richards Smith +1 903 934 8450 +1 903 934 9257 melissa@gillamsmithlaw.com
v.
No Logo IM Flash Technologies, LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Fish & Richardson, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ruffin B. Cordell +1 262 626 6449 +1 202 783 2331 cordell@fr.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Timothy Wayne Riffe +1 202 626 6429 +1 202 783 2331 Riffe@fr.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert Andrew Schwentker +1 202 626 6357 schwentker@fr.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Adam R Shartzer +1 202 783 5070 +1 202 783 2331 shartzer@fr.com

Toggle Switch Represented by GILLAM AND SMITH, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Melissa Richards Smith +1 903 934 8450 +1 903 934 9257 melissa@gillamsmithlaw.com
No Logo Micron Technology, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Fish & Richardson, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ruffin B. Cordell +1 262 626 6449 +1 202 783 2331 cordell@fr.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Timothy Wayne Riffe +1 202 626 6429 +1 202 783 2331 Riffe@fr.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert Andrew Schwentker +1 202 626 6357 schwentker@fr.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Adam R Shartzer +1 202 783 5070 +1 202 783 2331 shartzer@fr.com

Toggle Switch Represented by GILLAM AND SMITH, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Melissa Richards Smith +1 903 934 8450 +1 903 934 9257 melissa@gillamsmithlaw.com
No Logo EMS Technologies, LLC, Counter-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Evan Spencer Attorney At Law

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Aarika Katherine McCloskey +1 903 753 9300 +1 903 553 0403 aarika.kate@gmail.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Mishcon de Reya New York LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mark S Raskin +1 212 612 3270 +1 212 612 3297 Mark.Raskin@mishcon.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mark S Raskin +1 212 612 3270 +1 212 612 3297 Mark.Raskin@mishcon.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert Whitman +1 212 257 4455 +1 212 612 3297 robert.whitman@mishcon.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert Whitman +1 212 257 4455 +1 212 612 3297 robert.whitman@mishcon.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Ste. 300

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrew Wesley Spangler +1 903 935 3443 +1 903 553 0403 spangler@spanglerlawpc.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrew Wesley Spangler +1 903 935 3443 +1 903 553 0403 spangler@spanglerlawpc.com
No Logo Robert W Faulkner, Mediator

Toggle Switch Represented by JAMS

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert W Faulkner +1 214 744 5267 +1 214 720 6010 rfaulkner@jamsadr.com
  Entries (63) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 4/7/2015, Entered: None Order Dismissing Case
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 3/26/2015, Entered: None Dismiss
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 3/24/2015, Entered: None Protective Order
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 3/24/2015, Entered: None Order
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 3/20/2015, Entered: None Response to Non-Motion
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 3/19/2015, Entered: None Reply to Response to Motion
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 3/12/2015, Entered: None Reply to Response to Motion
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 3/9/2015, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 3/2/2015, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 2/24/2015, Entered: None Counterclaim
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 2/20/2015, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 2/19/2015, Entered: None Strike
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 2/13/2015, Entered: None Sur-Reply to Reply to Response to Motion
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 2/11/2015, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 2/11/2015, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 2/11/2015, Entered: None Dismiss
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 2/10/2015, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 2/7/2015, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 2/6/2015, Entered: None
                                      NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Ruffin B Cordell on behalf of IM Flash Technologies, LLC, Micron Technology, Inc. (Cordell, Ruffin) (Entered: 02/06/2015)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 2/7/2015, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 2/6/2015, Entered: None
                                          NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Timothy W Riffe on behalf of IM Flash Technologies, LLC, Micron Technology, Inc. (Riffe, Timothy) (Entered: 02/06/2015)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 2/6/2015, Entered: None Amended Complaint
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 2/4/2015, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 2/4/2015, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 2/3/2015, Entered: None
                                                  FILED IN ERROR - ATTORNEY WILL RE-FILE Submission of Proposed Agreed Discovery order by EMS Technologies, LLC . (Raskin, Mark) Modified on 2/4/2015 (nkl, ). (Entered: 02/03/2015)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 2/3/2015, Entered: None
                                                    FILED IN ERROR - ATTORNEY WILL RE-FILE Submission of Proposed Agreed Docket Control/Scheduling order by EMS Technologies, LLC . (Raskin, Mark) Modified on 2/4/2015 (nkl, ). (Entered: 02/03/2015)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 2/2/2015, Entered: None Reply to Response to Motion
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 2/2/2015, Entered: None Order Reassigning Case
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 2/2/2015, Entered: None Order
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 1/28/2015, Entered: None Amended Complaint
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 1/27/2015, Entered: None Order Referring Case to Mediator
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 1/23/2015, Entered: None Notice of Designation of Mediator
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 1/21/2015, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 1/21/2015, Entered: None
                                                                    RESPONSE to MICRON TECHNOLOGY, INC.'S COUNTERCLAIMS by EMS Technologies, LLC. (Spangler, Andrew) (Entered: 01/21/2015)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 1/5/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion to Amend/Correct
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 1/5/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion to Amend/Correct
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 12/29/2014, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 12/22/2014, Entered: None Amend/Correct
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 12/22/2014, Entered: None Amend/Correct
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 12/19/2014, Entered: None Extension of Time to File
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 12/19/2014, Entered: None Order
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 12/19/2014, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 12/8/2014, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 12/8/2014, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 12/5/2014, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 12/4/2014, Entered: None Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 12/4/2014, Entered: None Jury Demand
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 12/4/2014, Entered: None Dismiss
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 12/4/2014, Entered: None Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 12/4/2014, Entered: None Jury Demand
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 12/4/2014, Entered: None Counterclaim
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 12/4/2014, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 11/13/2014, Entered: None Unopposed Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 10/23/2014, Entered: None Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 10/23/2014, Entered: None Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 10/17/2014, Entered: None Unopposed Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 9/29/2014, Entered: None Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 9/29/2014, Entered: None Summons Reissued
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 9/19/2014, Entered: None Summons Issued
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 9/19/2014, Entered: None Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 9/19/2014, Entered: None Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 9/19/2014, Entered: None Jury Demand
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 9/19/2014, Entered: None Complaint
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                Statistics

                                                                                                                                This case has been viewed 68 times.

                                                                                                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                Space
                                                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                 
                                                                                                                                PlainSite
                                                                                                                                Sign Up
                                                                                                                                Need Password Help?