McRo Inc. v. Codemasters Inc. et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit California Central District Court, Case No. 2:14-cv-00439

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 30, 2017 at 1:28 PM ST (4.6 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Mcro, Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Farnan LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Brian E. Farnan +1 302 777 0300 +1 302 777 0301 bfarnan@farnanlaw.com
Space Michael J. Farnan +1 302 777 0338 +1 302 421 5870 mfarnan@farnanlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Mishcon de Reya New York LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Mark S Raskin +1 212 612 3270 +1 212 612 3297 Mark.Raskin@mishcon.com
No Logo Codemasters Inc., Counter-Claimant
No Logo Code Masters Software Company Ltd, Counter-Claimant
Officially listed as "Codemasters Software Company Limited"
v.
No Logo Codemasters Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Baker & Hostetler, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jared A Brandyberry +1 513 929 3400 +1 513 929 3003 jbrandyberry@bakerlaw.com
Space Lisa Inez Damji +1 310 979 8450 +1 310 820 8859 ldamji@bakerlaw.com
Space Kevin W. Kirsch +1 513 929 3400 +1 513 929 0303 kkirsch@bakerlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Saul Ewing LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Whitney W. Deeney +1 302 421 6824 wdeeney@saul.com
No Logo Code Masters Software Company Ltd, Defendant
Officially listed as "Codemasters Software Company Limited"

Toggle Switch Represented by Saul Ewing LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space James Darlington Taylor, Jr. +1 302 421 6863 jtaylor@saul.com
No Logo Mcro, Inc., Counter-Defendant
  Entries (62) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 1/30/2017, Entered: None Order
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 1/25/2017, Entered: None Dismiss Case
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 11/5/2014, Entered: None Miscellaneous Document
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 11/4/2014, Entered: None Judgment
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 10/31/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
          FINAL JUDGMENT by Judge George H. Wu, Accordingly, it is ADJUDGED that Plaintiff and Counterclaim-Defendant McRo, Inc., d.b.a. Planet Blue ("Plaintiff') takes nothing from Defendants and Counterclaim-Plaintiffs (SEE ATTACHED FOR FURTHER DETAILS) All remaining pending motions are DENIED as moot. As Defendants are the prevailing parties in this action, Defendants' costs of court shall be taxed against Plaintiff. (pj) (Entered: 11/03/2014)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 10/27/2014, Entered: None
            NOTIFICATION by Circuit Court of Appellate Docket Number 15-1101, Federal Circuit regarding Notice of Appeal to Federal Circuit Court of Appeals 52 as to Plaintiff McRO Inc. (mat) (Entered: 10/29/2014)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 10/28/2014, Entered: None Objections - non-motion
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 10/28/2014, Entered: None Judgment/Renewal of Judgment
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 10/22/2014, Entered: None
                  NOTICE OF APPEAL to the Federal Circuit filed by Plaintiff McRO Inc. Appeal of Judgment, 50 (Appeal fee of $505 receipt number 0973-14662639 paid.) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Raskin, Mark) (Entered: 10/22/2014)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 9/24/2014, Entered: None Report of Determination of Patent/Trademark Action (CLOSE) (AO 120)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 9/24/2014, Entered: None Judgment
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 9/22/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                        RULING ON DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS BASED ON UNPATENTABILITY UNDER 35 U.S.C. SECTION 101 by Judge George H. Wu. For the foregoing reasons, the Court would GRANT the Motion, and hold 576 Patent claims 1, 7-9, and 13, and 278 Patent claims 1-4, 6, 9, 13, and 15-17 invalid Under 35 U.S.C. Section 101. (MD JS-6, Case Terminated). (pj) (Entered: 09/24/2014)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 9/19/2014, Entered: None Status Conference
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 9/18/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                            MINUTES OF Status Conference held before Judge George H. Wu: The Court's Tentative Ruling re Defendants' Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings Based onUnpatentability Under 35 U.S.C. Section 101, in McRO, Inc., v. Namco Bandai Games America, Inc., CV 12- 10322-GW(FFMx), is circulated and attached hereto. Court hears oral argument. For reasons stated on the record, Defendants' motion is TAKEN UNDER SUBMISSION. Court to issue its ruling.Court Reporter: Katie Thibideaux. (pj) (Entered: 09/19/2014)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 8/8/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                              TEXT ONLY ENTRY (IN CHAMBERS): by Judge George H. Wu; Pursuant to the request of defense counsel, the Status Conference previously scheduled for 09/04/2014 is CONTINUED to 9/18/2014 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu.THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (jag) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 08/08/2014)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 8/5/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                **AMENDED** TEXT ONLY ENTRY 46 (IN CHAMBERS): by Judge George H. Wu; The Court, on its own motion, CONTINUES the Status Conference, previously scheduled for 8/14/2014 to 9/4/2014 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (jag) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 08/06/2014)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 8/5/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                  TEXT ONLY ENTRY (IN CHAMBERS): by Judge George H. Wu; The Court, on its own motion, CONTINUES the Status Conference previously scheduled for 8/14/2014 to 8/21/2014 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. WuTHERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (jag) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 08/05/2014)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 6/30/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                    MINUTES OF STATUS CONFERENCE held before Judge George H. Wu. Court and counsel confer. Parties will meet and confer re scheduling and possible consolidation of Track 2 cases with Track 1 cases. The status conference is continued to August 14, 2014 at 8:30 a.m. Joint status report re scheduling will be filed by noon on August 12, 2014. Court Reporter: Katie Thibodeaux. (lom) (Entered: 07/01/2014)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 6/26/2014, Entered: None
                                      STATUS REPORT Joint filed by Plaintiff McRO Inc. (Raskin, Mark) (Entered: 06/26/2014)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 5/29/2014, Entered: None
                                        NOTICE OF DENIAL OF PETITIONS FOR INTER PARTES REVIEW filed by PLAINTIFF McRO Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Raskin, Mark) (Entered: 05/29/2014)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 5/21/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                          PROTECTIVE ORDER GOVERNING THE DESIGNATION AND HANDLING OF CONFIDENTIAL MATERIALS by Magistrate Judge Frederick F. Mumm re Notice (Other) 41 : (see attached) (jm) (Entered: 05/21/2014)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 5/16/2014, Entered: None
                                            NOTICE OF MOTION AND Joint MOTION for Protective Order for Handling of Confidential Information filed by Plaintiff McRO Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Proposed Protective Order)(Raskin, Mark) (Entered: 05/16/2014)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 4/28/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                              MINUTES OF Status Conference held before Judge George H. Wu: Markman hearing held in Track 1 Consolidated Cases (Lead Case McRO, Inc. v. Namco Bandai Games America, Inc., CV 12-10322-GW(FFMx)). For reasons stated on the record, the status conference is continued to June 30, 2014 at 8:30 a.m.Court Reporter: Katie Thibodeaux. (pj) (Entered: 04/29/2014)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 2/28/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                ORDER ONREQUEST FOR APPROVAL OFSUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY by Judge George H. Wu: granting 38 Request to Substitute Attorney Kevin W. Kirsch instead of Attorney Whitney W Deeney and James Darlington Taylor, Jr terminated (pj) (Entered: 03/04/2014)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 2/27/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                  REQUEST to Substitute attorney Kevin W. Kirsch in place of attorney Whitney W. Deeney and James Darlington Taylor, Jr. filed by Defendant Codemasters Inc., Codemasters Software Company Limited. Request set for hearing on 3/17/2014 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Attorney Kevin W Kirsch added to party Codemasters Inc.(pty:cc), Attorney Kevin W Kirsch added to party Codemasters Software Company Limited(pty:cc))(Kirsch, Kevin) (Entered: 02/27/2014)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 2/24/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                    MINUTES OF Telephone Conference held before Judge George H. Wu: Court and counsel confer re discovery issues. The Court, as indicated on the record, allows the Track Two cases to propound discovery within 45 days of receipt of discovery requests and interrogatories. Plaintiff Planet Blue will also provide Track Two cases with Track One discovery within two weeks from the date of this order. The status conference is continued to April 28, 2014 at 8:30 a.m. Court Reporter: Katie Thibedeaux. (bp) (Entered: 02/25/2014)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 2/20/2014, Entered: None
                                                      STATUS REPORT JOINT filed by Plaintiff McRO Inc. (Raskin, Mark) (Entered: 02/20/2014)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 2/13/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                        MINUTES OF Status Conference held before Judge George H. Wu:, The Courts Tentative Position re Scheduling, Markman Hearing, and Discovery, is circulated. Partieswill confer and file a proposed schedule and objections to the consolidation of Track 2 Cases by noon on February 20, 2014. The status conference is continued to February 24, 2014 at 8:30 a.m. Parties may appear telephonically, provided that notice is given to the clerk at least two business days prior to the hearing. Court Reporter: Katie Thibodeaux. (pj) (Entered: 02/20/2014)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 2/19/2014, Entered: None
                                                          NOTICE TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE AT THE FEBRUARY 24, 2014 HEARING filed by Plaintiff McRO Inc. (Raskin, Mark) (Entered: 02/19/2014)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 2/11/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                            ORDER by Judge George H. Wu: granting 30 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Jared A. Brandyberry on behalf of Defendants for Codemasters Inc. and for Codemasters Software Company Limited, designating Lisa I. Damji as local counsel. (lt) (Entered: 02/12/2014)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 2/11/2014, Entered: None
                                                              NOTICE OF TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE FOR MARK S. RASKIN AT THE FEBRUARY 13, 2014 HEARING filed by Plaintiff McRO Inc. (Raskin, Mark) (Entered: 02/11/2014)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 2/10/2014, Entered: None
                                                                STATUS REPORT JOINT filed by Plaintiff McRO Inc. (Raskin, Mark) (Entered: 02/10/2014)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 2/7/2014, Entered: None
                                                                  First APPLICATION for attorney Jared Alan Brandyberry to Appear Pro Hac Vice(PHV Fee of $325 receipt number 0973-13349326 paid.) filed by Defendant Codemasters Inc., Codemasters Software Company Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing Jared Alan Brandyberry from The Supreme Court of Ohio, # 2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing for Jared Alan Brandyberry from the Supreme Court of Colorado, # 3 Proposed Order (Proposed) Order)(Attorney Lisa I Damji added to party Codemasters Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Lisa I Damji added to party Codemasters Software Company Limited(pty:dft))(Damji, Lisa) (Entered: 02/07/2014)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 2/3/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                    MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge George H. Wu: This action has been reassigned to the HONORABLE GEORGE H. WU, United States District Judge and the Honorable Frederick F. Mumm, United States Magistrate Judge. Please substitute the initials GW in place of the initials GHK. The case number will now read: CV 14-439-GW(FFMx).A Status Conference re consolidation into McRO, Inc. v. Namco Bandai Games America, Inc., CV 12- 10322-GW(FFMx), is set for February 13, 2014 at 8:30 a.m. Parties will meet and confer and within five days file a joint status report as to said consolidation. Additionally, Parties may appear telephonically provided that notice is given to the clerk by February 11, 2014. (lc) (Entered: 02/03/2014)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 1/30/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                      Standing Order Re Final Pre-Trial Conferences for Civil Jury Trials Before Judge George H. Wu. 1. You are instructed to read and to follow (unless otherwise superseded herein) the Central District of California Local Rules (henceforth Local Rules) 16-1 through 16-15 regarding pre-trial requirements. (See order for details.) (kti) (Entered: 01/30/2014)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 1/29/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                        ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 08-05 -Related Case- filed. Related Case No: CV 12-10322 GW(FFMx. Case transferred from Judge George H. King and Magistrate Judge Margaret A. Nagle to Judge George H. Wu and Magistrate Judge Frederick F. Mumm for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge CV 14-00439 GW(FFMx). Signed by Judge George H. Wu (rn) (Entered: 01/29/2014)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 1/23/2014, Entered: None
                                                                          NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Plaintiff McRO Inc. Related Case(s): 14-cv-00389, 14-cv-00336, 14-cv-00352, 14-cv-00358, 14-cv-00383, 14-cv-00332, 14-cv-00417, 13-cv-01870, 13-cv-01871, 13-cv-01872, 13-cv-01873, 13-cv-01874, Lead Case 12-cv-10322, consolidated with 12-cv-10323, 12-cv-10326, 12-cv-10327, 12-cv-10329, 12-cv-10331, 12-cv-10333, 12-cv-10335, 12-cv-10336, 12-cv-10337, 12-cv-10338, 12-cv-10340, 12-cv-10341, 12-cv-10342, 12-cv-10344 and 12-cv-10345 (Raskin, Mark) (Entered: 01/23/2014)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 1/23/2014, Entered: None
                                                                            NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Kevin W Kirsch on behalf of Defendants Codemasters Inc., Codemasters Software Company Limited (Attorney Kevin W Kirsch added to party Codemasters Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Kevin W Kirsch added to party Codemasters Software Company Limited(pty:dft))(Kirsch, Kevin) (Entered: 01/23/2014)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 1/21/2014, Entered: None
                                                                              NOTICE OF FILING FEE DUE on Pro Hac Vice Application mailed to attorney James Darlington Taylor, Jr for Counter Claimants Codemasters Inc., Codemasters Software Company Limited, Defendants Codemasters Inc., Codemasters Software Company Limited. Pro Hac Vice application has not been received by the court. Please return your completed Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case, form G-64, or a copy of the Notice of Electronic Filing of your application and the $325.00 fee and this notice immediately. Out-of-state federal government attorneys who are not employed by the U.S. Department of Justice are required to file a Pro Hac Vice application;no filing fee is required. (et) (Entered: 01/21/2014)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 1/21/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                NOTICE OF FILING FEE DUE on Pro Hac Vice Application mailed to attorney Whitney W Deeney for Counter Claimants Codemasters Inc., Codemasters Software Company Limited, Defendants Codemasters Inc., Codemasters Software Company Limited. Pro Hac Vice application has not been received by the court. Please return your completed Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case, form G-64, or a copy of the Notice of Electronic Filing of your application and the $325.00 fee and this notice immediately. Out-of-state federal government attorneys who are not employed by the U.S. Department of Justice are required to file a Pro Hac Vice application;no filing fee is required. (et) (Entered: 01/21/2014)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 1/21/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                  NOTICE OF FILING FEE DUE on Pro Hac Vice Application mailed to attorney Michael J Farnan for Counter Defendants McRO Inc, McRO Inc, Plaintiff McRO Inc. Pro Hac Vice application has not been received by the court. Please return your completed Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case, form G-64, or a copy of the Notice of Electronic Filing of your application and the $325.00 fee and this notice immediately. Out-of-state federal government attorneys who are not employed by the U.S. Department of Justice are required to file a Pro Hac Vice application;no filing fee is required. (et) (Entered: 01/21/2014)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 1/21/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                    NOTICE OF FILING FEE DUE on Pro Hac Vice Application mailed to attorney Mark S Raskin for Counter Defendants McRO Inc, McRO Inc, Plaintiff McRO Inc. Pro Hac Vice application has not been received by the court. Please return your completed Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case, form G-64, or a copy of the Notice of Electronic Filing of your application and the $325.00 fee and this notice immediately. Out-of-state federal government attorneys who are not employed by the U.S. Department of Justice are required to file a Pro Hac Vice application;no filing fee is required. (et) (Entered: 01/21/2014)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 1/21/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                      NOTICE OF FILING FEE DUE on Pro Hac Vice Application mailed to attorney Brian E Farnan for Counter Defendants McRO Inc, McRO Inc, Plaintiff McRO Inc. Pro Hac Vice application has not been received by the court. Please return your completed Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case, form G-64, or a copy of the Notice of Electronic Filing of your application and the $325.00 fee and this notice immediately. Out-of-state federal government attorneys who are not employed by the U.S. Department of Justice are required to file a Pro Hac Vice application;no filing fee is required. (et) (Entered: 01/21/2014)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 1/21/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                        NOTICE OF RECEIPT OF CASE TRANSFERRED-IN: Formerly Case Number: 1:13-cv-01756-LPS-CJB from USDC District of Delaware (Wilmington). The above-referenced case has been transferred to this district and assigned the above civil case number 2:14-00439 GHK (MANx). (Attachments: # 1 CV 18 Notice of Assignment to United States Judges)(et) (Entered: 01/21/2014)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 1/21/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                          ORIGINAL file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received from Delaware (Entered: 01/21/2014)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 1/6/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                            SO ORDERED, re 16 Stipulation and Order that this action is transferred to the United States District Court for the Central District of California. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 1/6/14. (ntl) [Transferred from Delaware on 1/21/2014.] (Entered: 01/06/2014)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 12/30/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                              STIPULATION to Transfer Case to the Central District of California by McRo Inc.. (Farnan, Brian) [Transferred from Delaware on 1/21/2014.] (Entered: 12/30/2013)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 12/12/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                ANSWER to 9 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim of The Codemasters Software Company Limited by McRo Inc..(Farnan, Brian) [Transferred from Delaware on 1/21/2014.] (Entered: 12/12/2013)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 12/12/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                  ANSWER to 7 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim of Codemasters, Inc. by McRo Inc..(Farnan, Brian) [Transferred from Delaware on 1/21/2014.] (Entered: 12/12/2013)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 12/3/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                    AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint served on Steve Jones, Credit Controller of The Codemasters Software Company Limited on 11/5/2013, filed by McRo Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Farnan, Brian) [Transferred from Delaware on 1/21/2014.] (Entered: 12/03/2013)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 12/3/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                      MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney John F. Bennett - filed by Codemasters Inc., Codemasters Software Company Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Certification, # 2 Proposed Order)Motions referred to Christopher J. Burke.(Deeney, Whitney) [Transferred from Delaware on 1/21/2014.] (Entered: 12/03/2013)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 12/3/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                        MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney David A. Mancino - filed by Codemasters Inc., Codemasters Software Company Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Certification, # 2 Proposed Order)Motions referred to Christopher J. Burke.(Deeney, Whitney) [Transferred from Delaware on 1/21/2014.] (Entered: 12/03/2013)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 12/3/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                          MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Kevin W. Kirsch - filed by Codemasters Inc., Codemasters Software Company Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Certification, # 2 Proposed Order)Motions referred to Christopher J. Burke.(Deeney, Whitney) [Transferred from Delaware on 1/21/2014.] (Entered: 12/03/2013)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 11/26/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                            ANSWER to 1 Complaint, with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM against McRo Inc. by Codemasters Software Company Limited.(Taylor, James) [Transferred from Delaware on 1/21/2014.] (Entered: 11/26/2013)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 11/18/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                              Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1 filed by Codemasters Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Codemasters USA Group, Inc. for Codemasters Inc., Codemasters Inc... (Deeney, Whitney) [Transferred from Delaware on 1/21/2014.] (Entered: 11/18/2013)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 11/18/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                ANSWER to 1 Complaint, with Jury Demand and Affirmative Defenses of Codemasters, Inc., COUNTERCLAIM against McRo Inc. by Codemasters Inc..(Deeney, Whitney) [Transferred from Delaware on 1/21/2014.] (Entered: 11/18/2013)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 11/4/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                  ORAL ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Christopher J. Burke: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the above captioned case is referred to Magistrate Judge Christopher J. Burke to hear and resolve all pretrial matters, up to and including the resolution of case-dispositive motions, subject to 28 U.S.C. § 636(b) and any further Order of the Court; all subsequent filings in this action shall be captioned as follows: Civil Action No. 13-1756-LPS-CJB. ORDERED by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 11/4/13. (ntl) [Transferred from Delaware on 1/21/2014.] (Entered: 11/04/2013)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 10/31/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                    MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Mark S. Raskin - filed by McRo Inc.. (Farnan, Brian) [Transferred from Delaware on 1/21/2014.] (Entered: 10/31/2013)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 10/29/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                      SUMMONS Returned Executed by McRo Inc.. Codemasters Inc. served on 10/28/2013, answer due 11/18/2013. (Farnan, Brian) [Transferred from Delaware on 1/21/2014.] (Entered: 10/29/2013)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 10/25/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                        Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) US 6,307,576 B1; US 6,611,278 B2;. (els) [Transferred from Delaware on 1/21/2014.] (Entered: 10/28/2013)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 10/25/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                          Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (els) [Transferred from Delaware on 1/21/2014.] (Entered: 10/28/2013)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 10/25/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                            COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT filed with Jury Demand against Codemasters Inc., Codemasters Software Company Limited - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-1394736.) - filed by McRo Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Civil Cover Sheet)(els) [Transferred from Delaware on 1/21/2014.] (Entered: 10/28/2013)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                              Statistics

                                                                                                                              This case has been viewed 105 times.

                                                                                                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                              Space
                                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                               
                                                                                                                              PlainSite
                                                                                                                              Sign Up
                                                                                                                              Need Password Help?