Jones v. Bloomberg et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Southern District Court, Case No. 1:14-cv-06402-KPF
District Judge Katherine Polk Failla, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 25, 2019 at 2:14 PM ST (2.3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Robert Jones, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert Jones +Pleaseu sea validnu

Toggle Switch Represented by Winston & Strawn, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jessica Greer Mary Griffith +1 215 913 1418 jgriffith@winston.com
v.
No Logo Adam Sager, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by NYC Law Department

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Tax No. 902338 Maria Fernanda DeCastro +1 212 356 2658 +1 212 356 3509 mdecastr@law.nyc.gov
No Logo City of New York Municipal Corporation "Person", Defendant
Vance, Jr., Cyrus R. Vance, Jr., Cyrus R., Defendant
Officially listed as "Cyrus Vance"
No Logo Felix Rivera, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by City of New York

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Maria Fernanda DeCastro +1 212 356 2658 +1 212 356 3509 mdecastr@law.nyc.gov
No Logo James Meehan, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by NYC Law Department

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Maria Fernanda DeCastro +1 212 356 2658 +1 212 356 3509 mdecastr@law.nyc.gov
No Logo John Doe Shield #, Defendant
No Logo Jose Criollo, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by NYC Law Department

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Shield #4076 Maria Fernanda DeCastro +1 212 356 2658 +1 212 356 3509 mdecastr@law.nyc.gov
No Logo Lauren Perry, Defendant
No Logo Manhattan Mid-Town North Pct, Defendant
Bloomberg, Michael Rubens Bloomberg, Michael Rubens, Defendant
Officially listed as "Michael Bloomberg"
No Logo P.O. Steven Mikonland, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by NYC Law Department

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Maria Fernanda DeCastro +1 212 356 2658 +1 212 356 3509 mdecastr@law.nyc.gov
No Logo Police Lieutenant Felix Rivera, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by NYC Law Department

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Tax no. 920765 Maria Fernanda DeCastro +1 212 356 2658 +1 212 356 3509 mdecastr@law.nyc.gov
No Logo Police Officer M. Koland Shiled, Defendant
No Logo Property Clerks Office, Defendant
No Logo Raymond Kelly, Defendant
No Logo Steven Mikonland, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by City of New York

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Maria Fernanda DeCastro +1 212 356 2658 +1 212 356 3509 mdecastr@law.nyc.gov
No Logo Thornton Gregory, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by NYC Law Department

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Tzx No. 919777 Maria Fernanda DeCastro +1 212 356 2658 +1 212 356 3509 mdecastr@law.nyc.gov
New York City Law Department New York City Law Department, Interested Party

Toggle Switch Represented by NYC Law Department

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Maria Fernanda DeCastro +1 212 356 2658 +1 212 356 3509 mdecastr@law.nyc.gov
Citation Section 42 U.S.C. § 1983
Nature of Suit 550 - Prisoner Petitions: Civil Rights
Office Foley Square
Filed 8/4/2014
Jury Demand Defendant
Demand
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition Judgment - Motion Before Trial
County Queens
Terminated 1/17/2018
Origin 4
Reopened 6/30/2015
Lead Case
None
Related Case
None
Other Court Case None
Defendant Custody Status
Flags CLOSED,ECF,PRO-SE
  Entries (188) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 3/5/2018, Entered: 3/5/2018 Taxation of Costs
TAXATION OF COSTS: as to [144] Bill of Costs Notice of Taxation. Costs are taxed on March 5, 2018, in favor of Det. Joe Criollo, Det. James Meehan, P.O. Steven Mikolanda, et al., against Robert Jones in the amount of $809.92. Done on submission, no objections filed.(dt)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Blank  Bill of Costs Hearing
    Minute Entry Bill of Costs: Done on submission March 5, 2018, no objections filed. (dt)
      LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 144 Filed: 2/16/2018, Entered: 2/16/2018 Bill of Costs Notice of Taxation
      BILL OF COSTS NOTICE OF TAXATION to recover costs against All Plaintiffs. Document filed by James Meehan, Steven Mikonland, Jose Criollo, Thornton Gregory, Adam Sager, John Doe Shield #, Felix Rivera. The Clerk may tax costs 14 days after this filing. Objections to Bill of Costs due by 3/2/2018 (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit in Support, # (2) Exhibit A, # (3) Exhibit B, # (4) Exhibit C, # (5) Exhibit D, # (6) Exhibit E)(Decastro, Maria) Modified on 2/20/2018 (dt).
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Blank  Received Returned Mail
        Received returned mail re: [143] Clerk's Judgment. Mail was addressed to Robert Jones BRC Center/ Homeless Services 146 Clay Street Brooklyn, NY and was returned for the following reason(s): Return to Sender, attempted not known, unable to forward. (rro)
          LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 1/17/2018, Entered: 1/17/2018 clerk's judgment
          CLERK'S JUDGMENT: It is, ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED: That for the reasons stated in the Court's Opinion and Order dated January 16, 2018, Plaintiff's motion for summary judgment is denied, Defendants' cross-motion for summary judgment is granted, and Plaintiff's causes of actions are dismissed with prejudice; accordingly, the case is closed. (Signed by Clerk of Court Ruby Krajick on 1/17/2018) (Attachments: # (1) Right to Appeal)(km)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Blank  Mail Order by Certified Mail
            Mailed a copy of [143] Clerk's Judgment to Robert Jones, BRC Center/ Homeless Services, 146 Clay Street, Brooklyn, NY. (mhe)
              LREF
              Blank  Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk
              Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk. Transmitted re: [143] Clerk's Judgment to the Docket Assistant Clerk for case processing. (km)
                LREF
                Blank  Terminate Transcript Deadlines
                Terminate Transcript Deadlines (km)
                  LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 1/16/2018, Entered: 1/17/2018 Memorandum and OpinionCourt Filing
                  OPINION AND ORDER re: [109] MOTION for Summary Judgment. filed by Robert Jones, [118] MOTION for Summary Judgment . filed by Thornton Gregory, Felix Rivera, Jose Criollo, Steven Mikonland, Adam Sager, James Meehan. For the foregoing reasons, Plaintiffs motion for summary judgment is DENIED, Defendants' cross-motion for summary judgment is GRANTED, and Plaintiff's causes of actions are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate all pending motions, adjourn all remaining dates, and close this case. So ordered(Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 1/16/2018) Sent by First Class Mail(js)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Blank  Transmission to Orders and Judgments Clerk
                    Transmission to Judgments and Orders Clerk. Transmitted re: [142] Memorandum & Opinion,,, to the Judgments and Orders Clerk. (js)
                      LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 1/11/2018, Entered: 1/15/2018 letterCourt Filing
                      LETTER addressed to Judge Katherine Polk Failla from Robert Jones, dated 1/1/18 re: Plaintiff submits this letter with attached Police End of Complaint Report(Exhibit A); and he also gives his new address at BRC Center/ Homeless Services, 146 Clay Street, Brooklyn, New York. Document filed by Robert Jones.(sc)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 12/28/2017, Entered: 12/29/2017 letterCourt Filing
                        LETTER addressed to Judge Katherine Polk Failla from Robert Jones, dated 12/18/17 re: Plaintiff gives his current address to the Court as follows: DIN# 17A5019, Downstate Corr. Facility, Box F, Red Schoolhouse Road, Fishkill, N.Y. 12524-0445; and he requests that his mail be held in abeyance, because he is scheduled to be released in a matter of days. Document filed by Robert Jones.(sc)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 12/19/2017, Entered: 12/20/2017 Memo EndorsementCourt Filing
                          MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: [138] Letter request for the appointment of Pro-Bono Counsel, filed by Robert Jones. ENDORSEMENT: Application DENIED. Summary judgment briefing in this case is complete, and Plaintiff therefore has no need for counsel at this time. Should this case proceed beyond summary judgment, Plaintiff may renew his motion for appointment of counsel. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 12/19/17) Copies Mailed By Chambers. (yv)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 12/18/2017, Entered: 12/18/2017 letterCourt Filing
                            LETTER addressed to Judge Katherine Polk Failla from Robert Jones, dated 11/27/17 re: PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR APPOINTMENT OF COUNSEL UNDER PRO BONO IN THE MATTER OF JONES V. MEEHAN ETC. Document filed by Robert Jones.(sc)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 11/17/2017, Entered: 11/17/2017 Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                              REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: [118] MOTION for Summary Judgment . . Document filed by Jose Criollo, Thornton Gregory, James Meehan, Steven Mikonland, Felix Rivera, Adam Sager. (Decastro, Maria)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 11/2/2017, Entered: 11/2/2017 order on motion for miscellaneous reliefCourt Filing
                                ORDER denying [133] Motion for Summay Judgment re: [133] MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM SUMMARY JUDGMENT FED.R.CIV.P. 60(b) JONES V. MEEHAN. Accordingly, Plaintiff's motion for relief from summary judgment is DENIED.The Clerk of Court is ordered to terminate docket entry number 133. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 11/2/2017) Copies Sent By Chambers. (js)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 11/1/2017, Entered: 11/1/2017 response in opposition to motion
                                  (Response)PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO THE DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT FED.R.CIV.P. 56(c). LOCAL CIVIL RULE 56.1 STATEMENT; re: [118] MOTION for Summary Judgment . Document filed by Robert Jones. (sc)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 11/1/2017, Entered: 11/1/2017 Affidavit
                                    AFFIDAVIT of Robert Jones; re: of Sworn Statement & Undisputed Facts based on personal knowledge etc. Document filed by Robert Jones. (sc)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 11/1/2017, Entered: 11/1/2017, Terminated: 11/2/2017 motion for miscellaneous relief
                                      MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM SUMMARY JUDGMENT FED.R.CIV.P. 60(b) JONES V. MEEHAN. Document filed by Robert Jones.(sc)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 11/1/2017, Entered: 11/1/2017 letterCourt Filing
                                        LETTER addressed to Judge Katherine Polk Failla from Robert Jones dated 10/25/17 re: (PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM SUMMARY JUDGMENT FED.R.CIV.P. 60(b)) -Plaintiff requests that the Court schedule a telephone conference etc. Document filed by Robert Jones.(sc)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 10/17/2017, Entered: 10/18/2017 OrderCourt Filing
                                          ORDER: Accordingly, Docket Entries #128 and #130 are amended to reflect that the Court shall consider Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment. In addition, because Defendants Motion for Summary Judgment is no longer unopposed and thus not fully briefed, Defendants may file a response to Plaintiffs Opposition by November 17, 2017. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 10/17/2017) Copies Sent By Chambers. (js)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 10/17/2017, Entered: 10/17/2017 OrderCourt Filing
                                            ORDER: The Court is in receipt of Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment. (Dkt. #129). Despite the deference due to pro se litigants such as Plaintiff, this filing is untimely. The Court has granted several extensions of the briefing schedule in this case: Plaintiff's response to Defendants' motion was initially due February 20, 2017 (Dkt. #86), and after a series of extensions, eventually became due September 6, 2017 (Dkt. #125). Plaintiff's Opposition was postmarked almost two weeks after this deadline, on September 18, 2017. (See Dkt. #129). Given this substantially tardy filing along with the Court's prior order considering Defendants' summary judgment submissions unopposed in light of Plaintiff's failure to timely respond (Dkt. #128), the Court shall not consider Plaintiff's opposition while ruling on the parties' cross motions for summary judgment. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 10/17/2017) Copies Mailed By Chambers. (mro)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Blank  ***Set/Reset Deadlines
                                              Set/Reset Deadlines: Responses due by 11/17/2017 (js)
                                                LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 10/13/2017, Entered: 10/16/2017 Affirmation in Opposition to Motion
                                                (Affirmation)PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT FED.R.CIV.P. 56(c) ETC., re: [118] MOTION for Summary Judgment . Document filed by Robert Jones. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit, # (2) Exhibit)(sc)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 10/10/2017, Entered: 10/10/2017 Memo EndorsementCourt Filing
                                                  MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: [127] Letter, filed by Thornton Gregory, Felix Rivera, Jose Criollo, Steven Mikonland, Adam Sager, James Meehan. ENDORSEMENT: Application GRANTED. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 10/10/2017) Copies Mailed By Chambers. (mro)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 10/9/2017, Entered: 10/9/2017 letterCourt Filing
                                                    LETTER addressed to Judge Katherine Polk Failla from Maria DeCastro dated October 9, 2017 re: Defendants write respectfully to request that the Court treat their Motion for Summary Judgment pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 56 as both unopposed and fully submitted, and accordingly, proceed to its consideration.. Document filed by Jose Criollo, Thornton Gregory, James Meehan, Steven Mikonland, Felix Rivera, Adam Sager.(Decastro, Maria)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 9/27/2017, Entered: 9/27/2017 Exhibit
                                                      SUPPLEMENTAL EXHIBIT "L". Document filed by Robert Jones.(sc)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 8/22/2017, Entered: 8/22/2017 Memo EndorsementCourt Filing
                                                        MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: [124] Letter filed by Robert Jones. ENDORSEMENT: Application GRANTED. Plaintiff must file his reply brief by September 6, 2017. Defendants must file their reply brief by October 6, 2017. (Responses due by 9/6/2017, Replies due by 10/6/2017.) (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 8/22/2017) Copies Mailed By Chambers. (ras)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 8/22/2017, Entered: 8/22/2017 letterCourt Filing
                                                          LETTER addressed to Judge Katherine Polk Failla from Robert Jones dated 8/16/2017 re: Plaintiff writes to request an extension of time to reply to defendants Motion for Summary Judgment. Document filed by Robert Jones.(js)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 7/17/2017, Entered: 7/17/2017 Rule 56.1 Statement
                                                            RULE 56.1 STATEMENT. Document filed by Jose Criollo, Thornton Gregory, James Meehan, Steven Mikonland, Felix Rivera, Adam Sager. (Decastro, Maria)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 7/17/2017, Entered: 7/17/2017 Declaration in Support of Motion
                                                              DECLARATION of Maria DeCastro in Support re: [118] MOTION for Summary Judgment .. Document filed by Jose Criollo, Thornton Gregory, James Meehan, Steven Mikonland, Felix Rivera, Adam Sager. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit C, # (4) Exhibit D, # (5) Exhibit E, # (6) Exhibit F, # (7) Exhibit G, # (8) Exhibit H PART I, # (9) Exhibit H PART II, # (10) Exhibit I, # (11) Exhibit J, # (12) Exhibit K, # (13) Exhibit L, # (14) Exhibit M, # (15) Exhibit N, # (16) Exhibit O, # (17) Exhibit P, # (18) Exhibit Q, # (19) Exhibit R, # (20) Exhibit S, # (21) Exhibit T, # (22) Exhibit V, # (23) Exhibit W, # (24) Exhibit X, # (25) Exhibit Y, # (26) Exhibit Z, # (27) Exhibit AA, # (28) Exhibit BB, # (29) Exhibit CC, # (30) Exhibit DD, # (31) Exhibit EE, # (32) Exhibit FF, # (33) Exhibit GG, # (34) Exhibit HH, # (35) Exhibit II, # (36) Exhibit JJ, # (37) Exhibit KK, # (38) Exhibit LL, # (39) Exhibit MM, # (40) Exhibit NN, # (41) Exhibit OO, # (42) Exhibit PP, # (43) Exhibit QQ, # (44) Exhibit U)(Decastro, Maria)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 7/17/2017, Entered: 7/17/2017 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                                                                MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: [118] MOTION for Summary Judgment . DEFENDANTS MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT OF THEIR MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. Document filed by Jose Criollo, Thornton Gregory, James Meehan, Steven Mikonland, Felix Rivera, Adam Sager. (Decastro, Maria)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 7/17/2017, Entered: 7/17/2017 Notice - other
                                                                  NOTICE of Notice Pursuant to Local Civil Rule 56.2 re: [118] MOTION for Summary Judgment .. Document filed by Jose Criollo, Thornton Gregory, James Meehan, Steven Mikonland, Felix Rivera, Adam Sager. (Decastro, Maria)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 7/17/2017, Entered: 7/17/2017 Counter Statement to Rule 56.1
                                                                    COUNTER STATEMENT TO Document filed by Jose Criollo, Thornton Gregory, James Meehan, Steven Mikonland, Felix Rivera, Adam Sager. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A)(Decastro, Maria)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 7/17/2017, Entered: 7/17/2017, Terminated: 1/16/2018 Motion for summary judgment
                                                                      MOTION for Summary Judgment . Document filed by Jose Criollo, Thornton Gregory, James Meehan, Steven Mikonland, Felix Rivera, Adam Sager.(Decastro, Maria)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 7/5/2017, Entered: 7/5/2017 Order on motion for extension of timeCourt Filing
                                                                        ORDER granting [116] SECOND LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time Defendants write respectfully to request an additional one week extension of time to submit defendants' opposition to plaintiff's motion for summary judgment and defendants' motion for summary judgment, from July 10, 2017, until July 17, 2017, and a corresponding revision of the current motion schedule. This is defendants' second such request. addressed to Judge Katherine Polk Failla. Document filed by Jose Criollo, Thornton Gregory, Steven Mikonland, Felix Rivera, Adam Sager. Application GRANTED. The parties may adhere to the briefing schedule Defendants have proposed in their letter. No further extension requests will be permitted. So ordered. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 7/5/2017) Copies Mailed By Chambers. (rjm)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Blank  ***Set/Reset Deadlines
                                                                          Set/Reset Deadlines: Responses due by 8/25/2017. Replies due by 9/25/2017. (rjm)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 7/3/2017, Entered: 7/3/2017, Terminated: 7/5/2017 MOTION for Extension of TimeCourt Filing
                                                                            SECOND LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time Defendants write respectfully to request an additional one week extension of time to submit defendants opposition to plaintiffs motion for summary judgment and defendants motion for summary judgment, from July 10, 2017, until July 17, 2017, and a corresponding revision of the current motion schedule. This is defendants second such request. addressed to Judge Katherine Polk Failla. Document filed by Jose Criollo, Thornton Gregory, Steven Mikonland, Felix Rivera, Adam Sager.(Decastro, Maria)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 6/20/2017, Entered: 6/21/2017 Order on motion for extension of time to file Response/ReplyCourt Filing
                                                                              ORDER granting [114] Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Application GRANTED. The parties may adhere to the briefing schedule Defendants have proposed in their letter. Responses due by 8/18/2017 Replies due by 9/18/2017. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 6/20/2017) Copies Mailed by Chambers. (mro)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 6/20/2017, Entered: 6/20/2017, Terminated: 6/20/2017 motion for extension of time to file response/replyCourt Filing
                                                                                LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to [109] MOTION for Summary Judgment. Defendants write respectfully to request an extension of time to submit defendants opposition to plaintiffs motion for summary judgment and defendants motion for summary judgment from June 26, 2017, until July 10, 2017, and a corresponding revision of the current motion schedule. addressed to Judge Katherine Polk Failla from Maria DeCastro. Document filed by Jose Criollo, Thornton Gregory, James Meehan, Steven Mikonland, Felix Rivera, Adam Sager.(Decastro, Maria)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Blank  ***Set/Reset Deadlines
                                                                                  Set/Reset Deadlines: Motions due by 7/10/2017. (mro)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 6/19/2017, Entered: 6/19/2017 letterCourt Filing
                                                                                    LETTER addressed to Judge Katherine Polk Failla from Robert Jones dated 6/12/2017 re: Defendant's request for extension. Document filed by Robert Jones. ***Docket and file instructions from chambers. (tn)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 6/15/2017, Entered: 6/15/2017 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                      ORDER: The Court is in receipt of a letter from Plaintiff dated June 6, 2017. Because this letter concerns Plaintiff's discussions with his counsel in another case, it is not relevant to Plaintiff's case before this Court and the Court will not consider it. The Court will return Plaintiff's letter and a copy of this Order to Plaintiff by first class mail. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 6/15/2017) Copies Mailed By Chambers. (ap)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 6/14/2017, Entered: 6/14/2017 Notice of Filing Transcript
                                                                                        NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a CONFERENCE proceeding held on 5/12/17 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(McGuirk, Kelly)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 6/14/2017, Entered: 6/14/2017 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                          TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: CONFERENCE held on 5/12/2017 before Judge Katherine Polk Failla. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Karen Gorlaski, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 7/5/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/17/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/12/2017.(McGuirk, Kelly)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 6/2/2017, Entered: 6/5/2017 Motion for summary judgment
                                                                                            MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. Document filed by Robert Jones. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit, # (2) Exhibit, # (3) Exhibit)(sc)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 5/12/2017, Entered: 5/12/2017 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                              ORDER: As was discussed on the record in a telephonic conference held today, May 12, 2017, the Court hereby extends the briefing schedule for the parties' contemplated cross-motions for summary judgment nunc pro tunc. The Court understands that Plaintiff will mail his motion for summary judgment at his earliest convenience, on or around May 15, 2017. The Court anticipates that the Court and Defendants will receive this motion by May 22, 2017. Therefore, Defendants must file their contemplated motion for summary judgment and Opposition to Plaintiff's motion by June 26, 2017. Plaintiff may file his reply by July 31, 2017; and Defendants may file their reply by August 21, 2017. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 5/12/2017) Copies Mailed By Chambers. (ap) Modified on 6/2/2017 (ap).
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Blank  ***Set/Reset Deadlines
                                                                                                Set/Reset Deadlines: Motions due by 6/26/2017. (ap)
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Blank  Telephone Conference
                                                                                                  Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Katherine Polk Failla: Telephone Conference held on 5/12/2017. (Court Reporter Karen Gorlaski) (Lopez, Jose)
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Blank  ***Set/Reset Deadlines
                                                                                                    Set/Reset Deadlines: Motions due by 5/22/2017. Responses due by 7/31/2017. Replies due by 8/21/2017. (ap)
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 4/12/2017, Entered: 4/12/2017 Notice of Filing Transcript
                                                                                                      NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Conference proceeding held on 3/3/17 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(Siwik, Christine)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 4/12/2017, Entered: 4/12/2017 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                        TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: Conference held on 3/3/2017 before Judge Katherine Polk Failla. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Kristen Carannante, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 5/3/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/15/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/11/2017.(Siwik, Christine)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Blank  Telephone Conference
                                                                                                          Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Katherine Polk Failla: Telephone Conference held on 3/23/2017. (Court Reporter Kristen Carannante) (Lopez, Jose)
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 3/15/2017, Entered: 3/15/2017 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                            ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED: (1) that the Superintendent or other official in charge of the Robert N. Davoren Complex, located in East Elmhurst, New York, produce inmate Robert Jones, B&C No. 141-15-02468, at a location within the facility for the taking of his deposition on April 10, 2017, at 10:00 A.M. and for so long thereafter as the deposition continues; (2) that plaintiff appear in such place as designated by the Superintendent or other official in charge of the Robert N. Davoren Complex so that his deposition may be taken; and that a court reporter designated by defendants be allowed to bring stenography equipment into the Robert N. Davoren Complex at the above-reference time in order to transcribe the deposition. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 3/15/2017) Copies Mailed By Chambers. (cla)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 3/15/2017, Entered: 3/15/2017 Order on motion for discoveryCourt Filing
                                                                                                              ORDER granting [103] Letter Motion for Discovery. Application GRANTED. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 3/15/2017) Copies Mailed By Chambers. (cla) .
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 3/15/2017, Entered: 3/15/2017, Terminated: 3/15/2017 motion for discoveryCourt Filing
                                                                                                                FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - LETTER MOTION for Discovery Defendants write respectfully to request that the Court endorse the enclosed proposed order directing that the Superintendent or other official in charge of the Robert N. Davoren Complex produce plaintiff at a location within the facility for the taking of his deposition on April 10, 2017. addressed to Judge Katherine Polk Failla from Maria DeCastro dated March 15, 2017. Document filed by Jose Criollo, Thornton Gregory, James Meehan, Steven Mikonland, Felix Rivera, Adam Sager.(Decastro, Maria) Modified on 4/19/2017 (db).
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Blank  ***Set/Reset Deadlines
                                                                                                                  Set/Reset Deadlines: Deposition due by 4/10/2017. (cla)
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Blank  ***Set/Reset Deadlines
                                                                                                                    Set/Reset Deadlines: Discovery due by 4/10/2017. (cla)
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 3/8/2017, Entered: 3/8/2017 protective orderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                      ORDER OF CONFIDENTIALITY...regarding procedures to be followed that shall govern the handling of confidential material... (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 3/8/2017) Copies Mailed By Chambers. (cla)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 3/7/2017, Entered: 3/7/2017, Terminated: 3/8/2017 Motion for protective order
                                                                                                                        FILING ERROR - ELECTRONIC FILING FOR NON-ECF DOCUMENT - MOTION for Protective Order . Document filed by Jose Criollo, Thornton Gregory, James Meehan, Steven Mikonland, Felix Rivera, Adam Sager.(Decastro, Maria) Modified on 4/13/2017 (ldi).
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 3/3/2017, Entered: 3/3/2017 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                          ORDER: As was discussed on the record in a telephonic conference held today, March 3, 2017, the Court hereby extends the briefing schedule for the parties' contemplated cross-motions for summary judgment by roughly 60 days. Plaintiff must file his contemplated Motion for Summary Judgment on or before April 25, 2017; Defendants must file their contemplated Motion for Summary Judgment and Opposition to Plaintiff's motion by May 25, 2017; Plaintiff may file his reply by June 23, 2017; and Defendants may file their reply by July 17, 2017. (Motions due by 5/25/2017., Responses due by 5/25/2017, Replies due by 7/17/2017.) (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 3/3/2017) Copies Mailed By Chambers. (cla)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 2/27/2017, Entered: 2/27/2017 Order on Motion for conferenceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                            ORDER granting [98] Letter Motion for Conference; granting [98] Letter Motion to Stay. Application GRANTED. The parties are directed to appear for a telephonic conference on March 3, 2017, at 10:00 AM. The Warden of the Robert N. Davoren Complex is hereby ORDERED to produce Plaintiff for this conference. The briefing schedule for the parties' motions for summary judgment is stayed pending the resolution of the issues described in Plaintiff's letter at the March 3 conference. ( Telephone Conference set for 3/3/2017 at 10:00 AM before Judge Katherine Polk Failla.) (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 2/27/2017) Copies Mailed by Chambers. (mro)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 2/24/2017, Entered: 2/24/2017, Terminated: 2/27/2017 Motion for Conference
                                                                                                                              MOTION for Conference The parties write jointly to respectfully request a conference in order to discuss purported deficiencies in defendants discovery productions, and to request that the briefing schedule for the parties motions for summary judgment be held in abeyance until such a conference is held.., MOTION to Stay . Document filed by Jose Criollo, Thornton Gregory, James Meehan, Steven Mikonland, Felix Rivera, Adam Sager.(Decastro, Maria)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 97 Filed: 2/6/2017, Entered: 2/6/2017 Sealed document
                                                                                                                                SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(mps)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 2/6/2017, Entered: 2/6/2017 Order on motion for discoveryCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting [95] Letter Motion for Discovery. Upon the application of defendants for leave to take the deposition of plaintiff Robert Jones, an inmate within the New York City Department of Correction: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED: (1) that the Superintendent or other official in charge of the Robert N. Davoren Complex, located in East Elmhurst, New York, produce inmate Robert Jones, B&C No. 141-15-02468, at a location within the facility for the taking of his deposition on February 22, 2017, at 10:00 A.M. and for so long thereafter as the deposition continues; and (2) that plaintiff appear in such place as designated by the Superintendent or other official in charge of the Robert N. Davoren Complex so that his deposition may be taken. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 2/6/2017) (mro)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 2/6/2017, Entered: 2/6/2017, Terminated: 2/6/2017 motion for discoveryCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                    FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - LETTER MOTION for Discovery Defendants write respectfully to request that the Court endorse the enclosed proposed order directing that the Superintendent or other official in charge of the Robert N. Davoren Complex produce plaintiff at a location within the facility for the taking of his deposition on February 22, 2017. addressed to Judge Katherine Polk Failla from Maria DeCastro dated February 6, 2017. Document filed by Jose Criollo, Thornton Gregory, James Meehan, Steven Mikonland, Felix Rivera, Adam Sager.(Decastro, Maria) Modified on 2/23/2017 (db).
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Blank  ***Set/Reset Deadlines
                                                                                                                                      Set/Reset Deadlines: Deposition due by 2/22/2017. (mro)
                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 1/31/2017, Entered: 2/1/2017 Endorsed LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                        MEMO ENDORSED ON LETTER addressed to Judge Katherine Polk Failla from Maria Fernanda Decastro dated 1/30/2017 re: Unfortunately, the New York Police Department cannot provide any documents regarding IA Log No. 98-15144. This is because, upon information and belief, all of the files for incidents that occurred prior to 2003 that were investigated by Patrol Borough Manhattan South Investigation Unit, the investigations unit that investigated IA Log No. 98-15144, were destroyed during a flood. Accordingly, this office is not able to provide the Court with any file related to IA Log No. 98-15144, nor can this office definitively state whether a file was ever created for IA Log No. 98-15144. ENDORSEMENT: The Court is in receipt of this letter and the disciplinary files produced for the Court's ex parte review. The Court has conducted a thorough review of the produced files. Mindful of Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(b)(1), the Court does not find that these disciplinary records are within the scope of discovery in this case. Defendants do not need to produce the files to Plaintiff, and the Court will file its copies of the files under seal. The schedule previously set for the briefing of the parties' contemplated summary judgment motions is therefore unaltered: Plaintiff may have until February 24, 2017 to file his contemplated Motion for Summary Judgment. Defendants may have until March 27, 2017, to file their Motion for Summary Judgment and Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion. Plaintiff's reply is due by April 26, 2017, and Defendant's reply by May 17, 2017. ( Motions due by 3/27/2017., Responses due by 3/27/2017, Replies due by 5/17/2017.) (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 1/31/2017) (js)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 1/30/2017, Entered: 1/30/2017 letterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                          LETTER addressed to Judge Katherine Polk Failla from Maria DeCastro dated January 30, 2017 re: Defendants write respectfully to provide the Court with a status update as to IA Log No. 98-15144.. Document filed by Jose Criollo, Thornton Gregory, James Meehan, Steven Mikonland, Felix Rivera, Adam Sager.(Decastro, Maria)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 1/20/2017, Entered: 1/20/2017 Order on motion for extension of timeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting [91] Letter Motion for Extension of Time: Application GRANTED. Though the Court would have preferred that this extension request was made sooner than today -- several days after the expiration of Defendants' production deadline -- Defendants may have until January 30, 2017, to file their contemplated status update. In the meantime, Defendants are directed to provide the Court with those materials that have been procured, so that the Court may begin its in camera review thereof and avoid further delay. The Court will also extend the parties briefing schedule by two weeks as follows: Plaintiff may have until February 24, 2017 to file his contemplated Motion for Summary Judgment. Defendants may have until March 27, 2017, to file their Motion for Summary Judgment and Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion. Plaintiff's reply is due by April 26, 2017, and Defendant's reply by May 17, 2017. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 1/20/2017) Copies Mailed By Chambers. (tn)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 1/20/2017, Entered: 1/20/2017, Terminated: 1/20/2017 MOTION for Extension of TimeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                              LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time Defendants write respectfully to request an extension of time until January 30, 2017, to update the Court on the status of one of the five disciplinary files that the Court ordered for in camera review. addressed to Judge Katherine Polk Failla from Maria DeCastro dated January 20, 2017. Document filed by Jose Criollo, Thornton Gregory, James Meehan, Steven Mikonland, Felix Rivera, Adam Sager.(Decastro, Maria)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Blank  ***Set/Reset Deadlines
                                                                                                                                                Set/Reset Deadlines: Motions due by 3/27/2017. Responses due by 3/27/2017. Replies due by 5/17/2017. (tn)
                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 12/15/2016, Entered: 12/16/2016 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                  ORDER: To allow Defendants adequate time for this production, the Court hereby extends the briefing deadline set in its October 28 Order as follows: (i) Defendants must further supplement their responses to Plaintiff's interrogatories on or before January 16, 2017; and (ii) Plaintiff must file his contemplated Motion for Summary Judgment on or before February 10, 2017; Defendants must file their contemplated Motion for Summary Judgment and Opposition to Plaintiff's motion by March 13, 2017; Plaintiff may file his reply by April 12, 2017; and Defendants may file their reply by May 3, 2017. Motions due by 2/10/2017. Responses due by 3/13/2017 Replies due by 5/3/2017. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 12/15/2016) Copies Mailed By Chambers. (kgo)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 12/1/2016, Entered: 12/1/2016 Notice of Filing Transcript
                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a CONFERNECE proceeding held on 10/28/16 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(McGuirk, Kelly)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 12/1/2016, Entered: 12/1/2016 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                      TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: conference held on 10/28/2016 before Judge Katherine Polk Failla. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Vincent Bologna, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 12/22/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/1/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/1/2017.(McGuirk, Kelly)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 11/22/2016, Entered: 11/22/2016 letterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                        LETTER addressed to Judge Katherine Polk Failla from Robert Jones dated 5/12/2016 re: I am the above named Plaintiff as held in the matter of Jones v. Meehan 1:14-cv-06402 (KPF)(MHD). Whereby, On March 20, 2016 Plaintiff did effectively serve on defendants Counsel Maria Decastro, Assistant Corporation City of New York, Law Department. Demand For Remedy under certified mail receipt #7014-2870-0000-4246-0906, and as further specified in this letter. (rjm)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 10/28/2016, Entered: 10/31/2016 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                          ORDER: Plaintiff must file his contemplated Motion for Summary Judgment on or before December 30, 2016; his briefing may not exceed 25 pages; Defendants must file their contemplated Motion for Summary Judgment and Opposition to Plaintiff's motion by January 27, 2017; their briefing may not exceed 35 pages; Plaintiff may file his Reply Brief in Further Support of His Motion and His Opposition to Defendants' Motion by February 20, 2017; his briefing may not exceed 25 pages; and Defendants may file their Reply Brief in Further Support of Their Motion by March 10, 2017; their briefing may not exceed 15 pages. (As further set forth in this Order.) (Motions due by 1/27/2017., Responses due by 1/27/2017, Replies due by 3/10/2017.) (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 10/28/2016) Copies Mailed By Chambers (cf)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Blank  Telephone Conference
                                                                                                                                                            Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Katherine Polk Failla: Telephone Conference held on 10/28/2016. (Court Reporter Vincent Bologna) (Lopez, Jose)
                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 10/14/2016, Entered: 10/14/2016 Order on Motion to Adjourn ConferenceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting [84] Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference. Application GRANTED. The Telephone Conference presently scheduled for October 21, 2016 at 1:00 PM is hereby adjourned to October 28, 2016, at 12:15 PM. The Warden of the Robert N. Davoren Complex is ORDERED to produce Mr. Jones for the October 28 telephone conference. Telephone Conference set for 10/28/2016 at 12:15 PM before Judge Katherine Polk Failla. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 10/14/2016) Copies Mailed by Chambers. (mro)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 10/14/2016, Entered: 10/14/2016, Terminated: 10/14/2016 Motion to Adjourn ConferenceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference addressed to Judge Katherine Polk Failla from Maria DeCastro dated October 14, 2016. Document filed by Jose Criollo, Thornton Gregory, Steven Mikonland, Felix Rivera, Adam Sager.(Decastro, Maria)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 9/26/2016, Entered: 9/26/2016 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER: the Court hereby directs the parties to appear for a telephone conference to resolve their discovery issues on Friday, October 21, 2016, at 1:00 p.m. The Warden of the Robert N. Davoren Complex is ORDERED to produce Mr. Jones for the October 21 telephone conference. (Telephone Conference set for 10/21/2016 at 01:00 PM before Judge Katherine Polk Failla.) (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 9/26/2016) Copies Mailed By Chambers. (tn) (Main Document 83 replaced on 9/26/2016) (tn). Modified on 9/26/2016 (tn).
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 9/23/2016, Entered: 9/23/2016 letterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                    LETTER addressed to Judge Katherine Polk Failla from Maria DeCastro dated September 23, 2016 re: Defendants responses and objections to plaintiff's interrogatories.. Document filed by Jose Criollo, Thornton Gregory, James Meehan, Steven Mikonland, Felix Rivera, Adam Sager. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A)(Decastro, Maria)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 9/20/2016, Entered: 9/20/2016 Notice of Filing Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Conference proceeding held on 8/11/16 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(Siwik, Christine)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 9/20/2016, Entered: 9/20/2016 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                        TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: Conference held on 8/11/2016 before Judge Katherine Polk Failla. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Andrew Walker, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 10/14/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/24/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/22/2016.(Siwik, Christine)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Blank  Telephone Conference
                                                                                                                                                                          Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Katherine Polk Failla: Telephone Conference held on 8/11/2016. (Court Reporter Andrew Walker) (Lopez, Jose)
                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 8/9/2016, Entered: 8/10/2016 letterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                            LETTER addressed to Judge Katherine Polk Failla from Robert Jones dated 6/22/2016 re: Plaintiff's letter enclosing notice of MSJ. Document filed by Robert Jones.(tn)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 8/9/2016, Entered: 8/10/2016 Answer/Response to Interrogatories
                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE to DEFENDANTS' FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES AND REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS TO PLAINTIFF. Document filed by Robert Jones.(tn)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 8/5/2016, Entered: 8/5/2016 letterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                LETTER addressed to Judge Katherine Polk Failla from Robert Jones dated 7/22/2016 re: Address change. Document filed by Robert Jones.(kgo)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 8/5/2016, Entered: 8/5/2016 Notice of Filing Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Conference proceeding held on 6/29/16 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(Siwik, Christine)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 8/5/2016, Entered: 8/5/2016 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                    TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: Conference held on 6/29/2016 before Judge Katherine Polk Failla. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Khristine Sellin, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 8/29/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/8/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/7/2016.(Siwik, Christine)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 7/28/2016, Entered: 7/29/2016 Order on Motion to Adjourn ConferenceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting [73] Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference. Application GRANTED. The telephone conference previously scheduled for August 2 is hereby ADJOURNED until August 11, 2016, at 10:00 a.m. The Warden of the Otis Bantum Correctional Center is ORDERED to produce Mr. Jones for the August 11 telephone conference. Telephone Conference set for 8/11/2016 at 10:00 AM before Judge Katherine Polk Failla. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 7/28/2016) Copies Mailed By Chambers. (cf)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 7/28/2016, Entered: 7/28/2016, Terminated: 7/28/2016 Motion to Adjourn ConferenceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                        LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference Defendants write respectfully to request an adjournment of the Telephone Conference, presently scheduled for August 2, 2016, at 10:00 a.m. Plaintiff addressed to Judge Katherine Polk Failla from Maria DeCastro dated July 28, 2016. Document filed by Jose Criollo, Thornton Gregory, James Meehan, Steven Mikonland, Felix Rivera, Adam Sager.(Decastro, Maria)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank  Telephone Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                          Minute Entry Telephone Conference set for 8/2/2016 at 10:00am. (Lopez, Jose)
                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 7/5/2016, Entered: 7/5/2016 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER: The Clerk of Court is ORDERED to terminate Jessica Greer Mary Griffith as counsel of record for Plaintiff. Attorney Jessica Greer Mary Griffith terminated. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 7/5/2016) Copies Mailed By Chambers. (tn)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank  Telephone Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                              Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Katherine Polk Failla: Telephone Conference held on 6/29/2016. (Court Reporter Khris Sellen) (Lopez, Jose)
                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 6/20/2016, Entered: 6/21/2016 Order on Motion for conferenceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting [69] Letter Motion for Conference: Defendants' request for a pre-motion conference is GRANTED. The parties must appear for a telephone conference on June 29, 2016, at 9:00 a.m. At the conference, the parties may discuss any problems they are having with the discovery process, and the Court will consider the propriety of extending discovery deadlines. The Warden of the Otis Bantum Correctional Center is ORDERED to produce Robert Jones, Reg. No. 141-15-02468, for the telephone conference on June 29, 2016, at 9:00 a.m. The parties should call the Court at (212) 805-0290 with all parties on the line. Telephone Conference set for 6/29/2016 at 09:00 AM before Judge Katherine Polk Failla. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 6/20/2016) Copies Mailed By Chambers. (tn)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 6/17/2016, Entered: 6/20/2016 letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                  LETTER from Robert Jones dated 5/30/16 re: FILING OF DEMAND FOR REMDY/NOTICE F DEFAULT CERTIFICATE OF NON-RESPONSE, NOTICE OF NON-RESPONSE AND DEFAULT JUDGMENT IN THE MATTER OF JONES V. MEEHAN ETC. Document filed by Robert Jones.(sc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 6/14/2016, Entered: 6/14/2016, Terminated: 6/20/2016 Motion for ConferenceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                    LETTER MOTION for Conference Defendants write respectfully to request (1) a pre-motion conference in order to discuss defendants anticipated motion to dismiss this action for plaintiffs failure to prosecute, and (2) that the Court stay discovery in this matter pending resolution of defendants anticipated motion for failure to prosecute. addressed to Judge Katherine Polk Failla from Maria DeCastro dated June 14, 2016., LETTER MOTION to Stay addressed to Judge Katherine Polk Failla from Maria DeCastro dated June 14, 2016. Document filed by Jose Criollo, Thornton Gregory, James Meehan, Steven Mikonland, Felix Rivera, Adam Sager.(Decastro, Maria)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 5/26/2016, Entered: 5/26/2016 letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                      LETTER from Robert Jones dated 5/3/16 re: U.S. MARSHAL SERVICE FORMS USM-285 AND A CERTIFICATE OF PROTEST. Document filed by Robert Jones.(sc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank  Request for Copies/Transcripts/Docket Sheet - Received
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request for Copy of Document Received: Re [68] Letter. Request for copy of his 42:1983 Complaintfrom Robert Jones received on 5/26/16. Transmission to Records Management for processing. (sc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 5/20/2016, Entered: 5/20/2016 Order on motion for discoveryCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting [66] Letter Motion for Discovery: Defendants' request for additional time is GRANTED. The new deadline for deposing fact witnesses is June 16, 2016. Defendants have also notified the Court that they have not yet received responses to their interrogatories and document requests. As a result, Mr. Jones must take one of the following two steps by June 10, 2016: (1) respond to Defendants' requests for information and documents; or (2) write the Court a letter explaining any trouble he is having with the discovery. The Court will also mail Mr. Jones a pamphlet with some information about the discovery process. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 5/20/2016) (tn)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank  ***Set/Reset Deadlines
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Set/Reset Deadlines: Deposition due by 6/16/2016. (tn)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 5/18/2016, Entered: 5/18/2016, Terminated: 5/20/2016 motion for discoveryCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                              SECOND LETTER MOTION for Discovery Defendants write respectfully to request that the Court (1) grant a fifteen day extension of time from June 1, 2016 to June 16, 2016 to complete depositions of fact witnesses in this matter, (2) compel plaintiff to provide responses to Defendants First Set of Interrogatories and Requests for the Production of Documents by June 6, 2016, and (3) warn plaintiff that further dilatory conduct may result in the dismissal of his claims for failure to prosecute. addressed to Judge Katherine Polk Failla from Maria DeCastro dated May 18, 2016. Document filed by Jose Criollo, Thornton Gregory, James Meehan, Steven Mikonland, Felix Rivera, Adam Sager.(Decastro, Maria)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 5/2/2016, Entered: 5/2/2016 Order on motion for discoveryCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting [64] Letter Motion for Discovery: Defendants' request for additional time is GRANTED. The new deadline for deposing fact witnesses is June 1, 2016. Defendants have also notified the Court that they have not yet received any responses to their interrogatories. Nor have they received any medical releases from Mr. Jones. Mr. Jones must make reasonable efforts to answer Defendants' interrogatories by May 16, 2016. Similarly, Mr. Jones must make reasonable efforts to sign the relevant medical releases by May 16, 2016. If Mr. Jones is having difficulty responding to Defendants, he must write the Court a letter explaining the situation. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 5/2/2016) Copies Mailed By Chambers. (tn)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank  ***Set/Reset Deadlines
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Set/Reset Deadlines: Deposition due by 6/1/2016. (tn)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 4/28/2016, Entered: 4/28/2016, Terminated: 5/2/2016 motion for discoveryCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LETTER MOTION for Discovery Defendants write respectfully to request that the Court (1) grant a thirty day extension of time from May 2, 2016 to June 1, 2016 to complete depositions of fact witnesses in this matter, and (2) compel plaintiff to provide responses to Defendants First Set of Interrogatories and Requests for the Production of Documents by May 9, 2016. addressed to Judge Katherine Polk Failla from Maria DeCastro dated April 28, 2016. Document filed by Jose Criollo, Thornton Gregory, James Meehan, Steven Mikonland, Felix Rivera, Adam Sager.(Decastro, Maria)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 4/14/2016, Entered: 4/14/2016 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER: The Court has received Plaintiff's letter requesting pro bono counsel. (Dkt. #61). After reviewing the Complaint and considering the Hodge factors, the Court concludes that it would be inappropriate to appoint pro bono counsel at this stage of the litigation. As a result, Plaintiff's application for pro bono counsel is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Plaintiff may renew his application as the litigation develops. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 4/14/2016) Copies Mailed By Chambers. (kko)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 4/12/2016, Entered: 4/12/2016 letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 4/12/2016, Entered: 4/12/2016 letterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LETTER addressed to Judge Katherine Polk Failla from Robert Jones dated 3/9/2016 re: Request for the Appointment of Pro Bono Counsel. Document filed by Robert Jones. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit)(kko)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 3/17/2016, Entered: 3/17/2016 Notice of Filing Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a conference proceeding held on 2/26/16 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(McGuirk, Kelly)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 3/17/2016, Entered: 3/17/2016 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: conference held on 2/26/2016 before Judge Katherine Polk Failla. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Jerry Harrison, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 4/11/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/21/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/20/2016.(McGuirk, Kelly)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 2/26/2016, Entered: 2/29/2016 order on motion to strikeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER denying [38] Motion to Strike: that Plaintiff's motion to strike affirmative defenses from the Answer is DENIED. The Clerk of Court is ORDERED to terminate docket entry 38. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 2/26/2016) Copies Mailed By Chambers. (tn) (Main Document 58 replaced on 3/7/2016) (tn). Modified on 3/7/2016 (tn).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 2/26/2016, Entered: 2/26/2016 Case Management Plan
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank  Telephone Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Katherine Polk Failla: Telephone Conference held on 2/26/2016. (Court Reporter Jerry Harrison) (Lopez, Jose)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 2/24/2016, Entered: 2/24/2016 letterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LETTER addressed to Judge Katherine Polk Failla from Maria DeCastro dated February 22, 2016 re: Proposed case management. Document filed by Jose Criollo, Thornton Gregory, James Meehan, Steven Mikonland, Felix Rivera, Adam Sager.(Decastro, Maria)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 2/18/2016, Entered: 2/18/2016 letterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        FIRST LETTER addressed to Judge Katherine Polk Failla from Maria DeCastro dated February 18, 2016 re: Maria Fernanda DeCastro. Document filed by Jose Criollo, Thornton Gregory, James Meehan, Steven Mikonland, Felix Rivera, Adam Sager.(Decastro, Maria)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 1/29/2016, Entered: 1/29/2016 letterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LETTER addressed to Judge Katherine Polk Failla from Maria DeCastro dated January 29, 2016 re: Defendants write respectfully in response to the Courts Order dated November 10, 2015.. Document filed by Jose Criollo, Thornton Gregory, James Meehan, Steven Mikonland, Felix Rivera, Adam Sager.(Decastro, Maria)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 1/28/2016, Entered: 1/28/2016 Brief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            BRIEF re: [51] Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File, [43] Order, Set Deadlines,,,,,,,,,, Plaintiff's Brief in Support of Applying the Heightened Standard of Pleading under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 8(a) - as Articulated in Twombly and Iqbal - to Affirmative Defenses. Document filed by Robert Jones.(Griffith, Jessica Greer)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 1/8/2016, Entered: 1/8/2016 letterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LETTER addressed to Judge Katherine Polk Failla from Robert Jones dated 12/13/2015 re: response to the Court's December 1, 2015 order. Document filed by Robert Jones.(tn)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 1/5/2016, Entered: 1/6/2016 order on motion for extension of time to fileCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting [50] Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File brief. Plaintiff's request for an extension of time is GRANTED. The parties must submit their briefs by January 29, 2016. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 1/5/2016) (cdo)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 1/5/2016, Entered: 1/5/2016, Terminated: 1/5/2016 motion for extension of time to fileCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File , request by Plaintiff and Defendants for three-week extension from 1/8/2016 to 1/29/2016 to file briefs as to whether Fed. R. Civ. P. 8(a) standard for pleadings applies to affirmative defenses, in re: 11/10/2015 Order (Dkt. # 43), addressed to Judge Katherine Polk Failla from Jessica Greer Griffith dated 1/5/2016. Document filed by Robert Jones.(Griffith, Jessica Greer)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank  ***Set/Reset Deadlines
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Set/Reset Deadlines: Brief due by 1/29/2016. (cdo)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 1/4/2016, Entered: 1/4/2016 Notice of Limited Appearance of Pro Bono Counsel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF LIMITED APPEARANCE OF PRO BONO COUNSEL for Robert Jones. (Griffith, Jessica Greer)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 1/4/2016, Entered: 1/4/2016 Notice of Limited Appearance of Pro Bono Counsel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF LIMITED APPEARANCE OF PRO BONO COUNSEL for Robert Jones. (Lawler, Richard)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 12/23/2015, Entered: 12/28/2015 Order for Initial Pretrial ConferenceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER. The initial pre-trial conference, which is currently scheduled for January 5, 2016, is hereby ADJOURNED until February 26, 2016, at 10:00 a.m. SO ORDERED. (Initial Pre-trial Conference set for 2/26/2016 at 10:00 AM before Judge Katherine Polk Failla.) (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 12/23/2015) Copies Mailed By Chambers. (adc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 12/1/2015, Entered: 12/1/2015 Order for Initial Pretrial ConferenceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE IN PRO SE ACTION: Initial Conference set for 1/5/2016 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 618, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Katherine Polk Failla, and as further set forth in this order. The Clerk of Court is directed to mail a copy of this Order to Plaintiff. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 12/1/2015) (tn)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank  Mail Order by Certified Mail
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Mailed a copy of [46] Order for Initial Pretrial Conference, to Robert Jones #141-15-02468 / NYSID# 04757650Q Otis Bantum Corr. Center 1600 Hazen Street E. Elmhurst, NY 11370. (ca)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank  Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk. Transmitted re: [46] Notice of Initial Pretrial Conference in Pro Se Action, to the Docket Assistant Clerk for case processing. (tn)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 11/24/2015, Entered: 11/24/2015 Order for Limited Appearance of Pro Bono Counsel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 11/24/2015, Entered: 11/24/2015 letterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LETTER addressed to Judge Katherine Polk Failla from Robert Jones dated 11/17/2015 re: Request for pro-bono counsel. Document filed by Robert Jones.(tn)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 11/10/2015, Entered: 11/12/2015 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER re: [42] Response to Motion, filed by Thornton Gregory, Felix Rivera, Jose Criollo, Steven Mikonland, Adam Sager, James Meehan, [38] MOTION to Strike. filed by Robert Jones. The Court has received Plaintiff's motion to strike affirmative defenses from the Answer (Dkt. # 38) and Defendants' response (Dkt. #42). To aid the Court as it considers Plaintiff's motion, the parties are ORDERED to submit additional letter briefs explaining whether they believe that the standard for pleadings under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 8(a) - as articulated in Bell Atl. Corp. v. Twombly, 550 U.S. 544 (2007), and Ashcroft v. Iqbal, 556 U.S. 662 (2009) - also applies to affirmative defenses. See, e.g., Tardif v. City of New York, 302 F.R.D. 31, 32-33 (S.D.N.Y. 2014)(highlighting a split of authority on this question). If Plaintiff would like the Court to appoint pro bono counsel for the limited purpose of assisting him with preparing his submission on this issue, Plaintiff must write a letter to the Court requesting counsel by December 9, 2015. Both parties' letter briefs will be due on January 8, 2016. The briefs should not exceed 20 pages., ( Brief due by 1/8/2016.) (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 11/10/2015) Copies Mailed By Chambers. (lmb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 10/29/2015, Entered: 10/29/2015 Response to motionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LETTER RESPONSE to Motion addressed to Judge Katherine Polk Failla from Maria DeCastro dated 10/29/15 re: [38] MOTION to Strike. . Document filed by Jose Criollo, Thornton Gregory, James Meehan, Steven Mikonland, Felix Rivera, Adam Sager. (Decastro, Maria)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 10/27/2015, Entered: 10/27/2015 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ANSWER to [1] Complaint, with JURY DEMAND. Document filed by Steven Mikonland.(Decastro, Maria)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 10/9/2015, Entered: 10/9/2015 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER: Defendants are ORDERED to submit a letter brief in response to Plaintiffs motion to strike affirmative defenses from the Answer. (Dkt. #38). The letter brief shall be submitted by October 30, 2015, and it shall not exceed ten pages. Set Deadlines/Hearing as to [38] MOTION to Strike: Responses due by 10/30/2015. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 10/9/2015) Copies Mailed By Chambers. (tn)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 10/9/2015, Entered: 10/9/2015, Terminated: 2/26/2016 Motion to strike
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Strike Affirmative Defenses. Document filed by Robert Jones. ***Docket and file instructions from chambers. (tn)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 10/8/2015, Entered: 10/13/2015 Marshal's Process Receipt and Return of Service Executed Complaints
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MARSHAL'S PROCESS RECEIPT AND RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED. Summons and Complaint served. Steven Mikonland served on 10/6/2015, answer due 10/27/2015. Service was accepted by Thomas, #4281. Document filed by Robert Jones. (sc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 8/31/2015, Entered: 8/31/2015 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ANSWER to [1] Complaint, with JURY DEMAND. Document filed by Jose Criollo, Thornton Gregory, James Meehan, Felix Rivera, Adam Sager.(Decastro, Maria)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank  FRCP 4 Service Package - Hand Delivered to U.S.M
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    FRCP 4 Service Package Hand Delivered to U.S.M.: Package hand delivered to U.S.M. on 8/24/2015 per the instructions of Judge Katherine Polk Failla. See [36] Order of Service. (sbr)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank  Summons issued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SUMMONS ISSUED as to Steven Mikonland. (sbr)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank  USM-285 Form Received
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Received Form U.S.M.-285 for defendant(s): Steven Mikonland on 8/24/2015. Summons to be issued listing these defendants for service of [1] Complaint,. (sbr)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 8/10/2015, Entered: 8/10/2015 Order of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank  FRCP 4 Service Package - Mailed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            FRCP 4 (Service Package Mailed) to plaintiff at the address noted on the complaint/court's docket on 8/10/2015 via Regular Mail. The service package included: a copy of the Order of Service, One United States Marshal (U.S.M.-285) form for defendant Officer Steven Mikonlanda, (sbr)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 8/7/2015, Entered: 8/7/2015 letterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              FIRST LETTER addressed to Judge Katherine Polk Failla from Maria DeCastro dated August 7, 2015 re: Defendants Criollo, Meehan, Rivera, and Thornton write respectfully in response to the Courts Order dated June 30, 2015.. Document filed by Jose Criollo, Thornton Gregory, James Meehan, Felix Rivera.(Decastro, Maria)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 8/7/2015, Entered: 8/7/2015 Order to Show CauseCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER: Defendants shall provide the Court with the information required by the Court's June 30, 2015 Order, or show good cause why this information cannot be supplied, by August 10, 2015. All parties are reminded of the importance of complying with this Court's Orders. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 8/7/2015) Copies Mailed By Chambers. (tn) Modified on 8/7/2015 (tn).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 6/30/2015, Entered: 7/1/2015 Order Reopening Case
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 6/29/2015, Entered: 6/29/2015 letterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LETTER addressed to Judge Katherine Polk Failla from Maria DeCastro dated June 29, 2015 re: Defendants write respectfully in opposition to plaintiffs June 23, 2015 motion to reopen this matter.. Document filed by Jose Criollo, Thornton Gregory, James Meehan, Felix Rivera.(Decastro, Maria)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 6/23/2015, Entered: 6/23/2015 letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LETTER from Robert Jones, #141-15-02468, dated 6/14/15 re: RELIEF FROM THE ORDER ON JUDGMENT FED.R.CIV.P. 60(b)(6). JONES V. BLOOMBERG. Document filed by Robert Jones.(sc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 6/8/2015, Entered: 6/8/2015 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 6/5/2015, Entered: 6/5/2015 letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LETTER from Robert Jones, #1411502468, dated 6/1/15 re: (SIX U.S. MARSHALS PROCESS OF SUMMONS FORM USM-285) - Plaintiff seeks to reopen this matter etc. Document filed by Robert Jones.(sc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 6/1/2015, Entered: 6/2/2015 Pro Se Memorandum to Change Address
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            PRO SE MEMORANDUM(Letter) dated 4/10/15 re: CHANGE OF ADDRESS for Robert Jones. New Address: #141-15-02468, Otis Bantum Corr. Facility, 1600 Hazen Street, E. Elmhurst, New York, 11370. (sc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 5/21/2015, Entered: 5/21/2015 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 5/21/2015, Entered: 5/21/2015 Pro Se Memorandum to Change Address
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                PRO SE MEMORANDUM dated 5/12/15 re: CHANGE OF ADDRESS for Robert Jones. New Address: #141-15-02468, Otis Bantum Corr. Center, 1600 Hazen Street, East Elmhurst, New York, 11370. (sc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 4/8/2015, Entered: 4/8/2015 Order of Dismissal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 3/9/2015, Entered: 3/9/2015 Order on motion for extension of time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 3/6/2015, Entered: 3/6/2015, Terminated: 3/9/2015 MOTION for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 2/17/2015, Entered: 2/17/2015 Order on Motion for extension of time to answerCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting [21] Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re [1] Complaint. Application GRANTED. Defendants Sager, Criollo, and Meehan shall answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint, in accordance with the Court's Individual Rules of Practice in Civil Cases, by April 14, 2015. As Defendants note, Plaintiff has yet to serve Defendants Gregory, Rivera, and Koland. The Court attaches a copy of the docket sheet and the unexecuted service receipts (Dkt. #15, 16, 20). Plaintiff is reminded that he must effect service on these Defendants within 120 days of the date the summons was issued. Jose Criollo answer due 4/14/2015; James Meehan answer due 4/14/2015; Adam Sager answer due 4/14/2015. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 2/17/2015) Copies Mailed By Chambers. (kko)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 2/17/2015, Entered: 2/17/2015, Terminated: 2/17/2015 motion for extension of time to file answerCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          FIRST LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: [1] Complaint, addressed to Judge Katherine Polk Failla from Maria DeCastro dated 2/17/15. Document filed by Jose Criollo, James Meehan.(Decastro, Maria)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 2/13/2015, Entered: 2/13/2015 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Maria Fernanda Decastro on behalf of New York City Law Department. (Decastro, Maria)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 2/4/2015, Entered: 2/17/2015 Marshal's Process Receipt and Return of Service Unexecuted
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MARSHAL'S PROCESS RECEIPT AND RETURN OF SERVICE UNEXECUTED as to M. Koland. Attempted Service of Summons and Complaint. Service was attempted on 1/23/15. Document filed by Robert Jones. (sc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 2/4/2015, Entered: 2/16/2015 Marshal's Process Receipt and Return of Service Executed Complaints
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MARSHAL'S PROCESS RECEIPT AND RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED. Summons and Complaint served. James Meehan served on 1/5/2015, answer due 3/6/2015. Service was accepted by Detective James Meehan. Document filed by Robert Jones. (sc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 2/4/2015, Entered: 2/16/2015 Marshal's Process Receipt and Return of Service Executed Complaints
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MARSHAL'S PROCESS RECEIPT AND RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED. Summons and Complaint served. Jose Criollo served on 1/23/2015, answer due 2/13/2015. Service was accepted by Debora Hill, PAA. Document filed by Robert Jones. (sc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 2/4/2015, Entered: 2/16/2015 Marshal's Process Receipt and Return of Service Executed Complaints
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MARSHAL'S PROCESS RECEIPT AND RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED. Summons and Complaint served. Adam Sager served on 1/23/2015, answer due 2/13/2015. Service was accepted by Adam Sager. Document filed by Robert Jones. (sc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 2/4/2015, Entered: 2/16/2015 Marshal's Process Receipt and Return of Service Unexecuted
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MARSHAL'S PROCESS RECEIPT AND RETURN OF SERVICE UNEXECUTED as to Thornton Gregory. Attempted Service of Summons and Complaint. Service was attempted on 1/23/15. Document filed by Robert Jones. (sc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 2/4/2015, Entered: 2/16/2015 Marshal's Process Receipt and Return of Service Unexecuted
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MARSHAL'S PROCESS RECEIPT AND RETURN OF SERVICE UNEXECUTED as to Felix Rivera. Attempted Service of Summons and Complaint. Service was attempted on 1/23/15. Document filed by Robert Jones. (sc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 1/21/2015, Entered: 1/22/2015 Pro Se Memorandum to Change Address
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          PRO SE MEMORANDUM(Letter) dated 1/14/15 re: CHANGE OF ADDRESS for Robert Jones. New Address: Neeno Freedom, 367 Howard Ave., Brooklyn, New York, 11233. (sc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank  FRCP 4 Service Package - Hand Delivered to U.S.M
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            FRCP 4 Service Package Hand Delivered to U.S.M.: Package hand delivered to U.S.M. on 12/12/2014. (vj)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank  Summons issued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SUMMONS ISSUED as to Jose Criollo, James Meehan. (vj)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 12/11/2014, Entered: 12/12/2014 Order 30 Days Other (case opening)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 12/10/2014, Entered: 12/15/2014 Pro Se Memorandum to Change Address
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  PRO SE MEMORANDUM dated 12/4/14 re: CHANGE OF ADDRESS for Robert Jones. New Address: DIN#00A0604, Ulster Corr. Facility, P.O. Box 800, Napanoch, New York, 12458. (sc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 12/5/2014, Entered: 12/10/2014 letterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LETTER addressed to Judge Katherine Polk Failla from Robert Jones dated 11/26/2014 re: Timely Filing of U S Marshal Form USM-285. Document filed by Robert Jones.(sac)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank  FRCP 4 Service Package - Hand Delivered to U.S.M
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      FRCP 4 Service Package Hand Delivered to U.S.M.: Package hand delivered to U.S.M. on 12/5/2014 per the instructions of Judge Katherine Polk Failla. See [6] Memorandum & Opinion, Set Deadlines/Hearings. (sbr)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank  Summons issued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SUMMONS ISSUED as to Felix Rivera, Adam Sager, M. Koland Shiled, Thornton Gegory. (sbr)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank  USM-285 Form Received
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Received Form U.S.M.-285 for defendant(s): Adam Sager, Thornton Gregory, Police Lieutenant Felix Rivera, Police Officer M. Koland Shiled on 12/4/2014. Summons to be issued listing these defendants for service of [1] Complaint,. (sbr)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 12/1/2014, Entered: 12/3/2014 letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LETTER from Robert Jones, ID#3491307505, dated 11/14/14 re: SERVICE OF PROCESS/UNITED STATES MARSHALS OFFICE/ FORM USM-285(concerning Police Detective James Meehan). Document filed by Robert Jones.(sc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 11/19/2014, Entered: 11/19/2014 Order to Show Cause
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 11/7/2014, Entered: 11/12/2014 Pro Se Memorandum to Change Address
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                PRO SE MEMORANDUM dated 11/2/14 re: CHANGE OF ADDRESS for Robert Jones. New Address: ID#3491307505, Manhattan Detention Center, 125 White Street, New York, NY, 10013. (sc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank  Authorization Deduction Letter - Mailed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Authorization Deduction Letter Mailed to George Motchan Detention Center on 9/19/2014. (vj)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank  FRCP 4 Service Package - Mailed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    FRCP 4 (Information Package Mailed) to plaintiff at the address noted on the complaint/court's docket on 09/19/2014. The information package included: Initial Case Memo Letter, a copy of the Order Granting In Forma Pauperis Application (IFP), United States Marshal (U.S.M.-285) forms (One For Each Defendant), Judge's individual rules, instructions on how to file a motion and opposition, instructions on filing an amended complaint, application for counsel, a consent to proceed before a Magistrate Judge, and affirmation of service forms. (vj)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank  Mail Notice to Attorney(s)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Mailed notice re: Notice of Case Assignment/Reassignment to the plaintiff(s) of record. (vj)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 9/17/2014, Entered: 9/18/2014 Memorandum and Opinion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank  Case Designation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Magistrate Judge Michael H. Dolinger is so designated. (pgu)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank  Notice of Case Assignment/Reassignment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT to Judge Katherine Polk Failla. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (pgu)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 8/19/2014, Entered: 8/19/2014 Order Granting IFP Application
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank  Mail Order by Certified Mail
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Mailed a copy of [4] Order Granting IFP Application to Robert Jones. (sbr)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 8/4/2014, Entered: 8/13/2014 Remark
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Prison Authorization. Document filed by Robert Jones. (moh)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 8/4/2014, Entered: 8/13/2014 Request to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. Document filed by Robert Jones.(moh)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 1 Filed: 8/4/2014, Entered: 8/13/2014 Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      COMPLAINT against Michael Bloomberg, City of New York Municipal Corporation "Person", Jose Criollo, Thornton Gregory, John Doe Shield #, Raymond Kelly, Manhattan Mid-Town North Pct, James Meehan, Lauren Perry, Property Clerks Office, Felix Rivera, Adam Sager, M. Koland Shiled, Cyrus Vance. Document filed by Robert Jones. (Attachments: # (1) Envelope, # (2) memo)(moh)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank  Case Designated ECF.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Case Designated ECF. (moh)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        This case has been viewed 149 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                         
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Need Password Help?