USA v. Cimino
Criminal Case Massachusetts District Court, Case No. 1:13-cr-10289
District Judge Douglas P. Woodlock, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 16, 2017 at 8:31 PM ST (4.3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Joseph Cimino, Defendant (1)

Toggle Switch Represented by DiMento & Sullivan

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Designation: Retained Francis J. DiMento +1 617 523 2345 +1 617 523 2346 fjd@dimentosullivan.com

Note: Criminal cases with multiple defendants may have several records with the same case number: one record for the master file (all defendants), as well as one record per defendant. It can often be difficult to tell which record is which. Other likely matches for this case include:

  Entries (152) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 158 Filed: 7/30/2015, Entered: 8/4/2015 Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 157 Filed: 8/3/2015, Entered: 8/3/2015 Notice of Rescheduling
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 156 Filed: 7/31/2015, Entered: 7/31/2015 Judgment*
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 155 Filed: 7/31/2015, Entered: 7/31/2015 Order on Motion to Dismiss
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 154 Filed: 7/30/2015, Entered: 7/30/2015 Motion to Dismiss
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 153 Filed: 7/29/2015, Entered: 7/29/2015 Motion to Modify Conditions of Release
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 152 Filed: 7/28/2015, Entered: 7/29/2015 Sentencing
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 150 Filed: 7/22/2015, Entered: 7/22/2015 Order on Motion to Seal Document
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 7/21/2015, Entered: 7/21/2015 Sentencing Memorandum
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 148 Filed: 7/21/2015, Entered: 7/21/2015 ~Motion to Seal Document
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 147 Filed: 6/19/2015, Entered: 6/19/2015 Procedural Order re sentencing hearing
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 6/18/2015, Entered: 6/19/2015 Plea Agreement
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 144 Filed: 6/18/2015, Entered: 6/19/2015 Rule 11 Hearing
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 5/27/2015, Entered: 5/27/2015 Notice Canceling Hearing or Other Deadline
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 5/27/2015, Entered: 5/27/2015 Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 5/25/2015, Entered: 5/25/2015 Motion to Continue
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 5/21/2015, Entered: 5/21/2015 Motion to Modify Conditions of Release
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 4/30/2015, Entered: 4/30/2015 Notice of Rescheduling
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 4/30/2015, Entered: 4/30/2015 Procedural Order re sentencing hearing
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 4/30/2015, Entered: 4/30/2015 Plea Agreement
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 4/30/2015, Entered: 4/30/2015 Order on Excludable Delay
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 4/30/2015, Entered: 4/30/2015 Order on Motion to Exclude
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 4/30/2015, Entered: 4/30/2015 Rule 11 Hearing
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 4/21/2015, Entered: 4/21/2015 Notice of Hearing.
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 4/7/2015, Entered: 4/7/2015 Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 4/2/2015, Entered: 4/2/2015 Motion to Modify Conditions of Release
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 1/23/2015, Entered: 1/23/2015 Motion for Excludable Delay
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 1/23/2015, Entered: 1/23/2015 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 1/23/2015, Entered: 1/23/2015 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 1/7/2015, Entered: 1/7/2015 Protective Order
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 1/6/2015, Entered: 1/6/2015 Pretrial Order
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 1/6/2015, Entered: 1/6/2015 Order on Motion to Sever
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 1/5/2015, Entered: 1/5/2015 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 12/29/2014, Entered: 12/29/2014 Motion for Protective Order
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 12/26/2014, Entered: 12/26/2014 Motion to Continue
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 12/17/2014, Entered: 12/17/2014 Reply to Response
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 12/16/2014, Entered: 12/16/2014 Case No Longer Referred to Magistrate Judge
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 12/16/2014, Entered: 12/16/2014 Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 12/16/2014, Entered: 12/16/2014 Arraignment
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 12/15/2014, Entered: 12/15/2014 Motion to Modify Conditions of Release
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 12/10/2014, Entered: 12/10/2014 Notice of Hearing.
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 12/10/2014, Entered: 12/10/2014 Response Unrelated to a Motion
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 12/10/2014, Entered: 12/10/2014 Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 12/10/2014, Entered: 12/10/2014 Indictment
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 11/26/2014, Entered: 11/26/2014 Notice of Hearing on Motion
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 11/26/2014, Entered: 11/26/2014 Memorandum (not related to a motion)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 11/17/2014, Entered: 11/17/2014 Response to Motion
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 11/12/2014, Entered: 11/12/2014 Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 11/10/2014, Entered: 11/10/2014 ~Motion to Sever
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 11/10/2014, Entered: 11/10/2014 ~Motion to Sever
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 11/10/2014, Entered: 11/10/2014 Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 11/10/2014, Entered: 11/10/2014 Order on Motion to Exclude
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 11/10/2014, Entered: 11/10/2014 Order on Excludable Delay
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 11/10/2014, Entered: 11/10/2014 Order on Excludable Delay
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 11/6/2014, Entered: 11/6/2014 Pretrial Order
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 11/6/2014, Entered: 11/6/2014 Pretrial Order
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 11/3/2014, Entered: 11/3/2014 Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 11/3/2014, Entered: 11/3/2014 Set/Reset Hearings
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 11/3/2014, Entered: 11/3/2014 Order on Motion to Continue
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 11/3/2014, Entered: 11/3/2014 Status Report
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 10/7/2014, Entered: 10/7/2014 Notice of Rescheduling
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 10/7/2014, Entered: 10/7/2014 Notice of Rescheduling
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 10/7/2014, Entered: 10/7/2014 Order on Motion to Continue
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 10/1/2014, Entered: 10/1/2014 Motion for Excludable Delay
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 9/22/2014, Entered: 9/22/2014 Motion to Continue
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 9/10/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                    Set/Reset Hearings as to Joseph Cimino: Jury Trial set for 1/26/2015 09:00 AM in Courtroom 1 before Judge Douglas P. Woodlock. (Lovett, Jarrett) (Entered: 09/10/2014)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 9/10/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                      ELECTRONIC NOTICE OF HEARING as to Husain Yassin: Status Conference set for 11/5/2014 02:00 PM in Courtroom 1 before Judge Douglas P. Woodlock. (Lovett, Jarrett) (Entered: 09/10/2014)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 9/9/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                        ELECTRONIC Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Douglas P. Woodlock:Initial Pretrial Conference as to Joseph Cimino held on 9/9/2014; possibility of filing of motions for separate trial; Jury Trial is set for 1/26/2014 in Courtroom 1 before Judge Douglas P. Woodlock, Court prefers that the co-defendant, Husain Yassin's trial go forward on said date; Court will take the case back from the USMJ and set a Status Conference for 11/5/14 at 2:00 PM as to Husain Yassin; a motion for exludable delay shall be filed. (Attorneys present: AUSA Gallagher, Jr. for the Gov't; DiMento for the deft. )Court Reporter Name and Contact information: Brenda Hancock (617-439-3214). (Lovett, Jarrett) (Entered: 09/10/2014)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 9/9/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                          Case as to Husain Yassin no longer referred to Magistrate Judge Robert B. Collings. (Russo, Noreen) (Entered: 09/09/2014)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 9/9/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                            Magistrate Judge Robert B. Collings: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 84 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney Attorney Behzad Mirhashem terminated as to Husain Yassin (4) (Russo, Noreen) (Entered: 09/09/2014)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 9/9/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by BEHZAD MIRHASHEM as to Husain Yassin. (Mirhashem, Behzad) (Entered: 09/09/2014)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 9/8/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: R. Bradford Bailey appearing for Husain Yassin. Type of Appearance: Retained. (Bailey, R.) (Entered: 09/08/2014)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 9/8/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                  STATUS REPORT by USA as to Joseph Cimino (Gallagher, Neil) (Entered: 09/08/2014)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 8/25/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF HEARING as to Joseph Cimino: Initial Pretrial Conference set for 9/9/2014 02:00 PM in Courtroom 1 before Judge Douglas P. Woodlock. (Lovett, Jarrett) (Entered: 08/25/2014)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 8/19/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                      Magistrate Judge Robert B. Collings: ORDER entered. REPORT AND ORDER on Initial Status Conference as to Husain Yassin Motions due by 10/31/2014. Final Status Conference set for 11/5/2014 @ 02:00 PM in Courtroom 23 before Magistrate Judge Robert B. Collings. (Russo, Noreen) (Entered: 08/20/2014)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 8/20/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                        Judge Douglas P. Woodlock: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered acknowledging 77 Report and Order on Final Status Conference by Magistrate Magistrate Judge Robert B. Collings as to Joseph Cimino (1). (Lovett, Jarrett) (Entered: 08/20/2014)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 8/19/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                          Case as to Joseph Cimino no longer referred to Magistrate Judge Robert B. Collings. (Russo, Noreen) (Entered: 08/19/2014)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 8/19/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                            Magistrate Judge Robert B. Collings: ORDER entered. REPORT AND ORDER on Final Status Conference as to Joseph Cimino (Russo, Noreen) (Entered: 08/19/2014)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 8/19/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                              Magistrate Judge Robert B. Collings: ORDER entered. SIXTH ORDER OF EXCLUDABLE DELAY as to Husain Yassin. Time excluded from 8/19/14 until 8/19/14. Reason for entry of order on excludable delay: 18 USC 3161(h)(1) Miscellaneous proceedings. Time excluded from 8/20/14 until 10/31/14. Reason for entry of order on excludable delay: 18 USC 3161(h)(7)(A) Interests of justice. (Russo, Noreen) (Entered: 08/19/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 8/19/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                ELECTRONIC Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Robert B. Collings: Initial Status Conference as to Husain Yassin held on 8/19/2014. Auto discovery is complete with exception of some video / audio. Other transcripts are being prepared and they may take up to 45 days. Video / Audio are expected by the end of the week. Court will allow extension of time for 116.3 to 9/15/14. No protective orders. Motions due 10/31/14. Expert reports due 45 days prior to trial for Gov't; 21 for the defense. Final Status Conference set for 11/5/14 @ 2:00 PM. Court Reporter Name and Contact or digital recording information: Digital Recording - for transcripts or CDs email Deborah Scalfani (deborah_scalfani@mad.uscourts.gov). (Russo, Noreen) (Entered: 08/19/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 8/19/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                  Magistrate Judge Robert B. Collings: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 71 Motion for Extension of Time to File as to Husain Yassin (4). "ALLOWED to 9/15/14" (Russo, Noreen) (Entered: 08/19/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 8/19/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                    ELECTRONIC Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Robert B. Collings:Motion Hearing as to Husain Yassin held on 8/19/2014 re 71 MOTION for Extension of Time to File discovery letter filed by Husain Yassin. Gov't has no objection. Court will allow motion. Court Reporter Name and Contact or digital recording information: Digital Recording - for transcripts or CDs email Deborah Scalfani (deborah_scalfani@mad.uscourts.gov). (Russo, Noreen) (Entered: 08/19/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 8/13/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                      ELECTRONIC NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION as to Husain Yassin 71 MOTION for Extension of Time to File discovery letter : Motion Hearing set for 8/19/2014 @ 02:30 PM in Courtroom 23 before Magistrate Judge Robert B. Collings. (Russo, Noreen) (Entered: 08/13/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 8/12/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Extension of Time to File discovery letter as to Husain Yassin. (Mirhashem, Behzad) (Entered: 08/12/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 8/6/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                          Return receipt received for 63 mail sent to Husain Yassin Delivered on 8/5/2014 as to Husain Yassin (Moore, Kellyann) (Entered: 08/06/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 7/24/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                            Magistrate Judge Robert B. Collings: ORDER entered. ORDER APPOINTING FEDERAL DEFENDER PROGRAM as to Husain Yassin (Tran, Henry) (Entered: 07/24/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 7/23/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                              Magistrate Judge Robert B. Collings: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered as to Husain Yassin. The defendant was arraigned before me on July 16, 2014. Accordingly, the case shall proceed pursuant to the amendments to the Local Rules which became effective February 1, 2012. Since no waiver was filed at arraignment and no request for an extension to file such waiver was filed, automatic disclosures pursuant to L.R. 116.1(c) and (d) must be completed by the date set at arraignment, i.e., 7/23/14. Counsel are ORDERED to appear for an Initial Status Conference on Tuesday, August 19, 2014 at 2:30 PM at Courtroom 23 (7th floor). Pursuant to L.R. 116.5(a), the Court does not require a joint memorandum before an initial status conference. (Russo, Noreen) Modified on 8/7/2014 (Russo, Noreen). (Entered: 07/23/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 7/16/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                Magistrate Judge Robert B. Collings: ORDER entered. FIFTH ORDER OF EXCLUDABLE DELAY as to Joseph Cimino, Husain Yassin. Time excluded from 7/16/14 until 7/16/14. Reason for entry of order on excludable delay: 18 USC 3161(h)(1) Miscellaneous proceedings. Time excluded from 7/17/14 until 8/18/14. Reason for entry of order on excludable delay: 18 USC 3161(h)(7)(A) Interests of justice. (Russo, Noreen) (Entered: 07/22/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 7/16/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                  Magistrate Judge Robert B. Collings: ORDER entered. ORDER Setting Conditions of Release as to Husain Yassin. (Attachments: # 1 Supplement EM Warrant) (Russo, Noreen) (Entered: 07/21/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 7/16/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                    Appearance Bond (unsecured) in the Amount of $50,000.00 Entered as to Husain Yassin (Russo, Noreen) (Entered: 07/21/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 7/18/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                      Arrest Warrant Returned Executed on 7/16/2014 as to Husain Yassin. (Moore, Kellyann) (Entered: 07/18/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 7/16/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                        Magistrate Judge Robert B. Collings: ORDER entered. ORDER PURSUANT TO 18 U.S.C. § 3006A(f) as to Husain Yassin (Russo, Noreen) (Entered: 07/17/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 7/16/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                          ELECTRONIC Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Robert B. Collings:Arraignment and Initial Apperance as to Husain Yassin (4) Count 1,5 held on 7/16/2014, Plea entered: Not Guilty by Husain Yassin (4) Count 1,5. The government states the maximum penalties. The court informs the def't of his rights and the charges against him. Upon review of the financial affidavit the court will appoint the FD but the def't must pay to the court $1,000.00 on or before the first working day of every month - starting 8/1/2014- to defray the cost of representation. Gov't agrees to conditions of release. The def't is released on an unsecured bond and EM. Court sets initial status conference for 8/19/14 @ 2:30 PM and automatic disclosures for 7/23/14. Court Reporter Name and Contact or digital recording information: Digital Recording - for transcripts/CDs contact Deborah Scalfani (deborah_scalfani@mad.uscourts.gov). (Russo, Noreen) Modified on 7/17/2014 (Russo, Noreen). Modified on 8/7/2014 (Russo, Noreen). (Entered: 07/17/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 7/16/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                            ELECTRONIC NOTICE OF HEARING for Initial Appearance as to Husain Yassin: Initial Appearance set for 7/16/2014 @ 02:30 PM in Courtroom 23 before Magistrate Judge Robert B. Collings. (Russo, Noreen) (Entered: 07/16/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 7/16/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                              Magistrate Judge Robert B. Collings: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 58 Motion to Unseal Case as to Joseph Cimino (1), Issam Elnarddaff (2), Christopher Staniforth (3), Husain Yassin (4) (Russo, Noreen) (Entered: 07/16/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 7/16/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Unseal Case as to Joseph Cimino, Issam Elnarddaff, Christopher Staniforth, Husain Yassin. (Russo, Noreen) (Entered: 07/16/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 5/23/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Magistrate Judge Robert B. Collings: ORDER entered. FOURTH ORDER OF EXCLUDABLE DELAY as to Joseph Cimino. Time excluded from 5/13/14 until 5/20/14. Reason for entry of order on excludable delay: 18 USC 3161(h)(7)(A) Interests of justice. Time excluded from 5/21/14 until 5/21/14. Reason for entry of order on excludable delay: 18 USC 3161(h)(1) Miscellaneous proceedings. Time excluded from 5/22/14 until 7/21/14. Reason for entry of order on excludable delay: 18 USC 3161(h)(7)(A) Interests of justice. (Russo, Noreen) (Entered: 05/23/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 5/21/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Magistrate Judge Robert B. Collings: ORDER entered. FURTHER ORDER re Motions as to Joseph Cimino. It is ORDERED that all non-discovery type pre-trial motions (such as motions to dismiss, suppress, etc.) be FILED on or before the close of business on Monday, July 21, 2014; the Government shall respond to any such motions within the time provided by the Local Rules. (Russo, Noreen) (Entered: 05/23/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 5/21/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Magistrate Judge Robert B. Collings: ORDER entered amending Conditions of Release as to Joseph Cimino - re 25 Order Setting Conditions of Release. The defendant shall have no contact either directly or indirectly with any of the co-defendants in this case except through his attorney. (Russo, Noreen) (Entered: 05/21/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 5/21/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                        ELECTRONIC Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Robert B. Collings: Final Status Conference as to Joseph Cimino held on 5/21/2014. Counsel report to the court as to the status of the case. Court notes that an expert report schedule had already been set. 30 for Gov't; 15 for def't. If the Gov't can do it sooner it will. Court will hold on to case until motions are filed. Motions due 7/21/14. (Gallagher and DiMento)Court Reporter Name and Contact or digital recording information: Digital Recording - for transcripts/CDs contact Deborah Scalfani (deborah_scalfani@mad.uscourts.gov). (Russo, Noreen) (Entered: 05/21/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 5/21/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                          STATUS REPORT (Joint Final) by USA as to Joseph Cimino (Gallagher, Neil) (Entered: 05/21/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 5/12/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Magistrate Judge Robert B. Collings: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 51 Motion to Continue as to Joseph Cimino (1). Final Status Conference re-set for 5/21/2014 @ 03:30 PM in Courtroom 23 before Magistrate Judge Robert B. Collings. Att. DiMento may participate by telephone and should call into 888-675-2535 - Access Code: 6494892. (Russo, Noreen) (Entered: 05/12/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 5/9/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Assented to MOTION to Continue to In Two Weeks to Final Status Hearing as to Joseph Cimino by USA. (Gallagher, Neil) (Entered: 05/09/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 4/22/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                ELECTRONIC NOTICE OF HEARING as to Joseph Cimino: Final Status Conference set for 5/13/2014 @ 04:00 PM in Courtroom 23 before Magistrate Judge Robert B. Collings. The provisions of docket no. 45 re the joint memorandum remain in effect as to the new date. (Russo, Noreen) (Entered: 04/22/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 4/3/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Magistrate Judge Robert B. Collings: ORDER entered. THIRD ORDER OF EXCLUDABLE DELAY as to Joseph Cimino. Time excluded from 4/3/14 until 4/3/14. Reason for entry of order on excludable delay: 18 USC 3161(h)(1) Miscellaneous proceedings. Time excluded from 4/4/14 until 5/12/14. Reason for entry of order on excludable delay: 18 USC 3161(h)(7)(A) Interests of justice. (Russo, Noreen) (Entered: 04/04/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 4/3/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ELECTRONIC Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Robert B. Collings: Further Interim Status Conference as to Joseph Cimino held on 4/3/2014. Parties give update to the court and indicate a transcriptions are still being done. Court will continue until 5/13/14 @ 4:00 PM for a final status conference. (Attorneys present: Gallagher, Dimento. )Court Reporter Name and Contact or digital recording information: Digital Recording - for transcripts/CDs contact Deborah Scalfani (deborah_scalfani@mad.uscourts.gov). (Russo, Noreen) (Entered: 04/03/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 4/3/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Magistrate Judge Robert B. Collings: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 46 Motion for Hearing (to Convert Final Status into Interim) as to Joseph Cimino (1) (Russo, Noreen) (Entered: 04/03/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 4/2/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Assented to MOTION for Hearing (to Convert Final Status into Interim) as to Joseph Cimino by USA. (Gallagher, Neil) (Entered: 04/02/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 3/25/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Magistrate Judge Robert B. Collings: ELECTRONIC ORDER FOR FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE (L.R. 116.5(c)) as to Joseph Cimino. A Final Status Conference pursuant to Local Rule 116.5(c) is set for Thursday, April 3, 2014 AT 4:15 PM at Courtroom #23 (7th floor). Pursuant to Local Rule 116.5(c), counsel for the defendant shall confer with the Assistant U.S. Attorney and, no later than five (5) CALENDAR DAYS prior to the Final Status Conference, file a joint memorandum addressing all of the issues listed in Local Rule 116.5(b)(1) through (9) and 116.5(c)(1) through (3) and any other issue relevant to the progress of the case. If counsel files a statement to the effect that his client will offer a change of plea to the charge(s) contained in the Indictment, the conference shall be canceled.(Russo, Noreen) Modified to say 5 calendar days on 3/25/2014 (Russo, Noreen). (Entered: 03/25/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 2/6/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Set/Reset Hearings as to Joseph Cimino: Final Status Conference set for 4/3/2014 @ 04:15 PM in Courtroom 23 before Magistrate Judge Robert B. Collings. (Russo, Noreen) (Entered: 02/06/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 2/4/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Magistrate Judge Robert B. Collings: ORDER entered as to Joseph Cimino. It is ORDERED that all non-discovery type pre-trial motions (such as motions to dismiss, suppress, etc.) be FILED on or before the close of business on Wednesday, March 19, 2014; the Government shall respond to any such motions within the time provided by the Local Rules. (Russo, Noreen) (Entered: 02/06/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 2/4/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Magistrate Judge Robert B. Collings: ORDER entered. SECOND ORDER OF EXCLUDABLE DELAY as to Joseph Cimino. Time excluded from 1/21/14 until 2/4/14. Reason for entry of order on excludable delay: 18 USC 3161(h)(1)(D) Pretrial motions from filing date to decision, or submission of all documents necessary for the court to make a determination. Time excluded from 2/4/14 until 2/4/14. Reason for entry of order on excludable delay: 18 USC 3161(h)(1) Miscellaneous proceedings. Time excluded from 2/5/14 until 4/2/14. Reason for entry of order on excludable delay: 18 USC 3161(h)(7)(A) Interests of justice. (Russo, Noreen) (Entered: 02/04/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 2/4/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ELECTRONIC Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Robert B. Collings: Interim Status Conference as to Joseph Cimino held on 2/4/2014. Government indicates that there is still information outstanding from the State of California such as search warrants etc. and also there are many recordings that need to be transcribed. Counsel ask for more time and the Court sets the final status conference for 4/3/14 @ 4:15 PM.(Attorneys present: Gallagher and Dimento (by phone). )Court Reporter Name and Contact or digital recording information: Digital Recording - for transcripts/CDs contact Deborah Scalfani (deborah_scalfani@mad.uscourts.gov). (Russo, Noreen) (Entered: 02/04/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 2/4/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Magistrate Judge Robert B. Collings: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting in part and denying in part 37 Motion to Continue as to Joseph Cimino (1). The conference is continued to 2/4/2014 at 4:15 P.M. The Second Order of Excludable Delay will provide for the requested time to be excluded. (Entered: 02/04/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 2/4/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ELECTRONIC NOTICE OF RESCHEDULING as to Joseph Cimino: Interim Status Conference re-set for 2/4/2014 @ 04:15 PM in Courtroom 23 before Magistrate Judge Robert B. Collings.(Russo, Noreen) (Entered: 02/04/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 1/21/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ELECTRONIC NOTICE OF RESCHEDULING as to Joseph Cimino: Interim Status Conference set for 2/5/2014 @ 02:15 PM in Courtroom 23 before Magistrate Judge Robert B. Collings. (Russo, Noreen) (Entered: 01/21/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 1/21/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Assented to MOTION to Continue (and Exclude Time under the STA) to 2/5/14 to Interim Status Conference as to Joseph Cimino by USA. (Gallagher, Neil) (Entered: 01/21/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 1/16/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ELECTRONIC NOTICE OF RESCHEDULING as to Joseph Cimino: Interim Status Conference re-set for 1/22/2014 @ 02:00 PM in Courtroom 23 before Magistrate Judge Robert B. Collings. (Russo, Noreen) (Entered: 01/16/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 1/7/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RECORDED MORTGAGE receipt as to Joseph Cimino for property located at 246 Commonwealth Ave, Unit 3, Boston, MA. Actually recorded on 1/2/14 but filed in court on 1/7/14. (Russo, Noreen) (Entered: 01/09/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 1/7/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Appearance Bond Entered as to Joseph Cimino in amount of $ $50,000.00 (secured). (Russo, Noreen) (Entered: 01/09/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 1/7/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ELECTRONIC Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Robert B. Collings:Bond Hearing as to Joseph Cimino held on 1/7/2014. Property to be security for the bond was not in a trust but rather owned by the def'ts father. Def'ts father, Joseph P. Cimino appears and signs bond along with defendant. (Attorneys present: Ricci, Dimento. )Court Reporter Name and Contact or digital recording information: Digital Recording - for transcripts/CDs contact Deborah Scalfani (deborah_scalfani@mad.uscourts.gov). (Russo, Noreen) (Entered: 01/09/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 12/26/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Magistrate Judge Robert B. Collings: ORDER entered. REPORT AND ORDER on Initial Status Conference as to Joseph Cimino (Russo, Noreen) (Entered: 12/26/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 12/26/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Magistrate Judge Robert B. Collings: ORDER entered. FIRST ORDER OF EXCLUDABLE DELAY as to Joseph Cimino Time excluded from 9/25/2013 until 9/25/2013. Time excluded from 11/14/13 until 11/14/13. Time excluded from 11/15/13 until 12/16/13. Time excluded from 12/17/13 until 12/17/13. Time excluded from 12/18/13 until 1/15/14. (Russo, Noreen) (Entered: 12/26/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 12/19/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Set/Reset Hearings as to Joseph Cimino: Bond Hearing set for 1/7/2014 03:00 PM and Interim Status Conference set for 1/16/2014 12:45 PM in Courtroom 23 before Magistrate Judge Robert B. Collings. (Russo, Noreen) (Entered: 12/19/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 12/17/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ELECTRONIC Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Robert B. Collings: Initial Status Conference as to Joseph Cimino held on 12/17/2013. Automatic discovery is not complete but is expected to be soon. Court sets deadline for 116.3 letters 1.15.14. No protective orders. Counsel not sure about motions. Court sets deadline for expert reports, 30 days for gov't; 21 for def't. Interim Status set for 1/16/14 @ 12:45 PM. Court goes over paperwork for secured bond. Counsel to return for Bond Hearing on 1/7/14 @ 3:00 PM. Both trustees of the trust must appear and counsel to have title report, assessed valuation, and most recent mortgage statement showing mortgage balance. (Attorneys present: Gallagher, DiMento. )Court Reporter Name and Contact or digital recording information: Digital Recording - for transcripts/CDs contact Deborah Scalfani (deborah_scalfani@mad.uscourts.gov). (Russo, Noreen) (Entered: 12/17/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 11/21/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ELECTRONIC NOTICE OF HEARING as to Joseph Cimino: Initial Status Conference set for 12/17/2013 @ 12:30 PM in Courtroom 23 before Magistrate Judge Robert B. Collings. (Russo, Noreen) (Entered: 11/21/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 11/14/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Bond Entered as to Joseph Cimino in amount of $ 200,000.00 to be secured by real estate located in Boston by December 16, 2013. (Belpedio, Lisa) (Entered: 11/15/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 11/14/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Magistrate Judge David H. Hennessy: ORDER Setting Conditions of Release as to Joseph Cimino (1). (Belpedio, Lisa) (Entered: 11/15/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 11/14/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ELECTRONIC Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge David H. Hennessy:Initial Appearance(in this District)/Arraignment held on 11/14/2013, Case called, Counsel, PTS Riley & Defendant appear, Defendant notified of rights, charges & maximum penalties, Not Guilty Plea entered by Joseph Cimino (1) on Counts 1,2,3-4, Date in which Automatic Disc. is to be filed & date for initial status conference to be issued by Judge Collings, Defendant previously released in District of Arrest, but, by agreement of Counsel & Pretrial Officer, Defendant executes Secured Bond and new Conditions of Release. Real Property Paperwork necessary to secure the appearance bond to be filed by December 16, 2013. Def't released. (Attorneys present: Gallagher, DiMento. )Court Reporter: Digital Recording - 2:40 for transcripts/CDs contact Deborah Scalfani (deborah_scalfani@mad.uscourts.gov). (Belpedio, Lisa) (Entered: 11/15/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 11/15/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Francis J. DiMento appearing for Joseph Cimino. Type of Appearance: Retained. (DiMento, Francis) (Entered: 11/15/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 11/13/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received as to Joseph Cimino. (Russo, Noreen) (Entered: 11/14/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 11/13/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ELECTRONIC NOTICE OF RESCHEDULING (Judge / Session only) as to Joseph Cimino: Arraignment and Initial Appearance in District re-set for 11/14/2013 @ 02:30 PM in Courtroom 16 before Magistrate Judge David H. Hennessy. (Russo, Noreen) (Entered: 11/13/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 11/8/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Arrest Warrant Returned Executed on 11/5/2013 as to Joseph Cimino. (Moore, Kellyann) (Entered: 11/08/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 11/7/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ELECTRONIC NOTICE OF HEARING as to Joseph Cimino: Initial Appearance in District set for 11/14/2013 @ 02:30 PM in Courtroom 23 before Magistrate Judge Robert B. Collings. (Russo, Noreen) (Entered: 11/07/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 11/7/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              REDACTED INDICTMENT as to Joseph Cimino. (Russo, Noreen) (Entered: 11/07/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 11/7/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Magistrate Judge Robert B. Collings: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered denying 7 Motion to Seal as to Joseph Cimino (1) (Russo, Noreen) (Entered: 11/07/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 11/7/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Magistrate Judge Robert B. Collings: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 7 Motion for Partial Lifting of Seal as to Joseph Cimino (1) (Russo, Noreen) (Entered: 11/07/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 10/28/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Magistrate Judge Robert B. Collings: ORDER entered. as to Joseph Cimino, Issam Elnarddaff, Christopher Staniforth, Husain Yassin (Russo, Noreen) (Entered: 11/06/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 10/28/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Magistrate Judge Robert B. Collings: ORDER entered. as to Joseph Cimino, Issam Elnarddaff, Christopher Staniforth, Husain Yassin (Russo, Noreen) (Entered: 11/06/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 10/28/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER to Service Provider as to Joseph Cimino, Issam Elnarddaff, Christopher Staniforth, Husain Yassin. (Russo, Noreen) (Entered: 11/06/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 10/28/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Search Warrant Issued in case as to Joseph Cimino, Issam Elnarddaff, Christopher Staniforth, Husain Yassin (Russo, Noreen) (Entered: 11/06/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 10/28/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            APPLICATION for Search Warrant as to Joseph Cimino, Issam Elnarddaff, Christopher Staniforth, Husain Yassin (Russo, Noreen) (Entered: 11/06/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 10/28/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Magistrate Judge Robert B. Collings: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 9 Motion to Seal as to Joseph Cimino (1), Issam Elnarddaff (2), Christopher Staniforth (3), Husain Yassin (4) (Russo, Noreen) (Entered: 11/06/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 10/28/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Seal as to Joseph Cimino, Issam Elnarddaff, Christopher Staniforth, Husain Yassinby USA. (Russo, Noreen) (Entered: 11/06/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 10/28/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT of Search Warrant as to Joseph Cimino, Issam Elnarddaff, Christopher Staniforth, Husain Yassin (Russo, Noreen) (Entered: 11/06/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 11/6/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Seal, MOTION for Partial Lifting of Seal of Indictment ( Responses due by 11/20/2013) as to Joseph Cimino by USA. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Moore, Kellyann) (Entered: 11/06/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 9/26/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Judge Douglas P. Woodlock: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Robert B. Collings Reason for referral: Full Pretrial Proceedings as to Joseph Cimino, Issam Elnarddaff, Christopher Staniforth, Husain Yassin (Alves-Baptista, Antonia) (Entered: 09/26/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 9/26/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment as to Joseph Cimino, Issam Elnarddaff, Christopher Staniforth, Husain Yassin; Judge Douglas P. Woodlock assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Robert B. Collings. (Abaid, Kimberly) (Entered: 09/26/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 9/26/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Arrest Warrant Issued by Ch. Magistrate Judge Leo T. Sorokin as to Joseph Cimino, Issam Elnarddaff, Christopher Staniforth, Husain Yassin. (Alves-Baptista, Antonia) (Entered: 09/26/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 9/26/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Ch. Magistrate Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ENDORSED ORDER entered granting 2 Motion to Seal Case as to Joseph Cimino (1), Issam Elnarddaff (2), Christopher Staniforth (3), Husain Yassin (4) (Alves-Baptista, Antonia) (Entered: 09/26/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 9/26/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Seal Case as to Joseph Cimino, Issam Elnarddaff, Christopher Staniforth, Husain Yassin by USA. (Alves-Baptista, Antonia) (Entered: 09/26/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 1 Filed: 9/26/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SEALED INDICTMENT as to Joseph Cimino (1) count(s) 1, 2, 3-4, Issam Elnarddaff (2) count(s) 1, 2, Christopher Staniforth (3) count(s) 1, 3, Husain Yassin (4) count(s) 1, 5. (Attachments: # 1 JS45)(Alves-Baptista, Antonia) (Entered: 09/26/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  This case has been viewed 2,066 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                   
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Need Password Help?