McRo Inc. v. Valve Corporation
Federal Civil Lawsuit California Central District Court, Case No. 8:13-cv-01874

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated July 31, 2017 at 11:38 PM DT (4.1 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Mcro, Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Mishcon de Reya New York LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mark S Raskin +1 212 612 3270 +1 212 612 3297 Mark.Raskin@mishcon.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Russ August & Kabat

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Marc Aaron Fenster +1 310 826 7474 +1 310 826 6991 mfenster@raklaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Irene Y Lee +1 310 826 7474 +1 310 826 6991 ilee@raklaw.com
No Logo Valve Corporation, Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by K&L Gates LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Theodore J. Angelis +1 206 370 8101 +1 206 623 7022 theo.angelis@klgates.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David Thomas McDonald +1 206 623 7580 + 206 623 7022 david.mcdonald@klgates.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph J Mellema +1 949 253 0900 +1 949 253 0902 joseph.mellema@klgates.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jan Patrick Weir +1 949 253 0900 +1 949 253 0902 jan.weir@klgates.com
v.
No Logo Valve Corporation, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by K&L Gates LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Theodore J. Angelis +1 206 370 8101 +1 206 623 7022 theo.angelis@klgates.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David Thomas McDonald +1 206 623 7580 + 206 623 7022 david.mcdonald@klgates.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph J Mellema +1 949 253 0900 +1 949 253 0902 joseph.mellema@klgates.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jan Patrick Weir +1 949 253 0900 +1 949 253 0902 jan.weir@klgates.com
No Logo Mcro, Inc., Counter-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Mishcon de Reya New York LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mark S Raskin +1 212 612 3270 +1 212 612 3297 Mark.Raskin@mishcon.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Russ August & Kabat

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Marc Aaron Fenster +1 310 826 7474 +1 310 826 6991 mfenster@raklaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Irene Y Lee +1 310 826 7474 +1 310 826 6991 ilee@raklaw.com
  Entries (76) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (1) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 7/25/2017, Entered: None Motion Hearing
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Blank 73 Filed: 7/24/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
    MINUTES OF DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS OR TRANSFER FOR IMPROPER VENUE 68 held before Judge George H. Wu: Court hears oral argument. The Court's Tentative circulated and attached hereto, is adopted as the Courts Final Ruling. Defendant's Motion is DENIED. Please refer to the Court's order for additional information. Court Reporter: Katie Thibodeaux. (cr) (Entered: 07/25/2017)
      LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 7/12/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Jan P Weir counsel for Counter Claimant Valve Corporation, Defendant Valve Corporation. Joseph J. Mellema is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Valve Corporation. (Weir, Jan) (Entered: 07/12/2017)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 7/12/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Kathrine J Brandt counsel for Counter Claimant Valve Corporation, Defendant Valve Corporation. Adding Kathrine J. Brandt as counsel of record for Valve Corporation for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Valve Corporation. (Attorney Kathrine J Brandt added to party Valve Corporation(pty:cc), Attorney Kathrine J Brandt added to party Valve Corporation(pty:dft))(Brandt, Kathrine) (Entered: 07/12/2017)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 7/10/2017, Entered: None Reply (Motion related)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 7/3/2017, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 6/22/2017, Entered: None Dismiss Case
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 1/19/2017, Entered: None Status Report
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 4/21/2015, Entered: None Bill of Costs (CV-59) - Issued
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 3/25/2015, Entered: None
                    BILL OF COSTS. Costs Taxed in amount of $ 325.80 in favor of Defendant and against Plaintiff (mb) (Entered: 04/21/2015)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 11/26/2014, Entered: None Objections - non-motion
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 11/17/2014, Entered: None
                        NOTICE of Application to the Clerk to Tax Costs and Proposed Bill of Costs filed by Defendant Valve Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3)(Mellema, Joseph) (Entered: 11/17/2014)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 11/5/2014, Entered: None Miscellaneous Document
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 11/4/2014, Entered: None Judgment
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 10/31/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                              FINAL JUDGMENT by Judge George H. Wu, Accordingly, it is ADJUDGED that Plaintiff and Counterclaim-Defendant McRo, Inc., d.b.a. Planet Blue ("Plaintiff') takes nothing from Defendants and Counterclaim-Plaintiffs (SEE ATTACHED FOR FURTHER DETAILS) All remaining pending motions are DENIED as moot. As Defendants are the prevailing parties in this action, Defendants' costs of court shall be taxed against Plaintiff. (pj) (Entered: 11/03/2014)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 10/27/2014, Entered: None
                                NOTIFICATION by Circuit Court of Appellate Docket Number 15-1099, Federal Circuit regarding Notice of Appeal to Federal Circuit Court of Appeals 56 as to Plaintiff McRo Inc. (mat) (Entered: 10/29/2014)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 10/28/2014, Entered: None Judgment/Renewal of Judgment
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 10/28/2014, Entered: None Objections - non-motion
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 10/22/2014, Entered: None
                                      NOTICE OF APPEAL to the Federal Circuit filed by Plaintiff McRo Inc. Appeal of Judgment, 54 (Appeal fee of $505 receipt number 0973-14662595 paid.) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Raskin, Mark) (Entered: 10/22/2014)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 9/24/2014, Entered: None Report of Determination of Patent/Trademark Action (CLOSE) (AO 120)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 9/24/2014, Entered: None Judgment
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 9/22/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                            RULING ON DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS BASED ON UNPATENTABILITY UNDER 35 U.S.C. SECTION 101 by Judge George H. Wu. For the foregoing reasons, the Court would GRANT the Motion, and hold 576 Patent claims 1, 7-9, and 13, and 278 Patent claims 1-4, 6, 9, 13, and 15-17 invalid Under 35 U.S.C. Section 101. (MD JS-6, Case Terminated). (pj) (Entered: 09/24/2014)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 9/22/2014, Entered: None Status Conference
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 9/18/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                MINUTES OF Status Conference held before Judge George H. Wu: The Court's Tentative Ruling re Defendants' Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings Based on Unpatentability Under 35 U.S.C. Section 101, in McRO, Inc., v. Namco Bandai Games America, Inc., CV 12- J 0322-GW(FFMx), is circulated and attached hereto. Court hears oral argument. For reasons stated on the record, Defendants' motion is TAKEN UNDER SUBMISSION. Court to issue its ruling.Court Reporter: Katie Thibodeaux. (pj) (Entered: 09/22/2014)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 8/8/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                  TEXT ONLY ENTRY (IN CHAMBERS): by Judge George H. Wu; Pursuant to the request of defense counsel, the Status Conference previously scheduled for 09/04/2014 is CONTINUED to 9/18/2014 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu.THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (jag) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 08/08/2014)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 8/5/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                    **AMENDED** TEXT ONLY ENTRY 50 (IN CHAMBERS): by Judge George H. Wu; The Court, on its own motion, CONTINUES the Status Conference, previously scheduled for 8/14/2014 to 9/4/2014 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (jag) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 08/06/2014)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 8/5/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                      TEXT ONLY ENTRY (IN CHAMBERS): by Judge George H. Wu; The Court, on its own motion, CONTINUES the Status Conference previously scheduled for 8/14/2014 to 8/21/2014 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. WuTHERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (jag) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 08/05/2014)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 6/30/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                        MINUTES OF STATUS CONFERENCE held before Judge George H. Wu. Court and counsel confer. Parties will meet and confer re scheduling and possible consolidation of Track 2 cases with Track 1 cases. The status conference is continued to August 14, 2014 at 8:30 a.m. Joint status report re scheduling will be filed by noon on August 12, 2014. Court Reporter: Katie Thibodeaux. (lom) (Entered: 07/01/2014)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 6/26/2014, Entered: None
                                                          STATUS REPORT Joint filed by Plaintiff McRo Inc. (Raskin, Mark) (Entered: 06/26/2014)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 6/10/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                            PROTECTIVE ORDER GOVERNING THE DESIGNATION AND HANDLING OF CONFIDENTIAL MATERIALS by Magistrate Judge Frederick F. Mumm re Notice (Other) 43 (see attached) (jm) (Entered: 06/12/2014)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 5/29/2014, Entered: None
                                                              NOTICE OF DENIAL OF PETITIONS FOR INTER PARTES REVIEW filed by PLAINTIFF McRo Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Raskin, Mark) (Entered: 05/29/2014)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 5/28/2014, Entered: None
                                                                NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings 4/28/14 9:09 am re Transcript 44 THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (Thibodeaux, Katie) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 05/28/2014)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 5/28/2014, Entered: None
                                                                  TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 4/28/14 9:09 am. Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder: Katie Thibodeaux, CSR, RPR, CRR, phone number www.katiethibodeaux.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 6/18/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/28/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/26/2014. (Thibodeaux, Katie) (Entered: 05/28/2014)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 5/22/2014, Entered: None
                                                                    NOTICE OF MOTION AND Joint MOTION for Protective Order for Handling of Confidential Information filed by Plaintiff McRo Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Raskin, Mark) (Entered: 05/22/2014)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 4/28/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                      MINUTES OF Status Conference held before Judge George H. Wu: Markman hearing held in Track 1 Consolidated Cases (Lead Case McRO, Inc. v. Namco Bandai Games America, Inc., CV 12-10322-GW(FFMx)). For reasons stated on the record, the status conference iscontinued to June 30, 2014 at 8:30 a.m. Court Reporter: Katie Thibodeaux. (pj) (Entered: 04/29/2014)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 3/31/2014, Entered: None
                                                                        Planet Blue's ANSWER to Amended Counterclaim, filed by Plaintiff McRo Inc.(Raskin, Mark) (Entered: 03/31/2014)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 3/17/2014, Entered: None
                                                                          AMENDED ANSWER and Amended Counterclaim to Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim 23 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) 1 filed by Defendant and Counterclaim-Plaintiff Valve Corporation. (Mellema, Joseph) (Entered: 03/17/2014)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 2/28/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                            ORDER GRANTING PLANETBLUE'S SECOND UNOPPOSED MOTION TO EXTEND TIME FOR PLANET BLUE TO ANSWER VALVE CORPORATION'SCOUNTERCLAIMS by Judge George H. Wu: 38 . Planet Blue has until March 14, 2014 to Answer Valve Corporation'sCounterclaims Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. (pj) (Entered: 03/03/2014)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 2/27/2014, Entered: None
                                                                              NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Extend Time to File Answer to 3/14/2014 re Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim 23 filed by Plaintiff McRo Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Raskin, Mark) (Entered: 02/27/2014)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 2/24/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                ORDER GRANTING PLANET BLUE'S UNOPPOSED MOTION TO EXTEND TIME FOR PLANET BLUE TO ANSWER VALVE CORPORATION'S COUNTERCLAIMS by Counter-Claimant McRo Inc answer due 2/28/2014. (pj) (Entered: 02/26/2014)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 2/24/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                  MINUTES OF Telephone Conference held before Judge George H. Wu: Court and counsel confer re discovery issues. The Court, as indicated on the record, allows the Track Two cases to propound discovery within 45 days of receipt of discovery requests and interrogatories. Plaintiff Plane Blue will also provide Track Two cases with Track One discovery within two weeks from the date of this order. The status conference is continued to April 28, 2014 at 8:30 a.m. Court Reporter: Katie Thibedeaux. (bp) (Entered: 02/25/2014)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 2/20/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                    STATUS REPORT JOINT filed by Plaintiff McRo Inc. (Raskin, Mark) (Entered: 02/20/2014)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 2/19/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                      NOTICE TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE AT THE FEBRUARY 24, 2014 HEARING filed by Plaintiff McRo Inc. (Raskin, Mark) (Entered: 02/19/2014)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 2/14/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                        ORDER by Judge George H. Wu: granting 28 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Theodore J. Angelis on behalf of Defendants Valve Corporation, designating Joseph J. Mellema as local counsel. (lt) (Entered: 02/18/2014)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 2/14/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                          ORDER by Judge George H. Wu: granting 29 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney David T. McDonald on behalf of Defendants Valve Corporation, designating Joseph J. Mellema as local counsel. (lt) (Entered: 02/18/2014)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 2/18/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                            NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Extend Time to File Answer to 2/28/2014 re Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim 23 filed by Plaintiff McRo Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Raskin, Mark) (Entered: 02/18/2014)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 2/13/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                              MINUTES OF Status Conference held before Judge George H. Wu: The Courts Tentative Position re Scheduling, Markman Hearing, and Discovery, is circulated. Partieswill confer and file a proposed schedule and objections to the consolidation of Track 2 Cases by noon on February 20, 2014. The status conference is continued to February 24, 2014 at 8:30 a.m. Parties may appear telephonically, provided that notice is given to the clerk at least two business days prior to the hearing. Court Reporter: Katie Thibideaux. (pj) (Entered: 02/14/2014)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 2/13/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                First APPLICATION for attorney David T. McDonald to Appear Pro Hac Vice(PHV Fee of $325 receipt number 0973-13372015 paid.) filed by Defendant/Counterclaim Valve Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Mellema, Joseph) (Entered: 02/13/2014)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 2/13/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                  First APPLICATION for attorney Theodore J. Angelis to Appear Pro Hac Vice(PHV Fee of $325 receipt number 0973-13371571 paid.) filed by Defendant and Counterclaim Valve Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Mellema, Joseph) (Entered: 02/13/2014)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 2/11/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                    NOTICE OF TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE FOR MARK S. RASKIN AT THE FEBRUARY 13, 2014 HEARING filed by Plaintiff McRo Inc. (Raskin, Mark) (Entered: 02/11/2014)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 2/10/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                      STATUS REPORT JOINT filed by Plaintiff McRo Inc. (Raskin, Mark) (Entered: 02/10/2014)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 1/30/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                        MINUTES OF Status Conference held before Judge George H. Wu: Court and counsel confer re newly transferred cases. Parties will meet and confer and within 10 daysfile a joint status report as to consolidation of remaining cases in Categories B and C. A Status Conference is set for February 13, 2014 at 8:30 a.m. Parties may appear telephonically provided that notice is given to the clerk by February 11, 2014. Court Reporter: Katie Thibodeaux. (pj) (Entered: 02/04/2014)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 1/27/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                          NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant and Counter-Claim Plaintiff Valve Corporation, (pj) (Entered: 01/28/2014)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 1/27/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                            ANSWER to Complaint 1 JURY DEMAND., COUNTERCLAIMAS against McRo Inc filed by Defendant Valve Corporation.(pj) (Entered: 01/28/2014)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 1/7/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                              NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Plaintiff McRo Inc. correcting APPLICATION for attorney Mark S. Raskin to Appear Pro Hac Vice(PHV Fee of $325 receipt number 0973-13186517 paid.) 18 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Lee, Irene) (Entered: 01/07/2014)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 1/7/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: APPLICATION for attorney Mark S. Raskin to Appear Pro Hac Vice(PHV Fee of $325 receipt number 0973-13186517 paid.) 18 . The following error(s) was found: A Certification of Good Standing is not attached to Pro Hac Vice Application. Good Standing Certificates have been required since 09/08. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (lt) (Entered: 01/07/2014)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 1/6/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                  ORDER by Judge George H. Wu: granting 18 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Mark S. Raskin on behalf of Plaintiff, designating Irene Y. Lee as local counsel. (lt) (Entered: 01/07/2014)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 1/6/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                    STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Respond as to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) 1 filed by Defendant Valve Corporation.(Attorney Joseph J Mellema added to party Valve Corporation(pty:dft))(Mellema, Joseph) (Entered: 01/06/2014)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 1/3/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                      APPLICATION for attorney Mark S. Raskin to Appear Pro Hac Vice(PHV Fee of $325 receipt number 0973-13186517 paid.) filed by Plaintiff McRo Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Lee, Irene) (Entered: 01/03/2014)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 1/2/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Plaintiff McRo Inc. Related Case(s): 13-cv-01870, 13-cv-01871, 13-cv-01872, 13-cv-01873; Lead Case 12-cv-10322, consolidated with 12-cv-10323, 12-cv-10326, 12-cv-10327, 12-cv-10329, 12-cv-10331, 12-cv-10333, 12-cv-10335, 12-cv-10336, 12-cv-10337, 12-cv-10338, 12-cv-10340, 12-cv-10341, 12-cv-10342, 12-cv-10344 and 12-cv-10345 (Lee, Irene) (Entered: 01/02/2014)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 12/19/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                          PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff McRo Inc, upon Defendant Valve Corporation served on 12/10/2013, answer due 12/31/2013. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Bryan Meagher, Legal Assistant designated to Accept Service in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity. Original Summons NOT returned. (Lee, Irene) (Entered: 12/19/2013)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 12/19/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                            TEXT ONLY ENTRY (IN CHAMBERS): by Judge George H. Wu; The Scheduling Conference previously scheduled for 03/17/2014 at 11:30 a.m. before Judge Selna is vacated and TAKEN OFF-CALENDAR. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (jag) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 12/19/2013)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 12/19/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                              Standing Order Re Final Pre-Trial Conferences for Civil Jury Trials Before Judge George H. Wu. 1. You are instructed to read and to follow (unless otherwise superseded herein) the Central District of California Local Rules (henceforth Local Rules) 16-1 through 16-15 regarding pre-trial requirements. (See order for details.) (kti) (Entered: 12/19/2013)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 12/17/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                TEXT ONLY ENTRY (IN CHAMBERS) TRANSFER OF CASE TO JUDGE WU AND ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE by Judge George H Wu; This action has been reassigned to the Honorable George H. Wu, U.S. District Judge and the Honorable Fredrick F. Mumm, U.S. Magistrate Judge. The Court, on its own motion, sets a Status Conference for January 30, 2014 at 8:30 a.m. Plaintiffs counsel is directed to give notice of the status conference immediately to each party that makes an initial appearance in the action after this date.THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (jag) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 12/17/2013)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 12/12/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                  ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 08-05 -Related Case- filed. Related Case No: CV12-10322 GW (FFMx). Case transferred from Magistrate Judge Robert N. Block and Judge James V. Selna to Judge George H. Wu and Magistrate Judge Frederick F. Mumm for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge SACV13-01874 GW (FFMx). Signed by Judge George H. Wu (dro) (Entered: 12/16/2013)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 12/12/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                    ORDER SETTING RULE 26(f) SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge James V. Selna. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 3/10/2014. Scheduling Conference set for 3/17/2014 11:30 AM before Judge James V. Selna. (jlen) (Entered: 12/12/2013)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 12/11/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                      INITIAL ORDER FOLLOWING FILING OF COMPLAINT ASSIGNED TO JUDGE SELNA. (jlen) (Entered: 12/11/2013)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 12/5/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF FILING FEE DUE on Pro Hac Vice Application mailed to Mark S. Raskin for Plaintiff McRo Inc. Pro Hac Vice application has not been received by the court. Please return your completed Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case, form G-64, or a copy of the Notice of Electronic Filing of your application and the $325.00 fee and this notice immediately. Out-of-state federal government attorneys who are not employed by the U.S. Department of Justice are required to file a Pro Hac Vice application;no filing fee is required. You have been removed as counsel of record from this case for failure to submit this filing fee. (lwag) (Entered: 12/05/2013)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 12/5/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                          21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) 1 as to Defendant Valve Corporation. (lwag) (Entered: 12/05/2013)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 12/2/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                            AMENDED DOCUMENT filed by Plaintiff McRo Inc. dba Planet Blue. Amendment to Corporate Disclosure Statement 5 (Lee, Irene) (Entered: 12/02/2013)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 11/27/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                              REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or a Trademark (Initial Notification) filed by McRo Inc. dba Planet Blue. (Lee, Irene) (Entered: 11/27/2013)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 11/27/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Plaintiff McRo Inc. dba Planet Blue (Lee, Irene) (Entered: 11/27/2013)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 11/27/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                  Certificate and Notice of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff McRo Inc. dba Planet Blue, (Lee, Irene) (Entered: 11/27/2013)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 11/27/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                    Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) 1 filed by Plaintiff McRo Inc. dba Planet Blue. (Lee, Irene) (Entered: 11/27/2013)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 11/27/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                      CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff McRo Inc. dba Planet Blue. (Lee, Irene) (Entered: 11/27/2013)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 11/27/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                        COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-13048338 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff McRo Inc. dba Planet Blue. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Attorney Irene Y Lee added to party McRo Inc. dba Planet Blue(pty:pla))(Lee, Irene) (Entered: 11/27/2013)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                          Statistics

                                                                                                                                                          This case has been viewed 14 times.

                                                                                                                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                          Space
                                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                           
                                                                                                                                                          PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                          Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                          Need Password Help?