Paige-Bey v. City of New York et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Eastern District Court, Case No. 1:13-cv-07300

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated July 26, 2017 at 10:16 PM DT (3.8 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Zaire Paige-Bey, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Wende Correctional Facility

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Zaire Paige-Bey
v.
City of New York City of New York, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by New York City Law Department

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph Aaron Gutmann +1 212 356 2659 +1 212 356 3509 jgutmann@law.nyc.gov
No Logo Darren Albanese, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by New York City Law Department

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph Aaron Gutmann +1 212 356 2659 +1 212 356 3509 jgutmann@law.nyc.gov
No Logo District Attorney Charles J. Hynes, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by New York City Law Department

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph Aaron Gutmann +1 212 356 2659 +1 212 356 3509 jgutmann@law.nyc.gov
Bloomberg, Michael Rubens Bloomberg, Michael Rubens, Defendant
Officially listed as "Michael Bloomberg"

Toggle Switch Represented by New York City Law Department

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph Aaron Gutmann +1 212 356 2659 +1 212 356 3509 jgutmann@law.nyc.gov
No Logo Officer Rashan LaCoste, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by New York City Law Department

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph Aaron Gutmann +1 212 356 2659 +1 212 356 3509 jgutmann@law.nyc.gov
No Logo Police Officer David Lawrence, Defendant
No Logo Raymond Kelly, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by New York City Law Department

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph Aaron Gutmann +1 212 356 2659 +1 212 356 3509 jgutmann@law.nyc.gov
  Entries (45) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 4/14/2017, Entered: None Notice(Other)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 3/2/2017, Entered: None Scheduling Order
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 2/27/2017, Entered: None Case Management Statement
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 2/16/2017, Entered: None Answer to Amended Complaint
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 1/24/2017, Entered: None Amended Complaint
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 12/23/2016, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Document
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 12/12/2016, Entered: None Order on Motion to Dismiss
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 4/14/2015, Entered: None Reply in Support
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 4/14/2015, Entered: None Memorandum in Support
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 4/14/2015, Entered: None Notice(Other)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 4/14/2015, Entered: None
                      AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION in Support re 27 MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure filed by Darren Albanese, Michael Bloomberg, City of New York, Charles J. Hynes, Raymond Kelly, Rashan LaCoste. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B) (Gutmann, Joseph) (Entered: 04/14/2015)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 4/14/2015, Entered: None Dismiss
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 3/20/2015, Entered: None Notice(Other)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 3/17/2015, Entered: None
                            Notice of MOTION Not to Dismiss Case by Zaire Paige-Bey. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit in Opposition to the Motion, dated 1/28/2015, for "Summary Judgment to dismiss this case", # 2 "Exhibits" [Exhibit List only], # 3 Exhibit A, # 4 Exhibit B, # 5 Exhibit C, # 6 Exhibit D, # 7 Exhibit E, # 8 Exhibit F, # 9 Exhibit G, # 10 Affirmation of Service) (Barrett, C) (Entered: 03/20/2015)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 2/26/2015, Entered: None Letter
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 2/25/2015, Entered: None
                                Letter dated 2/10/2015 from Zaire Paige to Superintendent Mr. J. Lempke, re: limited privileges/law library/mental health. (Attachments: # 1 Letter dated 2/10/2015 from Zaire Paige Bey to USDJ Townes) (Barrett, C) (Entered: 02/26/2015)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 2/24/2015, Entered: None Scheduling Order
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 2/24/2015, Entered: None Letter
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 2/18/2015, Entered: None
                                      Letter dated 2/6/2015 from Zaire Paige-Bey to USDJ Townes, in response to Corporation Counsel Joseph Gutman's false anticipated motion to dismiss his amended complaint pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6). (Barrett, C) (Entered: 02/24/2015)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 2/23/2015, Entered: None Letter
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 2/17/2015, Entered: None
                                          Letter dated 2/10/2015 from Zaire Paige-Bey to USDJ Townes, advising he just recently mailed to the "Courts" his reasons why his case should not be dismissed and inquiring whether his last response was a valid response to Corporation Counsel's motion to dismiss or does he need to respond better. (Barrett, C) (Entered: 02/23/2015)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 2/9/2015, Entered: None NOTICE of Change of Address/Firm/Email
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 1/20/2015, Entered: None
                                              NOTICE of Change of Address by pro se Zaire Paige-Bey. New address: 11-A-2563, Wende Correctional Facility, Wende Rd., P.O. Box 1187, D-23-9, Alden, New York 14004-1187. (Address on docket sheet updated accordingly.) (Barrett, C) (Entered: 02/09/2015)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 1/8/2015, Entered: None
                                                RESPONSE to Motion re 18 Letter MOTION for pre motion conference to discuss defendants' anticipated Motion to Dismiss plaintiff's amended complaint, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6) filed by Zaire Paige-Bey, dated 12/30/2014. (Plaintiff's address has been updated to reflect he is now located at Great Meadow Correctional Facility.) (Barrett, C) (Entered: 01/14/2015)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 12/31/2014, Entered: None Order on Motion for Pre Motion Conference
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 12/10/2014, Entered: None Pre Motion Conference
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 10/17/2014, Entered: None Letter
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 10/16/2014, Entered: None
                                                        Letter dated 10/14/2014 from Zaire Paige-Bey to USMJ Reyes, notifying the Court that he provided Joseph Gutmann, Esq., of Corporation Counsel with a signed and notarized copy for access to sealed records pursuant to N.Y.C.P.L. 160.50 and 160.55, a copy of his mental health status, and proof of taking medication. A signed and notarized copy of medical release forms was previously provided. Also stating that his grandmother is not litigating this case but reviewing ruff [sic] draft, correcting spelling, and properly presenting it so it's understandable. (Barrett, C) (Barrett, C) (Entered: 10/17/2014)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 9/23/2014, Entered: None Letter
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 9/22/2014, Entered: None
                                                            Letter dated 9/18/14 from petitioner Zaire Paige-Bey requesting the status of a previous mailing to the Court. (Guzzi, Roseann) (Entered: 09/23/2014)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 6/30/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                              Letter dated 6/25/2014 from pro se Zaire Paige Bey to Judge Reyes, re: medical release forms. W/Attachments: # 1 Letter described as "a signed and notarized original copy of medical release forms," # 2 Envelope. (Latka-Mucha, Wieslawa) (Modified) (Entered: 07/01/2014)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 6/20/2014, Entered: None
                                                                Letter MOTION to Dismiss under Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 16(f) and 37(b) because plaintiffs grandmother, and not plaintiff, has continued to litigate on behalf of her grandson despite repeated instructions from the Court to refrain from doing so by Darren Albanese, Michael Bloomberg, City of New York, Charles J. Hynes, Raymond Kelly, Rashan LaCoste. (Gutmann, Joseph) (Entered: 06/20/2014)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 6/19/2014, Entered: None
                                                                  Letter dated 6/12/14 from Zaire Paige Bey to City of New York re: release of medical records. (Guzzi, Roseann) (Entered: 06/20/2014)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 6/13/2014, Entered: None
                                                                    Letter dated 6/13/14 from Bettie Paige-El, grandmother on behalf of of Zaire Paige-Bey. (Guzzi, Roseann) (Entered: 06/17/2014)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 5/29/2014, Entered: None
                                                                      CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE upon Zaire Paige-Bey dated 5/24/14. (Guzzi, Roseann) (Entered: 05/29/2014)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 5/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                                        MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Darren Albanese, Michael Bloomberg, City of New York, Charles J. Hynes, Raymond Kelly. (Gutmann, Joseph) event type Modified on 5/21/2014 (Vertus, Miriam). (Entered: 05/14/2014)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 5/9/2014, Entered: None
                                                                          NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph Aaron Gutmann on behalf of Darren Albanese, Michael Bloomberg, City of New York, Charles J. Hynes, Raymond Kelly (aty to be noticed) (Gutmann, Joseph) (Entered: 05/09/2014)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 5/2/2014, Entered: None
                                                                            SUMMONS Returned Executed by Zaire Paige-Bey. David Lawrence served on 4/28/2014, answer due 5/19/2014. (Guzzi, Roseann) (Entered: 05/05/2014)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 5/1/2014, Entered: None
                                                                              SUMMONS Returned Executed by Zaire Paige-Bey. Darren Albanese served on 4/29/2014, answer due 5/20/2014; Michael Bloomberg served on 4/23/2014, answer due 5/14/2014; Charles J. Hynes served on 4/29/2014, answer due 5/20/2014; Raymond Kelly served on 4/23/2014, answer due 5/14/2014; Rashan LaCoste served on 4/24/2014, answer due 5/15/2014. (Guzzi, Roseann) (Entered: 05/02/2014)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 4/24/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                Letter dated 4/24/14 from Bettie Paige-El Advocate on behalf of Zaire Paige-Bey re: requesting additional time to serve summons. (Guzzi, Roseann) (Entered: 04/25/2014)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 4/21/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                  AMENDED Summons Issued as to Darren Albanese, Michael Bloomberg, Charles J. Hynes, Raymond Kelly, Rashan LaCoste, David Lawrence on 4/21/14. (Guzzi, Roseann) (Entered: 04/24/2014)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document 4 Filed: 4/21/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                    AMENDED COMPLAINT against Darren Albanese, Michael Bloomberg, City of New York, Charles J. Hynes, Raymond Kelly, Rashan LaCoste, David Lawrence, filed by Zaire Paige-Bey. (Attachments: # 1 attachment State Supreme Kings) (Guzzi, Roseann) (Entered: 04/23/2014)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 12/30/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                      In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link:http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 12/30/2013)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 12/30/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                        Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 12/30/2013)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 12/30/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                          COMPLAINT against All Defendants Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -no,, filed by Zaire Paige-Bey. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 12/30/2013)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                            Statistics

                                                                                            This case has been viewed 161 times.

                                                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                            Space
                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                             
                                                                                            PlainSite
                                                                                            Sign Up
                                                                                            Need Password Help?