Minnesota Life Insurance Company v. Wilmington Trust Company (TV2)
Federal Civil Lawsuit Tennessee Eastern District Court, Case No. 3:14-cv-00443

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated October 9, 2018 at 1:28 PM DT (2.7 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Wilmington Trust Company, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, Ariadna Alvarez arialvarez@aol.com
, Ariadna Alvarez arialvarez@aol.com
, Ariadna Alvarez arialvarez@aol.com
, , , TERMINATED: 05/16/2014, TERMINATED: 05/16/2014, TERMINATED: 05/16/2014, TERMINATED: 05/16/2014, TERMINATED: 05/16/2014, TERMINATED: 05/16/2014 Neal D Jacobs +1 513 229 0111 +1 513 204 1958 ndjacobs@fuse.net
, , , TERMINATED: 05/16/2014, TERMINATED: 05/16/2014, TERMINATED: 05/16/2014, TERMINATED: 05/16/2014, TERMINATED: 05/16/2014, TERMINATED: 05/16/2014 Neal D Jacobs +1 513 229 0111 +1 513 204 1958 ndjacobs@fuse.net
, , , TERMINATED: 05/16/2014, TERMINATED: 05/16/2014, TERMINATED: 05/16/2014, TERMINATED: 05/16/2014, TERMINATED: 05/16/2014, TERMINATED: 05/16/2014 Neal D Jacobs +1 513 229 0111 +1 513 204 1958 ndjacobs@fuse.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Abrams & Bayliss LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , Kevin G. Abrams +1 302 778 1000 +1 302 778 1001 abrams@abramsbayliss.com
, , , , Kevin G. Abrams +1 302 778 1000 +1 302 778 1001 abrams@abramsbayliss.com
, , , , Kevin G. Abrams +1 302 778 1000 +1 302 778 1001 abrams@abramsbayliss.com
, , , , , John M. Seaman +1 302 778 1000 +1 302 573 3501 seaman@abramsbayliss.com
, , , , , John M. Seaman +1 302 778 1000 +1 302 573 3501 seaman@abramsbayliss.com
, , , , , John M. Seaman +1 302 778 1000 +1 302 573 3501 seaman@abramsbayliss.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Akin Gump Strauss Hauer & Feld LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , Stephen Michael Baldini +1 212 872 1062 +1 212 407 3262 sbaldini@akingump.com
, , Stephen Michael Baldini +1 212 872 1062 +1 212 407 3262 sbaldini@akingump.com
, , Stephen Michael Baldini +1 212 872 1062 +1 212 407 3262 sbaldini@akingump.com
, , , , , , , , TERMINATED: 08/25/2015, TERMINATED: 08/25/2015, PRO HAC VICE, TERMINATED: 08/25/2015, PRO HAC VICE, TERMINATED: 08/25/2015, PRO HAC VICE, TERMINATED: 08/25/2015, TERMINATED: 08/25/2015, TERMINATED: 08/25/2015, PRO HAC VICE, TERMINATED James Philip Chou +1 212 872 1098 +1 212 407 3298 jchou@akingump.com
, , , , , , , , TERMINATED: 08/25/2015, TERMINATED: 08/25/2015, PRO HAC VICE, TERMINATED: 08/25/2015, PRO HAC VICE, TERMINATED: 08/25/2015, PRO HAC VICE, TERMINATED: 08/25/2015, TERMINATED: 08/25/2015, TERMINATED: 08/25/2015, PRO HAC VICE, TERMINATED James Philip Chou +1 212 872 1098 +1 212 407 3298 jchou@akingump.com
, , , James Philip Chou +1 212 872 1098 +1 212 407 3298 jchou@akingump.com
, , , , , , , , TERMINATED: 08/25/2015, TERMINATED: 08/25/2015, PRO HAC VICE, TERMINATED: 08/25/2015, PRO HAC VICE, TERMINATED: 08/25/2015, PRO HAC VICE, TERMINATED: 08/25/2015, TERMINATED: 08/25/2015, TERMINATED: 08/25/2015, PRO HAC VICE, TERMINATED James Philip Chou +1 212 872 1098 +1 212 407 3298 jchou@akingump.com
, , , James Philip Chou +1 212 872 1098 +1 212 407 3298 jchou@akingump.com
, , , James Philip Chou +1 212 872 1098 +1 212 407 3298 jchou@akingump.com
, , , , , Julia Ingrid DeBeers +1 310 229 1066 +1 310 229 1001 jdebeers@akingump.com
, , , , , Julia Ingrid DeBeers +1 310 229 1066 +1 310 229 1001 jdebeers@akingump.com
, , , , , Julia Ingrid DeBeers +1 310 229 1066 +1 310 229 1001 jdebeers@akingump.com
, , , , , Daniel H. Golden +1 212 872 1000 +1 212 872 1002 dgolden@akingump.com
, , , , , Daniel H. Golden +1 212 872 1000 +1 212 872 1002 dgolden@akingump.com
, , , , , Daniel H. Golden +1 212 872 1000 +1 212 872 1002 dgolden@akingump.com
, , Jason L. Goldsmith +1 212 872 1000 +1 212 872 1202 jgoldsmith@akingump.com
, , Jason L. Goldsmith +1 212 872 1000 +1 212 872 1202 jgoldsmith@akingump.com
, , Jason L. Goldsmith +1 212 872 1000 +1 212 872 1202 jgoldsmith@akingump.com
, , Sunish Gulati +1 212 872 1000 sgulati@akingump.com
, , Sunish Gulati +1 212 872 1000 sgulati@akingump.com
, , Sunish Gulati +1 212 872 1000 sgulati@akingump.com
, , , , , Mitchell Patrick Hurley +1 212 872 1011 +1 212 872 1002 mhurley@akingump.com
, , , , , , , , Mitchell Patrick Hurley +1 212 872 1011 +1 212 872 1002 mhurley@akingump.com
, , , , , Mitchell Patrick Hurley +1 212 872 1011 +1 212 872 1002 mhurley@akingump.com
, , , , , , , , Mitchell Patrick Hurley +1 212 872 1011 +1 212 872 1002 mhurley@akingump.com
, , , , , Mitchell Patrick Hurley +1 212 872 1011 +1 212 872 1002 mhurley@akingump.com
, , , , , , , , Mitchell Patrick Hurley +1 212 872 1011 +1 212 872 1002 mhurley@akingump.com
, , , , , , , , Angeline Lam Koo +1 212 872 1000 +1 212 872 1202 akoo@akingump.com
, , Angeline Lam Koo +1 212 872 1000 +1 212 872 1202 akoo@akingump.com
, , , , , , , , Angeline Lam Koo +1 212 872 1000 +1 212 872 1202 akoo@akingump.com
, , Angeline Lam Koo +1 212 872 1000 +1 212 872 1202 akoo@akingump.com
, , , , , , , , Angeline Lam Koo +1 212 872 1000 +1 212 872 1202 akoo@akingump.com
, , Angeline Lam Koo +1 212 872 1000 +1 212 872 1202 akoo@akingump.com
, , Natalie Lesser +1 215 965 1200 nlesser@akingump.com
, , Natalie Lesser +1 215 965 1200 nlesser@akingump.com
, , Natalie Lesser +1 215 965 1200 nlesser@akingump.com
, , Jonah Eric McCarthy +1 202 887 4000 jmccarthy@akingump.com
, , Jonah Eric McCarthy +1 202 887 4000 jmccarthy@akingump.com
, , Jonah Eric McCarthy +1 202 887 4000 jmccarthy@akingump.com
, , Deborah Jill Newman +1 212 872 7481 +1 212 872 7585 djnewman@akingump.com
, , Deborah Jill Newman +1 212 872 7481 +1 212 872 7585 djnewman@akingump.com
, , Deborah Jill Newman +1 212 872 7481 +1 212 872 7585 djnewman@akingump.com
, , Anthony Tobias Pierce +1 202 887 4411 +1 202 887 4288 apierce@akingump.com
, , , Anthony Tobias Pierce +1 202 887 4411 +1 202 887 4288 apierce@akingump.com
, , Anthony Tobias Pierce +1 202 887 4411 +1 202 887 4288 apierce@akingump.com
, , , Anthony Tobias Pierce +1 202 887 4411 +1 202 887 4288 apierce@akingump.com
, , , Anthony Tobias Pierce +1 202 887 4411 +1 202 887 4288 apierce@akingump.com
, , Anthony Tobias Pierce +1 202 887 4411 +1 202 887 4288 apierce@akingump.com
, , Katherine Penn Scully Porter +1 212 872 7467 +1 212 872 1002 kporter@akingump.com
, , Katherine Penn Scully Porter +1 212 872 7467 +1 212 872 1002 kporter@akingump.com
, , , , , Katherine Penn Scully Porter +1 212 872 7467 +1 212 872 1002 kporter@akingump.com
, , , , , Katherine Penn Scully Porter +1 212 872 7467 +1 212 872 1002 kporter@akingump.com
, , Katherine Penn Scully Porter +1 212 872 7467 +1 212 872 1002 kporter@akingump.com
, , , , , Katherine Penn Scully Porter +1 212 872 7467 +1 212 872 1002 kporter@akingump.com
, , , , Reginald David Steer +1 415 765 9500 +1 415 765 9501 rsteer@akingump.com
, , , , Reginald David Steer +1 415 765 9500 +1 415 765 9501 rsteer@akingump.com
, , , , Reginald David Steer +1 415 765 9500 +1 415 765 9501 rsteer@akingump.com
, , , , , , , , David M Zensky +1 212 872 1000 +1 212 872 1002 dzensky@akingump.com
, , , , David M Zensky +1 212 872 1000 +1 212 872 1002 dzensky@akingump.com
, , , , , David M Zensky +1 212 872 1000 +1 212 872 1002 dzensky@akingump.com
, , , , , , , , David M Zensky +1 212 872 1000 +1 212 872 1002 dzensky@akingump.com
, , , , David M Zensky +1 212 872 1000 +1 212 872 1002 dzensky@akingump.com
, , , , , David M Zensky +1 212 872 1000 +1 212 872 1002 dzensky@akingump.com
, , , , , , , , David M Zensky +1 212 872 1000 +1 212 872 1002 dzensky@akingump.com
, , , , David M Zensky +1 212 872 1000 +1 212 872 1002 dzensky@akingump.com
, , , , , David M Zensky +1 212 872 1000 +1 212 872 1002 dzensky@akingump.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Alston & Bird, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, Whitney Rachelle Chelgren +1 213 576 1000 +1 213 576 1100 whitney.chelgren@alston.com
, Whitney Rachelle Chelgren +1 213 576 1000 +1 213 576 1100 whitney.chelgren@alston.com
, Whitney Rachelle Chelgren +1 213 576 1000 +1 213 576 1100 whitney.chelgren@alston.com
, , , Michael Edward Johnson +1 212 210 9400 +1 212 210 9444 mjohnson@alston.com
, , , Michael Edward Johnson +1 212 210 9400 +1 212 210 9444 mjohnson@alston.com
, , , Michael Edward Johnson +1 212 210 9400 +1 212 210 9444 mjohnson@alston.com
, , , Kurt Vandercook Osenbaugh +1 213 576 1000 +1 213 576 1100 kurt.osenbaugh@alston.com
, , , Kurt Vandercook Osenbaugh +1 213 576 1000 +1 213 576 1100 kurt.osenbaugh@alston.com
, , , Kurt Vandercook Osenbaugh +1 213 576 1000 +1 213 576 1100 kurt.osenbaugh@alston.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Arnstein & Lehr, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 01/17/2013, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 01/17/2013 Alfredo J Marquez-Sterling +1 305 374 3330 +3744 374 374 4744 ajsterling@arnstein.com
, , , , ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 01/17/2013, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 01/17/2013 Alfredo J Marquez-Sterling +1 305 374 3330 +3744 374 374 4744 ajsterling@arnstein.com
, , , , ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 01/17/2013, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 01/17/2013 Alfredo J Marquez-Sterling +1 305 374 3330 +3744 374 374 4744 ajsterling@arnstein.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Aronauer, Goldfarb, Re & Yudell, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , Joseph Aronauer +1 212 755 6000 jaronauer@aryllp.com
, , Joseph Aronauer +1 212 755 6000 jaronauer@aryllp.com
, , Joseph Aronauer +1 212 755 6000 jaronauer@aryllp.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Ashby & Geddes

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , Andrew Dieter Cordo +1 302 654 1888 acordo@ashby-geddes.com
, , Andrew Dieter Cordo +1 302 654 1888 acordo@ashby-geddes.com
, , Andrew Dieter Cordo +1 302 654 1888 acordo@ashby-geddes.com
, , , , , Philip Trainer, Jr. +1 302 654 1888 +1 302 654 2067 ptrainer@ashby-geddes.com
, , , , , Philip Trainer, Jr. +1 302 654 1888 +1 302 654 2067 ptrainer@ashby-geddes.com
, , , , , Philip Trainer, Jr. +1 302 654 1888 +1 302 654 2067 ptrainer@ashby-geddes.com
, , Frederick T. Mickler, IV +1 302 654 1888 +1 302 654 2067 tmickler@ashby-geddes.com
, , Frederick T. Mickler, IV +1 302 654 1888 +1 302 654 2067 tmickler@ashby-geddes.com
, , Frederick T. Mickler, IV +1 302 654 1888 +1 302 654 2067 tmickler@ashby-geddes.com

Toggle Switch Represented by att.net Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , Matthew H. Farmer +1 212 872 1000 +1 212 872 1002 mfarmer@akingump.com
, , , , , , , , Matthew H. Farmer +1 212 872 1000 +1 212 872 1002 mfarmer@akingump.com
, , , , , , , , Matthew H. Farmer +1 212 872 1000 +1 212 872 1002 mfarmer@akingump.com
, , Jeffrey Carl Fourmaux +1 212 833 1100 +1 212 833 1250 jfourmaux@fklaw.com
, , Jeffrey Carl Fourmaux +1 212 833 1100 +1 212 833 1250 jfourmaux@fklaw.com
, , Jeffrey Carl Fourmaux +1 212 833 1100 +1 212 833 1250 jfourmaux@fklaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Baillon Thome Jozwiak & Wanta LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , Scott Moriarity +1 612 252 3578 samoriarity@baillonthome.com
, , , , , , , , , , , , , Scott Moriarity +1 612 252 3578 samoriarity@baillonthome.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Baillon Thome Jozwiak Miller & Wanta, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , Scott Moriarity +1 612 252 3578 samoriarity@baillonthome.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Burke Williams & Sorensen LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , Allan Edward Ceran +1 213 236 0600 +1 213 236 2700 aceran@bwslaw.com
, , Allan Edward Ceran +1 213 236 0600 +1 213 236 2700 aceran@bwslaw.com
, , Allan Edward Ceran +1 213 236 0600 +1 213 236 2700 aceran@bwslaw.com
, , , , , Melodie Kay Larsen +1 213 236 0600 +1 213 236 2700 mlarsen@bwslaw.com
, , , , , Melodie Kay Larsen +1 213 236 0600 +1 213 236 2700 mlarsen@bwslaw.com
, , , , , Melodie Kay Larsen +1 213 236 0600 +1 213 236 2700 mlarsen@bwslaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Canal Place

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, S. Ault Hootsell, III +1 504 566 1311 +1 504 568 9130
, S. Ault Hootsell, III +1 504 566 1311 +1 504 568 9130
, S. Ault Hootsell, III +1 504 566 1311 +1 504 568 9130

Toggle Switch Represented by Casner & Edwards, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , Donna Marie Brewer +1 617 426 5900 +1 617 426 8810 brewer@casneredwards.com
, , Donna Marie Brewer +1 617 426 5900 +1 617 426 8810 brewer@casneredwards.com
, , Donna Marie Brewer +1 617 426 5900 +1 617 426 8810 brewer@casneredwards.com
, , Andrew T. Imbriglio +1 617 426 5900 imbriglio@casneredwards.com
, , Andrew T. Imbriglio +1 617 426 5900 imbriglio@casneredwards.com
, , Andrew T. Imbriglio +1 617 426 5900 imbriglio@casneredwards.com
, , Douglas K. Mansfield +1 617 426 5900 +1 617 426 8810 mansfield@casneredwards.com
, , Douglas K. Mansfield +1 617 426 5900 +1 617 426 8810 mansfield@casneredwards.com
, , Douglas K. Mansfield +1 617 426 5900 +1 617 426 8810 mansfield@casneredwards.com
, , , John T. Morrier +1 617 426 5900 +1 617 426 8810 morrier@casneredwards.com
, , , John T. Morrier +1 617 426 5900 +1 617 426 8810 morrier@casneredwards.com
, , , John T. Morrier +1 617 426 5900 +1 617 426 8810 morrier@casneredwards.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Covington & Burling, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael Brian Hopkins +1 212 841 1000
Space Michael Brian Hopkins +1 212 841 1000
Space Michael Brian Hopkins +1 212 841 1000

Toggle Switch Represented by Cozen O'Connor, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , David A. Felice +1 302 295 2000 +1 302 295 2013 dfelice@cozen.com
, , , David A. Felice +1 302 295 2000 +1 302 295 2013 dfelice@cozen.com
, , , David A. Felice +1 302 295 2000 +1 302 295 2013 dfelice@cozen.com
, , , , , CAMILLE M. MILLER +1 215 665 7273 +1 215 701 2273 cmiller@cozen.com
, , , , , CAMILLE M. MILLER +1 215 665 7273 +1 215 701 2273 cmiller@cozen.com
, , , , , CAMILLE M. MILLER +1 215 665 7273 +1 215 701 2273 cmiller@cozen.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Cross & Simon, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , Joseph Grey +1 302 777 4200 +1 302 777 4224 jgrey@crosslaw.com
, , , , , , , , , , , Joseph Grey +1 302 777 4200 +1 302 777 4224 jgrey@crosslaw.com
, , , , , , , , , , , Joseph Grey +1 302 777 4200 +1 302 777 4224 jgrey@crosslaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Curtis, Mallet-Prevost, Colt & Mosle, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, Kathryn Alisbah
, Kathryn Alisbah
, Kathryn Alisbah
, Steven J. Reisman +1 212 696 6065 +1 212 697 1559
, Steven J. Reisman +1 212 696 6065 +1 212 697 1559
, Steven J. Reisman +1 212 696 6065 +1 212 697 1559

Toggle Switch Represented by Friday, Eldredge & Clark, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , William A. Waddell, Jr. +1 501 370 1510 +1 501 244 5342 waddell@fridayfirm.com
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , William A. Waddell, Jr. +1 501 370 1510 +1 501 244 5342 waddell@fridayfirm.com
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , William A. Waddell, Jr. +1 501 370 1510 +1 501 244 5342 waddell@fridayfirm.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Friedman Kaplan Seiler & Adelman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , Amy Christine Brown , +1 212 833 1239 +1 212 373 7939 abrown@fklaw.com
, , Amy Christine Brown , +1 212 833 1239 +1 212 373 7939 abrown@fklaw.com
, , Amy Christine Brown , +1 212 833 1239 +1 212 373 7939 abrown@fklaw.com
, , ROBERT J. LACK +1 973 877 6400 +1 212 373 7908 rlack@fklaw.com
, , ROBERT J. LACK +1 973 877 6400 +1 212 373 7908 rlack@fklaw.com
, , ROBERT J. LACK +1 973 877 6400 +1 212 373 7908 rlack@fklaw.com
, , Hal Neier +1 212 833 1111 +2127 212 212 7911 hneier@fklaw.com
, , Hal Neier +1 212 833 1111 +2127 212 212 7911 hneier@fklaw.com
, , Hal Neier +1 212 833 1111 +2127 212 212 7911 hneier@fklaw.com
, , Ricardo Solano +1 212 833 1100 +1 212 833 1250 rsolano@fklaw.com
, , Ricardo Solano +1 212 833 1100 +1 212 833 1250 rsolano@fklaw.com
, , Ricardo Solano +1 212 833 1100 +1 212 833 1250 rsolano@fklaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Frost Brown Todd LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Stephen Eric Chappelear +1 614 464 1211 +1 614 464 1737 schappelear@fbtlaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Stephen Eric Chappelear +1 614 464 1211 +1 614 464 1737 schappelear@fbtlaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Stephen Eric Chappelear +1 614 464 1211 +1 614 464 1737 schappelear@fbtlaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Russell Jay Kutell +1 614 464 1211 +1 614 464 1737 rkutell@fbtlaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Russell Jay Kutell +1 614 464 1211 +1 614 464 1737 rkutell@fbtlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Frost, Brown & Todd, LLC (Louisville)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Russell Jay Kutell +1 614 464 1211 +1 614 464 1737 rkutell@fbtlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Gibson Dunn & Crutcher, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 10/10/2017, LEAD ATTORNEY Gabriel Gillett +1 212 351 2656 +1 212 716 0858 GGillett@gibsondunn.com
TERMINATED: 10/10/2017, LEAD ATTORNEY Gabriel Gillett +1 212 351 2656 +1 212 716 0858 GGillett@gibsondunn.com
TERMINATED: 10/10/2017, LEAD ATTORNEY Gabriel Gillett +1 212 351 2656 +1 212 716 0858 GGillett@gibsondunn.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 03/06/2018 Mitchell Alan Karlan +1 212 351 3827 +1 212 351 5254 mkarlan@gibsondunn.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 03/06/2018 Mitchell Alan Karlan +1 212 351 3827 +1 212 351 5254 mkarlan@gibsondunn.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 03/06/2018 Mitchell Alan Karlan +1 212 351 3827 +1 212 351 5254 mkarlan@gibsondunn.com
TERMINATED: 04/02/2018, LEAD ATTORNEY Adam Offenhartz +1 212 351 3808 +1 212 351 5272 aoffenhartz@gibsondunn.com
TERMINATED: 04/02/2018, LEAD ATTORNEY Adam Offenhartz +1 212 351 3808 +1 212 351 5272 aoffenhartz@gibsondunn.com
TERMINATED: 04/02/2018, LEAD ATTORNEY Adam Offenhartz +1 212 351 3808 +1 212 351 5272 aoffenhartz@gibsondunn.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 03/06/2018 Lisa Heather Rubin +1 212 351 2390 +1 212 716 0790 lrubin@gibsondunn.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 03/06/2018 Lisa Heather Rubin +1 212 351 2390 +1 212 716 0790 lrubin@gibsondunn.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 03/06/2018 Lisa Heather Rubin +1 212 351 2390 +1 212 716 0790 lrubin@gibsondunn.com
TERMINATED: 04/02/2018, LEAD ATTORNEY Aric Hugo Wu +1 212 351 3820 +1 212 351 5344 awu@gibsondunn.com
TERMINATED: 04/02/2018, LEAD ATTORNEY Aric Hugo Wu +1 212 351 3820 +1 212 351 5344 awu@gibsondunn.com
TERMINATED: 04/02/2018, LEAD ATTORNEY Aric Hugo Wu +1 212 351 3820 +1 212 351 5344 awu@gibsondunn.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Hawkins Parnell Thackston & Young, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Brenton S. Bean +1 404 614 7400 +1 404 614 7500 bbean@hptylaw.com
Space Brenton S. Bean +1 404 614 7400 +1 404 614 7500 bbean@hptylaw.com
Space Brenton S. Bean +1 404 614 7400 +1 404 614 7500 bbean@hptylaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Holland & Knight, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, William F Hamilton +1 813 229 8500 +1 813 229 0134 william.hamilton@hklaw.com
, William F Hamilton +1 813 229 8500 +1 813 229 0134 william.hamilton@hklaw.com
, William F Hamilton +1 813 229 8500 +1 813 229 0134 william.hamilton@hklaw.com
, Frank A Lonegro
, Frank A Lonegro
, Frank A Lonegro
, Martin Leonard Steinberg
, Martin Leonard Steinberg
, Martin Leonard Steinberg

Toggle Switch Represented by Kasowitz, Benson, Torres & Friedman, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , Paul J Burgo +1 212 506 1865 +1 212 835 5265
, , , , , Paul J Burgo +1 212 506 1865 +1 212 835 5265
, , , , , Paul J Burgo +1 212 506 1865 +1 212 835 5265
, , Sheron Korpus +1 212 506 1969 +1 212 506 3397 skorpus@kasowitz.com
, , Sheron Korpus +1 212 506 1969 +1 212 506 3397 skorpus@kasowitz.com
, , Sheron Korpus +1 212 506 1969 +1 212 506 3397 skorpus@kasowitz.com
, , David S. Rosner +1 212 506 1726 +1 212 506 1800 drosner@kasowitz.com
, , David S. Rosner +1 212 506 1726 +1 212 506 1800 drosner@kasowitz.com
, , David S. Rosner +1 212 506 1726 +1 212 506 1800 drosner@kasowitz.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Kelley, Wolter & Scott, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , Kevin Matthew Magnuson +1 612 371 9090 +1 612 339 4181 kmagnuson@kelleywolter.com
, , Kevin Matthew Magnuson +1 612 371 9090 +1 612 339 4181 kmagnuson@kelleywolter.com
, , Kevin Matthew Magnuson +1 612 371 9090 +1 612 339 4181 kmagnuson@kelleywolter.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Kilpatrick Townsend & Stockton, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, Stephen Earl Hudson +1 404 815 6356 +1 404 541 3248 shudson@kilpatrickstockton.com
, Stephen Earl Hudson +1 404 815 6356 +1 404 541 3248 shudson@kilpatrickstockton.com
, Stephen Earl Hudson +1 404 815 6356 +1 404 541 3248 shudson@kilpatrickstockton.com
Space Sameer Kumar Kapoor +1 404 815 6566 +1 404 541 4672 skapoor@kilpatrickstockton.com
Space Sameer Kumar Kapoor +1 404 815 6566 +1 404 541 4672 skapoor@kilpatrickstockton.com
Space Sameer Kumar Kapoor +1 404 815 6566 +1 404 541 4672 skapoor@kilpatrickstockton.com
Space Todd C. Meyers +1 404 815 6500 +1 404 815 6555 TMeyers@KilpatrickStockton.com
Space Todd C. Meyers +1 404 815 6500 +1 404 815 6555 TMeyers@KilpatrickStockton.com
Space Todd C. Meyers +1 404 815 6500 +1 404 815 6555 TMeyers@KilpatrickStockton.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Latham & Watkins LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 08/24/2017, PRO HAC VICE Drew Ensign +1 202 637 2200 drew.ensign@lw.com
TERMINATED: 08/24/2017, PRO HAC VICE Drew Ensign +1 202 637 2200 drew.ensign@lw.com
TERMINATED: 08/24/2017, PRO HAC VICE Drew Ensign +1 202 637 2200 drew.ensign@lw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas James Giblin +1 212 906 1665 +1 212 751 4864 thomas.giblin@lw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas James Giblin +1 212 906 1665 +1 212 751 4864 thomas.giblin@lw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas James Giblin +1 212 906 1665 +1 212 751 4864 thomas.giblin@lw.com
TERMINATED: 07/20/2015, PRO HAC VICE Marc A. Levitt +1 202 637 2200 +1 202 637 2201 marc.levitt@lw.com
TERMINATED: 07/20/2015, PRO HAC VICE Marc A. Levitt +1 202 637 2200 +1 202 637 2201 marc.levitt@lw.com
TERMINATED: 07/20/2015, PRO HAC VICE Marc A. Levitt +1 202 637 2200 +1 202 637 2201 marc.levitt@lw.com
PRO HAC VICE, TERMINATED: 08/14/2014 Matthew E. Miller +1 202 637 2200 +1 202 637 2201 matthew.miller@lw.com
PRO HAC VICE, TERMINATED: 08/14/2014 Matthew E. Miller +1 202 637 2200 +1 202 637 2201 matthew.miller@lw.com
PRO HAC VICE, TERMINATED: 08/14/2014 Matthew E. Miller +1 202 637 2200 +1 202 637 2201 matthew.miller@lw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE Edward Jay Shapiro +1 202 637 2273 +1 202 637 2201 edward.shapiro@lw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE Edward Jay Shapiro +1 202 637 2273 +1 202 637 2201 edward.shapiro@lw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE Edward Jay Shapiro +1 202 637 2273 +1 202 637 2201 edward.shapiro@lw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE William R. Sherman +1 202 637 2200 +1 202 637 2201 william.sherman@lw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE William R. Sherman +1 202 637 2200 +1 202 637 2201 william.sherman@lw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE William R. Sherman +1 202 637 2200 +1 202 637 2201 william.sherman@lw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE Benjamin W. Snyder +1 202 637 1004 benjamin.w.snyder@lw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE Benjamin W. Snyder +1 202 637 1004 benjamin.w.snyder@lw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE Benjamin W. Snyder +1 202 637 1004 benjamin.w.snyder@lw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE Matthew David Thurlow +1 202 637 2200 matthew.thurlow@lw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE Matthew David Thurlow +1 202 637 2200 matthew.thurlow@lw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE Matthew David Thurlow +1 202 637 2200 matthew.thurlow@lw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE Christopher S. Turner , +1 202 637 2200 christopher.turner@lw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE Christopher S. Turner , +1 202 637 2200 christopher.turner@lw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE Christopher S. Turner , +1 202 637 2200 christopher.turner@lw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by LaVelle & LaVelle PLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , MATTHEW K. LAVELLE +1 602 279 2100 +1 602 279 2114 matt@lavelle-lavelle.com
, , MATTHEW K. LAVELLE +1 602 279 2100 +1 602 279 2114 matt@lavelle-lavelle.com
, , MATTHEW K. LAVELLE +1 602 279 2100 +1 602 279 2114 matt@lavelle-lavelle.com
, , Michael Joseph LaVelle +1 602 279 2100 +1 602 279 2114 mjl@lavelle-lavelle.com
, , Michael Joseph LaVelle +1 602 279 2100 +1 602 279 2114 mjl@lavelle-lavelle.com
, , Michael Joseph LaVelle +1 602 279 2100 +1 602 279 2114 mjl@lavelle-lavelle.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Lewis, Thomason, King, Krieg & Waldrop, P.C. (Knox)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , Benjamin W Jones +1 865 546 4646 +1 865 523 6529 bjones@lewisking.com
, , , Benjamin W Jones +1 865 546 4646 +1 865 523 6529 bjones@lewisking.com
, , , Benjamin W Jones +1 865 546 4646 +1 865 523 6529 bjones@lewisking.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Locke Lord Bissell & Liddell, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , Gregory Thomas Casamento +1 212 415 8600 +1 212 303 2754 gcasamento@lockelord.com
, , , , , Gregory Thomas Casamento +1 212 415 8600 +1 212 303 2754 gcasamento@lockelord.com
, , , , , Gregory Thomas Casamento +1 212 415 8600 +1 212 303 2754 gcasamento@lockelord.com
, , , , , R. James Jude De Rose, III +1 212 812 8329 +1 212 812 8379 rderose@lockelord.com
, , , , , R. James Jude De Rose, III +1 212 812 8329 +1 212 812 8379 rderose@lockelord.com
, , , , , R. James Jude De Rose, III +1 212 812 8329 +1 212 812 8379 rderose@lockelord.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Lockridge Grindal Nauen, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , David W Asp +1 612 339 6900 +1 612 339 0981 dwasp@locklaw.com
, , , , , , , , , , , , , David W Asp +1 612 339 6900 +1 612 339 0981 dwasp@locklaw.com
, , , , , , , , , , , , , David W Asp +1 612 339 6900 +1 612 339 0981 dwasp@locklaw.com
, , , , , , , , , , , , , Robert R. Shelquist +1 612 339 6900 +1 612 339 0981 rkshelquist@locklaw.com
, , , , , , , , , , , , , Robert R. Shelquist +1 612 339 6900 +1 612 339 0981 rkshelquist@locklaw.com
, , , , , , , , , , , , , Robert R. Shelquist +1 612 339 6900 +1 612 339 0981 rkshelquist@locklaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Mcconnell Valdes Llc

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, Eduardo A. Zayas-Marxuach +1 787 250 5813 +1 787 250 5185 ezm@mcvpr.com
, Eduardo A. Zayas-Marxuach +1 787 250 5813 +1 787 250 5185 ezm@mcvpr.com
, Eduardo A. Zayas-Marxuach +1 787 250 5813 +1 787 250 5185 ezm@mcvpr.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Milbank, Tweed, Hadley & McCloy LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Tyson Lomazow +1 212 530 5000 +1 212 822 5367 tlomazow@milbank.com
Space Tyson Lomazow +1 212 530 5000 +1 212 822 5367 tlomazow@milbank.com
Space Tyson Lomazow +1 212 530 5000 +1 212 822 5367 tlomazow@milbank.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Miller & Wrubel, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , Claire L. Huene +1 212 336 3519 +1 212 336 3555 chuene@mw-law.com
, , , Claire L. Huene +1 212 336 3519 +1 212 336 3555 chuene@mw-law.com
, , , Claire L. Huene +1 212 336 3519 +1 212 336 3555 chuene@mw-law.com
, , , Charles Richard Jacob, III +1 212 336 3500 +1 212 336 3555 cjacob@mw-law.com
, , , Charles Richard Jacob, III +1 212 336 3500 +1 212 336 3555 cjacob@mw-law.com
, , , Charles Richard Jacob, III +1 212 336 3500 +1 212 336 3555 cjacob@mw-law.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Polsinelli PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Russell Scott Jones +1 816 412 3355 +1 816 374 0509 rsjones@polsinelli.com
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Russell Scott Jones +1 816 412 3355 +1 816 374 0509 rsjones@polsinelli.com
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Russell Scott Jones +1 816 412 3355 +1 816 374 0509 rsjones@polsinelli.com
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Mark A. Olthoff +1 816 753 1000 +1 816 753 1536 molthoff@polsinelli.com
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Mark A. Olthoff +1 816 753 1000 +1 816 753 1536 molthoff@polsinelli.com
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Mark A. Olthoff +1 816 753 1000 +1 816 753 1536 molthoff@polsinelli.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Rose Law Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Stephen N. Joiner +1 501 377 0329 +1 501 375 1309 sjoiner@roselawfirm.com
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Stephen N. Joiner +1 501 377 0329 +1 501 375 1309 sjoiner@roselawfirm.com
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Stephen N. Joiner +1 501 377 0329 +1 501 375 1309 sjoiner@roselawfirm.com
, , , , , , Kathryn Bennett Perkins kperkins@roselawfirm.com
, , , , , , Kathryn Bennett Perkins kperkins@roselawfirm.com
, , , , , , Kathryn Bennett Perkins kperkins@roselawfirm.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Saint Ann Court

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , TERMINATED: 06/20/2013, TERMINATED: 06/20/2013, TERMINATED: 06/20/2013, TERMINATED: 06/20/2013, TERMINATED: 06/20/2013, TERMINATED: 06/20/2013 Jeffrey Goldfarb +1 214 583 2233 +1 214 583 2234 jgoldfarb@goldfarbbranham.com
, , , TERMINATED: 06/20/2013, TERMINATED: 06/20/2013, TERMINATED: 06/20/2013, TERMINATED: 06/20/2013, TERMINATED: 06/20/2013, TERMINATED: 06/20/2013 Jeffrey Goldfarb +1 214 583 2233 +1 214 583 2234 jgoldfarb@goldfarbbranham.com
, , , TERMINATED: 06/20/2013, TERMINATED: 06/20/2013, TERMINATED: 06/20/2013, TERMINATED: 06/20/2013, TERMINATED: 06/20/2013, TERMINATED: 06/20/2013 Jeffrey Goldfarb +1 214 583 2233 +1 214 583 2234 jgoldfarb@goldfarbbranham.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Shoemaker Ghiselli & Schwartz, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , Paul H. Schwartz +1 303 530 3452 pschwartz@sgslitigation.com
, , Paul H. Schwartz +1 303 530 3452 pschwartz@sgslitigation.com
, , Paul H. Schwartz +1 303 530 3452 pschwartz@sgslitigation.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Strauss & Troy

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , John Michael Levy +1 513 621 2120 jmlevy@strausstroy.com
, , , , , John Michael Levy +1 513 621 2120 jmlevy@strausstroy.com
, , , , , John Michael Levy +1 513 621 2120 jmlevy@strausstroy.com
, , , , , Nicolas Dylan Wayne +1 513 621 2120 +1 513 629 9426 ndwayne@strausstroy.com
, , , , , Nicolas Dylan Wayne +1 513 621 2120 +1 513 629 9426 ndwayne@strausstroy.com
, , , , , Nicolas Dylan Wayne +1 513 621 2120 +1 513 629 9426 ndwayne@strausstroy.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 1200

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Logan W Overman +1 816 561 7007 lwoverman@bowse-law.com
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Logan W Overman +1 816 561 7007 lwoverman@bowse-law.com
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Logan W Overman +1 816 561 7007 lwoverman@bowse-law.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 2100

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , Alison R Kalinski +1 213 688 0430 +1 213 688 0440 akalinski@pldlawyers.com
, , , Alison R Kalinski +1 213 688 0430 +1 213 688 0440 akalinski@pldlawyers.com
, , , Alison R Kalinski +1 213 688 0430 +1 213 688 0440 akalinski@pldlawyers.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Sullivan, Hazeltine Allinson LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Elihu Ezekiel Allinson, III +1 302 428 8191 +1 302 428 8195 ZAllinson@SHA-LLC.com
Space Elihu Ezekiel Allinson, III +1 302 428 8191 +1 302 428 8195 ZAllinson@SHA-LLC.com
Space Elihu Ezekiel Allinson, III +1 302 428 8191 +1 302 428 8195 ZAllinson@SHA-LLC.com
, William David Sullivan +1 302 428 8191 +1 302 428 8195 bsullivan@sha-llc.com
, William David Sullivan +1 302 428 8191 +1 302 428 8195 bsullivan@sha-llc.com
, William David Sullivan +1 302 428 8191 +1 302 428 8195 bsullivan@sha-llc.com

Toggle Switch Represented by The Federal Reserve Building

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , Charles Coster Ashdown +1 513 621 2120 +1 513 241 8259 ccashdown@strausstroy.com
, , , , , Charles Coster Ashdown +1 513 621 2120 +1 513 241 8259 ccashdown@strausstroy.com
, , , , , Charles Coster Ashdown +1 513 621 2120 +1 513 241 8259 ccashdown@strausstroy.com
, , , , , Richard Wayne, S. +1 513 621 2120 +6299 629 629 9426 rswayne@strausstroy.com
, , , , , Richard Wayne, S. +1 513 621 2120 +6299 629 629 9426 rswayne@strausstroy.com
, , , , , Richard Wayne, S. +1 513 621 2120 +6299 629 629 9426 rswayne@strausstroy.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown at time of filing

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Unknown at time of filing
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Unknown at time of filing
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Unknown at time of filing

Toggle Switch Represented by Wilmington Trust Company

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Wilmington Trust Company
Space Wilmington Trust Company
Space Wilmington Trust Company

Toggle Switch Represented by WILSON AND ASSOCIATES, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , C. Kent Jolliff
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , C. Kent Jolliff
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , C. Kent Jolliff

Toggle Switch Represented by WOMACK LAW FIRM

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Roger McNeil +1 870 932 0900 +1 870 932 2553 rmcneil@wlpmlaw.com
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Roger McNeil +1 870 932 0900 +1 870 932 2553 rmcneil@wlpmlaw.com
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Roger McNeil +1 870 932 0900 +1 870 932 2553 rmcneil@wlpmlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by WOODRUFF LAW FIRM

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Arlon L. Woodruff +1 870 237 4319
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Arlon L. Woodruff +1 870 237 4319
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Arlon L. Woodruff +1 870 237 4319

Toggle Switch Represented by Wright, Lindsey & Jennings, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Claire Shows Hancock +1 501 371 0808
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Claire Shows Hancock +1 501 371 0808
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Claire Shows Hancock +1 501 371 0808
v.
No Logo Fund House FCP-SIF-International Life Settlements Fund, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Lewis, Thomason, King, Krieg & Waldrop, P.C. (Knox)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , Benjamin W Jones +1 865 546 4646 +1 865 523 6529 bjones@lewisking.com
, , , Benjamin W Jones +1 865 546 4646 +1 865 523 6529 bjones@lewisking.com
, , , Benjamin W Jones +1 865 546 4646 +1 865 523 6529 bjones@lewisking.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Locke Lord Bissell & Liddell, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , Gregory Thomas Casamento +1 212 415 8600 +1 212 303 2754 gcasamento@lockelord.com
, , , , , Gregory Thomas Casamento +1 212 415 8600 +1 212 303 2754 gcasamento@lockelord.com
, , , , , Gregory Thomas Casamento +1 212 415 8600 +1 212 303 2754 gcasamento@lockelord.com
, , , , , R. James Jude De Rose, III +1 212 812 8329 +1 212 812 8379 rderose@lockelord.com
, , , , , R. James Jude De Rose, III +1 212 812 8329 +1 212 812 8379 rderose@lockelord.com
, , , , , R. James Jude De Rose, III +1 212 812 8329 +1 212 812 8379 rderose@lockelord.com
No Logo Genesis Merchant Partners, LP, Defendant
No Logo J. Randall Hooper, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Leibowitz Law Firm, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , Jennifer Knapp Hemmelgarn +1 865 637 1809 +1 865 637 9276 jlk@leibowitzfirm.com
, , , Jennifer Knapp Hemmelgarn +1 865 637 1809 +1 865 637 9276 jlk@leibowitzfirm.com
, , , Jennifer Knapp Hemmelgarn +1 865 637 1809 +1 865 637 9276 jlk@leibowitzfirm.com
, , , Lawrence P Leibowitz +1 865 637 1809 lpl@leibowitz-cohen.com
, , , Lawrence P Leibowitz +1 865 637 1809 lpl@leibowitz-cohen.com
, , , Lawrence P Leibowitz +1 865 637 1809 lpl@leibowitz-cohen.com
No Logo Minnesota Life Insurance Company, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Catherine A.T. Nelson +1 312 382 3100 cathynelson@comcast.net
Space Catherine A.T. Nelson +1 312 382 3100 cathynelson@comcast.net

Toggle Switch Represented by att.net Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , Chad Brian Walker +1 214 453 6500 +1 214 453 6400 cbwalker@winston.com
, , , , Chad Brian Walker +1 214 453 6500 +1 214 453 6400 cbwalker@winston.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Phillip Gardner Whaley +1 405 239 6040 +1 405 239 6766 pwhaley@ryanwhaley.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Phillip Gardner Whaley +1 405 239 6040 +1 405 239 6766 pwhaley@ryanwhaley.com
, Theodore Dubose Willard, Jr. +1 803 779 3500 +1 803 799 2755 tdw@montgomerywillard.com
, Theodore Dubose Willard, Jr. +1 803 779 3500 +1 803 799 2755 tdw@montgomerywillard.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Baker Donelson Bearman Caldwell & Berkowitz, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , Jamie Ballinger-Holden +1 865 549 7000 +1 865 633 7216 jballinger@bakerdonelson.com
, , , , , Jamie Ballinger-Holden +1 865 549 7000 +1 865 633 7216 jballinger@bakerdonelson.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Dykema Gossett, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , Patrick Thomas Stanton +1 312 627 4600 +1 312 627 4601 pstanton@dykema.com
, , Patrick Thomas Stanton +1 312 627 4600 +1 312 627 4601 pstanton@dykema.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Figari & Davenport, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, Ryan K. McComber +1 214 939 2014 +1 214 939 2090 ryan.mccomber@figdav.com
, Ryan K. McComber +1 214 939 2014 +1 214 939 2090 ryan.mccomber@figdav.com
Space Amber D Reece +1 214 939 2020 +1 214 939 2090 amber.reece@figdav.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Figari Davenport, L.L.P.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Amber D Reece +1 214 939 2020 +1 214 939 2090 amber.reece@figdav.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Fish & Richardson, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , Matthew A Colvin +1 214 747 5070 +1 214 747 2091 colvin@fr.com
, , , , Matthew A Colvin +1 214 747 5070 +1 214 747 2091 colvin@fr.com
, , , , , , , David Brandon Conrad +1 214 747 5070 +1 214 747 2091 conrad@fr.com
, , , , , , , David Brandon Conrad +1 214 747 5070 +1 214 747 2091 conrad@fr.com
, , , , , , , , , Neil J. McNabnay +1 214 747 5070 +1 214 747 2091 mcnabnay@fr.com
, , , , , , , , , Neil J. McNabnay +1 214 747 5070 +1 214 747 2091 mcnabnay@fr.com
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , James Eugene Youngblood +1 214 747 5070 +1 214 747 2091 jey@fr.com
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , James Eugene Youngblood +1 214 747 5070 +1 214 747 2091 jey@fr.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Greenberg Traurig LLP - Phoenix

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Peter W Sorensen +1 602 445 8000 +1 602 445 8100 sorensenp@gtlaw.com
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Peter W Sorensen +1 602 445 8000 +1 602 445 8100 sorensenp@gtlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Greene Espel PLLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , Jeanette M Bazis +1 612 373 0830 +1 612 373 0929 jbazis@greeneespel.com
, , , , , Jeanette M Bazis +1 612 373 0830 +1 612 373 0929 jbazis@greeneespel.com
, , , , , Samuel J Clark +1 612 373 8387 +1 612 373 0929 sclark@greeneespel.com
, , , , , Samuel J Clark +1 612 373 8387 +1 612 373 0929 sclark@greeneespel.com
, , , , , Robert J Gilbertson +1 612 373 8333 +1 612 373 0929 bgilbertson@greeneespel.com
, , , , , Robert J Gilbertson +1 612 373 8333 +1 612 373 0929 bgilbertson@greeneespel.com
, , , , , Kathryn N Hibbard +1 612 373 0380 +1 612 373 0929 khibbard@greeneespel.com
, , , , , Kathryn N Hibbard +1 612 373 0380 +1 612 373 0929 khibbard@greeneespel.com
, , , , , Mark L Johnson +1 612 373 0830 +1 612 373 0929 mjohnson@greeneespel.com
, , , , , Mark L Johnson +1 612 373 0830 +1 612 373 0929 mjohnson@greeneespel.com
, , , , , Megan M Walsh +1 612 373 8387 +1 612 373 0929 mwalsh@greeneespel.com
, , , , , Megan M Walsh +1 612 373 8387 +1 612 373 0929 mwalsh@greeneespel.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Karr Tuttle Campbell

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, Medora A. Marisseau +1 206 223 1313 +1 206 682 7100 mmarisseau@karrtuttle.com
Space Jacque Elizabeth St. Romain +1 206 224 8089 jstromain@karrtuttle.com
Space Jacque Elizabeth St. Romain +1 206 224 8089 jstromain@karrtuttle.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Karr Tuttle Campbell, PSC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, Medora A. Marisseau +1 206 223 1313 +1 206 682 7100 mmarisseau@karrtuttle.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Klee, Tuchin, Bogdanoff & Stern, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , David Max Stern +1 310 407 4025 +1 310 407 9090 dstern@ktbslaw.com
, , David Max Stern +1 310 407 4025 +1 310 407 9090 dstern@ktbslaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Larson King LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , TERMINATED: 02/11/2014, (Inactive), TERMINATED: 02/11/2014, TERMINATED: 02/11/2014, TERMINATED: 02/11/2014, TERMINATED: 02/11/2014, TERMINATED: 02/11/2014, TERMINATED: 02/11/2014, TERMINATED: 02/11/2014, TERMINATED Sarah E Madsen +1 651 312 6591 +1 651 789 4891 smadsen@larsonking.com
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , TERMINATED: 02/11/2014, (Inactive), TERMINATED: 02/11/2014, TERMINATED: 02/11/2014, TERMINATED: 02/11/2014, TERMINATED: 02/11/2014, TERMINATED: 02/11/2014, TERMINATED: 02/11/2014, TERMINATED: 02/11/2014, TERMINATED Sarah E Madsen +1 651 312 6591 +1 651 789 4891 smadsen@larsonking.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Lewis Roca Rothgerber LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, Ann-Martha Andrews +1 602 262 5707 +1 602 734 3764 ann.andrews@ogletree.com
, Ryan M Walters +1 505 764 5400 +1 505 764 5467 rwalters@lrrc.com
, Ryan M Walters +1 505 764 5400 +1 505 764 5467 rwalters@lrrc.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Ogletree, Deakins, Nash, Smoak & Stewart, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, Ann-Martha Andrews +1 602 262 5707 +1 602 734 3764 ann.andrews@ogletree.com

Toggle Switch Represented by P.O. Box

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , Chad E. Wallace +1 423 928 0181 +1 423 928 5694 cwallace@bakerdonelson.com
, , Chad E. Wallace +1 423 928 0181 +1 423 928 5694 cwallace@bakerdonelson.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Pett Furman PL

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, Kristina Beth Pett +1 561 994 4311 +9828 982 982 8985 kpett@pettfurman.com
, Kristina Beth Pett +1 561 994 4311 +9828 982 982 8985 kpett@pettfurman.com

Toggle Switch Represented by REED SMITH LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Cristyn Nicole Chadwick +1 213 457 8000 +1 213 457 8080 cchadwick@reedsmith.com
Space Cristyn Nicole Chadwick +1 213 457 8000 +1 213 457 8080 cchadwick@reedsmith.com
, Kathy J Huang +1 213 457 8000 +1 213 457 8080 khuang@reedsmith.com
, Kathy J Huang +1 213 457 8000 +1 213 457 8080 khuang@reedsmith.com
, Robert D. Phillips, Jr. +1 510 763 2000 +1 510 273 8832 RPhillips@ReedSmith.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Reed Smith LLP (IL-NA)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, Robert D. Phillips, Jr. +1 510 763 2000 +1 510 273 8832 RPhillips@ReedSmith.com

Toggle Switch Represented by WELLS MARBLE & HURST

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, Kelly D Simpkins +1 601 605 6900 +1 601 605 6901 ksimpkins@wellsmar.com
, Kelly D Simpkins +1 601 605 6900 +1 601 605 6901 ksimpkins@wellsmar.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Wells, Marble & Hurst, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, Kelly D Simpkins +1 601 605 6900 +1 601 605 6901 ksimpkins@wellsmar.com
, Kelly D Simpkins +1 601 605 6900 +1 601 605 6901 ksimpkins@wellsmar.com
No Logo Richard J. Gettelfinger, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Leibowitz Law Firm, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , Jennifer Knapp Hemmelgarn +1 865 637 1809 +1 865 637 9276 jlk@leibowitzfirm.com
, , , Jennifer Knapp Hemmelgarn +1 865 637 1809 +1 865 637 9276 jlk@leibowitzfirm.com
, , , Jennifer Knapp Hemmelgarn +1 865 637 1809 +1 865 637 9276 jlk@leibowitzfirm.com
, , , Lawrence P Leibowitz +1 865 637 1809 lpl@leibowitz-cohen.com
, , , Lawrence P Leibowitz +1 865 637 1809 lpl@leibowitz-cohen.com
, , , Lawrence P Leibowitz +1 865 637 1809 lpl@leibowitz-cohen.com
No Logo Smartbank, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Gentry, Tipton, Kizer & McLemore, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Tyler C. Huskey +1 865 525 5300 tch@tennlaw.com
Space Tyler C. Huskey +1 865 525 5300 tch@tennlaw.com
Space Tyler C. Huskey +1 865 525 5300 tch@tennlaw.com
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332
Nature of Suit 110 - Contract - Insurance
  Entries (82) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 8/10/2016, Entered: 8/10/2016 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER: The Court ACCEPTS IN WHOLE the R&R 81 . The Court hereby GRANTS IN PART and DENIES IN PART Minnesota Life Insurance Companys Motion for Interpleader Relief as to Defendants J. Randall Hooper and Richard J. Gettelfinger, Co- Executors of the Estate of Herman Edward Gettelfinger [Doc. 54]. Accordingly, the Court hereby GRANTS the Motion for Disbursement of Funds Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 67(b) 56 . The Motion to Enforce Settlement Agreement 72 is hereby DENIED as MOOT. The Clerk of Court is AUTHORIZED and DIRECTED to disburse the funds as follows: SmartBank in the amount of $175,000.00 representing the policy proceeds on Policy No. 2-350-013N; and Fund House FCP-SIF-International Life Settlements Fund in the amount of $2,825,000.00 and all interest accrued on the policy proceeds, representing the balance of the policy proceeds from Policy No. 2-350-013N and 2-348-015N. Said proceeds shall be distributed in care of Locke Lord, LLP. The Clerk of Court is DIRECTED toCLOSE this case. Signed by Chief District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 8/10/16. (ABF)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 7/22/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
    REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS: It is RECOMMENDED that Plaintiffs Motion for Interpleader Relief as to Defendants J. Randall Hooper and Richard J. Gettelfinger, Co-executors of the Estate of Herman Edward Gettelfinger 54 be GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART, the Motion for Disbursement of Funds pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 67(b) 56 be GRANTED, and the Motion to Enforcement Settlement Agreement 72 should be DENIED AS MOOT. It is further recommended that the proceeds from the policies be distributed as follows: SmartBank should receive $175,000.00 of the policy proceeds on Policy No. 2-350-013N; and Fund House FCP-SIF-International Life Settlements Fund should take the balance of the policy proceeds from Policy No. 2-350-013N and 2-348-015N equaling $2,825,000.00 and all interest accrued on the policy proceeds. The proceeds shall be distributed in care of Locke Lord, LLP. Signed by Magistrate Judge C Clifford Shirley, Jr on 7/22/16. (ABF) (Entered: 07/22/2016)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 7/20/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
      Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge C Clifford Shirley, Jr: Motion Hearing held on 7/20/2016. The parties appeared to address the pending motions before the Court. Argument heard by the parties. The Court takes the pending motions under advisement and will issue a report and recommendation or order in this matter.(Court Reporter Tiffany Ashton, Miller & Miller Court Reporters) (RLK) (Entered: 07/20/2016)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 7/12/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        REPLY to Response to Motion re 72 MOTION to Enforce Settlement Agreement filed by Wilmington Trust Company. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit email - 5-20-16, # 2 Exhibit email - 6-13-16)(Jones, Benjamin) (Entered: 07/12/2016)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 7/5/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          RESPONSE to Motion re 72 MOTION to Enforce Settlement Agreement filed by Richard J. Gettelfinger, J. Randall Hooper. (Leibowitz, Lawrence) (Entered: 07/05/2016)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Sealed Legal Document 77 Filed: 6/27/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            SEALED Exhibit A and B re: 72 MOTION to Enforce Settlement Agreement by Fund House FCP-SIF-International Life Settlements Fund. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit B)(ABF) (Entered: 06/27/2016)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 6/27/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
              ORDER granting 73 Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal. The Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to file the proposed sealeddocument 74 under seal. Signed by Chief District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 6/27/16. (ABF) (Entered: 06/27/2016)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 6/23/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                ORDER that defendants Fund House FCP-SIF International Life Settlements Fund and Wilmington Trust Company's Motion to Enforce Settlement Agreement 72 is hereby REFERRED to Magistrate Judge C. Clifford Shirley, Jr., for his consideration and determination or report and recommendation, as may be appropriate. Signed by Chief District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 6/23/16. (ADA) (Entered: 06/23/2016)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Sealed Legal Document 74 Filed: 6/23/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  SEALED Proposed Sealed Document re: 73 MOTION for Leave to File Document Under Seal (Exhibits A and B) by Fund House FCP-SIF-International Life Settlements Fund, Wilmington Trust Company(as Securities Intermediary) . (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit B - Settlement Agreement and Mutual Releases)(Jones, Benjamin) (Entered: 06/23/2016)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 6/23/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    MOTION for Leave to File Document Under Seal (Exhibits A and B) by Fund House FCP-SIF-International Life Settlements Fund, Wilmington Trust Company(as Securities Intermediary). (Jones, Benjamin) (Entered: 06/23/2016)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 6/22/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      MOTION to Enforce Settlement Agreement by Fund House FCP-SIF-International Life Settlements Fund, Wilmington Trust Company(as Securities Intermediary). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - series of e-mails, # 2 Exhibit B - Settlement Agreement and Mutual Releases, # 3 Exhibit C - Agreed Final Judgment)(Jones, Benjamin) (Entered: 06/22/2016)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 6/20/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                        Letter from Locke & Lord, LLP to Judge Shirley in RESPONSE to 56 Motion for Disbursement of Funds filed by Wilmington Trust Company, Fund House FCP-SIF-International Life Settlements Fund . (Jones, Benjamin) Modified text on 6/21/2016 (ADA). (Entered: 06/20/2016)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 5/19/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                          ORDER granting 50 Motion to Deposit Funds. The Plaintiff is directed to deposit the funds into the Registry of the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge C Clifford Shirley, Jr on 5/19/16. (ABF) (Entered: 05/19/2016)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 5/18/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                            ORDER REFERRING MOTION: 56 MOTION for Disbursement of Funds PURSUANT TO FED R. CIV. P. 67 (b) and 54 MOTION for Interpleader Relief as to Defendants J. Randall Hooper and Richard J. Gettelfinger, Co-Executors of the Estate of Herman Edward Gettelfinger. The Court also DENIES as MOOT defendants request for telephonic conference to discuss scheduling issues 40 . Signed by Chief District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 5/18/16. (ABF) (Entered: 05/18/2016)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 5/9/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                              Order Governing Depositions. Signed by Chief District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 5/9/16. (ABF) (Entered: 05/09/2016)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 5/9/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial set for 10/16/2017 09:00 AM in Courtroom 4 - Knoxville before Chief District Judge Thomas A Varlan. Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/10/2017 02:30 PM in Courtroom 4 - Knoxville before Chief District Judge Thomas A Varlan.Signed by Chief District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 5/9/16. (ABF) (Entered: 05/09/2016)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 5/6/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                  REPLY to Response to Motion re 59 Supplemental MOTION for Disbursement of Funds filed by Fund House FCP-SIF-International Life Settlements Fund, Wilmington Trust Company. (De Rose, R) (Entered: 05/06/2016)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 4/29/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                    STIPULATION re 64 Response to Motion by Fund House FCP-SIF-International Life Settlements Fund. (Jones, Benjamin) (Entered: 04/29/2016)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 4/22/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                      RESPONSE to Motion re 56 MOTION for Disbursement of Funds PURSUANT TO FED R. CIV. P. 67 (b) filed by Richard J. Gettelfinger, J. Randall Hooper. (Hemmelgarn, Jennifer) (Entered: 04/22/2016)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 4/22/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                        RESPONSE to Motion re 56 MOTION for Disbursement of Funds PURSUANT TO FED R. CIV. P. 67 (b) filed by SmartBank. (Huskey, Tyler) (Entered: 04/22/2016)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 4/20/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                          REPLY to Response to Motion re 54 MOTION for Interpleader Relief as to Defendants J. Randall Hooper and Richard J. Gettelfinger, Co-Executors of the Estate of Herman Edward Gettelfinger filed by Minnesota Life Insurance Company. (Wallace, Chad) (Entered: 04/20/2016)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 4/20/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                            RESPONSE to Motion re 56 MOTION for Disbursement of Funds PURSUANT TO FED R. CIV. P. 67 (b) filed by Minnesota Life Insurance Company. (Wallace, Chad) (Entered: 04/20/2016)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 4/20/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                              ORDER REFERRING MOTION: 50 MOTION to Deposit Funds filed by Minnesota Life Insurance Company, 59 Supplemental MOTION for Disbursement of Funds filed by Wilmington Trust Company, Fund House FCP-SIF-International Life Settlements Fund referred to the Honorable C. Clifford Shirley, Jr., USMJ.Signed by Chief District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 4/20/16. (ABF) (Entered: 04/20/2016)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 4/18/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                Supplemental MOTION for Disbursement of Funds by Fund House FCP-SIF-International Life Settlements Fund, Wilmington Trust Company. (Jones, Benjamin) (Entered: 04/18/2016)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 4/18/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                  STIPULATION re 56 MOTION for Disbursement of Funds PURSUANT TO FED R. CIV. P. 67 (b) by Fund House FCP-SIF-International Life Settlements Fund, Wilmington Trust Company. (Jones, Benjamin) (Entered: 04/18/2016)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 4/14/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                    RESPONSE to Motion re 54 MOTION for Interpleader Relief as to Defendants J. Randall Hooper and Richard J. Gettelfinger, Co-Executors of the Estate of Herman Edward Gettelfinger filed by Richard J. Gettelfinger, J. Randall Hooper. (Leibowitz, Lawrence) (Entered: 04/14/2016)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 4/7/2016, Entered: 4/7/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                      MOTION for Disbursement of Funds PURSUANT TO FED R. CIV. P. 67 (b) by Fund House FCP-SIF-International Life Settlements Fund, Wilmington Trust Company. (Jones, Benjamin)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 3/31/2016, Entered: 3/31/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                        MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re 54 MOTION for Interpleader Relief as to Defendants J. Randall Hooper and Richard J. Gettelfinger, Co-Executors of the Estate of Herman Edward Gettelfinger filed by Minnesota Life Insurance Company. (Wallace, Chad)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 3/31/2016, Entered: 3/31/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                          MOTION for Interpleader Relief as to Defendants J. Randall Hooper and Richard J. Gettelfinger, Co-Executors of the Estate of Herman Edward Gettelfinger by Minnesota Life Insurance Company. (Wallace, Chad)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 3/29/2016, Entered: 3/29/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                            RESPONSE to Motion re 50 MOTION to Deposit Funds filed by Fund House FCP-SIF-International Life Settlements Fund, Wilmington Trust Company. (Jones, Benjamin)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 3/24/2016, Entered: 3/24/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                              NOTICE OF NONCONSENT by Fund House FCP-SIF-International Life Settlements Fund, Wilmington Trust Company(as Securities Intermediary) (Jones, Benjamin)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 3/18/2016, Entered: 3/18/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re 50 MOTION to Deposit Funds filed by Minnesota Life Insurance Company. (Wallace, Chad)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 3/18/2016, Entered: 3/18/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                  MOTION to Deposit Funds by Minnesota Life Insurance Company. (Wallace, Chad)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 3/7/2016, Entered: 3/7/2016 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                    ORDER: The parties are ordered to confer and return the attached form within the time provided.Signed by Chief District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 3/7/16. (Attachments: # 1 Other Notice of Consent/Non-Consent) (ABF)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 3/4/2016, Entered: 3/4/2016 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                      ORDER granting 28 cross-defendants' motion to dismiss, and denying cross-defendants motion for sanctions [Doc. 35]. Signed by Chief District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 3/04/2016. (KMK, ) (KMK, ). Modified text and replaced PDF per Chambers due to error regarding case closing on 3/4/2016 (KMK).
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 3/4/2016, Entered: 3/4/2016 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                        MEMORANDUM OPINION granting 28 Motion to Dismiss; denying 35 Motion for Sanctions. The Court DISMISSES cross-plaintiffs' claims against cross-defendants. Signed by Chief District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 3/04/2016. (KMK, )
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 3/4/2016, Entered: 3/4/2016 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                          MEMORANDUM, OPINION, AND ORDER granting 44 Motion for Default Judgment as to Defendant Genesis Merchant Partners, LP. Signed by Chief District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 3/04/2016. (copy mailed via regular mail and certified mail to Genesis Merchant Partners, LP c/o Stellar Corporation Services, LLC 3500 South Dupont Hwy, Dover, DE 19901) (KMK, ) Modified on 3/4/2016 (KMK): Certified Mail Tracking ID: 7008 3230 0002 7443 2249 (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/11/2016: # 1 Other Certified Mail Card Returned) (ABF, ).
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 12/2/2015, Entered: 12/2/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                            MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re 44 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Defendant Genesis Merchant Partners, LP. filed by Minnesota Life Insurance Company. (Wallace, Chad)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 12/2/2015, Entered: 12/2/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                              MOTION for Default Judgment as to Defendant Genesis Merchant Partners, LP. by Minnesota Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Affidavit of Chad E. Wallace)(Wallace, Chad)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 12/1/2015, Entered: 12/1/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Genesis Merchant Partners, LP (Counsel may now file Step 2 in the Default Judgment process; see http://www.tned.uscourts.gov/defjudgment.php) (c/m Genesis Merchant Partners, LP, c/o Stellar Corporation Services, LLC, 3500 South Dupont Highway, Dover, Delaware 19901) (ABF)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 11/10/2015, Entered: 11/10/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                  MEMORANDUM in Support re 41 Application for Clerk's Default, . (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Affidavit of Chad E. Wallace)(Wallace, Chad)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 11/10/2015, Entered: 11/10/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                    APPLICATION for Clerk's Default as to Genesis Merchant Partners, LP by Minnesota Life Insurance Company. Party is instructed to email the proposed default to the clerk at the appropriate email address in accordance with http://tned.uscourts.gov/default.php. (Wallace, Chad)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 10/28/2015, Entered: 10/28/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                      REQUEST for telephonic conference to discuss scheduling issues by Fund House FCP-SIF-International Life Settlements Fund, Wilmington Trust Company. (ABF)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 8/4/2015, Entered: 8/4/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                        REPLY to Response to Motion re 35 MOTION for Sanctions Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 11 filed by Fund House FCP-SIF-International Life Settlements Fund, Wilmington Trust Company(as Securities Intermediary). (De Rose, R)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 7/28/2015, Entered: 7/28/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                          RESPONSE to Motion re 35 MOTION for Sanctions Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 11 filed by Richard J. Gettelfinger, J. Randall Hooper. (Leibowitz, Lawrence)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 7/14/2015, Entered: 7/14/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                            CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Fund House FCP-SIF-International Life Settlements Fund, Wilmington Trust Company(as Securities Intermediary) re 35 MOTION for Sanctions Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 11, 36 Memorandum in Support of Motion (De Rose, R)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 7/14/2015, Entered: 7/14/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                              MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re 35 MOTION for Sanctions Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 11 filed by Fund House FCP-SIF-International Life Settlements Fund, Wilmington Trust Company(as Securities Intermediary). (De Rose, R)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 7/14/2015, Entered: 7/14/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                MOTION for Sanctions Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 11 by Fund House FCP-SIF-International Life Settlements Fund, Wilmington Trust Company(as Securities Intermediary). (De Rose, R)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 5/15/2015, Entered: 5/15/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                  REPLY to Response to Motion re 28 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Fund House FCP-SIF-International Life Settlements Fund, Wilmington Trust Company. (Jones, Benjamin)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 5/7/2015, Entered: 5/7/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                    STIPULATION by Fund House FCP-SIF-International Life Settlements Fund, Wilmington Trust Company. (Jones, Benjamin)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 5/1/2015, Entered: 5/1/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                      RESPONSE to Motion re 28 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Richard J. Gettelfinger, J. Randall Hooper. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Affidavit of Richard J. Gettelfinger)(Hemmelgarn, Jennifer)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 3/20/2015, Entered: 3/20/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                        STIPULATION that the time Defendant Gettelfinger Estate has to file a response to Fund House FCP-SIF-International Life Settlements Fund and Wilmington Trust Companys Motion to Dismiss be extended until May 1, 2015 by Richard J. Gettelfinger, J. Randall Hooper. (Hemmelgarn, Jennifer) Modified text on 3/20/2015 (ADA).
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 3/4/2015, Entered: 3/4/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                          AFFIDAVIT re 28 MOTION to Dismiss of R. James DeRose, III by Fund House FCP-SIF-International Life Settlements Fund and Wilmington Trust Company. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Policy Purchase Agreement, # 2 Exhibit Policy Purchase Agreement, # 3 Exhibit Purchase Agreement)(Jones, Benjamin) Modified on 3/4/2015 to add filer (ABF).
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 3/4/2015, Entered: 3/4/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                            MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re 28 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Fund House FCP-SIF-International Life Settlements Fund and Wilmington Trust Company. (Jones, Benjamin) Modified on 3/4/2015 to add filer (ABF).
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 3/4/2015, Entered: 3/4/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                              MOTION to Dismiss by Fund House FCP-SIF-International Life Settlements Fund and Wilmington Trust Company. (Jones, Benjamin) Modified on 3/4/2015 to add filer (ABF).
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 2/9/2015, Entered: 2/9/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                ANSWER to 21 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by Minnesota Life Insurance Company.(Wallace, Chad)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 1/28/2015, Entered: 1/28/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                  Answer to 22 Cross-Claim of Fund House FCP-SIF International Life Settlements Fund and Wilmington Trust Company by SmartBank. (Huskey, Tyler) Modified entry relationship and text on 1/28/2015 (JBR).
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 1/5/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                    ORDER granting 23 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice and granting 24 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You MUST register as a CM/ECF user here: http://www.tned.uscourts.gov/RegistrationForm.php. Signed by Magistrate Judge C. Clifford Shirley, Jr. on 01/05/15. (This entry constitutes the complete Order of the Court.) (LWM) (c/m) Modified text on 1/5/2015 (JBR). (Entered: 01/05/2015)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 12/30/2014, Entered: 12/30/2014 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                      First MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Gregory T. Casamento ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-2717082.) by Fund House FCP-SIF-International Life Settlements Fund, Wilmington Trust Company. (Jones, Benjamin)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 12/30/2014, Entered: 12/30/2014 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                        First MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of R. James De Rose (Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-2717033.) by Fund House FCP-SIF-International Life Settlements Fund, Wilmington Trust Company. (Jones, Benjamin) Modified text on 12/31/2014 (JBR).
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 12/15/2014, Entered: 12/15/2014 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                          ANSWER to 10 Cross-Claim Filed by SmartBank and Cross-Claim Against SmartBank by Fund House FCP-SIF-International Life Settlements Fund, Wilmington Trust Company.(Jones, Benjamin) Modified text on 12/17/2014 (JBR).
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 12/15/2014, Entered: 12/15/2014 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                            ANSWER to 1 Complaint in Interpleader and Counterclaim against Minnesota Life Insurance Company by Wilmington Trust Company, Fund House FCP-SIF-International Life Settlements Fund.(Jones, Benjamin) Modified text on 12/17/2014 (JBR).
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 12/15/2014, Entered: 12/15/2014 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                              Certificate of Corporate Interest by Fund House FCP-SIF-International Life Settlements Fund. (Jones, Benjamin)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 12/15/2014, Entered: 12/15/2014 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                Certificate of Corporate Interest by Wilmington Trust Company identifying Corporate Parent M&T Bank Corporation for Wilmington Trust Company. (Jones, Benjamin)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 12/15/2014, Entered: 12/15/2014 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by Benjamin W Jones on behalf of Fund House FCP-SIF-International Life Settlements Fund, Wilmington Trust Company (Jones, Benjamin)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 12/5/2014, Entered: 12/5/2014 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                    ANSWER to 10 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, Counterclaim,,, by Richard J. Gettelfinger, J. Randall Hooper.(Hemmelgarn, Jennifer)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 12/5/2014, Entered: 12/5/2014 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                      ANSWER to 1 Complaint,,,,,,, CROSSCLAIM against Fund House FCP-SIF-International Life Settlements Fund, Genesis Merchant Partners, LP, Wilmington Trust Company by J. Randall Hooper, Richard J. Gettelfinger.(Hemmelgarn, Jennifer)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 11/13/2014, Entered: 11/13/2014 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                        ANSWER to 10 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, Counterclaim,,, by Minnesota Life Insurance Company.(Wallace, Chad)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 10/31/2014, Entered: 10/31/2014 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                          STIPULATION by Richard J. Gettelfinger, J. Randall Hooper. (Hemmelgarn, Jennifer)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 10/29/2014, Entered: 10/29/2014 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                            [PDF removed per counsel. Refiled as 14 without language requesting relief from court] STIPULATION by Richard J. Gettelfinger, J. Randall Hooper. (Hemmelgarn, Jennifer) Modified text on 11/3/2014 (JBR, ).
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 10/27/2014, Entered: 10/27/2014 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                              WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Minnesota Life Insurance Company. Fund House FCP-SIF-International Life Settlements Fund waiver sent on 10/15/2014. (Wallace, Chad)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 10/22/2014, Entered: 10/22/2014 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                Certificate of Corporate Interest by SmartBank identifying Corporate Parent SmartFinancial, Inc. for SmartBank. (Huskey, Tyler)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 10/20/2014, Entered: 10/20/2014 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                  ANSWER to 1 Complaint,,,,,,, CROSSCLAIM against J. Randall Hooper, Genesis Merchant Partners, LP, Fund House FCP-SIF-International Life Settlements Fund, Richard J. Gettelfinger, Wilmington Trust Company, COUNTERCLAIM against Minnesota Life Insurance Company by SmartBank. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-1, # 2 Exhibit B-1)(Huskey, Tyler)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 10/15/2014, Entered: 10/15/2014 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer Knapp Hemmelgarn on behalf of Richard J. Gettelfinger, J. Randall Hooper (Hemmelgarn, Jennifer)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 10/6/2014, Entered: 10/6/2014 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                      SUMMONS Returned Executed by Minnesota Life Insurance Company. Genesis Merchant Partners, LP served on 9/29/2014. (Wallace, Chad)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 10/3/2014, Entered: 10/3/2014 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                        SUMMONS Returned Executed by Minnesota Life Insurance Company. SmartBank served on 9/29/2014. (Wallace, Chad)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 10/3/2014, Entered: 10/3/2014 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                          SUMMONS Returned Executed by Minnesota Life Insurance Company. Wilmington Trust Company served on 10/2/2014. (Wallace, Chad)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 10/1/2014, Entered: 10/1/2014 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                            SUMMONS Returned Executed by Minnesota Life Insurance Company. J. Randall Hooper served on 9/30/2014. (Wallace, Chad)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 10/1/2014, Entered: 10/1/2014 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                              SUMMONS Returned Executed by Minnesota Life Insurance Company. Richard J. Gettelfinger served on 9/30/2014. (Wallace, Chad)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 9/24/2014, Entered: 9/24/2014 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Attachments: # 1 Other Summons Issued - Fund House, # 2 Other Summons Issued - Genesis Merchant Partners, LP, # 3 Other Summons Issued - SmartBank, # 4 Other Summons Issued - J. Randall Hooper, # 5 Other Summons Issued - Richard J. Gettelfinger) (JBR)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 9/23/2014, Entered: 9/23/2014 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                  Certificate of Corporate Interest by Minnesota Life Insurance Company. (Wallace, Chad)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 9/23/2014, Entered: 9/23/2014 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                    COMPLAINT in Interpleader against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0649-2646984.), filed by Minnesota Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: # 1 Summons Summons for Wilmington Trust Company, # 2 Summons Summons for Fund House-FCP-SIF-International Life Settlements Fund, # 3 Summons Summons for Genesis Merchant Partners, LP, # 4 Summons Summons for SmartBank, # 5 Summons Summons for J. Randall Hooper, # 6 Summons Summons for Richard J. Gettelfinger, # 7 Other Civil Cover Sheet, # 8 Exhibit December 11, 2009 SmartBank letter, # 9 Exhibit Collateral Assignment of Life Insurance Policy, # 10 Exhibit Beneficiary/Name Change Request for policy no. 2350013N, # 11 Exhibit Ownership Change Request for policy no. 2350013N, # 12 Exhibit Beneficiary/Name Change Request for policy no. 2348015N, # 13 Exhibit Ownership Change Request for policy no. 2348015N, # 14 Exhibit May 13, 2014 correspondence from ILSF Counsel, # 15 Exhibit September 19, 2014 Correspondence from Counsel for Fund House FCP-SIF-International Life Settlements Fund, # 16 Exhibit Correspondence from Progressive Capital Solutions regarding policy no. 2342015N, # 17 Exhibit Correspondence from Progressive Capital Solutions regarding policy no. 2350013N, # 18 Exhibit December 27, 2011 correspondence from CNF II Partners, # 19 Exhibit August 1, 2012 correspondence from Genesis Merchant Partners, LP, # 20 Exhibit May 29, 2014 correspondence from CMS Life Insurance Opportunity Fund, # 21 Exhibit May 29, 2014 correspondence from CNF II Partners)(Wallace, Chad)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                      Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                      This case has been viewed 28 times.

                                                                                                                                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                      Space
                                                                                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                       
                                                                                                                                                                      PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                      Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                      Need Password Help?