Brad Coleman et al v. Cashcall, Inc et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit California Central District Court, Case No. 8:08-cv-00024
District Judge Andrew J. Guilford, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated September 4, 2016 at 11:22 PM DT (5.1 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Alan Ruiz, Plaintiff
No Logo Angela Kim, Plaintiff
No Logo Ben Nable, Plaintiff
No Logo Brad Coleman, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Clark and Markham LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James Michael Treglio +1 619 239 1321 +1 888 273 4554 jtreglio@clarklawyers.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 311

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gregory A Douglas +1 562 252 8800 +1 562 252 8801 cduran@dplawllp.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Angie Van-Anh Phung +1 562 252 8800 +1 562 252 8801 aphung@dplawllp.com

Toggle Switch Represented by The Markham Law Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David R Markham +1 619 399 3995 +1 619 615 2067 dmarkham@markham-law.com

Toggle Switch Represented by United Employees Law Group PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Walter Lewis Haines +1 562 256 1047 +1 562 256 1006 admin@uelglaw.com
No Logo Cornell Wheeler, Plaintiff
No Logo Dante Zena, Plaintiff
No Logo David Mejia, Plaintiff
No Logo Edward Hill, Plaintiff
No Logo Edward Suk, Plaintiff
No Logo Evan Medley, Plaintiff
No Logo Fennell, Plaintiff
No Logo Ian Debbie, Plaintiff
No Logo Isaac Buchanan, Plaintiff
No Logo Ivan Lee, Plaintiff
No Logo Jeremy Fiebiger, Plaintiff
No Logo Jesse McCarthy, Plaintiff
No Logo John Morris, Plaintiff
No Logo John Shindledecker, Plaintiff
No Logo Jose Espinoza, Plaintiff
No Logo Jose Valenzuela, Plaintiff
No Logo Joseph Bang, Plaintiff
No Logo Joseph Speckman, Plaintiff
No Logo Lisa Banach, Plaintiff
No Logo Ryan Caywood, Plaintiff
No Logo Ryan Nable, Plaintiff
No Logo Son Thai, Plaintiff
No Logo Steven Liu, Plaintiff
No Logo Susan Chang, Plaintiff
No Logo Tony Nguyen, Plaintiff
No Logo Trevor Whitworth, Plaintiff
No Logo CashCall, Inc., Counter-Claimant
v.
No Logo CashCall, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David W Wiechert +1 949 361 2822 dwiechert@aol.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Gordee, Nowicki & Augustini LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeff Augustini +1 949 567 9923 +1 949 567 9928 jaugustini@gna-law.com
No Logo Paul Reddam, Defendant
No Logo Brad Coleman, Counter-Defendant
No Logo Edward Suk, Counter-Defendant
No Logo Ian Debbie, Counter-Defendant
No Logo Jeremy Fiebiger, Counter-Defendant
No Logo Jesse McCarthy, Counter-Defendant
No Logo John Shindledecker, Counter-Defendant
No Logo Jose Valenzuela, Counter-Defendant
No Logo Joseph Bang, Counter-Defendant
No Logo Joseph Speckman, Counter-Defendant
No Logo Steve Fennell, Counter-Defendant
No Logo Steven Liu, Counter-Defendant
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1331
Nature of Suit 710 - Labor: Fair Labor Standards Act
  Entries (121) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 121 Filed: 12/18/2009, Entered: None
Joint REQUEST to Dismiss Case Pursuant to Rule 41(a) or C FRCP filed by Joint Dante Zena, Isaac Buchanan, Ryan Caywood, Jose Valenzuela, Susan Chang, Edward Suk, Joseph Speckman, John Shindledecker, Jesse McCarthy, Steven Liu, Jeremy Fiebiger, Steve Fennell, Brad Coleman, Ben Nable, Ian Debbie, Fennell, Edward Hill, Angela Kim, Ivan Lee, John Morris, Ryan Nable, Tony Nguyen, Lisa Banach, Alan Ruiz, Son Thai, Cornell Wheeler, Trevor Whitworth. (Markham, David) (Entered: 12/18/2009)
    LREF
    Blank 120 Filed: 10/15/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
    ORDER STAYING Action Pending Final Settlement and Removing Case from Active Caseload by Judge Andrew J. Guilford. On October 1, 2009, counsel for Plaintiff filed a Joint Stipulation to Vacate All Dates Pending Settlement. The Court hereby orders all proceedings in the case stayed pending final settlement. It is further ordered that this action is removed from the Court's active caseload, subject to the right, upon good cause shown by December 18, 2009, to reopen the action if settlement is not consummated. Counsel shall file settlement documents and/or a dismissal with this Court by December 18, 2009. The Court retains full jurisdiction over this action and this order shall not prejudice any party in the action. All hearing dates in this matter are ordered vacated. (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (db) (Entered: 10/15/2009)
      LREF
      Blank 119 Filed: 10/13/2009, Entered: None
      Joint STIPULATION to Vacate All Dates Pending Settlement Dante Zena, Isaac Buchanan, Ryan Caywood, Susan Chang, Jesse McCarthy, Brad Coleman, Ben Nable, Ian Debbie, Jeremy Fiebiger, Fennell, Edward Hill, Angela Kim, Ivan Lee, Steven Liu, John Morris, Ryan Nable, Tony Nguyen, Lisa Banach, Alan Ruiz, John Shindledecker, Joseph Speckman, Edward Suk, Son Thai, Jose Valenzuela, Cornell Wheeler, Trevor Whitworth. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order on Joint Stipulation to Vacate All Dates)(Markham, David) (Entered: 10/13/2009)
        LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 10/1/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
        NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Plaintiffs/Counter-Defendants Edward Suk, Joseph Speckman, John Shindledecker, Jesse McCarthy, Steven Liu, Jeremy Fiebiger, Steve Fennell, Brad Coleman, Ian Debbie, Fennell. Motion set for hearing on 10/26/2009 at 10:00 AM before Judge Andrew J. Guilford. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Laura M. Cotter in Support of Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction, # 2 Declaration of Service, # 3 Memorandum of Points & Authorities in Support of Motion to Dismiss Counterclaims for Lack of Jurisdiction)(Markham, David) (Entered: 10/01/2009)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 9/10/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
          MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS): ORDER by Magistrate Judge Marc L. Goldman: denying 103 Motion to Compel. Having reviewed the pleadings, documents and declarations filed by the parties, the Court finds that Plaintiffs have substantially complied with the requirements of the Order filed April 21, 2009 and that Defendants are not entitled to any additional documents. The motion to compel is therefore DENIED. The hearing set for September 29, 2009 is taken off calendar. (wr) (Entered: 09/11/2009)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 9/8/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
            ORDER on Request for Approval of Substitution of Attorney by Judge Andrew J. Guilford for defendant J. Paul Reddam. (Jeff Augustini in place of Jeff Augustini of Finlayson, Augustini & Williams LLP) (db) (Entered: 09/08/2009)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 9/8/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
              ORDER on Request for Approval of Substitution of Attorney by Judge Andrew J. Guilford granting 111 Request to Substitute Attorney. Jeff Augustini in place of Jeff Augustini of Finlayson, Augustini & Williams LLP. (db) Modified on 9/8/2009 (db). (Entered: 09/08/2009)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 9/2/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                REQUEST to Substitute attorney Jeff Augustini in place of attorney Jeff Augustini filed by Defendant Cashcall, Inc. Request set for hearing on 9/28/2009 at 10:00 AM before Judge Andrew J. Guilford. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Augustini, Jeff) (Entered: 09/02/2009)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 9/1/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                  REQUEST to Substitute attorney Jeff Augustini in place of attorney Jeff Augustini filed by Defendant, Counter-Claimant Cashcall, Inc. Request set for hearing on 9/28/2009 at 10:00 AM before Judge Andrew J. Guilford. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Augustini, Jeff) (Entered: 09/01/2009)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 9/1/2009, Entered: None
                    NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Defendant Cashcall, Inc, Counter Claimants Cashcall, Inc, Cashcall, Inc, Cashcall, Inc, Cashcall, Inc, Cashcall, Inc, Cashcall, Inc, Cashcall, Inc, Cashcall, Inc, Cashcall, Inc, Cashcall, Inc, Cashcall, Inc. correcting REQUEST to Substitute attorney Jeff Augustini in place of attorney Jeff Augustini 111 (Augustini, Jeff) (Entered: 09/01/2009)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 9/1/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                      REQUEST to Substitute attorney Jeff Augustini in place of attorney Jeff Augustini filed by Defendant, Counter-Claimant Cashcall, Inc. Request set for hearing on 9/28/2009 at 10:00 AM before Judge Andrew J. Guilford. (Augustini, Jeff) (Entered: 09/01/2009)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 8/31/2009, Entered: None
                        DECLARATION of Elizabeth Weidetz in Opposition to MOTION to Compel Compliance With April 21, 2009 Order, the Production of Documents and Provision of Damage-Related Information by Plaintiffs, and for Issue and Monetary Sanctions 103 filed by Plaintiffs Dante Zena, Joseph Bang, Isaac Buchanan, Ryan Caywood, Susan Chang, Jesse McCarthy, Jose Espinoza, Brad Coleman, Ben Nable, Ian Debbie, Jeremy Fiebiger, Fennell, Edward Hill, Angela Kim, Ivan Lee, Steven Liu, Evan Medley, David Mejia, John Morris, Ryan Nable, Tony Nguyen, Lisa Banach, Alan Ruiz, John Shindledecker, Joseph Speckman, Edward Suk, Son Thai, Jose Valenzuela, Cornell Wheeler, Trevor Whitworth. (Augustini, Jeff) (Entered: 08/31/2009)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 8/31/2009, Entered: None
                          DECLARATION of Todd C. White in Opposition to MOTION to Compel Compliance With April 21, 2009 Order, the Production of Documents and Provision of Damage-Related Information by Plaintiffs, and for Issue and Monetary Sanctions 103 filed by Plaintiffs Dante Zena, Joseph Bang, Isaac Buchanan, Ryan Caywood, Susan Chang, Jesse McCarthy, Jose Espinoza, Brad Coleman, Ben Nable, Ian Debbie, Jeremy Fiebiger, Fennell, Edward Hill, Angela Kim, Ivan Lee, Steven Liu, Evan Medley, David Mejia, John Morris, Ryan Nable, Tony Nguyen, Lisa Banach, Alan Ruiz, John Shindledecker, Joseph Speckman, Edward Suk, Son Thai, Jose Valenzuela, Cornell Wheeler, Trevor Whitworth. (Augustini, Jeff) (Entered: 08/31/2009)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 8/31/2009, Entered: None
                            DECLARATION of Dr. James R. Lackritz in Opposition to MOTION to Compel Compliance With April 21, 2009 Order, the Production of Documents and Provision of Damage-Related Information by Plaintiffs, and for Issue and Monetary Sanctions 103 filed by Plaintiffs Dante Zena, Joseph Bang, Isaac Buchanan, Ryan Caywood, Susan Chang, Jesse McCarthy, Jose Espinoza, Brad Coleman, Ben Nable, Ian Debbie, Jeremy Fiebiger, Fennell, Edward Hill, Angela Kim, Ivan Lee, Steven Liu, Evan Medley, David Mejia, John Morris, Ryan Nable, Tony Nguyen, Lisa Banach, Alan Ruiz, John Shindledecker, Joseph Speckman, Edward Suk, Son Thai, Jose Valenzuela, Cornell Wheeler, Trevor Whitworth. (Augustini, Jeff) (Entered: 08/31/2009)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 8/31/2009, Entered: None
                              DECLARATION of Wesley L. Nutten in Opposition to MOTION to Compel Compliance With April 21, 2009 Order, the Production of Documents and Provision of Damage-Related Information by Plaintiffs, and for Issue and Monetary Sanctions 103 filed by Plaintiffs Dante Zena, Joseph Bang, Isaac Buchanan, Ryan Caywood, Susan Chang, Jesse McCarthy, Jose Espinoza, Brad Coleman, Ben Nable, Ian Debbie, Jeremy Fiebiger, Fennell, Edward Hill, Angela Kim, Ivan Lee, Steven Liu, Evan Medley, David Mejia, John Morris, Ryan Nable, Tony Nguyen, Lisa Banach, Alan Ruiz, John Shindledecker, Joseph Speckman, Edward Suk, Son Thai, Jose Valenzuela, Cornell Wheeler, Trevor Whitworth. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A (Part 1), # 2 Exhibit A (Part 2), # 3 Exhibit A (Part 3))(Augustini, Jeff) (Entered: 08/31/2009)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 8/31/2009, Entered: None
                                DECLARATION of Bonnie Louis in Opposition to MOTION to Compel Compliance With April 21, 2009 Order, the Production of Documents and Provision of Damage-Related Information by Plaintiffs, and for Issue and Monetary Sanctions 103 filed by Plaintiffs Dante Zena, Joseph Bang, Isaac Buchanan, Ryan Caywood, Susan Chang, Jesse McCarthy, Jose Espinoza, Brad Coleman, Ben Nable, Ian Debbie, Jeremy Fiebiger, Fennell, Edward Hill, Angela Kim, Ivan Lee, Steven Liu, Evan Medley, David Mejia, John Morris, Ryan Nable, Tony Nguyen, Lisa Banach, Alan Ruiz, John Shindledecker, Joseph Speckman, Edward Suk, Son Thai, Jose Valenzuela, Cornell Wheeler, Trevor Whitworth. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits A-E)(Augustini, Jeff) (Entered: 08/31/2009)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 8/31/2009, Entered: None
                                  DECLARATION of Laura M. Cotter in Opposition to MOTION to Compel Compliance With April 21, 2009 Order, the Production of Documents and Provision of Damage-Related Information by Plaintiffs, and for Issue and Monetary Sanctions 103 filed by Plaintiffs Dante Zena, Joseph Bang, Isaac Buchanan, Ryan Caywood, Susan Chang, Jesse McCarthy, Jose Espinoza, Brad Coleman, Ben Nable, Ian Debbie, Jeremy Fiebiger, Fennell, Edward Hill, Angela Kim, Ivan Lee, Steven Liu, Evan Medley, David Mejia, John Morris, Ryan Nable, Tony Nguyen, Lisa Banach, Alan Ruiz, John Shindledecker, Joseph Speckman, Edward Suk, Son Thai, Jose Valenzuela, Cornell Wheeler, Trevor Whitworth. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A (Part 1), # 2 Exhibit A (Part 2))(Augustini, Jeff) (Entered: 08/31/2009)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 8/31/2009, Entered: None
                                    DECLARATION of Jeff Augustini in Support of MOTION to Compel Compliance With April 21, 2009 Order, the Production of Documents and Provision of Damage-Related Information by Plaintiffs, and for Issue and Monetary Sanctions 103 filed by Defendants Cashcall, Inc, Paul Reddam, Counter Claimant Cashcall, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits A-R, # 2 Exhibits S-W, # 3 Exhibit X (Part 1), # 4 Exhibit X (Part 2), # 5 Exhibits Y-JJ)(Augustini, Jeff) (Entered: 08/31/2009)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 8/31/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                      NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Compel Compliance With April 21, 2009 Order, the Production of Documents and Provision of Damage-Related Information by Plaintiffs, and for Issue and Monetary Sanctions filed by DEFENDANTS Cashcall, Inc, Paul Reddam. Motion set for hearing on 9/29/2009 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Marc L. Goldman. (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Motion)(Augustini, Jeff) (Entered: 08/31/2009)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 8/24/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                        ORDER by Judge Andrew J. Guilford. In accordance with Plaintiff EVAN MEDLEY'S request for dismissal of all causes of action against Defendants CASHCALL, INC., a California corporation and PAUL REDDAM, an individual, as they relate to Plaintiff EVAN MEDLEY only, are hereby dismmissed with prejudice. (db) (Entered: 08/24/2009)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 8/14/2009, Entered: None
                                          NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents. The following error(s) was found: Proposed Document was not submitted as separate attachment RE: REQUEST to Dismiss Plaintiff Evan Medley with Prejudice 100 . In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. (rrp) (Entered: 08/14/2009)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 8/12/2009, Entered: None
                                            REQUEST to Dismiss Plaintiff Evan Medley with Prejudice filed by Plaintiff Evan Medley. (Phung, Angie) (Entered: 08/12/2009)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 7/23/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                              ORDER by Judge Andrew J. Guilford, Granting Stipulation to Dismiss Defendants CashCall, Inc. and J. Paul Reddam 96 (ade) (Entered: 07/27/2009)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 7/23/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                ORDER by Judge Andrew J. Guilford, GRANTING Stipulation to Dismiss Party 97 . Pursuant to the Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice filed with the Court on July 16, 2009, all of Plaintiff Joseph Bang's ("Bang") claims against Defendants CashCall, Inc. and J. Paul Reddam ("Defendants") are hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1). (ade) (Entered: 07/24/2009)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 7/16/2009, Entered: None
                                                  STIPULATION to Dismiss Plaintiff and Counter-Defendant Joseph Bang filed by Defendants and Counter-Claimant Cashcall, Inc, Paul Reddam.(Augustini, Jeff) (Entered: 07/16/2009)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 7/16/2009, Entered: None
                                                    STIPULATION to Dismiss Plaintiff Jose Espinoza filed by Defendants and Counter-Claimant Cashcall, Inc, Paul Reddam.(Augustini, Jeff) (Entered: 07/16/2009)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 6/10/2009, Entered: None
                                                      NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings 4/21/09 9:55AM (Lopez, Margarita) (Entered: 06/10/2009)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 6/10/2009, Entered: None
                                                        TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 4/21/09 9:55AM. Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder: Exceptional Reporting Services, Inc., phone number (361) 949-2988. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 7/1/2009. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/11/2009. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/8/2009. (Lopez, Margarita) (Entered: 06/10/2009)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 5/14/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                          MINUTES OF Discovery Hearing held before Magistrate Judge Marc L. Goldman Clarifying Scope of Deposition. Court Recorder: CS 05/14/2009. (nbo) (Entered: 05/15/2009)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 4/27/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                            MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS ORDER held before Judge Andrew J. Guilford: ORDER CONTINUING DISCOVERY CUTOFF, PRETRIAL CONFERENCE AND TRIAL DATES. Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings:( Discovery cut-off 10/26/2009. Final Pretrial Conference set for 1/11/2010 08:30 AM before Judge Andrew J. Guilford. Jury Trial set for 1/26/2010 09:00 AM before Judge Andrew J. Guilford.) (ade) (Entered: 04/27/2009)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 4/21/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                              MINUTES OF Motion hearing: granting in part 79 Motion to Compel Depositions and Produce Documents; granting in part 67 Motion to Compel Supplemental Responses to Discovery an Supplemental Production of Documents; and 3) granting in part defendants' Motion to Compel Depositions 71 ; held before Magistrate Judge Marc L. Goldman. (See document for details.) 6. The dates in the scheduling order issued by District Judge Guilford are VACATED. A new scheduling order shall be issued by Judge Guilford in accordance with the suggestion of counsel at the hearing. IT IS ORDERED.Court Recorder: CS 4/21/09. (rla, ) (Entered: 04/21/2009)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 4/9/2009, Entered: None
                                                                STATEMENT of Status regarding Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Production of Documents and Depositions MOTION to Compel Defendants to Testify at Deposition and Production of Documents 79 filed by Plaintiffs Dante Zena, Joseph Bang, Isaac Buchanan, Ryan Caywood, Susan Chang, Jesse McCarthy, Jose Espinoza, Brad Coleman, Ben Nable, Ian Debbie, Jeremy Fiebiger, Fennell, Edward Hill, Angela Kim, Ivan Lee, Steven Liu, Evan Medley, David Mejia, John Morris, Ryan Nable, Tony Nguyen, Lisa Banach, Alan Ruiz, John Shindledecker, Joseph Speckman, Edward Suk, Son Thai, Jose Valenzuela, Cornell Wheeler, Trevor Whitworth. (Attachments: # 1 Supplement Certificate of Service)(Markham, David) (Entered: 04/09/2009)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 4/7/2009, Entered: None
                                                                  CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Cashcall, Inc, re Memorandum in Support of Motion 86 , Memorandum in Support of Motion 87 , Declaration (Motion related), Declaration (Motion related) 88 served on 04/07/09. (Augustini, Jeff) (Entered: 04/07/2009)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 4/7/2009, Entered: None
                                                                    DECLARATION of Jeff Augustini in FURTHER SUPPORT of MOTION to Compel Plaintiffs to Provide Supplemental Responses to Written Discovery and to Compel the Production and Supplemental Production of Documents 67 , MOTION to Compel Plaintiffs' Depositions 71 filed by Defendant Cashcall, Inc. (Augustini, Jeff) (Entered: 04/07/2009)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 4/7/2009, Entered: None
                                                                      MEMORANDUM in Support of MOTION to Compel Plaintiffs' Depositions 71 filed by Defendant Cashcall, Inc. (Augustini, Jeff) (Entered: 04/07/2009)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 4/7/2009, Entered: None
                                                                        MEMORANDUM in Support of MOTION to Compel Plaintiffs to Provide Supplemental Responses to Written Discovery and to Compel the Production and Supplemental Production of Documents 67 filed by Defendant Cashcall, Inc. (Augustini, Jeff) (Entered: 04/07/2009)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 4/1/2009, Entered: None
                                                                          OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiffs Dante Zena, Joseph Bang, Isaac Buchanan, Ryan Caywood, Susan Chang, Jesse McCarthy, Jose Espinoza, Brad Coleman, Ben Nable, Ian Debbie, Jeremy Fiebiger, Fennell, Edward Hill, Angela Kim, Ivan Lee, Steven Liu, Evan Medley, David Mejia, John Morris, Ryan Nable, Tony Nguyen, Lisa Banach, Alan Ruiz, John Shindledecker, Joseph Speckman, Edward Suk, Son Thai, Jose Valenzuela, Cornell Wheeler, Trevor Whitworth, re Exhibit to Motion,,, 83 , MOTION to Compel Defendants to Testify at Deposition and Production of Documents 79 , Declaration (Motion related), Declaration (Motion related), Declaration (Motion related) 84 served on 03/31/09. (Markham, David) (Entered: 04/01/2009)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 4/1/2009, Entered: None
                                                                            DECLARATION of Lori Ginex In Support of Defendants Portion of the Joint Stipulation MOTION to Compel Defendants to Testify at Deposition and Production of Documents 79 filed by Plaintiffs Dante Zena, Joseph Bang, Isaac Buchanan, Ryan Caywood, Susan Chang, Jesse McCarthy, Jose Espinoza, Brad Coleman, Ben Nable, Ian Debbie, Jeremy Fiebiger, Fennell, Edward Hill, Angela Kim, Ivan Lee, Steven Liu, Evan Medley, David Mejia, John Morris, Ryan Nable, Tony Nguyen, Lisa Banach, Alan Ruiz, Joseph Speckman, Edward Suk, Son Thai, Jose Valenzuela, Cornell Wheeler, Trevor Whitworth. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibits D-G to the Declaration of Lori Ginex)(Markham, David) (Entered: 04/01/2009)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 4/1/2009, Entered: None
                                                                              EXHIBIT A-I to MOTION to Compel Defendants to Testify at Deposition and Production of Documents 79 filed by Plaintiffs Dante Zena, Joseph Bang, Isaac Buchanan, Ryan Caywood, Susan Chang, Jesse McCarthy, Jose Espinoza, Brad Coleman, Ben Nable, Ian Debbie, Jeremy Fiebiger, Fennell, Edward Hill, Angela Kim, Ivan Lee, Steven Liu, Evan Medley, David Mejia, John Morris, Ryan Nable, Tony Nguyen, Lisa Banach, Alan Ruiz, John Shindledecker, Joseph Speckman, Edward Suk, Son Thai, Jose Valenzuela, Cornell Wheeler, Trevor Whitworth. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibits A-D to Plaintiffs portion of the Joint Stipulation, # 2 Exhibit Exhibits E-G to Plaintiff's portion of the Joint Stipulation, # 3 Exhibit Exhibits H-I to Plaintiffs portion of the Joint Stipulation)(Markham, David) (Entered: 04/01/2009)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 4/1/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents. The following error(s) was found: Incorrect events selected. Correct events are Exhibit to Motion(docket 80) and Declaration(docket 81). RE: MOTION to Compel Defendants' Depositions and Production of Documents 80 , MOTION to Compel Depositions and Production of Documents 81 . In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. (nca) (Entered: 04/01/2009)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 3/31/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                  NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Compel Depositions and Production of Documents filed by Plaintiffs Dante Zena, Joseph Bang, Isaac Buchanan, Ryan Caywood, Susan Chang, Jesse McCarthy, Jose Espinoza, Brad Coleman, Ben Nable, Ian Debbie, Jeremy Fiebiger, Fennell, Edward Hill, Angela Kim, Ivan Lee, Steven Liu, David Mejia, John Morris, Ryan Nable, Tony Nguyen, Lisa Banach, Alan Ruiz, John Shindledecker, Joseph Speckman, Edward Suk, Son Thai, Jose Valenzuela, Cornell Wheeler, Trevor Whitworth. Motion set for hearing on 4/21/2009 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Marc L. Goldman. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibits D-G to Declaration of Lori Ginex)(Markham, David) (Entered: 03/31/2009)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 3/31/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                    NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Compel Defendants' Depositions and Production of Documents filed by Plaintiffs Dante Zena, Joseph Bang, Isaac Buchanan, Ryan Caywood, Susan Chang, Jesse McCarthy, Jose Espinoza, Brad Coleman, Ben Nable, Ian Debbie, Jeremy Fiebiger, Fennell, Edward Hill, Angela Kim, Ivan Lee, Steven Liu, Evan Medley, David Mejia, John Morris, Ryan Nable, Tony Nguyen, Lisa Banach, Alan Ruiz, John Shindledecker, Joseph Speckman, Edward Suk, Son Thai, Jose Valenzuela, Cornell Wheeler, Trevor Whitworth. Motion set for hearing on 4/21/2009 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Marc L. Goldman. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Plaintiff's Exhibits A-D tp Joint Stip, # 2 Exhibit Plaintiffs' Exhibits E-G to Joint Stipulation, # 3 Exhibit Plaintiff's Exhibits H-I to Joint Stipulation)(Markham, David) (Entered: 03/31/2009)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 3/31/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                      NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Compel Defendants to Testify at Deposition and Production of Documents filed by Plaintiffs Dante Zena, Joseph Bang, Isaac Buchanan, Ryan Caywood, Susan Chang, Jesse McCarthy, Jose Espinoza, Brad Coleman, Ben Nable, Ian Debbie, Jeremy Fiebiger, Fennell, Edward Hill, Angela Kim, Ivan Lee, Steven Liu, Evan Medley, David Mejia, John Morris, Ryan Nable, Tony Nguyen, Lisa Banach, Alan Ruiz, John Shindledecker, Joseph Speckman, Edward Suk, Son Thai, Jose Valenzuela, Cornell Wheeler, Trevor Whitworth. Motion set for hearing on 4/21/2009 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Marc L. Goldman. (Attachments: # 1 Supplement Joint Stipulation re Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel, # 2 Declaration Declaration of Clark in support of Plaintiffs' motion to compel, # 3 Declaration Declaration of Laura M. Cotter in support of Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel, # 4 Declaration Declaration of Jeff Augustini)(Markham, David) (Entered: 03/31/2009)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 3/27/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                        CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Cashcall, Inc, re Exhibit to Motion 74 , Declaration (Motion related) 72 , Exhibit to Motion, 70 , Declaration (Motion related), Declaration (Motion related) 75 , Declaration (Motion related), Declaration (Motion related) 69 , Declaration (Motion related), Declaration (Motion related) 76 , MOTION to Compel Plaintiffs to Provide Supplemental Responses to Written Discovery and to Compel the Production and Supplemental Production of Documents 67 , Declaration (Motion related), Declaration (Motion related) 73 , Declaration (Motion related), Declaration (Motion related) 68 , Notice of Motion, 77 , MOTION to Compel Plaintiffs' Depositions 71 served on March 27, 2009. (Augustini, Jeff) (Entered: 03/27/2009)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 3/27/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                          NOTICE OF MOTION re MOTION to Compel Plaintiffs to Provide Supplemental Responses to Written Discovery and to Compel the Production and Supplemental Production of Documents 67 , MOTION to Compel Plaintiffs' Depositions 71 filed by Defendant Cashcall, Inc. Motion set for hearing on 4/21/2009 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Marc L. Goldman. (Augustini, Jeff) (Entered: 03/27/2009)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 3/27/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                            DECLARATION of Laura M. Cotter in Opposition to MOTION to Compel Plaintiffs to Provide Supplemental Responses to Written Discovery and to Compel the Production and Supplemental Production of Documents 67 , MOTION to Compel Plaintiffs' Depositions 71 filed by Defendant Cashcall, Inc. (Augustini, Jeff) (Entered: 03/27/2009)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 3/27/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                              DECLARATION of R. Craig Clark in Opposition to MOTION to Compel Plaintiffs to Provide Supplemental Responses to Written Discovery and to Compel the Production and Supplemental Production of Documents 67 , MOTION to Compel Plaintiffs' Depositions 71 filed by Defendant Cashcall, Inc. (Augustini, Jeff) (Entered: 03/27/2009)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 3/27/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                EXHIBIT A-D to Plaintiffs' Portion of Joint Stipulation to MOTION to Compel Plaintiffs' Depositions 71 filed by Defendant Cashcall, Inc. (Augustini, Jeff) (Entered: 03/27/2009)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 3/27/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                  DECLARATION of Lori Ginex in Support of MOTION to Compel Plaintiffs' Depositions 71 filed by Defendant Cashcall, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G)(Augustini, Jeff) (Entered: 03/27/2009)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 3/27/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                    DECLARATION of Jeff Augustini in Support of MOTION to Compel Plaintiffs' Depositions 71 filed by Defendant Cashcall, Inc. (Augustini, Jeff) (Entered: 03/27/2009)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 3/27/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                      NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Compel Plaintiffs' Depositions filed by Defendant Cashcall, Inc. Motion set for hearing on 4/21/2009 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Marc L. Goldman. (Augustini, Jeff) (Entered: 03/27/2009)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 3/27/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                        EXHIBIT A-C to Plaintiffs' Portion of Joint Stipulation to MOTION to Compel Plaintiffs to Provide Supplemental Responses to Written Discovery and to Compel the Production and Supplemental Production of Documents 67 filed by Defendant Cashcall, Inc. (Augustini, Jeff) (Entered: 03/27/2009)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 3/27/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                          DECLARATION of Lori Ginex in Support of MOTION to Compel Plaintiffs to Provide Supplemental Responses to Written Discovery and to Compel the Production and Supplemental Production of Documents 67 filed by Defendant Cashcall, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G)(Augustini, Jeff) (Entered: 03/27/2009)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 3/27/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                            DECLARATION of Jeff Augustini in Support of MOTION to Compel Plaintiffs to Provide Supplemental Responses to Written Discovery and to Compel the Production and Supplemental Production of Documents 67 filed by Defendant Cashcall, Inc. (Augustini, Jeff) (Entered: 03/27/2009)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 3/27/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                              NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Compel Plaintiffs to Provide Supplemental Responses to Written Discovery and to Compel the Production and Supplemental Production of Documents filed by Defendant Cashcall, Inc. Motion set for hearing on 4/21/2009 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Marc L. Goldman. (Augustini, Jeff) (Entered: 03/27/2009)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 2/6/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Marc L. Goldman, REGARDING CONFIDENTIAL and Highly Confidential Information: Pursuant to the stipulation of the parties, the Court hereby orders the following: (See document for details) IT IS SO ORDERED. (rla) (Entered: 02/10/2009)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 2/5/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                  Joint STIPULATION for Protective Order filed by Defendants Cashcall, Inc, Paul Reddam. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Augustini, Jeff) (Entered: 02/05/2009)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 1/9/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information for attorney Jeff Augustini counsel for Defendants Cashcall, Inc, Paul Reddam, Counter Claimant Cashcall, Inc. Changing address to 15615 Alton Parkway, Suite 250, Irvine, California 92618. Filed by Defendants and Counter-Claimant J. Paul Reddam and CashCall, Inc. (Augustini, Jeff) (Entered: 01/09/2009)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 12/1/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                      PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff David Mejia, Order Granting United Employees Law Group's Motion to Withdraw as Attorney of record for Plaintiff David Mejia; Notice of Motion and Motion to Withdraw as Attorney of record for Plaintiff David Mejia; Points and Authorities in Support Thereof; Declaration of Walter L. Haines in Support of Motion to Withdraw as Attorney of Record for Plaintiffs served on 12/01/2008. (Douglas, Gregory) (Entered: 12/01/2008)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 11/20/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                        MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS ORDER by Judge Andrew J. Guilford: GRANTING MOTION of UNITED EMPLOYEES LAW GROUP, P.C. to Withdraw as Attorney of Record for Plaintiff David Mejia 44 . Accordingly, the Court VACATES the hearing on this matter scheduled for November 24, 2008. The Court ORDERS UELG to serve this Order on Plaintiff Mejia, especially the second page, which contains important information. Service shall be by hand delivery of a copy of this order if possible, and if not possible by mail. UELG must file a proof of this service no later than December 24, 2008. (See document for further details.) The Court GRANTS the Motion as of the date UELG (1) files proof that it served Plaintiff Mejia with this Order and (2) files proof that it gave Plaintiff Mejia notice of the Motion. NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF WHO WILL BE UNREPRESENTED: YOUR PRESENT COUNSEL WILL NO LONGER BE REPRESENTING YOU, WHICH CREATES A RISK THAT YOU COULD LOSE YOUR CASE. Plaintiff Mejia is notified that if he will be representing himself in an individual capacity, it will be his responsibility to comply with all Court rules and applicable laws. If he fails to do so, or fails to appear at hearings, HE COULD LOSE THIS CASE. Plaintiff Mejia is notified that it is his duty to keep the Court informed at all times of his current address. The Court needs to know how to contact Plaintiff Mejia. (rla) (Entered: 11/21/2008)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 10/21/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                          ANSWER filed by Plaintiff and Counter-Defendant Jose Valenzuela.(Treglio, James) (Entered: 10/21/2008)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 10/21/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                            ANSWER filed by Plaintiff and Counter-Defendant Edward Suk.(Treglio, James) (Entered: 10/21/2008)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 10/21/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                              ANSWER filed by Plaintiff and Counter-Defendant Joseph Speckman.(Treglio, James) (Entered: 10/21/2008)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 10/21/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                ANSWER filed by Plaintiff and Counter-Defendant John Shindledecker.(Treglio, James) (Entered: 10/21/2008)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 10/21/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                  ANSWER filed by Plaintiff and Counter-Defendant Jesse McCarthy.(Treglio, James) (Entered: 10/21/2008)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 10/21/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                    ANSWER filed by Plaintiff and Counter-Defendant Steven Liu.(Treglio, James) (Entered: 10/21/2008)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 10/21/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                      ANSWER filed by Plaintiff and Counter-Defendant Jeremy Fiebiger.(Treglio, James) (Entered: 10/21/2008)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 10/21/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                        ANSWER filed by Plaintiff and Counter-Defendant Steve Fennell.(Treglio, James) (Entered: 10/21/2008)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 10/21/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                          ANSWER filed by Plaintiff and Counter-Defendant Ian Debbie.(Treglio, James) (Entered: 10/21/2008)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 10/21/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                            ANSWER filed by Plaintiff and Counter-Defendant Brad Coleman.(Treglio, James) (Entered: 10/21/2008)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 10/21/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                              ANSWER filed by Plaintiff and Counter-Defendant Joseph Bang.(Treglio, James) (Entered: 10/21/2008)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 10/20/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                PROOF OF SERVICE filed by plaintiff David Mejia, re Amendment (Motion related), Amendment (Motion related) 48 , Amendment (Motion related) 49 served on Notice of Motion and Motion to Withdraw as Attorney of Record for Plaintiff David Mejia; Points and Authorities in Support Thereof; OrderGranting Motion to Withdraw as Attorney of Record for Plaintiffs. (Douglas, Gregory) (Entered: 10/20/2008)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 10/20/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                  Amendment to MOTION for Order for Granting Motion to Withdraw as Attorney of Record for Plaintiff 45 Order Granting Motion to Withdraw as Attorney of Record for Plaintiffs filed by Plaintiff David Mejia. (Douglas, Gregory) (Entered: 10/20/2008)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 10/20/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                    Amendment to MOTION of UNITED EMPLOYEES LAW GROUP, P.C. to Withdraw as Attorney of Record for Plaintiff David Mejia 44 Notice of Motion and Motion to Withdraw as Attorney of Record for Plaintiff David Mejia; Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed by Plaintiff David Mejia. (Douglas, Gregory) (Entered: 10/20/2008)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 10/20/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents. The following error(s) was found: Hearing information is not timely RE: MOTION of UNITED EMPLOYEES LAW GROUP, P.C. to Withdraw as Attorney of Record for Plaintiff David Mejia 44 . In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. (rrp) (Entered: 10/20/2008)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 10/14/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                        PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff David Mejia, re MOTION of UNITED EMPLOYEES LAW GROUP, P.C. to Withdraw as Attorney of Record for Plaintiff David Mejia 44 , MOTION for Order for Granting Motion to Withdraw as Attorney of Record for Plaintiff 45 served on 10/14/2008. (Douglas, Gregory) (Entered: 10/14/2008)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 10/14/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Order for Granting Motion to Withdraw as Attorney of Record for Plaintiff filed by Plaintiff David Mejia. Motion set for hearing on 10/27/2008 at 10:00 AM before Judge Andrew J. Guilford. (Douglas, Gregory) (Entered: 10/14/2008)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 10/14/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION of UNITED EMPLOYEES LAW GROUP, P.C. to Withdraw as Attorney of Record for Plaintiff David Mejia filed by Plaintiff David Mejia. Motion set for hearing on 10/27/2008 at 10:00 AM before Judge Andrew J. Guilford. (Douglas, Gregory) (Entered: 10/14/2008)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 10/7/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                              ANSWER to Amended Complaint, 39 with JURY DEMAND filed by DEFENDANTS Cashcall, Inc, Paul Reddam.(Augustini, Jeff) (Entered: 10/07/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 9/15/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                COUNTERCLAIM filed by Counter-Claimant Cashcall, Inc. against Counter-Defendant Brad Coleman. Jury Demand.(nbo) (Entered: 09/16/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 9/15/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                  COUNTERCLAIM filed by Counter-Claimant Cashcall, Inc. against Counter-Defendant Joseph Bang. Jury Demand.(nbo) (Entered: 09/16/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 9/15/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                    COUNTERCLAIM filed by Counter-Defendant Cashcall, Inc. against Counter-Defendant Ian Debbie. Jury Demand.(nbo) (Entered: 09/16/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 9/15/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                      FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by Plaintiffs Ben Nable, Ian Debbie, Jeremy Fiebiger, Dante Zena, Joseph Bang, Isaac Buchanan, Ryan Caywood, Susan Chang, Jesse McCarthy, Jose Espinoza, Brad Coleman, Fennell, Edward Hill, Angela Kim, Ivan Lee, Steven Liu, Evan Medley, David Mejia, John Morris, Ryan Nable, Tony Nguyen, Lisa Banach, Alan Ruiz, John Shindledecker, Joseph Speckman, Edward Suk, Son Thai, Jose Valenzuela, Cornell Wheeler, and Trevor Whitworth (nbo) (Entered: 09/16/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 9/15/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                        COUNTERCLAIM against Steve Fennell; Jury Demanded, filed by counter-claimant Cashcall, Inc(a California corporation).(db) (Entered: 09/16/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 9/15/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                          COUNTERCLAIM against Jeremy Fiebiger Jury Demand, filed by counter-claimant Cashcall, Inc(a California corporation).(db) (Entered: 09/16/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 9/15/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                            COUNTERCLAIM filed by Count-Claimant Cashcall, Inc. against Counter-Defendant Steven Liu. Jury Demand.(nbo) (Entered: 09/16/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 9/15/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                              COUNTERCLAIM filed by Counter-Claimant Cashcall, Inc. against Counter-Defendant Jesse McCarthy. Jury Demand.(nbo) (Entered: 09/16/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 9/15/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                COUNTERCLAIM filed by Counter-Claimant Cashcall, Inc. against Counter-Defendant John Shindledecker. Jury Demand.(nbo) (Entered: 09/16/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 9/15/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                  COUNTERCLAIM filed by Counter-Claimant Caschcall, Inc. against Counter-Defendant Joseph Speckman. Jury Demand.(nbo) (Entered: 09/16/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 9/15/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                    COUNTERCLAIM filed by Counter-Claimant Cashcall, Inc. against Counter-Defendant Edward Suk. Jury Demand.(nbo) (Entered: 09/16/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 9/15/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                      COUNTERCLAIM filed by Counter-Claimant Cashcall, Inc. against Counter-Defendant Jose Valenzuela. Jury Demand.(nbo) (Entered: 09/16/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 9/15/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Defendants Cashcall, Inc, Paul Reddam of Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint and Certain Counterclaims by Defendant CashCall, Inc.. (Augustini, Jeff) (Entered: 09/15/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 9/12/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER by Judge Andrew J. Guilford granting Stipulation for fililng of Plaintiffs Amended Compalint and the Filing of Certain Counterclaims by Defendant Cashcall, Inc. 27 . (1) Plaintiff's Amended Complaint, submitted concurrently with the Stipulation and the [Proposed] Order, shall be filed and deemed served on all Defendants as of the date set forth below: (2) CashCall's 11 Counterclaims, submitted concurrently with the Stipuation and the [Proposed} Order, shall be deemed filed and served on Brad Coleman, Joseph Bank, Ian Debie, Steve Fennell, Jeremy Fiebiger, Steven Liu, Jesse McCarthy, John Schindledecker, Joseph Speckman, Edward Suk, and Jose Valenzuela as the date set forth below; (3) Defendants shall have 30 days from the date set forth below to respond to the Amended Complaint; and (4) Plaintiffs shall have 40 days from the date set forth below to respond the the Counterclaims referenced above. (db) (Entered: 09/15/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 9/5/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF LODGING filed OF: (1) PLAINTIFFS' FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT; AND (2) CERTAIN COUNTERCLAIMS BY DEFENDANT CASHCALL, INC. re Stipulation to Amend/Correct 27 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 (Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint), # 2 Exhibit 2 (Counter-Claim Against Brad Coleman), # 3 Exhibit 3 (Counter-Claim Against Joseph Bang), # 4 Exhibit 4 (Counter-Claim Against Ian Debie), # 5 Exhibit 5 (Counter-Claim Against Steve Fennell), # 6 Exhibit 6 (Counter-Claim Against Jeremy Fiebiger), # 7 Exhibit 7 (Counter-Claim Against Steven Liu), # 8 Exhibit 8 (Counter-Claim Against Jesse McCarthy), # 9 Exhibit 9 (Counter-Claim Against John Shindledecker), # 10 Exhibit 10 (Counter-Claim Against Joseph Speckman), # 11 Exhibit 11 (Counter-Claim Against Edward Suk), # 12 Exhibit 12 (Counter-Claim Against Jose Valenzuela), # 13 Certificate of Service)(Augustini, Jeff) (Entered: 09/05/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 9/5/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                              Joint STIPULATION to Amend Complaint - (Discovery), Complaint - (Discovery), Complaint - (Discovery) 1 filed by Defendants Cashcall, Inc, Paul Reddam. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Certificate of Service)(Augustini, Jeff) (Entered: 09/05/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 8/14/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents. The following error(s) was found: Proposed Document was not submitted as separate attachment and lacking Judges initials RE: APPLICATION to Substitute attorney Walter Haines in place of attorney David R. Markham 23 , APPLICATION to Substitute attorney Walter Haines in place of attorney David R. Markham 25 , APPLICATION to Substitute attorney Walter Haines in place of attorney David R. Markham 24 . In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. (rrp) (Entered: 08/14/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 8/13/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                  APPLICATION to Substitute attorney Walter Haines in place of attorney David R. Markham filed by Plaintiff Tony Nguyen. (Treglio, James) (Entered: 08/13/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 8/13/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                    APPLICATION to Substitute attorney Walter Haines in place of attorney David R. Markham filed by Plaintiff Trevor Whitworth. (Treglio, James) (Entered: 08/13/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 8/13/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                      APPLICATION to Substitute attorney Walter Haines in place of attorney David R. Markham filed by Plaintiff Dante Zena. (Treglio, James) (Entered: 08/13/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 7/25/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                        APPLICATION to Substitute attorney David R. Markham in place of attorney Walter Haines filed by Plaintiff Dante Zena, Paul Reddam, Joseph Bang, Isaac Buchanan, Ryan Caywood, Susan Chang, Jose Espinoza, Brad Coleman, Fennell, Edward Hill, Angela Kim, Ivan Lee, Steven Liu, Evan Medley, David Mejia, John Morris, Ryan Nable, Tony Nguyen, Lisa Banach, Alan Ruiz, John Shindledecker, Joseph Speckman, Edward Suk, Son Thai, Jose Valenzuela, Cornell Wheeler, Trevor Whitworth. (Attachments: # 1 Supplement Proof of Service)(Treglio, James) (Entered: 07/25/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 7/7/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                          MINUTES OF Scheduling Conference held before Judge Andrew J. Guilford, Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings:( Discovery cut-off 4/14/2009. Final Pretrial Conference set for 6/29/2009 08:30 AM before Judge Andrew J. Guilford. Jury Trial set for 7/14/2009 09:00 AM before Judge Andrew J. Guilford.)Court Reporter: Bernadette Balajadia. (ade) (Entered: 07/10/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 7/7/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                            SCHEDULING ORDER by Judge Andrew J. Guilford, Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings:( Discovery cut-off 4/14/2009. Final Pretrial Conference set for 6/29/2009 08:30 AM before Judge Andrew J. Guilford. Jury Trial set for 7/14/2009 09:00 AM before Judge Andrew J. Guilford.) (ade) (Entered: 07/10/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 6/27/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                              JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 10-14 days, filed by Defendants Cashcall, Inc, Paul Reddam.. (Augustini, Jeff) (Entered: 06/27/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 5/9/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER RE EARLY MEETING OF PARTIES AND SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Andrew J. Guilford. Scheduling Conference set for 7/7/2008 09:00 AM before Judge Andrew J. Guilford. (ade) (Entered: 05/09/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 4/1/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Association of Counsel Filed by Defendants Cashcall, Inc, Paul Reddam (Augustini, Jeff) (Entered: 04/01/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 3/11/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    PROOF OF SERVICE Executed Brad Coleman, upon Paul Reddam The Summons and Complaint were served by by substituted service service, by Federal statute, upon Carrie Mercer, P.I.C.. Due Dilligence declaration is attached. Original Summons was returned. (Haines, Walter) (Entered: 03/11/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 3/11/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      PROOF OF SERVICE Executed Brad Coleman, upon CashCall, Inc. The Summons and Complaint were served by by substituted service service, by Federal statute, upon Daniel Harry Baren, Authorized Agent. Due Dilligence declaration is not attached. Original Summons was returned. (Haines, Walter) (Entered: 03/11/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 3/3/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 07-02 -Related Case- filed. Related Case No: SACV 06-963 AG (MLGx). Case transfered from Judge David O. Carter to Judge Andrew J. Guilford for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge SACV 08-24 AG (MLGx).Signed by Judge Andrew J. Guilford (jal) (Entered: 03/03/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 2/19/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents. The following deficiency was found, Incorrect event selected. Correct event is Certificate of Interested Parties. (rrp) (Entered: 02/19/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 2/18/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Brad Coleman, upon Paul Reddam served on 1/23/2008, answer due 2/12/2008. The Summons and Complaint were served by by substituted service service, by Federal statute, upon Carrie Mercer, P.I.C.. Due Dilligence declaration is attached. Original Summons not returned with the proof of service. (Haines, Walter) (Entered: 02/18/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 2/18/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              PROOF OF SERVICE ExecutedCashcall, Inc served on 1/23/2008, answer due 5/22/2008. Proof of Service The Summons and Complaint were served by by substituted service, by Federal statute. Service accepted by Carrie Mercer, P.I.C. on behalf of Daniel Harry Baren, Authorized Agent. Original Summons not returned with the proof of service. (Haines, Walter) (Entered: 02/18/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 2/11/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Certificate OF SERVICE filed by Defendants Cashcall, Inc, Paul Reddam, re Certificate of Interested Parties 8 , Notice of Related Case(s) 9 , Answer to Complaint (Discovery) 7 served on 2/11/2008. (Augustini, Jeff) (Entered: 02/11/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 2/11/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Defendants Cashcall, Inc, Paul Reddam. Related Case(s): SACV-06-963 AG (MLGx); SACV 07-831 AG (MLGx) (Augustini, Jeff) (Entered: 02/11/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 2/11/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Certification and Notice of Interested Parties filed by Defendants Cashcall, Inc, Paul Reddam. (Augustini, Jeff) (Entered: 02/11/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 2/11/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery), Complaint - (Discovery), Complaint - (Discovery) 1 filed by Defendants Cashcall, Inc, Paul Reddam.(Augustini, Jeff) (Entered: 02/11/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 2/7/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents. The following deficiency was found. Incorrect event selected, action will be taken by Filer. Correct event is Service of Summons & Complaint Returned Executed (20 days). (rrp) (Entered: 02/07/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 2/4/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Proof of Service filed by Plaintiff Brad Coleman (Haines, Walter) (Entered: 02/04/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 2/4/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Proof of Service (Haines, Walter) (Entered: 02/04/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 1/10/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE TO PARTIES OF ADR PILOT PROGRAM filed.(ade) (Entered: 01/17/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 1/10/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs Joseph Bang, Isaac Buchanan, Ryan Caywood, Susan Chang, Jose Espinoza, Brad Coleman, Fennell, Edward Hill, Angela Kim, Ivan Lee, Steven Liu, Evan Medley, David Mejia, John Morris, Ryan Nable, Tony Nguyen, Lisa Banach, Alan Ruiz, John Shindledecker, Joseph Speckman, Edward Suk, Son Thai. (klg) Additional attachment(s) added on 1/15/2008 (klg, ). (Entered: 01/14/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 1 Filed: 1/10/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  COMPLAINT against defendants Cashcall, Inc, Paul Reddam.(Filing fee $ 350 paid) Jury Demanded., filed by plaintiffs Dante Zena, Joseph Bang, Isaac Buchanan, Ryan Caywood, Susan Chang, Jose Espinoza, Brad Coleman, Fennell, Edward Hill, Angela Kim, Ivan Lee, Steven Liu, Evan Medley, David Mejia, John Morris, Ryan Nable, Tony Nguyen, Lisa Banach, Alan Ruiz, John Shindledecker, Joseph Speckman, Edward Suk, Son Thai, Jose Valenzuela, Cornell Wheeler, Trevor Whitworth.(klg) Additional attachment(s) added on 1/15/2008 (klg, ). Additional attachment(s) added on 1/24/2008 (klg, ). (Entered: 01/14/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Space Space

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    This case has been viewed 183 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                     
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Need Password Help?