Coach, Inc. et al v. Di Da Import and Export Inc.

Federal Civil Lawsuit Illinois Northern District Court, Case No. 1:13-cv-07165
Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated July 26, 2017 at 3:43 AM EDT (7.8 years ago) Update UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert AlertsSpaceJump Jump
Summary

No one has written a summary of this case yet. Sign up or sign in to contribute one.

Parties
No Logo Coach Services, Inc., Plaintiff

Represented by Bryan Cave, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lauren Jennifer Caisman +1 312 602 5000 lauren.caisman@bryancave.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lauren Jennifer Caisman +1 312 602 5000 lauren.caisman@bryancave.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Donald Alexander Cole +1 312 602 5028 donald.cole@bryancave.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Donald Alexander Cole +1 312 602 5028 donald.cole@bryancave.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Patrick McKey +1 312 602 5000 +1 312 602 5050 patrick.mckey@bryancave.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Patrick McKey +1 312 602 5000 +1 312 602 5050 patrick.mckey@bryancave.com
Space Patrick McKey +1 312 602 5000 +1 312 602 5050 patrick.mckey@bryancave.com
No Logo Coach, Inc., Plaintiff

Represented by Bryan Cave, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lauren Jennifer Caisman +1 312 602 5000 lauren.caisman@bryancave.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Donald Alexander Cole +1 312 602 5028 donald.cole@bryancave.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Patrick McKey +1 312 602 5000 +1 312 602 5050 patrick.mckey@bryancave.com
Space Patrick McKey +1 312 602 5000 +1 312 602 5050 patrick.mckey@bryancave.com
v.
No Logo Amy Shi, Defendant

Represented by 233 S Wacker Dr

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 12/15/2015 Brian T Noack +1 239 671 1103 +1 708 843 0509 briann@wonoip.com

Represented by Law Office of Richard D. Grossman

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Carolyn Shields +1 718 463 1868 shieldscj524@gmail.com

Represented by Suite 232

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 12/15/2015 Adam Wolek +1 312 860 9006 adamw@wonoip.com
No Logo Di Da Import And Export Inc., Defendant

Represented by 233 S Wacker Dr

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
doing business asDi Da New York Brian T Noack +1 239 671 1103 +1 708 843 0509 briann@wonoip.com

Represented by Ice Miller LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brian J Lum +1 312 726 8147 +1 312 726 6259 brian.lum@icemiller.com

Represented by Law Office of Richard D. Grossman

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ying Liu +1 718 463 1868 +1 718 359 7830 whinnyliu@gmail.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Carolyn Shields +1 718 463 1868 shieldscj524@gmail.com

Represented by Suite 232

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
doing business asDi Da New York Adam Wolek +1 312 860 9006 adamw@wonoip.com
No Logo Hong Zhu, Defendant

Represented by 233 S Wacker Dr

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 12/15/2015 Brian T Noack +1 239 671 1103 +1 708 843 0509 briann@wonoip.com

Represented by Law Office of Richard D. Grossman

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Carolyn Shields +1 718 463 1868 shieldscj524@gmail.com

Represented by Suite 232

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 12/15/2015 Adam Wolek +1 312 860 9006 adamw@wonoip.com
No Logo Long, Zhu, Defendant

Represented by 233 S Wacker Dr

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Brian T Noack +1 239 671 1103 +1 708 843 0509 briann@wonoip.com

Represented by Law Office of Richard D. Grossman

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Carolyn Shields +1 718 463 1868 shieldscj524@gmail.com

Represented by Suite 232

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Adam Wolek +1 312 860 9006 adamw@wonoip.com
No Logo Sam Zhu, Defendant

Represented by 233 S Wacker Dr

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Brian T Noack +1 239 671 1103 +1 708 843 0509 briann@wonoip.com

Represented by Law Office of Richard D. Grossman

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Carolyn Shields +1 718 463 1868 shieldscj524@gmail.com

Represented by Suite 232

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Adam Wolek +1 312 860 9006 adamw@wonoip.com
Attributes
Timeline
  Entries (147) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 5/2/2016, Entered: None
MAILED Trademark report to Patent Trademark Office, Alexandria VA (mr, ) (Entered: 05/02/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank 142 Filed: 4/29/2016, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before the Honorable Samuel Der-Yeghiayan: Final default judgment and permanent injunction having been entered, the instant action is hereby dismissed. All pending dates and motion, if any, are stricken as moot. Civil case terminated. Mailed notice (mw,) (Entered: 04/29/2016)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 4/12/2016, Entered: None
DECLARATION of Sam Zhu regarding entered judgment 139 in Response to Injunction (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Long Zhu in Response to Injunction)(Shields, Carolyn) (Entered: 04/12/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank 140 Filed: 4/12/2016, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before the Honorable Samuel Der-Yeghiayan: Status hearing held. As stated on the record, counsel for Plaintiffs advised the Court that they will not be filing a request for fees and costs. Mailed notice (mw,) (Entered: 04/12/2016)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 3/15/2016, Entered: None Judgment - AO450
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 3/15/2016, Entered: None Order on Motion for Default Judgment
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 3/11/2016, Entered: None
NOTICE of Motion by Donald Alexander Cole for presentment of motion for default judgment, 136 before Honorable Samuel Der-Yeghiayan on 3/15/2016 at 09:00 AM. (Cole, Donald) (Entered: 03/11/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 3/11/2016, Entered: None Default Judgment
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 3/9/2016, Entered: None Order on Motion to Reset
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 3/9/2016, Entered: None
NOTICE of Motion by Lauren Jennifer Caisman for presentment of motion to reset 133 before Honorable Samuel Der-Yeghiayan on 3/15/2016 at 09:00 AM. (Caisman, Lauren) (Entered: 03/09/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 3/9/2016, Entered: None Reset
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 3/9/2016, Entered: None Order
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 2/18/2016, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before the Honorable Samuel Der-Yeghiayan: Status hearing held. No one appeared on behalf of the Defendants on the Court's noticed hearing. The Defendants having been warned on 02/11/16, Plaintiffs' oral motion for default is granted. Default is hereby entered in favor of Plaintiffs Coach, Inc. and Coach Services, Inc. and against Defendants Di Da Import and Export Inc., Long Zhu, and Sam Zhu. Prove-up hearing set for 03/10/16 at 9:00 a.m. Mailed notice (mw, ) (Entered: 02/18/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 2/17/2016, Entered: None
REPLY by Plaintiffs Coach Services, Inc., Coach, Inc. to motion for preliminary injunction 100 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Email Correspondence, # 2 Exhibit B - Young's Fashion Deposition Excerpts, # 3 Exhibit C - Amy Shi Deposition Excerpts)(Caisman, Lauren) (Entered: 02/17/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 2/17/2016, Entered: None
TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on February 4, 2016, before the Honorable Samuel Der-Yeghiayan. Court Reporter Contact Information: Laura LaCien, 312-408-5032, laura_lacien@ilnd.uscourts.gov. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 3/9/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/21/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/17/2016. (Lacien, Laura) (Entered: 02/17/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 2/16/2016, Entered: None
OPINION from the USCA for the USCA, 7th Circuit; Argued 01/07/2016; Decided 01/22/2016 in USCA case no. 15-1480. (sxw, ) (Entered: 02/16/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 2/16/2016, Entered: None
MANDATE of USCA dated 01/22/2016 regarding notice of appeal 48 ; USCA No. 15-1480. This appeal is DISMISSED, with costs, for want of jurisdiction. The above is in accordance with the decision of this court entered on this date. (sxw, ) (Entered: 02/16/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 2/16/2016, Entered: None
LETTER from the USCA regarding the record on appeal in USCA no. 15-1480. No record to be returned. (sxw, ) (Entered: 02/16/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 2/11/2016, Entered: None Order on Motion to Compel
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank 124 Filed: 2/11/2016, Entered: None
DECLARATION of Sam Zhu regarding temporary restraining order 105 (Amended) (Shields, Carolyn) (Entered: 02/11/2016)
LREF
Blank 123 Filed: 2/10/2016, Entered: None
RESPONSE by Long Zhu, Sam Zhuin Opposition to MOTION by Plaintiffs Coach Services, Inc., Coach, Inc. for sanctions, MOTION by Plaintiffs Coach Services, Inc., Coach, Inc. to compel Compliance with Temporary Restraining Order 121 (Shields, Carolyn) (Entered: 02/10/2016)
LREF
Blank 122 Filed: 2/8/2016, Entered: None
NOTICE of Motion by Donald Alexander Cole for presentment of motion to compel,, 121 before Honorable Samuel Der-Yeghiayan on 2/11/2016 at 09:00 AM. (Cole, Donald) (Entered: 02/08/2016)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 2/8/2016, Entered: None Compel
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 2/4/2016, Entered: None Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 2/3/2016, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM by Di Da Import and Export Inc., Long Zhu, Sam Zhu in Opposition to motion for preliminary injunction 100 (Shields, Carolyn) (Entered: 02/03/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 2/3/2016, Entered: None
Leave for Adam Wolek to Withdraw as Local Counsel NOTICE of Motion by Adam Wolek for presentment of motion to withdraw as attorney 117 before Honorable Samuel Der-Yeghiayan on 2/9/2016 at 09:00 AM. (Wolek, Adam) (Entered: 02/03/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 2/3/2016, Entered: None Withdraw as Attorney
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 2/3/2016, Entered: None
Leave for Brian T. Noack to Withdraw as Local Counsel NOTICE of Motion by Adam Wolek for presentment of motion to withdraw as attorney 115 before Honorable Samuel Der-Yeghiayan on 2/9/2016 at 09:00 AM. (Wolek, Adam) (Entered: 02/03/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 2/3/2016, Entered: None Withdraw as Attorney
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 2/3/2016, Entered: None
DECLARATION of SAM ZHU and LONG ZHU regarding temporary restraining order 105 (Shields, Carolyn) (Entered: 02/03/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 2/2/2016, Entered: None
AMENDED ANSWER to amended complaint (first) by Long Zhu, Sam Zhu(Shields, Carolyn) (Entered: 02/02/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 2/1/2016, Entered: None
NOTICE of Motion by Donald Alexander Cole for presentment of motion for temporary restraining order 111 before Honorable Samuel Der-Yeghiayan on 2/4/2016 at 09:00 AM. (Cole, Donald) (Entered: 02/01/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 2/2/2016, Entered: None Temporary Restraining Order
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 2/1/2016, Entered: None
MOTION by Plaintiffs Coach Services, Inc., Coach, Inc. for temporary restraining order Agreed Extension (Cole, Donald) (Entered: 02/01/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 1/26/2016, Entered: None
TRANSMITTED to the USCA for the 7th Circuit supplemental record on appeal 48 (USCA no. 15-1480) consisting of 1 volume of transcript. (sxw, ) (Entered: 01/26/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 1/25/2016, Entered: None Order on Motion to Clarify
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 1/25/2016, Entered: None
TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on January 20, 2016, before the Honorable Samuel Der-Yeghiayan. Court Reporter Contact Information: Laura LaCien, 312-408-5032, laura_lacien@ilnd.uscourts.gov. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 2/15/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/25/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/25/2016. (Lacien, Laura) (Entered: 01/25/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 1/21/2016, Entered: None
NOTICE of Motion by Donald Alexander Cole for presentment of motion to clarify 106 before Honorable Samuel Der-Yeghiayan on 1/26/2016 at 09:00 AM. (Cole, Donald) (Entered: 01/21/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 1/21/2016, Entered: None Clarify
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 1/20/2016, Entered: None Temporary Restraining Order
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 1/20/2016, Entered: None Order on Motion for Entry of Default
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 1/15/2016, Entered: None
ANSWER to amended complaint by Long Zhu, Sam Zhu(Shields, Carolyn) (Entered: 01/15/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 1/15/2016, Entered: None
NOTICE of Motion by Donald Alexander Cole for presentment of motion for entry of default 101 , motion for preliminary injunction 100 before Honorable Samuel Der-Yeghiayan on 1/20/2016 at 09:00 AM. (Cole, Donald) (Entered: 01/15/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 1/15/2016, Entered: None Entry of Default
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 1/15/2016, Entered: None Preliminary Injunction
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 1/11/2016, Entered: None Order on Motion for Order
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 1/11/2016, Entered: None Temporary Restraining Order
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 1/11/2016, Entered: None
NOTICE of Motion by Donald Alexander Cole for presentment of motion for order 96 before Honorable Samuel Der-Yeghiayan on 1/14/2016 at 09:00 AM. (Cole, Donald) (Entered: 01/11/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 1/11/2016, Entered: None Order
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 1/7/2016, Entered: None
CERTIFIED copy of order dated 1/7/2016 from the 7th Circuit regarding notice of appeal 48 ; Appellate case no. : 15-1480; The parties have one week to file in the district court a motion asking it to comply with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 65(d). If no such motion is filed by January 14, 2016, this appeal will be dismissed summarily for lack of jurisdiction. If such a motion is filed, the parties shall file that motion with us simultaneously and promptly file with us any response the district court makes to that motion. If the parties believe that the district court's response requires supplemental briefs from either side, they should inform the court and the panel will decide the length and timing of any supplemental briefing. (lk, ) (Entered: 01/08/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 1/5/2016, Entered: None Order on Motion to Compel
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 1/5/2016, Entered: None
NOTICE by Brian T Noack of Change of Address (Noack, Brian) (Entered: 01/05/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 1/5/2016, Entered: None
NOTICE by Adam Wolek of Change of Address (Wolek, Adam) (Entered: 01/05/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 12/31/2015, Entered: None
NOTICE of Motion by Lauren Jennifer Caisman for presentment of motion to compel, 90 before Honorable Samuel Der-Yeghiayan on 1/6/2016 at 09:00 AM. (Caisman, Lauren) (Entered: 12/31/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 12/31/2015, Entered: None Compel
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 12/15/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 12/15/2015, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before the Honorable Samuel Der-Yeghiayan: Status hearing held and continued to 7/28/2016 at 9:00 a.m. Dispositive motions shall be filed by 2/19/2016. Responses shall be filed by 4/19/2016. Replies, if any, shall be filed by 5/10/2016. Mailed notice (meg, ) (Entered: 12/15/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank 87 Filed: 11/23/2015, Entered: None
USCA RECEIVED on 11/23/15 the long on appeal record. (ea, ) (Entered: 11/23/2015)
LREF
Blank 86 Filed: 11/23/2015, Entered: None
TRANSMITTED to the USCA for the 7th Circuit the long record on appeal 48 (USCA no. 15-1480) (ea, ) (Entered: 11/23/2015)
LREF
Blank 85 Filed: 11/20/2015, Entered: None
NOTICE to Transmit Record on Appeal regarding notice of appeal 48 ; USCA Case No. 15-1480. (lk, ) (Entered: 11/23/2015)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 11/5/2015, Entered: None
REPLY by Amy Shi, Hong Zhu, Long Zhu, Sam Zhu to MOTION by Defendants Amy Shi, Sam Zhu, Hong Zhu, Long Zhu to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction (personal) and for insufficiency of service of process 63 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Declaration of Carolyn Shields)(Shields, Carolyn) (Entered: 11/05/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 10/20/2015, Entered: None
RESPONSE by Coach Services, Inc., Coach, Inc.in Opposition to MOTION by Defendants Amy Shi, Sam Zhu, Hong Zhu, Long Zhu to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction (personal) and for insufficiency of service of process 63 (Attachments: # 1 Index of Exhibits, # 2 Exhibit A- Sam Zhu Deposition Testimony I, # 3 Exhibit B- Sam Zhu Deposition Testimony II, # 4 Exhibit C- NYS Department of State Business Entity Information, # 5 Exhibit D- Long Zhu Deposition Testimony II, # 6 Exhibit E- Amy Shi Deposition Testimony II, # 7 Exhibit F- Hong Zhu Deposition Testimony I, # 8 Exhibit G- Amy Shi Deposition Testimony I, # 9 Exhibit H- Hong Zhu Deposition Testimony II, # 10 Exhibit I- Long Zhu Deposition Testimony I)(Caisman, Lauren) (Entered: 10/20/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 10/20/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 10/15/2015, Entered: None
NOTICE of Motion by Lauren Jennifer Caisman for presentment of motion for leave to file excess pages,, 80 before Honorable Samuel Der-Yeghiayan on 10/20/2015 at 09:00 AM. (Caisman, Lauren) (Entered: 10/15/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 10/15/2015, Entered: None File Excess Pages
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 10/1/2015, Entered: None
TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on July 23, 2015, before the Honorable Samuel Der-Yeghiayan. Court Reporter Contact Information: Laura LaCien, 312-408-5032, laura_lacien@ilnd.uscourts.gov. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 10/22/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/2/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/30/2015. (Lacien, Laura) (Entered: 10/01/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 9/17/2015, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before the Honorable Samuel Der-Yeghiayan: Status hearing held and continued to 12/15/15 at 9:00 a.m. As stated on the record, Defendants will produce the requested documents by 09/24/15. Plaintiffs' response to Defendants' motion to dismiss 63 shall be filed by 10/15/15 and Defendants' reply shall be filed by 11/05/15. Mailed notice (mw,) (Entered: 09/17/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 8/27/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 8/24/2015, Entered: None
AGREED NOTICE of Motion by Carolyn Shields for presentment of motion for extension of time to complete discovery 75 before Honorable Samuel Der-Yeghiayan on 8/27/2015 at 09:00 AM. (Shields, Carolyn) (Entered: 08/24/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 8/24/2015, Entered: None Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 7/23/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion for Protective Order
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 7/21/2015, Entered: None
RESPONSE by Coach Services, Inc., Coach, Inc.in Opposition to MOTION by Defendants Amy Shi, Hong Zhu, Long Zhu, Sam Zhu for protective order (Amended Motion) 71 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Correspondence from C. Shields, # 2 Exhibit B - Response to Order to Show Cause, # 3 Exhibit C - Deposition Testimony of Hong Zhu, # 4 Exhibit D - Deposition Testimony of Sam Zhu, # 5 Exhibit E - Deposition Testimony of Amy Shi, # 6 Exhibit F - Correspondence from P. McKey, # 7 Exhibit G - Transcript of Proceedings, # 8 Exhibit H - Deposition Notices, # 9 Exhibit I - Correspondence from P. McKey, # 10 Exhibit J - Correspondence from P. McKey, # 11 Exhibit K- Deposition Transcript, # 12 Exhibit L - Discovery Responses)(Caisman, Lauren) (Entered: 07/21/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank 72 Filed: 7/13/2015, Entered: None
AMENDED NOTICE of Motion by Carolyn Shields for presentment of motion for protective order 71 before Honorable Samuel Der-Yeghiayan on 7/23/2015 at 09:00 AM. (Shields, Carolyn) (Entered: 07/13/2015)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 7/13/2015, Entered: None Protective Order
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 7/13/2015, Entered: None
NOTICE of Motion by Carolyn Shields for presentment of motion for protective order 69 before Honorable Samuel Der-Yeghiayan on 7/23/2015 at 09:00 AM. (Shields, Carolyn) (Entered: 07/13/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 7/13/2015, Entered: None Protective Order
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 6/3/2015, Entered: None Motion Hearing Held
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 6/2/2015, Entered: None
ORDER: Motion hearing held. Brian Lum's motion to withdraw as counsel for the Defendants and to substitute attorneys Adam Wolek and Brian Noack as counsel for Defendants is granted. Defendant's motion to dismiss 63 is entered and continued. As stated on the record, counsel for Plaintiffs is given until 08/17/15 to take limited discovery, including taking depositions, as it relates to Defendants' motion to dismiss. Status hearing reset to 08/19/15 at 9:00 a.m. Status hearing set for 06/17/15 is stricken. Signed by the Honorable Samuel Der-Yeghiayan on 6/2/2015. (rm, ) (Entered: 06/03/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 6/2/2015, Entered: None
ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Di Da Import and Export Inc., Amy Shi, Hong Zhu, Long Zhu, Sam Zhu by Brian T Noack (Noack, Brian) (Entered: 06/02/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 6/2/2015, Entered: None
ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Di Da Import and Export Inc., Amy Shi, Hong Zhu, Long Zhu, Sam Zhu by Adam Wolek (Wolek, Adam) (Entered: 06/02/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 5/29/2015, Entered: None
ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Amy Shi, Hong Zhu, Long Zhu, Sam Zhu by Carolyn Shields (Shields, Carolyn) (Entered: 05/29/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 5/28/2015, Entered: None
NOTICE of Motion by Carolyn Shields for presentment of motion to dismiss/lack of jurisdiction, 63 before Honorable Samuel Der-Yeghiayan on 6/2/2015 at 09:00 AM. (Shields, Carolyn) (Entered: 05/28/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 5/29/2015, Entered: None Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 5/28/2015, Entered: None
MOTION by Defendants Amy Shi, Sam Zhu, Hong Zhu, Long Zhu to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction (personal) and for insufficiency of service of process (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Sam Zhu, Long Zhu, Hong Zhu, Amy Shi, and Carolyn Shields)(Shields, Carolyn) (Entered: 05/28/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank 62 Filed: 5/28/2015, Entered: None
Notice of Motion To Dismiss/ NOTICE of Motion by Carolyn Shields for presentment of before Honorable Samuel Der-Yeghiayan on 6/2/2015 at 09:00 AM. (Shields, Carolyn) (Entered: 05/28/2015)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 5/27/2015, Entered: None
NOTICE of Motion by Brian J. Lum for presentment of motion to withdraw as attorney 60 before Honorable Samuel Der-Yeghiayan on 6/2/2015 at 09:00 AM. (Lum, Brian) (Entered: 05/27/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 5/27/2015, Entered: None Withdraw as Attorney
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank 59 Filed: 5/16/2015, Entered: None
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Coach, Inc., Coach Services, Inc. as to Amy Shi on 5/7/2015, answer due 5/28/2015; Hong Zhu on 5/7/2015, answer due 5/28/2015; Long Zhu on 5/7/2015, answer due 5/28/2015; Sam Zhu on 5/7/2015, answer due 5/28/2015. (Caisman, Lauren) (Entered: 05/16/2015)
LREF
Blank 58 Filed: 5/5/2015, Entered: None
ANSWER to amended complaint by Di Da Import and Export Inc.(Shields, Carolyn) (Entered: 05/05/2015)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 4/28/2015, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before the Honorable Samuel Der-Yeghiayan: Status hearing held and continued to 06/17/15 at 9:00 a.m. Defendant DiDa to answer or otherwise plead to the amended complaint within 7 days. Plaintiffs are warned that failure to serve summons and amended complaint on all Defendants may result in a dismissal of that Defendant who has not waived service or were not properly served pursuant to FRCP 4.Mailed notice (mw, ) (Entered: 04/28/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 3/20/2015, Entered: None
NOTICE of Correction 54 (tg, ) (Entered: 03/20/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 3/20/2015, Entered: None
SEVENTH CIRCUIT transcript information sheet by Di Da Import and Export Inc. (Shields, Carolyn) (Entered: 03/20/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 3/11/2015, Entered: None
TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on February 4, 2015, before the Honorable Samuel Der-Yeghiayan. Court Reporter Contact Information: Laura LaCien, 312-408-5032, laura_lacien@ilnd.uscourts.gov. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 4/1/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/13/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/9/2015. (Lacien, Laura) (Entered: 03/11/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 3/11/2015, Entered: None
TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on January 6, 2015, before the Honorable Samuel Der-Yeghiayan. Court Reporter Contact Information: Laura LaCien, 312-408-5032, laura_lacien@ilnd.uscourts.gov. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 4/1/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/13/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/9/2015. (Lacien, Laura) (Entered: 03/11/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 3/9/2015, Entered: None
ACKNOWLEDGMENT of receipt of short record on appeal regarding notice of appeal 48 ; USCA Case No. 15-1480 (sj, ) (Entered: 03/09/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 3/6/2015, Entered: None
TRANSMITTED to the 7th Circuit the short record on notice of appeal 48 . Notified counsel (smm) (Entered: 03/06/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 3/6/2015, Entered: None
NOTICE of Appeal Due letter sent to counsel of record regarding notice of appeal 48 . (smm) (Entered: 03/06/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 3/5/2015, Entered: None
DOCKETING Statement by Di Da Import and Export Inc. regarding notice of appeal 48 (Shields, Carolyn) (Entered: 03/05/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 3/5/2015, Entered: None
NOTICE of appeal by Di Da Import and Export Inc. regarding orders 44 , 42 Filing fee $ 505, receipt number 0752-10413722. (Shields, Carolyn) (Entered: 03/05/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 2/26/2015, Entered: None Amended Complaint
Request RequestSpace LREF
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 2/26/2015, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before the Honorable Samuel Der-Yeghiayan: Status hearing held and continued to 04/28/15 at 9:00 a.m. Mailed notice (mw, ) (Entered: 02/26/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 2/25/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion for Leave to File
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 2/25/2015, Entered: None memorandum opinion and order
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 2/4/2015, Entered: None
REPLY by Coach Services, Inc., Coach, Inc. to memorandum in opposition to motion 35 , MOTION by Plaintiffs Coach Services, Inc., Coach, Inc. for leave to file First Amended Complaint and Memorandum in Support 29 (McKey, Steven) (Entered: 02/04/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 2/4/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 1/28/2015, Entered: None
NOTICE of Motion by Brian J. Lum for presentment of motion to dismiss/lack of jurisdiction 40 before Honorable Samuel Der-Yeghiayan on 2/4/2015 at 09:00 AM. (Lum, Brian) (Entered: 01/28/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 1/28/2015, Entered: None Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 1/28/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion to Dismiss
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 1/23/2015, Entered: None
NOTICE of Motion by Carolyn Shields for presentment of motion to dismiss 37 before Honorable Samuel Der-Yeghiayan on 1/28/2015 at 09:00 AM. (Shields, Carolyn) (Entered: 01/23/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 1/23/2015, Entered: None Dismiss
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 1/20/2015, Entered: None
AFFIDAVIT by Defendant Di Da Import and Export Inc. in Opposition to MOTION by Plaintiffs Coach Services, Inc., Coach, Inc. for leave to file First Amended Complaint and Memorandum in Support 29 (Declarations of Sam Zhu, Long Zhu, Hong Zhu, Ami Shi, and Carolyn Shields) (Shields, Carolyn) (Entered: 01/20/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank 35 Filed: 1/20/2015, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM by Di Da Import and Export Inc. in Opposition to motion for leave to file, 29 first amended complaint (Shields, Carolyn) (Entered: 01/20/2015)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 1/20/2015, Entered: None
REPLY by Plaintiffs Coach Services, Inc., Coach, Inc. to motion for temporary restraining order, 30 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Hong Zhu Deposition Testimony, # 2 Exhibit 2 - Sam Zhu Deposition Testimony, # 3 Exhibit 3 - Amy Shi Deposition Testimony, # 4 Exhibit 4 - Long Zhu Deposition Testimony)(Caisman, Lauren) (Entered: 01/20/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 1/6/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion for TRO
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 1/5/2015, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM by Di Da Import and Export Inc. in Opposition to motion for temporary restraining order, 30 and Declarations in Support (Shields, Carolyn) (Entered: 01/05/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 12/19/2014, Entered: None
NOTICE of Motion by Steven Patrick McKey for presentment of motion for temporary restraining order, 30 before Honorable Samuel Der-Yeghiayan on 1/6/2015 at 09:00 AM. (McKey, Steven) (Entered: 12/19/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 12/19/2014, Entered: None Temporary Restraining Order
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 12/19/2014, Entered: None Leave to File Document
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 12/9/2014, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before the Honorable Samuel Der-Yeghiayan: Status hearing held and continued to 01/27/15 at 9:00 a.m. As stated on the record, Plaintiffs to file their motion for leave to file an amended complaint by 12/19/14 and Defendant to file its response by 01/20/15. Mailed notice (mw,) (Entered: 12/09/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 11/5/2014, Entered: None Order
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 11/4/2014, Entered: None
ORDER Signed by the Honorable Samuel Der-Yeghiayan on 11/4/2014: Carolyn Shields's motion for leave to appear pro hac vice for Defendant 26 is granted. Mailed notice (mgh, ) (Entered: 11/05/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 10/31/2014, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 9/30/2014, Entered: None Order on Motion to Compel
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 9/24/2014, Entered: None
NOTICE of Motion by Steven Patrick McKey for presentment of motion to compel, 23 before Honorable Samuel Der-Yeghiayan on 9/30/2014 at 09:00 AM. (McKey, Steven) (Entered: 09/24/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 9/24/2014, Entered: None Compel
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 7/21/2014, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before the Honorable Samuel Der-Yeghiayan: Second joint motion for extension of time to extend discovery 20 is granted as follows: All fact discovery to be completed by 10/01/14. All expert discovery to be completed by 12/05/14. Any dispositive motion(s) shall be filed by 01/23/15 response(s) shall be filed by 02/13/15; replies, if any, shall be filed by 02/27/15. Status hearing reset to 12/09/14 at 9:00 a.m. Noticed motion date of 07/22/14 and status hearing date of 10/01/14 are stricken. Mailed notice (mw, ) (Entered: 07/21/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 7/15/2014, Entered: None
NOTICE of Motion by Lauren Jennifer Caisman for presentment of motion for extension of time to complete discovery 20 before Honorable Samuel Der-Yeghiayan on 7/22/2014 at 09:00 AM. (Caisman, Lauren) (Entered: 07/15/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 7/15/2014, Entered: None
MOTION by Plaintiffs Coach Services, Inc., Coach, Inc. for extension of time to complete discovery Joint (Caisman, Lauren) (Entered: 07/15/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 5/13/2014, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before the Honorable Samuel Der-Yeghiayan: Joint motion for extension of time to complete discovery 17 is granted as follows: All fact discovery to be completed by 07/31/14. All expert discovery to be completed by 10/01/14. Any dispositive motion(s) shall be filed by 11/14/14 response(s) shall be filed by 12/05/14; replies, if any, shall be filed by 12/19/14. Status hearing reset to 10/01/14 at 9:00 a.m. Noticed motion date of 05/14/14 and status hearing date of 08/12/14 are stricken. Mailed notice (mw, ) (Entered: 05/13/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 5/9/2014, Entered: None
NOTICE of Motion by Lauren Jennifer Caisman for presentment of motion for extension of time to complete discovery 17 before Honorable Samuel Der-Yeghiayan on 5/14/2014 at 09:00 AM. (Caisman, Lauren) (Entered: 05/09/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 5/9/2014, Entered: None
MOTION by Plaintiffs Coach Services, Inc., Coach, Inc. for extension of time to complete discovery Joint (Caisman, Lauren) (Entered: 05/09/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 1/16/2014, Entered: None
ORDER Signed by the Honorable Samuel Der-Yeghiayan on 1/16/2014: Ying Liu's motion for leave to appear pro hac vice for Defendant 8 is granted. Mailed notice (mgh, ) (Entered: 01/17/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 12/12/2013, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before the Honorable Samuel Der-Yeghiayan: Motion hearing held. The defendant's agreed motion for an extension of time for defendant to respond to complaint 11 is granted. In the event, the defendant chooses to file a motion to strike, the anticipated motion shall be noticed up for presentment on December 17, 2014 at 9:00 a.m. All fact discovery to be completed by May 30, 2014. All expert discovery to be completed by August 1, 2014. Any dispositive motion(s) shall be filed by September 12, 2014; response(s) shall be filed by October 3, 2014; replies, if any, shall be filed by October 17, 2014. A further status hearing is set for August 12, 2014 at 9:00 a.m. Mailed notice (cdh, ) (Entered: 12/12/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 12/10/2013, Entered: None
ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Coach Services, Inc., Coach, Inc. by Lauren Jennifer Caisman (Caisman, Lauren) (Entered: 12/10/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 12/3/2013, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before the Honorable Samuel Der-Yeghiayan: Motion hearing held. Motion for extension of time to answer 11 is entered and continued to 12/12/2013 at 09:00 AM. (lcw, ) (Entered: 12/03/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 11/22/2013, Entered: None
NOTICE of Motion by Ying Liu for presentment of motion for extension of time to file answer 11 before Honorable Samuel Der-Yeghiayan on 12/3/2013 at 09:00 AM. (Liu, Ying) (Entered: 11/22/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 11/22/2013, Entered: None
MOTION by Defendant Di Da Import and Export Inc. for extension of time to file answer (Liu, Ying) (Entered: 11/22/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 11/22/2013, Entered: None
ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand and Notification of No Affiliates by Di Da Import and Export Inc.(Liu, Ying) (Entered: 11/22/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 11/22/2013, Entered: None
ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Di Da Import and Export Inc. by Brian J. Lum (Lum, Brian) (Entered: 11/22/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 11/1/2013, Entered: None
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-8890760. (Ying Liu) (Shields, Carolyn) (Entered: 11/01/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 10/24/2013, Entered: None
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Coach, Inc., Coach Services, Inc. as to Di Da Import and Export Inc. on 10/11/2013, answer due 11/1/2013. (Cole, Donald) (Entered: 10/24/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 10/10/2013, Entered: None
MAILED Trademark report to Patent Trademark Office, Alexandria VA (mgh, ) (Entered: 10/10/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 10/6/2013, Entered: None
ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Coach Services, Inc., Coach, Inc. by Donald Alexander Cole (Cole, Donald) (Entered: 10/06/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 10/6/2013, Entered: None
NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Coach Services, Inc., Coach, Inc. (McKey, Steven) (Entered: 10/06/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 10/6/2013, Entered: None
ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Coach Services, Inc., Coach, Inc. by Steven Patrick McKey (McKey, Steven) (Entered: 10/06/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 10/6/2013, Entered: None
CIVIL Cover Sheet (McKey, Steven) (Entered: 10/06/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 10/6/2013, Entered: None
COMPLAINT filed by Coach, Inc., Coach Services, Inc. ; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-8800593. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(McKey, Steven) (Entered: 10/06/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF

Statistics

This case has been viewed 141 times.

Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Sign Up
Need Password Help?