McRO Inc v. Sega of America Inc
Federal Civil Lawsuit California Central District Court, Case No. 2:12-cv-10327

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 5, 2017 at 6:08 PM ST (4.7 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Mcro, Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Mishcon de Reya New York LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Eric P Berger +1 212 612 3270 +1 212 612 3297 Eric.Berger@mishcon.com
TERMINATED: 10/24/2014, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James Joseph McGuire +1 212 612 3270 +1 212 612 3297 james.mcguire@mishcon.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mark S Raskin +1 212 612 3270 +1 212 612 3297 Mark.Raskin@mishcon.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Russ August & Kabat

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Marc Aaron Fenster +1 310 826 7474 +1 310 826 6991 mfenster@raklaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Irene Y Lee +1 310 826 7474 +1 310 826 6991 ilee@raklaw.com
v.
Sega Of America, Inc. Sega Of America, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Weil Gotshal & Manges LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Evan N. Budaj +1 650 802 3000 +1 650 802 3100 evan.budaj@weil.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Justin Morteza Lee +1 650 802 3000 +1 650 802 3100 jlee@jonesday.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sonal N. Mehta sonal.mehta@weil.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Edward Robert Reines +1 650 802 3022 +1 650 802 3100 edward.reines@weil.com
  Entries (59) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (1) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 8/27/2015, Entered: None Bill of Costs (CV-59) - Issued
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 8/13/2015, Entered: None
    BILL OF COSTS. Costs Taxed in amount of $ 550.81 in favor of Sega of America Inc and against McRo,Inc., dba Planet Blue. RE: 54 (mb) (Entered: 08/27/2015)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 11/26/2014, Entered: None Objections - non-motion
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 11/14/2014, Entered: None Clerk to Tax Costs
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 11/5/2014, Entered: None Miscellaneous Document
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 11/4/2014, Entered: None Judgment
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 10/31/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
              FINAL JUDGMENT by Judge George H. Wu, Accordingly, it is ADJUDGED that Plaintiff and Counterclaim-Defendant McRo, Inc., d.b.a. Planet Blue ("Plaintiff') takes nothing from Defendants and Counterclaim-Plaintiffs (SEE ATTACHED FOR FURTHER DETAILS) All remaining pending motions are DENIED as moot. As Defendants are the prevailing parties in this action, Defendants' costs of court shall be taxed against Plaintiff. (pj) (Entered: 11/03/2014)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 10/27/2014, Entered: None
                NOTIFICATION by Federal Circuit Court of Appellate Docket Number 15-1082, regarding Notice of Appeal to Federal Circuit Court of Appeals 47 as to plaintiff McRO Inc. (car) (Entered: 10/29/2014)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 10/28/2014, Entered: None Objections - non-motion
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 10/24/2014, Entered: None Judgment/Renewal of Judgment
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 10/24/2014, Entered: None
                      Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Mark S Raskin counsel for Plaintiff McRO Inc. James J McGuire is no longer attorney of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff McRo Inc.. (Raskin, Mark) (Entered: 10/24/2014)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 10/22/2014, Entered: None
                        NOTICE OF APPEAL to the Federal Circuit filed by Plaintiff McRO Inc. Appeal of Judgment, 45 (Appeal fee of $505 receipt number 0973-14662460 paid.) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Raskin, Mark) (Entered: 10/22/2014)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 9/24/2014, Entered: None Report of Determination of Patent/Trademark Action (CLOSE) (AO 120)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 9/24/2014, Entered: None Judgment
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Blank 45 Filed: 9/22/2014, Entered: 9/24/2014 Judgment*
                                LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 4/1/2013, Entered: 4/3/2013 Scheduling Conference
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 3/29/2013, Entered: 3/29/2013 ~Notice (other)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 3/29/2013, Entered: 3/29/2013 ~Notice (other)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 3/29/2013, Entered: 3/29/2013 Text Only Scheduling Notice
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 3/18/2013, Entered: 3/20/2013 Amended Complaint
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 3/6/2013, Entered: 3/8/2013 Order on Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 3/6/2013, Entered: 3/8/2013 Order on Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 3/4/2013, Entered: 3/5/2013 Order on Motion to Dismiss Case
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 3/1/2013, Entered: 3/1/2013 ~Notice (other)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 3/1/2013, Entered: 3/1/2013 application to appear pro hac vice
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 3/1/2013, Entered: 3/1/2013 application to appear pro hac vice
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 2/15/2013, Entered: 2/15/2013 Reply (Motion related)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 2/14/2013, Entered: 2/14/2013 ERRATA
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 2/11/2013, Entered: 2/11/2013 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 2/11/2013, Entered: 2/11/2013 Order on Motion for Relief
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 2/7/2013, Entered: 2/8/2013 Order on Application for Leave
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 2/7/2013, Entered: 2/7/2013 Change of Lead Counsel
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 2/5/2013, Entered: 2/5/2013 Declaration (non-motion)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 2/5/2013, Entered: 2/5/2013 Application for Leave to File
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 2/5/2013, Entered: 2/5/2013 Declaration (Motion related)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 2/5/2013, Entered: 2/5/2013 Motion for Relief
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 2/5/2013, Entered: 2/5/2013 Declaration (Motion related)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Blank 22 Filed: 2/5/2013, Entered: 2/5/2013 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 2/4/2013, Entered: 2/4/2013 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 2/4/2013, Entered: 2/4/2013 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 2/4/2013, Entered: 2/4/2013 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 2/4/2013, Entered: 2/4/2013 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 1/31/2013, Entered: 1/31/2013 Order Extending Answer Due Deadline
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 1/28/2013, Entered: 1/30/2013 Order on Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 1/28/2013, Entered: 1/28/2013 Stipulation to Extend Time to Answer (More than 30 days)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 1/25/2013, Entered: 1/25/2013 application to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 1/7/2013, Entered: 1/7/2013 Order
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 1/3/2013, Entered: 1/4/2013 Transferring Case purs GO 14-03 (Related Case)(CV 34)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 12/27/2012, Entered: 12/27/2012 Stipulation Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 12/21/2012, Entered: 12/21/2012 Notice of Related Cases
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 12/12/2012, Entered: 12/12/2012 Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 12/12/2012, Entered: 12/12/2012 Order
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 12/7/2012, Entered: 12/7/2012 Notice of Filing Fee Due (PHV)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 12/7/2012, Entered: 12/7/2012 Notice of Filing Fee Due (PHV)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 12/4/2012, Entered: 12/7/2012 Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 12/4/2012, Entered: 12/7/2012 Report on Filing of Patent/Trademark Action (Initial Notification) (AO 120)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 12/4/2012, Entered: 12/7/2012 Disclosure
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 12/4/2012, Entered: 12/7/2012 Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 12/4/2012, Entered: 12/7/2012 Complaint - (Discovery)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                        Statistics

                                                                                                                        This case has been viewed 36 times.

                                                                                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                        Space
                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                         
                                                                                                                        PlainSite
                                                                                                                        Sign Up
                                                                                                                        Need Password Help?