McRO Inc v. Obsidian Entertainment Inc
Federal Civil Lawsuit California Central District Court, Case No. 2:12-cv-10331

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 4, 2017 at 3:26 AM ST (4.6 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Mcro, Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Mishcon de Reya New York LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Eric P Berger +1 212 612 3270 +1 212 612 3297 Eric.Berger@mishcon.com
TERMINATED: 10/29/2014, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James Joseph McGuire +1 212 612 3270 +1 212 612 3297 james.mcguire@mishcon.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mark S Raskin +1 212 612 3270 +1 212 612 3297 Mark.Raskin@mishcon.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Russ August & Kabat

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Marc Aaron Fenster +1 310 826 7474 +1 310 826 6991 mfenster@raklaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Irene Y Lee +1 310 826 7474 +1 310 826 6991 ilee@raklaw.com
No Logo Obsidian Entertainment, Inc., Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Madison S Spach, Jr. +1 949 852 0710 +1 949 852 0714 madison.spach@gmail.com
v.
No Logo Obsidian Entertainment, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Madison S Spach, Jr. +1 949 852 0710 +1 949 852 0714 madison.spach@gmail.com
No Logo Mcro, Inc., Counter-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Mishcon de Reya New York LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Eric P Berger +1 212 612 3270 +1 212 612 3297 Eric.Berger@mishcon.com
TERMINATED: 10/29/2014, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James Joseph McGuire +1 212 612 3270 +1 212 612 3297 james.mcguire@mishcon.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mark S Raskin +1 212 612 3270 +1 212 612 3297 Mark.Raskin@mishcon.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Russ August & Kabat

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Marc Aaron Fenster +1 310 826 7474 +1 310 826 6991 mfenster@raklaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Irene Y Lee +1 310 826 7474 +1 310 826 6991 ilee@raklaw.com
  Entries (37) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (1) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 11/5/2014, Entered: None Miscellaneous Document
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 11/4/2014, Entered: None Judgment
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 10/31/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
      FINAL JUDGMENT by Judge George H. Wu, Accordingly, it is ADJUDGED that Plaintiff and Counterclaim-Defendant McRo, Inc., d.b.a. Planet Blue ("Plaintiff') takes nothing from Defendants and Counterclaim-Plaintiffs (SEE ATTACHED FOR FURTHER DETAILS) All remaining pending motions are DENIED as moot. As Defendants are the prevailing parties in this action, Defendants' costs of court shall be taxed against Plaintiff. (pj) (Entered: 11/03/2014)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 10/31/2014, Entered: None Judgment/Renewal of Judgment
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 10/27/2014, Entered: None
          NOTIFICATION by Federal Circuit Court of Appellate Docket Number 15-1084, regarding Notice of Appeal to Federal Circuit Court of Appeals 29 as to Plaintiff McRO Inc. (car) (Entered: 10/29/2014)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 10/29/2014, Entered: None
            Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Mark S Raskin counsel for Plaintiff McRO Inc. James J McGuire is no longer attorney of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff McRo, Inc.. (Raskin, Mark) (Entered: 10/29/2014)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 10/28/2014, Entered: None Objections - non-motion
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 10/22/2014, Entered: None
                NOTICE OF APPEAL to the Federal Circuit filed by Plaintiff McRO Inc. Appeal of Judgment, 27 (Appeal fee of $505 receipt number 0973-14662479 paid.) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Raskin, Mark) (Entered: 10/22/2014)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 9/24/2014, Entered: None Report of Determination of Patent/Trademark Action (CLOSE) (AO 120)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 9/24/2014, Entered: None Judgment
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 9/22/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                      RULING ON DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS BASED ON UNPATENTABILITY UNDER 35 U.S.C. SECTION 101 by Judge George H. Wu, For the foregoing reasons, the Court would GRANT the Motion, and hold 576 Patent claims 1, 7-9, and 13, and 278 Patent claims 1-4, 6, 9, 13, and 15-17 invalid under 35 U.S.C. Section 101. (MD JS-6, Case Terminated). (pj) (Entered: 09/24/2014)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 4/1/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                        MINUTES OF Scheduling Conference held before Judge George H. Wu. The Court consolidates the above-entitled action with McRO, Inc. v. Namco Banda Games America,Inc., CV 12-10322 GW (FFMx) for pretrial purpose. All subsequent documents will now be filed in CV 12-10322-GW(FFMx). The Scheduling Conference is continued to 4/18/2013 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu. Joint Status Report due by 4/15/2013. Court Reporter: Anne Kielwasser. (mg) (Entered: 04/02/2013)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 3/29/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                          ORDER re Stipulation for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply 23 by Judge George H. Wu. The Court hereby ORDERS as follows: Plaintiff McRO, Inc., d.b.a. Planet Blue, may have up to and including April 18, 2013, to respond to Defendant Obsidian Entertainment, Inc.s Counterclaims. (kti) (Entered: 04/01/2013)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 3/29/2013, Entered: None
                            NOTICE filed by Plaintiff McRO Inc. for Telephone Appearance re 4/1/13 Scheduling Conference (Lee, Irene) (Entered: 03/29/2013)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 3/22/2013, Entered: None
                              Joint STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Response to Obsidian Counterclaims as to Summons Issued filed by Plaintiff McRO Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Lee, Irene) (Entered: 03/22/2013)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 3/18/2013, Entered: None
                                JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan filed by Plaintiff McRO Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Lee, Irene) (Entered: 03/18/2013)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 3/6/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                  ORDER by Judge George H. Wu: granting 18 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Eric P. Berger on behalf of Plaintiff, designating Irene Y. Lee as local counsel. (lt) (Entered: 03/08/2013)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 3/6/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                    ORDER by Judge George H. Wu: granting 17 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney James J. McGuire on behalf of Plaintiff, designating Irene Y. Lee as local counsel. (lt) (Entered: 03/08/2013)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 3/4/2013, Entered: None
                                      PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Counter-Claimant Obsidian Entertainment Inc, re Counterclaim 16 and Summons served on 03/04/2013. (Spach, Madison) (Entered: 03/04/2013)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 3/1/2013, Entered: None
                                        APPLICATION for attorney Eric P. Berger to Appear Pro Hac Vice(PHV Fee of $325 receipt number 0973-11744072 paid.) filed by Plaintiff McRO Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Lee, Irene) (Entered: 03/01/2013)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 3/1/2013, Entered: None
                                          APPLICATION for attorney James J. McGuire to Appear Pro Hac Vice(PHV Fee of $325 receipt number 0973-11743403 paid.) filed by Plaintiff McRO Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Lee, Irene) (Entered: 03/01/2013)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 2/20/2013, Entered: None
                                            COUNTERCLAIM against Counter Defendants McRO Inc; Jury Demand,, filed by Counter-Claimant Obsidian Entertainment Inc.(pj) (pj). (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/6/2013: # 1 21 day summons issued COUNTERCLAIM) (pj). (Entered: 02/26/2013)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 2/21/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                              MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge George H. Wu. On the Courts own motion, a Scheduling Conference is set for April 1, 2013 at 8:30 a.m. A Joint 26(f) Report shall be filed with the Court not later than March 18, 2013. See Civil L.R. 26-1. (See order for details.) (kti) (Entered: 02/21/2013)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 2/19/2013, Entered: None
                                                ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery), 1 with JURY DEMAND filed by defendant Obsidian Entertainment Inc.(Spach, Madison) (Entered: 02/19/2013)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 1/28/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                  ORDER by Judge George H. Wu: granting 12 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Mark Raskin on behalf of plaintiff, designating Irene Lee as local counsel. (ak) (Entered: 01/30/2013)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 1/25/2013, Entered: None
                                                    APPLICATION for attorney Mark S. Raskin to Appear Pro Hac Vice(PHV Fee of $325 receipt number 0973-11571677 paid.) filed by Plaintiff McRO Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Lee, Irene) (Entered: 01/25/2013)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 1/7/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                      Standing Order Re Final Pre-Trial Conferences for Civil Jury Trials Before Judge George H. Wu. You are instructed to read and to follow (unless otherwise superseded herein) the Central District of California Local Rules (henceforth Local Rules) 16-1 through 16-15 regarding pre-trial requirements. (See Order for details.) (kti) (Entered: 01/07/2013)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 1/3/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                        ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 08-05 -Related Case- filed. Related Case No: CV12-10322 GW (FFMx). Case transferred from Judge Audrey B. Collins and Magistrate Judge Stephen J. Hillman to Judge George H Wu and Magistrate Judge Frederick F. Mumm for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge CV12-10331 GW (FFMx).Signed by Judge George H Wu (at) (Entered: 01/04/2013)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 12/21/2012, Entered: None
                                                          NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Plaintiff McRO Inc. Related Case(s): 15 (Lee, Irene) (Entered: 12/21/2012)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 12/11/2012, Entered: None
                                                            PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff McRO Inc, upon Defendant Obsidian Entertainment Inc served on 12/7/2012, answer due 12/28/2012. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Jeffrey Rose, Agent Authorized to Accept Service in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity. Original Summons NOT returned. (Lee, Irene) (Entered: 12/11/2012)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 12/7/2012, Entered: None
                                                              NOTICE OF FILING FEE DUE on Pro Hac Vice Application mailed to Vincent Filardo, Jr. for Plaintiff McRO Inc. Your Pro Hac Vice application has not been received by the court. Please return your completed Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case, form G-64, or a copy of the Notice of Electronic Filing of your application and the $325.00 fee and this notice immediately. Out-of-state federal government attorneys who are not employed by the U.S. Department of Justice are required to file a Pro Hac Vice application; no filing fee is required. (et) (Entered: 12/07/2012)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 12/7/2012, Entered: None
                                                                NOTICE OF FILING FEE DUE on Pro Hac Vice Application mailed to Mark S. Raskin for Plaintiff McRO Inc. Your Pro Hac Vice application has not been received by the court. Please return your completed Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case, form G-64, or a copy of the Notice of Electronic Filing of your application and the $325.00 fee and this notice immediately. Out-of-state federal government attorneys who are not employed by the U.S. Department of Justice are required to file a Pro Hac Vice application; no filing fee is required. (et) (Entered: 12/07/2012)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 12/4/2012, Entered: None
                                                                  NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et) (Entered: 12/07/2012)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 12/4/2012, Entered: None
                                                                    REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or a Trademark (Initial Notification) filed by McRO Inc. (et) (Entered: 12/07/2012)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 12/4/2012, Entered: None
                                                                      DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Plaintiff McRO Inc. (et) (mg). (Entered: 12/07/2012)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 12/4/2012, Entered: None
                                                                        CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff McRO Inc. (et) (mg). (Entered: 12/07/2012)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 12/4/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                          COMPLAINT against Defendant Obsidian Entertainment Inc. Case assigned to Judge Audrey B. Collins for all further proceedings. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Stephen J. Hillman. (Filing fee $ 350 PAID.) Jury Demanded., filed by Plaintiff McRO Inc.(et) (mg). (Entered: 12/07/2012)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                            Statistics

                                                                            This case has been viewed 5 times.

                                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                            Space
                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                             
                                                                            PlainSite
                                                                            Sign Up
                                                                            Need Password Help?