McRO Inc v. Naughty Dog Inc
Federal Civil Lawsuit California Central District Court, Case No. 2:12-cv-10335

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 4, 2017 at 12:17 AM ST (4.6 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Mcro, Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Mishcon de Reya New York LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mark S Raskin +1 212 612 3270 +1 212 612 3297 Mark.Raskin@mishcon.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Russ August & Kabat

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Marc Aaron Fenster +1 310 826 7474 +1 310 826 6991 mfenster@raklaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Irene Y Lee +1 310 826 7474 +1 310 826 6991 ilee@raklaw.com
v.
No Logo Naughty Dog, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Shook Hardy & Bacon LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Tony Maurice Diab +1 949 475 1500 +1 949 475 0016 tdiab@shb.com
  Entries (30) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (1) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 4/21/2015, Entered: None Bill of Costs (CV-59) - Issued
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 3/25/2015, Entered: None
    BILL OF COSTS. Costs Taxed in amount of $ 1644.34 in favor of Naughty Dog Inc and against McRo Inc. RE: 24 (mb) (Entered: 04/21/2015)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 11/26/2014, Entered: None Objections - non-motion
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 11/20/2014, Entered: None Amendment (Motion related)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 11/17/2014, Entered: None Tax Costs
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 11/5/2014, Entered: None Miscellaneous Document
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 11/4/2014, Entered: None Judgment
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 10/31/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                FINAL JUDGMENT by Judge George H. Wu, Accordingly, it is ADJUDGED that Plaintiff and Counterclaim-Defendant McRo, Inc., d.b.a. Planet Blue ("Plaintiff') takes nothing from Defendants and Counterclaim-Plaintiffs (SEE ATTACHED FOR FURTHER DETAILS) All remaining pending motions are DENIED as moot. As Defendants are the prevailing parties in this action, Defendants' costs of court shall be taxed against Plaintiff. (pj) (Entered: 11/03/2014)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 10/27/2014, Entered: None
                  NOTIFICATION by Circuit Court of Appellate Docket Number 15-1086, Federal Circuit regarding Notice of Appeal to Federal Circuit Court of Appeals 17 as to Plaintiff McRO Inc. (car) (Entered: 10/29/2014)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 10/28/2014, Entered: None Objections - non-motion
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 10/27/2014, Entered: None Judgment/Renewal of Judgment
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 10/24/2014, Entered: None
                        Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Mark S Raskin counsel for Plaintiff McRO Inc. Adding Mark S. Raskin as attorney as counsel of record for McRo, Inc. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice.James J McGuire is no longer attorney of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff McRo, Inc.. (Attorney Mark S Raskin added to party McRO Inc(pty:pla))(Raskin, Mark) (Entered: 10/24/2014)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 10/22/2014, Entered: None
                          NOTICE OF APPEAL to the Federal Circuit filed by Plaintiff McRO Inc. Appeal of Judgment, 15 (Appeal fee of $505 receipt number 0973-14662518 paid.) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Raskin, Mark) (Entered: 10/22/2014)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 9/24/2014, Entered: None Report of Determination of Patent/Trademark Action (CLOSE) (AO 120)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 9/24/2014, Entered: None Judgment
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 9/22/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                RULING ON DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS BASED ON UNPATENTABILITY UNDER 35 U.S.C. SECTION 101 by Judge George H. Wu, For the foregoing reasons, the Court would GRANT the Motion, and hold 576 Patent claims 1, 7-9, and 13, and 278 Patent claims 1-4, 6, 9, 13, and 15-17 invalid under 35 U.S.C. Section 101. (MD JS-6, Case Terminated). (pj) (Entered: 09/24/2014)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 7/11/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                  MINUTES OF DEFENDANT NAUGHTY DOG, INC.'S MOTION TO DISMISSPLAINTIFF'S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT (filed 06/10/13; Dkt.No. lOS) Motion Hearing held before Judge George H. Wu: Court hears oral argument. The Tentative circulated and attached hereto, is adopted as the Court's finalruling. Defendants' motion is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART. Defendant Naughty Dog, Inc.'s response to the amended complaint will be due 21 days from the date ofthis order.01 Court Reporter: Wil Wilcox. (pj) (Entered: 07/15/2013)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 4/1/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                    MINUTES OF SCHEDULING CONFERENCE held before Judge George H. Wu. The Court consolidates the above-entitled action with McRO, Inc. v. Namco Banda Games America, Inc., CV 12-10322-GW(FFMx) for pretrial purposes. All subsequent documents will now be filed in CV 12-10322-GW(FFMx). The Scheduling Conference is continued to April 18, 2013 at 8:30 a.m. Joint Status Report will be filed by noon on April 15, 2013. Court Reporter: Anne Kielwasser. (lom) (Entered: 04/03/2013)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 3/29/2013, Entered: None
                                      NOTICE filed by Plaintiff McRO Inc. for Telephone Appearance re 4/1/13 Scheduling Conference (Lee, Irene) (Entered: 03/29/2013)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 3/29/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                        TEXT ONLY NOTICE - A Scheduling Conference for related case, CV12-10331, is set for April 1, 2013, at 8:30 a.m. The schedule issued on said date shall also be the schedule for all related "McRO" cases. Parties may appear telephonically at the conference provided that notice is given to Judge Wu's Clerk. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY.(kbr) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 03/29/2013)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 1/7/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                          Standing Order Re Final Pre-Trial Conferences for Civil Jury Trials Before Judge George H. Wu. You are instructed to read and to follow (unless otherwise superseded herein) the Central District of California Local Rules (henceforth Local Rules) 16-1 through 16-15 regarding pre-trial requirements. (See Order for details.) (kti) (Entered: 01/07/2013)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 1/3/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                            ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 08-05 -Related Case- filed. Related Case No: CV 12-10322 GW(FFMx). Case transferred from Magistrate Judge Victor B. Kenton and Judge Christina A. Snyder to Judge George H Wu and Magistrate Judge Frederick F. Mumm for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge CV 12-10335 GW(FFMx).Signed by Judge George H Wu (rn) (Entered: 01/07/2013)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 12/21/2012, Entered: None
                                              NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Plaintiff McRO Inc. Related Case(s): 15 (Lee, Irene) (Entered: 12/21/2012)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 12/7/2012, Entered: None
                                                NOTICE OF FILING FEE DUE on Pro Hac Vice Application mailed to Vincent Filardo Jr. for Plaintiff McRO Inc. Your Pro Hac Vice application has not been received by the court. Please return your completed Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case, form G-64, or a copy of the Notice of Electronic Filing of your application and the $325.00 fee and this notice immediately. Out-of-state federal government attorneys who are not employed by the U.S. Department of Justice are required to file a Pro Hac Vice application; no filing fee is required. (et) (Entered: 12/07/2012)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 12/7/2012, Entered: None
                                                  NOTICE OF FILING FEE DUE on Pro Hac Vice Application mailed to Mark S. Raskin for Plaintiff McRO Inc. Your Pro Hac Vice application has not been received by the court. Please return your completed Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case, form G-64, or a copy of the Notice of Electronic Filing of your application and the $325.00 fee and this notice immediately. Out-of-state federal government attorneys who are not employed by the U.S. Department of Justice are required to file a Pro Hac Vice application; no filing fee is required. (et) (Entered: 12/07/2012)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 12/4/2012, Entered: None
                                                    NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et) (Entered: 12/07/2012)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 12/4/2012, Entered: None
                                                      REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or a Trademark (Initial Notification) filed by McRO Inc. (et) (Entered: 12/07/2012)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 12/4/2012, Entered: None
                                                        DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Plaintiff McRO Inc. (et) (mg). (Entered: 12/07/2012)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 12/4/2012, Entered: None
                                                          CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff McRO Inc. (et) (mg). (Entered: 12/07/2012)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 12/4/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                            COMPLAINT against Defendant Naughty Dog Inc. Case assigned to Judge Christina A. Snyder for all further proceedings. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Victor B. Kenton. (Filing fee $ 350 PAID.) Jury Demanded., filed by Plaintiff McRO Inc.(et) (mg). (Entered: 12/07/2012)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                              Statistics

                                                              This case has been viewed 12 times.

                                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                              Space
                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                               
                                                              PlainSite
                                                              Sign Up
                                                              Need Password Help?