McRO Inc v. Square Enix Inc
Federal Civil Lawsuit California Central District Court, Case No. 2:12-cv-10338

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 4, 2017 at 3:34 AM ST (4.7 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Mcro, Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Mishcon de Reya New York LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Eric P Berger +1 212 612 3270 +1 212 612 3297 Eric.Berger@mishcon.com
TERMINATED: 10/24/2014, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James Joseph McGuire +1 212 612 3270 +1 212 612 3297 james.mcguire@mishcon.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mark S Raskin +1 212 612 3270 +1 212 612 3297 Mark.Raskin@mishcon.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Russ August & Kabat

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Marc Aaron Fenster +1 310 826 7474 +1 310 826 6991 mfenster@raklaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Irene Y Lee +1 310 826 7474 +1 310 826 6991 ilee@raklaw.com
v.
No Logo Square Enix, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Morrison & Foerster, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Benjamin Jonathan Fox +1 213 892 5200 +1 213 892 5454 bfox@mofo.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Weil Gotshal & Manges LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Edward Robert Reines +1 650 802 3022 +1 650 802 3100 edward.reines@weil.com
  Entries (39) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (1) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 11/5/2014, Entered: None Miscellaneous Document
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 11/4/2014, Entered: None Judgment
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 10/3/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
      FINAL JUDGMENT by Judge George H. Wu, Accordingly, it is ADJUDGED that Plaintiff and Counterclaim-Defendant McRo, Inc., d.b.a. Planet Blue ("Plaintiff') takes nothing from Defendants and Counterclaim-Plaintiffs (SEE ATTACHED FOR FURTHER DETAILS) All remaining pending motions are DENIED as moot. As Defendants are the prevailing parties in this action, Defendants' costs of court shall be taxed against Plaintiff. (pj) (Entered: 11/03/2014)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 10/27/2014, Entered: None
        NOTIFICATION by Circuit Court of Appellate Docket Number 15-1088, Federal Circuit regarding Notice of Appeal to Federal Circuit Court of Appeals 32 as to Plaintiff McRO Inc. (car) (Entered: 10/29/2014)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 10/28/2014, Entered: None Objections - non-motion
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 10/24/2014, Entered: None
            Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Mark S Raskin counsel for Plaintiff McRO Inc. James J McGuire is no longer attorney of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff McRo, Inc.. (Raskin, Mark) (Entered: 10/24/2014)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 10/22/2014, Entered: None
              NOTICE OF APPEAL to the Federal Circuit filed by Plaintiff McRO Inc. Appeal of Judgment, 30 (Appeal fee of $505 receipt number 0973-14662554 paid.) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Raskin, Mark) (Entered: 10/22/2014)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 9/24/2014, Entered: None Report of Determination of Patent/Trademark Action (CLOSE) (AO 120)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 9/24/2014, Entered: None Judgment
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 9/22/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                    RULING ON DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS BASED ON UNPATENTABILITY UNDER 35 U.S.C. SECTION 101 by Judge George H. Wu, For the foregoing reasons, the Court would GRANT the Motion, and hold 576 Patent claims 1, 7-9, and 13, and 278 Patent claims 1-4, 6, 9, 13, and 15-17 invalid under 35 U.S.C. Section 101 (MD JS-6, Case Terminated). (pj) (Entered: 09/24/2014)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 4/1/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                      MINUTES OF SCHEDULING CONFERENCE held before Judge George H. Wu. MINUTES OF SCHEDULING CONFERENCE held before Judge George H. Wu. The Court consolidates the above-entitled action with McRO, Inc. v. Namco Banda Games America, Inc., CV 12-10322-GW(FFMx) for pretrial purposes. All subsequent documents will now be filed in CV 12-10322-GW(FFMx). The Scheduling Conference is continued to April 18, 2013 at 8:30 a.m. Joint Status Report will be filed by noon on April 15, 2013. Court Reporter: Anne Kielwasser. (lom) (Entered: 04/03/2013)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 3/29/2013, Entered: None
                        NOTICE filed by Plaintiff McRO Inc. for Telephone Appearance re 4/1/13 Scheduling Conference (Lee, Irene) (Entered: 03/29/2013)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 3/29/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                          TEXT ONLY NOTICE - A Scheduling Conference for related case, CV12-10331, is set for April 1, 2013, at 8:30 a.m. The schedule issued on said date shall also be the schedule for all related "McRO" cases. Parties may appear telephonically at the conference provided that notice is given to Judge Wu's Clerk. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY.(kbr) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 03/29/2013)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 3/18/2013, Entered: None
                            FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendant Square Enix Inc amending Complaint - (Discovery), 1 ,filed by Plaintiff McRO Inc (Attachments: # 1 21 day summons issued)(pj) (Entered: 03/20/2013)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 3/6/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                              ORDER by Judge George H. Wu: granting 22 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Eric P. Berger on behalf of Plaintiff, designating Irene Y. Lee as local counsel. (lt) (Entered: 03/08/2013)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 3/6/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                ORDER by Judge George H. Wu: granting 21 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney James J. McGuire on behalf of Plaintiff, designating Irene Y. Lee as local counsel. (lt) (Entered: 03/08/2013)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 3/4/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                  MINUTES OF DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT (filed 02/05/12) Motion Hearing held before Judge George H. Wu: The Tentative circulated and attached hereto, is adopted as the Court's final ruling. Defendants' motion is GRANTED WITH LEAVE TO AMEND. Plaintiffs will have until March 18, 2013 to manually file the First Amended Complaint.Court Reporter: Mary Rickey. (bp) (Entered: 03/05/2013)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 3/1/2013, Entered: None
                                    APPLICATION for attorney Eric P. Berger to Appear Pro Hac Vice(PHV Fee of $325 receipt number 0973-11744152 paid.) filed by Plaintiff McRO Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Lee, Irene) (Entered: 03/01/2013)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 3/1/2013, Entered: None
                                      APPLICATION for attorney James J. McGuire to Appear Pro Hac Vice(PHV Fee of $325 receipt number 0973-11743487 paid.) filed by Plaintiff McRO Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Lee, Irene) (Entered: 03/01/2013)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 2/15/2013, Entered: None
                                        REPLY in Support of MOTION to Dismiss Case 16 filed by Defendant Square Enix Inc. (Fox, Benjamin) (Entered: 02/15/2013)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 2/11/2013, Entered: None
                                          MEMORANDUM in Opposition to MOTION to Dismiss Case 16 filed by Plaintiff McRO Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Raskin, Mark) (Entered: 02/11/2013)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 1/28/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                            ORDER by Judge George H. Wu: granting 14 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Mark Raskin on behalf of plaintiff, designating Irene Lee as local counsel. (ak) (Entered: 01/30/2013)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 1/30/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                              TEXT ONLY ENTRY (IN CHAMBERS): by Judge George H. Wu; The Court, on its own motion, CONTINUES Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss Case 16 previously scheduled for 02/25/2013 830 to 3/4/2013 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY.(jag) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 01/30/2013)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 1/28/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendant Square Enix Inc. Motion set for hearing on 2/25/2013 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu. (Fox, Benjamin) (Entered: 01/28/2013)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 1/28/2013, Entered: None
                                                  CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant Square Enix Inc identifying Square Enix Holdings Co., Ltd. as Corporate Parent. (Fox, Benjamin) (Entered: 01/28/2013)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 1/25/2013, Entered: None
                                                    APPLICATION for attorney Mark S. Raskin to Appear Pro Hac Vice(PHV Fee of $325 receipt number 0973-11571758 paid.) filed by Plaintiff McRO Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Lee, Irene) (Entered: 01/25/2013)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 1/18/2013, Entered: None
                                                      STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Square Enix Inc answer now due 1/27/2013, filed by Defendant Square Enix Inc.(Reines, Edward) (Entered: 01/18/2013)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 1/7/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                        Standing Order Re Final Pre-Trial Conferences for Civil Jury Trials Before Judge George H. Wu. You are instructed to read and to follow (unless otherwise superseded herein) the Central District of California Local Rules (henceforth Local Rules) 16-1 through 16-15 regarding pre-trial requirements. (See Order for details.) (kti) (Entered: 01/07/2013)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 1/3/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                          ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 08-05 -Related Case- filed. Related Case No: CV 12-10322 GW(FFMx). Case transferred from Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eick and Judge Michael W Fitzgerald to Judge George H Wu and Magistrate Judge Frederick F. Mumm for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge CV 12-10338 GW(FFMx).Signed by Judge George H Wu (rn) (Entered: 01/07/2013)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 12/27/2012, Entered: None
                                                            STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Square Enix Inc answer now due 1/18/2013, filed by defendant Square Enix Inc.(Reines, Edward) (Entered: 12/27/2012)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 12/21/2012, Entered: None
                                                              NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Plaintiff McRO Inc. Related Case(s): 15 (Lee, Irene) (Entered: 12/21/2012)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 12/11/2012, Entered: None
                                                                PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff McRO Inc, upon Defendant Square Enix Inc served on 12/7/2012, answer due 12/28/2012. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Steve Cassidy, CSC Lawyers Incorporating Service, Registered Agent in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity. Original Summons NOT returned. (Lee, Irene) (Entered: 12/11/2012)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 12/7/2012, Entered: None
                                                                  NOTICE OF FILING FEE DUE on Pro Hac Vice Application mailed to Vincent Filardo, Jr. for Plaintiff McRO Inc. Your Pro Hac Vice application has not been received by the court. Please return your completed Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case, form G-64, or a copy of the Notice of Electronic Filing of your application and the $325.00 fee and this notice immediately. Out-of-state federal government attorneys who are not employed by the U.S. Department of Justice are required to file a Pro Hac Vice application; no filing fee is required. (et) (Entered: 12/07/2012)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 12/7/2012, Entered: None
                                                                    NOTICE OF FILING FEE DUE on Pro Hac Vice Application mailed to Mark S. Raskin for Plaintiff McRO Inc. Your Pro Hac Vice application has not been received by the court. Please return your completed Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case, form G-64, or a copy of the Notice of Electronic Filing of your application and the $325.00 fee and this notice immediately. Out-of-state federal government attorneys who are not employed by the U.S. Department of Justice are required to file a Pro Hac Vice application; no filing fee is required. (et) (Entered: 12/07/2012)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 12/4/2012, Entered: None
                                                                      NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et) (Entered: 12/07/2012)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 12/4/2012, Entered: None
                                                                        REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or a Trademark (Initial Notification) filed by McRO Inc. (et) (Entered: 12/07/2012)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 12/4/2012, Entered: None
                                                                          DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Plaintiff McRO Inc. (et) (mg). (Entered: 12/07/2012)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 12/4/2012, Entered: None
                                                                            CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff McRO Inc. (et) (mg). (Entered: 12/07/2012)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 12/4/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                              COMPLAINT against Defendant Square Enix Inc. Case assigned to Judge Michael W Fitzgerald for all further proceedings. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eick. (Filing fee $ 350 PAID.) Jury Demanded., filed by Plaintiff McRO Inc. (et) (mg). (Entered: 12/07/2012)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                Statistics

                                                                                This case has been viewed 30 times.

                                                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                Space
                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                 
                                                                                PlainSite
                                                                                Sign Up
                                                                                Need Password Help?