McRo Inc. v. Atlus U.S.A., et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit California Central District Court, Case No. 8:13-cv-01870

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated December 23, 2016 at 1:20 AM ST (4.7 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Mcro, Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Mishcon de Reya New York LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Mark S Raskin +1 212 612 3270 +1 212 612 3297 Mark.Raskin@mishcon.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Russ August & Kabat

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Marc Aaron Fenster +1 310 826 7474 +1 310 826 6991 mfenster@raklaw.com
Space Irene Y Lee +1 310 826 7474 +1 310 826 6991 ilee@raklaw.com
No Logo Index Digital Media, Inc., Counter-Claimant
v.
No Logo Atlus U.s.a., Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Weil Gotshal & Manges LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Sonal N. Mehta sonal.mehta@weil.com
No Logo Index Corp, Defendant
No Logo Index Digital Media, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Weil Gotshal & Manges LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Evan N. Budaj +1 650 802 3000 +1 650 802 3100 evan.budaj@weil.com
Space Justin Morteza Lee +1 650 802 3211 +1 650 802 3100 justin.m.lee@weil.com
Space Edward Robert Reines +1 650 802 3022 +1 650 802 3100 edward.reines@weil.com
No Logo Sega Dream Corp, Defendant
No Logo Mcro, Inc., Counter-Defendant
  Entries (56) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (1) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 9/18/2015, Entered: None Bill of Costs (CV-59) - Issued
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 8/2/2015, Entered: None
    BILL OF COSTS. Costs Taxed in amount of $ 288.14 in favor of Index Digital Media, Inc and against McRo,Inc., dba Planet Blue. RE: 51 (mb) (Entered: 09/18/2015)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 11/26/2014, Entered: None Objections - non-motion
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 11/14/2014, Entered: None Clerk to Tax Costs
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 11/5/2014, Entered: None Miscellaneous Document
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 11/4/2014, Entered: None Judgment
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 10/31/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
              FINAL JUDGMENT by Judge George H. Wu, Accordingly, it is ADJUDGED that Plaintiff and Counterclaim-Defendant McRo, Inc., d.b.a. Planet Blue ("Plaintiff') takes nothing from Defendants and Counterclaim-Plaintiffs (SEE ATTACHED FOR FURTHER DETAILS) All remaining pending motions are DENIED as moot. As Defendants are the prevailing parties in this action, Defendants' costs of court shall be taxed against Plaintiff. (pj) (Entered: 11/03/2014)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 10/27/2014, Entered: None
                NOTIFICATION by Circuit Court of Appellate Docket Number 15-1092, Federal Circuit regarding Notice of Appeal to Federal Circuit Court of Appeals 45 as to Plaintiff McRO Inc. (mat) (Entered: 10/29/2014)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 10/28/2014, Entered: None Objections - non-motion
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 10/24/2014, Entered: None Judgment/Renewal of Judgment
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 10/22/2014, Entered: None
                      NOTICE OF APPEAL to the Federal Circuit filed by Plaintiff McRO Inc. Appeal of Judgment, 43 (Appeal fee of $505 receipt number 0973-14662589 paid.) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Raskin, Mark) (Entered: 10/22/2014)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 9/24/2014, Entered: None Report of Determination of Patent/Trademark Action (CLOSE) (AO 120)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 9/24/2014, Entered: None Judgment
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 9/22/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                            RULING ON DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS BASED ON UNPATENTABILITY UNDER 35 U.S.C. SECTION 101 by Judge George H. Wu. For the foregoing reasons, the Court would GRANT the Motion, and hold 576 Patent claims 1, 7-9, and 13, and 278 Patent claims 1-4, 6, 9, 13, and 15-17 invalid Under 35 U.S.C. Section 101. (MD JS-6, Case Terminated). (pj) (Entered: 09/24/2014)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 2/13/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                              MINUTES OF Status Conference held before Judge George H. Wu:, For reasons stated on the record, the Court consolidates the above-entitled action into McRO, Inc., v.Namco Bandai Games America, Inc., CV 12-10322-GW(FFMx). All subsequent documents will now be filed in CV 12-10322-GW(FFMx). The Courts Tentative Position re Scheduling is circulated. The Court adopts its schedule for Track 1 Cases as follows: Pretrial Conference set for 11/24/2014 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu. Jury Trial set for 12/9/2014 09:00 AM before Judge George H. Wu. Claim Construction Hearing set on 4/28/2014 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu. Status Conference set for 9/25/2014 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu.Court Reporter: Katie Thibodeaux. (Cases associated with Lead Case 12-10322-GW(FFMx))., (see attached for further details) (pj) (Entered: 02/19/2014)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 2/18/2014, Entered: None
                                BRIEF filed by Plaintiff McRO Inc. PLAINTIFFS OPENING CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEF (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Raskin, Mark) (Entered: 02/18/2014)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 2/11/2014, Entered: None
                                  NOTICE OF TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE FOR MARK S. RASKIN AT THE FEBRUARY 13, 2014 HEARING filed by Plaintiff McRO Inc. (Raskin, Mark) (Entered: 02/11/2014)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 2/10/2014, Entered: None
                                    STATUS REPORT JOINT filed by Plaintiff McRO Inc. (Raskin, Mark) (Entered: 02/10/2014)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 2/10/2014, Entered: None
                                      Planet Blue's ANSWER to Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim 33 to Defendant Index Digital Media, Inc. filed by Plaintiff McRO Inc.(Raskin, Mark) (Entered: 02/10/2014)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 1/30/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                        MINUTES OF Status Conference held before Judge George H. Wu:, Court and counsel confer re newly transferred cases. For reasons stated on the record, the Courttentatively consolidates the above-entitled action with CV 12-10322-GW(FFMx). A hearing re further consideration to consolidate is set for February 13, 2014 at 8:30 a.m. Parties will meet and confer and within 10 days file a joint status report as to consolidation of remaining cases in Categories B and C. Additionally, Parties may appear telephonically provided that notice is given to the clerk by February11, 2014. Court Reporter: Katie Thibideaux. (pj) (Entered: 02/03/2014)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 1/28/2014, Entered: None
                                          WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff McRO Inc. upon Index Digital Media, Inc. waiver sent by Plaintiff on 1/28/2014, answer due 3/29/2014. Waiver of Service signed by Evan N. Budaj. (Lee, Irene) (Entered: 01/28/2014)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 1/16/2014, Entered: None
                                            CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant and Counter Claimant Index Digital Media, Inc. (pj) (Entered: 01/21/2014)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 1/16/2014, Entered: None
                                              NOTICE OF INTERESTED PARTIES of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Index Digital Media, Inc., identifying Other Affiliate Sega Sammy Holdings Inc, Other Affiliate Sega Corporation for Index Digital Media, Inc., Index Digital Media, Inc.. (pj) (Entered: 01/21/2014)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 1/16/2014, Entered: None
                                                ANSWER to FIRST Amended Complaint, 21 JURY DEMAND., COUNTERCLAIM against McRO Inc filed by Counter-Claimant and Defendant Index Digital Media, Inc..(pj) (Entered: 01/21/2014)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 1/21/2014, Entered: None
                                                  21 DAY Summons Issued re FIRST Amended Complaint, 21 as to Defendant Index Digital Media, Inc.. (pj) (Entered: 01/21/2014)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 1/21/2014, Entered: None
                                                    21 DAY Summons Issued re FIRST Amended Complaint, 21 as to Defendant Index Corp. (pj) (Entered: 01/21/2014)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 1/16/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                      ORDER Stipulation to Amend 20 by Judge George H. Wu: The Court, hereby ORDERS as follow: Plaintiff shall file an Amended Complaint naming Index Digital Media, Inc. instead of Atlus U.S.A., Inc., making no other changes from the Complaint, by Friday, January 10, 2014. Index Digital Media, Inc. shall file its response to the Amended Complaint by January 16, 2014. (kti) (Entered: 01/21/2014)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 1/16/2014, Entered: None
                                                        CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendant and Counterclaim Plaintiff Index Digital Media, Inc., re Amended Complaint, 21 served on 01/16/2014. (Mehta, Sonal) (Entered: 01/16/2014)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 1/16/2014, Entered: None
                                                          NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Evan N Budaj on behalf of Defendant Index Digital Media, Inc. (Attorney Evan N Budaj added to party Index Digital Media, Inc.(pty:dft))(Budaj, Evan) (Entered: 01/16/2014)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 1/16/2014, Entered: None
                                                            NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Justin Morteza Lee on behalf of Defendant Index Digital Media, Inc. (Attorney Justin Morteza Lee added to party Index Digital Media, Inc.(pty:dft))(Lee, Justin) (Entered: 01/16/2014)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 1/16/2014, Entered: None
                                                              NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Sonal Naresh Mehta on behalf of Defendant Index Digital Media, Inc. (Attorney Sonal Naresh Mehta added to party Index Digital Media, Inc.(pty:dft))(Mehta, Sonal) (Entered: 01/16/2014)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 1/16/2014, Entered: None
                                                                NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Edward R Reines on behalf of Defendant Index Digital Media, Inc. (Attorney Edward R Reines added to party Index Digital Media, Inc.(pty:dft))(Reines, Edward) (Entered: 01/16/2014)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 1/10/2014, Entered: None
                                                                  Certificate and Notice of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff McRO Inc, (Lee, Irene) (Entered: 01/10/2014)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 1/10/2014, Entered: None
                                                                    Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Amended Complaint, 21 filed by Plaintiff McRO Inc. (Lee, Irene) (Entered: 01/10/2014)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 1/10/2014, Entered: None
                                                                      Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Amended Complaint, 21 filed by Plaintiff McRO Inc. (Lee, Irene) (Entered: 01/10/2014)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 1/10/2014, Entered: None
                                                                        FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Index Digital Media, Inc. and Index Corp. Index Digital Media, Inc. amending Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) 1 , filed by Plaintiff McRO Inc (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Declaration C)(Lee, Irene) (Entered: 01/10/2014)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 1/9/2014, Entered: None
                                                                          STIPULATION to Amend Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) 1 filed by Non-party Index Digital Media, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Attorney Sonal Naresh Mehta added to party Index Digital Media, Inc.(pty:misc))(Mehta, Sonal) (Entered: 01/09/2014)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 1/6/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                            ORDER by Judge George H. Wu: granting 17 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Mark S. Raskin on behalf of Plaintiff, designating Irene Y. Lee as local counsel. (lt) (Entered: 01/08/2014)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 1/7/2014, Entered: None
                                                                              NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Plaintiff McRO Inc. correcting APPLICATION for attorney Mark S. Raskin to Appear Pro Hac Vice (PHV FEE NOT PAID.) 17 PHV FEE PAID ON JANUARY 3, 2014 RECEIPT NO. 0973-13186259 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Lee, Irene) (Entered: 01/07/2014)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 1/3/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                APPLICATION for attorney Mark S. Raskin to Appear Pro Hac Vice (PHV FEE NOT PAID.) filed by Plaintiff McRO Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit Pay.gov Receipt No 0973-13186259)(Lee, Irene) (Entered: 01/03/2014)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 1/2/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                  NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Plaintiff McRO Inc. Related Case(s): 13-cv-01870, 13-cv-01871, 13-cv-01872, 13-cv-01873, 13-cv-01874; Lead Case 12-cv-10322, consolidated with 12-cv-10323, 12-cv-10326, 12-cv-10327, 12-cv-10329, 12-cv-10331, 12-cv-10333, 12-cv-10335, 12-cv-10336, 12-cv-10337, 12-cv-10338, 12-cv-10340, 12-cv-10341, 12-cv-10342, 12-cv-10344 and 12-cv-10345 (Lee, Irene) (Entered: 01/02/2014)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 12/27/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                    STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Atlus U.S.A. Inc answer now due 1/10/2014, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) 1 filed by Defendant Atlus U.S.A. Inc.(Attorney Sonal Naresh Mehta added to party Atlus U.S.A. Inc(pty:dft))(Mehta, Sonal) (Entered: 12/27/2013)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 12/19/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                      PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff McRO Inc, upon Defendant Atlus U.S.A. Inc served on 12/10/2013, answer due 12/31/2013. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Tim Pivnicny in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity. Original Summons NOT returned. (Lee, Irene) (Entered: 12/19/2013)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 12/19/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                        Standing Order Re Final Pre-Trial Conferences for Civil Jury Trials Before Judge George H. Wu. 1. You are instructed to read and to follow (unless otherwise superseded herein) the Central District of California Local Rules (henceforth Local Rules) 16-1 through 16-15 regarding pre-trial requirements. (See order for details.) (kti) (Entered: 12/19/2013)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 12/17/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                          TEXT ONLY ENTRY (IN CHAMBERS) TRANSFER OF CASE TO JUDGE WU AND ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE by Judge George H Wu; This action has been reassigned to the Honorable George H. Wu, U.S. District Judge and the Honorable Fredrick F. Mumm, U.S. Magistrate Judge. The Court, on its own motion, sets a Status Conference for January 30, 2014 at 8:30 a.m. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (jag) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 12/17/2013)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 12/12/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                            ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 08-05 -Related Case- filed. Related Case No: CV12-10322 GW (FFMx). Case transferred from Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth and Judge Josephine L. Staton to Judge George H. Wu and Magistrate Judge Frederick F. Mumm for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge SACV13-01870 GW (FFMx). Signed by Judge George H. Wu (dro) (Entered: 12/16/2013)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 12/5/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                              NOTICE OF FILING FEE DUE on Pro Hac Vice Application mailed to Mark S. Raskin for Plaintiff McRO Inc. Pro Hac Vice application has not been received by the court. Please return your completed Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case, form G-64, or a copy of the Notice of Electronic Filing of your application and the $325.00 fee and this notice immediately. Out-of-state federal government attorneys who are not employed by the U.S. Department of Justice are required to file a Pro Hac Vice application;no filing fee is required. You have been removed as counsel of record from this case for failure to submit this filing fee. (lwag) (Entered: 12/05/2013)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 12/5/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) 1 as to Defendants Atlus U.S.A. Inc and Sega Dream Corp. (lwag) (Entered: 12/05/2013)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 12/2/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                  AMENDED DOCUMENT filed by Plaintiff McRo Inc. dba Planet Blue. Amendment to Corporate Disclosure Statement 5 (Lee, Irene) (Entered: 12/02/2013)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 11/27/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                    REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or a Trademark (Initial Notification) filed by McRo Inc. dba Planet Blue. (Lee, Irene) (Entered: 11/27/2013)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 11/27/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                      Certificate and Notice of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff McRo Inc. dba Planet Blue, (Lee, Irene) (Entered: 11/27/2013)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 11/27/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                        CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Plaintiff McRo Inc. dba Planet Blue (Lee, Irene) (Entered: 11/27/2013)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 11/27/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                          Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) 1 filed by Plaintiff McRo Inc. dba Planet Blue. (Lee, Irene) (Entered: 11/27/2013)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 11/27/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                            Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) 1 filed by Plaintiff McRo Inc. dba Planet Blue. (Lee, Irene) (Entered: 11/27/2013)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 11/27/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                              CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff McRo Inc. dba Planet Blue. (Lee, Irene) (Entered: 11/27/2013)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 11/27/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-13047709 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff McRo Inc. dba Planet Blue. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Attorney Irene Y Lee added to party McRo Inc. dba Planet Blue(pty:pla))(Lee, Irene) (Entered: 11/27/2013)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                  Statistics

                                                                                                                  This case has been viewed 50 times.

                                                                                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                  Space
                                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                   
                                                                                                                  PlainSite
                                                                                                                  Sign Up
                                                                                                                  Need Password Help?