McRo Inc. v. Sucker Punch Productions LLC
Federal Civil Lawsuit California Central District Court, Case No. 2:14-cv-00332

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated December 21, 2016 at 5:27 PM ST (4.8 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Mcro, Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Mishcon de Reya New York LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Vincent Filardo +1 212 612 3265 +1 212 612 3297 Vincent.Filardo@mishcon.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mark S Raskin +1 212 612 3270 +1 212 612 3297 Mark.Raskin@mishcon.com
v.
No Logo Sucker Punch Productions, L.l.c., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Shook Hardy & Bacon LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Tony Maurice Diab +1 949 475 1500 +1 949 475 0016 tdiab@shb.com
TERMINATED: 09/30/2014, PRO HAC VICE Albert F Harris, III +1 816 474 6550 +1 816 421 5547 afharris@shb.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lynn C. Herndon lherndon@shb.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Beth A Larigan +1 816 559 2459 blarigan@shb.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Douglas Wayne Robinson +1 949 475 1500 +1 949 475 0016 dwrobinson@shb.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED B. Trent Webb +1 816 474 6550 +1 816 421 5547 BWEBB@shb.com
TERMINATED: 09/30/2014, PRO HAC VICE Jonathan N. Zerger +1 816 474 6550 +1 816 421 5547 IPlitigation@shb.com
  Entries (70) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 4/21/2015, Entered: None Bill of Costs (CV-59) - Issued
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 3/25/2015, Entered: None
    BILL OF COSTS. Costs Taxed in amount of $ 137.50 in favor of Defendant and against Plaintiff. RE: 65 (mb) (Entered: 04/21/2015)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 11/26/2014, Entered: None Objections - non-motion
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 11/20/2014, Entered: None Amendment (Motion related)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 11/17/2014, Entered: None Clerk to Tax Costs
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 11/5/2014, Entered: None Miscellaneous Document
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 11/4/2014, Entered: None Judgment
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 10/31/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                FINAL JUDGMENT by Judge George H. Wu, Accordingly, it is ADJUDGED that Plaintiff and Counterclaim-Defendant McRo, Inc., d.b.a. Planet Blue ("Plaintiff') takes nothing from Defendants and Counterclaim-Plaintiffs (SEE ATTACHED FOR FURTHER DETAILS) All remaining pending motions are DENIED as moot. As Defendants are the prevailing parties in this action, Defendants' costs of court shall be taxed against Plaintiff. (pj) (Entered: 11/03/2014)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 10/27/2014, Entered: None
                  NOTIFICATION by Circuit Court of Appellate Docket Number 15-1093, Federal Circuit regarding Notice of Appeal to Federal Circuit Court of Appeals 59 as to Plaintiff McRO Inc. (mat) (Entered: 10/29/2014)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 10/28/2014, Entered: None Objections - non-motion
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 10/27/2014, Entered: None Judgment/Renewal of Judgment
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 10/22/2014, Entered: None
                        NOTICE OF APPEAL to the Federal Circuit filed by Plaintiff McRO Inc. Appeal of Judgment, 55 (Appeal fee of $505 receipt number 0973-14662602 paid.) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Raskin, Mark) (Entered: 10/22/2014)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 9/30/2014, Entered: None
                          Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Tony M Diab counsel for Defendant Sucker Punch Productions LLC. Jonathan N. Zerger is no longer attorney of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by defendant Sucker Punch Productions LLC. (Diab, Tony) (Entered: 09/30/2014)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 9/30/2014, Entered: None
                            Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Tony M Diab counsel for Defendant Sucker Punch Productions LLC. Albert F. Harris, III is no longer attorney of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by defendant Tony M. Diab. (Diab, Tony) (Entered: 09/30/2014)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 9/24/2014, Entered: None Report of Determination of Patent/Trademark Action (CLOSE) (AO 120)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 9/22/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                RULING ON DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS BASED ON UNPATENTABILITY UNDER 35 U.S.C. SECTION 101 by Judge George H. Wu. For the foregoing reasons, the Court would GRANT the Motion, and hold 576 Patent claims 1, 7-9, and 13, and 278 Patent claims 1-4, 6, 9, 13, and 15-17 invalid Under 35 U.S.C. Section 101. (MD JS-6, Case Terminated). (pj) (Entered: 09/24/2014)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 2/13/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                  MINUTES OF Status Conference held before Judge George H. Wu:, For reasons stated on the record, the Court consolidates the above-entitled action into McRO, Inc., v.Namco Bandai Games America, Inc., CV 12-10322-GW(FFMx). All subsequent documents will now be filed in CV 12-10322-GW(FFMx). The Courts Tentative Position re Scheduling is circulated. The Court adopts its schedule for Track 1 Cases as follows: (SEE ATTACHED FOR FURTHER DETAILS) Pretrial Conference set for 11/24/2014 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu. Jury Trial set for 12/9/2014 09:00 AM before Judge George H. Wu. Claim Construction Hearing set on 4/28/2014 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu. Post-Mediation Status Conference set for 9/25/2014 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu. Court Reporter: Katie Thibodeaux. (Cases associated with Lead Case 12-10322-GW(FFMx).) (pj) (Entered: 02/20/2014)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 2/18/2014, Entered: None
                                    BRIEF filed by Plaintiff McRO Inc. PLAINTIFFS OPENING CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEF (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Raskin, Mark) (Entered: 02/18/2014)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 2/12/2014, Entered: None
                                      NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Tony M Diab on behalf of Defendant Sucker Punch Productions LLC (Attorney Tony M Diab added to party Sucker Punch Productions LLC(pty:dft))(Diab, Tony) (Entered: 02/12/2014)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 2/12/2014, Entered: None
                                        NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Douglas Wayne Robinson on behalf of Defendant Sucker Punch Productions LLC (Attorney Douglas Wayne Robinson added to party Sucker Punch Productions LLC(pty:dft))(Robinson, Douglas) (Entered: 02/12/2014)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 2/11/2014, Entered: None
                                          NOTICE OF TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE FOR MARK S. RASKIN AT THE FEBRUARY 13, 2014 HEARING filed by Plaintiff McRO Inc. (Raskin, Mark) (Entered: 02/11/2014)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 2/10/2014, Entered: None
                                            STATUS REPORT JOINT filed by Plaintiff McRO Inc. (Raskin, Mark) (Entered: 02/10/2014)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 2/3/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                              MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge George H. Wu:This action has been reassigned to the HONORABLE GEORGE H. WU, United States District Judge and the Honorable Frederick F. Mumm, United States Magistrate Judge. Please substitute the initials GW in place of the initials GAF. The case number will now read: CV 14-332- GW(FFMx). A Status Conference re consolidation into McRO, Inc. v. Namco Bandai Games America, Inc., CV 12- 10322-GW(FFMx), is set for February 13, 2014 at 8:30 a.m. Parties will meet and confer and within five days file a joint status report as to said consolidation. Additionally, Parties may appear telephonically provided that notice is given to the clerk by February 11, 2014. (lc) (Entered: 02/03/2014)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 2/3/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                Standing Order Re Final Pre-Trial Conferences for Civil Jury Trial by Judge George H. Wu (lc) (Entered: 02/03/2014)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 1/29/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                  ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 08-05 -Related Case- filed. Related Case No: CV 12-10322 GW(FFMx). Case transferred from Judge Gary A. Feess and Magistrate Judge John E. McDermott to Judge George H. Wu and Magistrate Judge Frederick F. Mumm for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge CV 14-00332 GW(FFMx). Signed by Judge George H. Wu (rn) (Entered: 01/29/2014)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 1/23/2014, Entered: None
                                                    NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Plaintiff McRO Inc. Related Case(s): 14-cv-00389, 14-cv-00336, 14-cv-00352, 14-cv-00358, 14-cv-00383, 14-cv-00417, 14-cv-00439, 13-cv-01870, 13-cv-01871, 13-cv-01872, 13-cv-01873, 13-cv-01874, Lead Case 12-cv-10322, consolidated with 12-cv-10323, 12-cv-10326, 12-cv-10327, 12-cv-10329, 12-cv-10331, 12-cv-10333, 12-cv-10335, 12-cv-10336, 12-cv-10337, 12-cv-10338, 12-cv-10340, 12-cv-10341, 12-cv-10342, 12-cv-10344 and 12-cv-10345 (Raskin, Mark) (Entered: 01/23/2014)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 1/15/2014, Entered: None
                                                      NOTICE OF FILING FEE DUE on Pro Hac Vice Application mailed to attorney Brian E Farnan for Plaintiff McRO Inc. Pro Hac Vice application has not been received by the court. Please return your completed Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case, form G-64, or a copy of the Notice of Electronic Filing of your application and the $325.00 fee and this notice immediately. Out-of-state federal government attorneys who are not employed by the U.S. Department of Justice are required to file a Pro Hac Vice application;no filing fee is required. (ghap) (Entered: 01/15/2014)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 1/15/2014, Entered: None
                                                        NOTICE OF FILING FEE DUE on Pro Hac Vice Application mailed to attorney Rodger Dallery Smith, II for Defendant Sucker Punch Productions LLC. Pro Hac Vice application has not been received by the court. Please return your completed Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case, form G-64, or a copy of the Notice of Electronic Filing of your application and the $325.00 fee and this notice immediately. Out-of-state federal government attorneys who are not employed by the U.S. Department of Justice are required to file a Pro Hac Vice application;no filing fee is required. (ghap) (Entered: 01/15/2014)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 1/15/2014, Entered: None
                                                          NOTICE OF FILING FEE DUE on Pro Hac Vice Application mailed to attorney Jack B Blumenfeld for Defendant Sucker Punch Productions LLC. Pro Hac Vice application has not been received by the court. Please return your completed Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case, form G-64, or a copy of the Notice of Electronic Filing of your application and the $325.00 fee and this notice immediately. Out-of-state federal government attorneys who are not employed by the U.S. Department of Justice are required to file a Pro Hac Vice application;no filing fee is required. (ghap) (Entered: 01/15/2014)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 1/15/2014, Entered: None
                                                            NOTICE OF FILING FEE DUE on Pro Hac Vice Application mailed to attorney Michael J. Farnan for Plaintiff McRO Inc. Pro Hac Vice application has not been received by the court. Please return your completed Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case, form G-64, or a copy of the Notice of Electronic Filing of your application and the $325.00 fee and this notice immediately. Out-of-state federal government attorneys who are not employed by the U.S. Department of Justice are required to file a Pro Hac Vice application;no filing fee is required. (ghap) (Entered: 01/15/2014)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 1/15/2014, Entered: None
                                                              NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap) (Entered: 01/15/2014)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 1/15/2014, Entered: None
                                                                NOTICE of Receipt of Case Transferred In: Formerly Case Number:13:21-CV-01515- LPS-CJB from USDC, District of Delaware at Wilmington. The above-referenced case has been transferred to this district and assigned the Civil Case Number: CV 14-00332 GAF (JEMx). (ghap) (Entered: 01/15/2014)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 1/15/2014, Entered: None
                                                                  ORIGINAL file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received from Delaware (Entered: 01/15/2014)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 12/30/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                    ORDER granting (20) Motion to Transfer Case in case 1:12-cv-01514-LPS-CJB; granting (20) Motion to Transfer Case in case 1:12-cv-01515-LPS-CJB. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 12/30/2013. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01514-LPS-CJB, 1:12-cv-01515-LPS-CJB(rpg) [Transferred from Delaware on 1/15/2014.] (Entered: 12/30/2013)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 12/27/2013, Entered: None
                                                                      NOTICE of Withdrawal of Plaintiff's Opposition to Motion to Transfer by McRo Inc. re 26 Answering Brief in Opposition (Farnan, Brian) [Transferred from Delaware on 1/15/2014.] (Entered: 12/27/2013)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 12/20/2013, Entered: None
                                                                        Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark and The Honorable Christopher J. Burke from Brian E. Farnan regarding Motions to Transfer. (Farnan, Brian) [Transferred from Delaware on 1/15/2014.] (Entered: 12/20/2013)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 7/31/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                          ORAL ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Christopher J. Burke: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the above captioned case is referred to Magistrate Judge Christopher J. Burke to hear and resolve all pretrial matters, up to and including the resolution of case-dispositive motions, subject to 28 U.S.C. § 636(b) and any further Order of the Court; all subsequent filings in this action shall include the initials LPS-CJB after the case number. ORDERED by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 7/31/13. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01508-LPS et al. (ntl) [Transferred from Delaware on 1/15/2014.] (Entered: 07/31/2013)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 7/16/2013, Entered: None
                                                                            NOTICE of Subsequent Authority by McRo Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment)(Farnan, Brian) [Transferred from Delaware on 1/15/2014.] (Entered: 07/16/2013)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 5/23/2013, Entered: None
                                                                              DECLARATION re 30 Reply Brief -- Declaration of Lynn C. Herndon -- by Sucker Punch Productions LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Smith, Rodger) [Transferred from Delaware on 1/15/2014.] (Entered: 05/23/2013)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 5/23/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                REPLY BRIEF re 23 MOTION to Stay re 20 MOTION to Transfer Case to the United States District Court for the Central District of California filed by Sucker Punch Productions LLC. (Smith, Rodger) [Transferred from Delaware on 1/15/2014.] (Entered: 05/23/2013)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 5/23/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                  REPLY BRIEF re 20 MOTION to Transfer Case to the United States District Court for the Central District of California filed by Sucker Punch Productions LLC. (Smith, Rodger) [Transferred from Delaware on 1/15/2014.] (Entered: 05/23/2013)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 5/14/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                    NOTICE of Subsequent Authority by McRo Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Farnan, Brian) [Transferred from Delaware on 1/15/2014.] (Entered: 05/14/2013)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 5/13/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                      ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re 23 MOTION to Stay re 20 MOTION to Transfer Case to the United States District Court for the Central District of California filed by McRo Inc..Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 5/23/2013. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Farnan, Brian) [Transferred from Delaware on 1/15/2014.] (Entered: 05/13/2013)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 5/13/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                        DECLARATION re 26 Answering Brief in Opposition of Eric Berger by McRo Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5)(Farnan, Brian) [Transferred from Delaware on 1/15/2014.] (Entered: 05/13/2013)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 5/13/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                          ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re 20 MOTION to Transfer Case to the United States District Court for the Central District of California filed by McRo Inc..Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 5/23/2013. (Farnan, Brian) [Transferred from Delaware on 1/15/2014.] (Entered: 05/13/2013)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 4/25/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                            DECLARATION re 23 MOTION to Stay re 20 MOTION to Transfer Case to the United States District Court for the Central District of California of Sally Buchanan by Sucker Punch Productions LLC. (Smith, Rodger) [Transferred from Delaware on 1/15/2014.] (Entered: 04/25/2013)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 4/25/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                              OPENING BRIEF in Support re 23 MOTION to Stay re 20 MOTION to Transfer Case to the United States District Court for the Central District of California filed by Sucker Punch Productions LLC.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 5/13/2013. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits 1 and 2)(Smith, Rodger) [Transferred from Delaware on 1/15/2014.] (Entered: 04/25/2013)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 4/25/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                MOTION to Stay re 20 MOTION to Transfer Case to the United States District Court for the Central District of California - filed by Sucker Punch Productions LLC. (Smith, Rodger) [Transferred from Delaware on 1/15/2014.] (Entered: 04/25/2013)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 4/25/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                  DECLARATION re 20 MOTION to Transfer Case to the United States District Court for the Central District of California of Lynn C. Herndon by Sucker Punch Productions LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits 1 through 13)(Smith, Rodger) [Transferred from Delaware on 1/15/2014.] (Entered: 04/25/2013)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 4/25/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                    OPENING BRIEF in Support re 20 MOTION to Transfer Case to the United States District Court for the Central District of California filed by Sucker Punch Productions LLC.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 5/13/2013. (Smith, Rodger) [Transferred from Delaware on 1/15/2014.] (Entered: 04/25/2013)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 4/25/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                      MOTION to Transfer Case to the United States District Court for the Central District of California - filed by Sucker Punch Productions LLC. (Smith, Rodger) [Transferred from Delaware on 1/15/2014.] (Entered: 04/25/2013)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 4/15/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                        REPLY BRIEF re 15 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Sucker Punch Productions LLC. (Smith, Rodger) [Transferred from Delaware on 1/15/2014.] (Entered: 04/15/2013)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 4/3/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                          ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re 15 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by McRo Inc..Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 4/15/2013. (Farnan, Brian) [Transferred from Delaware on 1/15/2014.] (Entered: 04/03/2013)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 3/19/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                            MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Lynn C. Herndon of SHOOK, HARDY & BACON LLP - filed by Sucker Punch Productions LLC. (Smith, Rodger) [Transferred from Delaware on 1/15/2014.] (Entered: 03/19/2013)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 3/18/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                              OPENING BRIEF in Support re 15 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Sucker Punch Productions LLC.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 4/4/2013. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Smith, Rodger) [Transferred from Delaware on 1/15/2014.] (Entered: 03/18/2013)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 3/18/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim - filed by Sucker Punch Productions LLC. (Smith, Rodger) [Transferred from Delaware on 1/15/2014.] (Entered: 03/18/2013)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 3/4/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                  REPLY BRIEF re 9 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Sucker Punch Productions LLC. (Blumenfeld, Jack) [Transferred from Delaware on 1/15/2014.] (Entered: 03/04/2013)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 2/28/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                    First AMENDED COMPLAINT against Sucker Punch Productions LLC- filed by McRo Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Farnan, Brian) [Transferred from Delaware on 1/15/2014.] (Entered: 02/28/2013)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 2/22/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                      ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re 9 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by McRo Inc..Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 3/4/2013. (Farnan, Brian) [Transferred from Delaware on 1/15/2014.] (Entered: 02/22/2013)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 2/4/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                        Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1 filed by Sucker Punch Productions LLC identifying Corporate Parent Sony Computer Entertainment America LLC for Sucker Punch Productions LLC.. (Blumenfeld, Jack) [Transferred from Delaware on 1/15/2014.] (Entered: 02/04/2013)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 2/4/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                          OPENING BRIEF in Support re 9 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Sucker Punch Productions LLC.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 2/22/2013. (Blumenfeld, Jack) [Transferred from Delaware on 1/15/2014.] (Entered: 02/04/2013)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 2/4/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                            MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim - filed by Sucker Punch Productions LLC. (Blumenfeld, Jack) [Transferred from Delaware on 1/15/2014.] (Entered: 02/04/2013)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 2/4/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                              MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney B. Trent Webb, Jonathan N. Zerger, Beth A. Larigan and Albert F. Harris - filed by Sucker Punch Productions LLC. (Blumenfeld, Jack) [Transferred from Delaware on 1/15/2014.] (Entered: 02/04/2013)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 1/28/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to move, answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint to 2/4/2013 - filed by McRo Inc.. (Farnan, Brian) [Transferred from Delaware on 1/15/2014.] (Entered: 01/28/2013)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 1/8/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Vincent Filardo, Jr. and Mark Raskin - filed by McRo Inc.. (Farnan, Brian) [Transferred from Delaware on 1/15/2014.] (Entered: 01/08/2013)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 12/17/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                    STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Defendant to Respond to Complaint to January 28, 2013 - filed by McRo Inc., Sucker Punch Productions LLC. (Blumenfeld, Jack) [Transferred from Delaware on 1/15/2014.] (Entered: 12/17/2012)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 12/11/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                      SUMMONS Returned Executed by McRo Inc.. Sucker Punch Productions LLC served on 11/27/2012, answer due 12/18/2012. (Farnan, Brian) [Transferred from Delaware on 1/15/2014.] (Entered: 12/11/2012)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 11/21/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                        Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) US 6,307,576 B1; US 6,611,278 B2;. (dzb, ) [Transferred from Delaware on 1/15/2014.] (Entered: 11/26/2012)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 11/21/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                          Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction (dzb, ) [Transferred from Delaware on 1/15/2014.] (Entered: 11/26/2012)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 11/21/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                            COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT filed with Jury Demand against Sucker Punch Productions LLC - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 0311-1177521.) - filed by McRo Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Civil Cover Sheet)(dzb, ) [Transferred from Delaware on 1/15/2014.] (Entered: 11/26/2012)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                              Space Space

                                                                                                                                              Statistics

                                                                                                                                              This case has been viewed 24 times.

                                                                                                                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                              Space
                                                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                               
                                                                                                                                              PlainSite
                                                                                                                                              Sign Up
                                                                                                                                              Need Password Help?