McRo Inc. v. Activision Blizzard Inc.
Federal Civil Lawsuit California Central District Court, Case No. 2:14-cv-00336

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated December 21, 2016 at 3:55 AM ST (4.7 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Mcro, Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Farnan LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Brian E. Farnan +1 302 777 0300 +1 302 777 0301 bfarnan@farnanlaw.com
Space Michael J. Farnan +1 302 777 0338 +1 302 421 5870 mfarnan@farnanlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Mishcon de Reya New York LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Vincent Filardo +1 212 612 3265 +1 212 612 3297 Vincent.Filardo@mishcon.com
Space Mark S Raskin +1 212 612 3270 +1 212 612 3297 Mark.Raskin@mishcon.com
v.
No Logo Activision Blizzard, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Morris, Nichols, Arsht & Tunnell LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jack B. Blumenfeld +1 302 658 9200 jbbefiling@mnat.com
Space Rodger D. Smith, II +1 302 658 9200 rsmith@mnat.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Weil Gotshal & Manges LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Evan N. Budaj +1 650 802 3000 +1 650 802 3100 evan.budaj@weil.com
Space Justin Morteza Lee +1 650 802 3211 +1 650 802 3100 justin.m.lee@weil.com
Space Sonal N. Mehta sonal.mehta@weil.com
Space Edward Robert Reines +1 650 802 3022 +1 650 802 3100 edward.reines@weil.com
  Entries (73) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 8/24/2015, Entered: None Bill of Costs (CV-59) - Issued
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 8/3/2015, Entered: None
    BILL OF COSTS. Costs Taxed in amount of $ 100.48 in favor of Blizzard Entertainment, Inc and against McRo, Inc dba Plane Blue. RE: 66 (mb) (Entered: 08/24/2015)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 11/26/2014, Entered: None Objections - non-motion
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 11/26/2014, Entered: None Objections - non-motion
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 11/14/2014, Entered: None Clerk to Tax Costs
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 11/14/2014, Entered: None Clerk to Tax Costs
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 11/5/2014, Entered: None Miscellaneous Document
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 11/4/2014, Entered: None Judgment
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 10/31/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                  FINAL JUDGMENT by Judge George H. Wu, Accordingly, it is ADJUDGED that Plaintiff and Counterclaim-Defendant McRo, Inc., d.b.a. Planet Blue ("Plaintiff') takes nothing from Defendants and Counterclaim-Plaintiffs (SEE ATTACHED FOR FURTHER DETAILS) All remaining pending motions are DENIED as moot. As Defendants are the prevailing parties in this action, Defendants' costs of court shall be taxed against Plaintiff. (pj) (Entered: 11/03/2014)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 10/27/2014, Entered: None
                    NOTIFICATION by Circuit Court of Appellate Docket Number 15-1094, 9th Circuit regarding Notice of Appeal to Federal Circuit Court of Appeals 60 as to Plaintiff McRO Inc. (mat) (Entered: 10/29/2014)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 10/28/2014, Entered: None Objections - non-motion
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 10/24/2014, Entered: None Judgment/Renewal of Judgment
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 10/22/2014, Entered: None
                          NOTICE OF APPEAL to the Federal Circuit filed by Plaintiff McRO Inc. Appeal of Judgment, 58 (Appeal fee of $505 receipt number 0973-14662608 paid.) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Raskin, Mark) (Entered: 10/22/2014)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 9/24/2014, Entered: None Report of Determination of Patent/Trademark Action (CLOSE) (AO 120)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 9/24/2014, Entered: None Judgment
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Blank 58 Filed: 9/22/2014, Entered: 9/24/2014 Judgment*
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 2/13/2014, Entered: 2/20/2014 Status Conference
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 2/18/2014, Entered: 2/18/2014 Brief (non-motion) (non-appeal)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 2/11/2014, Entered: 2/11/2014 ~Notice (other)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 2/10/2014, Entered: 2/10/2014 Status Report
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 2/6/2014, Entered: 2/10/2014 Order on Request to Substitute Attorney
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 2/3/2014, Entered: 2/3/2014 Order
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 2/3/2014, Entered: 2/3/2014 Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 1/31/2014, Entered: 1/31/2014 Notice of Appearance/
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 1/31/2014, Entered: 1/31/2014 Notice of Appearance/
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 1/31/2014, Entered: 1/31/2014 Notice of Appearance/
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 1/31/2014, Entered: 1/31/2014 Request to Substitute Attorney (G-01)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 1/30/2014, Entered: 1/30/2014 Notice of Appearance/
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 1/29/2014, Entered: 1/29/2014 Transferring Case purs GO 14-03 (Related Case)(CV 34)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 1/23/2014, Entered: 1/23/2014 Notice of Related Cases
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 1/15/2014, Entered: 1/16/2014 Notice of Filing Fee Due (PHV)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 1/15/2014, Entered: 1/16/2014 Notice of Filing Fee Due (PHV)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 1/15/2014, Entered: 1/16/2014 Notice of Filing Fee Due (PHV)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 1/15/2014, Entered: 1/16/2014 Notice of Filing Fee Due (PHV)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 1/15/2014, Entered: 1/16/2014 Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 1/15/2014, Entered: 1/16/2014 ~Notice (other)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 1/15/2014, Entered: 1/15/2014 Case Transferred In from other District (Electronic Transfer)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 12/30/2013, Entered: 12/30/2013 R&R - Accepting Report and Recommendations
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 12/20/2013, Entered: 12/20/2013 Letter
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 12/13/2013, Entered: 12/13/2013 Miscellaneous Document
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 8/26/2013, Entered: 8/26/2013 Declaration (Motion related)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 8/26/2013, Entered: 8/26/2013 Reply (Motion related)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 8/15/2013, Entered: 8/15/2013 Declaration (Motion related)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 8/15/2013, Entered: 8/15/2013 Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 7/31/2013, Entered: 7/31/2013 Case Referred to Magistrate Judge
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 7/29/2013, Entered: 7/29/2013 Declaration (Motion related)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 7/29/2013, Entered: 7/29/2013 Declaration (Motion related)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 7/29/2013, Entered: 7/29/2013 Declaration (Motion related)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 7/29/2013, Entered: 7/29/2013 Declaration (Motion related)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 7/29/2013, Entered: 7/29/2013 Motion Related Document
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 7/29/2013, Entered: 7/29/2013 Motion to Transfer Case
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 5/14/2013, Entered: 5/14/2013 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 4/15/2013, Entered: 4/15/2013 Declaration (Motion related)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 4/15/2013, Entered: 4/15/2013 Reply (Motion related)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 4/3/2013, Entered: 4/3/2013 Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 3/18/2013, Entered: 3/18/2013 Declaration (Motion related)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 3/18/2013, Entered: 3/18/2013 Motion Related Document
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 3/18/2013, Entered: 3/18/2013 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 3/4/2013, Entered: 3/4/2013 Reply (Motion related)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Blank 14 Filed: 2/28/2013, Entered: 2/28/2013 Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 2/22/2013, Entered: 2/22/2013 Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 2/4/2013, Entered: 2/5/2013 Declaration (Motion related)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 2/4/2013, Entered: 2/4/2013 Motion Related Document
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 2/4/2013, Entered: 2/4/2013 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 2/4/2013, Entered: 2/4/2013 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 2/4/2013, Entered: 2/4/2013 Motion for Leave to Appear
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 1/28/2013, Entered: 1/28/2013 Stipulation Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 1/8/2013, Entered: 1/8/2013 Motion for Leave to Appear
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 12/11/2012, Entered: 12/11/2012 Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 12/5/2012, Entered: 12/5/2012 Stipulation Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 11/21/2012, Entered: 11/26/2012 Report on Filing of Patent/Trademark Action (Initial Notification) (AO 120)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 11/21/2012, Entered: 11/26/2012 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 11/21/2012, Entered: 11/26/2012 Complaint - (Discovery)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                    Statistics

                                                                                                                                                    This case has been viewed 90 times.

                                                                                                                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                    Space
                                                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                     
                                                                                                                                                    PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                    Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                    Need Password Help?