McRo Inc. v. Infinity Ward Inc.
Federal Civil Lawsuit California Central District Court, Case No. 2:14-cv-00352

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated July 27, 2017 at 2:30 AM DT (4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Mcro, Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Farnan LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brian E. Farnan +1 302 777 0300 +1 302 777 0301 bfarnan@farnanlaw.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael J. Farnan +1 302 777 0338 +1 302 421 5870 mfarnan@farnanlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Mishcon de Reya New York LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Vincent Filardo +1 212 612 3265 +1 212 612 3297 Vincent.Filardo@mishcon.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mark S Raskin +1 212 612 3270 +1 212 612 3297 Mark.Raskin@mishcon.com
v.
No Logo Infinity Ward Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Morris, Nichols, Arsht & Tunnell LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 02/06/2014, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jack B. Blumenfeld +1 302 658 9200 jbbefiling@mnat.com
TERMINATED: 02/06/2014, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Rodger D. Smith, II +1 302 658 9200 rsmith@mnat.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Weil Gotshal & Manges LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Evan N. Budaj +1 650 802 3000 +1 650 802 3100 evan.budaj@weil.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Justin Morteza Lee +1 650 802 3000 +1 650 802 3100 jlee@jonesday.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sonal N. Mehta sonal.mehta@weil.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Edward Robert Reines +1 650 802 3022 +1 650 802 3100 edward.reines@weil.com
  Entries (70) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 8/24/2015, Entered: None Bill of Costs (CV-59) - Issued
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 8/3/2015, Entered: None
    BILL OF COSTS. Costs Taxed in amount of $ 201.11 in favor of Infinity Ward Inc. and against McRo, Inc dba Plane Blue. RE: 65 (mb) (Entered: 08/24/2015)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 11/26/2014, Entered: None Objections - non-motion
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 11/14/2014, Entered: None Clerk to Tax Costs
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 11/5/2014, Entered: None Miscellaneous Document
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 11/4/2014, Entered: None Judgment
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 10/31/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
              FINAL JUDGMENT by Judge George H. Wu, Accordingly, it is ADJUDGED that Plaintiff and Counterclaim-Defendant McRo, Inc., d.b.a. Planet Blue ("Plaintiff') takes nothing from Defendants and Counterclaim-Plaintiffs (SEE ATTACHED FOR FURTHER DETAILS) All remaining pending motions are DENIED as moot. As Defendants are the prevailing parties in this action, Defendants' costs of court shall be taxed against Plaintiff. (pj) (Entered: 11/03/2014)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 10/27/2014, Entered: None
                NOTIFICATION by Federal Circuit Court of Appellate Docket Number 15-1097, regarding Notice of Appeal to Federal Circuit Court of Appeals 59 as to Plaintiff McRO Inc. (car) (Entered: 10/29/2014)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 10/28/2014, Entered: None Objections - non-motion
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 10/24/2014, Entered: None Judgment/Renewal of Judgment
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 10/22/2014, Entered: None
                      NOTICE OF APPEAL to the Federal Circuit filed by Plaintiff McRO Inc. Appeal of Judgment, 57 (Appeal fee of $505 receipt number 0973-14662615 paid.) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Raskin, Mark) (Entered: 10/22/2014)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 9/24/2014, Entered: None Report of Determination of Patent/Trademark Action (CLOSE) (AO 120)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 9/24/2014, Entered: None Judgment
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 9/22/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                            RULING ON DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS BASED ON UNPATENTABILITY UNDER 35 U.S.C. SECTION 101 by Judge George H. Wu. For the foregoing reasons, the Court would GRANT the Motion, and hold 576 Patent claims 1, 7-9, and 13, and 278 Patent claims 1-4, 6, 9, 13, and 15-17 invalid Under 35 U.S.C. Section 101. (MD JS-6, Case Terminated). (pj) (Entered: 09/24/2014)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 2/13/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                              MINUTES OF Status Conference held before Judge George H. Wu:, For reasons stated on the record, the Court consolidates the above-entitled action into McRO, Inc., v. Namco Bandai Games America, Inc., CV 12-10322-GW(FFMx). All subsequent documents will now be filed in CV 12-10322-GW(FFMx). The Courts Tentative Position re Scheduling is circulated. The Court adopts its schedule for Track 1 Cases as follows: (SEE ATTACHED FOR FURTHER DETAILS) Pretrial Conference set for 11/24/2014 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu. Jury Trial set for 12/9/2014 09:00 AM before Judge George H. Wu. Claim Construction Hearing set on 4/28/2014 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu. Post-Mediation Status Conference set for 9/25/2014 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu. Court Reporter: Katie Thibodeaux. (Cases associated with Lead Case 12-10322-GW(FFMx).) (pj) (Entered: 02/20/2014)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 2/18/2014, Entered: None
                                BRIEF filed by Plaintiff McRO Inc. PLAINTIFFS OPENING CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEF (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Raskin, Mark) (Entered: 02/18/2014)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 2/11/2014, Entered: None
                                  NOTICE OF TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE FOR MARK S. RASKIN AT THE FEBRUARY 13, 2014 HEARING filed by Plaintiff McRO Inc. (Raskin, Mark) (Entered: 02/11/2014)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 2/10/2014, Entered: None
                                    STATUS REPORT JOINT filed by Plaintiff McRO Inc. (Raskin, Mark) (Entered: 02/10/2014)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 2/6/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                      ORDER ON REQUEST FOR APPROVAL OF SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY by Judge George H. Wu: granting 47 Infinity Ward, Inc Request to Substitute Attorney Sonal N. Mehta, Weil, Gotshal & Manges LLP as attorney of record instead of Attorney Jack B Blumenfeld and Rodger Dallery Smith, II terminated (pj) (Entered: 02/10/2014)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 2/3/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                        MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge George H. Wu:This action has been reassigned to the HONORABLE GEORGE H. WU, United States District Judge and the Honorable Frederick F. Mumm, United States Magistrate Judge. Please substitute the initials GW in place of the initials FMO. The case number will now read: CV 14-352- GW(FFMx).A Status Conference re consolidation into McRO, Inc. v. Namco Bandai Games America, Inc., CV 12-10322-GW(FFMx), is set for February 13, 2014 at 8:30 a.m. Parties will meet and confer and within five days file a joint status report as to said consolidation. Additionally, Parties may appear telephonically provided that notice is given to the clerk by February 11, 2014. (lc) (Entered: 02/03/2014)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 1/31/2014, Entered: None
                                          NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Evan N Budaj on behalf of Defendant Infinity Ward Inc. (Budaj, Evan) (Entered: 01/31/2014)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 1/31/2014, Entered: None
                                            NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Justin Morteza Lee on behalf of Defendant Infinity Ward Inc. (Lee, Justin) (Entered: 01/31/2014)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 1/31/2014, Entered: None
                                              NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Edward R Reines on behalf of Defendant Infinity Ward Inc. (Reines, Edward) (Entered: 01/31/2014)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 1/31/2014, Entered: None
                                                REQUEST to Substitute attorney Sonal N. Mehta in place of attorney Jack B. Blumenfeld filed by Defendant Infinity Ward Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Mehta, Sonal) (Entered: 01/31/2014)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 1/30/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                  Standing Order Re Final Pre-Trial Conferences for Civil Jury Trials Before Judge George H. Wu. 1. You are instructed to read and to follow (unless otherwise superseded herein) the Central District of California Local Rules (henceforth Local Rules) 16-1 through 16-15 regarding pre-trial requirements. (See order for details.) (kti) (Entered: 01/30/2014)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 1/30/2014, Entered: None
                                                    NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Sonal Naresh Mehta on behalf of Defendant Infinity Ward Inc. (Mehta, Sonal) (Entered: 01/30/2014)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 1/29/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                      ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 08-05 -Related Case- filed. Related Case No: CV 12-10322 GW(FFMx). Case transferred from Magistrate Judge Stephen J. Hillman and Judge Fernando M. Olguin to Judge George H. Wu and Magistrate Judge Frederick F. Mumm for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge CV 14-00352 GW(FFMx). Signed by Judge George H. Wu (rn) (Entered: 01/29/2014)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 1/23/2014, Entered: None
                                                        NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Plaintiff McRO Inc. Related Case(s): 14-cv-00389, 14-cv-00336, 14-cv-00358, 14-cv-00383, 14-cv-00332, 14-cv-00417, 14-cv-00439, 13-cv-01870, 13-cv-01871, 13-cv-01872, 13-cv-01873, 13-cv-01874, Lead Case 12-cv-10322, consolidated with 12-cv-10323, 12-cv-10326, 12-cv-10327, 12-cv-10329, 12-cv-10331, 12-cv-10333, 12-cv-10335, 12-cv-10336, 12-cv-10337, 12-cv-10338, 12-cv-10340, 12-cv-10341, 12-cv-10342, 12-cv-10344 and 12-cv-10345 (Raskin, Mark) (Entered: 01/23/2014)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 1/15/2014, Entered: None
                                                          NOTICE OF FILING FEE DUE on Pro Hac Vice Application mailed to attorney Rodger Dallery Smith, II for Defendant Infinity Ward Inc.. Pro Hac Vice application has not been received by the court. Please return your completed Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case, form G-64, or a copy of the Notice of Electronic Filing of your application and the $325.00 fee and this notice immediately. Out-of-state federal government attorneys who are not employed by the U.S. Department of Justice are required to file a Pro Hac Vice application;no filing fee is required. (ghap) (Entered: 01/16/2014)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 1/15/2014, Entered: None
                                                            NOTICE OF FILING FEE DUE on Pro Hac Vice Application mailed to attorney Jack B Blumenfeld for Defendant Infinity Ward Inc.. Pro Hac Vice application has not been received by the court. Please return your completed Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case, form G-64, or a copy of the Notice of Electronic Filing of your application and the $325.00 fee and this notice immediately. Out-of-state federal government attorneys who are not employed by the U.S. Department of Justice are required to file a Pro Hac Vice application;no filing fee is required. (ghap) (Entered: 01/16/2014)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 1/15/2014, Entered: None
                                                              NOTICE OF FILING FEE DUE on Pro Hac Vice Application mailed to attorney Michael J Farnan for Plaintiff McRO Inc. Pro Hac Vice application has not been received by the court. Please return your completed Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case, form G-64, or a copy of the Notice of Electronic Filing of your application and the $325.00 fee and this notice immediately. Out-of-state federal government attorneys who are not employed by the U.S. Department of Justice are required to file a Pro Hac Vice application;no filing fee is required. (ghap) (Entered: 01/16/2014)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 1/15/2014, Entered: None
                                                                NOTICE OF FILING FEE DUE on Pro Hac Vice Application mailed to attorney Brian E Farnan for Plaintiff McRO Inc. Pro Hac Vice application has not been received by the court. Please return your completed Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case, form G-64, or a copy of the Notice of Electronic Filing of your application and the $325.00 fee and this notice immediately. Out-of-state federal government attorneys who are not employed by the U.S. Department of Justice are required to file a Pro Hac Vice application;no filing fee is required. (ghap) (Entered: 01/16/2014)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 1/15/2014, Entered: None
                                                                  NOTICE OF RECEIPT OF CASE TRANSFERRED IN: Formerly Case Number: 1:12-CV-1511-LPS-CJB from USDC, District of Delaware at Wilmington. The above-referenced case has been transferred to this district and assigned the Civil Case Number: CV 14-352 FMO (SHx) (Attachments: # 1 CV-18)(ghap) (Entered: 01/16/2014)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 1/16/2014, Entered: None
                                                                    ORIGINAL file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received from Delaware (Entered: 01/16/2014)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 12/30/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                      ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS and granting Motion to Transfer. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 12/30/2013. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01508-LPS-CJB, 1:12-cv-01511-LPS-CJB, 1:12-cv-01512-LPS-CJB, 1:12-cv-01518-LPS-CJB(rpg) [Transferred from Delaware on 1/16/2014.] (Entered: 12/30/2013)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 12/20/2013, Entered: None
                                                                        Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark and The Honorable Christopher J. Burke from Brian E. Farnan regarding Motions to Transfer. (Farnan, Brian) [Transferred from Delaware on 1/16/2014.] (Entered: 12/20/2013)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 12/13/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                          REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS recommending GRANTING D.I. (23 in 1:12-cv-01508-LPS-CJB) MOTION to Transfer Case to the United States District Court for the Central District of California filed by Activision Blizzard Inc., (23 in 1:12-cv-01518-LPS-CJB) MOTION to Transfer Case to the United States District Court for the Central District of California filed by Warner Bros. Interactive Entertainment Inc., (23 in 1:12-cv-01511-LPS-CJB) MOTION to Transfer Case to the United States District Court for the Central District of California filed by Infinity Ward Inc., (23 in 1:12-cv-01512-LPS-CJB) MOTION to Transfer Case to the United States District Court for the Central District of California filed by LucasArts Entertainment Company LLC. Please note that when filing Objections pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 72(b)(2), briefing consists solely of the Objections (no longer than ten (10) pages) and the Response to the Objections (no longer than ten (10) pages). No further briefing shall be permitted with respect to objections without leave of the Court. Objections to R&R due by 12/30/2013. Signed by Judge Christopher J. Burke on 12/13/2013. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01508-LPS-CJB, 1:12-cv-01511-LPS-CJB, 1:12-cv-01512-LPS-CJB, 1:12-cv-01518-LPS-CJB(mlc) [Transferred from Delaware on 1/16/2014.] (Entered: 12/13/2013)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 8/26/2013, Entered: None
                                                                            DECLARATION re (32 in 1:12-cv-01508-LPS-CJB) Reply Brief, (32 in 1:12-cv-01512-LPS-CJB) Reply Brief, (32 in 1:12-cv-01511-LPS-CJB) Reply Brief, (32 in 1:12-cv-01518-LPS-CJB) Reply Brief by Infinity Ward Inc., Activision Blizzard Inc., LucasArts Entertainment Company LLC, Warner Bros. Interactive Entertainment Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits A and B)(Blumenfeld, Jack) [Transferred from Delaware on 1/16/2014.] (Entered: 08/26/2013)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 8/26/2013, Entered: None
                                                                              REPLY BRIEF re 23 MOTION to Transfer Case to the United States District Court for the Central District of California filed by Infinity Ward Inc.. (Blumenfeld, Jack) [Transferred from Delaware on 1/16/2014.] (Entered: 08/26/2013)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 8/15/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                DECLARATION re 30 Answering Brief in Opposition of Eric Berger by McRo Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Farnan, Brian) [Transferred from Delaware on 1/16/2014.] (Entered: 08/15/2013)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 8/15/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                  ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re 23 MOTION to Transfer Case to the United States District Court for the Central District of California filed by McRo Inc..Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 8/26/2013. (Farnan, Brian) [Transferred from Delaware on 1/16/2014.] (Entered: 08/15/2013)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 7/31/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                    ORAL ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Christopher J. Burke: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the above captioned case is referred to Magistrate Judge Christopher J. Burke to hear and resolve all pretrial matters, up to and including the resolution of case-dispositive motions, subject to 28 U.S.C. § 636(b) and any further Order of the Court; all subsequent filings in this action shall include the initials LPS-CJB after the case number. ORDERED by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 7/31/13. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01508-LPS et al. (ntl) [Transferred from Delaware on 1/16/2014.] (Entered: 07/31/2013)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 7/29/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                      DECLARATION re (23 in 1:12-cv-01512-LPS) MOTION to Transfer Case to the United States District Court for the Central District of California, (23 in 1:12-cv-01508-LPS) MOTION to Transfer Case to the United States District Court for the Central District of California, (23 in 1:12-cv-01518-LPS) MOTION to Transfer Case to the United States District Court for the Central District of California, (23 in 1:12-cv-01511-LPS) MOTION to Transfer Case to the United States District Court for the Central District of California -- Declaration of Sonal N. Mehta -- by Infinity Ward Inc., Activision Blizzard Inc., McRo Inc., Warner Bros. Interactive Entertainment Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A & B (part 1), # 2 Exhibit B (part 2), # 3 Exhibit C - G, # 4 Exhibit H & J, # 5 Exhibit K & O (part 1), # 6 Exhibit O (part 2), # 7 Exhibit O (part 2) & P)(Blumenfeld, Jack) [Transferred from Delaware on 1/16/2014.] (Entered: 07/29/2013)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 7/29/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                        DECLARATION re (23 in 1:12-cv-01508-LPS) MOTION to Transfer Case to the United States District Court for the Central District of California, (23 in 1:12-cv-01518-LPS) MOTION to Transfer Case to the United States District Court for the Central District of California, (23 in 1:12-cv-01511-LPS) MOTION to Transfer Case to the United States District Court for the Central District of California, (23 in 1:12-cv-01512-LPS) MOTION to Transfer Case to the United States District Court for the Central District of California -- Declaration of Douglas L. Reilly -- by Infinity Ward Inc., Activision Blizzard Inc., LucasArts Entertainment Company LLC, Warner Bros. Interactive Entertainment Inc.. (Blumenfeld, Jack) [Transferred from Delaware on 1/16/2014.] (Entered: 07/29/2013)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 7/29/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                          DECLARATION re (23 in 1:12-cv-01508-LPS) MOTION to Transfer Case to the United States District Court for the Central District of California, (23 in 1:12-cv-01518-LPS) MOTION to Transfer Case to the United States District Court for the Central District of California, (23 in 1:12-cv-01511-LPS) MOTION to Transfer Case to the United States District Court for the Central District of California, (23 in 1:12-cv-01512-LPS) MOTION to Transfer Case to the United States District Court for the Central District of California -- Declaration of Omer Salik -- by Infinity Ward Inc., Activision Blizzard Inc., LucasArts Entertainment Company LLC, Warner Bros. Interactive Entertainment Inc.. (Blumenfeld, Jack) [Transferred from Delaware on 1/16/2014.] (Entered: 07/29/2013)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 7/29/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                            DECLARATION re (23 in 1:12-cv-01508-LPS) MOTION to Transfer Case to the United States District Court for the Central District of California, (23 in 1:12-cv-01518-LPS) MOTION to Transfer Case to the United States District Court for the Central District of California, (23 in 1:12-cv-01511-LPS) MOTION to Transfer Case to the United States District Court for the Central District of California, (23 in 1:12-cv-01512-LPS) MOTION to Transfer Case to the United States District Court for the Central District of California -- Declaration of Wayne M. Smith -- by Infinity Ward Inc., Activision Blizzard Inc., LucasArts Entertainment Company LLC, Warner Bros. Interactive Entertainment Inc.. (Blumenfeld, Jack) [Transferred from Delaware on 1/16/2014.] (Entered: 07/29/2013)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 7/29/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                              OPENING BRIEF in Support re 23 MOTION to Transfer Case to the United States District Court for the Central District of California filed by Infinity Ward Inc..Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 8/15/2013. (Blumenfeld, Jack) (Main Document 24 replaced on 8/1/2013) (ntl). [Transferred from Delaware on 1/16/2014.] (Entered: 07/29/2013)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 7/29/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                MOTION to Transfer Case to the United States District Court for the Central District of California - filed by Infinity Ward Inc.. (Blumenfeld, Jack) [Transferred from Delaware on 1/16/2014.] (Entered: 07/29/2013)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 5/14/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                  NOTICE of Subsequent Authority by McRo Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Farnan, Brian) [Transferred from Delaware on 1/16/2014.] (Entered: 05/14/2013)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 4/15/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                    DECLARATION re 20 Reply Brief Declaration of Sonal N. Mehta by Infinity Ward Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A Part 1, # 2 Exhibit A Part 2, # 3 Exhibit B)(Blumenfeld, Jack) [Transferred from Delaware on 1/16/2014.] (Entered: 04/15/2013)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 4/15/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                      REPLY BRIEF re 10 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , 16 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim the First Amended Complaint filed by Infinity Ward Inc.. (Blumenfeld, Jack) [Transferred from Delaware on 1/16/2014.] (Entered: 04/15/2013)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 4/3/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                        ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re 16 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim the First Amended Complaint filed by McRo Inc..Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 4/15/2013. (Farnan, Brian) [Transferred from Delaware on 1/16/2014.] (Entered: 04/03/2013)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 3/18/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                          DECLARATION re (16 in 1:12-cv-01508-LPS) MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim the First Amended Complaint, (16 in 1:12-cv-01511-LPS) MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim the First Amended Complaint, (16 in 1:12-cv-01518-LPS) MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim the First Amended Complaint, (16 in 1:12-cv-01512-LPS) MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim the First Amended Complaint of Sonal N. Mehta by Infinity Ward Inc., Activision Blizzard Inc., LucasArts Entertainment Company LLC, Warner Bros. Interactive Entertainment Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits A through C)(Smith, Rodger) [Transferred from Delaware on 1/16/2014.] (Entered: 03/18/2013)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 3/18/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                            OPENING BRIEF in Support re 16 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim the First Amended Complaint filed by Infinity Ward Inc..Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 4/4/2013. (Smith, Rodger) [Transferred from Delaware on 1/16/2014.] (Entered: 03/18/2013)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 3/18/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                              MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim the First Amended Complaint - filed by Infinity Ward Inc.. (Smith, Rodger) [Transferred from Delaware on 1/16/2014.] (Entered: 03/18/2013)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 3/4/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                REPLY BRIEF re 10 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Infinity Ward Inc.. (Blumenfeld, Jack) [Transferred from Delaware on 1/16/2014.] (Entered: 03/04/2013)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 2/28/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                  First AMENDED COMPLAINT against Infinity Ward Inc.- filed by McRo Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Farnan, Brian) [Transferred from Delaware on 1/16/2014.] (Entered: 02/28/2013)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 2/22/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                    ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re 10 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by McRo Inc..Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 3/4/2013. (Farnan, Brian) [Transferred from Delaware on 1/16/2014.] (Entered: 02/22/2013)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 2/4/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                      DECLARATION re (10 in 1:12-cv-01511-LPS) MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , (10 in 1:12-cv-01512-LPS) MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , (10 in 1:12-cv-01518-LPS) MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , (10 in 1:12-cv-01508-LPS) MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim -- Declaration of Sonal N. Mehta -- by Infinity Ward Inc., Activision Blizzard Inc., LucasArts Entertainment Company LLC, Warner Bros. Interactive Entertainment Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Blumenfeld, Jack) [Transferred from Delaware on 1/16/2014.] (Entered: 02/05/2013)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 2/4/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                        OPENING BRIEF in Support re 10 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Infinity Ward Inc..Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 2/22/2013. (Blumenfeld, Jack) [Transferred from Delaware on 1/16/2014.] (Entered: 02/04/2013)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 2/4/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                          MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim - filed by Infinity Ward Inc.. (Blumenfeld, Jack) [Transferred from Delaware on 1/16/2014.] (Entered: 02/04/2013)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 2/4/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                            Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1 filed by Infinity Ward Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Activision Blizzard, Inc. for Infinity Ward Inc... (Blumenfeld, Jack) [Transferred from Delaware on 1/16/2014.] (Entered: 02/04/2013)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 2/4/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                              MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Edward R. Reines, Sonal N. Mehta, Justin M. Lee and Evan N. Budaj - filed by Infinity Ward Inc.. (Blumenfeld, Jack) [Transferred from Delaware on 1/16/2014.] (Entered: 02/04/2013)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 1/28/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for defendant to move, answer, or otherwise respond to the Complaint to February 4, 2013 - filed by Infinity Ward Inc., McRo Inc.. (Blumenfeld, Jack) [Transferred from Delaware on 1/16/2014.] (Entered: 01/28/2013)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 1/8/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Vincent Filardo, Jr. and Mark Raskin - filed by McRo Inc.. (Farnan, Brian) [Transferred from Delaware on 1/16/2014.] (Entered: 01/08/2013)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 12/11/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                    SUMMONS Returned Executed by McRo Inc.. (Farnan, Brian) [Transferred from Delaware on 1/16/2014.] (Entered: 12/11/2012)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 12/5/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                      STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Answer Complaint to January 28, 2013 - filed by Infinity Ward Inc., McRo Inc.. (Blumenfeld, Jack) [Transferred from Delaware on 1/16/2014.] (Entered: 12/05/2012)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 11/21/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                        Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) US 6,307,576 B1; US 6,611,278 B2;. (dzb, ) [Transferred from Delaware on 1/16/2014.] (Entered: 11/26/2012)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 11/21/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                          Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction (dzb, ) [Transferred from Delaware on 1/16/2014.] (Entered: 11/26/2012)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 11/21/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                            COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT filed with Jury Demand against Infinity Ward Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 0311-1177506.) - filed by McRo Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Civil Cover Sheet)(dzb, ) [Transferred from Delaware on 1/16/2014.] (Entered: 11/26/2012)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                              Statistics

                                                                                                                                              This case has been viewed 24 times.

                                                                                                                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                              Space
                                                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                               
                                                                                                                                              PlainSite
                                                                                                                                              Sign Up
                                                                                                                                              Need Password Help?