McRo Inc. v. Sony Computer Entertainment America LLC
Federal Civil Lawsuit California Central District Court, Case No. 2:14-cv-00383

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 14, 2019 at 7:26 PM ST (2.5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Mcro, Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Farnan LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brian E. Farnan +1 302 777 0300 +1 302 777 0301 bfarnan@farnanlaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael J. Farnan +1 302 777 0338 +1 302 421 5870 mfarnan@farnanlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Mishcon de Reya New York LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Vincent Filardo +1 212 612 3265 +1 212 612 3297 Vincent.Filardo@mishcon.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mark S Raskin +1 212 612 3270 +1 212 612 3297 Mark.Raskin@mishcon.com
v.
No Logo SCE Santa Monica Studio Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Morris, Nichols, Arsht & Tunnell LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jack B. Blumenfeld +1 302 658 9200 jbbefiling@mnat.com
Sony Computer Entertainment America LLC Sony Computer Entertainment America LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Morris, Nichols, Arsht & Tunnell LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 02/13/2014, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jack B. Blumenfeld +1 302 658 9200 jbbefiling@mnat.com
TERMINATED: 02/13/2014, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Rodger D. Smith, II +1 302 658 9200 rsmith@mnat.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Shook Hardy & Bacon LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Tony Maurice Diab +1 949 475 1500 +1 949 475 0016 tdiab@shb.com
TERMINATED: 09/30/2014, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Albert F Harris, III +1 816 474 6550 +1 816 421 5547 afharris@shb.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lynn C. Herndon lherndon@shb.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Beth A Larigan +1 816 559 2459 blarigan@shb.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Douglas Wayne Robinson +1 949 475 1500 +1 949 475 0016 dwrobinson@shb.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED B. Trent Webb +1 816 474 6550 +1 816 421 5547 BWEBB@shb.com
TERMINATED: 09/30/2014, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jonathan N. Zerger +1 816 474 6550 +1 816 421 5547 IPlitigation@shb.com
Citation Section 35 U.S.C. § 271
Nature of Suit Patent
  Entries (72) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 5/5/2015, Entered: None Bill of Costs (CV-59) - Issued
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 4/20/2015, Entered: None
    BILL OF COSTS. Costs Taxed in amount of $ 275.00 in favor of Sony Computer Entertainment America and against McRo, Inc dba Plane Blue. RE: 66 (mb) (Entered: 05/05/2015)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 11/26/2014, Entered: None Objections - non-motion
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 11/20/2014, Entered: None Amendment (Motion related)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 11/17/2014, Entered: None Tax Costs
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 11/5/2014, Entered: None Miscellaneous Document
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 11/4/2014, Entered: None Judgment
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 10/31/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                FINAL JUDGMENT by Judge George H. Wu, Accordingly, it is ADJUDGED that Plaintiff and Counterclaim-Defendant McRo, Inc., d.b.a. Planet Blue ("Plaintiff') takes nothing from Defendants and Counterclaim-Plaintiffs (SEE ATTACHED FOR FURTHER DETAILS) All remaining pending motions are DENIED as moot. As Defendants are the prevailing parties in this action, Defendants' costs of court shall be taxed against Plaintiff. (pj) (Entered: 11/03/2014)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 10/27/2014, Entered: None
                  NOTIFICATION by Circuit Court of Appellate Docket Number 15-1096, Federal Circuit regarding Notice of Appeal to Federal Circuit Court of Appeals 60 as to Plaintiff McRO Inc. (mat) (Entered: 10/29/2014)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 10/28/2014, Entered: None Objections - non-motion
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 10/27/2014, Entered: None Judgment/Renewal of Judgment
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 10/22/2014, Entered: None
                        NOTICE OF APPEAL to the Federal Circuit filed by Plaintiff McRO Inc. Appeal of Judgment, 56 (Appeal fee of $505 receipt number 0973-14662631 paid.) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Raskin, Mark) (Entered: 10/22/2014)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 9/30/2014, Entered: None
                          Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Tony M Diab counsel for Defendant Sony Computer Entertainment America LLC. Jonathan N. Zerger is no longer attorney of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by defendant Sony computer Entertainment LLC. (Diab, Tony) (Entered: 09/30/2014)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 9/30/2014, Entered: None
                            Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Tony M Diab counsel for Defendant Sony Computer Entertainment America LLC. Albert F. Harris, III is no longer attorney of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by defendant Sony Computer Entertainment America LLC. (Diab, Tony) (Entered: 09/30/2014)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 9/24/2014, Entered: None Report of Determination of Patent/Trademark Action (CLOSE) (AO 120)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 9/24/2014, Entered: None Judgment
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 9/22/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                  RULING ON DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS BASED ON UNPATENTABILITY UNDER 35 U.S.C. SECTION 101 by Judge George H. Wu. For the foregoing reasons, the Court would GRANT the Motion, and hold 576 Patent claims 1, 7-9, and 13, and 278 Patent claims 1-4, 6, 9, 13, and 15-17 invalid Under 35 U.S.C. Section 101. (MD JS-6, Case Terminated). (pj) (Entered: 09/24/2014)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 2/13/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                    MINUTES OF Status Conference held before Judge George H. Wu:, For reasons stated on the record, the Court consolidates the above-entitled action into McRO, Inc., v.Namco Bandai Games America, Inc., CV 12-10322-GW(FFMx). All subsequent documents will now be filed in CV 12-10322-GW(FFMx). The Courts Tentative Position re Scheduling is circulated. The Court adopts its schedule for Track 1 Cases as follows: (SEE ATTACHED FOR FURTHER DETAILS) Pretrial Conference set for 11/24/2014 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu. Jury Trial set for 12/9/2014 09:00 AM before Judge George H. Wu. Claim Construction Hearing set on 4/28/2014 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu. Post-Mediation Status Conference set for 9/25/2014 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu. Court Reporter: Katie Thibodeaux. (Cases associated with Lead Case 12-10322-GW(FFMx).) (pj) (Entered: 02/20/2014)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 2/18/2014, Entered: None
                                      BRIEF filed by Plaintiff McRO Inc. PLAINTIFFS OPENING CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEF (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Raskin, Mark) (Entered: 02/18/2014)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 2/13/2014, Entered: None
                                        Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Tony M Diab counsel for Defendant Sony Computer Entertainment America LLC. Filed by Defendant Sony Computer Entertainment America LLC. (Diab, Tony) (Entered: 02/13/2014)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 2/12/2014, Entered: None
                                          NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Tony M Diab on behalf of Defendant Sony Computer Entertainment America LLC (Attorney Tony M Diab added to party Sony Computer Entertainment America LLC(pty:dft))(Diab, Tony) (Entered: 02/12/2014)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 2/12/2014, Entered: None
                                            NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Douglas Wayne Robinson on behalf of Defendant Sony Computer Entertainment America LLC (Attorney Douglas Wayne Robinson added to party Sony Computer Entertainment America LLC(pty:dft))(Robinson, Douglas) (Entered: 02/12/2014)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 2/11/2014, Entered: None
                                              NOTICE OF TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE FOR MARK S. RASKIN AT THE FEBRUARY 13, 2014 HEARING filed by Plaintiff McRO Inc. (Raskin, Mark) (Entered: 02/11/2014)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 2/10/2014, Entered: None
                                                STATUS REPORT JOINT filed by Plaintiff McRO Inc. (Raskin, Mark) (Entered: 02/10/2014)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 2/3/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                  MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge George H. Wu:This action has been reassigned to the HONORABLE GEORGE H. WU, United States District Judge and the Honorable Frederick F. Mumm, United States Magistrate Judge. Please substitute the initials GW in place of the initials RSWL. The case number will now read: CV 14-383-GW(FFMx).A Status Conference re consolidation into McRO, Inc. v. Namco Bandai Games America, Inc., CV 12- 10322-GW(FFMx), is set for February 13, 2014 at 8:30 a.m. (lc) (Entered: 02/03/2014)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 2/3/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                    Standing Order Re Final Pre-Trial Conferences for Civil Jury Trials by Judge George H. Wu (lc) (Entered: 02/03/2014)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 1/29/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                      ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 08-05 -Related Case- filed. Related Case No: CV 12-10322 GW(FFMx). Case transferred from Judge Ronald S.W. Lew and Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg to Judge George H. Wu and Magistrate Judge Frederick F. Mumm for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge CV 14-00383 GW(FFMx). Signed by Judge George H. Wu (rn) (Entered: 01/29/2014)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 1/23/2014, Entered: None
                                                        NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Plaintiff McRO Inc. Related Case(s): 14-cv-00389, 14-cv-00336, 14-cv-00352, 14-cv-00358, 14-cv-00332, 14-cv-00417, 14-cv-00439, 13-cv-01870, 13-cv-01871, 13-cv-01872, 13-cv-01873, 13-cv-01874, Lead Case 12-cv-10322, consolidated with 12-cv-10323, 12-cv-10326, 12-cv-10327, 12-cv-10329, 12-cv-10331, 12-cv-10333, 12-cv-10335, 12-cv-10336, 12-cv-10337, 12-cv-10338, 12-cv-10340, 12-cv-10341, 12-cv-10342, 12-cv-10344 and 12-cv-10345 (Raskin, Mark) (Entered: 01/23/2014)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 1/17/2014, Entered: None
                                                          NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et) (Entered: 01/21/2014)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 1/17/2014, Entered: None
                                                            NOTICE OF FILING FEE DUE on Pro Hac Vice Application mailed to attorney Rodger Dallery Smith, II for Defendants SCE Santa Monica Studio Inc., Sony Computer Entertainment America LLC. Pro Hac Vice application has not been received by the court. Please return your completed Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case, form G-64, or a copy of the Notice of Electronic Filing of your application and the $325.00 fee and this notice immediately. Out-of-state federal government attorneys who are not employed by the U.S. Department of Justice are required to file a Pro Hac Vice application;no filing fee is required. (et) (Entered: 01/17/2014)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 1/17/2014, Entered: None
                                                              NOTICE OF FILING FEE DUE on Pro Hac Vice Application mailed to attorney Jack B Blumenfeld for Defendants SCE Santa Monica Studio Inc., Sony Computer Entertainment America LLC. Pro Hac Vice application has not been received by the court. Please return your completed Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case, form G-64, or a copy of the Notice of Electronic Filing of your application and the $325.00 fee and this notice immediately. Out-of-state federal government attorneys who are not employed by the U.S. Department of Justice are required to file a Pro Hac Vice application;no filing fee is required. (et) (Entered: 01/17/2014)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 1/17/2014, Entered: None
                                                                NOTICE OF FILING FEE DUE on Pro Hac Vice Application mailed to attorney Brian E Farnan for Plaintiff McRO Inc. Pro Hac Vice application has not been received by the court. Please return your completed Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case, form G-64, or a copy of the Notice of Electronic Filing of your application and the $325.00 fee and this notice immediately. Out-of-state federal government attorneys who are not employed by the U.S. Department of Justice are required to file a Pro Hac Vice application;no filing fee is required. (et) (Entered: 01/17/2014)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 1/17/2014, Entered: None
                                                                  NOTICE OF FILING FEE DUE on Pro Hac Vice Application mailed to attorney Michael J Farnan for Plaintiff McRO Inc. Pro Hac Vice application has not been received by the court. Please return your completed Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case, form G-64, or a copy of the Notice of Electronic Filing of your application and the $325.00 fee and this notice immediately. Out-of-state federal government attorneys who are not employed by the U.S. Department of Justice are required to file a Pro Hac Vice application;no filing fee is required. (et) (Entered: 01/17/2014)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 1/16/2014, Entered: None
                                                                    NOTICE OF RECEIPT OF CASE TRANSFERRED IN: Formerly case number: 1:12-cv-01514-LP-CJB from USDC District of Delaware (Wilmington). The above-referenced case has been transferred to this district and assigned the above civil case number: 2:14-cv-00383 RSWL (AGRx). (et) (Entered: 01/17/2014)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 1/17/2014, Entered: None
                                                                      ORIGINAL file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received from Delaware (Entered: 01/17/2014)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 12/30/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                        ORDER granting (20) Motion to Transfer Case in case 1:12-cv-01514-LPS-CJB; granting (20) Motion to Transfer Case in case 1:12-cv-01515-LPS-CJB. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 12/30/2013. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01514-LPS-CJB, 1:12-cv-01515-LPS-CJB(rpg) [Transferred from Delaware on 1/17/2014.] (Entered: 12/30/2013)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 12/27/2013, Entered: None
                                                                          NOTICE of Withdrawal of Plaintiff's Opposition to Motion to Transfer by McRo Inc. re 26 Answering Brief in Opposition (Farnan, Brian) [Transferred from Delaware on 1/17/2014.] (Entered: 12/27/2013)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 12/20/2013, Entered: None
                                                                            Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark and The Honorable Christopher J. Burke from Brian E. Farnan regarding Motions to Transfer. (Farnan, Brian) [Transferred from Delaware on 1/17/2014.] (Entered: 12/20/2013)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 7/31/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                              ORAL ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Christopher J. Burke: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the above captioned case is referred to Magistrate Judge Christopher J. Burke to hear and resolve all pretrial matters, up to and including the resolution of case-dispositive motions, subject to 28 U.S.C. § 636(b) and any further Order of the Court; all subsequent filings in this action shall include the initials LPS-CJB after the case number. ORDERED by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 7/31/13. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01508-LPS et al. (ntl) [Transferred from Delaware on 1/17/2014.] (Entered: 07/31/2013)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 7/16/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                NOTICE of Subsequent Authority by McRo Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment)(Farnan, Brian) [Transferred from Delaware on 1/17/2014.] (Entered: 07/16/2013)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 5/23/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                  DECLARATION re 30 Reply Brief -- Declaration of Lynn C. Herndon -- by Sony Computer Entertainment America LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Smith, Rodger) [Transferred from Delaware on 1/17/2014.] (Entered: 05/23/2013)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 5/23/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                    REPLY BRIEF re 24 MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Resolution of Its Motion to Transfer filed by Sony Computer Entertainment America LLC. (Smith, Rodger) [Transferred from Delaware on 1/17/2014.] (Entered: 05/23/2013)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 5/23/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                      REPLY BRIEF re 20 MOTION to Transfer Case to Central District of California filed by Sony Computer Entertainment America LLC. (Smith, Rodger) [Transferred from Delaware on 1/17/2014.] (Entered: 05/23/2013)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 5/14/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                        NOTICE of Subsequent Authority by McRo Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Farnan, Brian) [Transferred from Delaware on 1/17/2014.] (Entered: 05/14/2013)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 5/13/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                          ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re 24 MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Resolution of Its Motion to Transfer filed by McRo Inc..Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 5/23/2013. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Farnan, Brian) [Transferred from Delaware on 1/17/2014.] (Entered: 05/13/2013)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 5/13/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                            DECLARATION re 26 Answering Brief in Opposition of Eric Berger by McRo Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5)(Farnan, Brian) [Transferred from Delaware on 1/17/2014.] (Entered: 05/13/2013)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 5/13/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                              ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re 20 MOTION to Transfer Case to Central District of California filed by McRo Inc..Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 5/23/2013. (Farnan, Brian) [Transferred from Delaware on 1/17/2014.] (Entered: 05/13/2013)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 4/25/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                OPENING BRIEF in Support re 24 MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Resolution of Its Motion to Transfer filed by Sony Computer Entertainment America LLC.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 5/13/2013. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits 1-2)(Smith, Rodger) [Transferred from Delaware on 1/17/2014.] (Entered: 04/25/2013)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 4/25/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                  MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Resolution of Its Motion to Transfer - filed by Sony Computer Entertainment America LLC. (Smith, Rodger) [Transferred from Delaware on 1/17/2014.] (Entered: 04/25/2013)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 4/25/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                    DECLARATION re 21 Opening Brief in Support, 20 MOTION to Transfer Case to Central District of California -- Declaration of Lynn C. Herndon -- by Sony Computer Entertainment America LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits 1-12)(Smith, Rodger) [Transferred from Delaware on 1/17/2014.] (Entered: 04/25/2013)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 4/25/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                      DECLARATION re 21 Opening Brief in Support, 20 MOTION to Transfer Case to Central District of California -- Declaration of Sally Buchanan -- by Sony Computer Entertainment America LLC. (Smith, Rodger) [Transferred from Delaware on 1/17/2014.] (Entered: 04/25/2013)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 4/25/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                        OPENING BRIEF in Support re 20 MOTION to Transfer Case to Central District of California filed by Sony Computer Entertainment America LLC.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 5/13/2013. (Smith, Rodger) [Transferred from Delaware on 1/17/2014.] (Entered: 04/25/2013)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 4/25/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                          MOTION to Transfer Case to Central District of California - filed by Sony Computer Entertainment America LLC. (Smith, Rodger) [Transferred from Delaware on 1/17/2014.] (Entered: 04/25/2013)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 4/15/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                            REPLY BRIEF re 15 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Sony Computer Entertainment America LLC. (Smith, Rodger) [Transferred from Delaware on 1/17/2014.] (Entered: 04/15/2013)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 4/3/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                              ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re 15 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by McRo Inc..Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 4/15/2013. (Farnan, Brian) [Transferred from Delaware on 1/17/2014.] (Entered: 04/03/2013)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 3/19/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Lynn C. Herndon of SHOOK, HARDY & BACON LLP - filed by Sony Computer Entertainment America LLC. (Smith, Rodger) [Transferred from Delaware on 1/17/2014.] (Entered: 03/19/2013)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 3/18/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                  OPENING BRIEF in Support re 15 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Sony Computer Entertainment America LLC.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 4/4/2013. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Smith, Rodger) [Transferred from Delaware on 1/17/2014.] (Entered: 03/18/2013)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 3/18/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                    MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim - filed by Sony Computer Entertainment America LLC. (Smith, Rodger) [Transferred from Delaware on 1/17/2014.] (Entered: 03/18/2013)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 3/4/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                      REPLY BRIEF re 9 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Sony Computer Entertainment America LLC. (Blumenfeld, Jack) [Transferred from Delaware on 1/17/2014.] (Entered: 03/04/2013)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 2/28/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                        First AMENDED COMPLAINT against SCE Santa Monica Studio Inc., Sony Computer Entertainment America LLC- filed by McRo Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Farnan, Brian) [Transferred from Delaware on 1/17/2014.] (Entered: 02/28/2013)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 2/22/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                          ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re 9 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by McRo Inc..Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 3/4/2013. (Farnan, Brian) [Transferred from Delaware on 1/17/2014.] (Entered: 02/22/2013)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 2/4/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                            Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1 filed by Sony Computer Entertainment America LLC identifying Corporate Parent Sony Corporation for Sony Computer Entertainment America LLC.. (Blumenfeld, Jack) [Transferred from Delaware on 1/17/2014.] (Entered: 02/04/2013)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 2/4/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                              OPENING BRIEF in Support re 9 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Sony Computer Entertainment America LLC.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 2/22/2013. (Blumenfeld, Jack) [Transferred from Delaware on 1/17/2014.] (Entered: 02/04/2013)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 2/4/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim - filed by Sony Computer Entertainment America LLC. (Blumenfeld, Jack) [Transferred from Delaware on 1/17/2014.] (Entered: 02/04/2013)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 2/4/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney B. Trent Webb, Jonathan N. Zerger, Beth A. Larigan and Albert F. Harris - filed by Sony Computer Entertainment America LLC. (Blumenfeld, Jack) [Transferred from Delaware on 1/17/2014.] (Entered: 02/04/2013)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 1/28/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                    STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to move, answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint to 2/4/2013 - filed by McRo Inc.. (Farnan, Brian) [Transferred from Delaware on 1/17/2014.] (Entered: 01/28/2013)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 1/8/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Vincent Filardo, Jr. and Mark Raskin - filed by McRo Inc.. (Farnan, Brian) [Transferred from Delaware on 1/17/2014.] (Entered: 01/08/2013)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 12/11/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                        SUMMONS Returned Executed by McRo Inc.. (Farnan, Brian) [Transferred from Delaware on 1/17/2014.] (Entered: 12/11/2012)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 12/6/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                          STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME FOR THE DEFENDANTS TO MOVE, ANSWER, OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT to JANUARY 28, 2013 - filed by McRo Inc., SCE Santa Monica Studio Inc., Sony Computer Entertainment America LLC. (Blumenfeld, Jack) [Transferred from Delaware on 1/17/2014.] (Entered: 12/06/2012)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 11/21/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                            Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) US 6,307,576 B1; US 6,611,278 B2;. (dzb, ) [Transferred from Delaware on 1/17/2014.] (Entered: 11/26/2012)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 11/21/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                              Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction (dzb, ) [Transferred from Delaware on 1/17/2014.] (Entered: 11/26/2012)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 11/21/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT filed with Jury Demand against SCE Santa Monica Studio Inc., Sony Computer Entertainment America LLC - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 0311-1177518.) - filed by McRo Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Civil Cover Sheet)(dzb, ) [Transferred from Delaware on 1/17/2014.] (Entered: 11/26/2012)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                  Statistics

                                                                                                                                                  This case has been viewed 59 times.

                                                                                                                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                  Space
                                                                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                   
                                                                                                                                                  PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                  Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                  Need Password Help?