McRo Inc. v. LucasArts Entertainment Company LLC
Federal Civil Lawsuit California Central District Court, Case No. 2:14-cv-00358

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated August 13, 2020 at 6:40 PM DT (11.5 months ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Mcro, Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Farnan LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brian E. Farnan +1 302 777 0300 +1 302 777 0301 bfarnan@farnanlaw.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael J. Farnan +1 302 777 0338 +1 302 421 5870 mfarnan@farnanlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Mishcon de Reya New York LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Vincent Filardo +1 212 612 3265 +1 212 612 3297 Vincent.Filardo@mishcon.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mark S Raskin +1 212 612 3270 +1 212 612 3297 Mark.Raskin@mishcon.com
v.
No Logo LucasArts Entertainment Company LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Morris, Nichols, Arsht & Tunnell LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 02/06/2014, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jack B. Blumenfeld +1 302 658 9200 jbbefiling@mnat.com
TERMINATED: 02/06/2014, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Rodger D. Smith, II +1 302 658 9200 rsmith@mnat.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Weil Gotshal & Manges LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Evan N. Budaj +1 650 802 3000 +1 650 802 3100 evan.budaj@weil.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Justin Morteza Lee +1 650 802 3000 +1 650 802 3100 jlee@jonesday.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sonal N. Mehta sonal.mehta@weil.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Edward Robert Reines +1 650 802 3022 +1 650 802 3100 edward.reines@weil.com
  Entries (72) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 8/13/2020, Entered: None Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 8/21/2015, Entered: None Bill of Costs (CV-59) - Issued
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 8/3/2015, Entered: None
      BILL OF COSTS. Costs Taxed in amount of $ 209.12 in favor of Defendant and against Plaintiff. RE: 66 (mb) (Entered: 08/21/2015)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 11/26/2014, Entered: None Objections - non-motion
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 11/14/2014, Entered: None Clerk to Tax Costs
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 11/5/2014, Entered: None Miscellaneous Document
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 11/4/2014, Entered: None Judgment
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 10/31/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                FINAL JUDGMENT by Judge George H. Wu, Accordingly, it is ADJUDGED that Plaintiff and Counterclaim-Defendant McRo, Inc., d.b.a. Planet Blue ("Plaintiff') takes nothing from Defendants and Counterclaim-Plaintiffs (SEE ATTACHED FOR FURTHER DETAILS) All remaining pending motions are DENIED as moot. As Defendants are the prevailing parties in this action, Defendants' costs of court shall be taxed against Plaintiff. (pj) (Entered: 11/03/2014)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 10/27/2014, Entered: None
                  NOTIFICATION by Circuit Court of Appellate Docket Number 15-1095, Federal Circuit regarding Notice of Appeal to Federal Circuit Court of Appeals 60 as to Plaintiff McRO Inc. (mat) (Entered: 10/29/2014)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 10/28/2014, Entered: None Objections - non-motion
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 10/24/2014, Entered: None Judgment/Renewal of Judgment
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 10/22/2014, Entered: None
                        NOTICE OF APPEAL to the Federal Circuit filed by Plaintiff McRO Inc. Appeal of Judgment, 58 (Appeal fee of $505 receipt number 0973-14662622 paid.) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Raskin, Mark) (Entered: 10/22/2014)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 9/24/2014, Entered: None Report of Determination of Patent/Trademark Action (CLOSE) (AO 120)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 9/24/2014, Entered: None Judgment
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 9/22/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                              RULING ON DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS BASED ON UNPATENTABILITY UNDER 35 U.S.C. SECTION 101 by Judge George H. Wu. For the foregoing reasons, the Court would GRANT the Motion, and hold 576 Patent claims 1, 7-9, and 13, and 278 Patent claims 1-4, 6, 9, 13, and 15-17 invalid Under 35 U.S.C. Section 101. (MD JS-6, Case Terminated). (pj) (Entered: 09/24/2014)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 2/13/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                MINUTES OF Status Conference held before Judge George H. Wu:, For reasons stated on the record, the Court consolidates the above-entitled action into McRO, Inc., v.Namco Bandai Games America, Inc., CV 12-10322-GW(FFMx). All subsequent documents will now be filed in CV 12-10322-GW(FFMx). The Courts Tentative Position re Scheduling is circulated. The Court adopts its schedule for Track 1 Cases as follows: (SEE ATTACHED FOR FURTHER DETAILS) Pretrial Conference set for 11/24/2014 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu. Jury Trial set for 12/9/2014 09:00 AM before Judge George H. Wu. Claim Construction Hearing set on 4/28/2014 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu. Post-Mediation Status Conference set for 9/25/2014 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu. Court Reporter: Katie Thibodeaux. (Cases associated with Lead Case 12-10322-GW(FFMx).) (pj) (Entered: 02/20/2014)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 2/18/2014, Entered: None
                                  BRIEF filed by Plaintiff McRO Inc. PLAINTIFFS OPENING CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEF (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Raskin, Mark) (Entered: 02/18/2014)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 2/11/2014, Entered: None
                                    NOTICE OF TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE FOR MARK S. RASKIN AT THE FEBRUARY 13, 2014 HEARING filed by Plaintiff McRO Inc. (Raskin, Mark) (Entered: 02/11/2014)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 2/10/2014, Entered: None
                                      STATUS REPORT JOINT filed by Plaintiff McRO Inc. (Raskin, Mark) (Entered: 02/10/2014)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 2/6/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                        ORDER ON REQUEST FOR APPROVAL OF SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY by Judge George H. Wu: granting 47 LucasArts Entertainment Company, LLC Request to Substitute Attorney Sonal N. Mehta, Weil, Gotshal & Manges LLP.as attorney of record instead of Attorney Jack B Blumenfeld and Rodger Dallery Smith, II terminated (pj) (Entered: 02/10/2014)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 2/3/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                          MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge George H. Wu:This action has been reassigned to the HONORABLE GEORGE H. WU, United States District Judge and the Honorable Frederick F. Mumm, United States Magistrate Judge. Please substitute the initials GW in place of the initials FMO. The case number will now read: CV 14-358- GW(FFMx).A Status Conference re consolidation into McRO, Inc. v. Namco Bandai Games America, Inc., CV 12- 10322-GW(FFMx), is set for February 13, 2014 at 8:30 a.m. Parties will meet and confer and within five days file a joint status report as to said consolidation. Additionally, Parties may appear telephonically provided that notice is given to the clerk by February 11, 2014. (lc) (Entered: 02/03/2014)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 2/3/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                            Standing Order Re Final Pre-Trial Conferences for Civil Jury Trials by Judge George H. Wu (lc) (Entered: 02/03/2014)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 1/31/2014, Entered: None
                                              NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Evan N Budaj on behalf of Defendant LucasArts Entertainment Company LLC (Budaj, Evan) (Entered: 01/31/2014)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 1/31/2014, Entered: None
                                                NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Justin Morteza Lee on behalf of Defendant LucasArts Entertainment Company LLC (Attorney Justin Morteza Lee added to party LucasArts Entertainment Company LLC(pty:dft))(Lee, Justin) (Entered: 01/31/2014)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 1/31/2014, Entered: None
                                                  NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Edward R Reines on behalf of Defendant LucasArts Entertainment Company LLC (Reines, Edward) (Entered: 01/31/2014)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 1/31/2014, Entered: None
                                                    REQUEST to Substitute attorney Sonal N. Mehta in place of attorney Jack B. Blumenfeld filed by Defendant LucasArts Entertainment Company LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Mehta, Sonal) (Entered: 01/31/2014)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 1/30/2014, Entered: None
                                                      NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Sonal Naresh Mehta on behalf of Defendant LucasArts Entertainment Company LLC (Mehta, Sonal) (Entered: 01/30/2014)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 1/29/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                        ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 08-05 -Related Case- filed. Related Case No: CV 12-10322 GW(FFMx). Case transferred from Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald and Magistrate Judge Victor B. Kenton to Judge George H. Wu and Magistrate Judge Frederick F. Mumm for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge CV 14-00358 GW(FFMx). Signed by Judge George H. Wu (rn) (Entered: 01/29/2014)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 1/23/2014, Entered: None
                                                          NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Plaintiff McRO Inc. Related Case(s): 14-cv-00389, 14-cv-00336, 14-cv-00352, 14-cv-00383, 14-cv-00332, 14-cv-00417, 14-cv-00439, 13-cv-01870, 13-cv-01871, 13-cv-01872, 13-cv-01873, 13-cv-01874, Lead Case 12-cv-10322, consolidated with 12-cv-10323, 12-cv-10326, 12-cv-10327, 12-cv-10329, 12-cv-10331, 12-cv-10333, 12-cv-10335, 12-cv-10336, 12-cv-10337, 12-cv-10338, 12-cv-10340, 12-cv-10341, 12-cv-10342, 12-cv-10344 and 12-cv-10345 (Raskin, Mark) (Entered: 01/23/2014)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 1/16/2014, Entered: None
                                                            NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et) (Entered: 01/17/2014)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 1/17/2014, Entered: None
                                                              NOTICE OF FILING FEE DUE on Pro Hac Vice Application mailed to attorney Rodger Dallery Smith, II for Defendant LucasArts Entertainment Company LLC. Pro Hac Vice application has not been received by the court. Please return your completed Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case, form G-64, or a copy of the Notice of Electronic Filing of your application and the $325.00 fee and this notice immediately. Out-of-state federal government attorneys who are not employed by the U.S. Department of Justice are required to file a Pro Hac Vice application; no filing fee is required. (et) (Entered: 01/17/2014)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 1/17/2014, Entered: None
                                                                NOTICE OF FILING FEE DUE on Pro Hac Vice Application mailed to attorney Jack B Blumenfeld for Defendant LucasArts Entertainment Company LLC. Pro Hac Vice application has not been received by the court. Please return your completed Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case, form G-64, or a copy of the Notice of Electronic Filing of your application and the $325.00 fee and this notice immediately. Out-of-state federal government attorneys who are not employed by the U.S. Department of Justice are required to file a Pro Hac Vice application; no filing fee is required. (et) (Entered: 01/17/2014)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 1/17/2014, Entered: None
                                                                  NOTICE OF FILING FEE DUE on Pro Hac Vice Application mailed to attorney Michael J Farnan for Plaintiff McRO Inc. Pro Hac Vice application has not been received by the court. Please return your completed Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case, form G-64, or a copy of the Notice of Electronic Filing of your application and the $325.00 fee and this notice immediately. Out-of-state federal government attorneys who are not employed by the U.S. Department of Justice are required to file a Pro Hac Vice application;no filing fee is required. (et) (Entered: 01/17/2014)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 1/17/2014, Entered: None
                                                                    NOTICE OF FILING FEE DUE on Pro Hac Vice Application mailed to attorney Brian E Farnan for Plaintiff McRO Inc. Pro Hac Vice application has not been received by the court. Please return your completed Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case, form G-64, or a copy of the Notice of Electronic Filing of your application and the $325.00 fee and this notice immediately. Out-of-state federal government attorneys who are not employed by the U.S. Department of Justice are required to file a Pro Hac Vice application;no filing fee is required. (et) (Entered: 01/17/2014)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 1/16/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                      NOTICE OF RECEIPT OF CASE TRANSFERRED IN: Formerly case number: 1:12CV1512 LPS-CJB from USDC District of Delaware (Wilimington). The above-referenced case has been transferred to this district and assigned the above civil case number 2:14-cv-00358 MWF (VBKx). (Attachments: # 1 CV 18 Notice of Assignment to United States Judges)(et) (Entered: 01/17/2014)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 1/17/2014, Entered: None
                                                                        ORIGINAL file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received from Delaware (Entered: 01/17/2014)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 12/30/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                          ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS and granting Motion to Transfer. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 12/30/2013. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01508-LPS-CJB, 1:12-cv-01511-LPS-CJB, 1:12-cv-01512-LPS-CJB, 1:12-cv-01518-LPS-CJB(rpg) [Transferred from Delaware on 1/17/2014.] (Entered: 12/30/2013)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 12/20/2013, Entered: None
                                                                            Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark and The Honorable Christopher J. Burke from Brian E. Farnan regarding Motions to Transfer. (Farnan, Brian) [Transferred from Delaware on 1/17/2014.] (Entered: 12/20/2013)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 12/13/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                              REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS recommending GRANTING D.I. (23 in 1:12-cv-01508-LPS-CJB) MOTION to Transfer Case to the United States District Court for the Central District of California filed by Activision Blizzard Inc., (23 in 1:12-cv-01518-LPS-CJB) MOTION to Transfer Case to the United States District Court for the Central District of California filed by Warner Bros. Interactive Entertainment Inc., (23 in 1:12-cv-01511-LPS-CJB) MOTION to Transfer Case to the United States District Court for the Central District of California filed by Infinity Ward Inc., (23 in 1:12-cv-01512-LPS-CJB) MOTION to Transfer Case to the United States District Court for the Central District of California filed by LucasArts Entertainment Company LLC. Please note that when filing Objections pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 72(b)(2), briefing consists solely of the Objections (no longer than ten (10) pages) and the Response to the Objections (no longer than ten (10) pages). No further briefing shall be permitted with respect to objections without leave of the Court. Objections to R&R due by 12/30/2013. Signed by Judge Christopher J. Burke on 12/13/2013. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01508-LPS-CJB, 1:12-cv-01511-LPS-CJB, 1:12-cv-01512-LPS-CJB, 1:12-cv-01518-LPS-CJB(mlc) [Transferred from Delaware on 1/17/2014.] (Entered: 12/13/2013)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 8/26/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                DECLARATION re (32 in 1:12-cv-01508-LPS-CJB) Reply Brief, (32 in 1:12-cv-01512-LPS-CJB) Reply Brief, (32 in 1:12-cv-01511-LPS-CJB) Reply Brief, (32 in 1:12-cv-01518-LPS-CJB) Reply Brief by Infinity Ward Inc., Activision Blizzard Inc., LucasArts Entertainment Company LLC, Warner Bros. Interactive Entertainment Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits A and B)(Blumenfeld, Jack) [Transferred from Delaware on 1/17/2014.] (Entered: 08/26/2013)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 8/26/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                  REPLY BRIEF re 23 MOTION to Transfer Case to the United States District Court for the Central District of California filed by LucasArts Entertainment Company LLC. (Blumenfeld, Jack) [Transferred from Delaware on 1/17/2014.] (Entered: 08/26/2013)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 8/15/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                    DECLARATION re 30 Answering Brief in Opposition of Eric Berger by McRo Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Farnan, Brian) [Transferred from Delaware on 1/17/2014.] (Entered: 08/15/2013)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 8/15/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                      ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re 23 MOTION to Transfer Case to the United States District Court for the Central District of California filed by McRo Inc..Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 8/26/2013. (Farnan, Brian) [Transferred from Delaware on 1/17/2014.] (Entered: 08/15/2013)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 7/31/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                        ORAL ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Christopher J. Burke: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the above captioned case is referred to Magistrate Judge Christopher J. Burke to hear and resolve all pretrial matters, up to and including the resolution of case-dispositive motions, subject to 28 U.S.C. § 636(b) and any further Order of the Court; all subsequent filings in this action shall include the initials LPS-CJB after the case number. ORDERED by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 7/31/13. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01508-LPS et al. (ntl) [Transferred from Delaware on 1/17/2014.] (Entered: 07/31/2013)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 7/29/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                          DECLARATION re (23 in 1:12-cv-01512-LPS) MOTION to Transfer Case to the United States District Court for the Central District of California, (23 in 1:12-cv-01508-LPS) MOTION to Transfer Case to the United States District Court for the Central District of California, (23 in 1:12-cv-01518-LPS) MOTION to Transfer Case to the United States District Court for the Central District of California, (23 in 1:12-cv-01511-LPS) MOTION to Transfer Case to the United States District Court for the Central District of California -- Declaration of Sonal N. Mehta -- by Infinity Ward Inc., Activision Blizzard Inc., McRo Inc., Warner Bros. Interactive Entertainment Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A & B (part 1), # 2 Exhibit B (part 2), # 3 Exhibit C - G, # 4 Exhibit H & J, # 5 Exhibit K & O (part 1), # 6 Exhibit O (part 2), # 7 Exhibit O (part 2) & P)(Blumenfeld, Jack) [Transferred from Delaware on 1/17/2014.] (Entered: 07/29/2013)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 7/29/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                            DECLARATION re (23 in 1:12-cv-01508-LPS) MOTION to Transfer Case to the United States District Court for the Central District of California, (23 in 1:12-cv-01518-LPS) MOTION to Transfer Case to the United States District Court for the Central District of California, (23 in 1:12-cv-01511-LPS) MOTION to Transfer Case to the United States District Court for the Central District of California, (23 in 1:12-cv-01512-LPS) MOTION to Transfer Case to the United States District Court for the Central District of California -- Declaration of Douglas L. Reilly -- by Infinity Ward Inc., Activision Blizzard Inc., LucasArts Entertainment Company LLC, Warner Bros. Interactive Entertainment Inc.. (Blumenfeld, Jack) [Transferred from Delaware on 1/17/2014.] (Entered: 07/29/2013)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 7/29/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                              DECLARATION re (23 in 1:12-cv-01508-LPS) MOTION to Transfer Case to the United States District Court for the Central District of California, (23 in 1:12-cv-01518-LPS) MOTION to Transfer Case to the United States District Court for the Central District of California, (23 in 1:12-cv-01511-LPS) MOTION to Transfer Case to the United States District Court for the Central District of California, (23 in 1:12-cv-01512-LPS) MOTION to Transfer Case to the United States District Court for the Central District of California -- Declaration of Omer Salik -- by Infinity Ward Inc., Activision Blizzard Inc., LucasArts Entertainment Company LLC, Warner Bros. Interactive Entertainment Inc.. (Blumenfeld, Jack) [Transferred from Delaware on 1/17/2014.] (Entered: 07/29/2013)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 7/29/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                DECLARATION re (23 in 1:12-cv-01508-LPS) MOTION to Transfer Case to the United States District Court for the Central District of California, (23 in 1:12-cv-01518-LPS) MOTION to Transfer Case to the United States District Court for the Central District of California, (23 in 1:12-cv-01511-LPS) MOTION to Transfer Case to the United States District Court for the Central District of California, (23 in 1:12-cv-01512-LPS) MOTION to Transfer Case to the United States District Court for the Central District of California -- Declaration of Wayne M. Smith -- by Infinity Ward Inc., Activision Blizzard Inc., LucasArts Entertainment Company LLC, Warner Bros. Interactive Entertainment Inc.. (Blumenfeld, Jack) [Transferred from Delaware on 1/17/2014.] (Entered: 07/29/2013)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 7/29/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                  OPENING BRIEF in Support re 23 MOTION to Transfer Case to the United States District Court for the Central District of California filed by LucasArts Entertainment Company LLC.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 8/15/2013. (Blumenfeld, Jack) (Main Document 24 replaced on 8/1/2013) (ntl). [Transferred from Delaware on 1/17/2014.] (Entered: 07/29/2013)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 7/29/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                    MOTION to Transfer Case to the United States District Court for the Central District of California - filed by LucasArts Entertainment Company LLC. (Blumenfeld, Jack) [Transferred from Delaware on 1/17/2014.] (Entered: 07/29/2013)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 5/14/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                      NOTICE of Subsequent Authority by McRo Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Farnan, Brian) [Transferred from Delaware on 1/17/2014.] (Entered: 05/14/2013)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 4/15/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                        DECLARATION re 20 Reply Brief Declaration of Sonal N. Mehta by LucasArts Entertainment Company LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A Part 1, # 2 Exhibit A Part 1, # 3 Exhibit B)(Blumenfeld, Jack) [Transferred from Delaware on 1/17/2014.] (Entered: 04/15/2013)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 4/15/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                          REPLY BRIEF re 10 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , 16 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim the First Amended Complaint filed by LucasArts Entertainment Company LLC. (Blumenfeld, Jack) [Transferred from Delaware on 1/17/2014.] (Entered: 04/15/2013)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 4/3/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                            ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re 16 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim the First Amended Complaint filed by McRo Inc..Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 4/15/2013. (Farnan, Brian) [Transferred from Delaware on 1/17/2014.] (Entered: 04/03/2013)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 3/18/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                              DECLARATION re (16 in 1:12-cv-01508-LPS) MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim the First Amended Complaint, (16 in 1:12-cv-01511-LPS) MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim the First Amended Complaint, (16 in 1:12-cv-01518-LPS) MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim the First Amended Complaint, (16 in 1:12-cv-01512-LPS) MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim the First Amended Complaint of Sonal N. Mehta by Infinity Ward Inc., Activision Blizzard Inc., LucasArts Entertainment Company LLC, Warner Bros. Interactive Entertainment Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits A through C)(Smith, Rodger) [Transferred from Delaware on 1/17/2014.] (Entered: 03/18/2013)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 3/18/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                OPENING BRIEF in Support re 16 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim the First Amended Complaint filed by LucasArts Entertainment Company LLC.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 4/4/2013. (Smith, Rodger) [Transferred from Delaware on 1/17/2014.] (Entered: 03/18/2013)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 3/18/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                  MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim the First Amended Complaint - filed by LucasArts Entertainment Company LLC. (Smith, Rodger) [Transferred from Delaware on 1/17/2014.] (Entered: 03/18/2013)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 3/4/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                    REPLY BRIEF re 10 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by LucasArts Entertainment Company LLC. (Blumenfeld, Jack) [Transferred from Delaware on 1/17/2014.] (Entered: 03/04/2013)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 2/28/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                      First AMENDED COMPLAINT against LucasArts Entertainment Company LLC- filed by McRo Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Farnan, Brian) [Transferred from Delaware on 1/17/2014.] (Entered: 02/28/2013)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 2/22/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                        ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re 10 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by McRo Inc..Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 3/4/2013. (Farnan, Brian) [Transferred from Delaware on 1/17/2014.] (Entered: 02/22/2013)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 2/4/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                          DECLARATION re (10 in 1:12-cv-01511-LPS) MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , (10 in 1:12-cv-01512-LPS) MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , (10 in 1:12-cv-01518-LPS) MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , (10 in 1:12-cv-01508-LPS) MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim -- Declaration of Sonal N. Mehta -- by Infinity Ward Inc., Activision Blizzard Inc., LucasArts Entertainment Company LLC, Warner Bros. Interactive Entertainment Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Blumenfeld, Jack) [Transferred from Delaware on 1/17/2014.] (Entered: 02/05/2013)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 2/4/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                            OPENING BRIEF in Support re 10 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by LucasArts Entertainment Company LLC.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 2/22/2013. (Blumenfeld, Jack) [Transferred from Delaware on 1/17/2014.] (Entered: 02/04/2013)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 2/4/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                              MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim - filed by LucasArts Entertainment Company LLC. (Blumenfeld, Jack) [Transferred from Delaware on 1/17/2014.] (Entered: 02/04/2013)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 2/4/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1 filed by LucasArts Entertainment Company LLC identifying Corporate Parent Lucasfilm Entertainment Company Ltd. LLC for LucasArts Entertainment Company LLC.. (Blumenfeld, Jack) [Transferred from Delaware on 1/17/2014.] (Entered: 02/04/2013)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 2/4/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Edward R. Reines, Sonal N. Mehta, Justin M. Lee and Evan N. Budaj - filed by LucasArts Entertainment Company LLC. (Blumenfeld, Jack) [Transferred from Delaware on 1/17/2014.] (Entered: 02/04/2013)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 1/28/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                    STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for defendant to move, answer, or otherwise respond to the Complaint to February 4, 2013 - filed by LucasArts Entertainment Company LLC, McRo Inc.. (Blumenfeld, Jack) [Transferred from Delaware on 1/17/2014.] (Entered: 01/28/2013)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 1/8/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Vincent Filardo, Jr. and Mark Raskin - filed by McRo Inc.. (Farnan, Brian) [Transferred from Delaware on 1/17/2014.] (Entered: 01/08/2013)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 12/12/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                        STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME FOR DEFENDANT TO MOVE, ANSWER, OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT to JANUARY 28, 2013 - filed by LucasArts Entertainment Company LLC, McRo Inc.. (Blumenfeld, Jack) [Transferred from Delaware on 1/17/2014.] (Entered: 12/12/2012)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 12/11/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                          SUMMONS Returned Executed by McRo Inc.. LucasArts Entertainment Company LLC served on 11/27/2012, answer due 12/18/2012. (Farnan, Brian) [Transferred from Delaware on 1/17/2014.] (Entered: 12/11/2012)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 11/21/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                            Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) US 6,307,576 B1; US 6,611,278 B2;. (dzb, ) [Transferred from Delaware on 1/17/2014.] (Entered: 11/26/2012)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 11/21/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                              Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction (dzb, ) [Transferred from Delaware on 1/17/2014.] (Entered: 11/26/2012)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 11/21/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT filed with Jury Demand against LucasArts Entertainment Company LLC - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 0311-1177510.) - filed by McRo Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Civil Cover Sheet)(dzb, ) [Transferred from Delaware on 1/17/2014.] (Entered: 11/26/2012)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                  Statistics

                                                                                                                                                  This case has been viewed 28 times.

                                                                                                                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                  Space
                                                                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                   
                                                                                                                                                  PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                  Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                  Need Password Help?