Robert Mullings et al v. DIRECTV Inc et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Southern District Court, Case No. 1:14-cv-05743
District Judge P. Kevin Castel, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated December 19, 2018 at 6:48 PM ST (2.5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Daniel Majeski, Plaintiff
No Logo Kerwyn Kirton, Plaintiff
No Logo Kevin Kerr, Plaintiff
No Logo Robert Mullings, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Hearin, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jesse B. Hearin, III +1 985 639 3377 jbhearin@hearinllc.com

Toggle Switch Represented by STUEVE AND SIEGEL, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Darren T. Kaplan +1 212 755 0022 +1 212 755 0005 kaplan@stuevesiegel.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Stueve Siegel Hanson LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED George Allan Hanson +1 816 714 7100 +1 816 714 7101 hanson@stuevesiegel.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jason Scott Hartley , +1 619 400 5822 +1 619 400 5832 hartley@stuevesiegel.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ryan Dennis O'Dell +1 619 400 5822 +1 619 400 5832 odell@stuevesiegel.com
v.
No Logo Directsat Usa, LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Fox Rothschild LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Connie L Chen +1 310 598 4170 +1 310 556 9828 cchen@foxrothschild.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Colin D Dougherty +1 610 397 6500 +1 610 397 0450 cdougherty@foxrothschild.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Yesenia M Gallegos +1 310 598 4150 +1 310 556 9828 ygallegos@foxrothschild.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James M. Lemonedes +1 212 788 0881 +1 212 788 0940 jlemonedes@foxrothschild.com
DirecTV Group, Inc. DirecTV Group, Inc., Defendant
Officially listed as "Directv Inc."

Toggle Switch Represented by O'Melveny & Myers LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Adam J Karr +1 949 760 9600 +1 949 823 6994 akarr@omm.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Reed Smith LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas E Hill +1 213 457 8000 +1 213 457 8080 thill@reedsmith.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Linda S Husar +1 213 457 8000 +1 213 457 8080 lhusar@reedsmith.com
DirecTV, LLC DirecTV, LLC, Defendant
No Logo DTV Home Services II LLC, Defendant
No Logo Mastec North America, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Reed Smith LLP (IL-NA)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Amanda Haverstick +1 215 241 7989 +1 215 851 1420 ahaverstick@reedsmith.com
Citation Section 29 U.S.C. § 201
Nature of Suit 710 - Labor: Fair Labor Standards Act
  Entries (128) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 199 Filed: 12/19/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion for Settlement
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 198 Filed: 12/13/2018, Entered: None Letter
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 197 Filed: 9/19/2018, Entered: None Proposed Order
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 196 Filed: 9/19/2018, Entered: None Settlement
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 195 Filed: 8/29/2018, Entered: None Notice of Change of Address
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 4/19/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            MOTION for Ryan D. O'Dell and Jason S. Hartley to Withdraw as Attorney . Document filed by Malik Abdussabr, Matthew Bloomfield, Kevin Kerr, Nathan Kirby, Kerwyn Kirton, Daniel Majeski, Kevin Maple, Robert Mullings, Mohd Rababah, Eric Smith, Jeff Whitlock, Norman Whitt. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order re Withdrawal of Ryan D. O'Dell, # 2 Text of Proposed Order re Withdrawal of Jason S. Hartley)(Hanson, George) (Entered: 04/19/2017)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 4/18/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
              ORDER GRANTING JOINT LETTER REQUEST TO CONTINUE CASE DEADLINES granting 116 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. AND NOW, this 13th day of April, 2017, upon consideration of the Parties' request seeking to (1) extend the deadline for completing fact discovery, which is currently April 24, 2017, by sixty (60) days; (2) vacate the deadline for completing expert discovery, which is currently May 19, 2017, as neither party intends to introduce expert testimony; and (3) continue the May 12, 2017 status conference for a date following the completion of fact discovery, it is hereby ORDERED that the request is GRANTED. It is HEREBY ORDERED that (1) the Parties are granted up to and until June 23, 2017 to complete fact discovery; (2) the expert discovery deadline is hereby vacated, as neither party intends to introduce expert testimony; and the May 12 conference is vacated and a status conference is set for the 17 day of July, 2017, at 12:00 p.m. (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 4/13/2017) (ras) (Entered: 04/18/2017)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 4/18/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                ORDER granting 121 Motion for Jarryd M. Cooper to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge P. Kevin Castel)(Text Only Order) (Castel, P.) (Entered: 04/18/2017)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 4/18/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                  ORDER granting 120 Motion for Emily M. Smith to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge P. Kevin Castel)(Text Only Order) (Castel, P.) (Entered: 04/18/2017)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 4/17/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Todd C. Werts to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-13549198. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Malik Abdussabr, Matthew Bloomfield, Kevin Kerr, Nathan Kirby, Kerwyn Kirton, Daniel Majeski, Kevin Maple, Robert Mullings, Mohd Rababah, Eric Smith, Jeff Whitlock, Norman Whitt. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit in Support of Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, # 2 Exhibit - Certificate of Good Standing from Kansas Supreme Court, # 3 Exhibit - Certificate of Good Standing from Missouri Supreme Court)(Werts, Todd) Modified on 4/17/2017 (jc). (Entered: 04/17/2017)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 4/14/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      MOTION for Jarryd M. Cooper to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-13544297. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Directv Inc., Directv LLC, Mastec North America, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit, # 2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Cooper, Jarryd) (Entered: 04/14/2017)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 4/13/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                        MOTION for Emily M. Smith to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-13538811. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Malik Abdussabr, Matthew Bloomfield, Kevin Kerr, Nathan Kirby, Kerwyn Kirton, Daniel Majeski, Kevin Maple, Robert Mullings, Mohd Rababah, Eric Smith, Jeff Whitlock, Norman Whitt. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Emily) (Entered: 04/13/2017)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 4/13/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                          ORDER granting 118 Motion for Daniel Michael Shaw to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge P. Kevin Castel)(Text Only Order) (Castel, P.) (Entered: 04/13/2017)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 4/12/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                            MOTION for Daniel Michael Shaw to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Malik Abdussabr, Matthew Bloomfield, Kevin Kerr, Nathan Kirby, Kerwyn Kirton, Daniel Majeski, Kevin Maple, Robert Mullings, Mohd Rababah, Eric Smith, Jeff Whitlock, Norman Whitt. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Good Standing, # 2 Affidavit Shaw Affidavit, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Shaw, Daniel) (Entered: 04/12/2017)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 4/12/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                              FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Daniel Michael Shaw to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-13534229. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Robert Mullings. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Good Standing, # 2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Shaw, Daniel) Modified on 4/12/2017 (jc). (Entered: 04/12/2017)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 4/7/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                JOINT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Christina Tellado Winston dated April 7, 2017. Document filed by Directv LLC, Mastec North America, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Tellado Winston, Christina) (Entered: 04/07/2017)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 3/15/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                  ORDER. All fact discovery shall be concluded by April 24, 2017. Any expert discovery shall be concluded by May 19, 2017. The parties shall appear for a conference on May 12, 2017 at 3:30 p.m. SO ORDERED. (Expert Discovery due by 5/19/2017. Fact Discovery due by 4/24/2017.) (Conference set for 5/12/2017 at 03:30 PM before Judge P. Kevin Castel.) (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 3/13/2017) (rjm) (Entered: 03/15/2017)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 12/9/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                    MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: (106 in 1:14-cv-05743-PKC) Amended Complaint filed by Daniel Majeski, Robert Mullings, Kevin Kerr, Kerwyn Kirton. ENDORSEMENT: Docket in both cases and close 15cv1860. Pursuant to the Order of May 13, 2015, the Whitlock action is administratively closed. The caption in 14cv5743 is deemed amended to reflect that the Whitlock plaintiffs are parties to the Mullings action, 14cv5743. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 12/9/2016) (mro) (Entered: 12/09/2016)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 8/24/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                      MEMO ENDORSEMENT granting 112 Motion for Amanda D. Haverstick to Withdraw as Attorney. ENDORSEMENT: Application granted. SO ORDERED. Attorney Amanda Dealy Haverstick terminated. (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 8/23/2016) (kko) (Entered: 08/24/2016)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 8/17/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                        MOTION for Amanda D. Haverstick to Withdraw as Attorney for DirecTV, Inc., DirecTV, LLC, and MasTech North America, Inc. Document filed by Directv Inc., Directv LLC, Mastec North America, Inc..(Tellado Winston, Christina) (Entered: 08/17/2016)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 5/25/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                          SUPPLEMENTAL RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent AT&T Inc. for Directv LLC. Document filed by Directv LLC.(Tellado Winston, Christina) (Entered: 05/25/2016)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 7/14/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                            LETTER addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Ryan D. O'Dell dated July 14, 2015 re: Response to Court's Order Following Pre-Trial Conference (Dkt. 105) - Spreadsheet of Cases and Orders. Document filed by Kevin Kerr, Kerwyn Kirton, Daniel Majeski, Robert Mullings. (Attachments: # 1 Spreadsheet of Cases, # 2 Exhibit 1 - Alrdrich Order, # 3 Exhibit 2 - Alston Order, # 4 Exhibit 3 - Amponsah Order, # 5 Exhibit 4 - Andersen Order, # 6 Exhibit 5 - Barbosa Order, # 7 Exhibit 6 - Battle Order, # 8 Exhibit 7 - Berger Order, # 9 Exhibit 8 - Chesley Order, # 10 Exhibit 9 - Collins Order, # 11 Exhibit 10 - Cooper Order, # 12 Exhibit 11 - Doucette Order, # 13 Exhibit 12 - Hall Order, # 14 Exhibit 13 - Renteria-Camacho Order, # 15 Exhibit 14 - Roslov Order, # 16 Exhibit 15- Azawi Order)(O'Dell, Ryan) (Entered: 07/14/2015)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 6/12/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                              ANSWER to 106 Amended Complaint,. Document filed by Mastec North America, Inc..(Hill, Thomas) (Entered: 06/12/2015)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 6/12/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                ANSWER to 106 Amended Complaint,. Document filed by Directv LLC.(Hill, Thomas) (Entered: 06/12/2015)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 5/29/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                  LETTER addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Ryan D. O'Dell dated May 29, 2015 re: Private Mediation. Document filed by Kevin Kerr, Kerwyn Kirton, Daniel Majeski, Robert Mullings. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10)(Hanson, George) (Entered: 05/29/2015)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Blank 106 Filed: 5/27/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                    THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT amending 99 Amended Complaint, against Directv LLC, Mastec North America, Inc. with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Kerwyn Kirton, Kevin Kerr, Robert Mullings, Daniel Majeski. Related document: 99 Amended Complaint, filed by Daniel Majeski, Robert Mullings, Kevin Kerr, Kerwyn Kirton.(Hanson, George) (Entered: 05/27/2015)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 5/13/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                      ORDER FOLLOWING PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: 1. By May 27, 2015, plaintiffs shall file an amended pleading in Mullings bringing the claims of the Whitlock plaintiffs in the Mullings action. Whitlock will then be dismissed without prejudice. 2. By June 12, 2015 defendants may file a Rule 12(b)(6) motion. Plaintiffs may respond by July 3. Reply due July 14. 3. By July 14, 2015, plaintiffs shall submit a listing of all pending cases, pending substantive motions and copies of all rulings. 4. By May 29, 2015, each side shall send a letter to the Court advising whether they agree to the concept of retaining a private mediator (who, where and when to be determined by the parties at a later point) to address all pending claims of any king brought by Stueve Siegel Hanson against DirectTV, Inc. in which Mastec North America Inc. is the HSP. No preconditions except even split of mediator's fees. (Amended Pleadings due by 5/27/2015.) (Motions due by 6/12/2015.) (Responses due by 7/3/2015.) (Replies due by 7/14/2015.) (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 5/13/2015) (spo) (Entered: 05/14/2015)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 5/6/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                        LETTER addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Ryan O'Dell dated May 6, 2015 re: Case Management Plan. Document filed by Kevin Kerr, Kerwyn Kirton, Daniel Majeski, Robert Mullings.(O'Dell, Ryan) (Entered: 05/06/2015)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 3/19/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                          ORDER - PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Pretrial Conference set for 5/13/2015 at 11:30 AM in Courtroom 11D, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge P. Kevin Castel. (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 3/19/2015) (spo) (Entered: 03/19/2015)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 2/18/2015, Entered: None
                                                            NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Christina Theresa Tellado Winston on behalf of Directv Inc., Directv LLC, Mastec North America, Inc.. New Address: Reed Smith LLP, 355 South Grand Avenue, Suite 2800, Los Angeles, California, USA 90071, 213-457-8129. (Tellado Winston, Christina) (Entered: 02/18/2015)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 2/18/2015, Entered: None
                                                              NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Christina Theresa Tellado Winston on behalf of Directv Inc., Directv LLC, Mastec North America, Inc.. (Tellado Winston, Christina) (Entered: 02/18/2015)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 2/6/2015, Entered: None
                                                                CERTIFIED TRUE COPY OF MDL ORDER FROM THE MDL PANEL DENYING TRANSFER....that the motion, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1407(c), for transfer of eleven actions listed on Schedule A to the United States District Court - Central District of California, be, and the same hereby is denied. (Signed by MDL Panel on 2/6/2015) (sjo) (Entered: 02/06/2015)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 11/12/2014, Entered: None
                                                                  SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT amending 91 Amended Complaint, against Directv Inc., Directv LLC, Mastec North America, Inc. with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Kerwyn Kirton, Kevin Kerr, Robert Mullings, Daniel Majeski. Related document: 91 Amended Complaint, filed by Daniel Majeski, Robert Mullings, Kevin Kerr, Kerwyn Kirton.(Hanson, George) (Entered: 11/12/2014)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 11/6/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                    MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: 97 Letter filed by Daniel Majeski, Robert Mullings, Kevin Kerr, Kerwyn Kirton. ENDORSEMENT: Application granted., ( Amended Pleadings due by 11/12/2014.) (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 11/5/2014) (lmb) (Entered: 11/06/2014)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 11/4/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                      LETTER addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from George A. Hanson dated November 4, 2014 re: Filing a Modified Second Amended Complaint. Document filed by Kevin Kerr, Kerwyn Kirton, Daniel Majeski, Robert Mullings.(Hanson, George) (Entered: 11/04/2014)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 10/30/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                        LETTER addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from George A. Hanson dated 10/30/2014 re: Plaintiffs' Intention to Amend Proposed Second Amended Complaint. Document filed by Kevin Kerr, Kerwyn Kirton, Daniel Majeski, Robert Mullings.(Hanson, George) (Entered: 10/30/2014)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 10/27/2014, Entered: None
                                                                          RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Mastec, Inc. for Mastec North America, Inc.. Document filed by Mastec North America, Inc..(Haverstick, Amanda) (Entered: 10/27/2014)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 10/23/2014, Entered: None
                                                                            FILING ERROR - CORPORATE PARENT/OTHER AFFILIATE NOT ADDED - RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Mastec North America, Inc..(Haverstick, Amanda) Modified on 10/24/2014 (lb). (Entered: 10/23/2014)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Blank 93 Filed: 10/20/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                              LETTER addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Amanda D. Haverstick dated 10/20/2014 re: The letter is pursuant to the Court's October 1, 2014 Order. Document filed by Directv Inc., Directv LLC, Mastec North America, Inc..(Haverstick, Amanda) (Entered: 10/20/2014)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 10/10/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Second Amended Complaint on October 10, 2014. Document filed by Kevin Kerr, Kerwyn Kirton, Daniel Majeski, Robert Mullings. (Hanson, George) (Entered: 10/10/2014)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 10/10/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                  SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT amending 10 Amended Complaint, against Directv Inc., Directv LLC, Mastec North America, Inc. with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Kerwyn Kirton, Kevin Kerr, Robert Mullings, Daniel Majeski. Related document: 10 Amended Complaint, filed by Daniel Majeski, Robert Mullings, Kevin Kerr, Kerwyn Kirton.(Hanson, George) (Entered: 10/10/2014)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Blank 90 Filed: 10/1/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                    ORDER FOLLOWING PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: As a result of a pretrial conference held before the Court today, the following is ORDERED: By October 10, 2014, plaintiffs may amend their complaint. By October 20, 2014, defendants shall set forth in detail in a premotion letter all proposed grounds for dismissal. By October 30, 2014, plaintiffs shall advise whether they further wish to amend to address any matter in the premotion letter. Defendants' time to answer or move adjourned to a date to be set by this Court. Plaintiff represents that it will be filing a motion with JPMDL by October 17, 2014., ( Amended Pleadings due by 10/10/2014., Motions due by 10/17/2014.) (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 10/1/2014) (lmb) (Entered: 10/01/2014)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 9/30/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                      MEMO ENDORSEMENT on NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE. ENDORSEMENT: Application granted as to Mr. Karr., Attorney Adam J Karr terminated. (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 9/29/2014) (lmb) Modified on 9/30/2014 (lmb). (Entered: 09/30/2014)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 9/29/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                        NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Amanda Dealy Haverstick on behalf of Directv Inc., Directv LLC. (Haverstick, Amanda) (Entered: 09/29/2014)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 9/26/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                          ORDER granting 86 Motion for Ryan D. O'Dell to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge P. Kevin Castel)(Text Only Order) (Castel, P.) (Entered: 09/26/2014)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 9/25/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                            AMENDED MOTION for Ryan D. O'Dell to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Kevin Kerr, Kerwyn Kirton, Daniel Majeski, Robert Mullings. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Missouri Certificate of Good Standing, # 2 Exhibit Kansas Certificate of Good Standing, # 3 Exhibit California Certificate of Good Standing, # 4 Exhibit Receipt of Fee from Previous Filing, # 5 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(O'Dell, Ryan) (Entered: 09/25/2014)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 9/25/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                              NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Darren T. Kaplan on behalf of All Plaintiffs. New Address: Stueve Siegel Hanson LLP, 1359 Broadway, Suite 2001, New York, New York, United States 10018, (212) 999-7370. (Kaplan, Darren) (Entered: 09/25/2014)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 9/25/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Darren T. Kaplan on behalf of All Plaintiffs. New Address: Stueve Siegel Hanson LLP, 1359 Broadway, Suite 2001, New York, New York, United States 10018, (212) 999-7370. (Kaplan, Darren) (Entered: 09/25/2014)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 9/24/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                  JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from James M. Lemonedes dated 09/24/2014 re: joint letter in advance of Initial Pretrial Conference. Document filed by DTV Home Services II LLC, DirectSat USA LLC, Directv Inc., Directv LLC, Kevin Kerr, Kerwyn Kirton, Daniel Majeski, Mastec North America, Inc., Robert Mullings. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3)(Lemonedes, James) (Entered: 09/24/2014)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 9/24/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                    NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Darren T. Kaplan on behalf of All Plaintiffs. New Address: Stueve Siegel Hanson LLP, 1359 Broadway, Suite 2001, New York, New York, USA 10018, (212) 999-7370. (Kaplan, Darren) (Entered: 09/24/2014)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 9/24/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                      NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Darren T. Kaplan on behalf of Kevin Kerr, Kerwyn Kirton, Robert Mullings. (Kaplan, Darren) (Entered: 09/24/2014)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 9/23/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                        ORDER granting 79 Motion for George A. Hanson to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge P. Kevin Castel)(Text Only Order) (Castel, P.) (Entered: 09/23/2014)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 9/22/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                          MOTION for George A. Hanson to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Kevin Kerr, Kerwyn Kirton, Daniel Majeski, Robert Mullings. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Missouri Certificate of Good Standing, # 2 Exhibit Kansas Certificate of Good Standing, # 3 Exhibit Receipt 0208-10091983 for Previously Paid Fee, # 4 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Hanson, George) (Entered: 09/22/2014)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 9/16/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                            ORDER granting 75 Motion for Linda Stephanie Husar to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge P. Kevin Castel)(Text Only Order) (Castel, P.) (Entered: 09/16/2014)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 9/16/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                              ORDER granting 74 Motion for Thomas E. Hill to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge P. Kevin Castel)(Text Only Order) (Castel, P.) (Entered: 09/16/2014)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 9/16/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Amanda Dealy Haverstick on behalf of Directv Inc., Directv LLC, Mastec North America, Inc.. New Address: Reed Smith LLP, Three Logan Square, 1717 Arch Street, Suite 3100, Philadelphia, PA, USA 19103, 2158518100. (Haverstick, Amanda) (Entered: 09/16/2014)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 9/15/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                  MOTION for Linda Stephanie Husar to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-10103919. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Directv Inc..(Husar, Linda) (Entered: 09/15/2014)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 9/15/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                    SECOND MOTION for Thomas E. Hill to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Mastec North America, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit California Supreme Court certificate of standing, # 2 Affidavit USDC (C.D. Cal.) certificate of standing, # 3 Affidavit California State Bar certificate of standing, # 4 Text of Proposed Order re Thomas E. Hill motion for PHV admission)(Hill, Thomas) (Entered: 09/15/2014)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 9/12/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                      FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Ryan D. O'Dell to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-10097442. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Kevin Kerr, Kerwyn Kirton, Daniel Majeski, Robert Mullings. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit California Certificate of Good Standing, # 2 Exhibit Kansas Certificate of Good Standing, # 3 Exhibit Missouri Certificate of Good Standing, # 4 Exhibit Proposed Order)(O'Dell, Ryan) Modified on 9/15/2014 (sdi). Modified on 9/15/2014 (sdi). Modified on 9/15/2014 (sdi). (Entered: 09/12/2014)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 9/11/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                        FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Kevin Kerr, Kerwyn Kirton, Daniel Majeski, Robert Mullings. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Kansas Certificate of Good Standing, # 2 Exhibit Missouri Certificate of Good Standing, # 3 Exhibit Proposed Order)(Hanson, George) Modified on 9/15/2014 (sdi). (Entered: 09/11/2014)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 9/11/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                          ORDER INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 10/1/2014 at 10:45 AM in Courtroom 12C, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge P. Kevin Castel as further set forth in this order. (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 9/11/2014) (lmb) (Entered: 09/11/2014)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 9/9/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                            FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Thomas E. Hill to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-10082356. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Mastec North America, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Certificate of Good Standing, # 2 Text of Proposed Order Motion of Thomas E. Hill to Appear Pro Hac vice)(Hill, Thomas) Modified on 9/10/2014 (sdi). (Entered: 09/09/2014)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 8/21/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Amanda Dealy Haverstick on behalf of Mastec North America, Inc.. (Haverstick, Amanda) (Entered: 08/21/2014)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 8/14/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                ORDER granting 67 Motion for Colin D Dougherty to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge P. Kevin Castel)(Text Only Order) (Castel, P.) (Entered: 08/14/2014)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 8/13/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Colin D Dougherty to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-9993659. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by DirectSat USA LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Colin D Dougherty)(Dougherty, Colin) (Entered: 08/13/2014)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 7/29/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by James M. Lemonedes on behalf of DirectSat USA LLC. (Lemonedes, James) (Entered: 07/29/2014)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 7/28/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                      CASE TRANSFERRED IN from the United States District Court - District of California Central; Case Number: 2:13-cv-08167. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket entries received. (sjo) (Entered: 07/28/2014)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 7/23/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                        TRANSMITTAL of documents: Electronic Documents are Accessible Through Pacer. (bp) [Transferred from California Central on 7/28/2014.] (Entered: 07/23/2014)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 7/22/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                          ORDER RE: MOTIONS TO TRANSFER AND MOTIONS TO SEVER CLAIMS OF PLAINTIFFS AND DEFENDANTS by Judge Audrey B. Collins. Pending before the Court are Defendant's Motions to Sever Claims of Plaintiffs, Sever Defendants, and Transfer. Plaintiffs filed Oppositions to all Motions and Defendants filed Replies. The Court hereby GRANTS all Motions to Transfer. The Court DENIES as moot and without prejudice all Motions to Sever Claims of Plaintiffs and to Sever Defendants. transferring case to Southern District of New York. (MD JS-6. Case Terminated.) (bp) [Transferred from California Central on 7/28/2014.] (Entered: 07/23/2014)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 7/17/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                            JOINT REPORT of Parties RE: Motion to Transfer filed by Defendants DIRECTV Inc, DIRECTV LLC, DTV Home Services II LLC. (Karr, Adam) [Transferred from California Central on 7/28/2014.] (Entered: 07/17/2014)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 7/11/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                              TEXT ENTRY (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER parties are hereby notified that the Court inadvertently indicated the incorrect date on the minute dated July 10, 2014. The joint report must be e-filed by Thursday, July 17, 2014. A. Bridges, Court Clerk to Judge Collins. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (ab) TEXT ONLY ENTRY [Transferred from California Central on 7/28/2014.] (Entered: 07/11/2014)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 7/10/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS RE: JOINT REPORT RE: MOTION TO TRANSFER by Judge Audrey B. Collins: Pending before the Court are Defendants' Motions to Transfer the four above-referenced cases. Upon review of the papers the, Court notes that the Motions ask the Court only to transfer the cases to the "appropriate District" for each state. However, each prospective transferee state consists of more than one district, and the Court cannot ascertain, based on the information presently before it, which district is the "appropriate" one for each case or for each plaintiff within each case. The Court therefore ORDERS the parties to meet and confer and file a Joint Report consisting of the following: 1. Defendants' position as to which district is the "appropriate District" for each case, should the Court decide to transfer each of the four cases in their entirety. 2. Defendants' position as to which district is the "appropriate District" for each Plaintiff, should the Court sever the Plaintiffs and then transfer the resulting cases. 3. Plaintiffs' objections, if any, to each "appropriate District" as identified by Defendants. Plaintiffs' participation in this Joint Report shall not be construed as consent to severance, transfer, or both. This Joint Report must be filed no later than Thursday July 16, 2014. (bm) [Transferred from California Central on 7/28/2014.] (Entered: 07/10/2014)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 6/26/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                  MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER CONTINUING MOTIONS by Judge Audrey B. Collins: The Court hereby CONTINUES the hearing on Defendants' Motions to Sever Plaintiffs, Sever Defendants, and Transfer to Monday, July 28, 2014, at 10:00 a.m. (lw) [Transferred from California Central on 7/28/2014.] (Entered: 06/26/2014)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 6/9/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                    REPLY in support of MOTION to Transfer Case 42 filed by Defendants DIRECTV Inc, DIRECTV LLC, DTV Home Services II LLC. (Karr, Adam) [Transferred from California Central on 7/28/2014.] (Entered: 06/09/2014)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 6/9/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                      REPLY in support of MOTION to Sever defendants 41 filed by Defendants DIRECTV Inc, DIRECTV LLC, DTV Home Services II LLC. (Karr, Adam) [Transferred from California Central on 7/28/2014.] (Entered: 06/09/2014)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 6/9/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                        REPLY in support of MOTION to Sever Claims of Plaintiffs 40 filed by Defendants DIRECTV Inc, DIRECTV LLC, DTV Home Services II LLC. (Karr, Adam) [Transferred from California Central on 7/28/2014.] (Entered: 06/09/2014)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 6/2/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF DOCUMENT DISCREPANCIES AND ORDER by Judge Audrey B. Collins ORDERING Application to Seal; Proposed Order; Declaration of Ryan O'Dell submitted by Plaintiffs received on 5/27/2014 to be filed and processed; filed date to be the date the document was stamped Received but not Filed with the Clerk. (jp) [Transferred from California Central on 7/28/2014.] (Entered: 06/05/2014)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 5/27/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                            REQUEST to Exceed Page Limitation of Memorandum in Opposition to Motions to Sever Plaintiffs Claims and Defendants (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(O'Dell, Ryan) [Transferred from California Central on 7/28/2014.] (Entered: 05/27/2014)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 5/27/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                              MEMORANDUM in Opposition to MOTION to Transfer Case 42 filed by Plaintiff Robert Mullings. (O'Dell, Ryan) [Transferred from California Central on 7/28/2014.] (Entered: 05/27/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 5/27/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                MEMORANDUM in Opposition to MOTION to Sever defendants 41 , MOTION to Sever Claims of Plaintiffs 40 filed by Plaintiff Robert Mullings. (O'Dell, Ryan) [Transferred from California Central on 7/28/2014.] (Entered: 05/27/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 5/27/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                  JOINT STATEMENT of Plaintiffs of Facts and Procedural History in Opposition to Defendants' Motions to Sever and Transfer MOTION to Sever defendants 41 , MOTION to Transfer Case 42 , MOTION to Sever Claims of Plaintiffs 40 filed by Plaintiff Robert Mullings. (Hanson, George) [Transferred from California Central on 7/28/2014.] (Entered: 05/27/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 5/26/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Plaintiff Robert Mullings of Declaration of Ryan O'Dell and Exhibits Thereto in Opposition to Motion to Sever Plaintiffs' Claims, Motion to Sever Defendants and Motion to Transfer Actions; Application to File Declaration of Ryan O'Dell Under Seal and Proposed Order. (O'Dell, Ryan) [Transferred from California Central on 7/28/2014.] (Entered: 05/26/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 4/30/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER by Judge Audrey B. Collins: The Court, having reviewed Defendants' Request to Exceed Page Limit, and for good cause shown, hereby orders that the page limit on the memorandum of points and authorities in all briefs associated with Defendants Motion to Transfer Plaintiffs for Inconvenient Venue under 28 U.S.C. § 1404 be extended to 40 pages. re: granting 35 Request for Leave to File Excess Pages (lw) [Transferred from California Central on 7/28/2014.] (Entered: 04/30/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 4/28/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF LODGING filed re MOTION to Sever defendants 41 , MOTION to Transfer Case 42 , MOTION to Sever Claims of Plaintiffs 40 (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Karr, Adam) [Transferred from California Central on 7/28/2014.] (Entered: 04/28/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 4/28/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                          DECLARATION of Adam J. Karr in support of MOTION to Sever defendants 41 , MOTION to Sever Claims of Plaintiffs 40 , MOTION to Transfer Case 42 filed by Defendants DIRECTV Inc, DIRECTV LLC, DTV Home Services II LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B Part 1, # 3 Exhibit B Part 2, # 4 Exhibit B Part 3, # 5 Exhibit B Part 4, # 6 Exhibit B Part 5, # 7 Exhibit C, # 8 Exhibit D)(Karr, Adam) [Transferred from California Central on 7/28/2014.] (Entered: 04/28/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 4/28/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                            REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re MOTION to Sever defendants 41 , MOTION to Transfer Case 42 , MOTION to Sever Claims of Plaintiffs 40 filed by Defendants DIRECTV Inc, DIRECTV LLC, DTV Home Services II LLC. (Karr, Adam) [Transferred from California Central on 7/28/2014.] (Entered: 04/28/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 4/28/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Transfer Case filed by Defendants DIRECTV Inc, DIRECTV LLC, DTV Home Services II LLC. Motion set for hearing on 6/30/2014 at 10:00 AM before Judge Audrey B. Collins. (Attachments: # 1 Defendant's Compendium of Evidence in Support)(Karr, Adam) [Transferred from California Central on 7/28/2014.] (Entered: 04/28/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 4/28/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Sever defendants filed by defendants DIRECTV Inc, DIRECTV LLC, DTV Home Services II LLC. Motion set for hearing on 6/30/2014 at 10:00 AM before Judge Audrey B. Collins. (Karr, Adam) [Transferred from California Central on 7/28/2014.] (Entered: 04/28/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 4/28/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Sever Claims of Plaintiffs filed by defendants DIRECTV Inc, DIRECTV LLC, DTV Home Services II LLC. Motion set for hearing on 6/30/2014 at 10:00 AM before Judge Audrey B. Collins. (Karr, Adam) [Transferred from California Central on 7/28/2014.] (Entered: 04/28/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 4/28/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                  STATEMENT of Facts filed by Defendants DIRECTV Inc, DIRECTV LLC, DTV Home Services II LLC /Index to Motions and Joint Statement of Facts (Karr, Adam) [Transferred from California Central on 7/28/2014.] (Entered: 04/28/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 4/28/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                    Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Thomas E Hill counsel for Defendants DIRECTV Inc, DIRECTV LLC, Mastec North America Inc. Adding Thomas E. Hill as attorney as counsel of record for MasTec North America, Inc., DirecTV, Inc., DirecTV, LLC for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendants MasTec North America, Inc., DirecTV, Inc., DirecTV, LLC. (Attorney Thomas E Hill added to party DIRECTV Inc(pty:dft), Attorney Thomas E Hill added to party DIRECTV LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Thomas E Hill added to party Mastec North America Inc(pty:dft))(Hill, Thomas) [Transferred from California Central on 7/28/2014.] (Entered: 04/28/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 4/28/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                      CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Mastec North America Inc, identifying MasTec North America, Inc.. (Husar, Linda) [Transferred from California Central on 7/28/2014.] (Entered: 04/28/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 4/28/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                        Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Linda S Husar counsel for Defendants DIRECTV Inc, DIRECTV LLC, Mastec North America Inc. Adding Linda S. Husar as attorney as counsel of record for MasTec North America, Inc., DirecTV, Inc., DirecTV, LLC for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendants MasTec North America, Inc., DirecTV, Inc., DirecTV, LLC. (Attorney Linda S Husar added to party DIRECTV Inc(pty:dft), Attorney Linda S Husar added to party DIRECTV LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Linda S Husar added to party Mastec North America Inc(pty:dft))(Husar, Linda) [Transferred from California Central on 7/28/2014.] (Entered: 04/28/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 4/25/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                          REQUEST to Exceed Page Limitation filed by defendants DIRECTV Inc, DIRECTV LLC, DTV Home Services II LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Attorney Adam J Karr added to party DTV Home Services II LLC(pty:dft))(Karr, Adam) [Transferred from California Central on 7/28/2014.] (Entered: 04/25/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 4/21/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER GRANTING JOINT STIPULATION RE: EXTENSION TO FILE THRESHOLD MOTIONS AND RELATED DEADLINES by Judge Audrey B. Collins, re Stipulation for Extension of Time to File 33 : The Court, having reviewed the Parties' Joint Stipulation re: Extension to File Threshold Motions and Related Deadlines, hereby orders: (1) The Threshold Motions to be e-filed by April 28, 2014; (2) Opposition to Threshold Motions to be e-filed by May 27, 2014; (3) Replies in support of Threshold Motions to be e-filed by June 9, 2014; and (4) The hearing on the Threshold Motions will conducted on June 30, 2014 at 10:00 a.m. (bm) [Transferred from California Central on 7/28/2014.] (Entered: 04/21/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 4/18/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                              Joint STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Threshold Motions and related deadlines filed by defendants DIRECTV Inc, DIRECTV LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Karr, Adam) [Transferred from California Central on 7/28/2014.] (Entered: 04/18/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 3/31/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                MINUTES OF STATUS CONFERENCE held before Judge Audrey B. Collins: Case called. Counsel makes appearances. Court and counsel confer regarding status of case. The Court having heard from counsel, ORDERS the following: the Threshold motion to be e-filed by April 21, 2014, opposition due May 12, 2014, reply due by May 27, 2014, the hearing will be held on June 16, 2014 at 10:00 a.m. Court and counsel discuss the deadline on pleadings. The deadline to resolve pleadings on the merits is hereby STAYED. Court Reporter: Katherine Stride. (bm) [Transferred from California Central on 7/28/2014.] (Entered: 04/03/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 3/26/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                  STATUS REPORT / Joint Report In Advance Of Status Conference filed by Defendants DIRECTV Inc, DIRECTV LLC. (Karr, Adam) [Transferred from California Central on 7/28/2014.] (Entered: 03/26/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 3/21/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER GRANTING JOINT REQUEST FOR STATUS CONFERENCE ON MARCH 31, 2014, OR AS SOON THEREAFTER AS IS PRACTICABLE by Judge Audrey B. Collins, re Stipulation for Order 26 . A status conference in the above-entitled action is set for Monday,March 31, 2014 at 10:00 a.m. The parties are to file a joint status conference statement five days in advance of the status conference. The time for all named defendants to respond to the operative complaints in the above-entitled action will be stayed pending completion of the status conference. IT IS SO ORDERED. (cb) [Transferred from California Central on 7/28/2014.] (Entered: 03/24/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 3/18/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Joint STIPULATION for Order Requesting Status Conference filed by Defendant DIRECTV Inc, DIRECTV LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Attorney Adam J Karr added to party DIRECTV Inc(pty:dft))(Karr, Adam) [Transferred from California Central on 7/28/2014.] (Entered: 03/18/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 3/6/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                        PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Kerwyn Kirton, Kevin Kerr, Robert Mullings, Daniel Majeski, upon Defendant Mastec North America Inc served on 2/13/2014, answer due 3/6/2014. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Becky DeGeorge - Person Authorized to Accept in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity. Original Summons NOT returned. (O'Dell, Ryan) [Transferred from California Central on 7/28/2014.] (Entered: 03/06/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 3/6/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                          PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Kerwyn Kirton, Kevin Kerr, Robert Mullings, Daniel Majeski, upon Defendant DTV Home Services II LLC served on 2/11/2014, answer due 3/4/2014. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Paul Matthews (Authorized Person) in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity. Original Summons NOT returned. (O'Dell, Ryan) [Transferred from California Central on 7/28/2014.] (Entered: 03/06/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 3/6/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                            PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Kerwyn Kirton, Kevin Kerr, Robert Mullings, Daniel Majeski, upon Defendant DIRECTV LLC served on 2/13/2014, answer due 3/14/2014. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Becky DeGeorge - Person Authorized to Accept in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity. Original Summons NOT returned. (O'Dell, Ryan) [Transferred from California Central on 7/28/2014.] (Entered: 03/06/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 3/6/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                              PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Kerwyn Kirton, Kevin Kerr, Robert Mullings, Daniel Majeski, upon Defendant DirectSat USA LLC served on 2/14/2014, answer due 3/7/2014. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Yesenia Gallegos - Counsel for DirectSAT USA LLC in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity. Original Summons NOT returned. (O'Dell, Ryan) [Transferred from California Central on 7/28/2014.] (Entered: 03/06/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 2/26/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Yesenia M Gallegos on behalf of Defendant DirectSat USA LLC (Attorney Yesenia M Gallegos added to party DirectSat USA LLC(pty:dft))(Gallegos, Yesenia) [Transferred from California Central on 7/28/2014.] (Entered: 02/26/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 2/20/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Kerwyn Kirton, Kevin Kerr, Robert Mullings, Daniel Majeski, upon Defendant DIRECTV Inc served on 1/23/2014, answer due 2/13/2014. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Milissa Vang - Person Authorized to Accept in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity. Original Summons NOT returned. (Hartley, Jason) [Transferred from California Central on 7/28/2014.] (Entered: 02/20/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 2/13/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant DIRECTV LLC identifying DIRECTV as Corporate Parent. (Karr, Adam) [Transferred from California Central on 7/28/2014.] (Entered: 02/13/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 21 Filed: 2/13/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant DIRECTV LLC, (Karr, Adam) [Transferred from California Central on 7/28/2014.] (Entered: 02/13/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 2/13/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to DIRECTV LLC answer now due 3/14/2014, re Complaint - (Discovery),, 1 filed by defendant DIRECTV LLC.(Attorney Adam J Karr added to party DIRECTV LLC(pty:dft))(Karr, Adam) [Transferred from California Central on 7/28/2014.] (Entered: 02/13/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 2/5/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ALIAS SUMMONS ON FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT issued as to Defendants DIRECTV Inc, DIRECTV LLC, DTV Home Services II LLC, DirectSat USA LLC, Mastec North America Inc (bm) [Transferred from California Central on 7/28/2014.] (Entered: 02/11/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 1/28/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Counsel hereby notified that the scheduling conference set before the previous Judge on February 10, 2014 is hereby VACATED. Judge Collins will reset this matter at a later date. No appearance is required by counsel. A. Bridges, Court Clerk to Judge Collins. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (ab) TEXT ONLY ENTRY [Transferred from California Central on 7/28/2014.] (Entered: 01/28/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 1/22/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER by Judge Audrey B. Collins: granting 8 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney George A. Hanson on behalf of Plaintiffs, designating Jason S. Hartley as local counsel. (lt) [Transferred from California Central on 7/28/2014.] (Entered: 01/23/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 1/22/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER by Judge Audrey B. Collins: granting 9 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Jesse B. Hearin on behalf of Plaintiff, designating Jason S. Hartley as local counsel. (lt) [Transferred from California Central on 7/28/2014.] (Entered: 01/23/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 1/21/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  21 DAY Summons Issued re First Amended Complaint 10 as to Defendant DIRECTV Inc. (bm) [Transferred from California Central on 7/28/2014.] (Entered: 01/21/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 14 Filed: 1/20/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Ryan D O'Dell on behalf of Plaintiffs Kevin Kerr, Kerwyn Kirton, Daniel Majeski, Robert Mullings (Attorney Ryan D O'Dell added to party Kevin Kerr(pty:pla), Attorney Ryan D O'Dell added to party Kerwyn Kirton(pty:pla), Attorney Ryan D O'Dell added to party Daniel Majeski(pty:pla), Attorney Ryan D O'Dell added to party Robert Mullings(pty:pla))(O'Dell, Ryan) [Transferred from California Central on 7/28/2014.] (Entered: 01/20/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 1/13/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Audrey B. Collins (SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER DETAILS). (ab) [Transferred from California Central on 7/28/2014.] (Entered: 01/13/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 1/10/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS)CASE TRANSFERRED TO JUDGE COLLINS by Judge Audrey B. Collins: PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this action has been reassigned to the Honorable Audrey B. Collins, United States District Judge. Please substitute the initials ABC in place of the initials JFW. The case number will now read: CV 13-8167 ABC(Ex). Henceforth, it is imperative that the initials ABC be used on all documents to prevent any delays in processing of documents. The Courtroom Deputy Clerk for Judge Collins is Angela Bridges, who may be reached at (213) 894-6500. Judge Collins's courtroom is located on the 6th floor of the Roybal Federal Building, Courtroom 680. Additional information about Judge Collins may be found on the Court's website at www.cacd.uscourts.gov, "Judges' Procedures & Schedules." (PLEASE REVIEW DOCUMENT FOR FULL AND COMPLETE DETAILS) (lw) [Transferred from California Central on 7/28/2014.] (Entered: 01/13/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 1/8/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 08-05 -Related Case- filed. Related Case No: CV 13-08108 ABC(Ex). Case transferred from Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar and Judge John F. Walter to Judge Audrey B. Collins and Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eick for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge CV 13-08167 ABC(Ex). Signed by Judge Audrey B. Collins (rn) [Transferred from California Central on 7/28/2014.] (Entered: 01/08/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 12/23/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against defendants DIRECTV Inc, DIRECTV LLC, DTV Home Services II LLC, DirectSat USA LLC, Mastec North America Inc amending Complaint 1 with JURY DEMAND, filed by plaintiffs Kerwyn Kirton, Robert Mullings, Daniel Majeski, Kevin Kerr. (jp) (jp). [Transferred from California Central on 7/28/2014.] (Entered: 12/30/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 11/25/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              APPLICATION for attorney Jesse B. Hearin III to Appear Pro Hac Vice (PHV FEE NOT PAID.) filed by Plaintiffs Kerwyn Kirton, Daniel Majeski, Robert Mullings. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Hartley, Jason) [Transferred from California Central on 7/28/2014.] (Entered: 11/25/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 11/21/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                APPLICATION for attorney George A. Hanson to Appear Pro Hac Vice(PHV Fee of $325 receipt number 0973-13018242 paid.) filed by Plaintiffs Kerwyn Kirton, Daniel Majeski, Robert Mullings. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Hartley, Jason) [Transferred from California Central on 7/28/2014.] (Entered: 11/21/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 11/15/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  COURT ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge John F. Walter. Counsel are hereby notified that a Scheduling Conference has been set for February 10, 2014 at 8:30 a.m. before Judge John F. Walter. Counsel are directed to comply with Rule 26 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 26-1 in a timely fashion and to file a Joint Report, on or before February 3, 2014. (cb) [Transferred from California Central on 7/28/2014.] (Entered: 11/15/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 11/7/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Defendant DirectSat USA LLC. upon DirectSat USA LLC waiver sent by Plaintiff on 11/7/2013, answer due 1/6/2014. Waiver of Service signed by Yesenia M. Gallegos. (Gallegos, Yesenia) [Transferred from California Central on 7/28/2014.] (Entered: 11/07/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 11/5/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      STANDING ORDER by Judge John F. Walter. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT CONTROLS THE CASE AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. (bp) [Transferred from California Central on 7/28/2014.] (Entered: 11/07/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 11/6/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF FILING FEE DUE on Pro Hac Vice Application mailed to attorney George A Hanson for Plaintiffs Kerwyn Kirton, Daniel Majeski, Robert Mullings. Pro Hac Vice application has not been received by the court. Please return your completed Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case, form G-64, or a copy of the Notice of Electronic Filing of your application and the $325.00 fee and this notice immediately. Out-of-state federal government attorneys who are not employed by the U.S. Department of Justice are required to file a Pro Hac Vice application;no filing fee is required. You have been removed as counsel of record from this case for failure to submit this filing fee. (et) [Transferred from California Central on 7/28/2014.] (Entered: 11/06/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 11/1/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et) [Transferred from California Central on 7/28/2014.] (Entered: 11/06/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 11/1/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs Kerwyn Kirton, Daniel Majeski, Robert Mullings. (et) (mg). [Transferred from California Central on 7/28/2014.] (Entered: 11/06/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 11/1/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              COMPLAINT against Defendants DIRECTV Inc, DIRECTV LLC, DTV Home Services II LLC, DirectSat USA LLC, Mastec North America Inc. Case assigned to Judge John F. Walter for all further proceedings. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar. (Filing fee $ 400 PAID.) Jury Demanded., filed by Plaintiffs Kerwyn Kirton, Robert Mullings, Daniel Majeski. [Summons not Issued on 11/1/2013.] (et) (mg). (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/14/2013: # 1 Notice of Assignment, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet) (mg). [Transferred from California Central on 7/28/2014.] (Entered: 11/06/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                This case has been viewed 151 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                 
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Need Password Help?