Torres v. United Service Workers Union Local 74 et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Eastern District Court, Case No. 2:13-cv-06864

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated August 1, 2017 at 9:22 PM DT (4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Jorge Torres, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Edward Lee Sample , II

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 10/14/2014, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Edward Lee Sample, II +1 631 756 0400 +1 631 756 0547

Toggle Switch Represented by Frank & Associates PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Neil Michael. Frank +1 631 756 0400 +1 631 756 0547 nfrank@laborlaws.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Peter Arcadio Romero +1 631 756 0400 +1 631 756 0547 promero@laborlaws.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jon Alec Stockman +1 212 608 1178 +1 212 608 2913 jstockman@laborlaws.com
v.
No Logo Pinelawn Cemetary, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Duane Morris LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Eve Irene Klein +1 212 692 1000 +1 212 692 1020 Eiklein@duanemorris.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Eric William Ruden +1 212 471 1893

Toggle Switch Represented by O'Dwyer & Bernstein, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Zachary Richard Harkin +1 212 571 7100 +1 212 571 7124 zharkin@odblaw.com
No Logo United Service Workers Union Local 74, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by O'Dwyer & Bernstein, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Zachary Richard Harkin +1 212 571 7100 +1 212 571 7124 zharkin@odblaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joy Kim Mele +1 212 571 7100 +1 212 571 7124 jmele@odblaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gary Silverman +1 212 571 7100 +1 212 571 7124 gsilverman@odblaw.com
  Entries (60) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 8/5/2015, Entered: None Order Dismissing Case
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 8/3/2015, Entered: None Stipulation of Dismissal
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 7/31/2015, Entered: None Withdraw as Attorney
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 7/31/2015, Entered: None Status Conference
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 7/15/2015, Entered: None Letter
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 7/14/2015, Entered: None Letter
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 7/14/2015, Entered: None Stay
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 7/13/2015, Entered: None More Definite Statement
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 6/19/2015, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Document
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 6/17/2015, Entered: None Letter
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 6/15/2015, Entered: None Letter
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 6/8/2015, Entered: None
                        AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION in Opposition re 44 MOTION to Dismiss of Eric Ruden filed by Pinelawn Cemetary. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - April 7, 2015 Email, # 2 Exhibit B - Emails from Plaintiff's Counsel, # 3 Exhibit C - April 15, 2015, # 4 Exhibit D - April 15, 2015 Email from Pinelawn's Counsel, # 5 Exhibit E - April 20, 2015 Email, # 6 Exhibit F - April 23, 2015 Email, # 7 Exhibit G - Transcript) (Klein, Eve) (Entered: 06/08/2015)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 6/8/2015, Entered: None
                          RESPONSE in Opposition re 44 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Pinelawn Cemetary. (Klein, Eve) (Entered: 06/08/2015)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 6/1/2015, Entered: None
                            RESPONSE to Motion re 44 MOTION to Dismiss filed by United Service Workers Union Local 74. (Mele, Joy) (Entered: 06/01/2015)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 5/28/2015, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Document
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 5/19/2015, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Document
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 5/14/2015, Entered: None Dismiss
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 5/13/2015, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Document
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 5/12/2015, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 3/12/2015, Entered: None Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 3/9/2015, Entered: None Reply in Support
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 3/5/2015, Entered: None
                                            RESPONSE in Opposition re 38 MOTION to Compel a Discovery Response filed by Jorge Torres. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A) (Barnhorn, David) (Entered: 03/05/2015)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 3/3/2015, Entered: None Compel
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 1/15/2015, Entered: None Status Conference
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 12/17/2014, Entered: None Adjourn Conference
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 11/12/2014, Entered: None Scheduling Order
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 11/12/2014, Entered: None Pretrial Conference - Initial
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 11/10/2014, Entered: None Proposed Scheduling Order
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 11/6/2014, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 10/23/2014, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 10/17/2014, Entered: None Answer
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 10/9/2014, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Answer
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 10/9/2014, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 10/8/2014, Entered: None Answer
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 9/30/2014, Entered: None Pretrial Order
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 9/26/2014, Entered: None Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 3/28/2014, Entered: None
                                                                          MEMORANDUM in Support re 15 Notice of Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (2) Declining to exercise supplemental jurisdiction over Plaintiffs Second, Third, and Fourth Causes of Action pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1367(c); and (3) Granting Defendant such other relief DEFENDANT PINELAWN CEMETERYS REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION TO DISMISS filed by Pinelawn Cemetary. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Compendium of Unreported Cases) (Klein, Eve) (Entered: 03/28/2014)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 3/28/2014, Entered: None
                                                                            REPLY to Response to Motion re 13 First Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Memorandum of Law in Reply to Plaintiff's Opposition to Local 74's Motion to Dismiss filed by United Service Workers Union Local 74. (Mele, Joy) (Entered: 03/28/2014)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 2/28/2014, Entered: None
                                                                              AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION in Opposition re 13 First Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Jorge Torres. (Sample, Edward) (Entered: 02/28/2014)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 2/28/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 13 First Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Jorge Torres. (Sample, Edward) (Entered: 02/28/2014)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 2/28/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                  AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION in Opposition re 15 Notice of Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (2) Declining to exercise supplemental jurisdiction over Plaintiffs Second, Third, and Fourth Causes of Action pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1367(c); and (3) Granting Defendant such other relief filed by Jorge Torres. (Sample, Edward) (Entered: 02/28/2014)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 2/28/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                    MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 15 Notice of Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (2) Declining to exercise supplemental jurisdiction over Plaintiffs Second, Third, and Fourth Causes of Action pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1367(c); and (3) Granting Defendant such other relief filed by Jorge Torres. (Sample, Edward) (Entered: 02/28/2014)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 2/5/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                      Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 15 Notice of Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (2) Declining to exercise supplemental jurisdiction over Plaintiffs Second, Third, and Fourth Causes of Action pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1367(c); and (3) Granting Defendant such other relief, 13 First Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Jorge Torres. (Sample, Edward) (Entered: 02/05/2014)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 1/31/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                        MEMORANDUM in Support re 15 Notice of Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (2) Declining to exercise supplemental jurisdiction over Plaintiffs Second, Third, and Fourth Causes of Action pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1367(c); and (3) Granting Defendant such other relief filed by Pinelawn Cemetary. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix Compendium of Unreported Cases) (Klein, Eve) (Entered: 01/31/2014)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 1/31/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                          AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION in Support re 15 Notice of Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (2) Declining to exercise supplemental jurisdiction over Plaintiffs Second, Third, and Fourth Causes of Action pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1367(c); and (3) Granting Defendant such other relief filed by Pinelawn Cemetary. (Klein, Eve) (Entered: 01/31/2014)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 1/31/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                            Notice of Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (2) Declining to exercise supplemental jurisdiction over Plaintiffs Second, Third, and Fourth Causes of Action pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1367(c); and (3) Granting Defendant such other relief as this Court may deem just and proper by Pinelawn Cemetary. (Klein, Eve) (Entered: 01/31/2014)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 1/31/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                              Declaration of Joy K. Mele in Support Re: 13 Motion to Dismiss by United Service Workers Union Local 74. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A to the Declaration of Joy K. Mele, # 2 Exhibit B to the Declaration of Joy K. Mele, # 3 Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss) (Mele, Joy) Modified on 2/4/2014 to correct entry information. (Valle, Christine). (Entered: 01/31/2014)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 1/31/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                First Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by United Service Workers Union Local 74. (Mele, Joy) (Entered: 01/31/2014)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 12/31/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by Joy K. Mele on behalf of United Service Workers Union Local 74 (aty to be noticed) (Mele, Joy) (Entered: 12/31/2013)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 12/31/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                    Letter requesting extension of time to answer by Pinelawn Cemetary, United Service Workers Union Local 74 (Harkin, Zachary) (Entered: 12/31/2013)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 12/31/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                      NOTICE of Appearance by Zachary Richard Harkin on behalf of Pinelawn Cemetary, United Service Workers Union Local 74 (aty to be noticed) (Harkin, Zachary) (Entered: 12/31/2013)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 12/30/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                        Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint upon Consent by Pinelawn Cemetary. (Klein, Eve) (Entered: 12/30/2013)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 12/30/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                          NOTICE of Appearance by Eric William Ruden on behalf of Pinelawn Cemetary (aty to be noticed) (Ruden, Eric) (Entered: 12/30/2013)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 12/30/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                            NOTICE of Appearance by Eve Irene Klein on behalf of Pinelawn Cemetary (aty to be noticed) (Klein, Eve) (Entered: 12/30/2013)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 12/19/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                              SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jorge Torres. Pinelawn Cemetary served on 12/10/2013, answer due 12/31/2013. (Sample, Edward) (Entered: 12/19/2013)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 12/19/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jorge Torres. United Service Workers Union Local 74 served on 12/12/2013, answer due 1/2/2014. (Sample, Edward) (Entered: 12/19/2013)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 12/9/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                  In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link:http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Danisi, Cristine) (Entered: 12/09/2013)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 12/6/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                    Summons Issued as to Pinelawn Cemetary. (Danisi, Cristine) (Entered: 12/09/2013)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 12/6/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                      Summons Issued as to United Service Workers Union Local 74. (Danisi, Cristine) (Entered: 12/09/2013)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 12/6/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                        COMPLAINT against All Defendants Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -No,, filed by Jorge Torres. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Danisi, Cristine) (Entered: 12/09/2013)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                          Statistics

                                                                                                                          This case has been viewed 92 times.

                                                                                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                          Space
                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                           
                                                                                                                          PlainSite
                                                                                                                          Sign Up
                                                                                                                          Need Password Help?