August et al v. Bridgeport et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Connecticut District Court, Case No. 3:10-cv-00456

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo George August, Plaintiff
No Logo Robert August, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of John R. Williams

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John R. Williams +1 203 562 9931 +1 203 776 9494 jrw@johnrwilliams.com
v.
No Logo Christopher Borona, Defendant
No Logo City of Bridgeport, Connecticut, Defendant
Officially listed as "City of Bridgeport"

Toggle Switch Represented by City of Bridgeport

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Betsy Edwards +1 203 576 3940 +1 203 576 8252 betsy.edwards@bridgeportct.gov
No Logo John Holtz, Defendant
No Logo Joseph Gallagher, Defendant
No Logo Kimberly A. Biehn, Defendant
No Logo Michael Sigrist, Defendant
  Entries (52) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 9/30/2014, Entered: None Judgment
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 9/26/2014, Entered: None Order on Motion for Summary Judgment
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 5/6/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
      Minute Entry. Proceedings held before Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer: Motion Hearing held on 5/6/2014, taking under advisement 44 Motion for Summary Judgment Total Time: 26 minutes(Court Reporter Diana Huntington.) (Gutierrez, Y.) (Entered: 05/06/2014)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 5/1/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
        NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE.ALL PERSONS ENTERING THE COURTHOUSE MUST PRESENT PHOTO IDENTIFICATION. RESET FROM 5/5/2014 at 3:00 PM, Motion Hearing re: 44 MOTION for Summary Judgment.( Motion Hearing set for 5/6/2014 10:00 AM in Courtroom Two, 915 Lafayette Blvd., Bridgeport, CT before Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer) (Gutierrez, Y.) (Entered: 05/01/2014)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 4/17/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
          NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE.ALL PERSONS ENTERING THE COURTHOUSE MUST PRESENT PHOTO IDENTIFICATION. Motion Hearing re: 44 MOTION for Summary Judgment.( Motion Hearing set for 5/5/2014 03:00 PM in Courtroom Two, 915 Lafayette Blvd., Bridgeport, CT before Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer) (Gutierrez, Y.) (Entered: 04/17/2014)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 10/28/2011, Entered: None
            RESPONSE to Plaintiff's Statement of Material Facts in Opposition of 44 Summary Judgment filed by Kimberly A. Biehn, Christopher Borona, City of Bridgeport, Joseph Gallagher, John Holtz, Michael Sigrist. (Edwards, Betsy) Modified on 11/4/2011 to edit text and link document. (Blue, A.). (Entered: 10/28/2011)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 10/28/2011, Entered: None
              REPLY to Response to 44 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Kimberly A. Biehn, Christopher Borona, City of Bridgeport, Joseph Gallagher, John Holtz, Michael Sigrist. (Edwards, Betsy) (Entered: 10/28/2011)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 10/17/2011, Entered: None
                Memorandum in Opposition re 44 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by George August, Robert August. (Attachments: # 1 Statement of Material Facts, # 2 Deposition Transcript of George August, # 3 Legislative History)(Williams, John) (Entered: 10/17/2011)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 9/30/2011, Entered: None
                  MOTION for Summary Judgment by Kimberly A. Biehn, Christopher Borona, City of Bridgeport, Joseph Gallagher, John Holtz, Michael Sigrist.Responses due by 10/21/2011 (Attachments: # 1 Statement of Material Facts, # 2 Memorandum in Support, # 3 Exhibit A-L)(Edwards, Betsy) (Entered: 09/30/2011)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 8/29/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                    ORDER granting in part 42 Motion for Extension of Time until October 3, 2011 to file a dispositive motion. If no dispositive motion is filed, the parties shall file their joint trial memorandum by October 3, 2011. This case shall be trial ready November, 2011. No further extensions shall be granted. Signed by Judge Dominic J. Squatrito on 8/29/11. (Pike, C.) (Entered: 08/29/2011)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 8/26/2011, Entered: None
                      MOTION for Extension of Time until October 2, 2011 to File Dispositive Motions by Kimberly A. Biehn, Christopher Borona, City of Bridgeport, Joseph Gallagher, John Holtz, Michael Sigrist. (Edwards, Betsy) (Entered: 08/26/2011)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 7/13/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                        ORDER granting in part 40 Motion for Extension of Time. The parties shall file their dispositive motion by September 2, 2011. If no dispositive motion is filed, the parties shall file their joint trial memorandum by September 23, 2011. This case shall be trial ready October, 2011. Signed by Judge Dominic J. Squatrito on 7/13/11. (Pike, C.) (Entered: 07/13/2011)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 7/12/2011, Entered: None
                          MOTION for Extension of Time until 9/25/2011 Set Deadlines/Hearings by Kimberly A. Biehn, Christopher Borona, City of Bridgeport, Joseph Gallagher, John Holtz, Michael Sigrist. (Edwards, Betsy) (Entered: 07/12/2011)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 4/18/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                            Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Thomas P. Smith: Telephonic Status Conference held on 4/18/2011. 30 minutes (Keefe, B.) (Entered: 04/18/2011)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 4/18/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                              ORDER. A telephonic status conference was held with counsel today, at the conclusion of which Judge Smith reiterated his earlier turnover order (Dkt. #35) in view of plaintiff's presumptively valid permits, licenses, and privileges. Signed by Judge Thomas P. Smith on April 18, 2011. (Keefe, B.) (Entered: 04/18/2011)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 4/12/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                ORDER granting in part 36 Motion for Modification of Scheduling Order. All discovery shall be completed by June 30, 2011. Dispostive motions shall be filed by July 25, 2011 and if no dispositive motions are filed, the parties shall file their joint trial memorandum by July 25, 2011. This case shall be trial ready August, 2011. Signed by Judge Dominic J. Squatrito on 4/12/11. (Pike, C.) (Entered: 04/12/2011)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 4/8/2011, Entered: None
                                  MOTION for Modification of Scheduling Order by Kimberly A. Biehn, Christopher Borona, City of Bridgeport, Joseph Gallagher, John Holtz, Michael Sigrist. (Edwards, Betsy) (Entered: 04/08/2011)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 4/7/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                    ORDER granting 33 Motion for Order. The court, having been advised that there is no objection thereto, hereby GRANTS the pending motion upon agreement of counsel. The seized property shall be returned forthwith. Signed by Judge Thomas P. Smith on April 7, 2011. (Hyne, J.) (Entered: 04/07/2011)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 4/7/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                      ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Thomas P. Smith for Referral of Motion, 33 Consent MOTION for Immediate Return of Property Order. Signed by Judge Dominic J. Squatrito on 4/7/11. Motions referred to Thomas P. Smith(Pike, C.) (Entered: 04/07/2011)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 4/6/2011, Entered: None
                                        Consent MOTION for Immediate Return of Property Order by George August, Robert August. (Williams, John) (Entered: 04/06/2011)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 4/6/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                          Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Thomas P. Smith: Settlement Conference held on 4/6/2011. Total Time: 1 hours and 30 minutes (Hyne, J.) (Entered: 04/06/2011)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 4/6/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                            ORDER. A settlement conference was held. Progress has been made. Plaintiff is filing a motion (absent objection) for the return of seized property, which the parties anticipate will be referred to the magistrate, who will act on it as part of the projected settlement. Signed by Judge Thomas P. Smith on April 6, 2011. (Hyne, J.) (Entered: 04/06/2011)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 3/2/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                              NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. ALL PERSONS ENTERING THE COURTHOUSE MUST PRESENT PHOTO IDENTIFICATION. Settlement Conference set for 4/6/2011 at 10:00 AM in West Courtroom, 450 Main St., Hartford, CT before Judge Thomas P. Smith. Counsel must be accompanied by appropriate persons with authority to settle, including insurance adjusters. SEE ATTACHED Nick v. Morgan's Foods decision. SEE ALSO ATTACHED ORDER requiring each party to submit an ex parte statement at least 2 days prior to the conference. (Attachments: # 1 Nick v. Morgan's Foods decision) (Hyne, J.) (Entered: 03/02/2011)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 2/10/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Thomas P. Smith for Settlement Conference. Signed by Judge Dominic J. Squatrito on 2/10/11. (Pike, C.) (Entered: 02/10/2011)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 2/10/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                  ORDER granting in part 27 Motion for Extension of Time until April 8, 2011 to file a dispositive motion. If no dispositive motion is filed, the parties shall file a joint trial memorandum by April 8, 2011. This case shall be trial ready May, 2011. Signed by Judge Dominic J. Squatrito on 2/10/11. (Pike, C.) (Entered: 02/10/2011)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 2/9/2011, Entered: None
                                                    MOTION for Extension of Time until April 9, 2011 by Kimberly A. Biehn, Christopher Borona, City of Bridgeport, Joseph Gallagher, John Holtz, Michael Sigrist. (Edwards, Betsy) (Entered: 02/09/2011)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 9/24/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                      ORDER OF TRANSFER. Case reassigned to Judge Dominic J. Squatrito for all further proceedings. Signed by Clerk on 9/24/10. (Johnson, D.) (Entered: 09/24/2010)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 9/9/2010, Entered: None
                                                        RESPONSE TO 24 Order to Show Cause by John Holtz, Joseph Gallagher, Kimberly A. Biehn, Michael Sigrist, Christopher Borona, City of Bridgeport filed by John Holtz, Joseph Gallagher, Kimberly A. Biehn, Michael Sigrist, Christopher Borona, City of Bridgeport. (Edwards, Betsy) (Entered: 09/09/2010)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 9/9/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                          ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re: why defendant's counsel should not be sanctioned for failure to participate in the filing of a Status Report. Show Cause Response due by 9/23/2010. Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 9/9/2010. (Simpson, T.) (Entered: 09/09/2010)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 9/2/2010, Entered: None
                                                            STATUS REPORT by George August, Robert August. (Williams, John) (Entered: 09/02/2010)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 9/1/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                              NOTICE TO COUNSEL/PRO SE LITIGANTS: Counsel and Pro Se Litigants are reminded that an initial Joint Status Report in this case was due on 7/21/2010, with subsequent Status Reports due every 90 days thereafter. A Joint Status Report of Counsel must be filed within 14 days of this Notice. Failure to file by this deadline may result in sanctions against counsel for failure to comply with the courts Order. SO ORDERED by Judge Janet C. Hall on 9/1/2010. (DeRubeis, B.) (Entered: 09/01/2010)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 7/22/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                ORDER granting for good cause 18 Motion to Set Aside Default; ORDER denying as moot 20 Motion for Default Judgment. SO ORDERED by Judge Janet C. Hall on 7/22/2010. (DeRubeis, B.) (Entered: 07/22/2010)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 7/21/2010, Entered: None
                                                                  MOTION for Default Judgment as to all defendants by George August, Robert August. (Williams, John) (Entered: 07/21/2010)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 7/21/2010, Entered: None
                                                                    ANSWER to 1 Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by Kimberly A. Biehn, Christopher Borona, City of Bridgeport, Joseph Gallagher, John Holtz, Michael Sigrist.(Edwards, Betsy) (Entered: 07/21/2010)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 7/21/2010, Entered: None
                                                                      MOTION to Set Aside Default by Kimberly A. Biehn, Christopher Borona, City of Bridgeport, Joseph Gallagher, John Holtz, Michael Sigrist. (Edwards, Betsy) (Entered: 07/21/2010)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 7/20/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                        ORDER granting 13 Motion for Default Entry 55(a). The court extended the time to answer to 6/28/2010 and yet, no answer was filed. Motion for default judgment due by 8/19/2010. A Motion for Default Judgment pursuant to FRCP 55(b) shall be filed or this action will be dismissed by the Clerk pursuant to Rule 41(b) FRCP. SO ORDERED by Judge Janet C. Hall on 7/19/2010. (DeRubeis, B.) (Entered: 07/20/2010)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 7/15/2010, Entered: None
                                                                          RESPONSE re 14 MOTION for Extension of Time until August 14, 2010 Respond to Discovery Requests filed by George August, Robert August. (Williams, John) (Entered: 07/15/2010)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 7/15/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                            ORDER granting 14 MOTION for Extension of Time until August 14, 2010 Respond to Discovery Requests by Kimberly A. Biehn, Christopher Borona, Joseph Gallagher, John Holtz, Michael Sigrist. SO ORDERED by Judge Janet C. Hall on 7/15/2010. (DeRubeis, B.) (Entered: 07/15/2010)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 7/14/2010, Entered: None
                                                                              MOTION for Extension of Time until August 14, 2010 Respond to Discovery Requests by Kimberly A. Biehn, Christopher Borona, Joseph Gallagher, John Holtz, Michael Sigrist. (Edwards, Betsy) (Entered: 07/14/2010)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 7/14/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                MOTION for Default Entry 55(a) as to all defendants by George August, Robert August. (Williams, John) (Entered: 07/14/2010)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 6/1/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                  ORDER granting 11 MOTION for Extension of Time until June 28, 2010 to Respond to Plaintiff's 1 Complaint by Kimberly A. Biehn, Christopher Borona, City of Bridgeport, Joseph Gallagher, John Holtz, Michael Sigrist. SO ORDERED by Judge Janet C. Hall on 5/29/2010. (DeRubeis, B.) (Entered: 06/01/2010)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 5/28/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                    MOTION for Extension of Time until June 28, 2010 to Respond to Plaintiff's 1 Complaint by Kimberly A. Biehn, Christopher Borona, City of Bridgeport, Joseph Gallagher, John Holtz, Michael Sigrist. (Edwards, Betsy) Modified on 6/1/2010 TO CREATE LINK TO DOC #1 (Simpson, T.). (Entered: 05/28/2010)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 4/21/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                      SCHEDULING ORDER re: 9 Joint REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. Discovery due by 1/15/2011 Dispositive Motions due by 2/15/2011 Status Report due by 7/21/2010 Trial Brief due by 2/15/2011. Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 4/21/2010. (Simpson, T.) (Entered: 04/21/2010)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 4/19/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                        Joint REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Williams, John) (Entered: 04/19/2010)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 4/14/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                          NOTICE of Appearance by Betsy Edwards on behalf of Kimberly A. Biehn, Christopher Borona, City of Bridgeport, Joseph Gallagher, John Holtz, Michael Sigrist (Edwards, Betsy) (Entered: 04/14/2010)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 4/13/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                            SUMMONS Returned Executed by George August, Robert August. Joseph Gallagher served on 4/11/2010, answer due 5/2/2010. (Attachments: # 1 Gallagher-Summons, # 2 Gallagher-Marshal's Return)(Williams, John) (Entered: 04/13/2010)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 4/9/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                              SUMMONS Returned Executed by George August, Robert August. Kimberly A. Biehn served on 4/5/2010, answer due 4/26/2010; Christopher Borona served on 4/5/2010, answer due 4/26/2010; City of Bridgeport served on 4/5/2010, answer due 4/26/2010; Michael Sigrist served on 4/5/2010, answer due 4/26/2010. (Attachments: # 1 City Bpt.-Summons, # 2 City Bpt.-Marshal's Return, # 3 Biehn-Summons, # 4 Beihn-Marshal's Return, # 5 Borona-Summons, # 6 Borona-Marshal's Return, # 7 Sigrist-Summons, # 8 Sigrist-Marshal's Return)(Williams, John) (Entered: 04/09/2010)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 3/25/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                NOTICE of Appearance by John R. Williams on behalf of George August, Robert August (Malone, P.) (Entered: 03/26/2010)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 3/25/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                  PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 3/25/10. (Malone, P.) (Entered: 03/26/2010)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 3/25/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                    ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER. Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 3/25/10. (Malone, P.) (Entered: 03/26/2010)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 3/25/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                      Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Motions to Dismiss due on 6/25/10; Amended Pleadings due by 5/24/2010; Discovery due by 9/24/2010; Dispositive Motions due by 10/24/2010. Signed by Clerk on 3/25/10. (Malone, P.) (Entered: 03/26/2010)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 3/25/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                        COMPLAINT against Kimberly A. Biehn, Christopher Borona, City of Bridgeport, Joseph Gallagher, John Holtz, Michael Sigrist ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number N029958), filed by George August, Robert August.(Malone, P.) (Entered: 03/26/2010)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                          Statistics

                                                                                                          This case has been viewed 51 times.

                                                                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                          Space
                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                           
                                                                                                          PlainSite
                                                                                                          Sign Up
                                                                                                          Need Password Help?