District Appellate Supreme
Federal
New York Southern District Court Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit United States Supreme Court

Segarra v. The Federal Reserve Bank of Ne
Appeal Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit, Case No. 14-1714

Tags
Last Updated October 21, 2019 at 2:38 PM DT (2 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Carmen M. Segarra, Plaintiff-Appellant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Linda J. Stengle +1 610 367 1604
No Logo Johnathon Kim, Defendant-Appellee

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David Gross +1 212 720 2356
Space Thomas M. Noone +1 212 720 7743
No Logo Michael Koh, Defendant-Appellee

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David Gross +1 212 720 2356
Space Thomas M. Noone +1 212 720 7743
No Logo Michael Silva, Defendant-Appellee

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David Gross +1 212 720 2356
Space Richard F. Hans +1 212 335 4530
Space Thomas M. Noone +1 212 720 7743
Federal Reserve Bank Of New York Federal Reserve Bank Of New York, Defendant-Appellee
Officially listed as "The Federal Reserve Bank Of New York"

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David Gross +1 212 720 2356
Space Thomas M. Noone +1 212 720 7743
Nature of Suit 3890 - Statutes: Other
Case Type Civil
Lower Court Case https://ecf.nysd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?caseNumber=13-cv-7173
Lower Court Case https://ecf.nysd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?caseNumber=13-cv-7173
  Entries (104) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 81
    LREF
    Blank 80
      LREF
      Blank 79
        LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76
          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73
            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72
              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
              Blank 71
                LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64
                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00204368545 Filed: 10/15/2015, Entered: None ?
                  JUDGMENT MANDATE, ISSUED.[1620446] [14-1714]
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63
                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00204328346 Filed: 9/23/2015, Entered: None ?
                      JUDGMENT, FILED.[1605282] [14-1714]
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Blank 62
                          LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00204327407 Filed: 9/23/2015, Entered: None ?
                          NEW CASE MANAGER, Connie Mazariego, ASSIGNED.[1604914] [14-1714]
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00204327404 Filed: 9/23/2015, Entered: None ?
                            NON- DISPOSITIVE SUMMARY ORDER, the district court judgment is affirmed, by ALK, BDP, RCW, FILED.[1604913] [14-1714]
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Blank 60
                                LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00204327389 Filed: 9/23/2015, Entered: None ?Court Filing
                                OPINION, Concurring, by Judge Kearse, FILED.[1604908] [14-1714]
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00204327360 Filed: 9/23/2015, Entered: None ?
                                  OPINION, the district court judgment is affirmed, per curiam, by ALK, BDP, RCW, FILED.[1604898] [14-1714]
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Blank  Filed: 4/20/2015, Entered: None ?
                                    CASE, to ALK, BDP, RCW, C.JJ., SUBMITTED.[1489019] [14-1714]
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00203951287 Filed: 3/17/2015, Entered: None ?
                                      SUBMITTED NOTICE, to attorneys/parties, TRANSMITTED.[1462923] [14-1714]
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Blank  Filed: 2/24/2015, Entered: None ?
                                        CASE CALENDARING, on submission for 04/20/2015, SET.[1445349] [14-1714]
                                          LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55
                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                            Blank  Filed: 2/3/2015, Entered: None ?
                                            CASE CALENDARING, for the week of 04/20/2015, PROPOSED.[1429155] [14-1714]
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 54
                                                LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00203850530 Filed: 1/28/2015, Entered: None ?
                                                REPLY BRIEF, on behalf of Appellant Carmen M. Segarra, FILED. Service date 01/28/2015 by US mail, CM/ECF. [1424649] [14-1714]
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00203848795 Filed: 1/27/2015, Entered: None ?
                                                  ORAL ARGUMENT STATEMENT LR 34.1 (a), on behalf of filer Attorney Linda J. Stengle, Esq. for Appellant Carmen M. Segarra, FILED. Service date 01/27/2015 by CM/ECF. [1423969] [14-1714]
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00203848738 Filed: 1/27/2015, Entered: None ?
                                                    ORAL ARGUMENT STATEMENT LR 34.1 (a), on behalf of filer Attorney Mr. Thomas M. Noone, Esq. for Appellee Federal Reserve Bank of New York, Johnathon Kim, Michael Koh and Michael Silva, FILED. Service date 01/27/2015 by CM/ECF. [1423950] [14-1714]
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51
                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00203825934 Filed: 1/14/2015, Entered: None ?
                                                        MOTION ORDER, granting motion to file late [72] filed by Appellee Federal Reserve Bank of New York, FILED. [1415247][76] [14-1714]
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Blank 50
                                                            LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00203825090 Filed: 1/13/2015, Entered: None ?
                                                            BRIEF, on behalf of Appellee Federal Reserve Bank of New York, Johnathon Kim, Michael Koh and Michael Silva, FILED. Service date 01/13/2015 by CM/ECF. [1414924] [14-1714]
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49
                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00203825084 Filed: 1/13/2015, Entered: None ?
                                                                MOTION, to file late, on behalf of Appellee Federal Reserve Bank of New York, FILED. Service date 01/13/2015 by CM/ECF. [1414923] [14-1714]
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48
                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00203819567 Filed: 1/12/2015, Entered: None ?
                                                                    NOTICE, to Appellees Federal Reserve Bank of New York, Johnathon Kim, Michael Koh and Michael Silva, for failure to file a brief, SENT.[1412754] [14-1714]
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00203757941 Filed: 12/9/2014, Entered: None ?
                                                                      APPENDIX, volume 2 of 2, (pp. 180-451), on behalf of Appellant Carmen M. Segarra, FILED. Service date 12/09/2014 by US mail, CM/ECF.[1389316] [14-1714]
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00203757924 Filed: 12/9/2014, Entered: None ?
                                                                        APPENDIX, volume 1 of 2, (pp. 1-179), on behalf of Appellant Carmen M. Segarra, FILED. Service date 12/09/2014 by US mail, CM/ECF.[1389310] [14-1714]
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00203757907 Filed: 12/9/2014, Entered: None ?
                                                                          BRIEF & SPECIAL APPENDIX, on behalf of Appellant Carmen M. Segarra, FILED. Service date 12/09/2014 by US mail, CM/ECF. [1389302] [14-1714]
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44
                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00203729328 Filed: 11/25/2014, Entered: None ?
                                                                              MOTION ORDER, granting motion to extend time to file brief and appendix until 12/09/2014; appeal is dismissed effective 12/09/2014 unless a brief is filed by that date [55] filed by Appellant Carmen M. Segarra, by RKW, FILED. [1378365][60] [14-1714]
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Blank 43
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank  Filed: 11/20/2014, Entered: None ?
                                                                                  CURED DEFECTIVE Motion to extend time [54], [55], on behalf of Appellant Carmen M. Segarra, FILED.[1375243] [14-1714]
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank 42
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00203720833 Filed: 11/20/2014, Entered: None ?
                                                                                      MOTION, to extend time, on behalf of Appellant Carmen M. Segarra, FILED. Service date 11/20/2014 by CM/ECF. [1375065] [14-1714]
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Blank 41
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00203720550 Filed: 11/20/2014, Entered: None ?
                                                                                          DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Motion to extend time, [53], on behalf of Appellant Carmen M. Segarra, FILED.[1374960] [14-1714]
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Blank 40
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Blank  Filed: 11/20/2014, Entered: None ?
                                                                                              MOTION, for continuance of appeal, on behalf of Appellant Carmen M. Segarra, FILED. Service date 11/20/2014 by CM/ECF. [1374868] [14-1714]
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39
                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                  Blank  Filed: 10/27/2014, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                  ATTORNEY, Richard Hans, [51], in place of attorney David Gross and Thomas Noone, SUBSTITUTED.[1354590] [14-1714]
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Blank 38
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00203666449 Filed: 10/27/2014, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                      NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Michael Silva, FILED. Service date 10/27/2014 by CM/ECF. [1354230] [14-1714]
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Blank 37
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00203564792 Filed: 10/22/2014, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                          LETTER, informing Court that counsel will be substituted for Appellee Michael Silva, on behalf of Appellee Federal Reserve Bank of New York, Johnathon Kim and Michael Koh, RECEIVED. Service date 10/22/2014 by CM/ECF.[1351629] [14-1714]--[Edited 10/27/2014 by DE]
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00203560196 Filed: 10/21/2014, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                            TRANSCRIPT STATUS UPDATE LETTER, dated 10/21/2014, on behalf of Appellant Carmen M. Segarra , informing court of transcript delays, RECEIVED. Service date 10/21/2014 by CM/ECF.[1349820] [14-1714]
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Blank 35
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00203560177 Filed: 10/21/2014, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                EXPEDITED SCHEDULING ORDER re: Appellant's Brief due date as 11/25/2014; Joint Appendix due date as 11/25/2014, Appellees' Brief due date as 12/30/2014, FILED.[1349813] [14-1714]
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Blank 34
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00203529794 Filed: 10/7/2014, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                    TRANSCRIPT STATUS UPDATE LETTER, dated 10/07/2014, on behalf of Appellant Carmen M. Segarra , informing court of transcript delays, RECEIVED. Service date 10/07/2014 by CM/ECF.[1338109] [14-1714]
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00203500071 Filed: 9/23/2014, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                      TRANSCRIPT STATUS UPDATE LETTER, dated 09/23/2014, on behalf of Appellant Carmen M. Segarra , informing court of transcript delays, RECEIVED. Service date 09/23/2014 by CM/ECF.[1327002] [14-1714]
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00203470116 Filed: 9/9/2014, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                        TRANSCRIPT STATUS UPDATE LETTER, dated 09/09/2014, on behalf of Appellant Carmen M. Segarra , informing court of transcript delays, RECEIVED. Service date 09/09/2014 by CM/ECF.[1315715] [14-1714]
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00203440993 Filed: 8/26/2014, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                          TRANSCRIPT STATUS UPDATE LETTER, dated 08/26/2014, on behalf of Appellant Carmen M. Segarra , informing court of transcript delays, RECEIVED. Service date 08/26/2014 by CM/ECF.[1304780] [14-1714]
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30
                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00203410110 Filed: 8/12/2014, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                              TRANSCRIPT STATUS UPDATE LETTER, dated 08/12/2014, on behalf of Appellant Carmen M. Segarra , informing court of transcript delays, RECEIVED. Service date 08/12/2014 by CM/ECF.[1293047] [14-1714]
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29
                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00203381771 Filed: 7/29/2014, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                                  TRANSCRIPT STATUS UPDATE LETTER, dated 07/29/2014, on behalf of Appellant Carmen M. Segarra , informing court of transcript delays, RECEIVED. Service date 07/29/2014 by CM/ECF.[1282382] [14-1714]
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28
                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00203352222 Filed: 7/15/2014, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                                      TRANSCRIPT STATUS UPDATE LETTER, dated 07/15/2014, on behalf of Appellant Carmen M. Segarra , informing court of transcript delays, RECEIVED. Service date 07/15/2014 by CM/ECF.[1271208] [14-1714]
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00203326568 Filed: 7/1/2014, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                                        TRANSCRIPT STATUS UPDATE LETTER, dated 07/01/2014, on behalf of Appellant Carmen M. Segarra , informing court of transcript delays, RECEIVED. Service date 07/01/2014 by CM/ECF.[1261604] [14-1714]
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Blank  Filed: 6/18/2014, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                                          CURED DEFECTIVE Form D [34], [35], on behalf of Appellant Carmen M. Segarra, FILED.[1251277] [14-1714]
                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                            Blank  Filed: 6/18/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                            CURED DEFECTIVE Form D [34], [35], on behalf of Appellant Carmen M. Segarra, FILED.[1251277] [14-1714]
                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00203298854 Filed: 6/18/2014, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                                              TRANSCRIPT STATUS UPDATE LETTER, dated 06/17/2014, on behalf of Appellant Carmen M. Segarra , informing court of transcript delays, RECEIVED. Service date 06/18/2014 by CM/ECF, email.[1251259] [14-1714]
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Blank 24
                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00203295302 Filed: 6/17/2014, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                                                  DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Form D, [33], on behalf of Appellant Carmen M. Segarra, FILED.[1249896] [14-1714]
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Blank  Filed: 6/17/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                    FORM D, on behalf of Appellant Carmen M. Segarra, FILED. Service date 06/17/2014 by CM/ECF, email.[1249876] [14-1714]
                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Blank  Filed: 6/10/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                      ATTORNEY, Thomas M. Noone for Johnathon Kim Federal Reserve Bank of New York Michael Silva Michael Koh, in case 14-1714, [30], ADDED.[1244371] [14-1714]
                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Blank  Filed: 6/10/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                        CURED DEFECTIVE Acknowledgment and Notice of Appearance [28], [29], on behalf of Appellee Federal Reserve Bank of New York, Johnathon Kim, Michael Koh and Michael Silva, FILED.[1244292] [14-1714]
                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00203280107 Filed: 6/10/2014, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Federal Reserve Bank of New York, Johnathon Kim, Michael Koh and Michael Silva, FILED. Service date 06/10/2014 by CM/ECF. [1244264] [14-1714]
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00203280084 Filed: 6/10/2014, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                                                            ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Federal Reserve Bank of New York, Johnathon Kim, Michael Koh and Michael Silva, FILED. Service date 06/10/2014 by CM/ECF.[1244255] [14-1714]
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18
                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00203279956 Filed: 6/10/2014, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                                                                DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Acknowledgment and Notice of Appearance, [27], on behalf of Appellee Federal Reserve Bank of New York, Johnathon Kim, Michael Koh and Michael Silva, FILED.[1244207] [14-1714]
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Blank  Filed: 6/10/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                  ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Federal Reserve Bank of New York, Johnathon Kim, Michael Koh and Michael Silva, FILED. Service date 06/10/2014 by CM/ECF.[1244178] [14-1714]
                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16
                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00203271392 Filed: 6/5/2014, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                                                                      NEW CASE MANAGER, Dana Ellwood, ASSIGNED.[1241001] [14-1714]
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Blank  Filed: 6/4/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                        CURED DEFECTIVE Acknowledgment and Notice of Appearance [14], on behalf of Appellant Carmen M. Segarra, FILED.[1240323] [14-1714]
                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00203269386 Filed: 6/4/2014, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                                                                          ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellant Carmen M. Segarra, FILED. Service date 06/04/2014 by CM/ECF.[1240306] [14-1714]
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13
                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00203269275 Filed: 6/4/2014, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                                                                              DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Acknowledgment and Notice of Appearance, [14], on behalf of Appellant Carmen M. Segarra, FILED.[1240253] [14-1714]
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank  Filed: 6/4/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                  ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellant Carmen M. Segarra, FILED. Service date 06/04/2014 by CM/ECF.[1240192] [14-1714]
                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00203269005 Filed: 6/4/2014, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                                                                                      LR 31.2 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellant Carmen M. Segarra, informing Court of proposed due date 12/03/2014, RECEIVED. Service date 06/03/2014 by US mail, email.[1240157] [14-1714]
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00203268694 Filed: 6/4/2014, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                                                                                          FORM D, on behalf of Appellant Carmen M. Segarra, FILED. Service date 06/03/2014 by US mail, email.[1240035] [14-1714]
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00203268684 Filed: 6/4/2014, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                                                                                            FORM C, on behalf of Appellant Carmen M. Segarra, FILED. Service date 06/03/2014 by US mail, email.[1240031] [14-1714]
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00203268228 Filed: 6/4/2014, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER, dated 06/04/2014, dismissing appeal by 6/18/2014 unless Appellant submits Form C and Form D, FILED.[1239849] [14-1714]
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank  Filed: 5/27/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                NON-ADMITTED ATTORNEY, Attorney Linda Jeffries Stengle for Appellant Carmen M. Segarra, orally informed to apply for admission forthwith and submit Addendum A to Notice of Appearance, NOTIFIED.[1234459] [14-1714]
                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00203254026 Filed: 5/20/2014, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                                                                                                  ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[1234453] [14-1714]
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00203254018 Filed: 5/20/2014, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                                                                                                      DISTRICT COURT JUDGMENT, dated 04/24/2014, RECEIVED.[1234451] [14-1714]
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00203254011 Filed: 5/20/2014, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                                                                                                          DISTRICT COURT OPINION, dated 04/23/2014, RECEIVED.[1234448] [14-1714]
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 00203253999 Filed: 5/20/2014, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Carmen M. Segarra, FILED. [1234442] [14-1714]
                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                This case has been viewed 242 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                 
                                                                                                                                                                                                                PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Need Password Help?