Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. v. Pearson
Federal Civil Lawsuit Arkansas Western District Court, Case No. 4:14-cv-04094

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 14, 2019 at 6:00 PM ST (2.4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Citation Section 47 U.S.C. § 0605
Nature of Suit Cable/Satellite TV
  Entries (16) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 1/11/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on January 11, 2016. (mll)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 12/17/2015, Entered: None Notice of Voluntary Dismissal (Party/Case)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 12/16/2015, Entered: None Dismiss Case
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 10/21/2015, Entered: None Final Scheduling Order
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 9/22/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          ORDER declining to adopt 14 Report and Recommendations; denying 7 Motion to Dismiss; granting 9 Motion to Extend time to perfect service, plaintiffs given until 10/5/15 for service. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on September 22, 2015. (cnn)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 2/20/2015, Entered: None Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 2/13/2015, Entered: None Objection to Report and Recommendations
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 1/27/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 9 MOTION to Extend Time to Serve Defendant filed by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc., 7 First MOTION to Dismiss for lack of service filed by Carmenchita Pearson. Objections to R&R due by 2/13/2015. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on January 27, 2015. (mll)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 1/7/2015, Entered: None Response in Support of Motion
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 12/19/2014, Entered: None Leave to File Document
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 12/11/2014, Entered: None Initial Scheduling Order
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 12/9/2014, Entered: None Response to Motion
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 11/24/2014, Entered: None Extend
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 11/24/2014, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 11/6/2014, Entered: None Dismiss
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 9/29/2014, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF

                                  Statistics

                                  This case has been viewed 1 time.

                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                  Space
                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                   
                                  PlainSite
                                  Sign Up
                                  Need Password Help?