United States v. Back
Criminal Case Alaska District Court, Case No. 3:14-cr-00020
District Judge Ralph R. Beistline, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated November 5, 2018 at 10:39 AM ST (2.9 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo James R. Back, Defendant (1)

Toggle Switch Represented by Earl & Earl, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space James R. Back +1 907 262 2225 alldef2014@yahoo.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of Defender Services

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Designation: Public Defender or Community Defender Appointment Jamie McGrady +1 907 646 3400 +1 907 464 3480 jamie_mcgrady@fd.org
TERMINATED: 04/16/2014, Designation: Public Defender or Community Defender Appointment Cara McNamara +1 907 646 3400 +1 907 646 3480 cara_mcnamara@fd.org

Note: Criminal cases with multiple defendants may have several records with the same case number: one record for the master file (all defendants), as well as one record per defendant. It can often be difficult to tell which record is which. Other likely matches for this case include:

  Entries (119) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 157 Filed: 7/18/2018, Entered: None USCA order
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 156 Filed: 7/2/2018, Entered: None USCA order
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 3/6/2015, Entered: None
      USCA Appeal Fees received $505, receipt number ANC010239 as to James R. Back re 109 Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment. (TYM, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 03/09/2015)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 3/2/2015, Entered: None
        Judgment Returned Executed as to James R. Back on 1/9/15. (PXS, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 03/03/2015)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 2/23/2015, Entered: None
          USCA ORDER as to James R. Back re 109 Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment. Filed order (Appellate Commissioner) The motion of the Federal Public Defenders Office to be relieved as counsel of record is GRANTED. Within 28 days after the date of this order, appellant shall: (1) retain counsel who shall file a notice of appearance and make the necessary arrangements to pay the docketing and filing fees of $505.00 to the clerk of the district court and provide proof of payment to this court; or (2) file a motion for appointment of counsel at government expense accompanied by a completed financial affidavit (Form CJA 23); or (3) inform the court in writing of appellants clear and unequivocal request that the court exercise its discretion to permit appellant to proceed on appeal without the assistance of counsel. Appellants motion for release pending appeal is held in abeyance pending appellants compliance with this order. A new briefing schedule shall be established upon compliance with this order. Appellants motions for extensions of time are denied as moot. The Clerk shall amend this courts docket to reflect that Assistant Federal Public Defender Jamie McGrady is no longer appellants counsel of record. The Clerk shall serve this order and a Form CJA 23 on appellant individually at Reg, No. 17586-006, Federal Correctional Institution, P.O. Box 5000, Sheridan, Oregon 97378. (Attachments: # 1 CJA 23)(TYM, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 02/23/2015)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Blank 114 Filed: 1/16/2015, Entered: None
            NOTICE of Change of Address by James Back (PXS, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 01/21/2015)
              LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 12/30/2014, Entered: None
              JUDGE BEISTLINE TEXT ORDER: The Motion to Withdraw as Counsel at Docket 112 as to James R. Back is GRANTED. The Federal Public Defender for the District of Alaska is withdrawn as standby counsel. (CC: FPD/CJA) (Jan, Chambers Staff) (Entered: 12/30/2014)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Blank 112 Filed: 12/29/2014, Entered: None
                MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Jamie McGrady. by James R. Back. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(McGrady, Jamie) (Entered: 12/29/2014)
                  LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 12/23/2014, Entered: None
                  USCA Time Schedule Order as to James R. Back re 109 Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment : Sentence imposed: 16 Months. Transcript ordered by 01/13/2015. Transcript due 02/12/2015. Appellant briefs and excerpts due by 03/24/2015 for James R. Back. Appellee brief due 04/23/2015 for United States of America. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 14 days after service of the answering brief. (TYM, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 12/23/2014)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 12/23/2014, Entered: None
                    USCA Case Number as to James R. Back 14-30265 for 109 Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment filed by James R. Back. (Attachments: # 1 USCA General Information Packet)(TYM, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 12/23/2014)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 12/23/2014, Entered: None
                      NOTICE OF APPEAL by James R. Back Filing fee $ 505. (McGrady, Jamie) (Entered: 12/23/2014)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Sealed Legal Document 108 Filed: 12/17/2014, Entered: None
                        Sealed Statement of Reasons as to James R. Back cc: USM, USPO, Finance (SDW, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 12/17/2014)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 12/17/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                          JUDGMENT as to James R. Back (1), Counts 1-3,4-7: 16 months imprisonment; 1 year supervised release; $400.00 special assessment; $10,000.00 fine; $113,286.00 restitution; $17,240.59 cost of prosecution. Signed by Judge Ralph R. Beistline on 12/16/2014. cc: USM, USPO, Finance (SDW, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 12/17/2014)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 12/16/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                            Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Ralph R. Beistline: Imposition of Sentence held on 12/16/2014 for James R. Back (1), Counts 1-3,4-7: 16 months imprisonment; 1 year supervised release; $400.00 special assessment; $10,000.00 fine; $113,286.00 restitution; $17,240.59 cost of prosecution. cc: USM, USPO, Finance (SDW, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 12/16/2014)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 12/15/2014, Entered: None
                              NOTICE of Filing Letters in Support of Defendant by James R. Back (Attachments: # 1 Appendix Support Letters)(McGrady, Jamie) (Entered: 12/15/2014)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Sealed Legal Document 104 Filed: 12/10/2014, Entered: None
                                SEALED SENTENCING MEMORANDUM SUPPLEMENT as to James R. Back (McGrady, Jamie) (Entered: 12/10/2014)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Blank 103 Filed: 12/10/2014, Entered: None
                                  SENTENCING MEMORANDUM by James R. Back (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(McGrady, Jamie) (Entered: 12/10/2014)
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 12/9/2014, Entered: None
                                    JUDGE BEISTLINE TEXT ORDER as to James R. Back: Motion for One-Day Extension to File Sentencing Memorandum, at docket 101 , is GRANTED. The 12/9/14 Sentencing Memorandum deadline in this matter is extended to 12/10/14. (JLH, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 12/09/2014)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 12/9/2014, Entered: None
                                      UNOPPOSED MOTION for One Day Extension to File Sentencing Memorandum, Filed on Shortened Time by James R. Back. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(McGrady, Jamie) (Entered: 12/09/2014)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Sealed Legal Document 100 Filed: 12/4/2014, Entered: None
                                        SEALED SENTENCING MEMORANDUM SUPPLEMENT as to James R. Back (Bradley, Thomas) (Entered: 12/04/2014)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 12/4/2014, Entered: None
                                          SENTENCING MEMORANDUM by USA as to James R. Back (Bradley, Thomas) (Entered: 12/04/2014)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Sealed Legal Document 98 Filed: 12/2/2014, Entered: None
                                            FINAL PRESENTENCE INVESTIGATION REPORT (Sealed) as to James R. Back. (Michaelis, Michelle) (Entered: 12/02/2014)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Sealed Legal Document 97 Filed: 11/10/2014, Entered: None
                                              DRAFT PRESENTENCE INVESTIGATION REPORT (Sealed) as to James R. Back. Objections to the Draft Presentence Report are due to the Probation Officer and opposing counsel by 11/24/2014. Counsel should not rely on this draft for sentencing purposes. (Michaelis, Michelle) (Entered: 11/10/2014)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 10/31/2014, Entered: None
                                                ORDER Denying Motion for Bail Release at Docket 93 . (Jan, Chambers Staff) (Entered: 10/31/2014)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 10/27/2014, Entered: None
                                                  OBJECTION TO PRESENTENCE INVESTIGATION REPORT by James R. Back. (PRR, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 10/27/2014)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 10/20/2014, Entered: None
                                                    RESPONSE in Opposition by USA as to James R. Back re 93 MOTION for Release on Bail (Bradley, Thomas) (Entered: 10/20/2014)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Blank 93 Filed: 10/19/2014, Entered: None
                                                      MOTION for Release on Bail by James R. Back. (PXS, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 10/20/2014)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 92 Filed: 10/8/2014, Entered: None
                                                        JUDGE BEISTLINE TEXT ORDER: Defendant's Motion for Discovery at Docket 61 is hereby DENIED because full, timely, and complete discovery was made to Defendant throughout this matter. IT IS SO ORDERED. (Jan, Chambers Staff) (Entered: 10/08/2014)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 10/3/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                          AMENDED MINUTE ENTRY: The parties are advised that the PDF Document as to James R. Back: 83 Trial by Jury - Day 1 is amended as follows: Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Ralph R. Beistline: Trial by Jury - Day 1 held on 9/29/2014 as to James R. Back. Witnesses sworn. Exhibits admitted. Trial by Jury - Day 2 set for 9/30/2014 at 8:30 AM in Anchorage Courtroom 2 before Ralph R. Beistline. cc: USM, USPO. (NXL, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 10/03/2014)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 10/1/2014, Entered: None
                                                            Jury Instructions re Trial by Jury held 9/29/2014 thru 10/1/2014. (NXL, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 10/02/2014)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 10/1/2014, Entered: None
                                                              JURY VERDICT 1 as to James R. Back (1) Guilty on Counts 1-7 of the Indictment. (Attachments: # 1 Verdict 2, # 2 Verdict 3, # 3 Verdict 4, # 4 Verdict 5, # 5 Verdict 6, # 6 Verdict 7)(NXL, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 10/02/2014)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 10/1/2014, Entered: None
                                                                EXHIBIT LIST re Trial by Jury held 9/29/2014 thru 10/1/2014. (NXL, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 10/02/2014)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 10/1/2014, Entered: None
                                                                  WITNESS LIST re Trial by Jury held 9/29/2014 thru 10/1/2014. (NXL, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 10/02/2014)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 10/1/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Ralph R. Beistline:Trial by Jury - Day 3/Verdict as to James R. Back held on 10/1/2014. Defendant's Oral Motion for 24 hour Continuance; DENIED. Witnesses sworn. Exhibits admitted. Plaintiff rested. Defendant rested. Defendant found GUILTY on Counts 1-7 of the Indictment. Imposition of Sentence set for 12/16/2014 at 9:00 AM in Anchorage Courtroom 2 before Ralph R. Beistline. cc: USM, USPO (NXL, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 10/02/2014)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 10/2/2014, Entered: None
                                                                      NOTICE OF HEARING as to James R. Back: Sentencing in this matter will be held on Tuesday, December 16, 2014, at 9:00 AM in Anchorage Courtroom 2 before Ralph R. Beistline. Sentencing Memoranda are due by December 9, 2014. (Jan, Chambers Staff) (Entered: 10/02/2014)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 9/30/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                        Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Ralph R. Beistline:Trial by Jury - Day 2 as to James R. Back held on 9/30/2014. Witnesses sworn. Exhibits admitted. Trial by Jury - Day 3 set for 10/1/2014 at 8:30 AM in Anchorage Courtroom 2 before Ralph R. Beistline. cc: USM, USPO. (NXL, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 10/01/2014)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 9/29/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                          Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Ralph R. Beistline:Trial by Jury - Day 1 held on 9/29/2014 as to James R. Back. Witnesses sworn. Exhibits admitted. Trial by Jury - Day 2 set for 9/30/2014 at 8:30 AM in Anchorage Courtroom 2 before Ralph R. Beistline. cc: USM, USPO. (NXL, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 09/30/2014)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 9/30/2014, Entered: None
                                                                            Proposed Jury Instructions by James R. Back (Jan, Chambers Staff) (Entered: 09/30/2014)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 9/26/2014, Entered: None
                                                                              SUPPLEMENT by USA as to James R. Back 76 Proposed Jury Instructions filed by USA (Bradley, Thomas) (Entered: 09/26/2014)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 9/25/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                SUPPLEMENT by USA as to James R. Back 76 Proposed Jury Instructions filed by USA (Bradley, Thomas) (Entered: 09/25/2014)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 9/25/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                  Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Ralph R. Beistline: Final Pretrial Conference as to James R. Back held on 9/25/2014. cc: USM, USPO. (NXL, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 09/25/2014)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 9/22/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                    Proposed Voir Dire by James R. Back (PXS, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 09/23/2014)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Blank 77 Filed: 9/22/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                      TRIAL BRIEF by USA as to James R. Back (Bradley, Thomas) (Entered: 09/22/2014)
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 9/22/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                        Proposed Jury Instructions by USA as to James R. Back (Bradley, Thomas) (Entered: 09/22/2014)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 9/22/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                          Proposed Voir Dire by USA as to James R. Back (Bradley, Thomas) (Entered: 09/22/2014)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 9/19/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                            ORDER Denying Motion to Continue at Docket 67 . (Jan, Chambers Staff) (Entered: 09/19/2014)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 9/19/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                              Notice of Intent to use the Court's Digital Evidence Presentation System (DEPS) for hearing/trial scheduled to begin 09/29/2014 by James R. Back (McGrady, Jamie) (Entered: 09/19/2014)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 9/19/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                NOTICE OF INTENT TO ENTER EVIDENCE OF UNCHARGED CONDUCT by USA as to James R. Back (Bradley, Thomas) (Entered: 09/19/2014)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 9/19/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                  NOTICE OF INTENT TO USE EXPERT WITNESS by USA as to James R. Back (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Bradley, Thomas) (Entered: 09/19/2014)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 9/19/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                    RESPONSE in Opposition by USA as to James R. Back re 67 MOTION to Continue (Bradley, Thomas) (Entered: 09/19/2014)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 9/19/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                      JUDGE BEISTLINE TEXT ORDER: The Government shall file a Response to the Motion to Continue Trial at Docket 67 on or before 4:00 PM on Wednesday, September 24, 2014. (Jan, Chambers Staff) (Entered: 09/19/2014)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 9/19/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                        Notice of Intent to use the Court's Digital Evidence Presentation System (DEPS) for hearing/trial scheduled to begin 9/29/14 by USA as to James R. Back (Bradley, Thomas) (Entered: 09/19/2014)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 9/19/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                          MOTION to Continue by James R. Back. (PXS, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 09/19/2014)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 9/10/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                            JUDGE BEISTLINE TEXT ORDER: Before the Court, at Docket 60 , is Defendant with a Motion In Limine. The Government opposes at Docket 63 . After reviewing the relevant pleadings the Court finds the instant motion to be without merit and inconsistent with the Rules of Evidence. Therefore, for the reasons set forth by the Government at Docket 63 , the Motion in Limine is hereby DENIED. IT IS SO ORDERED this 10th day of September, 2014. (Jan, Chambers Staff) (Entered: 09/10/2014)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 9/8/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                              ORDER Denying Motion to Recuse Judge at Docket 59 as to James R. Back (1) (Jan, Chambers Staff) (Entered: 09/08/2014)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 9/4/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                REPLY TO RESPONSE to Motion by James R. Back re 59 MOTION for Recusal. (PRR, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 09/05/2014)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 9/4/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                  RESPONSE in Opposition by USA as to James R. Back re 60 MOTION in Limine (Bradley, Thomas) (Entered: 09/04/2014)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 9/2/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                    RESPONSE in Opposition by USA as to James R. Back re 59 MOTION for Recusal (Bradley, Thomas) (Entered: 09/02/2014)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 8/29/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                      SECOND Formal Request for Discovery by James R. Back. (PXS, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 08/29/2014)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 8/29/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                        MOTION in Limine by James R. Back. (PXS, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 08/29/2014)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 8/28/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                          28 USC 455 Affidavit to Recuse Judge for Questionable Impartiality by James R. Back. (PXS, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 08/29/2014)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 8/13/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                            AMENDED ORDER Denying Motions at Dockets 51 and 53 . (Jan, Chambers Staff) (Entered: 08/13/2014)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 8/12/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                              DISREGARD THIS ENTRY - AMENDED ORDER AT 58 . Order Denying Motions at Dockets 51 and 53 . (Jan, Chambers Staff) Modified on 8/13/2014 (Jan, Chambers Staff). (Entered: 08/12/2014)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 8/11/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE Thomas C. Bradley appearing for USA. (Bradley, Thomas) (Entered: 08/11/2014)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 8/8/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                  REPLY TO RESPONSE to Motion by James R. Back re 53 MOTION to Compel (PXS, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 08/08/2014)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 8/5/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE in Opposition by USA as to James R. Back re 53 MOTION to Compel (Bradley, Thomas) Modified on 8/5/2014 to clarify text (JLH, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 08/05/2014)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 7/30/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Compel Discovery by James R. Back. (PXS, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 07/30/2014)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 7/24/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE in Opposition by USA as to James R. Back re 51 MOTION for Discovery (Bradley, Thomas) (Entered: 07/24/2014)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 7/21/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                          MOTION Formal Request for Discovery by James R. Back. (PXS, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 07/21/2014)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 7/21/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                            ORDER Denying Motion to Strike at Docket 43 . (Jan, Chambers Staff) (Entered: 07/21/2014)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 7/18/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                              ORDER Denying Motions at Dockets 45 and 46 . (Jan, Chambers Staff) (Entered: 07/18/2014)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 7/11/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                REPLY TO RESPONSE to Motion by James R. Back re 45 MOTION to Dismiss (PXS, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 07/14/2014)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 7/9/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE in Opposition by USA as to James R. Back re 45 MOTION to Dismiss (Bradley, Thomas) (Entered: 07/09/2014)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 7/9/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Clarification of Order re 34 Order by James R. Back. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(PXS, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 07/09/2014)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 7/3/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Dismiss for Prosecutorial Misconduct by James R. Back. (PXS, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 07/03/2014)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 6/16/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                        ORDER Denying Motion for Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law or in the Alternative Motion for Reconsideration at Docket 38 and Motion for Hearing at Docket 39 . (Jan, Chambers Staff) (Entered: 06/16/2014)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 6/16/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                          MOTION to Strike Logical Fallacies and Non-Responsive Answers by James R. Back. (PXS, COURT STAFF) Modified on 6/16/2014 to clarify docket text (PXS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 06/16/2014)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 6/13/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                            REPLY TO RESPONSE to Motion by James R. Back re 38 MOTION for Reconsideration re 37 Order (PXS, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 06/13/2014)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 6/12/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE in Opposition by USA as to James R. Back re 39 MOTION for Hearing (Bradley, Thomas) (Entered: 06/12/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 6/12/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE in Opposition by USA as to James R. Back re 38 MOTION for Reconsideration re 37 Order (Bradley, Thomas) (Entered: 06/12/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 6/9/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Set Motion for Finding of Facts and Conclusion of Law or in the alternative Motion for Reconsideration for Telephonic Hearing by James R. Back. (PXS, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 06/10/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 6/9/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Finding of Facts and Conclusion of Law or in the alternative Motion for Reconsideration re 37 Order by James R. Back. (PXS, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 06/10/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 5/19/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                      AMENDED ORDER Regarding Pending Motions. (Jan, Chambers Staff) (Entered: 05/19/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 5/19/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                        CLERK'S NOTICE as to James R. Back: In light of the retirement of Magistrate Judge Roberts the pretrial referral of this matter is hereby reassigned to the Honorable Kevin F. McCoy. Please use the following case number on all future filings: 3:14-cr-00020-RRB-KFM. (NKD, COURT STAFF) Modified on 5/19/2014 to modify judge's initials and regenerate NEF (NKD, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 05/19/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 5/15/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                          Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Ralph R. Beistline:Hearing on Motions 15 16 17 19 24 and 25 as to James R. Back held on 5/15/2014. RE 11 Motion for Bill of Particulare DENIED; re 15 MOTION to Continue GRANTED; RE 17 and 24 MOTION for Defendant Access to CM/ECF System GRANTED ; RE 19 MOTION for Changing Due Date for Pretrial Motions GRANTED; RE 16 and 25 MOTION for Electronic/Telephonic Hearings GRANTED IN PART, DENIED IN PART; RE 27 and 28 MOTION to Strike DENIED. Court found excludable delay under 18 U.S.C. § 3161(h)(7)(A)(B) Continuance granted; (h)(7)(B)(iv) Continuance granted to give reasonable time to prepare. Final Pretrial Conference set for 9/25/2014 at 10:00 AM in Anchorage Courtroom 2 before Ralph R. Beistline. Jury Trial set for 9/29/2014 at 8:30 AM in Anchorage Courtroom 2 before Ralph R. Beistline. Final Pretrial Conference set for 6/3/2014 and Trial by Jury set for 6/9/2014 were VACATED. cc: USM, USPO. (NXL, COURT STAFF) Modified on 5/19/2014 to add cc: JC. (RMC, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 05/16/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 5/16/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                            DISREGARD - See Amended Order at 37 . ORDER Regarding Pending Motions. (Jan, Chambers Staff) Modified on 5/19/2014 (JPS, CHAMBERS STAFF). (Entered: 05/16/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 5/15/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                              RRB ORDER as to James R. Back re: Defendant's Amended Motion for Alleged Defendant to CM/ECF System. See pdf for full details. (NKD, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 05/15/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 5/12/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                REPLY TO RESPONSE to Motion by James R. Back re 27 MOTION to Strike (PXS, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 05/13/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 5/12/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                  REPLY TO RESPONSE to Motion by James R. Back re 28 MOTION to Strike (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(PXS, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 05/13/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 5/6/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE in Opposition by USA as to James R. Back re 28 MOTION to Strike (Bradley, Thomas) (Entered: 05/06/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 5/6/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE in Opposition by USA as to James R. Back re 27 MOTION to Strike (Bradley, Thomas) (Entered: 05/06/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 5/5/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Strike Surplusage and Strike Defective Allegations from Indictment by James R. Back. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(PXS, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 05/05/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 5/5/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION to Strike/Dismiss Indictment by James R. Back. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(PXS, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 05/05/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 5/2/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF HEARING as to James R. Back: The Court will address the pending motions regarding Pretrial Motions, Access to CM/ECF System, and Electronic/Telephonic Hearings at the time scheduled for the Motion to Continue Trial on Thursday, May 15, 2014, at 1:15 PM in Anchorage Courtroom 2 before Ralph R. Beistline. Defendant shall appear in person in Courtroom 2 for the hearing. (E-mailed to Defendant) (Jan, Chambers Staff) Modified on 5/2/2014 to note email service on Defendant. (Jan). (Entered: 05/02/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 4/30/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                              AMENDED MOTION for Electronic/Telephonic Hearings by James R. Back. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(PXS, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 04/30/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 4/30/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                AMENDED MOTION for Alleged Defendant Access to CM/ECF System re 17 MOTION for Defendant Access to CM/ECF System by James R. Back. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(PXS, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 04/30/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 4/29/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE RESCHEDULING HEARING as to James R. Back: Due to scheduling conflicts, the hearing on the Motion to Continue Trial at Docket 15 is rescheduled and will be held on Thursday, May 15, 2014, at 1:15 PM in Anchorage Courtroom 2 before Ralph R. Beistline. Mr. Back shall appear personally for the hearing. (Jan, Chambers Staff) (Entered: 04/29/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 4/25/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                    JDR ORDER denying 11 Motion for Bill of Particulars as to James R. Back. Clerk to furnish defendant with copy of order. Signed by Judge John D. Roberts on 4/25/2014. (JAM, Chambers Staff) (Entered: 04/25/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 21 Filed: 4/25/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF HEARING as to James R. Back: A hearing on the Motion to Continue Trial at Docket 15 will be held on Tuesday, May 6, 2014, at 1:00 PM in Anchorage Courtroom 2 before Ralph R. Beistline. (Jan, Chambers Staff) (Entered: 04/25/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 4/22/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE to Motion (Non-Opposition) by USA as to James R. Back re 19 MOTION for Changing Due Date for Pretrial Motions (Bradley, Thomas) (Entered: 04/22/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 4/22/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Changing Due Date for Pretrial Motions by James R. Back. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(PXS, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 04/22/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 4/22/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE in Opposition by USA as to James R. Back re 16 MOTION for Hearing (PARTIAL OPPOSITION) (Bradley, Thomas) (Entered: 04/22/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 4/21/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Defendant Access to CM/ECF System by James R. Back. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(PXS, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 04/22/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 4/21/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Electronic/Telephonic Hearings by James R. Back. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(PXS, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 04/22/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 4/21/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Continue Trial by USA as to James R. Back. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Bradley, Thomas) Modified on 4/22/2014 to clarify title. (Jan, Chambers Staff). (Entered: 04/21/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 4/18/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE in Opposition by USA as to James R. Back re 11 MOTION for Bill of Particulars (Bradley, Thomas) (Entered: 04/18/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 4/16/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER FOR THE PROGRESSION OF A CRIMINAL CASE as to James R. Back: Motions due by 5/6/2014. Final Pretrial Conference set for 6/3/2014 09:30 AM in Anchorage Courtroom 2 before Ralph R. Beistline. Jury Trial set for 6/9/2014 08:30 AM in Anchorage Courtroom 2 before Ralph R. Beistline. Signed by Judge John D. Roberts on 4/16/2014. cc: USM, USPO, JC (SDW, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 04/17/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 4/16/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge John D. Roberts: Arraignment on Indictment/Status of Counsel as to James R. Back (1) Counts 1-3,4-7 held on 4/16/2014. Defendant's oral motion to represent himself GRANTED. Jamie McGrady appointed as stand-by counsel. Defendant pled not guilty to counts 1-7 of the Indictment. Pretrial motions due 5/6/2014. Final Pretrial Conference set for 6/3/2014 09:30 AM and Trial by Jury set for 6/9/2014 08:30 AM in Anchorage Courtroom 2 before Ralph R. Beistline. cc: USM, USPO, FPD (SDW, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 04/17/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 4/16/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Bill of Particulars by James R. Back. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(PXS, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 04/17/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 4/11/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge John D. Roberts:Status Hearing (Arraignment on Indictment/Status of Counsel) as to James R. Back held on 4/11/2014. Defendant's Oral Motion For More Time to Retain Counsel; GRANTED. Defendant's Oral Motion to Appear Telephonically in Future Proceedings; DENIED. Arraignment on Indictment/Status of Counsel set for 4/16/2014 at 2:30 PM in Anchorage Courtroom 6 before John D. Roberts. cc: USM, USPO, FPD (CJA Clerk). (AJH, COURT STAFF) Modified on 4/11/2014 to regenerate NEF to C. McNamara. (BJK, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 04/11/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 4/8/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER of Release as to James R. Back. Signed by Judge John D. Roberts on 4/8/2014. cc: Original and 1 cy to USM, USPO(SDW, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 04/08/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 4/8/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Bail Information Sheet re 7 Order Setting Conditions of Release, 6 Appearance Bond by James R. Back. cc: USM, USPO (SDW, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 04/08/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 4/8/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER Setting Conditions of Release as to James R. Back. Signed by Judge John D. Roberts on 4/8/2014. cc: USM, USPO, Def(SDW, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 04/08/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 4/8/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Appearance Bond set as to James R. Back in amount of $ 5,000 Unsecured. cc: USM, USPO (SDW, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 04/08/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 4/8/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge John D. Roberts: Initial Appearance on Indictment (Arraignment on Indictment) as to James R. Back held on 4/8/2014. Bond set at $5,000.00 Unsecured. Arraignment on Indictment/Status of Counsel Hearing set for 4/11/2014 02:00 PM in Anchorage Courtroom 6 before John D. Roberts. cc: USM, USPO, FPD (SDW, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 04/08/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 4/8/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Arrest Warrant Returned Executed on 4/7/14. in case as to James R. Back. (PXS, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 04/08/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 4/7/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          JDR TEXT ORDER: as to James R. Back re 2 Indictment, Arraignment set for 4/8/2014 at 01:30 PM in Anchorage Courtroom 6 before John D. Roberts. cc: USM, USPO and FPD (CJA Clerk). (CLW, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 04/07/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 2 Filed: 3/19/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            INDICTMENT as to James R. Back. (BJK, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 03/19/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 3/19/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              INDICTMENT COVER SHEET(S) AND SIGNATURES as to James R. Back (1) count(s) 1-3, 4-7. (Attachments: # 1 Criminal Cover Sheet re Defendant James R. Back) (BJK, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 03/19/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                This case has been viewed 128 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                 
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Need Password Help?