Olasumbo Ajetunmobi v. Countrywide, et al
Appeal Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit, Case No. 12-56523

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated September 15, 2016 at 2:31 AM EDT (5.2 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

Nature of Suit 3371 - TORTS-Truth in Lending
  Entries (6) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 2/28/2014, Entered: None
Filed clerk order: The answering brief [35] submitted by BAC Home Loans Servicing, LP, Bank of America NA, Countrywide Home Loans, Inc, MERS and ReconTrust Company, NA is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Cover color: red. The paper copies shall be printed from the PDF version of the brief created from the word processing application, not from PACER or Appellate ECF. The Court has reviewed the supplemental excerpts of record [37] submitted by BAC Home Loans Servicing, LP, Bank of America NA, Countrywide Home Loans, Inc, MERS and ReconTrust Company, NA. Within 7 days of this order, filer is ordered to file 4 copies of the excerpts in paper format, with a white cover. The paper copies must be in the format described in 9th Circuit Rule 30-1.6. [8997375] (WP)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 2/27/2014, Entered: None
    Submitted (ECF) supplemental excerpts of record. Submitted by Appellees BAC Home Loans Servicing, LP, Bank of America NA, Countrywide Home Loans, Inc, MERS and ReconTrust Company, NA. Date of service: 02/24/2014. [8995411] (EWK)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 2/24/2014, Entered: None
      Received Appellees BAC Home Loans Servicing, LP, Bank of America NA and Countrywide Home Loans, Inc excerpts of record in 1 volume. Deficiencies: excerpts not submitted via ECF. Notified counsel (See attached notice). [8994858] (WP)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 2/24/2014, Entered: None
        Submitted (ECF) Answering Brief for review. Submitted by Appellees BAC Home Loans Servicing, LP, Bank of America NA, Countrywide Home Loans, Inc, MERS and ReconTrust Company, N.A.. Date of service: 02/24/2014. [8989962]--[COURT UPDATE: Attached certificate of service. Resent NDA. 02/28/2014 by RY] (EWK)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 2/20/2014, Entered: None
        Filed order MEDIATION (MAC): This appeal is released from the Mediation Program. All further inquiries regarding this appeal, including requests for extensions of time, should be directed to the Clerk’s office. Counsel are requested to contact the Circuit Mediator should circumstances develop that warrant further settlement discussions while the appeal is pending. [8984760] (SM)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 2/13/2014, Entered: None
          Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Jan T. Chilton for Appellees BAC Home Loans Servicing, LP, Bank of America NA, Countrywide Home Loans, Inc, MERS and ReconTrust Company, N.A.. Date of service: 02/13/2014. [8978174] (JTC)
            Request RequestSpace LREF

            Statistics

            This case has been viewed 32 times.

            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
            Space
            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
             
            PlainSite
            Sign Up
            Need Password Help?