Northrup v. Police Division et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Ohio Northern District Court, Case No. 3:12-cv-01544

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 20, 2017 at 12:35 AM ST (4.5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Shawn Northrup, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Steven M. Burke

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Daniel T. Ellis +1 419 882 7100 +1 419 882 7201 dellis@lydymoan.com
v.
No Logo City of Toledo Police Division, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by City of Toledo

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Adam W. Loukx +1 419 245 1020 +1 419 245 1090 adam.loukx@toledo.oh.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John T. Madigan +1 419 245 1020 +1 419 245 1090 john.madigan@toledo.oh.gov
No Logo David R. Bright, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by City of Toledo

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Adam W. Loukx +1 419 245 1020 +1 419 245 1090 adam.loukx@toledo.oh.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John T. Madigan +1 419 245 1020 +1 419 245 1090 john.madigan@toledo.oh.gov
No Logo Donald Comes, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by City of Toledo

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Adam W. Loukx +1 419 245 1020 +1 419 245 1090 adam.loukx@toledo.oh.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John T. Madigan +1 419 245 1020 +1 419 245 1090 john.madigan@toledo.oh.gov
No Logo Ray Daniel, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by City of Toledo

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Adam W. Loukx +1 419 245 1020 +1 419 245 1090 adam.loukx@toledo.oh.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John T. Madigan +1 419 245 1020 +1 419 245 1090 john.madigan@toledo.oh.gov
  Entries (61) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 12/1/2015, Entered: None Order Dismissing Case
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Blank 61 Filed: 11/20/2015, Entered: None
    Settlement Notice filed by Shawn Northrup. (Ellis, Daniel) (Entered: 11/20/2015)
      LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 8/5/2015, Entered: None Judgment
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 8/5/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
        Memorandum Opinion and Order: Northrup's motion to amend his complaint is denied. re 55 . Judge Jeffrey J. Helmick on 8/5/2015. (S,AL) (Entered: 08/05/2015)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 7/25/2015, Entered: None
          Reply in support of 55 Motion for leave to amend complaint filed by All Plaintiffs. (Ellis, Daniel) (Entered: 07/25/2015)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 7/17/2015, Entered: None
            Opposition to 55 Motion for leave to amend complaint filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: # 1 Legislative Service Commission 1996)(Madigan, John) (Entered: 07/17/2015)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 7/2/2015, Entered: None Order
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 7/1/2015, Entered: None Amend Complaint
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 6/25/2015, Entered: None Minute Order _ Telephone Conference
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Blank 53 Filed: 6/4/2015, Entered: None
                    True copy of mandate from the USCA for the Sixth Circuit: The District Court's judgment is affirmed in part, reversed in part, and the case is remanded for further proceedings re 49 Notice of Appeal (USCA# 14-4050). Date issued as mandate 6/4/15, Costs: None (H,SP) (Entered: 06/04/2015)
                      LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 10/29/2014, Entered: None
                      Acknowledgment from the USCA for Sixth Circuit of receipt of 49 Notice of Appeal (USCA# 14-4050). Date filed in USCA 10/27/14. (H,SP) (Entered: 10/29/2014)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 10/24/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                        IMPORTANT: Notice of Settlement Conference set for 11/13/2014 at 11:30 AM in Chambers 222 (Toledo) before Magistrate Judge Vernelis K. Armstrong. Ex parte narrative statements are due by 11/6/2014 before the close of business day. (B,TM) (Entered: 10/24/2014)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 10/24/2014, Entered: None
                          NOTICE OF APPEAL to the Sixth Circuit Court of Appeals from the 45 Memorandum Opinion and Order of 9/30/14, filed by David R. Bright, Ray Daniel, City of Toledo Police Division. (Filing fee of $505.00 paid, receipt# 34660008577) (Madigan, John). Modified text on 10/24/2014 (H,SP). (Entered: 10/24/2014)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 10/16/2014, Entered: None Minute Order _ Status Conference
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 10/16/2014, Entered: None Alter/Amend judgment
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 9/30/2014, Entered: None Judgment
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 9/30/2014, Entered: None memorandum opinion and order
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 4/14/2014, Entered: None
                                    Reply Memorandum filed by All Defendants. Related document(s) 38 . (Madigan, John) (Entered: 04/14/2014)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 4/9/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                      Marginal Entry Order granting 42 defendants' Motion for Extension of Time until 4/14/14 to file a reply in support of their motion for summary judgment. Judge Jeffrey J. Helmick on 4/9/2014.(S,AL) (Entered: 04/09/2014)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 4/7/2014, Entered: None
                                        Motion for extension of time until April 14, 2014 to file a reply to Plaintiff's memorandum in opposition to Defendant's motion for summary judgment filed by David R. Bright, Donald Comes, Ray Daniel, City of Toledo Police Division. (Madigan, John) (Entered: 04/07/2014)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 4/2/2014, Entered: None
                                          Audio DVD Exhibits D, E, and F to Plaintiff's 38 Memorandum in Opposition received in Clerk's Office and filed, re: 40 Notice of Manual Filing. (L,A) (Entered: 04/02/2014)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 4/1/2014, Entered: None
                                            Notice of Manual Filing of Exhibits in Support of Plaintiff's 38 Memorandum in Opposition to Defendants' 24 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by All Plaintiffs. (Ellis, Daniel) Modified on 4/2/2014 (L,A). (Entered: 04/01/2014)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 4/1/2014, Entered: None
                                              Deposition of Alan Rose taken on 2/6/14 filed by All Plaintiffs. (Ellis, Daniel) Modified on 5/8/2014 to note incorrect event used (B,TM). (Entered: 04/01/2014)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 4/1/2014, Entered: None
                                                Memorandum in Opposition to Defendants' 24 Motion for summary judgment filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A Court Docket, # 2 Exhibit B Police Report, # 3 Exhibit C Affidavit of Denise Northrup)(Ellis, Daniel) Modified as to text on 4/2/2014 (H,JD). Modified on 4/2/2014 (L,A). (Entered: 04/01/2014)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 4/1/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                  Marginal Entry Order granting 36 plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time until 4/2/2014 to respond to defendants' motion for summary judgment. Judge Jeffrey J. Helmick on 4/1/2014.(S,AL) (Entered: 04/01/2014)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 3/31/2014, Entered: None
                                                    Motion for extension of time until 04-02-2014 to file response/reply to 24 Motion for summary judgment and memorandum filed by Plaintiff Shawn Northrup. Related document(s) 24 . (Ellis, Daniel) (Entered: 03/31/2014)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 3/28/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                      Marginal Entry Order granting 34 plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time until 3/31/14 to file an opposition to the motion for summary judgment. Judge Jeffrey J. Helmick on 3/28/2014.(S,AL) (Entered: 03/28/2014)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 3/27/2014, Entered: None
                                                        Motion for extension of time until 03/31/2014 to file response/reply to 24 Motion for summary judgment and memorandum filed by Plaintiff Shawn Northrup. Related document(s) 24 . (Ellis, Daniel) (Entered: 03/27/2014)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 3/21/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                          Marginal Entry Order granting 32 plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time until 3/27/14 to file a response to the motion for summary judgment. Judge Jeffrey J. Helmick on 3/21/2014.(S,AL) (Entered: 03/21/2014)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 3/19/2014, Entered: None
                                                            Motion for extension of time until 03/27/2014 to file response/reply to 24 Motion for summary judgment and memorandum filed by Plaintiff Shawn Northrup. Related document(s) 24 . (Ellis, Daniel) (Entered: 03/19/2014)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 3/5/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                              Order granting 30 plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time. Opposition to motion for summary judgment due 3/20/14; reply due 4/4/14. re 24 . Judge Jeffrey J. Helmick on 3/5/2014.(S,AL) (Entered: 03/05/2014)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 2/28/2014, Entered: None
                                                                Motion for extension of time until 03/20/2014 to Reply to Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Plaintiff Shawn Northrup. Related document(s) 24 . (Ellis, Daniel) Modified as to text on 3/4/2014 (H,JD). (Entered: 02/28/2014)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 1/29/2014, Entered: None
                                                                  Deposition of Daniel Ray taken on 9/17/2013 filed by All Defendants. Related document(s) 25 . (Madigan, John) Modified on 2/11/2014 to edit text (B,TM). (Entered: 01/29/2014)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 1/29/2014, Entered: None
                                                                    Deposition of Shawn Northrup filed by All Defendants. Related document(s) 25 . (Madigan, John) (Entered: 01/29/2014)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 1/29/2014, Entered: None
                                                                      Deposition of Donald Comes filed by All Defendants. Related document(s) 25 . (Madigan, John) (Entered: 01/29/2014)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 1/29/2014, Entered: None
                                                                        Deposition of David Bright filed by All Defendants. Related document(s) 25 . (Madigan, John) (Entered: 01/29/2014)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 1/29/2014, Entered: None
                                                                          Notice of Filing of Depositions of David Bright, Donald Comes, Daniel Ray and Shawn Northrup filed by All Defendants. (Madigan, John) (Entered: 01/29/2014)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Blank 24 Filed: 1/29/2014, Entered: None
                                                                            Motion for summary judgment and memorandum filed by David R. Bright, Donald Comes, Ray Daniel, City of Toledo Police Division. (Madigan, John) (Entered: 01/29/2014)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 1/15/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                              Marginal Entry Order granting 22 defendant's Motion for Extension of Time to file dispositive motions. Dispositive Motions due by 1/29/2014; opposition due 2/28/2014; reply due 3/14/2014. Judge Jeffrey J. Helmick on 1/15/2014.(S,AL) (Entered: 01/15/2014)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 1/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                Motion for extension of time until 1/29/2014 to file a motion for summary judgment filed by David R. Bright, Donald Comes, Ray Daniel, City of Toledo Police Division. (Madigan, John) (Entered: 01/14/2014)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 11/7/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                  Order of Telephone Status Conference held on 11/7/13. Dispositive motions shall be filed no later than January 15, 2014. Briefs in opposition shall be filed no later than February 12, 2014. Briefs in reply, if any, shall be filed no later than February 24, 2014. The dates for the final pretrial conference and trial are vacated and held in abeyance pending a ruling on summary judgment motions. Judge Jeffrey J. Helmick on 11/7/13. Time: 10 min(SG,D) (Entered: 11/07/2013)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 10/1/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                    Order of Telephone Conference held on 10/1/13. Counsel shall proceed with discovery in the manner and with the timing agreed upon during the conference; Counsel shall attend a follow-up telephone status conference on November 7, 2013, at 10:30a.m. My chambers will initiate the call. Judge Jeffrey J. Helmick on 10/1/13. Time: 15 min(SG,D) (Entered: 10/01/2013)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 9/5/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                      Answer to 1 Complaint, with Jury Demand (Amended Answer) filed by David R. Bright, Donald Comes, Ray Daniel, City of Toledo Police Division. (Madigan, John) (Entered: 09/05/2013)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 8/26/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                        Order of Telephone Conference held on 8/20/13. A follow-up telephone status conference will be held on September 30, 2013 at 10:00 a.m. before Judge Jeffrey J. Helmick. The dispositive motion deadline and corresponding briefing schedule will be reset during or after the September 30, 2013 telephone status conference. Judge Jeffrey J. Helmick on 8/26/13. Time: 15 min(SG,D) (Entered: 08/26/2013)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 8/26/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                          Marginal Entry Order granting Motion for leave to File an Amended Answer filed by David R. Bright, Donald Comes, Ray Daniel, City of Toledo Police Division(Related Doc # 14 ). Judge Jeffrey J. Helmick on 8/26/13.(SG,D) (Entered: 08/26/2013)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 8/15/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                            Reply to response to 14 Motion for leave to File an Amended Answer filed by All Defendants. (Green, Merritt) (Entered: 08/15/2013)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 8/9/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                              Opposition 14 to Motion for leave to File an Amended Answer filed by All Plaintiffs. (Ellis, Daniel) Modified on 8/13/2013 (L,V). (Entered: 08/09/2013)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 7/25/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                Motion for leave to File an Amended Answer filed by David R. Bright, Donald Comes, Ray Daniel, City of Toledo Police Division. (Madigan, John) (Entered: 07/25/2013)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 7/15/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                  Order of Telephone Conference held on 7/12/13. Court reporter Angela Nixon was present. Defendants shall produce responses to Plaintiffs' discovery requests no later than July 31, 2013; The May 1, 2013 discovery deadline is retroactively vacated, and is reset for September 30, 2013; The telephone status conference scheduled for July 22, 2013 at 1:30 p.m. is vacated; A follow-up telephone status conference will be held on August 20, 2013 at 9:30 a.m.; The dispositive motion deadline of August 30, 2013, and the corresponding briefing schedule, is vacated and will be reset during or after the August 20, 2013 telephone status conference. Judge Jeffrey J. Helmick on 7/15/13. Time: 35 min(SG,D) (Entered: 07/15/2013)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 5/22/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                    Order of Telephone Conference held on 5/20/13. Telephone Status Conference set for 7/22/2013 at 01:30 PM before Judge Jeffrey J. Helmick. Time: 10 minutes. Judge Jeffrey J. Helmick on 5/22/13. (SG,D) (Entered: 05/22/2013)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 10/4/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                      IMPORTANT: Notice of Settlement Conference set for 11/16/2012 at 10:00 AM in Chambers 222 (Toledo) before Magistrate Judge Vernelis K. Armstrong. Counsel and Parties are required to appear in person. Ex Parte Statements shall be provided to chambers not later than 11/9/12. (B,CJ) (Entered: 10/04/2012)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 9/7/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                        Order of Case Management Conference held on 9/4/2012. Case is assigned to the complex track. Discovery due by 5/1/2013. Parties to be Joined and Pleading Amendments due by 1/30/2013. Dispositive Motions due by 8/30/2013; opposition due 9/30/13; reply due 10/10/13. Final Settlement/Pretrial Conference set for 12/9/2013 at 01:30 PM. Jury Trial set for 1/14/2014 at 01:00 PM in Courtroom 204 with voir dire set for 1/14/14 at 9:00am. Telephone Conference set for 5/20/2013 at 01:30 PM. Mediation to be held by United States Magistrate Judge Armstrong, to be completed by November 30, 2012. Judge Jeffrey J. Helmick on 9/7/2012. Time:.20(S,AL) (Entered: 09/07/2012)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 8/28/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                          Report of Parties' Planning Meeting , parties do not consent to this case being assigned to the magistrate judge, filed by All Parties. Related document(s) 6 , 4 .(Ellis, Daniel) (Entered: 08/28/2012)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 8/28/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                            Notice of Rule 26 Disclosures filed by Plaintiff Shawn Northrup. (Ellis, Daniel) Modified on 8/30/2012 to term incorrect filed motion (B,TM). (Entered: 08/28/2012)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 8/20/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                              Initial Disclosures filed by All Defendants. (Madigan, John) (Entered: 08/20/2012)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 8/14/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                Order of Telephone Conference held on 8/13/2012. Case management conference scheduled for August 13, 2012 at 3:00 p.m. is vacated and rescheduled for September 4, 2012 at 9:00 a.m. Parties to file Rule 26(f) report no later than one week before the case management conference. Failure to file such report, counsel may be subject to sanctions. Time:.10. Judge Jeffrey J. Helmick on 8/14/2012. (S,AL) (Entered: 08/14/2012)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 7/31/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                  Answer to 1 Complaint, with Jury Demand filed by David R. Bright. (Madigan, John) (Entered: 07/31/2012)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 7/24/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                    Case Management Conference Scheduling Notice: case management conference to be held on 8/13/2012 at 03:00 PM at Chambers 210 before Judge Jeffrey J. Helmick. (S,AL) (Entered: 07/24/2012)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 7/6/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                      Attorney Appearance by John T. Madigan filed by on behalf of All Defendants. (Madigan, John) (Entered: 07/06/2012)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 6/18/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                        Original Summons and Magistrate Consent Form issued for service upon All Defendants. (Attachments: # 1 Magistrate Consent Form) (B,TM) (Entered: 06/18/2012)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 6/15/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                          Complaint with jury demand against All Defendants. Filing fee paid $ 350, Receipt number 0647-5410583. Filed by Shawn Northrup. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, Photos of Ligature Marks to Wrists, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons, # 5 Summons, # 6 Summons) (Ellis, Daniel) (Entered: 06/15/2012)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                            Statistics

                                                                                                                            This case has been viewed 437 times.

                                                                                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                            Space
                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                             
                                                                                                                            PlainSite
                                                                                                                            Sign Up
                                                                                                                            Need Password Help?