Steele et al v. GE Money Bank et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Illinois Northern District Court, Case No. 1:08-cv-01880
District Judge Blanche M. Manning, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated August 20, 2016 at 11:30 AM DT (5.1 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Alexandra Diaz, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Bonnett, Fairbourn, Friedman & Balint, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Andrew Steven Friedman +1 602 776 5902 +1 602 274 1199 afriedman@bffb.com
Space Wendy Jocobsen Harrison +1 602 274 1100 +1 602 274 1199 wharrison@bffb.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Roddy Klein & Ryan

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gary Edward Klein +1 617 357 5500 +1 617 357 5030 Klein@kkcllp.com

Toggle Switch Represented by WILLIAMSON PETTY LC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Marvin Alan Miller +1 312 332 3400 +1 312 676 2676 mmiller@millerlawllc.com
No Logo Doris Steele, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Bonnett, Fairbourn, Friedman & Balint, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Andrew Steven Friedman +1 602 776 5902 +1 602 274 1199 afriedman@bffb.com
Space Wendy Jocobsen Harrison +1 602 274 1100 +1 602 274 1199 wharrison@bffb.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Al Hofeld, III., LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Al Hofeld, III +1 773 241 5844 +1 773 241 5845 al@alhofeldlaw.com

Represented by Miller & Law, PC

Toggle Switch Represented by Roddy Klein & Ryan

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gary Edward Klein +1 617 357 5500 +1 617 357 5030 Klein@kkcllp.com

Toggle Switch Represented by WILLIAMSON PETTY LC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Marvin Alan Miller +1 312 332 3400 +1 312 676 2676 mmiller@millerlawllc.com
No Logo Eric R. Chavez, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Bonnett, Fairbourn, Friedman & Balint, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Andrew Steven Friedman +1 602 776 5902 +1 602 274 1199 afriedman@bffb.com
Space Wendy Jocobsen Harrison +1 602 274 1100 +1 602 274 1199 wharrison@bffb.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Roddy Klein & Ryan

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gary Edward Klein +1 617 357 5500 +1 617 357 5030 Klein@kkcllp.com

Toggle Switch Represented by WILLIAMSON PETTY LC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Marvin Alan Miller +1 312 332 3400 +1 312 676 2676 mmiller@millerlawllc.com
No Logo Herbert Steele, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Bonnett, Fairbourn, Friedman & Balint, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Andrew Steven Friedman +1 602 776 5902 +1 602 274 1199 afriedman@bffb.com
Space Wendy Jocobsen Harrison +1 602 274 1100 +1 602 274 1199 wharrison@bffb.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Al Hofeld, III., LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Al Hofeld, III +1 773 241 5844 +1 773 241 5845 al@alhofeldlaw.com

Represented by Miller & Law, PC

Toggle Switch Represented by Roddy Klein & Ryan

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gary Edward Klein +1 617 357 5500 +1 617 357 5030 Klein@kkcllp.com

Toggle Switch Represented by WILLIAMSON PETTY LC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Marvin Alan Miller +1 312 332 3400 +1 312 676 2676 mmiller@millerlawllc.com
No Logo Sonia Torres, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Bonnett, Fairbourn, Friedman & Balint, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Andrew Steven Friedman +1 602 776 5902 +1 602 274 1199 afriedman@bffb.com
Space Wendy Jocobsen Harrison +1 602 274 1100 +1 602 274 1199 wharrison@bffb.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Roddy Klein & Ryan

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gary Edward Klein +1 617 357 5500 +1 617 357 5030 Klein@kkcllp.com

Toggle Switch Represented by WILLIAMSON PETTY LC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Marvin Alan Miller +1 312 332 3400 +1 312 676 2676 mmiller@millerlawllc.com
v.
GE Money Bank GE Money Bank, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John P. Mastando
Space Walter E. Zalenski +1 212 310 8878

Represented by Novack & Macey LLP

No Logo Wmc Mortgage Corporation, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Dickstein Shapiro LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Alana L. Brown +1 212 277 6500 +1 212 277 6501 brownalana@dicksteinshapiro.com
Space Jay N. Fastow +1 212 277 6500 +1 212 277 6501 fastowj@ballardspahr.com
No Logo WMC Mortgage, LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Dickstein Shapiro LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Alana L. Brown +1 212 277 6500 +1 212 277 6501 brownalana@dicksteinshapiro.com
Space Jay N. Fastow +1 212 277 6500 +1 212 277 6501 fastowj@ballardspahr.com
Space Denise Lynne Plunkett +1 212 277 6500 plunkettd@dicksteinshapiro.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Jenner & Block, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Justin Carey Steffen +1 312 923 8396 jsteffen@jenner.com
Space James L. Thompson +1 312 222 9350 jthompson@jenner.com
Office Chicago
Filed 4/1/2008
Jury Demand Both
Demand
Nature of Suit 443 - Civil Rights: Housing/Accommodations
Cause Section 42 U.S.C. § 405 Fair Housing Act
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition
County Cook
Terminated
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag ASHMAN
  Entries (221) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 222 Filed: 2/29/2012, Entered: None
NOTICE of Nonresponse; Notice per FRPC Rule 23(c)(2)(B)(v) (Alleged) Members' Declaration of Non-Member Status of Daniel and Gloria Chavez. (Exhibit) (lp, ) (Entered: 03/01/2012)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 221 Filed: 6/1/2011, Entered: None
    FINAL JUDGMENT AND Order of Dismissal Signed by the Honorable Blanche M. Manning on 6/1/2011:(lp, ) (Entered: 06/03/2011)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 220 Filed: 6/1/2011, Entered: None
      ORDER Adopting Report and Recommendations Signed by the Honorable Blanche M. Manning on 6/1/2011:(lp, ) (Entered: 06/03/2011)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 219 Filed: 6/1/2011, Entered: None
        MINUTE entry before Honorable Blanche M. Manning: The court adopts the report and recommendation 217 . Enter Final Approval Order. As set forth in the final approval order, the Court approves the agreement and dismisses this case in its entirety with prejudice. Enter Final Judgment and Order of Dismissal. [For further detail see separate order(s).] Mailed notice (lp, ) Modified on 7/8/2011 (lp, ). (Entered: 06/03/2011)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 218 Filed: 6/1/2011, Entered: None
          MINUTE entry before Honorable Blanche M. Manning: Status hearing set to 6/2/2011 is stricken. The court will issue the proposed orders attached to the report and recommendation by the end of the week.Mailed notice (rth, ) (Entered: 06/01/2011)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 217 Filed: 5/17/2011, Entered: None
            REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION On Final Approval of Settlement regarding MOTION by Plaintiffs Eric R. Chavez, Doris Steele, Herbert Steele, Sonia Torres(Agreed) For Final Approval of Class Action Settlement and for Approval of Payment of Attorney's Fees, Costs and Service Payments to Class Representatives and Response tMOTION by Plaintiffs Eric R. Chavez, Doris Steele, Herbert Steele, Sonia Torres(Agreed) For Final Approval of Class Action Settlement and for Approval of Payment of Attorney's Fees, Costs and Service Payments to Class Representatives and Response 185 Objections to R&R due by 5/31/2011 Signed by the Honorable Martin C. Ashman on 5/17/2011:(lp, ) (Entered: 05/18/2011)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 216 Filed: 5/16/2011, Entered: None
              MINUTE entry before Honorable Blanche M. Manning: Status hearing set for 5/17/2011 is reset to 6/2/2011 at 11:00 AM.Mailed notice (rth, ) (Entered: 05/16/2011)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 215 Filed: 5/3/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                MINUTE entry before Honorable Martin C. Ashman: All matters pertaining to this referral have been completed. This case is returned to the assigned district court judge for further proceedings. Judge Honorable Martin C. Ashman no longer referred to the case.Mailed notice (tlp, ) (Entered: 05/03/2011)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 214 Filed: 4/26/2011, Entered: None
                  NOTICE by Al Hofeld, III of Change of Address Suite Number (Hofeld, Al) (Entered: 04/26/2011)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 213 Filed: 4/20/2011, Entered: None
                    MINUTE entry before Honorable Blanche M. Manning: Status hearing date of 4/21/2011 is reset for 5/17/2011 at 11:00 AM.Mailed notice (jms, ) (Entered: 04/20/2011)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 212 Filed: 4/15/2011, Entered: None
                      MINUTE entry before Honorable Martin C. Ashman: Final hearing held as motion by Plaintiffs Eric R. Chavez, Doris Steele, Herbert Steele, Sonia Torres For Final Approval of Class Action Settlement and for Approval of Payment of Attorney's Fees, Costs and Service Payments to Class Representatives and Response to Objections 185 . No one appears in objection. This matter is taken under advisement. Plaintiff will prepare a proposed report and recommendation.Mailed notice (tlp, ) Modified on 4/18/2011 (tlp, ). (Entered: 04/15/2011)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 211 Filed: 4/11/2011, Entered: None
                        MINUTE entry before Honorable Blanche M. Manning: Application for Kevin Costello to appear pro hac vice 208 is granted.Mailed notice (rth, ) (Entered: 04/11/2011)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 210 Filed: 3/30/2011, Entered: None
                          MINUTE entry before Honorable Blanche M. Manning:The court appreciates counsels' helpful status report. Status hearing date of 3/31/2011 is reset for 4/21/2011 at 11:00 AM.Mailed notice (jms, ) (Entered: 03/30/2011)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 209 Filed: 3/29/2011, Entered: None
                            STATUS Report (Joint) - Status Report And Joint Request To Adjourn Status Conference by WMC Mortgage, LLC (Thompson, James) (Entered: 03/29/2011)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 208 Filed: 3/22/2011, Entered: None
                              MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-5820970. (Costello, Kevin) (Entered: 03/22/2011)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 207 Filed: 3/9/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                MINUTE entry before Honorable Martin C. Ashman:Magistrate Judge Status hearing held on 3/9/2011. Final hearing set for 4/15/2011 at 2:00 PM.Mailed notice (tlp, ) (Entered: 03/09/2011)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 206 Filed: 3/8/2011, Entered: None
                                  STATUS Report (Joint) by Eric R. Chavez, Doris Steele, Herbert Steele, Sonia Torres (Klein, Gary) (Entered: 03/08/2011)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 205 Filed: 3/8/2011, Entered: None
                                    MINUTE entry before Honorable Martin C. Ashman:Time for status hearing scheduled for 3/9/2011 is reset to 10:30 AM.Mailed notice (tlp, ) (Entered: 03/08/2011)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 204 Filed: 3/3/2011, Entered: None
                                      MINUTE entry before Honorable Martin C. Ashman: Status hearing set for 3/9/2011 at 10:00 AM.Mailed notice (tlp, ) (Entered: 03/03/2011)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 203 Filed: 2/23/2011, Entered: None
                                        EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE ORDER:Case referred to the Honorable Martin C. Ashman Signed by Executive Committee on 2/23-2011.(lp, ) (Entered: 02/25/2011)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 202 Filed: 2/23/2011, Entered: None
                                          STIPULATION (Thompson, James) (Entered: 02/23/2011)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 201 Filed: 2/23/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                            MINUTE entry before Honorable Young B. Kim: Status hearing held by phone. Parties reported that they have successfully resolved Class Member Stephen West's objection to the class settlement. Additionally, in response to this court's concern about a potential conflict of interest, Defendants alerted the court today to its F.R.C.P. 7.1 and Local Rule 3.2 Disclosure Statement. A review of this statement shows that this court has a conflict and that this matter must be reassigned to another Magistrate Judge. The court will prepare the necessary paperwork to have the remaining issues of the referral to be reassigned to another Magistrate Judge. The parties should file their stipulation resolving West's objection as soon as it is prepared. Mailed notice (aac, ) (Entered: 02/23/2011)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 200 Filed: 2/17/2011, Entered: None
                                              MINUTE entry before Honorable Young B. Kim: Status hearing held and continued to February 23, 2011, at 9:00 a.m. (c.s.t.) by phone. Plaintiffs are ordered to initiate the conference call and contact Courtroom Deputy Alex Castaneda at (312) 408-5168 or establish a call-bridge and provide the court with the call-in number and passcode. Parties reported that they are in the process of trying to resolve the concerns expressed by Class Member Stephen West in his objection to the class settlement. Mailed notice (aac, ) (Entered: 02/17/2011)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 199 Filed: 2/16/2011, Entered: None
                                                MEMORANDUM by Eric R. Chavez, Doris Steele, Herbert Steele, Sonia Torres in support of motion for miscellaneous relief, 185 Request for Award of Attorneys' Fees and Costs and Named Plaintiffs' Service Fees (Friedman, Andrew) (Entered: 02/16/2011)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 198 Filed: 2/16/2011, Entered: None
                                                  MEMORANDUM by Eric R. Chavez, Doris Steele, Herbert Steele, Sonia Torres in support of motion for miscellaneous relief, 185 for Final Approval of Settlement and Response to Objections (Friedman, Andrew) (Entered: 02/16/2011)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 197 Filed: 2/16/2011, Entered: None
                                                    Third AMENDED complaint by Eric R. Chavez, Doris Steele, Herbert Steele, Sonia Torres against GE Money Bank, WMC Mortgage Corporation, WMC Mortgage, LLC (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits 1 - 5)(Klein, Gary) (Entered: 02/16/2011)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 196 Filed: 2/16/2011, Entered: None
                                                      MINUTE entry before Honorable Young B. Kim: Plaintiffs' agreed motion for leave to file excess pages 187 is granted. Mailed notice (aac, ) (Entered: 02/16/2011)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 195 Filed: 2/14/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                        MINUTE entry before Honorable Young B. Kim: This matter having been assigned to Magistrate Judge Young B. Kim, a status conference will be held on February 17, 2011, at 10:00 a.m. by telephone. Plaintiff is ordered to initiate the conference call and contact Courtroom Deputy Alex Castaneda at (312) 408-5168 or establish a call-bridge and provide the court with the call-in number and passcode. The parties will be expected to discuss whether the objections to the proposed class settlement is fully briefed and whether there are any pending motions associated with the briefing of the objections. Prior to this status hearing, the court encourages the parties to consider and discuss whether to enter into a limited consent to this court's jurisdiction for purposes of adjudicating the pending objections. Mailed notice (aac, ) (Entered: 02/14/2011)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 194 Filed: 2/11/2011, Entered: None
                                                          EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE ORDER:Case referred to the Honorable Young B. Kim Signed by Executive Committee on 2/11/2011.(lp, ) (Entered: 02/14/2011)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 193 Filed: 2/10/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                            MINUTE entry before Honorable Blanche M. Manning: Fairness hearing set to 2/15/2011 is stricken. This case is referred to Magistrate Judge Kim for a report and recommendation on objections to class settlement 182 as well as plaintiffs' pending motions for final approval of attorney's fees 185 and for leave to file excess pages 187 . Status hearing set for 3/31/2011 at 11:00 AM.Mailed notice (rth, ) (Entered: 02/10/2011)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 192 Filed: 1/27/2011, Entered: None
                                                              REPLY by Plaintiff Stephen J. West in Support of Objections to Class Action Settlement (Newman, Randall) (Entered: 01/27/2011)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 191 Filed: 1/20/2011, Entered: None
                                                                MEMORANDUM of law in support of (1) Motion for Final Approval of Settlement and (2) Entry of Proposed Final Approval Order and Proposed Final Judgment and Order of Dismissal (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Thompson, James) (Entered: 01/21/2011)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 190 Filed: 1/20/2011, Entered: None
                                                                  DECLARATION of Michelle M. La Count, Esq. regarding motion for miscellaneous relief, 185 (Friedman, Andrew) (Entered: 01/20/2011)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 189 Filed: 1/20/2011, Entered: None
                                                                    DECLARATION of Counsel regarding motion for miscellaneous relief, 185 (Agreed Motion for Final Approval of Settlement and for Approval of Payment of Attorney's Fees, Costs and Class Representative Service Payments and Response to Objections (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7)(Friedman, Andrew) (Entered: 01/20/2011)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 188 Filed: 1/20/2011, Entered: None
                                                                      NOTICE of Motion by Andrew S Friedman for presentment of motion for leave to file excess pages 187 before Honorable Blanche M. Manning on 2/15/2011 at 11:30 AM. (Friedman, Andrew) (Entered: 01/20/2011)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 187 Filed: 1/20/2011, Entered: None
                                                                        MOTION by Plaintiffs Eric R. Chavez, Doris Steele, Herbert Steele, Sonia Torres for leave to file excess pages (Agreed) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Friedman, Andrew) (Entered: 01/20/2011)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 186 Filed: 1/20/2011, Entered: None
                                                                          NOTICE of Motion by Andrew S Friedman for presentment of motion for miscellaneous relief, 185 before Honorable Blanche M. Manning on 2/15/2011 at 11:30 AM. (Friedman, Andrew) (Entered: 01/20/2011)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 185 Filed: 1/20/2011, Entered: None
                                                                            MOTION by Plaintiffs Eric R. Chavez, Doris Steele, Herbert Steele, Sonia Torres(Agreed) For Final Approval of Class Action Settlement and for Approval of Payment of Attorney's Fees, Costs and Service Payments to Class Representatives and Response to Objections (Friedman, Andrew) (Entered: 01/20/2011)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 184 Filed: 1/20/2011, Entered: None
                                                                              DECLARATION of Gary Klein regarding set motion and R&R deadlines/hearings, 183 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4)(Klein, Gary) (Entered: 01/20/2011)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 183 Filed: 1/7/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                MINUTE entry before Honorable Blanche M. Manning:The parties are given to 1/20/2011 to file a response to the objections to the class settlement. Replies are to be filed by 1/27/2011. The parties are advised that these are final dates and that filing substantive prehearing briefs is mandatory.Mailed notice (jms, ) (Entered: 01/07/2011)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 182 Filed: 12/21/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                  Objections to Class Action Settlement and Notice of Intent to Appear on Behalf of Stephen J. West by Stephen J. West (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Randall S. Newman, Esq., # 2 Exhibit A to Declaration of Randall S. Newman, Esq., # 3 Exhibit B to Declaration of Randall S. Newman, Esq., # 4 Exhibit C to Declaration of Randall S. Newman, Esq.)(Newman, Randall) (Entered: 12/21/2010)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 181 Filed: 11/12/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                    CLAIM form. (lp, ) (Entered: 11/17/2010)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 180 Filed: 9/7/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                      PRELIMINARY APPROVAL ORDER Signed by the Honorable Blanche M. Manning on 9/7/2010:Mailed notice(rth, ) (Entered: 09/07/2010)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 179 Filed: 9/7/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                        MINUTE entry before Honorable Blanche M. Manning: Status hearing held. Motion hearing held. Plaintiffs' motion for preliminary approval of class action settlement 167 is granted. Fairness hearing set to 2/15/2011 at 11:30 a.m. Enter Preliminary Approval Order.Mailed notice (rth, ) (Entered: 09/07/2010)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 178 Filed: 9/3/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                          SEALED EXHIBIT by Defendant WMC Mortgage, LLC / Exhibits D and F to Declaration of Alana L. Brown regarding memorandum in support of motion, 174 (Thompson, James) (Entered: 09/03/2010)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 177 Filed: 9/3/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                            MINUTE entry before Honorable Blanche M. Manning: Defendant's motion to seal Exhibits D and F to the 9/1/2010 declaration of Alana L. Brown 175 is granted.Mailed notice (rth, ) (Entered: 09/03/2010)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 176 Filed: 9/1/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                              NOTICE of Motion by James L. Thompson for presentment of motion to seal 175 before Honorable Blanche M. Manning on 9/7/2010 at 11:00 AM. (Thompson, James) (Entered: 09/01/2010)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 175 Filed: 9/1/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                MOTION by Defendant WMC Mortgage, LLC to seal Exhibits D and F to Declaration of Alana L. Brown. (Thompson, James) (Entered: 09/01/2010)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 174 Filed: 9/1/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                  MEMORANDUM by WMC Mortgage, LLC in support of motion for miscellaneous relief 167 (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Alana Brown, # 2 Exhibit A to Declaration of Alana Brown, # 3 Exhibit B to Declaration of Alana Brown, # 4 Exhibit C to Declaration of Alana Brown, # 5 Exhibit D to Declaration of Alana Brown, # 6 Exhibit E to Declaration of Alana Brown, # 7 Exhibit F to Declaration of Alana Brown)(Thompson, James) (Entered: 09/01/2010)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 173 Filed: 8/30/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                    MINUTE entry before Honorable Blanche M. Manning: Justin C. Steffen's motion to withdraw as attorney 164 is granted. Plaintiffs' motion for leave to file excess pages 169 is granted. Joint request to adjourn status conference is granted. Status hearing set for 8/31/2010 is reset to 9/7/2010 at 11:00 AM.Mailed notice (rth, ) (Entered: 08/30/2010)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 172 Filed: 8/26/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                      DECLARATION of Wendy J. Harrison regarding motion for miscellaneous relief 167 (Klein, Gary) (Entered: 08/26/2010)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 171 Filed: 8/26/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                        DECLARATION of Gary Klein regarding motion for miscellaneous relief 167 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Settlement Agreement, # 2 Exhibit 2- Gary Klein Resume, # 3 Exhibit 3 - Shennan Kavanagh Resume, # 4 Exhibit 4 - Kevin Costello Resume)(Klein, Gary) (Entered: 08/26/2010)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 170 Filed: 8/26/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                          NOTICE of Motion by Gary Edward Klein for presentment of motion for leave to file, 169 before Honorable Blanche M. Manning on 9/7/2010 at 11:00 AM. (Klein, Gary) (Entered: 08/26/2010)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 169 Filed: 8/26/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                            MOTION by Plaintiffs Eric R. Chavez, Doris Steele, Herbert Steele, Sonia Torres for leave to file Excess Pages (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - [Proposed] Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement)(Klein, Gary) (Entered: 08/26/2010)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 168 Filed: 8/26/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                              NOTICE of Motion by Gary Edward Klein for presentment of motion for miscellaneous relief 167 before Honorable Blanche M. Manning on 9/7/2010 at 11:00 AM. (Klein, Gary) (Entered: 08/26/2010)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 167 Filed: 8/26/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                MOTION by Plaintiffs Eric R. Chavez, Doris Steele, Herbert Steele, Sonia Torres for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement (Klein, Gary) (Entered: 08/26/2010)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 166 Filed: 8/25/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                  Joint Request to Adjourn Status Conference by Eric R. Chavez, Doris Steele, Herbert Steele, Sonia Torres, WMC Mortgage, LLC (Thompson, James) (Entered: 08/25/2010)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 165 Filed: 8/17/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Motion by Justin Carey Steffen for presentment of motion to withdraw as attorney 164 before Honorable Blanche M. Manning on 8/31/2010 at 11:00 AM. (Steffen, Justin) (Entered: 08/17/2010)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 164 Filed: 8/17/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                      MOTION by counsel for Defendant WMC Mortgage, LLC to withdraw as attorney (Steffen, Justin) (Entered: 08/17/2010)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 163 Filed: 7/20/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                        MINUTE entry before Honorable Blanche M. Manning: At the parties' request, status hearing set for 7/20/2010 is reset to 8/31/2010 at 11:00 AM.Mailed notice (rth, ) (Entered: 07/20/2010)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 162 Filed: 7/16/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                          JOINT REQUEST to Adjourn Status Conference by Eric R. Chavez, Doris Steele, Herbert Steele, Sonia Torres, WMC Mortgage, LLC (Thompson, James) (Entered: 07/16/2010)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 161 Filed: 5/25/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                            MINUTE entry before Honorable Young B. Kim: Joint motion to adjourn the status conference 157 is granted. The initial status conference scheduled for May 26, 2010, is stricken. The District Court advises that the parties have reached a settlement. All matters relating to the referral having been resolved, the case is returned to the assigned judge. Mailed notice (aac, ) (Entered: 05/25/2010)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 160 Filed: 5/25/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Motion by James L. Thompson for presentment of motion for miscellaneous relief 157 before Honorable Young B. Kim on 5/28/2010 at 11:00 AM. (Thompson, James) (Entered: 05/25/2010)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 159 Filed: 5/25/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                MINUTE entry before Honorable Blanche M. Manning: Status hearing set for 6/17/2010 is reset to 7/20/2010 at 11:00 AM.Mailed notice (rth, ) (Entered: 05/25/2010)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 158 Filed: 5/25/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Motion by James L. Thompson for presentment of motion for miscellaneous relief 157 before Honorable Blanche M. Manning on 5/28/2010 at 09:00 AM. (Thompson, James) (Entered: 05/25/2010)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 157 Filed: 5/25/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                    MOTION by Plaintiffs Eric R. Chavez, Doris Steele, Herbert Steele, Sonia Torres, Defendant WMC Mortgage, LLC TO ADJOURN STATUS CONFERENCE (JOINT) (Thompson, James) (Entered: 05/25/2010)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 156 Filed: 5/24/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                      JOINT REQUEST TO ADJOURN STATUS CONFERENCE by Eric R. Chavez, Doris Steele, Herbert Steele, Sonia Torres, WMC Mortgage, LLC (Thompson, James) (Entered: 05/24/2010)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 155 Filed: 5/12/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                        MINUTE entry before Honorable Young B. Kim: This matter having been reassigned to Magistrate Judge Young B. Kim, an initial status conference will be held on May 26, 2010 at 2:00 p.m. in Courtroom 1944D. Mailed notice (aac, ) (Entered: 05/12/2010)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 154 Filed: 5/7/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                          EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE ORDER: It appearing that Young B. Kim has been appointed as a United States Magistrate Judge for the Northern District of Illinois, and It further appearing that Internal Operating Procedure 17(a) provides for the creation of an initial calendar for a newly-appointed magistrate judge; therefore IT is hereby ordered that the attached list of civil consent cases and civil referrals be and they are hereby reassigned to form the initial calendar of the Honorable Young B. Kim. Case referred to the Honorable Young B. Kim for the purpose of holding proceedings related to: discovery supervision, settlement conference, and all nondispositive pretrial motions. Signed by Executive Committee on 5/7/10. Mailed notice. (gmr, ) (Entered: 05/10/2010)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 153 Filed: 3/23/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                            NOTICE by Al Hofeld, III of Change of Address (Hofeld, Al) (Entered: 03/23/2010)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 152 Filed: 3/9/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                              MINUTE entry before Honorable Blanche M. Manning: The court has reviewed the parties' joint status report regarding pending settlement negotiations and mediation. The status hearing set for 3/23/2010 is reset to 6/17/2010 at 11:00 AM. based on the expected mediation date.Mailed notice (rth, ) (Entered: 03/09/2010)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 151 Filed: 3/1/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                STATUS Report Regarding Pending Settlement Negotiations And Mediation (JOINT) by Eric R. Chavez, Doris Steele, Herbert Steele, Sonia Torres, WMC Mortgage, LLC (Thompson, James) (Entered: 03/01/2010)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 150 Filed: 2/12/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                  MINUTE entry before Honorable Blanche M. Manning: Status hearing set for 3/23/2010 at 11:00 AM so the parties may report on the progress of mediation.Mailed notice (rth, ) (Entered: 02/12/2010)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 1/12/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                    MINUTE entry before Honorable Blanche M. Manning: Pursuant to the parties' stipulation to stay litigation pending settlement negotiations and mediation, pending motions 108 111 128 136 are stricken without prejudice. The parties shall file a joint status report and provide copies to this court and Magistrate Judge Ashman by 3/1/2010, and shall advise the court if any significant developments occur prior to that date.Mailed notice (rth, ) (Entered: 01/12/2010)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 148 Filed: 1/4/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                      MINUTE entry before Honorable Martin C. Ashman: Magistrate Judge Status hearing of 1/28/2010 is stricken, pursuant to the parties' stipulation to stay litigation pending settlement negotiations and mediation. Mailed notice. (is, ) (Entered: 01/04/2010)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 147 Filed: 12/14/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                        STIPULATION To Stay Litigation Pending Settlement Negotiations And Mediation (Thompson, James) (Entered: 12/14/2009)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 146 Filed: 11/13/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                          MINUTE entry before the Honorable Martin C. Ashman: Pursuant to the parties' stipulation to vacate and reschedule status hearing, Magistrate Judge Status hearing of 11/17/2009 is vacated. Magistrate Judge Status hearing is reset to 1/28/2010 at 10:00 AM. Mailed notice. (is, ) (Entered: 11/13/2009)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 11/12/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                            STIPULATION To Vacate And Reschedule Status Hearing (Thompson, James) (Entered: 11/12/2009)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 144 Filed: 10/26/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE by Justin Carey Steffen of Change of Address (Steffen, Justin) (Entered: 10/26/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 10/23/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE by James L. Thompson of Change of Address (Thompson, James) (Entered: 10/23/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 10/23/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE by Matthew James Thomas of Change of Address (Thomas, Matthew) (Entered: 10/23/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 10/2/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                    MINUTE entry before the Honorable Martin C. Ashman: Pursuant to the parties' stipulation to vacate and reschedule status hearing, Magistrate Judge Status hearing of 10/6/2009 is vacated. Magistrate Judge Status hearing is reset to 11/17/2009 at 10:00 AM. Mailed notice. (is, ) (Entered: 10/02/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 10/2/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                      STIPULATION to Vacate and Reschedule Status Hearing (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Rescheduling Status Hearing)(Harrison, Wendy) (Entered: 10/02/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 9/16/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                        MINUTE entry before the Honorable Blanche M. Manning: Plaintiffs' motion to strike or in the alternative for consideration of previously filed response 136 is taken under advisement.Mailed notice (rth, ) (Entered: 09/16/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 9/14/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE by WMC Mortgage, LLCin Opposition to MOTION by Plaintiffs Herbert Steele, Eric R. Chavez, Sonia Torres, Doris Steele to strike Response 134 or in the Alternative for Consideration of Previously Filed Response 136 (Thompson, James) (Entered: 09/14/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 9/4/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Motion by Gary Edward Klein for presentment of motion to strike, motion for relief 136 before Honorable Blanche M. Manning on 9/17/2009 at 11:00 AM. (Klein, Gary) (Entered: 09/04/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 9/4/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION by Plaintiffs Herbert Steele, Eric R. Chavez, Sonia Torres, Doris Steele to strike Response 134 or in the Alternative for Consideration of Previously Filed Response (Klein, Gary) (Entered: 09/04/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 9/1/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                MINUTE entry before the Honorable Blanche M. Manning: Novack and Macey LLP's motion to terminate CM/ECF electronic notification 132 is granted. The Clerk of the Court shall terminate the names of Eric N. Macey and Kristen Werries Collier from the CM/ECF electronic notification list for this ongoing case. Plaintiff's motion to strike or in the alternative, for leave to file reply 128 is taken under advisement. The court will rule on said motion when it rules on the motion to reconsider. Mailed notice (ep, ) (Entered: 09/02/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 9/1/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE by Defendant WMC Mortgage, LLC to declaration 131 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Thompson, James) (Entered: 09/01/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 8/27/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Motion by Kristen Werries Collier, Eric Neal Macey for presentment of motion to terminate CM/ECF Electronic Notifications 132 before Honorable Blanche M. Manning on 9/3/2009 at 11:00 AM. (ep, ) (Entered: 08/28/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 8/27/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by Defendant GE Money Bank to Terminate CM/ECF Electronic Notifications. (ep, ) (Entered: 08/28/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 8/27/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                        DECLARATION of Gary Klein for the Purpose of Submitting Supplemental Authority Directly Relevant to Plaintiffs' Motion for Clarification/Reconsideration (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Klein, Gary) (Entered: 08/27/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 8/27/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE by WMC Mortgage, LLCin Opposition to MOTION by Plaintiffs Herbert Steele, Eric R. Chavez, Sonia Torres, Doris Steele to strike Response 127 or in the Alternative for Leave to File a Reply 128 (Thompson, James) (Entered: 08/27/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 8/25/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Motion by Gary Edward Klein for presentment of motion to strike, motion for relief 128 before Honorable Blanche M. Manning on 9/3/2009 at 11:00 AM. (Klein, Gary) (Entered: 08/25/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 8/24/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION by Plaintiffs Herbert Steele, Eric R. Chavez, Sonia Torres, Doris Steele to strike Response 127 or in the Alternative for Leave to File a Reply (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Klein, Gary) (Entered: 08/24/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 8/21/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE by Defendant WMC Mortgage, LLC to declaration 126 (Thompson, James) (Entered: 08/21/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 8/12/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                  DECLARATION of Gary Klein for the Purpose of Submitting Supplemental Authority Directly Relevant to Plaintiffs' Motion for Clarification/Reconsideration (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Klein, Gary) (Entered: 08/12/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 8/12/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                    MINUTE entry before the Honorable Martin C. Ashman: Pursuant to the parties' stipulation to vacate and reschedule status hearing, Magistrate Judge Status hearing of 8/18/2009 is vacated. Magistrate Judge Status hearing is reset to 10/6/2009 at 10:00 AM. Mailed notice. (is, ) (Entered: 08/12/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 8/11/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                      STIPULATION To Vacate And Reschedule Status Hearing (Thompson, James) (Entered: 08/11/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 8/4/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE by Justin Carey Steffen of Change of Address For Denise Plunkett, Jay Fastow, Alana Brown (Steffen, Justin) (Entered: 08/04/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 6/26/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                          MINUTE entry before the Honorable Martin C. Ashman: Pursuant to the parties' stipulation to vacate and reschedule status hearing, Magistrate Judge Status hearing of 6/29/2009 is vacated. Magistrate Judge Status hearing is reset to 8/18/2009 at 10:00 AM. Mailed notice. (is, ) (Entered: 06/26/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 6/25/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                            STIPULATION To Vacate And Reschedule Status Hearing (Thompson, James) (Entered: 06/25/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 6/24/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                              REPLY by WMC Mortgage, LLC to memorandum in opposition to motion 117 (Thompson, James) (Entered: 06/24/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 6/15/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                MINUTE entry before the Honorable Blanche M. Manning: The claims as to plaintiff Alexandra Diaz are voluntarily dismissed without prejudice pursuant to FRCP 41(a). Mailed notice (ep, ) (Entered: 06/16/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 6/8/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Plaintiffs' Request for Oral Argument by Herbert Steele, Eric R. Chavez, Sonia Torres, Doris Steele (Klein, Gary) (Entered: 06/08/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 6/8/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MEMORANDUM by Herbert Steele, Eric R. Chavez, Sonia Torres, Doris Steele in Opposition to motion to dismiss 111 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Klein, Gary) (Entered: 06/08/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 6/8/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Suggestion of Mootness of Motion to Dismiss by Defendant GE Money Bank by Herbert Steele, Eric R. Chavez, Sonia Torres, Doris Steele (Klein, Gary) (Entered: 06/08/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 6/5/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Alexandra Diaz Without Prejudice as to her claims only (Friedman, Andrew) (Entered: 06/05/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 5/11/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant WMC Mortgage, LLC by Matthew James Thomas (Thomas, Matthew) (Entered: 05/11/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 5/11/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE by WMC Mortgage, LLC re memorandum in support of motion 112 , MOTION by Defendant WMC Mortgage, LLC to dismiss / Defendant WMC Mortgage, LLC's Motion to Dismiss the Second Amended Complaint 111 / Notice of Filing of Defendant WMC Mortgage, LLC's Motion to Dismiss the Second Amended Complaint and Memorandum of Law in Support thereof (Thompson, James) (Entered: 05/11/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 5/11/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MEMORANDUM by WMC Mortgage, LLC in support of motion to dismiss 111 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Pt. 1, # 2 Exhibit 1 - Pt. 2, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4)(Thompson, James) (Entered: 05/11/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 5/11/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION by Defendant WMC Mortgage, LLC to dismiss / Defendant WMC Mortgage, LLC's Motion to Dismiss the Second Amended Complaint (Thompson, James) (Entered: 05/11/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 5/11/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE by GE Money Bank re MOTION by Defendant GE Money Bank to dismiss the Second Amended Class Action Complaint, or in the Alternative, to Strike Subclass Definitions 108 , memorandum in support of motion 109 (Collier, Kristen) (Entered: 05/11/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 5/11/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MEMORANDUM by GE Money Bank in support of motion to dismiss 108 the Second Amended Class Action Complaint, or in the Alternative, to Strike Subclass Definitions (Collier, Kristen) (Entered: 05/11/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 5/11/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by Defendant GE Money Bank to dismiss the Second Amended Class Action Complaint, or in the Alternative, to Strike Subclass Definitions (Collier, Kristen) (Entered: 05/11/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 5/11/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MINUTE entry before the Honorable Martin C. Ashman: Magistrate Judge Status hearing of 5/13/2009 is vacated. Magistrate Judge Status hearing is reset to 6/29/2009 at 10:00 AM. Mailed notice. (is, ) (Entered: 05/11/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 5/8/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          STIPULATION To Vacate And Reschedule Status Hearing (Thompson, James) (Entered: 05/08/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 4/9/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MINUTE entry before the Honorable Martin C. Ashman: Magistrate Judge Status hearing of 4/14/2009 is vacated. Magistrate Judge Status hearing is reset to 5/13/2009 at 10:00 AM., pursuant to stipulation to vacate and reschedule status hearing by the parties. Mailed notice. (is, ) (Entered: 04/09/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 4/7/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              STIPULATION TO VACATE AND RESCHEDULE STATUS HEARING (Thompson, James) (Entered: 04/07/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 4/6/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MINUTE entry before the Honorable Blanche M. Manning: The briefing schedule set on plaintiffs' motion to reconsider 98 is vacated. Pursuant to stipulation, defendants' consolidated response to plaintiffs' motion for reconsideration as well as their motion to dismiss and memorandum in support shall be filed by 5/11/2009, not to exceed 25 pages. Plaintiffs' consolidated response to the motion to dismiss second amended complaint and reply to its motion for reconsideration 98 shall be filed by 6/8/2009, not to exceed 25 pages. Each defendant's reply to the motion to dismiss to be filed by 6/24/2009, not to exceed 15 pages. The court will notify the parties if oral argument is necessary. The parties having agreed to this briefing by stipulation, no extensions will be allowed. Mailed notice (ep, ) (Entered: 04/07/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 4/1/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  STIPULATION To Vacate Presentment Hearing And Set Briefing Schedule On Plaintiffs' Motion For Clarification/Reconsideration And Defendants' Motions To Dismiss Plaintiffs' Second Amended Class Action Complaint (AGREED) (Thompson, James) (Entered: 04/01/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 4/1/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MINUTE entry before the Honorable Blanche M. Manning: On plaintiffs' motion to clarify 98 , response to be filed by 4/23/2009. Reply to be filed by 5/7/2009. Ruling by mail.Mailed notice (rth, ) (Entered: 04/01/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 3/20/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Motion by Gary Edward Klein for presentment of motion to clarify 98 before Honorable Blanche M. Manning on 4/2/2009 at 11:00 AM. (Klein, Gary) (Entered: 03/20/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 3/20/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MEMORANDUM by Herbert Steele, Alexandra Diaz, Eric R. Chavez, Sonia Torres, Doris Steele in support of motion to clarify 98 / reconsider (Klein, Gary) (Entered: 03/20/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 3/20/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION by Plaintiffs Herbert Steele, Alexandra Diaz, Eric R. Chavez, Sonia Torres, Doris Steele to clarify / reconsider (Klein, Gary) (Entered: 03/20/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 3/20/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Second AMENDED complaint by Herbert Steele, Alexandra Diaz, Eric R. Chavez, Sonia Torres, Doris Steele against GE Money Bank, WMC Mortgage Corporation, WMC Mortgage, LLC (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits 1-6)(Klein, Gary) (Entered: 03/20/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 3/19/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MINUTE entry before the Honorable Martin C. Ashman: Plaintiffs' unopposed motion for short extension of time (to and including 3/20/2009) to file a second amended complaint 90 , 94 is granted. Mailed notice. (is, ) (Entered: 03/19/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 3/19/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Re- NOTICE of Motion by Al Hofeld, Jr for presentment of extension of time 94 before Honorable Martin C. Ashman on 3/24/2009 at 10:30 AM. (Hofeld, Al) (Entered: 03/19/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 3/19/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by Plaintiffs Herbert Steele, Alexandra Diaz, Eric R. Chavez, Sonia Torres, Doris Steele for extension of time to file second amended complaint (Hofeld, Al) (Entered: 03/19/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 3/16/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MINUTE entry before the Honorable Blanche M. Manning: This case having been referred, in part, for ruling on all nondispositive pretrial motions, plaintiffs' unopposed motion for short extension of time to file second amended complaint 90 shall be re-noticed before Magistrate Judge Ashman.Mailed notice (rth, ) (Entered: 03/16/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 3/12/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MINUTE entry before the Honorable Martin C. Ashman: Magistrate Judge Status hearing of 3/18/2009 is stricken. Magistrate Judge Status hearing is reset for 4/14/2009 at 10:00 AM., by agreement of the parties. Mailed notice. (is, ) (Entered: 03/12/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 3/10/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Motion by Al Hofeld, Jr for presentment of extension of time 90 before Honorable Blanche M. Manning on 3/17/2009 at 11:00 AM. (Hofeld, Al) (Entered: 03/10/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 3/10/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION by Plaintiffs Herbert Steele, Alexandra Diaz, Eric R. Chavez, Sonia Torres, Doris Steele for extension of time to file second amended complaint (Hofeld, Al) (Entered: 03/10/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 2/13/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            AGREED Scheduling Order. Signed by the Honorable Martin C. Ashman on 2/13/2009. (ep, ) (Entered: 02/18/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 2/13/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MINUTE entry before the Honorable Martin C. Ashman: Enter agreed scheduling order. Deadline for service of third-party discovery requests by 10/31/2009. Deadline for service of party discovery requests by 11/30/2009. Close fact discovery by 2/15/2010. (For further detail see separate order(s).) Mailed notice (ep, ) (Entered: 02/18/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 87 Filed: 2/17/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MEMORANDUM and Order Signed by the Honorable Blanche M. Manning on 2/17/2009:Mailed notice(rth, ) (Entered: 02/17/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 2/17/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MINUTE entry before the Honorable Blanche M. Manning: The motions to dismiss, strike, and to join necessary parties filed by GEMB 32 and WMC 35 are granted in part and denied in part. Consistent with this order and counsels Rule 11 obligations, the plaintiffs may, by March 11, 2009, file an amended complaint that repleads the portions of the complaint that were dismissed or stricken. The plaintiffs must also join the brokers as necessary parties by this date. Enter Memorandum and Order.Mailed notice (rth, ) (Entered: 02/17/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 2/13/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    DECLARATION of Gary Klein for the Purpose of Submitting Supplemental Authority Directly Relevant to Defendants' Motions to Dismiss (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Klein, Gary) (Entered: 02/13/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 2/10/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MINUTE entry before the Honorable Martin C. Ashman: Magistrate Judge Status hearing held on 2/10/2009; and continued to 3/18/2009 at 10:00 AM. Parties to submit an agreed discovery scheduling order on or before 2/13/2009. Mailed notice. (is, ) (Entered: 02/10/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 2/10/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MINUTE entry before the Honorable Blanche M. Manning:Applications to appear pro hac vice for Edward W. Ciolko 67 , Charles Delbaum 73 , Joseph H. Meltzer 78 , Donna Siegel Moffa 79 , Peter A. Muhic 80 , and Joseph A. Weeden 81 are granted.Mailed notice (rth, ) (Entered: 02/10/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 1/26/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MINUTE entry before the Honorable Martin C. Ashman: Magistrate Judge Status hearing set for 2/10/2009 at 10:00 AM., in courtroom 1386. Mailed notice. (is, ) (Entered: 01/26/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 1/22/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 07520000000003446830. by Joseph A. Weeden on behalf of Plaintiffs (Weeden, Joseph) (Entered: 01/22/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 1/20/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 07520000000003436942. of Peter A. Muhic on behalf of Plaintiffs (Muhic, Peter) (Entered: 01/20/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 1/20/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 07520000000003436813. of Donna Siegel Moffa on behalf of Plaintiffs (Moffa, Donna) (Entered: 01/20/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 1/20/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 07520000000003436550. of Joseph H. Meltzer on behalf of Plaintiffs (Meltzer, Joseph) (Entered: 01/20/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 1/15/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE ORDER: Case referred to the Honorable Martin C. Ashman pursuant to Local Rule 72.1. Signed by Executive Committee on 1/15/2009. (ep, ) (Entered: 01/20/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 1/16/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Designation of Local Counsel by Alexandra Diaz (Delbaum, Charles) (Entered: 01/16/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 1/15/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        PROTECTIVE Order and Confidentiality Agreement. (Exhibits). Signed by the Honorable Martin C. Ashman on 1/15/2009. (ep, ) (Entered: 01/16/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 1/15/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MINUTE entry before the Honorable Martin C. Ashman: Plaintiffs and defendants' agreed motion for entry of protective order and confidentiality agreement 71 is granted. Mailed notice. (is, ) (Entered: 01/15/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 1/15/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 07520000000003428988. (Delbaum, Charles) (Entered: 01/15/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 1/12/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Motion by James L. Thompson for presentment of motion for protective order 71 before Honorable Martin C. Ashman on 1/20/2009 at 10:30 AM. (Thompson, James) (Entered: 01/12/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 1/12/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION by Defendants WMC Mortgage Corporation, WMC Mortgage, LLC for protective order And Confidentiality Agreement (Agreed) (Attachments: # 1 Protective Order And Confidentiality Agreement)(Thompson, James) (Entered: 01/12/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 12/23/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE by Defendant GE Money Bank to notice of filing 68 and Notice of Supplemental Authority Regarding Motion to Strike Allegations Aimed at Tolling the Statute of LImitations 69 (Macey, Eric) (Entered: 12/23/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 12/19/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE by Defendant WMC Mortgage, LLC to notice of filing 68 and Notice of Supplemental Authority Regarding Motion to Strike Allegations Aimed at Tolling the Statute of Limitations (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Thompson, James) (Entered: 12/19/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 12/9/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE by Herbert Steele, Alexandra Diaz, Eric R. Chavez, Sonia Torres, Doris Steele re response in opposition to motion, 57 of Supplemental Authority (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Friedman, Andrew) (Entered: 12/09/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 11/14/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 07520000000003279548. of Edward W. Ciolko on behalf of Plaintiffs. (Ciolko, Edward) (Entered: 11/14/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 11/11/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SUMMONS Returned Executed by Herbert Steele as to WMC Mortgage Corporation on 4/28/2008, answer due 5/19/2008. (Hofeld, Al) (Entered: 11/11/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 10/23/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MINUTE entry before the Honorable Blanche M. Manning: Status hearing set to 10/28/2008 is hereby stricken. New dates, as necessary, will be set forth in the ruling on the motion to dismiss.Mailed notice (rth, ) (Entered: 10/23/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 9/19/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              REPLY by WMC Mortgage, LLC to response in opposition to motion, 57 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Thompson, James) (Entered: 09/19/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 9/19/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                REPLY by Defendant GE Money Bank to response in opposition to motion, 57 And In Support of Its Motion to Dismiss 32 (Collier, Kristen) (Entered: 09/19/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 9/18/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Corrected Table of Contents for Memorandum in Support of Motions of Defendant WMC Mortgage Corporation to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, or in the Alternative to Join Necessary Parties and to Strike Certain Allegations in the Amended Complaint. by WMC Mortgage, LLC (Thompson, James) (Entered: 09/18/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 9/15/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MINUTE entry before the Honorable Blanche M. Manning: Defendant's agreed motion for leave to file a reply brief in excess of 15 pages 59 is granted.Mailed notice (rth, ) (Entered: 09/15/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 9/11/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Motion by James L. Thompson for presentment of motion for leave to file excess pages 59 before Honorable Blanche M. Manning on 9/16/2008 at 11:00 AM. (Thompson, James) (Entered: 09/11/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 9/11/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by Defendants WMC Mortgage Corporation, WMC Mortgage, LLC for leave to file excess pages (Agreed Motion). (Thompson, James) (Entered: 09/11/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 8/28/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MINUTE entry before the Honorable Blanche M. Manning: Plaintiffs' unopposed motion for leave to file a brief in excess of fifteen pages 55 is granted. The Court encourages counsel, however, to be as concise as possible. No appearance on 8/28/2008 is necessary. Mailed and telephoned notice by judge's staff. (srb,) (Entered: 09/11/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 57 Filed: 9/2/2008, Entered: 9/2/2008 Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE by Herbert Steele, Alexandra Diaz, Eric R. Chavez, Sonia Torres, Doris Steelein Opposition to MOTION by Defendant WMC Mortgage, LLC to dismiss[35], MOTION by Defendant GE Money Bank to dismiss[32] (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B)(Klein, Gary)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 56 Filed: 8/22/2008, Entered: 8/22/2008 Notice of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Motion by Andrew S Friedman for presentment of motion for leave to file excess pages[55] before Honorable Blanche M. Manning on 8/28/2008 at 11:00 AM. (Friedman, Andrew)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 55 Filed: 8/22/2008, Entered: 8/22/2008 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION by Plaintiffs Herbert Steele, Alexandra Diaz, Eric R. Chavez, Sonia Torres, Doris Steele for leave to file excess pages to Consolidated Response to Defendants' Motions to Dismiss (Friedman, Andrew)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 54 Filed: 8/19/2008, Entered: 8/21/2008 Motion to Stay
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by Defendants GE Money Bank, WMC Mortgage Corporation, WMC Mortgage, LLC to stay discovery and disclosures temporarily. (vmj, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 53 Filed: 8/14/2008, Entered: 8/19/2008 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac ViceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MINUTE entry before the Honorable Blanche M. Manning: Hearing on motions held on 8/14/2008. The parties agreed motion to extend briefing schedule on defendants' motions [47] is granted. Plaintiffs to file brief in opposition to the motions by 9/2/2008. Defendants' to file a consolidated reply by 9/19/2008. Defendants' Motion for leave to file instanter motion to stay discovery and disclosures temporarily [45] is granted. Defendants' motion to stay discovery is denied as stated in open court. Applications to appear pro hac vice [42], [43], and [52] are granted. A status hearing is set for 10/28/2008 at 11:00 A.M. This case is referred to the Magistrate Judge for discovery supervision, non-dispositive motions and a settlement conference up until the filing of dispositive motions. The parties are directed to submit a proposed agreed discovery schedule to this Court as well as the Magistrate Judge as soon as possible. Mailed notice by judge's staff. (srb,)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 52 Filed: 8/14/2008, Entered: 8/14/2008, Terminated: 8/14/2008 motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 07520000000003021107. (Brown, Alana)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 51 Filed: 8/13/2008, Entered: 8/13/2008 Notice of Correction
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Correction regarding notice of motion [48] (emd, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 50 Filed: 8/13/2008, Entered: 8/13/2008 Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE by Herbert Steele, Alexandra Diaz, Eric R. Chavez, Sonia Torres, Doris Steelein Opposition to MOTION by Defendants GE Money Bank, WMC Mortgage, LLC for leave to file Instanter Defendants' Motion to Stay Discovery and Disclosures Temporarily[45] (Friedman, Andrew)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 49 Filed: 8/12/2008, Entered: 8/12/2008 Notice of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Corrected NOTICE of Motion by Wendy J. Harrison for presentment of motion for extension of time to file response/reply, motion for relief, [47] before Honorable Blanche M. Manning on 8/14/2008 at 11:00 AM. (Harrison, Wendy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 48 Filed: 8/12/2008, Entered: 8/12/2008 Notice of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Incorrect document was linked.(Harrison, Wendy) Modified on 8/13/2008 (emd, ).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 47 Filed: 8/12/2008, Entered: 8/12/2008, Terminated: 8/14/2008 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Repl
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION by Plaintiffs Herbert Steele, Alexandra Diaz, Eric R. Chavez, Sonia Torres, Doris Steele for extension of time to file response/reply as to motion to dismiss[35], motion to dismiss[32] (Agreed) (Harrison, Wendy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 46 Filed: 8/8/2008, Entered: 8/8/2008 Notice of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Motion by James L. Thompson for presentment of motion for leave to file[45] before Honorable Blanche M. Manning on 8/14/2008 at 11:00 AM. (Thompson, James)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 45 Filed: 8/8/2008, Entered: 8/8/2008, Terminated: 8/14/2008 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by Defendants GE Money Bank, WMC Mortgage, LLC for leave to file Instanter Defendants' Motion to Stay Discovery and Disclosures Temporarily (Attachments: # (1) Motion to Stay Discovery and Disclosures Temporarily)(Thompson, James)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 44 Filed: 8/8/2008, Entered: 8/8/2008 Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      STATUS Report Initial Joint Status Report by WMC Mortgage, LLC (Thompson, James)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 43 Filed: 8/8/2008, Entered: 8/8/2008, Terminated: 8/14/2008 motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 07520000000003005853. (Bell, Marshall)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 42 Filed: 8/5/2008, Entered: 8/5/2008, Terminated: 8/14/2008 motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 07520000000002996533. (Fastow, Jay)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 41 Filed: 7/22/2008, Entered: 7/22/2008 notification of affiliates pursuant to local rule
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by WMC Mortgage, LLC (Thompson, James)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 40 Filed: 7/21/2008, Entered: 7/21/2008 text entry
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MINUTE entry before the Honorable Blanche M. Manning: Minute entry of 7/16/2008 (38) is amended in part as follows: Applications to appear pro hac vice on behalf of Walter E. Zalenski [26] and John P. Mastando III [27] are granted. The remainder of the minute entry to stand.Mailed notice (rth, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 39 Filed: 7/18/2008, Entered: 7/18/2008 notification of affiliates pursuant to local rule
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by GE Money Bank (Collier, Kristen)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 38 Filed: 7/16/2008, Entered: 7/16/2008 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MINUTE entry before the Honorable Blanche M. Manning:Applications to appear pro hac vice on behalf of Eric Neal Macey[26] and Kristen Werries Collier [27] are granted. On defendants GE Money Bank and WMC Mortgage's motions to dismiss[32][35], the plaintiffs must file a consolidated response by 8/14/2008. Replies to be filed by 8/28/2008. For any common issues, the defendants should file a consolidated reply with separate individual replies if necessary. Ruling by mail.Mailed notice (rth, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 37 Filed: 7/11/2008, Entered: 7/11/2008 Notice of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Motion by James L. Thompson for presentment of motion to dismiss[35] before Honorable Blanche M. Manning on 7/17/2008 at 11:00 AM. (Thompson, James)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 36 Filed: 7/11/2008, Entered: 7/11/2008 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MEMORANDUM by WMC Mortgage, LLC in support of motion to dismiss[35] (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit C, # (4) Exhibit D, # (5) Exhibit E, # (6) Exhibit F)(Thompson, James)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 35 Filed: 7/11/2008, Entered: 7/11/2008 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by Defendant WMC Mortgage, LLC to dismiss (Thompson, James)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 34 Filed: 7/11/2008, Entered: 7/11/2008 Notice of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Motion by Kristen Werries Collier for presentment of motion to dismiss[32] before Honorable Blanche M. Manning on 7/17/2008 at 11:00 AM. (Collier, Kristen)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 33 Filed: 7/11/2008, Entered: 7/11/2008 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MEMORANDUM by GE Money Bank in support of motion to dismiss[32] (Collier, Kristen)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 32 Filed: 7/11/2008, Entered: 7/11/2008 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION by Defendant GE Money Bank to dismiss (Collier, Kristen)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 31 Filed: 7/7/2008, Entered: 7/7/2008 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MINUTE entry before the Honorable Blanche M. Manning: The court appreciates the detailed explanation supporting the defendants' request to file an oversized brief. The number of pages sought appears to be very generous. Nevertheless, the motion to file an oversized brief of 35 pages [29] is granted with the understanding that counsel should strive to be as concise as possible. Consolidated motion and memorandum in support to be filed by 7/11/2008. Consolidated response to be filed by 8/8/2008. Consolidated reply to be filed by 8/22/2008. Status hearing set to 7/17/2008 is hereby stricken. New dates, as necessary, will be set in the ruling on the motion to dismiss.Mailed notice (rth, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 30 Filed: 7/2/2008, Entered: 7/2/2008 Notice of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Motion by James L. Thompson for presentment of motion for extension of time to file[29] before Honorable Blanche M. Manning on 7/8/2008 at 11:00 AM. (Thompson, James)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 29 Filed: 7/2/2008, Entered: 7/2/2008, Terminated: 7/7/2008 Motion for Extension of Time to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by Defendant WMC Mortgage, LLC for extension of time to file A Brief In Excess Of Fifteen Pages (Renewed Agreed) (Thompson, James)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 28 Filed: 7/1/2008, Entered: 7/1/2008 Set/Reset Hearings
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MINUTE entry before the Honorable Blanche M. Manning: The minute entry dated 6/30/2008 requesting extension of time, specifically, "Defendant's agreed motion for leave to extend time to 7/11/2008 to answer or otherwise plead [23] is granted." shall also include defendant GE Money Bank. Status hearing set for 7/8/2008 is reset to 7/17/2008 at 11:00 AM.Mailed notice (rth, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 25 Filed: 6/30/2008, Entered: 6/30/2008 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MINUTE entry before the Honorable Blanche M. Manning: Defendant's agreed motion for leave to extend time to 7/11/2008 to answer or otherwise plead [23] is granted. Defendant's agreed motion for leave to file a brief in excess of 15 pages [23] is denied without prejudice as WMC has not provided sufficient justification (or, indeed, an explanation) for its request to file a brief of more than double the number of pages allowed by the Local Rules.Mailed notice (rth, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 27 Filed: 6/27/2008, Entered: 7/1/2008 motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for John P. Mastando III on behalf of GE Money. Filing fee $ 50. (ca, ) .
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 26 Filed: 6/27/2008, Entered: 7/1/2008 motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Walter E. Zalenski on behalf of GE Money. Filing fee $ 50. (ca, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 24 Filed: 6/26/2008, Entered: 6/26/2008 Notice of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Motion by James L. Thompson for presentment of motion for extension of time to file answer, motion for leave to file[23] before Honorable Blanche M. Manning on 7/1/2008 at 11:00 AM. (Thompson, James)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 23 Filed: 6/26/2008, Entered: 6/26/2008, Terminated: 6/30/2008 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION by Defendant WMC Mortgage, LLC for extension of time to file answer Or Otherwise Plead, MOTION by Defendant WMC Mortgage, LLC for leave to file A Brief In Excess Of Fifteen Pages (Thompson, James)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 22 Filed: 6/9/2008, Entered: 6/9/2008 Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Herbert Steele, Alexandra Diaz, Eric R. Chavez, Sonia Torres, Doris Steele by Gary Edward Klein (Klein, Gary)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 21 Filed: 5/29/2008, Entered: 6/6/2008 Description not availableCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    APPLICATION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of WMC Mortgage, LLC by Denise Lynne Plunkett; Order entered granting leave by Judge Honorable Blanche M. Manning. Filing fee $ 50 paid, receipt number 4624003061. (rp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 20 Filed: 5/21/2008, Entered: 5/21/2008 Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant GE Money Bank by Kristen Werries Collier (Collier, Kristen)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 19 Filed: 5/21/2008, Entered: 5/21/2008 Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant GE Money Bank by Eric Neal Macey (Macey, Eric)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 18 Filed: 5/20/2008, Entered: 5/20/2008 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MINUTE entry before the Honorable Blanche M. Manning: Joint motion for extension of time to 7/2/2008 to answer or otherwise plead [16] is granted. Requests for extension of this date will be strongly disfavored. Status hearing set for 5/20/2008 is reset to 7/8/2008 at 11:00 AM.Mailed notice (rth, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 17 Filed: 5/19/2008, Entered: 5/19/2008 Notice of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Motion by James L. Thompson for presentment of motion for extension of time to file answer[16] before Honorable Blanche M. Manning on 5/22/2008 at 11:00 AM. (Thompson, James)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 16 Filed: 5/19/2008, Entered: 5/19/2008, Terminated: 5/20/2008 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION by Defendant WMC Mortgage, LLC for extension of time to file answer Or Otherwise Respond (Thompson, James)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 15 Filed: 5/12/2008, Entered: 5/15/2008 Description not availableCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                APPLICATION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Herbert Steele, and Doris Steele by Gary Edward Klein; Order entered granting leave by Judge Honorable Blanche M. Manning. Filing fee $ 50 paid, receipt number 4624001377. (kjc, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 14 Filed: 5/12/2008, Entered: 5/15/2008 Description not availableCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  APPLICATION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Herbert Steele, Alexandra Diaz, Eric R. Chavez, Sonia Torres, and Doris Steele by Andrew S Friedman; Order entered granting leave by Judge Honorable Blanche M. Manning. Filing fee $ 50 paid, receipt number 4624001815. (kjc, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 13 Filed: 5/12/2008, Entered: 5/15/2008 Description not availableCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    APPLICATION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Herbert Steele, Alexandra Diaz, Eric R. Chavez, Sonia Torres, and Doris Steele by Wendy J. Harrison; Order entered granting leave by Judge Honorable Blanche M. Manning. Filing fee $ 50 paid, receipt number 4624001814. (kjc, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 12 Filed: 4/30/2008, Entered: 4/30/2008 Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant WMC Mortgage, LLC by Justin Carey Steffen (Steffen, Justin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 11 Filed: 4/30/2008, Entered: 4/30/2008 Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant WMC Mortgage, LLC by James L. Thompson (Thompson, James)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 10 Filed: 4/24/2008, Entered: 4/24/2008 Set/Reset HearingsCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MINUTE entry before Judge Honorable Blanche M. Manning: Status hearing set for 5/20/2008 at 11:00 AM. Plaintiff's counsel should be prepared to advise the court regarding the progress of efforts to serve the defendants. Mailed notice (rth, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 9 Filed: 4/3/2008, Entered: 4/3/2008 Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Duplicate filing of entry no. 8. (Miller, Marvin) Modified on 4/7/2008 (emd, ).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 8 Filed: 4/3/2008, Entered: 4/3/2008 Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Herbert Steele, Doris Steele by Marvin Alan Miller Marvin A. Miller (Miller, Marvin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 7 Filed: 4/3/2008, Entered: 4/3/2008 Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Herbert Steele, Doris Steele by Lori Ann Fanning Appearance for Lori A. Fanning (Fanning, Lori)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 6 Filed: 4/3/2008, Entered: 4/3/2008 Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Amended Class Action Complaint AMENDED complaint by Herbert Steele, Doris Steele against all defendants (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1 through 5)(Fanning, Lori)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 5 Filed: 4/2/2008, Entered: 4/3/2008 Summons Issued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SUMMONS, 3 originals Issued to Defendants GE Money Bank, WMC Mortgage Corporation, WMC Mortgage, LLC. (ca, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 3 Filed: 4/1/2008, Entered: 4/3/2008 Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Herbert Steele, Doris Steele by Al Hofeld, Jr. (ca, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 2 Filed: 4/1/2008, Entered: 4/3/2008 civil cover sheet
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        CIVIL Cover Sheet. (ca, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 1 Filed: 4/1/2008, Entered: 4/3/2008 Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          COMPLAINT filed by Herbert Steel and Doris Steele; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 350.Attachments: # (1) Exhibits 1 and 2).(ca, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            This case has been viewed 207 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                             
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Need Password Help?