USA v. Qualtier
Criminal Case Illinois Northern District Court, Case No. 1:08-cr-00289

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

United States of America United States of America, Plaintiff
Officially listed as "USA"

Represented by United States Department of Justice

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Entity DB

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Probation Department +4085 408 408 5197 Intake_Docket_ILNP@ilnp.uscourts.gov
Space Pretrial Services +4355 435 435 5545 ilnptdb_Court_Action_Notice@ilnpt.uscourts.gov
v.
No Logo Frank P Qualtier, Defendant

Represented by Dziedziak & Marcus, PC

Note: Criminal cases with multiple defendants may have several records with the same case number: one record for the master file (all defendants), as well as one record per defendant. It can often be difficult to tell which record is which. Other likely matches for this case include:

Office Chicago
Filed 4/9/2008
County Cook
Terminated
Reopened
Other Court Case None
Count 1
Citation Section 26 U.S.C. § 7206A.F
Offense Level 4
Count 2-4
Citation Section 26 U.S.C. § 7203D.F
Offense Level 4
Def Custody Status Released
Flag COX
  Entries (24) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 9/4/2008, Entered: 9/4/2008 Certificate
CERTIFICATE of Service by USA as to Frank P Qualtier (Yonan, Jason)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 9/4/2008, Entered: 9/4/2008 notice of attorney substitution - USA
    ATTORNEY Substitution for the USA of Jason A. Yonan (Yonan, Jason)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 8/6/2008, Entered: 8/7/2008 status hearing
      MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Status hearing held on 8/6/2008. Sentencing is re-set to 10/21/2008 at 11:00 a.m. Mailed notice (gds, )
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 7/29/2008, Entered: 7/29/2008 Set/Reset Hearings
        MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Status hearing, regarding pretrial services' report, is set for 8/6/2008 at 9:00 a.m. Telephone notice (gds, )
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 6/16/2008, Entered: 6/16/2008 Terminate Hearings
          MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Sentencing is re-set to 9/4/2008 at 10:00 a.m. Telephone notice (gds, )
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 5/27/2008, Entered: 5/28/2008 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
            MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Motion to terminate electronic monitoring [13] is granted as to Frank P Qualtier (1); Motion hearing held on 5/27/2008 regarding sad motion [13]. Mailed notice (gds, )
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 5/14/2008, Entered: 5/14/2008 Certificate Of Service.
              CERTIFICATE of Service regarding notice of motion[14], MOTION by Frank P Qualtier To Terminte Electronic Monitoring[13] (Marcus, James)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 5/14/2008, Entered: 5/14/2008 Notice of Motion
                NOTICE of Motion by James I. Marcus for presentment of before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 5/27/2008 at 09:15 AM. (Marcus, James)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 5/14/2008, Entered: 5/14/2008, Terminated: 5/27/2008 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                  MOTION by Frank P Qualtier To Terminte Electronic Monitoring (Marcus, James)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 5/14/2008, Entered: 5/14/2008 Certificate Of Service.
                    CERTIFICATE of Service regarding notice of attorney appearance - defendant[11] (Marcus, James)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 5/14/2008, Entered: 5/14/2008 Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant
                      ATTORNEY Appearance for defendant Frank P Qualtier by James I. Marcus (Marcus, James)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 5/8/2008, Entered: 5/16/2008 status hearing
                        MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Status hearing held. Defendant withdraws plea of not guilty to count 1 of the criminal information and enters plea of guilty to said count. Defendant advised of his rights. Enter finding of guilty. Cause is referred to the probation dept. for a pre-sentence investigation and report. Sentencing is set for 7/22/2008, at 10:00a.m. Mailed notice (emd, )
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 5/8/2008, Entered: 5/16/2008 Plea Agreement
                          PLEA Agreement as to Frank P Qualtier (emd, )
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 5/8/2008, Entered: 5/16/2008 Waiver......
                            WAIVER of indictment by Frank P Qualtier (emd, )
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 5/1/2008, Entered: 5/1/2008 Description not availableCourt Filing
                              MINUTE entry before Judge Honorable Robert W. Gettleman:Defendant's bond is enlarged to permit travel to the Central District of Illinois from 5/2/2008 9:00 a.m. through 5/4/2008 6:00 p.m. Telephone notice (gds, )
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 4/28/2008, Entered: 4/28/2008 Terminate HearingsCourt Filing
                                MINUTE entry before Judge Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Status hearing date of 5/6/2008 is stricken. The Court deems the period of time from 5/6/2008 through 5/8/2008 excludable under 18 USC Sect. 3161(h)(8)(B)(iv). Change of Plea Hearing set for 5/8/2008, at 2:00 p.m. Telephone notice (gds, )
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 4/22/2008, Entered: 4/24/2008 Description not availableCourt Filing
                                  MINUTE entry before Judge Susan E. Cox: Order Setting Conditions of Release entered 4/21/08 is amended to reflect the hours of curfew for defendant. Defendant is permitted to leave his residence for work and family obligations with a daily curfew. He may leave his residence by 5:0am but must return each day by 10:00pm. Exceptions and special circumstances are to have prior approval of the pretrial services officer. Mailed notice (emd, )
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 4/21/2008, Entered: 4/22/2008 Order Setting Conditions of ReleaseCourt Filing
                                    ORDER Setting Conditions of Release as to Frank P Qualtier (1) $4500.00 Signed by Judge Susan E. Cox on 4/21/08. (Redacted image) (emd, )
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 4/21/2008, Entered: 4/22/2008 Bond
                                      OWN Recognizance Bond as to Frank P Qualtier in amount of $ 4500.00, (Redacted image) (emd, )
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 4/21/2008, Entered: 4/22/2008 ArraignmentCourt Filing
                                        MINUTE entry before Judge Susan E. Cox: Arraignment held. Defendant enters plea of not guilty to all counts. James Marcus is given leave to file his appearance as counsel for defendant. 16.1(A) conference to be held as soon as possible. Pretrial motions to be filed by 5/6/08. Status hearing before Judge Gettleman set for 5/6/08 at 9:15a.m. Bond hearing held. Order time excluded from 4/21/08 to and including status date pursuant to 18 USC Section 3161(h)(1)(F). Mailed notice (emd, )
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 4/11/2008, Entered: 4/15/2008 Description not availableCourt Filing
                                          MINUTE entry before Judge Honorable Susan E. Cox as to Frank P Qualtier: Pursuant to an agreed request by the parties, arraignment set for 4/16/08 at 10:00 a.m. is reset to 4/21/08 at 4:00 p.m. Mailed notice (yap, )
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 4/10/2008, Entered: 4/10/2008 notice of arraignmentCourt Filing
                                            NOTICE of Arraignment as to Frank P Qualtier before Honorable Susan E. Cox on 4/16/2008 at 10:00 AM. for Judge Gettleman. (Redacted image) (emd, )
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 4/9/2008, Entered: 4/10/2008 designation form
                                              DESIGNATION Sheet: FELONY (Category 2). (emd, )
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 4/9/2008, Entered: 4/10/2008 Information - Felony
                                                INFORMATION as to Frank P Qualtier (1) count(s) 1, 2-4 (emd, )
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                  Statistics

                                                  This case has been viewed 422 times.

                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                  Space
                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                   
                                                  PlainSite
                                                  Sign Up
                                                  Need Password Help?