Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. v. MacLeroy
Federal Civil Lawsuit Alabama Middle District Court, Case No. 2:14-cv-00622

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated May 31, 2019 at 11:59 PM DT (2 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Citation Section 47 U.S.C. § 605
Nature of Suit Cable/Satellite TV
  Entries (7) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 9/28/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
JUDGMENT: IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that the 14 Motion for Final Default Judgment is granted as follows: 1. That Judgment by default be entered in favor of Plaintiff and against Defendants, Yance E. MacLeroy, individually and as an officer, director, shareholder and/or principal of Firenze II, LLC d/b/a Caf Firenze II and Firenze II, LLC d/b/a Caf Firenze II. 2. That Plaintiff recover statutory damages pursuant to 47 U.S.C. § 605(e)(3)(C)(i)(II) from Defendants in the amount of $10,000.00. 3. That Plaintiff recover additional damages pursuant to 47 U.S.C. § 605(e) 3)(C)(ii) from Defendants in the amount of $50,000.00. 4. That Plaintiff recovers attorneys' fees from defendants in the amount of $1,500.00 and costs in the amount of $475.00 relating to the prosecution of this matter. 5. That Plaintiff recover, in the event Defendants fail to voluntarily pay the judgment, is entitled to reasonable attorneys' fees for post-trial and appellate services. 6. The Court also enjoin Defendants from ever intercepting or exhibiting an unauthorized program in violation of the Federal Communications Act. 7. The Court also awards Plaintiff court costs and post-judgment interest on the amounts awarded herein at an annual rate of 12% per annum from the date of this Judgment until paid. 8. All writs and process for the enforcement and collection of this judgment may issue as necessary. In connection with any Writ of Execution i n this case, the Court directs the United States Marshals Service to use any means or force reasonably necessary to satisfy this Judgment. 9. This judgment is a final judgment. The clerk of the court is DIRECTED to enter this document on the civil docket as a final judgment pursuant to Rule 58 of the FRCP. This case is closed. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 9/28/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Appeals Checklist)(kh, )
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 1/12/2015, Entered: None Order to Show Cause
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 12/15/2014, Entered: None Default Judgment
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 10/30/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
        ORDER OF DEFAULT entering Default against Firenze II, LLC d/b/a Cafe Firenze, II, as further set out in order. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 10/30/14. (djy, )
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 10/30/2014, Entered: None Order
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 9/30/2014, Entered: None Entry of Default
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 9/30/2014, Entered: None Entry of Default
                Request RequestSpace LREF

                Statistics

                This case has been viewed 0 times.

                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                Space
                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                 
                PlainSite
                Sign Up
                Need Password Help?