USA v. Malukaite
Criminal Case Illinois Northern District Court, Case No. 1:08-cr-00374

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

United States of America United States of America, Plaintiff
Officially listed as "USA"

Represented by United States Department of Justice

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Entity DB

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Pretrial Services +4355 435 435 5545 ilnptdb_Court_Action_Notice@ilnpt.uscourts.gov
v.
No Logo Viktorija Malukaite, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of Defender Services

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Paul Flynn +1 312 621 8300 paul_flynn@fd.org

Note: Criminal cases with multiple defendants may have several records with the same case number: one record for the master file (all defendants), as well as one record per defendant. It can often be difficult to tell which record is which. Other likely matches for this case include:

Office Chicago
Filed 7/8/2008
County Cook
Terminated
Reopened
Other Court Case None
Count 1
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 2113A.F
Offense Level 4
BANK ROBBERY BY FORCE OR VIOLENCE; 182 AIDING & ABETTING
Def Custody Status Released
Flag NOLAN
  Entries (38) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 12/8/2014, Entered: None Request To Modify Conditions/Term of Supervision
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document 42 Filed: 9/8/2008, Entered: 9/8/2008 Supplement
    SUPPLEMENT by USA to indictment[26] Bill of Particulars (Hogstrom, Erik)
      LREF
      Legal Document 41 Filed: 8/21/2008, Entered: 8/22/2008 status hearing
      MINUTE entry before the Honorable Samuel Der-Yeghiayan as to all Defendants: Status hearing held and continued to 10/07/08 at 9:30 a.m. In the interest of justice, the Government's oral motion to exclude time through and including 10/07/08 is granted pursuant to 18 U.S.C. 3161(h)(8)(A)(B) without objection. Mailed notice (emd, )
        LREF
        Legal Document 37 Filed: 8/8/2008, Entered: 8/12/2008 Description not available
        MINUTE entry before the Honorable Nan R. Nolan: Defendant's oral agreed motion for modification of bond is granted as follows and approved by Pretrial Services: (1) Defendant Viktorija Malukaite is allowed to attend her fathers birthday party (August 8, 2008) from 8p.m. until 2 a.m. (2) Family outing beginning the evening of August 15, 2008 until 12 a.m. (midnight) August 17, 2008. (3) Defendant is allowed to attend evening classes during the Fall Semester 2008 (Monday's 6p.m. to 8:50p.m. and Wednesdays from 6p.m. to 9:50p.m.). Mailed notice (emd, )
          LREF
          Legal Document 30 Filed: 7/17/2008, Entered: 7/21/2008 ArraignmentCourt Filing
          MINUTE entry before the Honorable Nan R. Nolan as to Viktorija Malukaite and Nader Zeidan:Arraignment proceedings held. Defendants informed of their rights. Defendants acknowledge receipt of the Indictment, waive formal reading and both enter pleas of not guilty. Rule 16 conference to be conducted no later than 07/24/08. Pre-trial motions are due by 07/31/08. Response to be filed by 08/07/08. Reply brief is due by 08/14/08. Status hearing before Judge Der-Yeghiayan is set for 08/21/08 at 10:30 a.m. Time is hereby excluded from 07/17/08 to and including 08/21/08 pursuant to 18 USC § 3161 (h)(8)(A)(B). Mailed notice (meg, )
            LREF
            Legal Document 29 Filed: 7/14/2008, Entered: 7/14/2008 notice of arraignment
            NOTICE of Arraignment as to Viktorija Malukaite, Ahmad Ali Ahmad, Nader Zeidan, Rami Jafilan before Honorable Nan R. Nolan on Thursday, 7/17/2008 at 10:00 a.m. (meg, )
              LREF
              Legal Document 28 Filed: 7/8/2008, Entered: 7/10/2008 Description not available
              MINUTE entry before the Honorable Samuel Der-Yeghiayan as to Viktorija Malukaite, et al.: Bond set in 08 CR 374 to stand as bond in this instance as to Viktorija Malukaite. Detention order previously issued in 08 CR 384 to stand as to Ahmad Ali Ahmad. Bond set in 08 CR 414 to stand as bond in this instance as to Nader Zeidan. Detention order previously issued in 08 CR 458 to stand as to Rami Jafilan. (meg, )
                LREF
                Legal Document 27 Filed: 7/8/2008, Entered: 7/10/2008 designation form
                DESIGNATION Sheet: FELONY (Category II). (meg, )
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 26 Filed: 7/8/2008, Entered: 7/10/2008 Indictment
                  INDICTMENT as to Viktorija Malukaite (1) count(s) 1, Ahmad Ali Ahmad (2) count(s) 1, 2, Nader Zeidan (3) count(s) 1, Rami Jafilan (4) count(s) 1, 2 with Forfeiture Allegations (meg, )
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 25 Filed: 7/1/2008, Entered: 7/3/2008 miscellaneous remark
                    ATTACHMENT by USA to government's second unopoosed motion for an extension of time to return indictment or to file an information as to Viktorija Malukaite (RESTRICTED) (meg, )
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 24 Filed: 7/1/2008, Entered: 7/3/2008 Order
                      ORDER as to Viktorija Malukaite Signed by the Honorable James F. Holderman on 7/1/08.Mailed notice (meg, )
                        LREF
                        Legal Document 23 Filed: 7/1/2008, Entered: 7/3/2008 Order on Motion for Extension of Time
                        MINUTE entry before the Honorable James F. Holderman as to Viktorija Malukaite :Government's second unopposed motion for an extension of time to return indictment or to file an information [22] is granted. ENTER ORDER: It is hereby ordered that the time within which to file an indictment against the defendant be extended to and including July 12, 2008. Mailed notice (meg, )
                          LREF
                          Legal Document 22 Filed: 6/30/2008, Entered: 6/30/2008, Terminated: 7/1/2008 Motion for Extension of Time
                          GOVERNMENT'S SECOND UNOPPOSED MOTION for extension of time as to return indictment or to file an information (Hogstrom, Erik) (Text modified by Clerk's Office on 7/1/2008) (cdy, ).
                            LREF
                            Legal Document 21 Filed: 6/16/2008, Entered: 6/23/2008 Order
                            ORDER as to Viktorija Malukaite Signed by the Honorable Nan R. Nolan on 6/16/08.Mailed notice (meg, )
                              LREF
                              Legal Document 20 Filed: 6/16/2008, Entered: 6/23/2008 Description not available
                              MINUTE entry before the Honorable Nan R. Nolan as to Viktorija Malukaite:Enter Order granting defendant's request that the conditions of the release be modified. Mailed notice (meg, )
                                LREF
                                Legal Document 19 Filed: 6/11/2008, Entered: 6/12/2008 magistrate judge status hearing
                                MINUTE entry before the Honorable Nan R. Nolan:Magistrate judge status hearing held on 6/11/2008. Defendant is hereby admonished and reminded that she is ordered to comply with all conditions set forth in the Order Setting Conditions of Release. Defendant's oral motion for modification as to curfew and employment is granted. Defendant is advised that any modifications to her pretrial release order, must first be directed and approved by Pretrial Services prior to any adjustments being made. Order to follow. Mailed notice (lxs, )
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document 18 Filed: 6/9/2008, Entered: 6/9/2008 Terminate Deadlines and Hearings
                                  MINUTE entry before the Honorable Nan R. Nolan: Status hearing set for 06/10/2008 is stricken and reset to 6/11/2008 at 02:30 PM. Mailed notice (lxs, )
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document 17 Filed: 6/5/2008, Entered: 6/5/2008 Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release
                                    MINUTE entry before the Honorable Nan R. Nolan:Unopposed Motion to modify conditions of release [16] is granted as to Viktorija Malukaite. Mailed notice (lxs, )
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document 16 Filed: 6/5/2008, Entered: 6/5/2008, Terminated: 6/5/2008 Motion to Modify Conditions of Release
                                      MOTION by Viktorija Malukaite to modify conditions of release (Unopposed Motion) (Flynn, Paul)
                                        LREF
                                        Legal Document 15 Filed: 5/28/2008, Entered: 5/29/2008 miscellaneous remark
                                        ATTACHMENT by USA to motion to extend as to Viktorija Malukaite (RESTRICTED) (meg, )
                                          LREF
                                          Legal Document 14 Filed: 5/28/2008, Entered: 5/29/2008 Order
                                          ORDER as to Viktorija Malukaite Signed by the Honorable Samuel Der-Yeghiayan on 5/28/08.Mailed notice (meg, )
                                            LREF
                                            Legal Document 13 Filed: 5/28/2008, Entered: 5/29/2008 Order on Motion for Extension of Time
                                            MINUTE entry before the Honorable Samuel Der-Yeghiayan as to Viktoria Malukaite:The Government's motion for extension of time to return indictment or to file an information [12] is granted.Mailed notice (meg, )
                                              LREF
                                              Legal Document 12 Filed: 5/28/2008, Entered: 5/28/2008, Terminated: 5/28/2008 Motion for Extension of Time
                                              MOTION by USA for extension of time as to Viktorija Malukaite GOVERNMENT'S UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR AN EXTENSION OF TIME TO RETURN INDICTMENT OR TO FILE AN INFORMATION (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order ORDER)(Hogstrom, Erik)
                                                LREF
                                                Legal Document 11 Filed: 5/28/2008, Entered: 5/28/2008, Terminated: 5/28/2008 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                MOTION by USA for extension of time as to Viktorija Malukaite GOVERNMENT'S UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR AN EXTENSION OF TIME TO RETURN INDICTMENT OR TO FILE AN INFORMATION (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order ORDER)(Hogstrom, Erik)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Legal Document 10 Filed: 5/9/2008, Entered: 5/14/2008 Order on Motion to Amend/CorrectCourt Filing
                                                  MINUTE entry before Judge Nan R. Nolan as to Viktorija Malukaite:Government's unopposed motion for leave to amend affidavit in support of criminal complaint to correct tow inadvertent errors [9] is granted. Mailed notice (meg, )
                                                    LREF
                                                    Legal Document 9 Filed: 5/9/2008, Entered: 5/14/2008 Motion to Amend/Correct
                                                    UNOPPOSED MOTION by USA for leave to amend affidavit in support of criminal complaint to correct two inadvertent errors as to Viktorija Malukaite (meg, )
                                                      LREF
                                                      Legal Document 8 Filed: 5/9/2008, Entered: 5/14/2008 Bond
                                                      SECURED Bond by $5,000.00 Cash as to Viktorija Malukaite in amount of $ 50,000.00, Receipt # 4624002337 (REDACTED) (meg, )
                                                        LREF
                                                        Legal Document 7 Filed: 5/9/2008, Entered: 5/14/2008 Order Setting Conditions of ReleaseCourt Filing
                                                        ORDER Setting Conditions of Release as to Viktorija Malukaite (1) $50,000.00 (Secured by $5,000.00 Cash) Signed by Judge Honorable Nan R. Nolan on 5/9/08. (REDACTED)Mailed notice (meg, )
                                                          LREF
                                                          Legal Document 6 Filed: 5/9/2008, Entered: 5/14/2008 Affidavit
                                                          FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT filed by Viktorija Malukaite (REDACTED) (meg, )
                                                            LREF
                                                            Legal Document 5 Filed: 5/9/2008, Entered: 5/14/2008 Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant
                                                            ATTORNEY Appearance for defendant Viktorija Malukaite by Paul Flynn (meg, )
                                                              LREF
                                                              Legal Document 4 Filed: 5/9/2008, Entered: 5/14/2008 Order Appointing CounselCourt Filing
                                                              ORDER Appointing Counsel Signed by Judge Honorable Nan R. Nolan on 5/9/08.Mailed notice (meg, )
                                                                LREF
                                                                Legal Document 3 Filed: 5/9/2008, Entered: 5/14/2008 order on motion for detentionCourt Filing
                                                                MINUTE entry before Judge Nan R. Nolan as to Viktorija Malukaite:Detention hearing held. Government's oral motion to detain the defendant pending trial is denied. Enter Order Setting Conditions of Release. Defendant waives her right to preliminary examination. Enter finding of probable cause; Order defendant bound to the District Court for further proceedings. Status hearing is set for 6/10/08 at 2:30 p.m. Mailed notice (meg, )
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Legal Document 2 Filed: 5/9/2008, Entered: 5/14/2008 order on motion for detentionCourt Filing
                                                                  MINUTE entry before Judge Nan R. Nolan as to Viktorija Malukaite : Initial appearance proceedings held. Defendant Viktorija Malukaite appears in response to arrest on 5/9/08. Defendant informed of her rights. Enter order appointing Paul Flynn as counsel for defendant. Government's oral motion for pretrial detention is granted. Defendant's oral motion for expedited detention hearing is granted. Detention hearing is set for this afternoon, 5/9/08 at 3:30 p.m. Defendant to remain in custody until further order of the Court. Mailed notice (meg, )
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Legal Document 1 Filed: 5/9/2008, Entered: 5/14/2008 ComplaintCourt Filing
                                                                    COMPLAINT signed by Judge Honorable Nan R. Nolan as to Viktorija Malukaite (1) (meg, )
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 5/9/2008, Entered: 5/14/2008 motion for detention
                                                                      ORAL MOTION by USA to detain the defendant pending trial as to Viktorija Malukaite (meg, )
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 5/9/2008, Entered: 5/14/2008 motion for detention
                                                                        ORAL MOTION by USA for expedited detention hearing as to Viktorija Malukaite (meg, )
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 5/9/2008, Entered: 5/14/2008 motion for detention
                                                                          ORAL MOTION by USA for pretrial detention as to Viktorija Malukaite (meg, )
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 5/9/2008, Entered: 5/14/2008 arrest2
                                                                            ARREST of defendant Viktorija Malukaite (meg, )
                                                                              LREF

                                                                              Statistics

                                                                              This case has been viewed 1,379 times.

                                                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                              Space
                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                               
                                                                              PlainSite
                                                                              Sign Up
                                                                              Need Password Help?