Ansari v. Chertoff et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Illinois Northern District Court, Case No. 1:08-cv-02899
District Judge James B. Zagel, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Tauseef Ansari, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by AzulaySeiden Law Group

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Roland C Lara +3128 329 200 x107 +1 312 363 6107 rlara@azulayseiden.com
v.
Rice, Condoleezza Rice, Condoleezza, Defendant
Officially listed as "Condoleezza Rice"
Unknown Role, Kior, Inc.
Unknown Role, Evenflow, Inc.
Unknown Role, C3, Inc.

Represented by United States Department of Justice

No Logo Embassy of the United States for Riyadh, Saudi Arabia, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Christopher Wayne Hollis +1 202 305 0899 +1 202 616 8962 christopher.hollis@usdoj.gov
No Logo Emilio T. Gonzales, Defendant

Represented by United States Department of Justice

No Logo Ford M. Fraker, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Christopher Wayne Hollis +1 202 305 0899 +1 202 616 8962 christopher.hollis@usdoj.gov
No Logo Michael B. Mukasey, Defendant

Represented by United States Department of Justice

No Logo Michael Chertoff, Defendant

Represented by United States Department of Justice

Office Chicago
Filed 5/19/2008
Jury Demand None
Demand
Nature of Suit 890 - Other Statutes: Other Statutory Actions
Cause Section 05 U.S.C. § 702 Administrative Procedure Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Dismissed - Voluntarily
County Cook
Terminated 9/8/2008
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags KEYS, TERMED
  Entries (14) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 15 Filed: 9/8/2008, Entered: 9/8/2008 Order on Motion to Dismiss
MINUTE entry before the Honorable James B. Zagel:Plaintiff's motion to dismiss without prejudice and without costs [13] is granted. Status set for 10/2/2008 is stricken. Civil case terminated. Mailed notice (drw, )
    LREF
    Legal Document 14 Filed: 9/4/2008, Entered: 9/4/2008 Notice of Motion
    NOTICE of Motion by Roland C Lara for presentment of motion to dismiss[13] before Honorable James B. Zagel on 9/9/2008 at 10:15 AM. (Lara, Roland)
      LREF
      Legal Document 13 Filed: 9/4/2008, Entered: 9/4/2008, Terminated: 9/8/2008 Motion to Dismiss
      MOTION by Plaintiff Tauseef Ansari to dismiss (Lara, Roland)
        LREF
        Legal Document 12 Filed: 8/15/2008, Entered: 8/28/2008 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Resp
        MINUTE entry before the Honorable James B. Zagel:Motion for extension of time until 9/18/2008 to file response to the petition for writ of mandamus [11] is granted. Status hearing (9-4-2008) is reset for 10/2/2008 at 10:00 AM. Mailed notice (drw, )
          LREF
          Legal Document 11 Filed: 8/15/2008, Entered: 8/15/2008, Terminated: 8/15/2008 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Repl
          MOTION by Defendants Ford M. Fraker, Embassy of the United States for Riyadh, Saudi Arabia, Michael Chertoff, Michael B. Mukasey, Emilio T. Gonzales, Condoleezza Rice for extension of time to file response/reply (Hollis, Christopher)
            LREF
            Legal Document 10 Filed: 7/29/2008, Entered: 7/30/2008 Terminate Hearings
            MINUTE entry before the Honorable James B. Zagel:Status hearing held on 7/29/2008. Status hearing set for 9/4/2008 at 10:00 AM.Mailed notice (drw, )
              LREF
              Legal Document 9 Filed: 7/22/2008, Entered: 7/22/2008 Order on Motion for Default Judgment
              MINUTE entry before the Honorable James B. Zagel:Motion hearing held on 7/22/2008. Motion for Chistopher Hollis to appear pro hac Vice [8] is granted. MOTION by Plaintiff Tauseef Ansari for default judgment as to all defendants [6] is denied. Attorney Christopher Hollis is directed to appear for the status on 7/29/2008. Status hearing set for 7/29/2008 at 10:00 AM.Mailed notice (drw, )
                LREF
                Legal Document 8 Filed: 7/18/2008, Entered: 7/18/2008, Terminated: 7/22/2008 motion to appear pro hac vice
                MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Hollis, Christopher)
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 7 Filed: 7/17/2008, Entered: 7/17/2008 Notice of Motion
                  NOTICE of Motion by Roland C Lara for presentment of motion for default judgment[6] before Honorable James B. Zagel on 7/22/2008 at 10:15 AM. (Lara, Roland)
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 6 Filed: 7/17/2008, Entered: 7/17/2008, Terminated: 7/22/2008 Motion for Default Judgment
                    MOTION by Plaintiff Tauseef Ansari for default judgment as to all Defendants (Lara, Roland)
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 5 Filed: 5/19/2008, Entered: 5/20/2008 Summons Issued as to USA
                      SUMMONS Issued as to Ford M. Fraker, Embassy of the United States for Riyadh, Saudi Arabia, Michael Chertoff, Michael B. Mukasey, Emilio T. Gonzales, Condoleezza Rice, U.S. Attorney. (ef, )
                        LREF
                        Legal Document 3 Filed: 5/19/2008, Entered: 5/20/2008 Attorney Appearance
                        ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Tauseef Ansari by Roland C Lara. (ef, )
                          LREF
                          Legal Document 2 Filed: 5/19/2008, Entered: 5/20/2008 civil cover sheet
                          CIVIL Cover Sheet. (ef, )
                            LREF
                            Legal Document 1 Filed: 5/19/2008, Entered: 5/20/2008 Complaint
                            PETITION for Writ of Mandamus filed by Tauseef Ansari; Filing fee $ 350. (Exhibits).(ef, )
                              LREF

                              Statistics

                              This case has been viewed 116 times.

                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                              Space
                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                               
                              PlainSite
                              Sign Up
                              Need Password Help?